Angela L Wilder v. CBS Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Angela L Wilder
Defendant: CBS Television Studios, RelativityREAL LLC, Sony Pictures Television, Tom Forman, Holly Jacobs, CBS Corporation, Relativity Media LLC and Sony Pictures Entertainment
Case Number: 2:2012cv08961
Filed: October 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Referring Judge: Ralph Zarefsky
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re Stipulation to Dismiss Case #76 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court hereby ORDERS that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees. The Court reserves and retains jurisdiction over this action for the purpose of enforcing the parties settlement agreement. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Case Terminated. Made JS-6.) (kti)
June 12, 2013 Filing 76 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the Settlement Agreement filed by Defendants Holly Jacobs, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Sony Pictures Television. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pines, Adam)
June 7, 2013 Filing 75 SCHEDULING NOTICE re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Complaint #69 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment #51 , MOTION to Strike and/or Exclude the Opinions, Report and Testimony of Plaintiff's Purported Expert Witness, Todd P. Leavitt #70 , MOTION for Attorney Fees #47 : Hearing on all Motions set in this case will occur on 6/24/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 17, 2013 Filing 74 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi: The above-captioned matter came on for a Settlement Conference. The parties and their counsel were present. The Court conducted a joint session. The Court privately caucused with the parties and their counsel. The matter was resolved. The parties shall file a Notice of Settlement and effectuate dismissal of this action forthwith. The parties are reminded that all discussions were, and are, deemed to be confidential settlement communications. It is so ordered. Court Recorder: CS 5/17/13. (bem)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Having reviewed the Plaintiffs ex parte application, the Court DENIES the motion to strike Defendants amended motion for summary judgment, but GRANTS Plaintiff until June 3, 2013 to file her Opposition to Defendants amended motion for summary judgment; Defendants shall have until June 10, 2013 to file their reply; and the hearing on the amended motion for summary judgment is set for June 24, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. The Court further VACATES the trial set for June 18, 2013; should this Court determine that a triable issue of fact remains after considering Defendants amended motion for summary judgment, itwill set a trial date at that time. #71 (pj)
May 15, 2013 Filing 72 SONY DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Defendants' Amended Motion for Summary Judgment #71 filed by Defendants Holly Jacobs, Sony Pictures Television. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Pines, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Petrossian, Emil)
May 14, 2013 Filing 71 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Defendants' Amended Motion for Summary Judgment filed by plaintiff Angela L Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Peter J. Toren, #2 Proposed Order)(Toren, Peter)
May 13, 2013 Filing 70 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike and/or Exclude the Opinions, Report and Testimony of Plaintiff's Purported Expert Witness, Todd P. Leavitt filed by defendants Holly Jacobs, Sony Pictures Television. Motion set for hearing on 6/10/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emil Petrossian, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 [Proposed] Order)(Petrossian, Emil)
May 13, 2013 Filing 69 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by defendants Holly Jacobs, Sony Pictures Television. Motion set for hearing on 6/10/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Amended Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, #2 Supplemental Compendium of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit U, #4 Exhibit V, #5 Exhibit W, #6 Exhibit X, #7 Exhibit Y, #8 Supplemental Declaration of Sara Gilbert, #9 Supplemental Declaration of Adam Pines, #10 [Proposed] Order, #11 Amended [Proposed] Judgment)(Petrossian, Emil)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #65 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney August J. Matteis, Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Angela L. Wilder, designating Neville L. Johnson as local counsel. (lt)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #64 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Pamira Shah Matteis on behalf of Plaintiff Angela L. Wilder, designating Neville L. Johnson as local counsel. (lt)
May 2, 2013 Filing 66 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Shari Mulrooney Wollman counsel for Defendants Holly Jacobs, Sony Pictures Television. Adding Shari Mulrooney Wollman as attorney as counsel of record for Defendants Sony Pictures Television Inc. and Holly Jacobs for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants Sony Pictures Television Inc. and Holly Jacobs (Wollman, Shari)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi: IT IS ORDERED as follows: The parties and their lead trial counsel shall appear for a settlement conference on May 17, 2013 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 827-A of the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, 8th Floor, Los Angeles, California 90012. The parties and their lead trial counsel shall keep their schedule clear for the remaining part of the day. (See Order for important details) (bem)
April 30, 2013 Filing 65 APPLICATION for attorney August J. Matteis, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by Plaintiff Angela L Wilder. Lodged Application of Non Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case. (lt)
April 30, 2013 Filing 64 APPLICATION for attorney Pamira Shah Matteis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by Plaintiff Angela L Wilder. Lodged Application of Non Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case. (lt)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #61 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Susan M. Sajadi on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Neville L. Johnson as local counsel. (lt)
April 10, 2013 Filing 61 APPLICATION for attorney Susan M. Sajadi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by Plaintiff Angela L Wilder. Lodged Application of Non Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case. (lt)
April 3, 2013 Filing 60 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. On the Court's own motion, defendants' MOTION for Attorney Fees #47 is continued from April 15, 2013 to June 10, 2013 at 1:30 P.M. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 1, 2013 Filing 59 REPLY in support of motion MOTION for Attorney Fees #47 filed by Defendants CBS Corporation, CBS Television Studios, Tom Forman, Relativity Media LLC, RelativityREAL LLC. (Roth, Michael)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky denying the Stipulation for Protective Order #56 . (See document for details). (ib)
March 25, 2013 Filing 57 OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Attorney Fees #47 filed by Plaintiff Angela L Wilder. (Toren, Peter)
March 25, 2013 Filing 56 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by defendants Holly Jacobs, Sony Pictures Television. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order)(Petrossian, Emil)
March 22, 2013 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John D Fowler, III on behalf of Plaintiff Angela L Wilder (Fowler, John)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER ORDER Re EX PARTE APPLICATION and MOTION FORSUMMARY JUDGMENT #51 #52 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Plaintiff shall have until May 20, 2013 to file their opposition to Defendants motion for summary judgment. Defendants reply will be due May 28, 2013. Hearing on this matter is set for June 10, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. (pj)
March 20, 2013 Filing 53 OPPOSITION re: EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Summary Judgment #52 filed by Defendants Holly Jacobs, Sony Pictures Television. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Pines, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Petrossian, Emil)
March 19, 2013 Filing 52 EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Angela L Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter J. Toren, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Toren, Peter)
March 18, 2013 Filing 51 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment filed by defendants Holly Jacobs, Sony Pictures Television. Motion set for hearing on 4/15/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, #2 Declaration of Sara Gilbert, #3 Declaration of Todd Christopher, #4 Declaration of Tom Forman, #5 Declaration of Nina Tassler, #6 Declaration of Barbara Bloom, #7 Declaration of Holly Jacobs, #8 Declaration of Steve Mosko, #9 Declaration of Adam Pines, #10 Compendium of Exhibits, #11 Exhibits A to M, #12 Exhibits N to Q, #13 Exhibits R to T, #14 Notice of Request and Request for Judicial Notice, #15 [Proposed] Order, #16 [Proposed] Judgment)(Petrossian, Emil)
March 18, 2013 Filing 50 NOTICE OF MOTION re MOTION for Attorney Fees #47 AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION WITH NEW HEARING DATE filed by Defendants CBS Corporation, CBS Television Studios, Tom Forman, Relativity Media LLC, RelativityREAL LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/15/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Roth, Michael)
March 18, 2013 Filing 49 STATEMENT Joint Rule 26(f) Statement (Toren, Peter)
March 18, 2013 Filing 48 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Holly Jacobs, Sony Pictures Television of Exhibit T to Compendium of Evidence in Support of Sony Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lodging of Exhibit T to Compendium of Evidence in Support of Sony Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment)(Petrossian, Emil)
March 15, 2013 Filing 47 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Defendants CBS Corporation, CBS Television Studios, Tom Forman, Relativity Media LLC, RelativityREAL LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/22/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher G. Caldwell, #2 Exhibit A to Caldwell Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Caldwell Declaration, #4 Declaration of Michael D. Roth, #5 Exhibit 1 to Roth Declaration, #6 Proposed Order)(Roth, Michael)
March 11, 2013 Filing 46 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Neesa Sethi counsel for Plaintiff Angela L Wilder.Neesa Sethi is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Angela L. Wilder (Sethi, Neesa)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File #42 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The CBS Defendants, Forman and the Relativity Defendants shall have up to and including March 15, 2013 to move for their attorneys' fees and costs as the prevailing parties under Cal. Code Civ. Proc. 425.16(c)(1). (lom)
February 27, 2013 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Holly Jacobs, Sony Pictures Television.(Petrossian, Emil)
February 27, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Seth Reagan counsel for Defendants Holly Jacobs, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Sony Pictures Television. Adding Seth Reagan as attorney as counsel of record for Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Pictures Television Inc. and Holly Jacobs for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Pictures Television Inc. and Holly Jacobs (Reagan, Seth)
February 26, 2013 Filing 42 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Defendants CBS Corporation, CBS Television Studios, Tom Forman, Relativity Media LLC, RelativityREAL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Approving Joint Stipulation to Set Deadline for Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Section 425.16(c)(1))(Roth, Michael)
February 22, 2013 Filing 41 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): R Re REQUEST to Strike Reply #29 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Based on the representations of the CBS Defendants counsel, the request to strike the reply brief is DENIED. (pj)
February 22, 2013 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Motion to Dismiss Case, #21 , Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,,,, #39 , Motion to Strike,, #22 , Motion to Dismiss Case, #20 , as to Defendants CBS Corporation, CBS Television Studios, Tom Forman, Relativity Media LLC, RelativityREAL LLC Court Reporter. Court will contact Margie Odanaka at odanaka@caldwell-leslie.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: February 11, 2013. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Roth, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 38 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Angela L Wilder Court Reporter. Court will contact Neesa Sethi at nsethi@wmclaw.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: February 11, 2013. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Sethi, Neesa)
February 14, 2013 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Holly Jacobs, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Sony Pictures Television Court Reporter. Court will contact Erica Embray at eembray@manatt.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: February 11, 2013. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Petrossian, Emil)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER Re MOTIONS TO DISMISS and MOTION TO STRIKE #20 #21 #22 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: For the reasons put forward in this Order, the Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's tortious inference with contract and prospective economic advantage, civil conspiracy, and breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing claims WITH PREJUDICE and DISMISSES Plaintiff's unfair competition claim to the extent it relies on Plaintiff's allegations of tortious interference and civil conspiracy. However, it DENIES Sony and Jacobs's motion to dismiss as to Plaintiff's breach of implied contract, breach of confidence, and unfair competition claim premised on the alleged breach of confidence. Finally, the Court GRANTS the CBS Defendants' anti-SLAPP motion. **See attached Order.** (es)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Pretrial Conference: 06/10/13 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial: 06/18/13 at 9:00 a.m. The above-mentioned cause of action is set for trial before the Honorable Stephen V. Wilson. Counsel preparing for trial before this Court shall comply with this Order. (See attached document for requirements.) (lom)
February 11, 2013 Filing 35 MINUTES OF #20 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Holly Jacobs, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Sony Pictures Television; #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants CBS Corporation, CBS Television Studios, Tom Forman, Relativity Media LLC, RelativityREAL LLC; #22 MOTION to Strike Complaint filed by Defendants CBS Corporation, CBS Television Studios, Tom Forman, Relativity Media LLC, RelativityREAL LLC; #29 Request to Strike Reply filed by Plaintiff Angela L. Wilder held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Court advises counsel that a minute order has been prepared regarding the pending motions. Court sets the following dates in this matter: Pretrial Conference set for June 10, 2013 at 3:00 pm. ; Jury Trial set for June 18, 2013 at 9:00 am. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (lom)
February 7, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Emil Petrossian counsel for Defendants Holly Jacobs, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Sony Pictures Television. Adding Emil Petrossian as attorney as counsel of record for Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Pictures Television Inc., and Holly Jacobs for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Pictures Television Inc., and Holly Jacobs (Petrossian, Emil)
February 4, 2013 Filing 33 Response to Plaintiff's Request to Strike Oversized Reply Briefs re MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) #21 , MOTION to Strike Complaint #22 , Request to Strike, Request for Relief, #29 filed by Defendants CBS Corporation, CBS Television Studios, Tom Forman, Relativity Media LLC, RelativityREAL LLC. (Roth, Michael)
February 4, 2013 Filing 32 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) #31 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sethi, Neesa)
February 4, 2013 Filing 31 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Request to Strike #29 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Plaintiff's counsel shall lodge a proposed order forthwith. (kti)
February 4, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request to Strike, Request for Relief #29 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (kti)
February 1, 2013 Filing 29 REQUEST to Strike Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) #27 , Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) #28 filed by Plaintiff Angela L Wilder. (Sethi, Neesa)
January 28, 2013 Filing 28 REPLY in support of MOTION to Strike Complaint #22 filed by Defendants CBS Corporation, CBS Television Studios, Tom Forman, Relativity Media LLC, RelativityREAL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sara Gilbert, #2 Declaration of Tom Forman, #3 Exhibit 1 - 4, #4 Objections to Declaration of Angela Wilder)(Roth, Michael)
January 28, 2013 Filing 27 REPLY in support of MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) #21 filed by Defendants CBS Corporation, CBS Television Studios, Tom Forman, Relativity Media LLC, RelativityREAL LLC. (Roth, Michael)
January 28, 2013 Filing 26 REPLY Memorandum in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities #20 filed by Defendants Holly Jacobs, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Sony Pictures Television. (Petrossian, Emil)
January 18, 2013 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Strike Complaint #22 filed by Plaintiff Angela L Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (part 1), #2 Exhibit 1 (part 2), #3 Exhibit 1 (part 3), #4 Exhibit 1 (part 4), #5 Exhibit 2)(Sethi, Neesa)
January 18, 2013 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities #20 filed by Plaintiff Angela L Wilder. (Sethi, Neesa)
January 18, 2013 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) #21 filed by Plaintiff Angela L Wilder. (Sethi, Neesa)
December 14, 2012 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint filed by Defendants CBS Corporation, CBS Television Studios, Tom Forman, Relativity Media LLC, RelativityREAL LLC. Motion set for hearing on 2/11/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Barbara Bloom, #2 Declaration of Todd Christopher, #3 Declaration of Tom Forman, #4 Declaration of Sara Gilbert, #5 Declaration of Holly Jacobs, #6 Declaration of Nina Tassler, #7 Exhibit A - F, #8 Proposed Order)(Roth, Michael)
December 14, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants CBS Corporation, CBS Television Studios, Tom Forman, Relativity Media LLC, RelativityREAL LLC. Motion set for hearing on 2/11/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roth, Michael)
December 14, 2012 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendants Holly Jacobs, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Sony Pictures Television. Motion set for hearing on 2/11/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pines, Adam)
November 19, 2012 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Angela L Wilder, upon Defendant Tom Forman served on 10/29/2012, answer due 12/14/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe (refused name) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Toren, Peter)
November 19, 2012 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Angela L Wilder, upon Defendant Holly Jacobs served on 10/31/2012, answer due 12/14/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ihor Yaskiw, Legal Department in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Toren, Peter)
November 19, 2012 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Angela L Wilder, upon Defendant CBS Corporation served on 10/24/2012, answer due 12/14/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kevin Vohnoutka, Authorized Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Toren, Peter)
November 19, 2012 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Angela L Wilder, upon Defendant RelativityREAL LLC served on 11/6/2012, answer due 12/14/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sharon Cooke, Authorized Ageny for Para Corp. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Toren, Peter)
November 19, 2012 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Angela L Wilder, upon Defendant Relativity Media LLC served on 11/6/2012, answer due 12/14/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sharon Cooke, Authorized Agent for Para Corp. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Toren, Peter)
November 19, 2012 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Angela L Wilder, upon Defendant CBS Television Studios served on 11/6/2012, answer due 12/14/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Authorized Agent for Register Agent CSC in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Toren, Peter)
November 19, 2012 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Angela L Wilder, upon Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment served on 10/25/2012, answer due 12/14/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ihor Yaskiw, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Toren, Peter)
November 19, 2012 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Angela L Wilder, upon Defendant Sony Pictures Television served on 10/25/2012, answer due 12/14/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ihor Yaskiw, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Toren, Peter)
November 19, 2012 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Angela L Wilder, Tom Forman served on 10/29/2012. (Toren, Peter)
November 19, 2012 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Angela L Wilder, Holly Jacobs served on 10/31/2012. (Toren, Peter)
November 19, 2012 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Angela L Wilder, CBS Corporation served on 10/24/2012. (Toren, Peter)
November 15, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants CBS Corporation, CBS Television Studios, Tom Forman, Relativity Media LLC, RelativityREAL LLC, identifying CBS Corporation, CBS Studios Inc., CBS Operations Inc., CBS Television Service Inc., Relativity REAL, LLC, Relativity Media, LLC, Tom Forman, Brandt Point Productions, LLC. (Roth, Michael)
November 15, 2012 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Relativity Media LLC answer now due 12/14/2012; RelativityREAL LLC answer now due 12/14/2012; CBS Corporation answer now due 12/14/2012; Tom Forman answer now due 12/14/2012; CBS Television Studios answer now due 12/14/2012, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) #1 filed by Defendants Relativity Media LLC; RelativityREAL LLC; CBS Corporation; Tom Forman; CBS Television Studios.(Roth, Michael)
November 8, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Holly Jacobs, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Sony Pictures Television, identifying Angela L. Wilder, Sony Pictures Television Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Holly Jacobs. (Pines, Adam)
November 8, 2012 Filing 5 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sony Pictures Television answer now due 12/14/2012; Holly Jacobs answer now due 12/14/2012; Sony Pictures Entertainment answer now due 12/14/2012, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) #1 filed by Defendants Sony Pictures Television; Holly Jacobs; Sony Pictures Entertainment.(Pines, Adam)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NEW CASE ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (See Order for details.) (kti)
October 17, 2012 Filing 3 Notice of Electronic Filing re Summons Issued, Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) #1 e-mailed to PToren@kasowitz.com bounced due to Delivery to the following recipients failed.. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to ptoren@wmclaw.com with a request that he update his CM profile. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 17, 2012 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Angela L Wilder. (et) (ds).
October 17, 2012 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendants CBS Corporation, CBS Television Studios, Tom Forman, Holly Jacobs, Relativity Media LLC, RelativityREAL LLC, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Sony Pictures Television. (et)
October 17, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants CBS Corporation, CBS Television Studios, Tom Forman, Holly Jacobs, Relativity Media LLC, RelativityREAL LLC, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Sony Pictures Television. Case assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky.(Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Angela L Wilder.(et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2012: #1 Complaint, Part 2, #2 Complaint, Part 3, #3 Notice of Assignment, Summons & Civil Cover Sheet) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angela L Wilder v. CBS Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Television Studios
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Hong
Represented By: Michael Dietz Roth
Represented By: Christopher G Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RelativityREAL LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Hong
Represented By: Michael Dietz Roth
Represented By: Christopher G Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Pictures Television
Represented By: Emil Petrossian
Represented By: Adam Pines
Represented By: Shari Mulrooney Wollman
Represented By: Seth Reagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Forman
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Hong
Represented By: Michael Dietz Roth
Represented By: Christopher G Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Jacobs
Represented By: Emil Petrossian
Represented By: Adam Pines
Represented By: Shari Mulrooney Wollman
Represented By: Seth Reagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Hong
Represented By: Michael Dietz Roth
Represented By: Christopher G Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Relativity Media LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Hong
Represented By: Michael Dietz Roth
Represented By: Christopher G Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Pictures Entertainment
Represented By: Emil Petrossian
Represented By: Adam Pines
Represented By: Seth Reagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela L Wilder
Represented By: Pamira Matteis
Represented By: John D Fowler
Represented By: Susan M Sajadi
Represented By: Neesa Sethi
Represented By: August J Matteis, Jr
Represented By: Neville Lawrence Johnson
Represented By: Peter J Toren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?