Humberto Daniel Klee et al v. Nissan North America Inc et al

Plaintiff: Humberto Daniel Klee and David Wallak
Defendant: Nissan Motor Company Ltd and Nissan North America Inc
Case Number: 2:2012cv08238
Filed: September 24, 2012
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Dean D. Pregerson
Referring Judge: Patrick J. Walsh
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2015 171 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Judge A. Wallace Tashima. In accordance with the Order Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Awarding Attorneys' Fees (the "Order") 170 , signed and filed concurrently herewith, IT IS ADJUDGED that this action hereby is DISMISSED with prejudice. Costs, expenses, and fees shall be as provided in the Order. IT IS ORDERED that this Court retains jurisdiction over this action and the parties (including class members) for the purpose implementing, administering, and enforcing the Settlement and the Order. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jre)
February 19, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL DISCOVERY MATERIAL 29 by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (afe)
December 17, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The court orders Plaintiffs to file a brief, not to exceed five pages, by Friday, January 4, 2013 to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction (lc). Modified on 12/17/2012 (lc). Modified on 12/17/2012 (lc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humberto Daniel Klee et al v. Nissan North America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humberto Daniel Klee
Represented By: Jordan L Lurie
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Sokolowski
Represented By: Tarek H Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wallak
Represented By: Jordan L Lurie
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Sokolowski
Represented By: Tarek H Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Company Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America Inc
Represented By: Paul J Riehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?