Kathleen Angel Einsenberg v. Citibank NA et al

Defendant: Citibank NA, Does, Homeward Residential Inc and Power Default Services Inc
Plaintiff: Kathleen Angel Einsenberg
Case Number: 2:2013cv01814
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Presiding Judge: Christina A. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2016 129 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISSOLVE OR MODIFY THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Christina A. Snyder: On 2/8/2013, Kathleen Eisenberg filed the instant action in Los Angeles County Superior Court. On 2/25/2013, the Superior C ourt held a hearing regarding the issuance of a preliminary injunction. The Superior Court issued a preliminary injunction against defendants enjoining them from foreclosing upon the Property during the pendency of this action. On 3/13/2013, defendan ts removed the case to this Court. Defendants' motion to dissolve the preliminary injunction 118 is GRANTED. The preliminary injunction will be dissolved on 12/19/2016. If plaintiff can cure the default on her loan before that date, plaintiff may make a new request for a preliminary injunction at which time the Court may reconsider what amount of security is appropriate. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
October 31, 2016 121 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder RE: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 109 . Defendants motion to dismiss plaintiff's first and third claims for relief is GRANTED. Plaintiff's counsel shall confer with plai ntiff and file a declaration no later than ten days from the issuance of this order explaining whether or not the foregoing defects can be cured. Thereafter, if plaintiff contends that the foregoing defects can be cured, the SAC shall be dismissed wi thout prejudice and plaintiff is granted an additional ten days leave in which to file a Third Amended Complaint. If plaintiff determines that the foregoing defects cannot be cured, then plaintiff's SAC shall be dismissed with prejudice. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
July 25, 2016 101 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: On 6/29/2016, plaintiff filed the instant Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification, Reconsideration, and/or Leave to Amend 93 . In this motion, plaintiff requests that the Court clarify whether it s dismissal of the FAC was with or without leave to amend. Alternatively, to the extent the Court did not grant leave to amend, plaintiff requests that the Court reconsider its ruling and grant plaintiff leave to file a Second Amended Complaint. In d ismissing the FAC, the Court intended to provide plaintiff with leave to file an amended complaint. Accordingly, the Court hereby grants plaintiff 30 days in which to file an amended complaint addressing the deficiencies identified in the Court's order dismissing the FAC. Plaintiff's motion for clarification and/or reconsideration is DENIED AS MOOT. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
June 15, 2016 89 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - MOTION TO DISMISS CASE (Docket # 25 , filed May 29, 2013), APPLICATION TO REMAND (Docket # 14 , filed April 8, 2013) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: In accordance with the foregoing, defendants motion to dismiss is hereby gra nted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs claims for rescission and plaintiffs UCL claim are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Otherwise, defendants motion is denied. Additionally, plaintiffs motion to remand the case is denied. IT IS SO ORDERED. (clee)
April 15, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Proceedings: Motion to Dismiss Case 3 , filed 3/15/2013 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: plaintiff's complaint is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff must file an amended complaint addressing the deficiencies identified herein by May 13, 2013. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action with prejudice. (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kathleen Angel Einsenberg v. Citibank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank NA
Represented By: Nicole S Dunn
Represented By: T Robert Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeward Residential Inc
Represented By: Nicole S Dunn
Represented By: T Robert Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Default Services Inc
Represented By: Nicole S Dunn
Represented By: T Robert Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Angel Einsenberg
Represented By: Mark E Goodfriend
Represented By: Rachel Shannon Ruttenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?