Securities and Exchange Commission v. Gold Standard Mining Corp et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Kenneth G Eade, Gold Standard Mining Corp, Edward Randall Gruber, Gruber and Company LLC and Panteleimon Zachos
Case Number: 2:2012cv05662
Filed: June 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Presiding Judge: Carla Woehrle
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal for Report and Recommendation (Issued) 188 . (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that defendant Eade's Claim of Exemption and request for hearing (docket nos. 182, 183) are denied. (iva)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE 162 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: No objections to the Report and Recommendation have been filed herein. The Court concurs with and accepts the findings , conclusions and recommendations of the Magistrate Judge. IT THEREFORE IS ORDERED that plaintiff's Application for Post-Judgment Continuing Writ of Garnishment 150 and Cross-Motion and Motion for Entry of Writs of Garnishment 153 are granted. It is further ordered that the writ of execution and writ of garnishment to Amazon.com shall be issued. (ad)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 JUDGMENT by Judge Jesus G. Bernal related to: MINUTE ORDER APPROVING SEC's Calculation of Prejudgment Interest (IN CHAMBERS), 146 . The Court orders that judgment shall be entered as follows: (See document for specifics.) (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (iva)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 JUDGMENT AS TO GRUBER & COMPANY LLC by Judge Jesus G. Bernal re: granting 123 Motion for Permanent Injunction ; 123 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant and Defendants agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and all persons in active concert or participation with them who receive actual notice of this Judgment by personal service or otherwise are permanently restrained and enjoined from violating, directly or indirectly, Section 1 0(b) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 (the Exchange Act) [15 U.S.C. § 78j(b)] and Rule 10b-5 promulgated thereunder [17 C.F.R. § 240.10b-5], by using any means or instrumentality of interstate commerce, or of the mails, or of any facility of any national securities exchange, in connection with the purchase or sale of any security: (see document for specifics). (mrgo)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 JUDGMENT AS TO EDWARD RANDALL GRUBER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal re: 120 Motion for Permanent Injunction. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant and Defendants agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and all persons in active con cert or participation with them who receive actual notice of this Judgment by personal service or otherwise are permanently restrained and enjoined from violating, directly or indirectly, Section 10(b) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 (the Exc hange Act) [15 U.S.C. § 78j(b)] and Rule 10b-5 promulgated thereunder [17 C.F.R. § 240.10b-5], by using any means or instrumentality of interstate commerce, or of the mails, or of any facility of any national securities exchange, in connection with the purchase or sale of any security: (see document for further specifics). (mrgo)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO KENNETH G EADE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, in favor of Securities and Exchange Commission against Kenneth G Eade Related to: Joint MOTION for Entry of Judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) as to Kenneth G. Eade 99 . (See document for details) (mrgo)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FINAL JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST GOLD STANDARD MINING CORPORATION by Judge Percy Anderson: Upon Joint Motion for Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction against Gold Standard Mining Corp. 33 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREE D that Defendant Gold Standard Mining Corp. and its agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and all persons in active concert or participation with them who receive actual notice of this Final Judgment of Permanent Injunction by personal service or o therwise are permanently restrained and enjoined from violating, directly or indirectly, Section 10(b) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 (the "Exchange Act"), 15 U.S.C. Section 78j(b), and Rule 10b-5 promulgated thereunder, 17 C.F.R. Section 240.10b-5, by using any means or instrumentality of interstate commerce, or of the mails, or of any facility of any national securities exchange, in connection with the purchase or sale of any security, etc. See document for details. (gk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Gold Standard Mining Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth G Eade
Represented By: Kenneth G Eade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold Standard Mining Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Randall Gruber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gruber and Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panteleimon Zachos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Leslie J Hughes
Represented By: Molly M White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?