Craig White et al v. Quicksilver Air Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Craig White and Bethany White |
Defendant: |
Timken Alcor Aerospace Technologies, Inc., The Timken Company, 11 Aerospace LLC, Quicksilver Air Inc., John and Jane Does I-X, Doe Corporations XI-XX, Arrow Aviation, LLC, Richard C. Swisher and H.E.R.O.S. |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv00462 |
Filed: |
January 23, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Gary A. Feess |
Presiding Judge: |
Carla Woehrle |
Nature of Suit: |
Tort Product Liability |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 27, 2013 |
Filing
70
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: UNSERVED DEFENDANTS The Court has reviewed the status reports submitted by counsel and signed the proposed orders. It appears, based on that review, that there are some defendants in these cases who have not yet been served. To the extent that there are any unserved defendants in this case, Plaintiffs are ordered either to dismiss those parties from the lawsuit or toshow cause why dismissal would not be appropriate at this time. Plaintiffs must respond to this OSC no later than close of business on April 5, 2013. Failure to respond will be deemed consent to the dismissal of any unserved party. (rfi)
|
January 22, 2013 |
Filing
42
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDNAT ARROW AVIATION, LLC re ( 37 in 3:12-cv-00367-BLW) Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Arrow Aviation, LLC, ( 40 in 3:12-cv-00366-BLW) Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Arrow Aviation, LLC, ( 66 i n 3:12-cv-00006-BLW) Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. all related pending motions and matters, and the actions brought by Plaintiffs are hereby dismissed without prejudice against Defendant Arrow Aviation, LLC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that this Order shall be deemed entered on the same date and time the Stipulation of Dismissal was filed on 1/18/2013, and the Clerk shall transmit this Order along with the rest of the filed to the Central District of California pursuant to the Court's decision. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00006-BLW, 3:12-cv-00366-BLW, 3:12-cv-00367-BLW (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)[Transferred from Idaho on 1/24/2013.]
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?