Cacique Inc v. Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cacique Inc
Defendant: Does 1-10 inclusive and Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv01018
Filed: February 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jay C Gandhi
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2014 Filing 171 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 consent judgment) (lc)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION ORDER as to defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC and its agents by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, (see document for specifics) Related to: Stipulation for Judgment #169 . ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (lc)
March 25, 2014 Filing 169 STIPULATION for Judgment as to Consent Judgment filed by Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction Order)(Loomis, C)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. The Court hereby ORDERS the parties TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing no later than Tuesday, March 25, 2014, why settlement has not been finalized. (bp)
February 21, 2014 Filing 166 NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Cacique Inc. (Leader, Jon)
February 20, 2014 Filing 168 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi: The parties and their counsel appeared for the Settlement Conference. The Court confidentially caucused with the parties and their counsel. The parties reached a resolution pursuant to a written settlement agreement. The parties are reminded that all discussions are deemed confidential settlement communications. Court Recorder: CS 2/20/14. (bem)
February 20, 2014 Filing 165 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion Related Document, #159 , Motion Related Document, #160 . pdfs are proposed orders. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected.Proposed orders are to be submitted as a separate attachments to a main document. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
February 19, 2014 Filing 164 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) and (#2) to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiff Experts David W. Stewart and John T. Crissey filed by Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. Motion set for hearing on 2/24/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Reynaldo's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Opinion and Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert David W. Stewart, #2 Proposed Order Granting Reynaldo's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Opinion and Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert John T. Crissey, #3 Declaration of C. Dennis Loomis, #4 Exhibit A to Loomis Declaration, #5 Exhibit B to Loomis Declaration, #6 Exhibit C to Loomis Declaration)(Loomis, C)
February 19, 2014 Filing 163 COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED, the Motions in Limine hearing set on February 24, 2014 is hereby ADVANCED to 1:30pm. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi: The parties (including officer-level principals) and their lead trial counsel shall appear for a Settlement Conference on February 20, 2014 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 827-A of the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, 8th Floor, Los Angeles, California 90012. The Judge's settlement conference mirrors the traditional, comprehensive mediation and the parties shall prepare accordingly. No later than 4:00 p.m. on February 19, 2014, each party shall submit a confidential statement (or email) directly to the chambers of the Court at jay_gandhi@cacd.uscourts.gov. (See Order for details) (bem)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO FILE MOTIONS IN LIMINE UNDER SEAL #158 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II . (lc). Modified on 2/19/2014. (lc).
February 18, 2014 Filing 160 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING REYNALDOS MEXICAN FOOD COMPANY, LLCS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE OPINION AND TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERT DAVID W. STEWART re APPLICATION for Order for to file motions in limine and supporting declarations and exhibits under seal #158 filed by Counter Claimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC, Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (Loomis, C)
February 18, 2014 Filing 159 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING REYNALDOS MEXICAN FOOD COMPANY, LLCS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE OPINION AND TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERT JOHN T. CRISSEY re APPLICATION for Order for to file motions in limine and supporting declarations and exhibits under seal #158 filed by Counter Claimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC, Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (Loomis, C)
February 18, 2014 Filing 158 APPLICATION for Order for to file motions in limine and supporting declarations and exhibits under seal filed by Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. Application set for hearing on 2/24/2014 at 02:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Loomis, C)
February 18, 2014 Filing 157 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC of 1) Defendant's Motions in Limine Nos. 1 and 2 to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiff's Experts David W. Stewart and John T. Crissey; and 2) Supporting Declaration of C. Dennis Loomis with exhibits. (Loomis, C)
February 18, 2014 Filing 156 MINUTES OF Pretrial Conference held before Judge Otis D. Wright, II:. Case called and counsel state their appearances. Ms. Tobin informed the Court that the Motions in Limine will be filed by the close of business today. The parties motioned the Court for the Magistrate Court to conduct a Settlement Hearing. The Court sets a status conference for Friday, February 21, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Debi Reed. (bp)
February 14, 2014 Filing 155 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated set) filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC.. (Loomis, C)
February 14, 2014 Filing 154 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Disputed set) filed by plaintiff Cacique Inc.. (Leader, Jon)
February 13, 2014 Filing 153 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated set) filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC.. (Loomis, C)
February 12, 2014 Filing 152 Joint PRETRIAL STIPULATION regarding Exhibits . (Leader, Jon)
February 10, 2014 Filing 151 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (Loomis, C)
February 10, 2014 Filing 150 Witness List filed by JOINT WITNESS LIST - Plaintiff Cacique Inc.. (Leader, Jon)
February 10, 2014 Filing 149 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Cacique Inc, Counter Defendant Cacique Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Pretrial Conference Order)(Leader, Jon)
February 10, 2014 Filing 148 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc. (Leader, Jon)
February 10, 2014 Filing 147 STATUS REPORT SETTLEMENT STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc, Counter Defendant Cacique Inc. (Leader, Jon)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TRADEMARK/TRADE DRESS CLAIMS #64 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc). Modified on 2/10/2014. (lc). Modified on 2/10/2014 (lc).
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER GRANTING CACIQUES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTERCLAIM #41 AND DENYING REYNALDOS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTERCLAIM(ECF no.75 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc). Modified on 2/7/2014 (lc).
January 27, 2014 Filing 141 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Otis D. Wright, II: RE MOTION for Summary Judgment #41 , #64 and docket entry # 75. Case called, no appearances. The Court hears oral argument from counsel.The matter stands submitted. An order will issue.Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lc)
January 27, 2014 Filing 140 DECLARATION of Donna A. Tobin in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Trademark/Trade Dress Claims #64 as required by 1/22/14 Order filed by Counter Claimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Loomis, C)
January 24, 2014 Filing 144 SEALED DOCUMENT -EXHIBIT B RE CARDENAS DEPOSITION(lc)
January 24, 2014 Filing 143 SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT A TO MORGAN DEPOSITION (lc)
January 24, 2014 Filing 142 SEALED DOCUMENT-CORRECTED SECOND DECLARATION OF DONNA A. TOBIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTERCLAIM (lc)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER GRANTING REYNALDOS MEXICAN FOOD COMPANY, LLCS APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CORRECTED DONNA TOBIN DECLARATION UNDER SEAL #137 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) Modified on 1/24/2014 (lc).
January 23, 2014 Filing 138 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Counter Claimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. correcting Reply (Motion related), #123 re Second Declaration of Donna A. Tobin in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim (Loomis, C)
January 23, 2014 Filing 137 APPLICATION for Order for to File Under Seal Corrected Second Declaration of Donna A. Tobin in support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim filed by Counterclaimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. Application set for hearing on 1/27/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Loomis, C)
January 23, 2014 Filing 136 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC of Corrected Second Declaration of Donna A. Tobin in support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim. (Loomis, C)
January 22, 2014 Filing 135 DECLARATION of Jon M. Leader in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Trademark/Trade Dress Claims #64 Supplemental Declaration of Jon M. Leader per 1/22/14 Order filed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Leader, Jon)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER RE. SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATIONS ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ASTO TRADEMARK/TRADE DRESS CLAIMS WITH THE FOLLOWING EXHIBITS ATTACHED (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFICS) #64 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:The supplemental declarations are due by Monday, January 27, 2014, before the hearing on this Motion. The parties are encouraged to submit this material sooner, if possible. The supplemental declarations should be electronically filed ont he docket. Paper courtesy copies are required, and the declarations and attached exhibits should also be emailed to ODW_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lc)
January 16, 2014 Filing 133 NOTICE of Change of address by C Dennis Loomis attorney for Counter Claimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. Changing attorneys address to 11601 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1400, Los Angeles, CA 90025-0509. Filed by Counter Claimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (Loomis, C)
January 10, 2014 Filing 132 Objection to Plaintiff's Late-Filed Reply in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Counterclaim in opposition to re: APPLICATION for Order for granting Application to File Under Seal Cacique's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim and Supporting Declaration of Jon M. Leader #103 filed by Counter Claimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (Loomis, C)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER GRANTING REYNALDOS MEXICAN FOOD COMPANY, LLCS #126 APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PLEADINGS UNDER SEAL by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
January 6, 2014 Filing 131 SEALED DOCUMENT-DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTERCLAIM(lc)
January 6, 2014 Filing 130 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF C. DENNIS LOOMIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTERCLAIM.(lc)
January 6, 2014 Filing 129 SEALED DOCUMENT-SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF DONNA A TOBIN IN OPPOSITION TOPLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTERCLAIM(lc)
January 6, 2014 Filing 127 REPLY in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment #41 Sur-Reply filed by Counter Defendant Cacique Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gilbert B. de Cardenas, Jr., #2 Declaration of Jon M. Leader, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jon M. Leader)(Leader, Jon)
January 3, 2014 Filing 126 APPLICATION for Order for to File Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim filed by Counterclaimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. Application set for hearing on 1/27/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Loomis, C)
January 3, 2014 Filing 125 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC of Reynaldo's Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim; Reynaldo's Supporting Declarations in support of Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim. (Loomis, C)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATES ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF Nos. 41, 64, 75.)The Court hereby CONTINUES the hearing dates until Monday, January 27, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. This continuance has no effect on the deadlines set for filing papers associated with these Motions.In addition, the remaining dates in the Scheduling and Case Management Order are adjusted as follows: Lodge Pretrial Conference Order and Pretrial Exhibit Stipulation as well as all other Pretrial Conference Documents: February 10, 2014. Final Pretrial Conference: February 18, 2014 2:30pm. File Motions in Limine, Proposed Voir Dire Questions and Agreed-To Statement of Case: February 18, 2014. Hearing on Motions in Limine: February 24, 2014 2:30 p.m. File Final Trial Exhibit Stipulation :February 27, 2014:. Trial: March 4, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. (lc)
December 30, 2013 Filing 123 REPLY MOTION for Summary Judgment #75 filed by Counter Claimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC, Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Second Declaration of Donna A. Tobin in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit A to the Second Declaration of Donna A Tobin in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Loomis, C)
December 30, 2013 Filing 122 STATEMENT of Response to Alleged Statement of Uncontroverted Facts MOTION for Summary Judgment #75 filed by Counter Claimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC, Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (Loomis, C)
December 30, 2013 Filing 121 STATEMENT of Response to Cacique, Inc's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Trademark/Trade Dress Claims #64 filed by Counter Claimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC, Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (Loomis, C)
December 30, 2013 Filing 120 REPLY MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Trademark/Trade Dress Claims #64 filed by Counter Claimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC, Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of C. Dennis Loomis in Support of Reply on Motion For Summary Judgment on Trademark - Trade Dress Claims, #2 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 2) to Declaration of C. Dennis Loomis in Support of Reply on Motion For Summary Judgment on Trademark - Trade Dress Claims, #3 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 2) to Declaration of C. Dennis Loomis in Support of Reply on Motion For Summary Judgment on Trademark - Trade Dress Claims, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of C. Dennis Loomis in Support of Reply on Motion For Summary Judgment on Trademark - Trade Dress Claims, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of C. Dennis Loomis in Support of Reply on Motion For Summary Judgment on Trademark - Trade Dress Claims, #6 Declaration Second Declaration of Donna A. Tobin in Support Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Trademark and Trade Dress Claims, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Donna A. Tobin, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B to Second Declaration of Donna A. Tobin)(Loomis, C)
December 27, 2013 Filing 119 STATEMENT of Genuine Issues of Material Fact and Statement of Uncontroverted Material Facts in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Trademark/Trade Dress Claims #64 filed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc. (Leader, Jon)
December 27, 2013 Filing 118 DECLARATION of Professor David Stewart, Ph.D in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Trademark/Trade Dress Claims #64 filed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Leader, Jon)
December 27, 2013 Filing 117 OPPOSITION in opposition re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Trademark/Trade Dress Claims #64 ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc. (Leader, Jon)
December 27, 2013 Filing 116 SEALED DOCUMENT-SUPPORTING DECLARATION JON M LEADER, ESQ. RE CACIQUE'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTER CLAIM.(lc)
December 27, 2013 Filing 115 SEALED DOCUMENT-CACIQUES REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE COUNTERCLAIM (lc)
December 27, 2013 Filing 114 SEALED DOCUMENT-CACIQUE, INC.S STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES OF MATERIAL FACT AND STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO REYNALDO'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTERCLAIM (lc)
December 27, 2013 Filing 113 SEALED DOCUMENT-SUPPORTING DECLARATIONS OF GILBERT B. DE CARDENAS, JR., TIRSO IGLESIAS III, JON KMETT, AND JON M. LEADER, ESQ. RE CACIQUE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTER CLAIM. (lc)
December 27, 2013 Filing 112 SEALED DOCUMENT- CACIQUES OPPOSITION TO REYNALDOS MEXICAN FOOD COMPANY, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTERCLAIM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES.(lc)
December 27, 2013 Filing 111 SEALED DOCUMENT-ORDER GRANTING CACIQUE INC.S LR 79-5.1 APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL ITS OPPOSITION TO REYNALDOS MEXICAN FOOD COMPANY, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTERCLAIM. (lc)
December 27, 2013 Filing 110 SEALED DOCUMENT-SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF JON LEADER ESQ RE CACIQUE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTERCLAIM. (lc)
December 27, 2013 Filing 109 SEALED DOCUMENT-CACIQUES REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE COUNTERCLAIM (lc)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER DENYING CACIQUE INC.S LR 79-5.1 APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEALITS OPPOSITION TO REYNALDOS MEXICAN FOOD COMPANY, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE TRADEMARK / TRADE DRESS #98 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, (lc)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF CACIQUES APPLICATION TO FILE OPPOSITION UNDER SEAL #98 AND ORDER UNSEALING DEFENDANT REYNALDOS MEXICANS STATEMENT OFUNCONTROVERTED FACTS #87 by Judge Otis D. Wright, I:(1) Caciques Application to File Opposition to Reynaldos Motion for Summary Judgment on Trademark/Trade Dress Under Seal is DENIED. (ECF No. 98.) (2) The Courts Order sealing Reynaldos Mexicans Corrected Statement of Uncontroverted Facts is VACATED. (ECF No. 88.) (3) Reynaldos Mexicans Corrected Statement of Uncontroverted Facts shall be UNSEALED by the clerk of the court. (ECF No. 87.) (lc). Modified on 12/27/2013 .(lc).
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING CACIQUE INC.S LR 79-5.1 APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL ITS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTERCLAIM #103 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
December 26, 2013 Filing 105 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff/counter-defendant Cacique Inc, Notice of Manual Filing; Application to File Under Seal with proposed Order; Under Seal Cacique's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim and Supporting Declaration of Jon M. Leader, Esq.; Cacique's Objections to Evidence Submitted by Defendant/Counter-claimant in Opposition to Cacique's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim served on December 26, 2013. (Leader, Jon)
December 26, 2013 Filing 104 OBJECTION in support of re: MOTION for Summary Judgment #41 Cacique's Objections to Evidence Submitted by Reynaldo's in Opposition to Cacique's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc. (Leader, Jon)
December 26, 2013 Filing 103 APPLICATION for Order for granting Application to File Under Seal Cacique's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim and Supporting Declaration of Jon M. Leader filed by plaintiff/counter-defendant Cacique Inc. Application set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leader, Jon)
December 26, 2013 Filing 102 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc of Cacique's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment re Counterclaim; Supporting Declaration of Jon M. Leader. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Service)(Leader, Jon)
December 26, 2013 Filing 101 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: plaintiffs Miscellaneous Document #98 , Miscellaneous Document #94 . pdfs are applications to file under seal. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Application: order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
December 23, 2013 Filing 100 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff/counter-defendant Cacique Inc, Notice of Manual Filing; Cacique's Application to File Under Seal and proposed Order; Under Seal Cacique's Opposition to Reynaldo's Motion for Summary Judgment on Trademark/Trade Dress Claims and supporting documents served on December 23, 2013. (Leader, Jon)
December 23, 2013 Filing 99 OBJECTIONS IN OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Trademark/Trade Dress Claims #64 Cacique's Objections to Evidence Submitted by Reynaldo's in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment on Trademark / Trade Dress Claims filed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc. (Leader, Jon)
December 23, 2013 Filing 98 Cacique's LR 79-5.1 Application to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Reynaldo's Motion for Summary Judgment on Trademark / Trade Dress, and supporting documents (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leader, Jon)
December 23, 2013 Filing 97 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc of Cacique's Opposition to Reynaldo's Motion For Summary Judgment on Trademark / Trade Dress and supporting documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Leader, Jon)
December 23, 2013 Filing 96 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff/counter-defendant Cacique Inc, Application to File Under Seal; Notice of Manual Filing; Under Seal Caique's Opposition to Reynaldo's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim and supporting documents served on December 23, 2013. (Leader, Jon)
December 23, 2013 Filing 95 OBJECTIONS in OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Summary Judgment #75 Cacique's Objections to Evidence Submitted in support of Reynaldo's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc. (Leader, Jon)
December 23, 2013 Filing 94 Cacique's Application to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Reynaldo's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim and Supporting Documents filed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leader, Jon)
December 23, 2013 Filing 93 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc of Cacique's Opposition to Reynaldo's Mexican Food Company's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim; Supporting Declarations; and Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact. (Leader, Jon)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER DENYING #84 Cacique Inc Ex parte application for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Motions for Summary Judgment Or, In the Alternative, to Strike Motions by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER RE COURTESY COPIES FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court hereby ORDERS the parties to submit courtesy copies by Friday, December 20, 2013 at 12 p.m. of all papers and supporting documents that have been filed so far in the pending Motions for Summary Judgment. The Court expects that courtesy copies will submitted in a timely fashion for all future filings. (lc)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING #86 APPLICATION PURSUANT TO LR 79-5.1 BY DEFENDANT AN DCOUNTERCLAIMANT REYNALDOS MEXICAN FOOD COMPANY, LLC TO FILE CORRECTED STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW UNDER SEAL by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) Modified on 12/27/2013 (lc). (VACATED PER 12/27/13 ORDER)
December 18, 2013 Filing 87 CORRRECTED STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW OF REYNALDO'S MEXICAN FOOD COMPANY, LLC IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT(lc) Modified on 12/27/2013 (lc). (UNSEALED PER 12/27/13 ORDER)
December 18, 2013 Filing 86 APPLICATION for Order for to File Corrected Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law Under Seal filed by Counterclaimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. Application set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Loomis, C)
December 18, 2013 Filing 85 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC of Corrected Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. (Loomis, C)
December 17, 2013 Filing 92 SEALED DOCUMENT- SUPPORTING DECLARATION of Jennie de Cardenas filed Under Seal.(mat)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING CACIQUE INC.'S L.R. 79-5.1 APPLICATION TO FILE SUPPORTING DECLARATION AND EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi: It is HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Application is GRANTED; 2. The Declaration of Jennie de Cardenas and its Exhibit in support of Cacique's ex parte Application for Protective Order shall be filed under seal; and 3. Defendant and Counter-claimant Reynaldo's Mexican Food Company, LLC and any interested member of the public may challenge the sealing of these documents. (See Order for details) granting #59 Application for Order (bem)
December 17, 2013 Filing 84 EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Motions for Summary Judgment Or, In the Alternative, to Strike Motions filed by Plaintiff/Counter-defendant Cacique Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jon M. Leader, #3 Proposed Order)(Leader, Jon)
December 17, 2013 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Trademark/Trade Dress Claims #64 filed by Counter Claimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC, Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (Loomis, C)
December 17, 2013 Filing 82 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Counter Claimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC, Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. correcting MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Trademark/Trade Dress Claims #64 Attachment 1 (Loomis, C)
December 17, 2013 Filing 81 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 1 (#2) (Attachments: #1 part 2)(lc) Modified on 12/17/2013 (lc).
December 17, 2013 Filing 80 SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBT 1 (lc)
December 17, 2013 Filing 79 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF BRYAN BLOOM IN SUPPORT OF REYNALDOS MEXICAN FOOD COMPANY LLC MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTCLAIM. (lc)
December 17, 2013 Filing 78 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Donna A. Tobin in Support of Reynaldo's Mexican Food Company, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim. (mat)
December 17, 2013 Filing 77 SEALED DOCUMENT- STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS of Law in Support of Reynaldo's Mexican Food Company, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim. (mat)
December 17, 2013 Filing 76 SEALED DOCUMENT- DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim. (mat)
December 17, 2013 Filing 75 SEALED DOCUMENT- DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim. (mat)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that the document entitled STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts, filed on December 17, 2013, docket number 68 was filed incorrectly. Therefore, said document is ordered STRICKEN from the docket and the clerks office shall seal the document. (lc)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING AGREED APPLICATION PURSUANT TO LR 79-5.1 BY COUNTERCLAIMANTREYNALDOS MEXICAN FOOD COMPANY, LLC TO FILE ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARYJUDGMENT ON COUNTERCLAIM AND SUPPORTING PAPERS UNDER SEAL by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
December 17, 2013 Filing 72 SEALED DOCUMENT-AGREED APPLICATION PURSUANT TO LR 79-5.1 BY COUNTERCLAIMANT REYNALDOS MEXICAN FOOD COMPANY, LLC TO FILE ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTERCLAIM AND SUPPORTING PAPERS UNDER SEAL. (lc)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATIONS by Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi: The Court has studied Plaintiff Cacique's ex parte application for a protective order regarding the depositions of Gilbert L. de Cardenas, Sr. and Jennie de Cardenas. The Court has also studied the ex parte application of Defendant Reynaldo's Mexican Food Co. authorizing certain designated representatives to have restricted access to records and testimony that Plaintiff has labeled as "confidential." Both applications are DENIED. (See Order for details)denying #55 #57 #59 #61 (bem)
December 17, 2013 Filing 70 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION for Order for on Motion for Summary Judgment #65 . Pdf is Not a motion, but the proposed statement of decision and was erroneously set for hearing. Note clerk has termed the erroneous hearing. The proposed statement of decision should have been submitted as a separate attachment to a main document. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
December 17, 2013 Filing 69 OPPOSITION in OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Authorizing Designated Representatives to Have Restricted Access to Records and Testimony that Plaintiff has Labelled Confidential #61 filed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jon M. Leader, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jon M. Leader, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jon M. Leader, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Jon M. Leader, #5 Declaration of Gildbert B de Cardenas, Jr.)(Leader, Jon)
December 17, 2013 Filing 68 SEALED DOCUMENT-STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS. (SEALED AND STRICKEN PER 12/17/13 MINUTE ORDER (lc).
December 17, 2013 Filing 67 DECLARATION of Linda Fischer in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Trademark/Trade Dress Claims #64 filed by Counter Claimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Loomis, C)
December 17, 2013 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Donna A. Tobin in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Trademark/Trade Dress Claims #64 filed by Counter Claimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Exhibit C-D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F)(Loomis, C)
December 17, 2013 Filing 65 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Counterclaimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Loomis, C)
December 16, 2013 Filing 64 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Trademark/Trade Dress Claims filed by Counterclaimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Loomis, C)
December 16, 2013 Filing 63 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC of Application to File Under Seal Reynaldo's Mexican Food Company, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Reynaldo's Mexican Food Company, LLC's Application to File its Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order re Reynaldo's Mexican Food Company, LLC's Application to File Under Seal, #3 Declaration of Service)(Loomis, C)
December 16, 2013 Filing 62 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for random reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read CV13-01018 ODW (JCGx). (dro)
December 15, 2013 Filing 61 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Authorizing Designated Representatives to Have Restricted Access to Records and Testimony that Plaintiff has Labelled Confidential filed by Defendant/Counterclaimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan Bloom in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Authorizing Designated Representatives to Have Restricted Access to Records and Testimony that Plaintiff has Labelled Confidential, #2 Declaration of Donna A. Tobin in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Authorizing Designated Representatives to Have Restricted Access to Records and Testimony that Plaintiff has Labelled Confidential, #3 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Order Authorizing Designated Representatives to Have Restricted Access to Records and Testimony that Plaintiff has Labelled Confidential)(Loomis, C)
December 14, 2013 Filing 60 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order Regarding Depositions of Gilbert L. de Cardenas, Sr. and Jennie de Cardenas OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for Regarding Depositions of Gilbert L. de Cardenas, Sr. and Jennie de Cardenas #55 filed by Counter Claimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC, Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Donna A. Tobin in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Protective Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration of Donna A. Tobin in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Protective Order)(Loomis, C)
December 13, 2013 Filing 59 APPLICATION for Order for to File Under Seal the Declaration of Jennie de Cardenas in Support of Cacique Inc.'s Ex Parte Application for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff/Counter-defendant Cacique Inc. Application set for hearing on 12/16/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leader, Jon)
December 13, 2013 Filing 58 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff/Counter-defendant Cacique Inc. Declaration of Service of Application to File Supporting Declaration and Exhibit of Jennie de Cardenas in Support of Ex Parte Application for Protective Order Under Seal (Leader, Jon)
December 13, 2013 Filing 57 APPLICATION for Order for to File Under Seal the Declaration of Jennie de Cardenas in Support of Ex Parte Application for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff/Counter-defendant Cacique Inc. Application set for hearing on 12/16/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leader, Jon)
December 13, 2013 Filing 56 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc of Declaration of Jennie de Cardenas with Exhibit In Support of Cacique, Inc.'s ex parte Application for Protective Order Regarding Depositions of Gilbert L. de Cardenas, Sr. and Jennie de Cardenas. (Leader, Jon)
December 13, 2013 Filing 55 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for Regarding Depositions of Gilbert L. de Cardenas, Sr. and Jennie de Cardenas filed by plaintiff/counter-defendant Cacique Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Notice per L.R. 7-19.1, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #3 Declaration Under Seal - of Jennie de Cardenas, #4 Proposed Order)(Leader, Jon)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RELIEF UNDER RULE 56(d) #47 AND CONTINUING HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: 1) Reynaldos shall have until December 27, 2013, to conduct thedepositions of Gilbert B. Cardenas, Tirso Iglesias III, and Jon M. Kmett. 2) In light of those depositions, Reynaldos may file and serve aSupplemental Brief in Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment The Supplemental Brief shall not exceed 10 pages and must be filed no later than Friday, January 3, 2014 at 5 p.m.3) Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Cacique, Inc. (Cacique) may also file a brief Sur-Reply. The Sur-Reply shall not exceed 5 pages and must be filed no later than Monday January 6, 2014 at 5 p.m.Because the Court has granted the ex parte application, the Court finds that theJanuary 6, 2014 hearing date is not feasible. Accordingly, the Court herebyCONTINUES the hearing date on Caciques Motion for Summary Judgment toMonday, January 13, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. (lc)
December 12, 2013 Filing 53 OPPOSITION opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Under Rule 56(d) (1) To Conduct Discovery to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, and (2) To File Supplemental Opposition to Motion by Date Certain #47 filed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jon M. Leader, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Leader, Jon)
December 12, 2013 Filing 52 SEALED DOCUMENT-REYNALDOS MEXICAN FOOD COMPANY, LLCS CORRECTED RESPONSE TO CACIQUE, INC.S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTERCLAIM. (lc)
December 12, 2013 Filing 47 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Under Rule 56(d) (1) To Conduct Discovery to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, and (2) To File Supplemental Opposition to Motion by Date Certain filed by Plaintiff Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Reynaldo's Mexican Food Company, LLC's Ex Parte Application for Relief Under Rule 56(d))(Loomis, C)
December 11, 2013 Filing 51 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Donna A Tobin in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim. (Attachments: Part 1, Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
December 11, 2013 Filing 50 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Bryan Bloom in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim. (Attachments: EXHIBIT 1, EXHIBIT 2, EXHIBIT 3)(mat)
December 11, 2013 Filing 49 SEALED DOCUMENT- REYNALDO'S MEXICAN FOOD COMPANY LLC'S RESPONSE TO CACIQUE, INC.'S Separate Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim. (mat)
December 11, 2013 Filing 48 SEALED DOCUMENT- DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2013: #1 SEALED DOCUMENT- LODGED DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION DEYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) (mat).
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING REYNALDO'S MEXICAN FOOD COMPANY, LLC'S LR 79-5.1 APPLICATION TO FILE ITS OPPOSITION TO CACIQUE, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTERCLAIM, STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES DISPUTES, AND SUPPORTING DECLARATIONS UNDER SEAL by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The Application is GRANTED; Reynaldo's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, Supporting Declarations, and Separate Statement shall be filed under seal; Plaintiff and Counter-defendant Cacique, Inc. and any interested Member of the public may challenge the sealing of these documents. #45 Application to Seal (bp)
December 11, 2013 Filing 45 REYNALDO'S MEXICAN FOOD COMPANY, LLC'S LR 79-5.1 AGREED APPLICATION TO FILE ITS OPPOSITION TO CACIQUE, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE COUNTERCLAIM, STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES, AND SUPPORTING DECLARATION UNDER SEAL filed by Defendants Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (bp)
December 9, 2013 Filing 44 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC of Defendant's Application to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, with declarations and related papers; 2) Defendant's Summary Judgment Opposition and related papers; 3) [Proposed] Order to File Under Seal; 4) [Proposed] Order for Rule 56(d) Relief. (Attachments: #1 Application to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order re Reynaldo's Mexican Food Company, LLC's Application to File Under Seal, #3 Certificate of Service)(Loomis, C)
December 3, 2013 Filing 39 NOTICE New Hearing Date of January 6, 2014 at 1:30 a.m. for Cacique, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff/Counter-defendant Cacique Inc. (Leader, Jon)
December 3, 2013 Filing 38 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff/Counter-defendant Cacique Inc, re APPLICATION for Order for Application to File Under Seal Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents #37 with copies of Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents served on December 2, 2013. (Leader, Jon)
December 3, 2013 Filing 37 APPLICATION for Order for Application to File Under Seal Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents filed by Plaintiff/Counter-defendant Cacique Inc. Application set for hearing on 1/6/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leader, Jon)
December 2, 2013 Filing 43 SEALED DOCUMENT-CACIQUE, INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTERCLAIM(lc)
December 2, 2013 Filing 42 SEALED DOCUMENT-SUPPORTING DECLARATIONS OF GILBERT DE CARDENAS, JR., TIRSO IGLESIAS III, JON KMETT, JON M. LEADER, ESQ. RE CACIQUE, INC.'S MOTIONFOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTER CLAIM(lc)
December 2, 2013 Filing 41 SEALED DOCUMENT-CACIQUES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RECOUNTERCLAIM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (lc)
December 2, 2013 Filing 40 SEALED DOCUMENT-ORDER GRANTING CACIQUE INC.S LR 79-5.1 APPLICATION TO FILE ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTERCLAM, SUPPORTING DECLARATIONS, AND SEPARATESTATEMENT UNDER SEAL. (lc)
December 2, 2013 Filing 36 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Defendant Cacique Inc of Application to File Under Seal Cacique, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Cacique, Inc.'s Application to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order re Cacique, Inc.'s Application to File Under Seal, #3 Declaration Declaration of Service)(Leader, Jon)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, re Stipulation #34 The discovery cut-off date set forth in the Scheduling Order in this action is hereby extended from December 2, 2013 to December 20, 2013, for the purpose of taking currently noticed fact and expert depositions only. All other dates and deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order remain unchanged. (lc)
November 27, 2013 Filing 34 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to December 20, 2013 filed by Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Dennis Loomis In Support of Joint Application Pursuant to Stipulation to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to December 20, 2013 to Accommodate Mediation, #2 Proposed Order Extending Discovery Cut-Off Date to December 20, 2013 to Accommodate Mediation)(Loomis, C)
September 25, 2013 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lisa I Damji counsel for Counter Claimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. Adding C. Dennis Loomis as attorney as counsel of record for Reynaldo's Mexican Food Company, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Reynaldo's Mexican Food Company, LLC. (Damji, Lisa)
September 25, 2013 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sara B Poster counsel for Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. Sara B. Poster is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Reynaldo's Mexican Food Company, LLC. (Poster, Sara)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING STIPULATED APPLICATION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO AMEND PLEADINGS OR ADD PARTIES #30 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (cch)
September 23, 2013 Filing 30 First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Amended Pleadings or Add Parties filed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leader, Jon)
June 24, 2013 Filing 29 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Initial Disclosures filed by Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC (Damji, Lisa)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. (lc)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright II: THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. SEE THE LAST PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR THE SPECIFIED DATES. Jury trial: 3/4/14 9:00 AM; File final trial exhibit stipulation: 2/27/14; hearing on motions in limine: 2/24/14 2:30 PM; Final Pretrial Conference: 2/10/14 2:30 PM; motions in limine, proposed voir dire questions and proposed voir dire questions and agreed to statement of case: 2/10/14; lodged Pretrial conference order and pretrial exhibit stipulation, file contentions of fact and law, exhibit and witness lists, status report regarding settlement, agreed upon set of instructions and verdict forms, joint statement regarding disputed instructions verdicts etc: 2/3/14; last day for hearing motions: 1/13/14; last date to conduct settlement conference: 1/6/14; discovery cutoff: 12/2/13; last date to amend pleadings or add parties: 9/23/14. (lc)
June 17, 2013 Filing 26 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc.. (Leader, Jon)
May 13, 2013 Filing 25 CACIQUE'S ANSWER TO REYNALDO'S COUNTERCLAIM filed by Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Cacique Inc.(Leader, Jon)
May 8, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE filed by plaintiff Cacique Inc. of Order Setting Scheduling Conference for July 1, 2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leader, Jon)
April 24, 2013 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Sara B Poster counsel for Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. Adding Sara B. Poster as attorney as counsel of record for Reynaldo's Mexican Food Company, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Reynaldo's Mexican Food Company, LLC (Poster, Sara)
April 23, 2013 Filing 23 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT A to Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim. (mat)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: granting #18 defendant Application to file settlement agreement under seal. (lc)
April 22, 2013 Filing 20 Amended Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC, identifying The Huff Alternative Fund, L.P., The Huff Alternative Parallel Fund, L.P., Huff Hispanic Food Holdings, L.L.C., Reynaldo's Holding Corp., WRH Partners II, L.L.C.. (Damji, Lisa)
April 18, 2013 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 , COUNTERCLAIM against Cacique Inc, Does; Jury Demand filed by defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC.(lc) (lc).
April 17, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #13 . PDF is a combined answer and Counterclaim. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event and Incorrect procedure selected. Per L.R. 3-2 Attorneys are NOT TO E-FILE INITIATING DOCUMENTS*, but toMANUALLY FILE IT WITH CIVIL INTAKE. AFTERWHICH, EMAIL WITHIN 24HOURS the conformed filed stamped PDF image to :CivilIntakeCourtDocs-LA@cacd.uscourts.gov In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
April 16, 2013 Filing 18 APPLICATION TO FILE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT UNDER SEAL filed by defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (lc)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 7/1/13 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
April 16, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC of Settlement Agreement. (Damji, Lisa)
April 16, 2013 Filing 14 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC, identifying The Huff Alternative Fund LP. (Damji, Lisa)
April 16, 2013 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 with JURY DEMAND Defendant Reynaldo's Mexican Food Company, LLC's Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC.(Damji, Lisa)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING #11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 30, 2013 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
April 12, 2013 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 30, 2013 re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Damji, Lisa)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: granting #9 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Donna Tobin on behalf of defendant, designating Lisa Damji as local counsel. (ak)
March 15, 2013 Filing 9 APPLICATION for attorney Donna Tobin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by defenant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. Lodged Prop order. (ak).
March 13, 2013 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC answer now due 4/15/2013, re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC.(Damji, Lisa)
March 13, 2013 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc, upon Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC served on 2/22/2013, answer due 3/15/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Leader, Jon)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. ( SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION). (lc)
February 12, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 12, 2013 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Cacique Inc. (et)
February 12, 2013 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc. (et) (mg).
February 12, 2013 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc. (et) (mg).
February 12, 2013 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendant Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. (et)
February 12, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10 inclusive, Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC. Case assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Cacique Inc.(et) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cacique Inc v. Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynaldos Mexican Food Company LLC
Represented By: Sara B Poster
Represented By: Donna A Tobin
Represented By: C Dennis Loomis
Represented By: Lisa I Carteen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cacique Inc
Represented By: Jon M Leader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?