March 16, 2016 |
Filing
142
FINAL JUDGMENT 11 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: Plaintiff is the prevailing party in this matter with respect to the recovery of allowed costs as set forth in Rule 54 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedu re. Defendant County of Los Angeles is dismissed from this action with prejudice. Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Eduardo Cervantes as against Defendants Paulo Cruz and Vincent Cisneros; and Plaintiff Eduardo Cervantes shall recover from Defendants Paulo Cruz and Vincent Cisneros $500,000.00 in compensatory damages and $264,304.62 in attorneys' fees and unreimbursed expenses. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
|
February 24, 2016 |
Filing
140
ORDER RE: ATTORNEYS' FEES by Judge Dean D. Pregerson Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs 115 is GRANTED, in part., Mr. Conlogue reasonably expended 369.6 hours at $275 per hour, plus 8.9 paralegal work hours at $125 p er hour, plus $116.70 in out-of-pocket costs, for a total of $102,869.20. Mr. Avina reasonably expended 204.7 hours at$400 per hour, plus 5.5 paralegal hours at $125 per hour, plus $753 in out-of-pocket expenses, for a total of of $83,320. Mr. Beck reasonably expended 103.4 hours at $700 per hour, plus $5,735.42 in out-of-pocket costs, for a total of $78,115.42.2 The court awards a grand total of $264,304.62 in attorneys fees and unreimbursed expenses. (jp)
|
September 3, 2015 |
Filing
134
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR REMITTITUR by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The award of damages is remitted from $900,000 to $500,000. Plaintiff shall have fourteen days from the date of this Order to accept or reject the remittitur. Should Plaintiff accept, a final judgment shall issue. Should Plaintiff reject the remittitur, the court shall grant Defendants Motion for a New Trial in the Alternative. (lc). Modified on 9/3/2015 (lc).
|
December 11, 2014 |
Filing
113
JUDGMENT ON THE VERDICT FOR PLAINTIFFS by Clerk of Court: This action having been tried before the Court sitting with a jury, the Honorable Dean D.Pregerson, District Judge, presiding; the issues having been duly tried and the jury having duly rendered its verdict. A Final Judgment shall be issued hereafter. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lc)
|
December 4, 2014 |
Filing
91
ORDER RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: DEFENDANTS' Motions in Limine numbers 1, 4, and 5 58 , 61 , 62 are GRANTED. Defendants' Motion in Limine number 2 59 is GRANTED. Plaintiff may, however, question Defendant Cruz re garding his current employment. Defendants' Motion in Limine number 3 60 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is granted with respect to Orelia Cervantes' testimony. The motion is denied with respect to Plaintiff's medi cal bills. PLAINTIFF filed four separate Motions in Limine under one docket entry 56 . Of those, motions one through three are GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion in Limine number four is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff may utilize portions of videos that depict Plaintiff's injuries. (lc). Modified on 12/4/2014. (lc).
|
May 12, 2014 |
Filing
26
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Order for further details) re Stipulation for Protective Order 25 (vm)
|