Robert Potter et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA et al
Plaintiff: Robert De Vico, Joseph Gordon, Melba Hopwood, Diane Truong, Betty Maxwell, Jack Flemington, Jerry Hildreth, Anthony Bland, Carol Weisskopf, Robert Miller, Edith Campbell, Dennis O Dorisio, Gene Shropshire, Lucy Bauer, Irma Castillo, John Jacinto Villas, Jerome Grant, Wendy Iriberri, Mathew Abraham, Cynthia Genrich Wolfe, Tom Ford, Pram-Held Mongthu, Efren Duarte, Valera Smith, Martha Ramirez, Romelia Magnetti, Douglas Randall, Arthur Fichtenberg, Orlando Kinard, Connie Cameron, Maria Zulema Herrera, Steven Scott Newton, Rosita Panes, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Jacqueline Baird, Mary Mobley, Marilyn Michalak, James Cox, Gumersindo Castaneda, Cynthia Woolem, Judea Ellorin, Hermina Adame, Patria Jalandoni, Otis McKinney, Bennett Meltzer, Tiffany Truong Tran, Fausto Mancilla, Rosario Perez, Rodolfo Reyes, Raul Morales, Hedy Magna, George Hassemer, Averill Stanley, Annette Wahl, Dennis F Beame, David Lee Dawson, Manuel Domingo, Judith Pico-Beltran, Deborah Borks, Janie Warschaw, Verden Fernandes, Arida Indhasiri, Marcia Willoughby, Dyvan Srey, Rosa Cabrera, Xiomara Milette, Joanne Gatrell, Vernnie Huggins, Chester Campbell, Monique Dority, Craig White, Lorenzo Jalandoni, Diana Rosales, Emily Kooyman, Serrano Brooks, Gloria Young, Fariba Maghoui, Simona Bakker, Teresita Bitanga, Pablo Maldonado, Alain Michael, Gila Sabet, Michael Everts, Magg Hernandez, Willie Collins, Geronimo Zarate, Julio Rendon, Donald Scott, Wilbur Steele, Vladimir Miskevich, Jesse Herrera, Carol Curtis, John Ferles, Placido Urioste, Rigoberto Canales, James Borks, Angela Mastromonico, Joy Haenny, Marcia Rodriguez, Emilio Perito, Joann Thomas, Judith Martino, Marilyn Jordan, Fernando Montelongo, Jose Ortiz, Javier Zuniga, Raul Perez, Litaun Lewis, Jose Castro, Phil Dupre, Elias Fuentes, Ramon Carrillo, Djuanique Slaughter, Larry Jordan, Leticia Velazquez, Thomas Perez, Paul Saunders, Kevin Badiei, Prescilla Weaver, Karie Wasinack, Zenaida Bersamira, Ana Verastica De Ojeda, Josephine Paragas, Mike Ferris, Carol Hildreth, Alice Collins, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Miguel Hernandez, Norma Guillo, Hattie Perry, Moses Mortazavi, Stephen Leen, Martha Estrada, Robert Clark, Rudy Standerfer, Laura McPheeters, Amelio Acosta, Johnny Tuan Tran, Rosalva Encizo, Cecilia Ezekiel, John Garcia, Kathleen Kowal, Fidel Covarrubias, Larry Nahlen, Nhu-Thuan Nguyen, Connie Soto, Lydia Ramos, Ken Kooyman, Mark Drury, Candy Ross, Isabel Dury, Carolyn Le, Jonathan Weisz, Cristina Reyes, Anita Glaszko, Lorena Martin, Richard Wahl, Antonio Ellorin, Jr, Randal Dorman, John Thomas, Maria Rivera, Abdullah Aslami, Kristie Greenleaf, Ana Rosa Castaneda, Marlene Bacon, John Petros, Kim Collier, Alex Bauer, Carol Nahlen, Pete Castillo, Chor Chun Ngan, Jim Fox, David Bennett, Walter Harris, Grace Caruth Johnson, Lenepe Villegas, Rochelle Herod, George Lewis, Ramiro Devila, Carlos Madrid Mora, Judy Lim, Tina Waters, Polly McKinney, Deborah Lamb, Guadalupe Garcia, Joan Potter, Francesca Bravos, Patricia Navarro, Mariam Javadzadeh, Frederick Heavner, Cecilia Davalos, Maria Cruz Cabrera Maldonado, Kasey Dority, Amadita De La Garza, Shaun Jennings, Guadalupe Fuentes, Cheryl Holland, Timothy Anusiem, Thomas Baird, Odette Nayrouz, Antonio Razo, Michael Man, Gloria Hassemer, Teri O Rourke, David Lucio, Yun Park, Kimberly Weisz, Rosana Desoto, Victoria Lyons, Francisco Ojeda, Maybelle Rivera, Jeff Wise, Madonna Gionta, Stirling Hale, Ada Cheung, Cathy Cox, Mike Kowal, Rigoberto Carbajal, Mitra Bagherian Aliabad, Pertch Toukhladjian, Agustin Perez, Robert Herod, Debra Lynn Klein, Sandra Fernandez, Armando Navarro, Gerald Szillinsky, Sydney C Beame, Theresa Moreno, Patricia Blue, Norma Guzman, Ramon Mejia, Nicole Jackson, Debra May, Helen Martin, Lolita Randall, Sinia Jennings, Judy Earle, Levi Llorico, Juan Planz, Melba Saunders, Felix Garcia, Juan Luna, Anita Chavez, Chantel Foti, Pamela Meier, Ingshou Lin, Michelle Martinez, Francesca Llorico, Ramiro Negrete, Harinder Chhokar, Tiffany Nhan, Jeremy Foti, James Scarborough, Veronica Garcia, Digna Dupre, Christopher Grieves, Jose De Jesus Padilla, Kristin Witzenburg, Dawn Light Amora, Marlene Zarate, Marziyeh Eghtesadi, Linda Brooks, Nhuthuan Nguyen, Mahmood Timbo, Maria M Segura, Juan Diaz Serrano, Marina Sakach, Jeanne Tatum, Kelly Moustris, Cristina Magana, Daniel Houston, Patricia Garcia, Jesus Juarez, Deborah Berman, Mari Weston, Timothy Sakach, Kevin Moustris, Hilda Fernandes, Tom Harry, Jesus Villegas, Hector Ramos, Isaias Garcia, Lidia Young, Richard Tatum, Robert Perry, Magda Chavez, Vatche Kasumyan, Sandra Velazquez, Barry Ross, Eliazar Toledo, Ngoc-Anh Pram, Matthew Smith, George Pappas, Robert Rositano, Melanie O Dorisio, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Mark Magna, Madeline Brigante, Ernie De La Garza, Mitchell Coleman, Linda Brice, Nicole Peterson, Isabel Mejia, Klara Kasumyan, Kent Fitch, Sally Miller, Michelle Hale, Kimberly Smith, Robert Messner, Gloria Martinez, Janine Tavoularis, Keith Beltran, Jonathan Weston, Eduardo Salazar, Martin Chavez, Elayne Diaz Serrano, Oscar Salas, Jose Encizo, Kathy Fitch, Curtis Blue, Cesar Salas, Susan Gonzales, Anthony Armand, Eileen Kolkey, Antonio Bersamira, Mary Enehtownsell, Carlos Castro, Lorenzo Cabrera, Maricela Cruz, Patricia Meier, Freddie Wing Fai, Steven Chau, Ruth Garcia, Sang Park, Irma Bennett, Michael Mobley, Connie Nhan, Joseph Earle, Garnetta Vestle, Raymundo Gonzales, Randeleigh Harris, Maria Teresa Silva, David Castaneda, Tasso Bravos, Enriqueta Flores, Daniel Obeso, Fabian Bitanga, Virgil Atkins, Danh Hong, Jeffrey Warschaw, Sippin Pappas, Miguel Adame, Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Elizabeth Abraham, Angel Lomeli, Jerry Ung, Leonard Harlin, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Noel Ezekiel, Maria De La Cruz, Blanca Bernal Longoria, Gerardo Rivera, Rosa E Garaicoa, Miguel Velazquez, Maria Zepeda, Romeo Bangalan, Roberta Doucet, Theodore William Voigtlander, Andreite Harlin, Gene Michalak, Sharron Covington, Kevin Murray, Juanita Lusung, Mary Gordon, Roger Milette, Tony Keusseyan, Esperanza Garcia, Janet Leen, Jose Rodriguez, Consuelo Morales, Eva Thielk, Edith Smith, Shayna Stone, Arnulfa Quinones, Maria Imelda Villas, Michelle Scott, Behzad Javadzadeh, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Esther Magna, Brett Mattus, Cheryl Soto, Isaiah Lyons, Cari Krumme, Marietta Bland, April Perez, Barry Stanley, Sherell Lewis, Jeanie Zou, Emanuel Sabet, Eleno Pienado-Garcia, Bernadette Atienza, Ferdinand Paragas, Victor Alvarado, Christian Silver, Clifford Risch, Nina Nguyen, Lila Clark, Robert Potter, Eileen Keusseyan, Ali Roueenfar, Richard Comer, Aswin Reddy, Jerry Rogge, Caitlin McLean, Arturo Reyes, John Waddle, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Nahid Pebdani, Carlos Rivera, Nathalie Sebagh, Tony McPheeters, Quan Tran, Melodie Waddle, Humberto Arruda and Jay Pebdani
Defendant: EMC Mortgage Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Chase Home Finance LLC, Eappraiseit LLC, California Reconveyance Company, Mauro Perez Fernandez, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, Long Beach Mortgage Company, First American Corporation, Does 1 through 1000 inclusive and Bear Stearns Companies LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv00863
Filed: February 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2013 Filing 71 Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. BC459627, acknowledged on 5/10/2013. (gk)
May 8, 2013 Filing 70 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation ("the FDIC"), acting as the receiver for Washington Mutual Bank, F.A.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction #29 is GRANTED. Additionally, because the FDIC's presence of this case was the sole basis upon which the Court exercised jurisdiction over this case, the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the remainder of the case, and hereby REMANDS this case to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case No. BC459627. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) Court Reporter: Not Present. (Attachments: #1 CV-103 Remand Transmittal Letter) (gk)
May 2, 2013 Filing 68 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant FDIC Receiver's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint filed 4/8/2013 #57 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 11-6 Memorandum brief exceeds 25 pages. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
May 2, 2013 Filing 67 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Allowing Plaintiff to Exceed the Page Limit for Their Opposition to Defendant FDIC-Receiver's Motion to Dismiss filed 4/5/2013 #50 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
May 2, 2013 Filing 66 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Eappraiseit LLC, First American Corporation Court Reporter. Court will contact Christopher D. Beatty at cbeatty@irell.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: 4/29/13 Motions, by Laura Elias. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Beatty, Christopher)
May 1, 2013 Filing 65 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Magda Chavez pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to All Defendants. (Torchia, Vito)
May 1, 2013 Filing 64 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Fidel Covarrubias pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to All Defendants. (Torchia, Vito)
April 29, 2013 Filing 69 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Tentative order provided. The Court confers with counsel and counsel argue. The Court takes Motion of FDIC-Receiver to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint #29 , Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., for itself and as successor by merger to Chase Home Finance LLC, EMC Mortgage LLC, and the Bear Stearns Companies, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint #31 , Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint #32 and Defendants' Joinder in Sections of the FDIC's and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint #36 under submission. The Court vacates the Scheduling Conference, to be rescheduled by the Court. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 63 JOINDER in MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Fourth Amended Complaint #29 , MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint #31 filed by Defendants Eappraiseit LLC, First American Corporation. (Beatty, Christopher)
April 22, 2013 Filing 62 REPLY In Support of Request for Judicial Notice In Support of MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint #31 filed by Defendants Bear Stearns Companies LLC, EMC Mortgage Corporation, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Luther, Douglas)
April 22, 2013 Filing 61 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint #31 filed by Defendants Bear Stearns Companies LLC, EMC Mortgage Corporation, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Luther, Douglas)
April 22, 2013 Filing 60 REPLY in Support MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Fourth Amended Complaint #29 filed by Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Schoppe)(Sobiecki, Richard)
April 22, 2013 Filing 59 REPLY In Support Of MOTION to Dismiss Case The Fourth Amended Complaint #32 filed by Defendants Eappraiseit LLC, First American Corporation. (Beatty, Christopher)
April 8, 2013 Filing 58 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE - PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FDIC RECEIVERS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Abraham, Mathew Abraham, Amelio Acosta, Hermina Adame, Miguel Adame, Mitra Bagherian Aliabad, Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Dawn Light Amora, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Humberto Arruda, Abdullah Aslami, Bernadette Atienza, Virgil Atkins, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Romeo Bangalan, Alex Bauer, Lucy Bauer, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, Keith Beltran, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Deborah Berman, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Deborah Borks, James Borks, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Linda Brooks, Serrano Brooks, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Lorenzo Cabrera, Rosa Cabrera, Maria Cruz Cabrera Maldonado, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Rigoberto Canales, Rigoberto Carbajal, Ramon Carrillo, Ana Rosa Castaneda, David Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Carlos Castro, Jose Castro, Steven Chau, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Ada Cheung, Harinder Chhokar, Lila Clark, Robert Clark, Mitchell Coleman, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Sharron Covington, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Maricela Cruz, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Jose De Jesus Padilla, Maria De La Cruz, Amadita De La Garza, Ernie De La Garza, Ana Verastica De Ojeda, Robert De Vico, Rosana Desoto, Ramiro Devila, Manuel Domingo, Kasey Dority, Monique Dority, Randal Dorman, Roberta Doucet, Mark Drury, Efren Duarte, Digna Dupre, Phil Dupre, Isabel Dury, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Marziyeh Eghtesadi, Antonio Ellorin, Jr, Judea Ellorin, Jose Encizo, Rosalva Encizo, Mary Enehtownsell, Martha Estrada, Michael Everts, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, Freddie Wing Fai, John Ferles, Hilda Fernandes, Verden Fernandes, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Mike Ferris, Arthur Fichtenberg, Kathy Fitch, Kent Fitch, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Tom Ford, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Rosa E Garaicoa, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Isaias Garcia, John Garcia, Patricia Garcia, Ruth Garcia, Veronica Garcia, Joanne Gatrell, Madonna Gionta, Anita Glaszko, Raymundo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Norma Guillo, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Norma Guzman, Joy Haenny, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Andreite Harlin, Leonard Harlin, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Tom Harry, George Hassemer, Gloria Hassemer, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Miguel Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Maria Zulema Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Cheryl Holland, Danh Hong(an individual), Melba Hopwood, Daniel Houston, Vernnie Huggins, Arida Indhasiri, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Nicole Jackson, Lorenzo Jalandoni, Patria Jalandoni, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Shaun Jennings, Sinia Jennings, Grace Caruth Johnson, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Klara Kasumyan, Vatche Kasumyan, Eileen Keusseyan, Tony Keusseyan, Orlando Kinard, Debra Lynn Klein, Eileen Kolkey, Emily Kooyman, Ken Kooyman, Kathleen Kowal, Mike Kowal, Cari Krumme, Deborah Lamb, Carolyn Le, Janet Leen, Stephen Leen, George Lewis, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Ingshou Lin, Francesca Llorico, Levi Llorico, Angel Lomeli, Blanca Bernal Longoria, David Lucio, Juan Luna, Juanita Lusung, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Fariba Maghoui, Esther Magna, Hedy Magna, Mark Magna, Romelia Magnetti, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Helen Martin, Lorena Martin, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Brett Mattus, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Pamela Meier, Patricia Meier, Isabel Mejia, Ramon Mejia, Bennett Meltzer, Robert Messner, Alain Michael, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Roger Milette, Xiomara Milette, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Mary Mobley, Michael Mobley, Pram-Held Mongthu, Fernando Montelongo, Carlos Madrid Mora, Consuelo Morales, Raul Morales, Theresa Moreno, Moses Mortazavi, Kelly Moustris, Kevin Moustris, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Armando Navarro, Patricia Navarro, Odette Nayrouz, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Chor Chun Ngan, Nhu-Thuan Nguyen, Nhuthuan Nguyen, Nina Nguyen, Connie Nhan, Tiffany Nhan, Dennis O Dorisio, Melanie O Dorisio, Teri O Rourke, Daniel Obeso, Francisco Ojeda, Jose Ortiz, Rosita Panes, George Pappas, Sippin Pappas, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Sang Park, Yun Park, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Agustin Perez, April Perez, Raul Perez, Rosario Perez, Thomas Perez, Emilio Perito, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Judith Pico-Beltran, Eleno Pienado-Garcia, Juan Planz, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Ngoc-Anh Pram, Arnulfa Quinones, Martha Ramirez, Hector Ramos, Lydia Ramos, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Antonio Razo, Aswin Reddy, Julio Rendon, Arturo Reyes, Cristina Reyes, Rodolfo Reyes, Clifford Risch, Carlos Rivera, Gerardo Rivera, Maria Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jose Rodriguez, Marcia Rodriguez, Jerry Rogge, Diana Rosales, Robert Rositano, Barry Ross, Candy Ross, Ali Roueenfar, Emanuel Sabet, Gila Sabet, Marina Sakach, Timothy Sakach, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Eduardo Salazar, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, James Scarborough, Donald Scott, Michelle Scott, Nathalie Sebagh, Maria M Segura, Elayne Diaz Serrano, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Gene Shropshire, Maria Teresa Silva, Christian Silver, Djuanique Slaughter, Edith Smith, Kimberly Smith, Matthew Smith, Valera Smith, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Wilbur Steele, Shayna Stone, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Eva Thielk, Joann Thomas, John Thomas, Mahmood Timbo, Eliazar Toledo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Jerry Ung, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Garnetta Vestle, John Jacinto Villas, Maria Imelda Villas, Jesus Villegas, Lenepe Villegas, Theodore William Voigtlander, John Waddle, Melodie Waddle, Annette Wahl, Richard Wahl, Janie Warschaw, Jeffrey Warschaw, Karie Wasinack, Tina Waters, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weisz, Kimberly Weisz, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Marcia Willoughby, Jeff Wise, Kristin Witzenburg, Cynthia Genrich Wolfe, Cynthia Woolem, Gloria Young, Lidia Young, Geronimo Zarate, Marlene Zarate, Maria Zepeda, Jeanie Zou, Javier Zuniga. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Torchia, Vito)
April 8, 2013 Filing 57 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Fourth Amended Complaint #29 - PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FDIC RECEIVERS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Abraham, Mathew Abraham, Amelio Acosta, Hermina Adame, Miguel Adame, Mitra Bagherian Aliabad, Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Dawn Light Amora, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Humberto Arruda, Abdullah Aslami, Bernadette Atienza, Virgil Atkins, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Romeo Bangalan, Alex Bauer, Lucy Bauer, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, Keith Beltran, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Deborah Berman, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Deborah Borks, James Borks, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Linda Brooks, Serrano Brooks, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Lorenzo Cabrera, Rosa Cabrera, Maria Cruz Cabrera Maldonado, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Rigoberto Canales, Rigoberto Carbajal, Ramon Carrillo, Ana Rosa Castaneda, David Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Carlos Castro, Jose Castro, Steven Chau, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Ada Cheung, Harinder Chhokar, Lila Clark, Robert Clark, Mitchell Coleman, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Sharron Covington, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Maricela Cruz, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Jose De Jesus Padilla, Maria De La Cruz, Amadita De La Garza, Ernie De La Garza, Ana Verastica De Ojeda, Robert De Vico, Rosana Desoto, Ramiro Devila, Manuel Domingo, Kasey Dority, Monique Dority, Randal Dorman, Roberta Doucet, Mark Drury, Efren Duarte, Digna Dupre, Phil Dupre, Isabel Dury, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Marziyeh Eghtesadi, Antonio Ellorin, Jr, Judea Ellorin, Jose Encizo, Rosalva Encizo, Mary Enehtownsell, Martha Estrada, Michael Everts, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, Freddie Wing Fai, John Ferles, Hilda Fernandes, Verden Fernandes, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Mike Ferris, Arthur Fichtenberg, Kathy Fitch, Kent Fitch, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Tom Ford, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Rosa E Garaicoa, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Isaias Garcia, John Garcia, Patricia Garcia, Ruth Garcia, Veronica Garcia, Joanne Gatrell, Madonna Gionta, Anita Glaszko, Raymundo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Norma Guillo, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Norma Guzman, Joy Haenny, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Andreite Harlin, Leonard Harlin, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Tom Harry, George Hassemer, Gloria Hassemer, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Miguel Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Maria Zulema Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Cheryl Holland, Danh Hong, Danh Hong, Melba Hopwood, Daniel Houston, Vernnie Huggins, Arida Indhasiri, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Nicole Jackson, Lorenzo Jalandoni, Patria Jalandoni, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Shaun Jennings, Sinia Jennings, Grace Caruth Johnson, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Klara Kasumyan, Vatche Kasumyan, Eileen Keusseyan, Tony Keusseyan, Orlando Kinard, Debra Lynn Klein, Eileen Kolkey, Emily Kooyman, Ken Kooyman, Kathleen Kowal, Mike Kowal, Cari Krumme, Deborah Lamb, Carolyn Le, Janet Leen, Stephen Leen, George Lewis, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Ingshou Lin, Francesca Llorico, Levi Llorico, Angel Lomeli, Blanca Bernal Longoria, David Lucio, Juan Luna, Juanita Lusung, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Fariba Maghoui, Esther Magna, Hedy Magna, Mark Magna, Romelia Magnetti, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Helen Martin, Lorena Martin, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Brett Mattus, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Pamela Meier, Patricia Meier, Isabel Mejia, Ramon Mejia, Bennett Meltzer, Robert Messner, Alain Michael, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Roger Milette, Xiomara Milette, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Mary Mobley, Michael Mobley, Pram-Held Mongthu, Fernando Montelongo, Carlos Madrid Mora, Consuelo Morales, Raul Morales, Theresa Moreno, Moses Mortazavi, Kelly Moustris, Kevin Moustris, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Armando Navarro, Patricia Navarro, Odette Nayrouz, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Chor Chun Ngan, Nhu-Thuan Nguyen, Nhuthuan Nguyen, Nina Nguyen, Connie Nhan, Tiffany Nhan, Dennis O Dorisio, Melanie O Dorisio, Teri O Rourke, Daniel Obeso, Francisco Ojeda, Jose Ortiz, Rosita Panes, George Pappas, Sippin Pappas, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Sang Park, Yun Park, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Agustin Perez, April Perez, Raul Perez, Rosario Perez, Thomas Perez, Emilio Perito, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Judith Pico-Beltran, Eleno Pienado-Garcia, Juan Planz, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Ngoc-Anh Pram, Arnulfa Quinones, Martha Ramirez, Hector Ramos, Lydia Ramos, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Antonio Razo, Aswin Reddy, Julio Rendon, Arturo Reyes, Cristina Reyes, Rodolfo Reyes, Clifford Risch, Carlos Rivera, Gerardo Rivera, Maria Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jose Rodriguez, Marcia Rodriguez, Jerry Rogge, Diana Rosales, Robert Rositano, Barry Ross, Candy Ross, Ali Roueenfar, Emanuel Sabet, Gila Sabet, Marina Sakach, Timothy Sakach, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Eduardo Salazar, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, James Scarborough, Donald Scott, Michelle Scott, Nathalie Sebagh, Maria M Segura, Elayne Diaz Serrano, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Gene Shropshire, Maria Teresa Silva, Christian Silver, Djuanique Slaughter, Edith Smith, Kimberly Smith, Matthew Smith, Valera Smith, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Wilbur Steele, Shayna Stone, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Eva Thielk, Joann Thomas, John Thomas, Mahmood Timbo, Eliazar Toledo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Jerry Ung, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Garnetta Vestle, John Jacinto Villas, Maria Imelda Villas, Jesus Villegas, Lenepe Villegas, Theodore William Voigtlander, John Waddle, Melodie Waddle, Annette Wahl, Richard Wahl, Janie Warschaw, Jeffrey Warschaw, Karie Wasinack, Tina Waters, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weisz, Kimberly Weisz, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Marcia Willoughby, Jeff Wise, Kristin Witzenburg, Cynthia Genrich Wolfe, Cynthia Woolem, Gloria Young, Lidia Young, Geronimo Zarate, Marlene Zarate, Maria Zepeda, Jeanie Zou, Javier Zuniga. (Torchia, Vito)
April 8, 2013 Filing 56 OBJECTIONS in opposition to re: MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint #31 - PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS JPMORGAN CHASE, NA, CHASE HOME FINANCIAL LLC, EMC MORTGAGE LLC, AND THE BEAR STEARNS COMPANIES, LLCS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Abraham, Mathew Abraham, Amelio Acosta, Hermina Adame, Miguel Adame, Mitra Bagherian Aliabad, Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Dawn Light Amora, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Humberto Arruda, Abdullah Aslami, Bernadette Atienza, Virgil Atkins, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Romeo Bangalan, Alex Bauer, Lucy Bauer, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, Keith Beltran, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Deborah Berman, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Deborah Borks, James Borks, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Linda Brooks, Serrano Brooks, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Lorenzo Cabrera, Rosa Cabrera, Maria Cruz Cabrera Maldonado, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Rigoberto Canales, Rigoberto Carbajal, Ramon Carrillo, Ana Rosa Castaneda, David Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Carlos Castro, Jose Castro, Steven Chau, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Ada Cheung, Harinder Chhokar, Lila Clark, Robert Clark, Mitchell Coleman, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Sharron Covington, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Maricela Cruz, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Jose De Jesus Padilla, Maria De La Cruz, Amadita De La Garza, Ernie De La Garza, Ana Verastica De Ojeda, Robert De Vico, Rosana Desoto, Ramiro Devila, Manuel Domingo, Kasey Dority, Monique Dority, Randal Dorman, Roberta Doucet, Mark Drury, Efren Duarte, Digna Dupre, Phil Dupre, Isabel Dury, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Marziyeh Eghtesadi, Antonio Ellorin, Jr, Judea Ellorin, Jose Encizo, Rosalva Encizo, Mary Enehtownsell, Martha Estrada, Michael Everts, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, Freddie Wing Fai, John Ferles, Hilda Fernandes, Verden Fernandes, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Mike Ferris, Arthur Fichtenberg, Kathy Fitch, Kent Fitch, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Tom Ford, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Rosa E Garaicoa, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Isaias Garcia, John Garcia, Patricia Garcia, Ruth Garcia, Veronica Garcia, Joanne Gatrell, Madonna Gionta, Anita Glaszko, Raymundo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Norma Guillo, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Norma Guzman, Joy Haenny, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Andreite Harlin, Leonard Harlin, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Tom Harry, George Hassemer, Gloria Hassemer, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Miguel Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Maria Zulema Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Cheryl Holland, Danh Hong, Danh Hong, Melba Hopwood, Daniel Houston, Vernnie Huggins, Arida Indhasiri, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Nicole Jackson, Lorenzo Jalandoni, Patria Jalandoni, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Shaun Jennings, Sinia Jennings, Grace Caruth Johnson, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Klara Kasumyan, Vatche Kasumyan, Eileen Keusseyan, Tony Keusseyan, Orlando Kinard, Debra Lynn Klein, Eileen Kolkey, Emily Kooyman, Ken Kooyman, Kathleen Kowal, Mike Kowal, Cari Krumme, Deborah Lamb, Carolyn Le, Janet Leen, Stephen Leen, George Lewis, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Ingshou Lin, Francesca Llorico, Levi Llorico, Angel Lomeli, Blanca Bernal Longoria, David Lucio, Juan Luna, Juanita Lusung, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Fariba Maghoui, Esther Magna, Hedy Magna, Mark Magna, Romelia Magnetti, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Helen Martin, Lorena Martin, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Brett Mattus, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Pamela Meier, Patricia Meier, Isabel Mejia, Ramon Mejia, Bennett Meltzer, Robert Messner, Alain Michael, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Roger Milette, Xiomara Milette, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Mary Mobley, Michael Mobley, Pram-Held Mongthu, Fernando Montelongo, Carlos Madrid Mora, Consuelo Morales, Raul Morales, Theresa Moreno, Moses Mortazavi, Kelly Moustris, Kevin Moustris, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Armando Navarro, Patricia Navarro, Odette Nayrouz, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Chor Chun Ngan, Nhu-Thuan Nguyen, Nhuthuan Nguyen, Nina Nguyen, Connie Nhan, Tiffany Nhan, Dennis O Dorisio, Melanie O Dorisio, Teri O Rourke, Daniel Obeso, Francisco Ojeda, Jose Ortiz, Rosita Panes, George Pappas, Sippin Pappas, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Sang Park, Yun Park, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Agustin Perez, April Perez, Raul Perez, Rosario Perez, Thomas Perez, Emilio Perito, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Judith Pico-Beltran, Eleno Pienado-Garcia, Juan Planz, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Ngoc-Anh Pram, Arnulfa Quinones, Martha Ramirez, Hector Ramos, Lydia Ramos, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Antonio Razo, Aswin Reddy, Julio Rendon, Arturo Reyes, Cristina Reyes, Rodolfo Reyes, Clifford Risch, Carlos Rivera, Gerardo Rivera, Maria Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jose Rodriguez, Marcia Rodriguez, Jerry Rogge, Diana Rosales, Robert Rositano, Barry Ross, Candy Ross, Ali Roueenfar, Emanuel Sabet, Gila Sabet, Marina Sakach, Timothy Sakach, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Eduardo Salazar, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, James Scarborough, Donald Scott, Michelle Scott, Nathalie Sebagh, Maria M Segura, Elayne Diaz Serrano, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Gene Shropshire, Maria Teresa Silva, Christian Silver, Djuanique Slaughter, Edith Smith, Kimberly Smith, Matthew Smith, Valera Smith, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Wilbur Steele, Shayna Stone, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Eva Thielk, Joann Thomas, John Thomas, Mahmood Timbo, Eliazar Toledo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Jerry Ung, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Garnetta Vestle, John Jacinto Villas, Maria Imelda Villas, Jesus Villegas, Lenepe Villegas, Theodore William Voigtlander, John Waddle, Melodie Waddle, Annette Wahl, Richard Wahl, Janie Warschaw, Jeffrey Warschaw, Karie Wasinack, Tina Waters, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weisz, Kimberly Weisz, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Marcia Willoughby, Jeff Wise, Kristin Witzenburg, Cynthia Genrich Wolfe, Cynthia Woolem, Gloria Young, Lidia Young, Geronimo Zarate, Marlene Zarate, Maria Zepeda, Jeanie Zou, Javier Zuniga. (Torchia, Vito)
April 8, 2013 Filing 55 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., FOR ITSELF AND AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC, EMC MORTGAGE, AND THE BEAR STEARNS COMPANIES, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Abraham, Mathew Abraham, Amelio Acosta, Hermina Adame, Miguel Adame, Mitra Bagherian Aliabad, Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Dawn Light Amora, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Humberto Arruda, Abdullah Aslami, Bernadette Atienza, Virgil Atkins, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Romeo Bangalan, Alex Bauer, Lucy Bauer, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, Keith Beltran, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Deborah Berman, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Deborah Borks, James Borks, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Linda Brooks, Serrano Brooks, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Lorenzo Cabrera, Rosa Cabrera, Maria Cruz Cabrera Maldonado, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Rigoberto Canales, Rigoberto Carbajal, Ramon Carrillo, Ana Rosa Castaneda, David Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Carlos Castro, Jose Castro, Steven Chau, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Ada Cheung, Harinder Chhokar, Lila Clark, Robert Clark, Mitchell Coleman, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Sharron Covington, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Maricela Cruz, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Jose De Jesus Padilla, Maria De La Cruz, Amadita De La Garza, Ernie De La Garza, Ana Verastica De Ojeda, Robert De Vico, Rosana Desoto, Ramiro Devila, Manuel Domingo, Kasey Dority, Monique Dority, Randal Dorman, Roberta Doucet, Mark Drury, Efren Duarte, Digna Dupre, Phil Dupre, Isabel Dury, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Marziyeh Eghtesadi, Antonio Ellorin, Jr, Judea Ellorin, Jose Encizo, Rosalva Encizo, Mary Enehtownsell, Martha Estrada, Michael Everts, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, Freddie Wing Fai, John Ferles, Hilda Fernandes, Verden Fernandes, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Mike Ferris, Arthur Fichtenberg, Kathy Fitch, Kent Fitch, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Tom Ford, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Rosa E Garaicoa, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Isaias Garcia, John Garcia, Patricia Garcia, Ruth Garcia, Veronica Garcia, Joanne Gatrell, Madonna Gionta, Anita Glaszko, Raymundo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Norma Guillo, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Norma Guzman, Joy Haenny, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Andreite Harlin, Leonard Harlin, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Tom Harry, George Hassemer, Gloria Hassemer, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Miguel Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Maria Zulema Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Cheryl Holland, Danh Hong(an individual), Melba Hopwood, Daniel Houston, Vernnie Huggins, Arida Indhasiri, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Nicole Jackson, Lorenzo Jalandoni, Patria Jalandoni, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Shaun Jennings, Sinia Jennings, Grace Caruth Johnson, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Klara Kasumyan, Vatche Kasumyan, Eileen Keusseyan, Tony Keusseyan, Orlando Kinard, Debra Lynn Klein, Eileen Kolkey, Emily Kooyman, Ken Kooyman, Kathleen Kowal, Mike Kowal, Cari Krumme, Deborah Lamb, Carolyn Le, Janet Leen, Stephen Leen, George Lewis, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Ingshou Lin, Francesca Llorico, Levi Llorico, Angel Lomeli, Blanca Bernal Longoria, David Lucio, Juan Luna, Juanita Lusung, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Fariba Maghoui, Esther Magna, Hedy Magna, Mark Magna, Romelia Magnetti, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Helen Martin, Lorena Martin, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Brett Mattus, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Pamela Meier, Patricia Meier, Isabel Mejia, Ramon Mejia, Bennett Meltzer, Robert Messner, Alain Michael, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Roger Milette, Xiomara Milette, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Mary Mobley, Michael Mobley, Pram-Held Mongthu, Fernando Montelongo, Carlos Madrid Mora, Consuelo Morales, Raul Morales, Theresa Moreno, Moses Mortazavi, Kelly Moustris, Kevin Moustris, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Armando Navarro, Patricia Navarro, Odette Nayrouz, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Chor Chun Ngan, Nhu-Thuan Nguyen, Nhuthuan Nguyen, Nina Nguyen, Connie Nhan, Tiffany Nhan, Dennis O Dorisio, Melanie O Dorisio, Teri O Rourke, Daniel Obeso, Francisco Ojeda, Jose Ortiz, Rosita Panes, George Pappas, Sippin Pappas, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Sang Park, Yun Park, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Agustin Perez, April Perez, Raul Perez, Rosario Perez, Thomas Perez, Emilio Perito, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Judith Pico-Beltran, Eleno Pienado-Garcia, Juan Planz, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Ngoc-Anh Pram, Arnulfa Quinones, Martha Ramirez, Hector Ramos, Lydia Ramos, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Antonio Razo, Aswin Reddy, Julio Rendon, Arturo Reyes, Cristina Reyes, Rodolfo Reyes, Clifford Risch, Carlos Rivera, Gerardo Rivera, Maria Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jose Rodriguez, Marcia Rodriguez, Jerry Rogge, Diana Rosales, Robert Rositano, Barry Ross, Candy Ross, Ali Roueenfar, Emanuel Sabet, Gila Sabet, Marina Sakach, Timothy Sakach, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Eduardo Salazar, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, James Scarborough, Donald Scott, Michelle Scott, Nathalie Sebagh, Maria M Segura, Elayne Diaz Serrano, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Gene Shropshire, Maria Teresa Silva, Christian Silver, Djuanique Slaughter, Edith Smith, Kimberly Smith, Matthew Smith, Valera Smith, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Wilbur Steele, Shayna Stone, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Eva Thielk, Joann Thomas, John Thomas, Mahmood Timbo, Eliazar Toledo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Jerry Ung, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Garnetta Vestle, John Jacinto Villas, Maria Imelda Villas, Jesus Villegas, Lenepe Villegas, Theodore William Voigtlander, John Waddle, Melodie Waddle, Annette Wahl, Richard Wahl, Janie Warschaw, Jeffrey Warschaw, Karie Wasinack, Tina Waters, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weisz, Kimberly Weisz, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Marcia Willoughby, Jeff Wise, Kristin Witzenburg, Cynthia Genrich Wolfe, Cynthia Woolem, Gloria Young, Lidia Young, Geronimo Zarate, Marlene Zarate, Maria Zepeda, Jeanie Zou, Javier Zuniga. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Torchia, Vito)
April 8, 2013 Filing 54 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint #31 filed by Defendants JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., FOR ITSELF AND AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC, EMC MORTGAGE, AND THE BEAR STEARNS COMPANIES, LLC filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Abraham, Mathew Abraham, Amelio Acosta, Hermina Adame, Miguel Adame, Mitra Bagherian Aliabad, Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Dawn Light Amora, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Humberto Arruda, Abdullah Aslami, Bernadette Atienza, Virgil Atkins, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Romeo Bangalan, Alex Bauer, Lucy Bauer, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, Keith Beltran, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Deborah Berman, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Deborah Borks, James Borks, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Linda Brooks, Serrano Brooks, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Lorenzo Cabrera, Rosa Cabrera, Maria Cruz Cabrera Maldonado, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Rigoberto Canales, Rigoberto Carbajal, Ramon Carrillo, Ana Rosa Castaneda, David Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Carlos Castro, Jose Castro, Steven Chau, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Ada Cheung, Harinder Chhokar, Lila Clark, Robert Clark, Mitchell Coleman, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Sharron Covington, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Maricela Cruz, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Jose De Jesus Padilla, Maria De La Cruz, Amadita De La Garza, Ernie De La Garza, Ana Verastica De Ojeda, Robert De Vico, Rosana Desoto, Ramiro Devila, Manuel Domingo, Kasey Dority, Monique Dority, Randal Dorman, Roberta Doucet, Mark Drury, Efren Duarte, Digna Dupre, Phil Dupre, Isabel Dury, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Marziyeh Eghtesadi, Antonio Ellorin, Jr, Judea Ellorin, Jose Encizo, Rosalva Encizo, Mary Enehtownsell, Martha Estrada, Michael Everts, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, Freddie Wing Fai, John Ferles, Hilda Fernandes, Verden Fernandes, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Mike Ferris, Arthur Fichtenberg, Kathy Fitch, Kent Fitch, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Tom Ford, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Rosa E Garaicoa, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Isaias Garcia, John Garcia, Patricia Garcia, Ruth Garcia, Veronica Garcia, Joanne Gatrell, Madonna Gionta, Anita Glaszko, Raymundo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Norma Guillo, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Norma Guzman, Joy Haenny, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Andreite Harlin, Leonard Harlin, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Tom Harry, George Hassemer, Gloria Hassemer, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Miguel Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Maria Zulema Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Cheryl Holland, Danh Hong, Danh Hong, Melba Hopwood, Daniel Houston, Vernnie Huggins, Arida Indhasiri, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Nicole Jackson, Lorenzo Jalandoni, Patria Jalandoni, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Shaun Jennings, Sinia Jennings, Grace Caruth Johnson, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Klara Kasumyan, Vatche Kasumyan, Eileen Keusseyan, Tony Keusseyan, Orlando Kinard, Debra Lynn Klein, Eileen Kolkey, Emily Kooyman, Ken Kooyman, Kathleen Kowal, Mike Kowal, Cari Krumme, Deborah Lamb, Carolyn Le, Janet Leen, Stephen Leen, George Lewis, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Ingshou Lin, Francesca Llorico, Levi Llorico, Angel Lomeli, Blanca Bernal Longoria, David Lucio, Juan Luna, Juanita Lusung, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Fariba Maghoui, Esther Magna, Hedy Magna, Mark Magna, Romelia Magnetti, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Helen Martin, Lorena Martin, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Brett Mattus, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Pamela Meier, Patricia Meier, Isabel Mejia, Ramon Mejia, Bennett Meltzer, Robert Messner, Alain Michael, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Roger Milette, Xiomara Milette, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Mary Mobley, Michael Mobley, Pram-Held Mongthu, Fernando Montelongo, Carlos Madrid Mora, Consuelo Morales, Raul Morales, Theresa Moreno, Moses Mortazavi, Kelly Moustris, Kevin Moustris, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Armando Navarro, Patricia Navarro, Odette Nayrouz, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Chor Chun Ngan, Nhu-Thuan Nguyen, Nhuthuan Nguyen, Nina Nguyen, Connie Nhan, Tiffany Nhan, Dennis O Dorisio, Melanie O Dorisio, Teri O Rourke, Daniel Obeso, Francisco Ojeda, Jose Ortiz, Rosita Panes, George Pappas, Sippin Pappas, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Sang Park, Yun Park, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Agustin Perez, April Perez, Raul Perez, Rosario Perez, Thomas Perez, Emilio Perito, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Judith Pico-Beltran, Eleno Pienado-Garcia, Juan Planz, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Ngoc-Anh Pram, Arnulfa Quinones, Martha Ramirez, Hector Ramos, Lydia Ramos, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Antonio Razo, Aswin Reddy, Julio Rendon, Arturo Reyes, Cristina Reyes, Rodolfo Reyes, Clifford Risch, Carlos Rivera, Gerardo Rivera, Maria Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jose Rodriguez, Marcia Rodriguez, Jerry Rogge, Diana Rosales, Robert Rositano, Barry Ross, Candy Ross, Ali Roueenfar, Emanuel Sabet, Gila Sabet, Marina Sakach, Timothy Sakach, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Eduardo Salazar, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, James Scarborough, Donald Scott, Michelle Scott, Nathalie Sebagh, Maria M Segura, Elayne Diaz Serrano, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Gene Shropshire, Maria Teresa Silva, Christian Silver, Djuanique Slaughter, Edith Smith, Kimberly Smith, Matthew Smith, Valera Smith, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Wilbur Steele, Shayna Stone, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Eva Thielk, Joann Thomas, John Thomas, Mahmood Timbo, Eliazar Toledo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Jerry Ung, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Garnetta Vestle, John Jacinto Villas, Maria Imelda Villas, Jesus Villegas, Lenepe Villegas, Theodore William Voigtlander, John Waddle, Melodie Waddle, Annette Wahl, Richard Wahl, Janie Warschaw, Jeffrey Warschaw, Karie Wasinack, Tina Waters, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weisz, Kimberly Weisz, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Marcia Willoughby, Jeff Wise, Kristin Witzenburg, Cynthia Genrich Wolfe, Cynthia Woolem, Gloria Young, Lidia Young, Geronimo Zarate, Marlene Zarate, Maria Zepeda, Jeanie Zou, Javier Zuniga. (Torchia, Vito)
April 8, 2013 Filing 53 OBJECTION in opposition to re: MOTION to Dismiss Case The Fourth Amended Complaint #32 - OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS CORELOGIC VALUATION SERVICES, LLC, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO EAPPRIASEIT, LLC, AND CORELOGIC INC. F/K/A THE FIRST AMERICAN CORPORATIONS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Abraham, Mathew Abraham, Amelio Acosta, Hermina Adame, Miguel Adame, Mitra Bagherian Aliabad, Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Dawn Light Amora, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Humberto Arruda, Abdullah Aslami, Bernadette Atienza, Virgil Atkins, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Romeo Bangalan, Alex Bauer, Lucy Bauer, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, Keith Beltran, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Deborah Berman, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Deborah Borks, James Borks, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Linda Brooks, Serrano Brooks, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Lorenzo Cabrera, Rosa Cabrera, Maria Cruz Cabrera Maldonado, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Rigoberto Canales, Rigoberto Carbajal, Ramon Carrillo, Ana Rosa Castaneda, David Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Carlos Castro, Jose Castro, Steven Chau, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Ada Cheung, Harinder Chhokar, Lila Clark, Robert Clark, Mitchell Coleman, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Sharron Covington, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Maricela Cruz, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Jose De Jesus Padilla, Maria De La Cruz, Amadita De La Garza, Ernie De La Garza, Ana Verastica De Ojeda, Robert De Vico, Rosana Desoto, Ramiro Devila, Manuel Domingo, Kasey Dority, Monique Dority, Randal Dorman, Roberta Doucet, Mark Drury, Efren Duarte, Digna Dupre, Phil Dupre, Isabel Dury, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Marziyeh Eghtesadi, Antonio Ellorin, Jr, Judea Ellorin, Jose Encizo, Rosalva Encizo, Mary Enehtownsell, Martha Estrada, Michael Everts, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, Freddie Wing Fai, John Ferles, Hilda Fernandes, Verden Fernandes, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Mike Ferris, Arthur Fichtenberg, Kathy Fitch, Kent Fitch, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Tom Ford, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Rosa E Garaicoa, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Isaias Garcia, John Garcia, Patricia Garcia, Ruth Garcia, Veronica Garcia, Joanne Gatrell, Madonna Gionta, Anita Glaszko, Raymundo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Norma Guillo, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Norma Guzman, Joy Haenny, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Andreite Harlin, Leonard Harlin, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Tom Harry, George Hassemer, Gloria Hassemer, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Miguel Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Maria Zulema Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Cheryl Holland, Danh Hong, Danh Hong, Melba Hopwood, Daniel Houston, Vernnie Huggins, Arida Indhasiri, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Nicole Jackson, Lorenzo Jalandoni, Patria Jalandoni, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Shaun Jennings, Sinia Jennings, Grace Caruth Johnson, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Klara Kasumyan, Vatche Kasumyan, Eileen Keusseyan, Tony Keusseyan, Orlando Kinard, Debra Lynn Klein, Eileen Kolkey, Emily Kooyman, Ken Kooyman, Kathleen Kowal, Mike Kowal, Cari Krumme, Deborah Lamb, Carolyn Le, Janet Leen, Stephen Leen, George Lewis, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Ingshou Lin, Francesca Llorico, Levi Llorico, Angel Lomeli, Blanca Bernal Longoria, David Lucio, Juan Luna, Juanita Lusung, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Fariba Maghoui, Esther Magna, Hedy Magna, Mark Magna, Romelia Magnetti, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Helen Martin, Lorena Martin, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Brett Mattus, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Pamela Meier, Patricia Meier, Isabel Mejia, Ramon Mejia, Bennett Meltzer, Robert Messner, Alain Michael, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Roger Milette, Xiomara Milette, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Mary Mobley, Michael Mobley, Pram-Held Mongthu, Fernando Montelongo, Carlos Madrid Mora, Consuelo Morales, Raul Morales, Theresa Moreno, Moses Mortazavi, Kelly Moustris, Kevin Moustris, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Armando Navarro, Patricia Navarro, Odette Nayrouz, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Chor Chun Ngan, Nhu-Thuan Nguyen, Nhuthuan Nguyen, Nina Nguyen, Connie Nhan, Tiffany Nhan, Dennis O Dorisio, Melanie O Dorisio, Teri O Rourke, Daniel Obeso, Francisco Ojeda, Jose Ortiz, Rosita Panes, George Pappas, Sippin Pappas, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Sang Park, Yun Park, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Agustin Perez, April Perez, Raul Perez, Rosario Perez, Thomas Perez, Emilio Perito, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Judith Pico-Beltran, Eleno Pienado-Garcia, Juan Planz, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Ngoc-Anh Pram, Arnulfa Quinones, Martha Ramirez, Hector Ramos, Lydia Ramos, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Antonio Razo, Aswin Reddy, Julio Rendon, Arturo Reyes, Cristina Reyes, Rodolfo Reyes, Clifford Risch, Carlos Rivera, Gerardo Rivera, Maria Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jose Rodriguez, Marcia Rodriguez, Jerry Rogge, Diana Rosales, Robert Rositano, Barry Ross, Candy Ross, Ali Roueenfar, Emanuel Sabet, Gila Sabet, Marina Sakach, Timothy Sakach, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Eduardo Salazar, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, James Scarborough, Donald Scott, Michelle Scott, Nathalie Sebagh, Maria M Segura, Elayne Diaz Serrano, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Gene Shropshire, Maria Teresa Silva, Christian Silver, Djuanique Slaughter, Edith Smith, Kimberly Smith, Matthew Smith, Valera Smith, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Wilbur Steele, Shayna Stone, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Eva Thielk, Joann Thomas, John Thomas, Mahmood Timbo, Eliazar Toledo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Jerry Ung, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Garnetta Vestle, John Jacinto Villas, Maria Imelda Villas, Jesus Villegas, Lenepe Villegas, Theodore William Voigtlander, John Waddle, Melodie Waddle, Annette Wahl, Richard Wahl, Janie Warschaw, Jeffrey Warschaw, Karie Wasinack, Tina Waters, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weisz, Kimberly Weisz, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Marcia Willoughby, Jeff Wise, Kristin Witzenburg, Cynthia Genrich Wolfe, Cynthia Woolem, Gloria Young, Lidia Young, Geronimo Zarate, Marlene Zarate, Maria Zepeda, Jeanie Zou, Javier Zuniga. (Torchia, Vito)
April 8, 2013 Filing 52 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO CORELOGIC VALUATION SERVICES, LLC, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO EAPPRIASEIT, LLC, AND CORELOGIC INC. F/K/A THE FIRST AMERICAN CORPORATIONS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Abraham, Mathew Abraham, Amelio Acosta, Hermina Adame, Miguel Adame, Mitra Bagherian Aliabad, Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Dawn Light Amora, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Humberto Arruda, Abdullah Aslami, Bernadette Atienza, Virgil Atkins, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Romeo Bangalan, Alex Bauer, Lucy Bauer, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, Keith Beltran, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Deborah Berman, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Deborah Borks, James Borks, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Linda Brooks, Serrano Brooks, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Lorenzo Cabrera, Rosa Cabrera, Maria Cruz Cabrera Maldonado, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Rigoberto Canales, Rigoberto Carbajal, Ramon Carrillo, Ana Rosa Castaneda, David Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Carlos Castro, Jose Castro, Steven Chau, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Ada Cheung, Harinder Chhokar, Lila Clark, Robert Clark, Mitchell Coleman, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Sharron Covington, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Maricela Cruz, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Jose De Jesus Padilla, Maria De La Cruz, Amadita De La Garza, Ernie De La Garza, Ana Verastica De Ojeda, Robert De Vico, Rosana Desoto, Ramiro Devila, Manuel Domingo, Kasey Dority, Monique Dority, Randal Dorman, Roberta Doucet, Mark Drury, Efren Duarte, Digna Dupre, Phil Dupre, Isabel Dury, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Marziyeh Eghtesadi, Antonio Ellorin, Jr, Judea Ellorin, Jose Encizo, Rosalva Encizo, Mary Enehtownsell, Martha Estrada, Michael Everts, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, Freddie Wing Fai, John Ferles, Hilda Fernandes, Verden Fernandes, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Mike Ferris, Arthur Fichtenberg, Kathy Fitch, Kent Fitch, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Tom Ford, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Rosa E Garaicoa, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Isaias Garcia, John Garcia, Patricia Garcia, Ruth Garcia, Veronica Garcia, Joanne Gatrell, Madonna Gionta, Anita Glaszko, Raymundo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Norma Guillo, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Norma Guzman, Joy Haenny, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Andreite Harlin, Leonard Harlin, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Tom Harry, George Hassemer, Gloria Hassemer, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Miguel Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Maria Zulema Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Cheryl Holland, Danh Hong(an individual), Melba Hopwood, Daniel Houston, Vernnie Huggins, Arida Indhasiri, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Nicole Jackson, Lorenzo Jalandoni, Patria Jalandoni, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Shaun Jennings, Sinia Jennings, Grace Caruth Johnson, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Klara Kasumyan, Vatche Kasumyan, Eileen Keusseyan, Tony Keusseyan, Orlando Kinard, Debra Lynn Klein, Eileen Kolkey, Emily Kooyman, Ken Kooyman, Kathleen Kowal, Mike Kowal, Cari Krumme, Deborah Lamb, Carolyn Le, Janet Leen, Stephen Leen, George Lewis, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Ingshou Lin, Francesca Llorico, Levi Llorico, Angel Lomeli, Blanca Bernal Longoria, David Lucio, Juan Luna, Juanita Lusung, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Fariba Maghoui, Esther Magna, Hedy Magna, Mark Magna, Romelia Magnetti, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Helen Martin, Lorena Martin, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Brett Mattus, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Pamela Meier, Patricia Meier, Isabel Mejia, Ramon Mejia, Bennett Meltzer, Robert Messner, Alain Michael, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Roger Milette, Xiomara Milette, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Mary Mobley, Michael Mobley, Pram-Held Mongthu, Fernando Montelongo, Carlos Madrid Mora, Consuelo Morales, Raul Morales, Theresa Moreno, Moses Mortazavi, Kelly Moustris, Kevin Moustris, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Armando Navarro, Patricia Navarro, Odette Nayrouz, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Chor Chun Ngan, Nhu-Thuan Nguyen, Nhuthuan Nguyen, Nina Nguyen, Connie Nhan, Tiffany Nhan, Dennis O Dorisio, Melanie O Dorisio, Teri O Rourke, Daniel Obeso, Francisco Ojeda, Jose Ortiz, Rosita Panes, George Pappas, Sippin Pappas, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Sang Park, Yun Park, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Agustin Perez, April Perez, Raul Perez, Rosario Perez, Thomas Perez, Emilio Perito, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Judith Pico-Beltran, Eleno Pienado-Garcia, Juan Planz, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Ngoc-Anh Pram, Arnulfa Quinones, Martha Ramirez, Hector Ramos, Lydia Ramos, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Antonio Razo, Aswin Reddy, Julio Rendon, Arturo Reyes, Cristina Reyes, Rodolfo Reyes, Clifford Risch, Carlos Rivera, Gerardo Rivera, Maria Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jose Rodriguez, Marcia Rodriguez, Jerry Rogge, Diana Rosales, Robert Rositano, Barry Ross, Candy Ross, Ali Roueenfar, Emanuel Sabet, Gila Sabet, Marina Sakach, Timothy Sakach, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Eduardo Salazar, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, James Scarborough, Donald Scott, Michelle Scott, Nathalie Sebagh, Maria M Segura, Elayne Diaz Serrano, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Gene Shropshire, Maria Teresa Silva, Christian Silver, Djuanique Slaughter, Edith Smith, Kimberly Smith, Matthew Smith, Valera Smith, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Wilbur Steele, Shayna Stone, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Eva Thielk, Joann Thomas, John Thomas, Mahmood Timbo, Eliazar Toledo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Jerry Ung, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Garnetta Vestle, John Jacinto Villas, Maria Imelda Villas, Jesus Villegas, Lenepe Villegas, Theodore William Voigtlander, John Waddle, Melodie Waddle, Annette Wahl, Richard Wahl, Janie Warschaw, Jeffrey Warschaw, Karie Wasinack, Tina Waters, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weisz, Kimberly Weisz, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Marcia Willoughby, Jeff Wise, Kristin Witzenburg, Cynthia Genrich Wolfe, Cynthia Woolem, Gloria Young, Lidia Young, Geronimo Zarate, Marlene Zarate, Maria Zepeda, Jeanie Zou, Javier Zuniga. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Torchia, Vito)
April 8, 2013 Filing 51 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: MOTION to Dismiss Case The Fourth Amended Complaint #32 filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Abraham, Mathew Abraham, Amelio Acosta, Hermina Adame, Miguel Adame, Mitra Bagherian Aliabad, Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Dawn Light Amora, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Humberto Arruda, Abdullah Aslami, Bernadette Atienza, Virgil Atkins, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Romeo Bangalan, Alex Bauer, Lucy Bauer, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, Keith Beltran, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Deborah Berman, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Deborah Borks, James Borks, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Linda Brooks, Serrano Brooks, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Lorenzo Cabrera, Rosa Cabrera, Maria Cruz Cabrera Maldonado, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Rigoberto Canales, Rigoberto Carbajal, Ramon Carrillo, Ana Rosa Castaneda, David Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Carlos Castro, Jose Castro, Steven Chau, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Ada Cheung, Harinder Chhokar, Lila Clark, Robert Clark, Mitchell Coleman, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Sharron Covington, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Maricela Cruz, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Jose De Jesus Padilla, Maria De La Cruz, Amadita De La Garza, Ernie De La Garza, Ana Verastica De Ojeda, Robert De Vico, Rosana Desoto, Ramiro Devila, Manuel Domingo, Kasey Dority, Monique Dority, Randal Dorman, Roberta Doucet, Mark Drury, Efren Duarte, Digna Dupre, Phil Dupre, Isabel Dury, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Marziyeh Eghtesadi, Antonio Ellorin, Jr, Judea Ellorin, Jose Encizo, Rosalva Encizo, Mary Enehtownsell, Martha Estrada, Michael Everts, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, Freddie Wing Fai, John Ferles, Hilda Fernandes, Verden Fernandes, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Mike Ferris, Arthur Fichtenberg, Kathy Fitch, Kent Fitch, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Tom Ford, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Rosa E Garaicoa, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Isaias Garcia, John Garcia, Patricia Garcia, Ruth Garcia, Veronica Garcia, Joanne Gatrell, Madonna Gionta, Anita Glaszko, Raymundo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Norma Guillo, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Norma Guzman, Joy Haenny, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Andreite Harlin, Leonard Harlin, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Tom Harry, George Hassemer, Gloria Hassemer, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Miguel Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Maria Zulema Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Cheryl Holland, Danh Hong, Danh Hong, Melba Hopwood, Daniel Houston, Vernnie Huggins, Arida Indhasiri, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Nicole Jackson, Lorenzo Jalandoni, Patria Jalandoni, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Shaun Jennings, Sinia Jennings, Grace Caruth Johnson, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Klara Kasumyan, Vatche Kasumyan, Eileen Keusseyan, Tony Keusseyan, Orlando Kinard, Debra Lynn Klein, Eileen Kolkey, Emily Kooyman, Ken Kooyman, Kathleen Kowal, Mike Kowal, Cari Krumme, Deborah Lamb, Carolyn Le, Janet Leen, Stephen Leen, George Lewis, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Ingshou Lin, Francesca Llorico, Levi Llorico, Angel Lomeli, Blanca Bernal Longoria, David Lucio, Juan Luna, Juanita Lusung, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Fariba Maghoui, Esther Magna, Hedy Magna, Mark Magna, Romelia Magnetti, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Helen Martin, Lorena Martin, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Brett Mattus, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Pamela Meier, Patricia Meier, Isabel Mejia, Ramon Mejia, Bennett Meltzer, Robert Messner, Alain Michael, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Roger Milette, Xiomara Milette, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Mary Mobley, Michael Mobley, Pram-Held Mongthu, Fernando Montelongo, Carlos Madrid Mora, Consuelo Morales, Raul Morales, Theresa Moreno, Moses Mortazavi, Kelly Moustris, Kevin Moustris, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Armando Navarro, Patricia Navarro, Odette Nayrouz, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Chor Chun Ngan, Nhu-Thuan Nguyen, Nhuthuan Nguyen, Nina Nguyen, Connie Nhan, Tiffany Nhan, Dennis O Dorisio, Melanie O Dorisio, Teri O Rourke, Daniel Obeso, Francisco Ojeda, Jose Ortiz, Rosita Panes, George Pappas, Sippin Pappas, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Sang Park, Yun Park, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Agustin Perez, April Perez, Raul Perez, Rosario Perez, Thomas Perez, Emilio Perito, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Judith Pico-Beltran, Eleno Pienado-Garcia, Juan Planz, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Ngoc-Anh Pram, Arnulfa Quinones, Martha Ramirez, Hector Ramos, Lydia Ramos, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Antonio Razo, Aswin Reddy, Julio Rendon, Arturo Reyes, Cristina Reyes, Rodolfo Reyes, Clifford Risch, Carlos Rivera, Gerardo Rivera, Maria Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jose Rodriguez, Marcia Rodriguez, Jerry Rogge, Diana Rosales, Robert Rositano, Barry Ross, Candy Ross, Ali Roueenfar, Emanuel Sabet, Gila Sabet, Marina Sakach, Timothy Sakach, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Eduardo Salazar, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, James Scarborough, Donald Scott, Michelle Scott, Nathalie Sebagh, Maria M Segura, Elayne Diaz Serrano, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Gene Shropshire, Maria Teresa Silva, Christian Silver, Djuanique Slaughter, Edith Smith, Kimberly Smith, Matthew Smith, Valera Smith, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Wilbur Steele, Shayna Stone, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Eva Thielk, Joann Thomas, John Thomas, Mahmood Timbo, Eliazar Toledo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Jerry Ung, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Garnetta Vestle, John Jacinto Villas, Maria Imelda Villas, Jesus Villegas, Lenepe Villegas, Theodore William Voigtlander, John Waddle, Melodie Waddle, Annette Wahl, Richard Wahl, Janie Warschaw, Jeffrey Warschaw, Karie Wasinack, Tina Waters, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weisz, Kimberly Weisz, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Marcia Willoughby, Jeff Wise, Kristin Witzenburg, Cynthia Genrich Wolfe, Cynthia Woolem, Gloria Young, Lidia Young, Geronimo Zarate, Marlene Zarate, Maria Zepeda, Jeanie Zou, Javier Zuniga. (Torchia, Vito)
April 5, 2013 Filing 50 Joint Stipulation filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Abraham, Mathew Abraham, Amelio Acosta, Hermina Adame, Miguel Adame, Mitra Bagherian Aliabad, Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Dawn Light Amora, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Humberto Arruda, Abdullah Aslami, Bernadette Atienza, Virgil Atkins, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Romeo Bangalan, Alex Bauer, Lucy Bauer, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, Keith Beltran, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Deborah Berman, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Deborah Borks, James Borks, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Linda Brooks, Serrano Brooks, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Lorenzo Cabrera, Rosa Cabrera, Maria Cruz Cabrera Maldonado, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Rigoberto Canales, Rigoberto Carbajal, Ramon Carrillo, Ana Rosa Castaneda, David Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Carlos Castro, Jose Castro, Steven Chau, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Ada Cheung, Harinder Chhokar, Lila Clark, Robert Clark, Mitchell Coleman, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Sharron Covington, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Maricela Cruz, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Jose De Jesus Padilla, Maria De La Cruz, Amadita De La Garza, Ernie De La Garza, Ana Verastica De Ojeda, Robert De Vico, Rosana Desoto, Ramiro Devila, Manuel Domingo, Kasey Dority, Monique Dority, Randal Dorman, Roberta Doucet, Mark Drury, Efren Duarte, Digna Dupre, Phil Dupre, Isabel Dury, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Marziyeh Eghtesadi, Antonio Ellorin, Jr, Judea Ellorin, Jose Encizo, Rosalva Encizo, Mary Enehtownsell, Martha Estrada, Michael Everts, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, Freddie Wing Fai, John Ferles, Hilda Fernandes, Verden Fernandes, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Mike Ferris, Arthur Fichtenberg, Kathy Fitch, Kent Fitch, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Tom Ford, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Rosa E Garaicoa, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Isaias Garcia, John Garcia, Patricia Garcia, Ruth Garcia, Veronica Garcia, Joanne Gatrell, Madonna Gionta, Anita Glaszko, Raymundo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Norma Guillo, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Norma Guzman, Joy Haenny, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Andreite Harlin, Leonard Harlin, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Tom Harry, George Hassemer, Gloria Hassemer, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Miguel Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Maria Zulema Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Cheryl Holland, Danh Hong, Danh Hong, Melba Hopwood, Daniel Houston, Vernnie Huggins, Arida Indhasiri, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Nicole Jackson, Lorenzo Jalandoni, Patria Jalandoni, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Shaun Jennings, Sinia Jennings, Grace Caruth Johnson, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Klara Kasumyan, Vatche Kasumyan, Eileen Keusseyan, Tony Keusseyan, Orlando Kinard, Debra Lynn Klein, Eileen Kolkey, Emily Kooyman, Ken Kooyman, Kathleen Kowal, Mike Kowal, Cari Krumme, Deborah Lamb, Carolyn Le, Janet Leen, Stephen Leen, George Lewis, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Ingshou Lin, Francesca Llorico, Levi Llorico, Angel Lomeli, Blanca Bernal Longoria, David Lucio, Juan Luna, Juanita Lusung, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Fariba Maghoui, Esther Magna, Hedy Magna, Mark Magna, Romelia Magnetti, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Helen Martin, Lorena Martin, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Brett Mattus, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Pamela Meier, Patricia Meier, Isabel Mejia, Ramon Mejia, Bennett Meltzer, Robert Messner, Alain Michael, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Roger Milette, Xiomara Milette, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Mary Mobley, Michael Mobley, Pram-Held Mongthu, Fernando Montelongo, Carlos Madrid Mora, Consuelo Morales, Raul Morales, Theresa Moreno, Moses Mortazavi, Kelly Moustris, Kevin Moustris, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Armando Navarro, Patricia Navarro, Odette Nayrouz, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Chor Chun Ngan, Nhu-Thuan Nguyen, Nhuthuan Nguyen, Nina Nguyen, Connie Nhan, Tiffany Nhan, Dennis O Dorisio, Melanie O Dorisio, Teri O Rourke, Daniel Obeso, Francisco Ojeda, Jose Ortiz, Rosita Panes, George Pappas, Sippin Pappas, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Sang Park, Yun Park, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Agustin Perez, April Perez, Raul Perez, Rosario Perez, Thomas Perez, Emilio Perito, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Judith Pico-Beltran, Eleno Pienado-Garcia, Juan Planz, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Ngoc-Anh Pram, Arnulfa Quinones, Martha Ramirez, Hector Ramos, Lydia Ramos, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Antonio Razo, Aswin Reddy, Julio Rendon, Arturo Reyes, Cristina Reyes, Rodolfo Reyes, Clifford Risch, Carlos Rivera, Gerardo Rivera, Maria Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jose Rodriguez, Marcia Rodriguez, Jerry Rogge, Diana Rosales, Robert Rositano, Barry Ross, Candy Ross, Ali Roueenfar, Emanuel Sabet, Gila Sabet, Marina Sakach, Timothy Sakach, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Eduardo Salazar, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, James Scarborough, Donald Scott, Michelle Scott, Nathalie Sebagh, Maria M Segura, Elayne Diaz Serrano, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Gene Shropshire, Maria Teresa Silva, Christian Silver, Djuanique Slaughter, Edith Smith, Kimberly Smith, Matthew Smith, Valera Smith, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Wilbur Steele, Shayna Stone, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Eva Thielk, Joann Thomas, John Thomas, Mahmood Timbo, Eliazar Toledo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Jerry Ung, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Garnetta Vestle, John Jacinto Villas, Maria Imelda Villas, Jesus Villegas, Lenepe Villegas, Theodore William Voigtlander, John Waddle, Melodie Waddle, Annette Wahl, Richard Wahl, Janie Warschaw, Jeffrey Warschaw, Karie Wasinack, Tina Waters, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weisz, Kimberly Weisz, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Marcia Willoughby, Jeff Wise, Kristin Witzenburg, Cynthia Genrich Wolfe, Cynthia Woolem, Gloria Young, Lidia Young, Geronimo Zarate, Marlene Zarate, Maria Zepeda, Jeanie Zou, Javier Zuniga (Behnood, Sasan)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court hereby grants Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for itself and as successor by merger to Chase Home Finance LLC, EMC Mortgage LLC (incorrectly sued as EMC Mortgage Corporation), and The Bear Stearns Companies LLC's Request for the telephonic appearance of Susan J. Miller Overbey at the hearing on the Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint on 4/29/2013 at 10:00 AM #48 . (gk)
March 15, 2013 Filing 48 REQUEST for Leave of Susan J. Miller Overbey to Appear for hearing on motion to dismiss by telephone filed by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. Request set for hearing on 4/29/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Luther, Douglas)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: granting #26 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Danielle J. Szukala on behalf of Defendants Bear Stearns Companies LLC, California Reconveyance Company, Chase Home Finance LLC, EMC Mortgage Corporation, and for JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, designating Shannon Z. Petersen as local counsel. (lt)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: granting #27 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ellen J. W. Brace on behalf of Defendants Bear Stearns Companies LLC, California Reconveyance Company, Chase Home Finance LLC, EMC Mortgage Corporation, and for JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, designating Shannon Z. Petersen as local counsel. (lt)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: granting #28 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Susan J. Miller Overbey on behalf of Defendants Bear Stearns Companies LLC, California Reconveyance Company, Chase Home Finance LLC, EMC Mortgage Corporation, and for JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, designating Shannon Z. Petersen as local counsel. (lt)
March 13, 2013 Filing 44 NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
March 11, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh. (Torchia, Vito)
March 11, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Daniel Houston pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Daniel Houston. (Torchia, Vito)
March 11, 2013 Filing 41 NOTICE OF LODGING filed with Certificates of Admission to Illinois State Bar re APPLICATION for attorney Danielle J. Szukala to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11689688 paid.) #26 , APPLICATION for attorney Ellen J. W. Brace to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11689809 paid.) #27 , APPLICATION for attorney Susan J. Miller Overbey to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11689868 paid.) #28 (Luther, Douglas)
March 7, 2013 Filing 40 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA of Certificates of Admission to Illinois State Bar. (Luther, Douglas)
March 4, 2013 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co., Bear Stearns. (Luther, Douglas)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RE-SCHEDULE MOTIONS HEARING by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Stipulation #37 , the Scheduling Conference and all other discovery obligations, are continued until after the Court's resolution of the pending Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants #29 , #31 , #32 . Plaintiffs' time to file their Oppositions to the Motions is extended to 4/8/2013. Defendants' reply briefs shall be due on 4/22/2013. The hearing on the Motions and the Scheduling Conference 4/29/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (gk)
February 27, 2013 Filing 37 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Re-Sheduling Motions Hearing from March 25, 2013 to April 29, 2013 filed by plaintiff Elizabeth Abraham, Mathew Abraham, Amelio Acosta, Hermina Adame, Miguel Adame, Mitra Bagherian Aliabad, Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Dawn Light Amora, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Humberto Arruda, Abdullah Aslami, Bernadette Atienza, Virgil Atkins, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Romeo Bangalan, Alex Bauer, Lucy Bauer, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, Keith Beltran, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Deborah Berman, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Deborah Borks, James Borks, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Linda Brooks, Serrano Brooks, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Lorenzo Cabrera, Rosa Cabrera, Maria Cruz Cabrera Maldonado, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Rigoberto Canales, Rigoberto Carbajal, Ramon Carrillo, Ana Rosa Castaneda, David Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Carlos Castro, Jose Castro, Steven Chau, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Ada Cheung, Harinder Chhokar, Lila Clark, Robert Clark, Mitchell Coleman, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Sharron Covington, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Maricela Cruz, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Jose De Jesus Padilla, Maria De La Cruz, Amadita De La Garza, Ernie De La Garza, Ana Verastica De Ojeda, Robert De Vico, Rosana Desoto, Ramiro Devila, Manuel Domingo, Kasey Dority, Monique Dority, Randal Dorman, Roberta Doucet, Mark Drury, Efren Duarte, Digna Dupre, Phil Dupre, Isabel Dury, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Marziyeh Eghtesadi, Antonio Ellorin, Jr, Judea Ellorin, Jose Encizo, Rosalva Encizo, Mary Enehtownsell, Martha Estrada, Michael Everts, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, Freddie Wing Fai, John Ferles, Hilda Fernandes, Verden Fernandes, Mauro Perez Fernandez, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Mike Ferris, Arthur Fichtenberg, Kathy Fitch, Kent Fitch, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Tom Ford, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Rosa E Garaicoa, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Isaias Garcia, John Garcia, Patricia Garcia, Ruth Garcia, Veronica Garcia, Joanne Gatrell, Madonna Gionta, Anita Glaszko, Raymundo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Norma Guillo, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Norma Guzman, Joy Haenny, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Andreite Harlin, Leonard Harlin, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Tom Harry, George Hassemer, Gloria Hassemer, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Miguel Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Maria Zulema Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Cheryl Holland, Danh Hong(an individual), Melba Hopwood, Daniel Houston, Vernnie Huggins, Arida Indhasiri, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Nicole Jackson, Lorenzo Jalandoni, Patria Jalandoni, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Shaun Jennings, Sinia Jennings, Grace Caruth Johnson, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Klara Kasumyan, Vatche Kasumyan, Eileen Keusseyan, Tony Keusseyan, Orlando Kinard, Debra Lynn Klein, Eileen Kolkey, Emily Kooyman, Ken Kooyman, Kathleen Kowal, Mike Kowal, Cari Krumme, Deborah Lamb, Carolyn Le, Janet Leen, Stephen Leen, George Lewis, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Ingshou Lin, Francesca Llorico, Levi Llorico, Angel Lomeli, Blanca Bernal Longoria, David Lucio, Juan Luna, Juanita Lusung, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Fariba Maghoui, Esther Magna, Hedy Magna, Mark Magna, Romelia Magnetti, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Helen Martin, Lorena Martin, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Brett Mattus, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Pamela Meier, Patricia Meier, Isabel Mejia, Ramon Mejia, Bennett Meltzer, Robert Messner, Alain Michael, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Roger Milette, Xiomara Milette, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Mary Mobley, Michael Mobley, Pram-Held Mongthu, Fernando Montelongo, Carlos Madrid Mora, Consuelo Morales, Raul Morales, Theresa Moreno, Moses Mortazavi, Kelly Moustris, Kevin Moustris, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Armando Navarro, Patricia Navarro, Odette Nayrouz, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Chor Chun Ngan, Nhu-Thuan Nguyen, Nhuthuan Nguyen, Nina Nguyen, Connie Nhan, Tiffany Nhan, Dennis O Dorisio, Melanie O Dorisio, Teri O Rourke, Daniel Obeso, Francisco Ojeda, Jose Ortiz, Rosita Panes, George Pappas, Sippin Pappas, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Sang Park, Yun Park, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Agustin Perez, April Perez, Raul Perez, Rosario Perez, Thomas Perez, Emilio Perito, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Judith Pico-Beltran, Eleno Pienado-Garcia, Juan Planz, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Ngoc-Anh Pram, Arnulfa Quinones, Martha Ramirez, Hector Ramos, Lydia Ramos, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Antonio Razo, Aswin Reddy, Julio Rendon, Arturo Reyes, Cristina Reyes, Rodolfo Reyes, Clifford Risch, Carlos Rivera, Gerardo Rivera, Maria Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jose Rodriguez, Marcia Rodriguez, Jerry Rogge, Diana Rosales, Robert Rositano, Barry Ross, Candy Ross, Ali Roueenfar, Emanuel Sabet, Gila Sabet, Marina Sakach, Timothy Sakach, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Eduardo Salazar, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, James Scarborough, Donald Scott, Michelle Scott, Nathalie Sebagh, Maria M Segura, Elayne Diaz Serrano, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Gene Shropshire, Maria Teresa Silva, Christian Silver, Djuanique Slaughter, Edith Smith, Kimberly Smith, Matthew Smith, Valera Smith, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Wilbur Steele, Shayna Stone, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Eva Thielk, Joann Thomas, John Thomas, Mahmood Timbo, Eliazar Toledo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Jerry Ung, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Garnetta Vestle, John Jacinto Villas, Maria Imelda Villas, Jesus Villegas, Lenepe Villegas, Theodore William Voigtlander, John Waddle, Melodie Waddle, Annette Wahl, Richard Wahl, Janie Warschaw, Jeffrey Warschaw, Karie Wasinack, Tina Waters, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weisz, Kimberly Weisz, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Marcia Willoughby, Jeff Wise, Kristin Witzenburg, Cynthia Genrich Wolfe, Cynthia Woolem, Gloria Young, Lidia Young, Geronimo Zarate, Marlene Zarate, Maria Zepeda, Jeanie Zou, Javier Zuniga. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torchia, Vito)
February 21, 2013 Filing 36 JOINDER in MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Fourth Amended Complaint #29 , MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint #31 filed by Defendants Eappraiseit LLC, First American Corporation. (Beatty, Christopher)
February 21, 2013 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Eappraiseit LLC, First American Corporation identifying CoreLogic, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Beatty, Christopher)
February 21, 2013 Filing 34 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case The Fourth Amended Complaint #32 filed by Defendants Eappraiseit LLC, First American Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Ashley, A)
February 21, 2013 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case The Fourth Amended Complaint #32 filed by Defendants Eappraiseit LLC, First American Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ashley, A)
February 21, 2013 Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case The Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Eappraiseit LLC, First American Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 3/25/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ashley, A)
February 21, 2013 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint filed by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. Motion set for hearing on 3/25/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Douglas R. Luther)(Luther, Douglas)
February 21, 2013 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Fourth Amended Complaint #29 filed by Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Declaration Lewis Nelson, Sr., #5 Declaration Roberto C. Silva)(Sobiecki, Richard)
February 21, 2013 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 3/25/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sobiecki, Richard)
February 20, 2013 Filing 28 APPLICATION for attorney Susan J. Miller Overbey to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11689868 paid.) filed by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Luther, Douglas)
February 20, 2013 Filing 27 APPLICATION for attorney Ellen J. W. Brace to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11689809 paid.) filed by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Luther, Douglas)
February 20, 2013 Filing 26 APPLICATION for attorney Danielle J. Szukala to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11689688 paid.) filed by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Luther, Douglas)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: granting #23 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard Sobiecki on behalf of Defendant FDIC as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank, FA, designating Stephanie Krafchak as local counsel. (lt)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: granting #22 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David A. Super on behalf of Defendant FDIC as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank, FA, designating Stephanie Krafchak as local counsel. (lt)
February 15, 2013 Filing 21 SCHEDULING NOTICE CONTINUED by Judge Christina A. Snyder, Scheduling Conference set for 3/25/2013, is continued from 8:30 AM to 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. *NOTE: TIME CHANGE ONLY. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 14, 2013 Filing 23 APPLICATION for attorney Richard Sobiecki to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Attorney Stephanie Krafchak designated as local counsel. Lodged Application of Non Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case. (lt)
February 14, 2013 Filing 22 APPLICATION for attorney David A. Super to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Attorney Stephanie Krafchak designated as local counsel. Lodged Application of Non Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case. (lt)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Stipulation #11 that Defendants JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., for itself and as successor by merger to CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC, EMC MORTGAGE LLC (incorrectly sued as EMC Mortgage Corporation), THE BEAR STEARNS COMPANIES,LLC, CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY, CORELOGIC VALUATION SERVICES, LLC, F/K/A/ EAPPRAISEIT, LLC, CORELOGIC, INC. F/K/A THE FIRST AMERICAN CORPORATION,and the FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION have to and including February 21, 2013 to respond to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Judge S. James Otero (lc)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant to Section 6.0 of General Order 08-05 (identical case) by Judge James V. Selna, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Case number now reads as CV 13-00863 CAS(AGRx). (rn)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge S. James Otero : Scheduling Conference set for 3/25/13 8:30 AM; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/11/13 ; in order to assist counsel, court has included a schedule form for pretrial dates to be completed by counsel and submitted in conjunction with their rule 26(f) report; if case is part of ADR program, counsel must confer and jointly complete ADR Pilot Program Questionnaire and to file it concurrently with the Joint Rule 26(f) report; plaintiff counsel directed to give notice of scheduling conference to all parties. (lc)
February 13, 2013 Filing 17 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge S. James Otero. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Otero's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. It governs this case and differs in some respect from the Local Rules. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 12, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher Dale Beatty on behalf of Defendants Eappraiseit LLC, First American Corporation (Beatty, Christopher)
February 12, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John C Hueston on behalf of Defendants Eappraiseit LLC, First American Corporation (Hueston, John)
February 12, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney A Matthew Ashley on behalf of Defendants Eappraiseit LLC, First American Corporation (Ashley, A)
February 12, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Eappraiseit LLC, First American Corporation. Related Case(s): 11-CV-10255 CAS (ARGx) (Beatty, Christopher)
February 12, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher Dale Beatty on behalf of Defendants Eappraiseit LLC, First American Corporation (Beatty, Christopher)
February 11, 2013 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Bear Stearns Companies LLC answer now due 2/21/2013; California Reconveyance Company answer now due 2/21/2013; Chase Home Finance LLC answer now due 2/21/2013; EMC Mortgage Corporation answer now due 2/21/2013; JPMorgan Chase Bank NA answer now due 2/21/2013, re Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by defendants Bear Stearns Companies LLC; California Reconveyance Company; Chase Home Finance LLC; EMC Mortgage Corporation; JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Luther, Douglas)
February 11, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Douglas Robert Luther on behalf of Defendants Bear Stearns Companies LLC, California Reconveyance Company, Chase Home Finance LLC, EMC Mortgage Corporation, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA (Luther, Douglas)
February 8, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Rich Sobiecki for Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et)
February 8, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to David Super for Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et)
February 7, 2013 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Bear Stearns Companies LLC, California Reconveyance Company, Chase Home Finance LLC, Does, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Mauro Perez Fernandez, First American Corporation, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, Long Beach Mortgage Company amending Notice of Removal, #1 ,filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Abraham, Mathew Abraham, Amelio Acosta, Hermina Adame, Miguel Adame, Mitra Bagherian Aliabad, Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Dawn Light Amora, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Humberto Arruda, Abdullah Aslami, Bernadette Atienza, Virgil Atkins, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Romeo Bangalan, Alex Bauer, Lucy Bauer, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, Keith Beltran, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Deborah Berman, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Deborah Borks, James Borks, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Linda Brooks, Serrano Brooks, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Lorenzo Cabrera, Rosa Cabrera, Maria Cruz Cabrera Maldonado, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Rigoberto Canales, Rigoberto Carbajal, Ramon Carrillo, Ana Rosa Castaneda, David Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Carlos Castro, Jose Castro, Steven Chau, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Ada Cheung, Harinder Chhokar, Lila Clark, Robert Clark, Mitchell Coleman, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Sharron Covington, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Maricela Cruz, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Jose De Jesus Padilla, Maria De La Cruz, Amadita De La Garza, Ernie De La Garza, Ana Verastica De Ojeda, Robert De Vico, Rosana Desoto, Ramiro Devila, Manuel Domingo, Kasey Dority, Monique Dority, Randal Dorman, Roberta Doucet, Mark Drury, Efren Duarte, Digna Dupre, Phil Dupre, Isabel Dury, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Marziyeh Eghtesadi, Antonio Ellorin, Jr, Judea Ellorin, Jose Encizo, Rosalva Encizo, Mary Enehtownsell, Martha Estrada, Michael Everts, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, Freddie Wing Fai, John Ferles, Hilda Fernandes, Verden Fernandes, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Mike Ferris, Arthur Fichtenberg, Kathy Fitch, Kent Fitch, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Tom Ford, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Rosa E Garaicoa, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Isaias Garcia, John Garcia, Patricia Garcia, Ruth Garcia, Veronica Garcia, Joanne Gatrell, Madonna Gionta, Anita Glaszko, Raymundo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Norma Guillo, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Norma Guzman, Joy Haenny, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Andreite Harlin, Leonard Harlin, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Tom Harry, George Hassemer, Gloria Hassemer, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Miguel Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Maria Zulema Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Cheryl Holland, Danh Hong(an individual), Melba Hopwood, Daniel Houston, Vernnie Huggins, Arida Indhasiri, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Nicole Jackson, Lorenzo Jalandoni, Patria Jalandoni, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Shaun Jennings, Sinia Jennings, Grace Caruth Johnson, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Klara Kasumyan, Vatche Kasumyan, Eileen Keusseyan, Tony Keusseyan, Orlando Kinard, Debra Lynn Klein, Eileen Kolkey, Emily Kooyman, Ken Kooyman, Kathleen Kowal, Mike Kowal, Cari Krumme, Deborah Lamb, Carolyn Le, Janet Leen, Stephen Leen, George Lewis, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Ingshou Lin, Francesca Llorico, Levi Llorico, Angel Lomeli, Blanca Bernal Longoria, David Lucio, Juan Luna, Juanita Lusung, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Fariba Maghoui, Esther Magna, Hedy Magna, Mark Magna, Romelia Magnetti, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Helen Martin, Lorena Martin, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Brett Mattus, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Pamela Meier, Patricia Meier, Isabel Mejia, Ramon Mejia, Bennett Meltzer, Robert Messner, Alain Michael, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Roger Milette, Xiomara Milette, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Mary Mobley, Michael Mobley, Pram-Held Mongthu, Fernando Montelongo, Carlos Madrid Mora, Consuelo Morales, Raul Morales, Theresa Moreno, Moses Mortazavi, Kelly Moustris, Kevin Moustris, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Armando Navarro, Patricia Navarro, Odette Nayrouz, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Chor Chun Ngan, Nhu-Thuan Nguyen, Nhuthuan Nguyen, Nina Nguyen, Connie Nhan, Tiffany Nhan, Dennis O Dorisio, Melanie O Dorisio, Teri O Rourke, Daniel Obeso, Francisco Ojeda, Jose Ortiz, Rosita Panes, George Pappas, Sippin Pappas, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Sang Park, Yun Park, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Agustin Perez, April Perez, Raul Perez, Rosario Perez, Thomas Perez, Emilio Perito, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Judith Pico-Beltran, Eleno Pienado-Garcia, Juan Planz, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Ngoc-Anh Pram, Arnulfa Quinones, Martha Ramirez, Hector Ramos, Lydia Ramos, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Antonio Razo, Aswin Reddy, Julio Rendon, Arturo Reyes, Cristina Reyes, Rodolfo Reyes, Clifford Risch, Carlos Rivera, Gerardo Rivera, Maria Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jose Rodriguez, Marcia Rodriguez, Jerry Rogge, Diana Rosales, Robert Rositano, Barry Ross, Candy Ross, Ali Roueenfar, Emanuel Sabet, Gila Sabet, Marina Sakach, Timothy Sakach, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Eduardo Salazar, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, James Scarborough, Donald Scott, Michelle Scott, Nathalie Sebagh, Maria M Segura, Elayne Diaz Serrano, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Gene Shropshire, Maria Teresa Silva, Christian Silver, Djuanique Slaughter, Edith Smith, Kimberly Smith, Matthew Smith, Valera Smith, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Wilbur Steele, Shayna Stone, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Eva Thielk, Joann Thomas, John Thomas, Mahmood Timbo, Eliazar Toledo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Jerry Ung, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Garnetta Vestle, John Jacinto Villas, Maria Imelda Villas, Jesus Villegas, Lenepe Villegas, Theodore William Voigtlander, John Waddle, Melodie Waddle, Annette Wahl, Richard Wahl, Janie Warschaw, Jeffrey Warschaw, Karie Wasinack, Tina Waters, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weisz, Kimberly Weisz, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Marcia Willoughby, Jeff Wise, Kristin Witzenburg, Cynthia Genrich Wolfe, Cynthia Woolem, Gloria Young, Lidia Young, Geronimo Zarate, Marlene Zarate, Maria Zepeda, Jeanie Zou, Javier Zuniga. [Filed in State Court on 12/4/12 Submitted Attached to Notice Removal Part 1 of 6.] (et)
February 7, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 7, 2013 Filing 6 FDIC-RECEIVER'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ PART 6 of 6] as to Notice of Removal #1 Filed filed by Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2013: #1 Notice of Removal Part 6B, #2 Notice of Removal Part 6C, #3 Notice of Removal part 6D) (mg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2013: #4 Notice of Assignment, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (mg).
February 7, 2013 Filing 5 FDIC-RECEIVER'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ PART 5 of 6] as to Notice of Removal #1 Filed filed by Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2013: #1 Notice of Removal Part 5B, #2 Notice of Removal part 5C, #3 Notice of Removal Part 5D) (mg).
February 7, 2013 Filing 4 FDIC-RECEIVER'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ PART 4 of 6] as to Notice of Removal #1 Filed filed by Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. [UNCONFORMED COPY OF FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED] (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2013: #1 Notice of Removal Part 4B, #2 Notice of Removal Part 4 C) (mg). Modified on 2/11/2013 (et).
February 7, 2013 Filing 3 FDIC-RECEIVER'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ PART 3 of 6] as to Notice of Removal #1 Filed filed by Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2013: #1 Notice of Removal Part 3A) (mg).
February 7, 2013 Filing 2 FDIC-RECEIVER'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ PART 2 of 6] as to Notice of Removal #1 Filed filed by Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. (et) (mg).
February 7, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [PART 1 of 6] from Superior Court of CA for the County of Los Angeles, case number BC459627 with NO CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge S. James Otero, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID. ), filed by Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. (et) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Potter et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert De Vico
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gordon
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melba Hopwood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Truong
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Maxwell
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Flemington
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Hildreth
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bland
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Weisskopf
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Miller
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith Campbell
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis O Dorisio
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Shropshire
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Bauer
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Castillo
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Jacinto Villas
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Grant
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Iriberri
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew Abraham
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Genrich Wolfe
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Ford
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pram-Held Mongthu
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efren Duarte
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valera Smith
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Ramirez
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romelia Magnetti
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Randall
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Fichtenberg
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Kinard
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Cameron
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Zulema Herrera
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Scott Newton
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosita Panes
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Amalia Shiotsugu
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Baird
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Mobley
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Michalak
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cox
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gumersindo Castaneda
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Woolem
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judea Ellorin
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hermina Adame
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patria Jalandoni
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis McKinney
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennett Meltzer
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Truong Tran
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fausto Mancilla
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosario Perez
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Reyes
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Morales
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hedy Magna
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Hassemer
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Averill Stanley
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Wahl
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis F Beame
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lee Dawson
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Domingo
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Pico-Beltran
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Borks
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janie Warschaw
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verden Fernandes
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arida Indhasiri
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Willoughby
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dyvan Srey
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Cabrera
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiomara Milette
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Gatrell
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernnie Huggins
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester Campbell
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Dority
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig White
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Jalandoni
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Rosales
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Kooyman
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serrano Brooks
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Young
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fariba Maghoui
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simona Bakker
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresita Bitanga
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Maldonado
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alain Michael
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gila Sabet
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Everts
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magg Hernandez
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Collins
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geronimo Zarate
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Rendon
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Scott
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbur Steele
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladimir Miskevich
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Herrera
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Curtis
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ferles
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Placido Urioste
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rigoberto Canales
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Borks
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Mastromonico
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Haenny
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Rodriguez
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilio Perito
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Thomas
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Martino
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Jordan
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Montelongo
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ortiz
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Zuniga
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Perez
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Litaun Lewis
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Castro
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Dupre
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elias Fuentes
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Carrillo
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Djuanique Slaughter
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Jordan
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia Velazquez
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Perez
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Saunders
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Badiei
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prescilla Weaver
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karie Wasinack
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zenaida Bersamira
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Verastica De Ojeda
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Paragas
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Ferris
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Hildreth
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Collins
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Harry Tavoularis
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Hernandez
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Guillo
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hattie Perry
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moses Mortazavi
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Leen
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Estrada
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Clark
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy Standerfer
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura McPheeters
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelio Acosta
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Tuan Tran
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalva Encizo
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Ezekiel
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Garcia
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Kowal
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidel Covarrubias
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Nahlen
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nhu-Thuan Nguyen
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Soto
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Ramos
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Kooyman
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Drury
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candy Ross
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Dury
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Le
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Weisz
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristina Reyes
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Glaszko
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorena Martin
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Wahl
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Ellorin, Jr
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randal Dorman
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Thomas
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Rivera
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdullah Aslami
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie Greenleaf
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Rosa Castaneda
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Bacon
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Petros
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Collier
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Bauer
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Nahlen
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pete Castillo
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chor Chun Ngan
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Fox
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bennett
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Harris
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Caruth Johnson
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenepe Villegas
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle Herod
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Lewis
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramiro Devila
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Madrid Mora
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Lim
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Waters
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polly McKinney
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Lamb
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Garcia
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Potter
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francesca Bravos
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Navarro
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariam Javadzadeh
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Heavner
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Davalos
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Cruz Cabrera Maldonado
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasey Dority
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amadita De La Garza
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Jennings
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Fuentes
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Holland
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Anusiem
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Baird
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odette Nayrouz
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Razo
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Man
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Hassemer
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri O Rourke
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lucio
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yun Park
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Weisz
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosana Desoto
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Lyons
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Ojeda
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maybelle Rivera
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Wise
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madonna Gionta
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stirling Hale
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ada Cheung
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Cox
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Kowal
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rigoberto Carbajal
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitra Bagherian Aliabad
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pertch Toukhladjian
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agustin Perez
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Herod
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Lynn Klein
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Fernandez
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Navarro
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Represented By: Deron Colby
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers</