Rupa Marya v. Warner Chappell Music Inc Featured Case

Happy Birthday song is ruled to be in the Public Domain

Plaintiff: Rupa Marya
Defendant: Warner Chappell Music Inc
Case Number: 2:2013cv04460
Filed: June 20, 2013
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: George H. King
Referring Judge: Michael R. Wilner
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2016 375 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (bm)
August 30, 2016 374 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS REOPENING/CLOSING by Judge George H. King: Case should have been closed on entry dated 6/30/16. JS-6 (bm)
August 25, 2016 373 [REDACTED] RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' STATEMENT REGARDING CLASS COUNSEL'S BILLING RECORDS filed by Plaintiffs. Filed Pursuant to Dkt. 372 (pso)
August 25, 2016 372 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re: Sealing Plaintiffs' Unredacted Response Brief (Dkt. 364) by Judge George H. King: On August 16, 2016, we ordered Plaintiffs to state whether their unredacted response brief regarding class counsel's billing records should be filed under seal and, if so, to provide a redacted version of the brief to be filed publicly. (See Dkt. 369.) Plaintiffs request that their unredacted response be filed under seal and have provided a redacted version. (Dkt. 371.) We DIRECT the clerk to seal the unredacted response, (Dkt. 364), and to file Plaintiffs' redacted version, (Dkt. 371, Ex. A), publicly. (bm)
August 17, 2016 371 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegelto Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, 369 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Manifold, Betsy)
August 16, 2016 370 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order re: Award of Attorneys' Fees by Judge George H. King granting 323 MOTION for Attorney Fees: We GRANT Plaintiffs' fee request and award class counsel $4,620,000.00. (see document for further details) (bm)
August 16, 2016 369 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order re: Application to File Unredacted Reply Brief Under Seal (Dkt. 365) by Judge George H. King granting 365 APPLICATION to Seal Document: We GRANT the request. Within ten days hereof, Plaintiffs SHALL state whether their response brief, (Dkt. 364), should be filed under seal and, if so, provide a redacted version of the brief to be filed publicly. Failing this, it shall be deemed Plaintiffs' position that Defendants' unredacted response and reply briefs regarding the billing records, (Dkts. 354, 366), need not be filed under seal. In that case, those briefs will be unsealed. (see document for further details) (bm)
July 21, 2016 368 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. correcting Sealed Document, 366 , APPLICATION to file document Defendants' Application To File Unredacted Reply Brief Regarding Response To Class Counsel's Billing Records Under Seal under seal 365 (Klaus, Kelly)
July 20, 2016 367 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc, re Sealed Document, 366 served on 07/19/2016. (Klaus, Kelly)
July 19, 2016 366 SEALED DOCUMENT Defendants' [Unredacted] Reply Brief Regarding Response To Class Counsel's Billing Records re APPLICATION to file document Defendants' Application To File Unredacted Reply Brief Regarding Response To Class Counsel's Billing Records Under Seal under seal 365 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, 334 filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc.(Klaus, Kelly)
July 19, 2016 365 APPLICATION to file document Defendants' Application To File Unredacted Reply Brief Regarding Response To Class Counsel's Billing Records Under Seal under seal filed by Defendant Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Defendants [Redacted] Reply Brief Regarding Response To Class Counsels Billing Records, # 3 Declaration of Kelly Klaus in Support of Application)(Klaus, Kelly)
July 12, 2016 364 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and for Incentive Compensation Awards; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 323 Response to Defendants' Statement Regarding Class Counsel's Billing Records [354-1] filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dina Perez, # 2 Declaration of Marc L. Godino)(Manifold, Betsy)
July 12, 2016 363 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice (Other) 352 by Clerk. The document is accepted as filed. (lom)
July 12, 2016 362 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc, re Sealed Document, 361 served on 07/11/16. (Klaus, Kelly)
July 11, 2016 361 SEALED DOCUMENT Defendants' Unredacted Response to Class Counsel's Billling Records and Exhibits 1-5 re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, 357 , APPLICATION to file document Defendants' Response to Class Counsel's Billing Records and Exhibits 1-5 under seal 353 filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc.(Klaus, Kelly)
July 8, 2016 360 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) 352 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Errata. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom)
July 8, 2016 359 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings MONDAY, JUNE 27, 2016 9:34 A.M. re Transcript 358 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Nirenberg, C) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 8, 2016 358 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on MONDAY, JUNE 27, 2016 9:34 A.M. Court Reporter: C. NIRENBERG, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Court Reporter: C. NIRENBERG, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com, or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2016. (Nirenberg, C)
July 6, 2016 357 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO FILE RESPONSE TO CLASS COUNSEL'S BILLING RECORDS UNDER SEAL 353 by Judge George H. King: granting 353 APPLICATION to Seal Document. The following documents shall hereby be filed under seal: Defendants' Unredacted and Under Seal Response to Class Counsel's Billing Records and Exhibits 1-5 thereto. (lom)
July 6, 2016 356 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc, re Sealed Document,, 354 served on 07/05/2016. (Klaus, Kelly)
July 6, 2016 355 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re: Response to Class Counsel's Billing Records (Dkt. 351) by Judge George H. King: On July 5, 2016, Defendants filed the above-captioned Response. (Dkt. 351.) Although Defendants intended to file part of the Response under seal, they did not do so. (See Dkt. 352.) Defendants filed a notice of errata, explaining that they would refile the Response as intended, which they have now done. They request that we remove the inadvertently filed Response from the docket. We GRANT the request and direct the Clerk to strike Docket No. 351. (bm)
July 5, 2016 354 SEALED DOCUMENT Defendants' [Unredacted] Response to Class Counsel's Billing Records re APPLICATION to file document Defendants' Response to Class Counsel's Billing Records and Exhibits 1-5 under seal 353 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, 334 filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Defendants' [Unredacted] Response to Class Counsel's Billing Records)(Klaus, Kelly)
July 5, 2016 353 APPLICATION to file document Defendants' Response to Class Counsel's Billing Records and Exhibits 1-5 under seal filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Defendants' [Redacted] Response to Class Counsel's Billing Records, # 3 Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus in support of Application)(Klaus, Kelly)
July 5, 2016 352 NOTICE filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. of Errata Regarding Dkt. No. 351 (Klaus, Kelly)
July 5, 2016 351 DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN, see document no. 355 - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to file document /Defendants' Notice Of Filing Of Response To Class Counsels Billing Records under seal filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Unredacted Exhibit B Pursuant To Order Of The Court Dated June 10, 2016 Dkt. 334), # 2 Unredacted Document Unredacted Exhibits 1-5 to Exhibit B Pursuant To Order Of The Court Dated June 10, 2016 Dkt. 334))(Klaus, Kelly) Modified on 7/13/2016 (lom).
June 30, 2016 350 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order re: Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. 247) by Judge George H. King finding as moot 247 MOTION for Reconsideration: In light of the Court's final approval of the settlement of this matter, Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration, (Dkt. 247), is DENIED as moot. (bm)
June 30, 2016 349 Featured Case FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT by Judge George H. King (bm)
June 30, 2016 348 TEXT ENTRY ONLY: Counsel hereby notified that the minute order reflecting the hearing on June 27, 2016 has been updated on the Court's docket with the correct date. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ab) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 27, 2016 347 MINUTES OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT [DOCUMENT 322]; MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS [DOCUMENT 323] Hearing held before Judge George H. King: Case called. The Court discusses with counsel the motion for final approval of class settlement. The Court is satisfied with the motion and the showing made therein. No class members are present with any oppositions or objections to the settlement. The Court approves the settlement as fair, reasonable and adequate, after having considered all relevant factors. Parties are ORDERED to send a Word version of the final proposed order approving the settlement. Court and counsel engage in colloquy regarding the motion for attorney's fees. Defendant's counsel withdraws all objections to costs. The Court, having heard from the parties, ORDERS defendant to file any objections to plaintiffs' records by July 5, 2016. Plaintiffs shall respond by July 12, 2016, and defendant may file a reply by July 19, 2016. The Court will take the matter under submission thereafter. Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg. (bm) (Main Document 347 replaced on 6/30/2016) (ab). Modified on 6/30/2016 (ab).
June 24, 2016 346 NOTICE /Defendants' Notice of Filing of Statement Pursuant to Dkt. 334, Regarding Class Counsel's Billing Records filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Exhibit A - Defendants' [Redacted] Statement, Pursuant to Dkt. 334, Regarding Class Counsel's Billing Records, # 2 Unredacted Document POS to Defendants' [Unredacted] Statement, Pursuant to Dkt. 334, Regarding Class Counsel's Billing Records)(Klaus, Kelly)
June 24, 2016 345 SEALED DOCUMENT /Defendants' Notice of Filing of Statement Pursuant to Dkt. 334, Regarding Class Counsel's Billing Records re Notice of Under Seal Filing 337 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, 334 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and for Incentive Compensation Awards; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 323 filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Exhibit A - Defendants' [Redacted] Statement, Pursuant to Dkt. 334, Regarding Class Counsel's Billing Records, # 2 Unredacted Document Exhibit B - Defendants' [Unredacted] Statement, Pursuant to Dkt. 334, Regarding Class Counsel's Billing Records, # 3 Unredacted Document POS to Defendants' [Unredacted] Statement, Pursuant to Dkt. 334, Regarding Class Counsel's Billing Records)(Klaus, Kelly)
June 24, 2016 344 Featured Case ORDER ON INTERVENERS' UNOPPOSED MOTION REQUESTING LEAVE TO BE EXCUSED FROM APPEARING by Judge George H. King granting 343 MOTION: After considering the Unopposed Motion filed by Interveners, the Association for Childhood Education International and The Hill Foundation, Inc., the Court grants the Motion. Interveners are excused from appearing at the hearing scheduled for June 27, 2016. In the event that the Court deems it necessary, the Court will call Interveners counsel at (410) 347-9425 and, if unavailable at that number, then (443) 347-9449. (bm)
June 21, 2016 343 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to to be Excused from Appeaing at the 6-27-16 Hearing UNOPPOSED MOTION REQUESTING LEAVE FOR INTERVENERS TO BE EXCUSED FROM APPEARING filed by Interveners The Association for Childhood Education International, The Hill Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Interveners' Unopposed Motion Requesting Leave to be Excused from Appearing) (Luskin, Scott)
June 21, 2016 342 DECLARATION of Norman Swett [Revised Second Supplemental Declaration of Norman Swett] In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof
June 21, 2016 341 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. correcting Declaration (Motion related),, 340 (Manifold, Betsy)
June 20, 2016 340 DECLARATION of Norman Swett [Second Supplemental Declaration of Norman Swett] In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof
June 17, 2016 339 DECLARATION of Omel A. Nieves in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and for Incentive Compensation Awards; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 323 Revised Declaration of Omel A. Nieves in Support of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Request for Attorneys' Fees filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
June 17, 2016 338 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. correcting Declaration (Motion related),,, 330 (Manifold, Betsy)
June 17, 2016 337 NOTICE of Under Seal Filing filed Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel (Manifold, Betsy)
June 17, 2016 336 SEALED DOCUMENT [Unredacted] Notice of Filing of Requested Time Sheets Under Seal in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and for Incentive Compensation Awards; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 323 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, 334 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel.(Manifold, Betsy)
June 13, 2016 335 REPLY in Further Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and for Incentive Compensation Awards; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 323 Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Counsel's Request for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark C. Rifkin, # 2 Declaration of Randall S. Newman, # 3 Declaration of Robert Brauneis, # 4 Declaration of Daniel J. Schacht)(Manifold, Betsy)
June 10, 2016 334 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re: Submission of Time Sheets by Judge George H. King: On April 27, 2016, Plaintiffs' counsel filed a Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and for Incentive Compensation Awards. (Dkt. 323.) While Plaintiffs' counsel submitted cursory summaries of the time they expended on this action, they did not submit full time sheets. In order to conduct a complete lodestar cross-check, we require the full time sheets. Plaintiffs' counsel SHALL file the time sheets under seal, serve Defense counsel, and deliver mandatory chambers copies by no later than close of business on Friday, June 17, 2016. Plaintiffs' counsel may redact the time sheets as necessary to protect privileged communications, but the unredacted versions must be sufficient for Defendants to state a position and the Court to make its determination. (bm)
June 1, 2016 333 Featured Case ORDER EXTENDING CLAIMS DEADLINE FOR CERTAIN SETTLEMENT CLASS MEMBERS by Judge George H. King, re Stipulation 331 : Pursuant to the May 27, 2016 Stipulation by the Parties and good cause appearing therefore, the Court hereby orders that the deadline for the 48 foreign rights societies on Exhibit A to the Stipulation to submit Claims is extended by 27 days, until June 24, 2016. Except as specifically modified herein for the 48 foreign rights societies, all dates and deadlines established by the Court's March 7, 2016 Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement remain unaffected and unchanged. (bm)
May 27, 2016 332 In Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and for Incentive Compensation Awards; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 323 /Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Award Of Attorneys' Fees And Expenses filed by Defendant Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Kelly M. Klaus In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Award Of Attorneys' Fees And Expenses, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Award Of Attorneys' Fees And Expenses, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Award Of Attorneys' Fees And Expenses, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Award Of Attorneys' Fees And Expenses, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Award Of Attorneys' Fees And Expenses)(Klaus, Kelly)
May 27, 2016 331 STIPULATION for Order Extending Claims Deadline for Certain Settlement Class Members filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rickert, Rachele)
May 26, 2016 330 DECLARATION of Omel A. Nieves in Support of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Request for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof
May 24, 2016 329 SCHEDULING NOTICE. In light of the above case having settled the Court Trial set for May 31, 2016 is VACATED. By Chief Judge George H. King THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 27, 2016 328 DECLARATION of Robert Siegel in Support of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Request for Incentive Compensation Award NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof
April 27, 2016 327 DECLARATION of Rupa Marya in Support of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Request for Incentive Compensation Award NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof
April 27, 2016 326 DECLARATION of James Chressanthis in Support of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Request for Incentive Compensation Award NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof
April 27, 2016 325 DECLARATION of Jennifer Nelson in Support of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Request for Incentive Compensation Award NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof
April 27, 2016 324 DECLARATION of Mark C. Rifkin in Support of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Request for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof
April 27, 2016 323 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and for Incentive Compensation Awards; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. Motion set for hearing on 6/27/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Randall S. Newman, # 2 Declaration of Daniel J. Schacht, # 3 Declaration of Kara M. Wolke, # 4 Proposed Order) (Manifold, Betsy)
April 27, 2016 322 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. Motion set for hearing on 6/27/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Norman Swett, # 2 Proposed Order) (Manifold, Betsy)
April 25, 2016 321 NOTICE of Change of firm name and address by Randall Scott Newman attorney for Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. Changing firm name to Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP and address to 270 Madison Avenue, New York, NY 10016. Filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attorney Randall Scott Newman added to party Good Morning to You Productions Corp(pty:pla), Attorney Randall Scott Newman added to party Majar Productions LLC(pty:pla))(Newman, Randall)
April 12, 2016 320 NOTICE of Change of address by Scott O Luskin attorney for Intervenor Plaintiffs The Association for Childhood Education International, The Hill Foundation, Inc.. Changing attorneys address to 1100 Glendon Avenue, Suite 1250, Los Angeles, CA 90024 - T. (310) 689-1750 - F. (310) 689-1755. Filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs The Association for Childhood Education International, The Hill Foundation, Inc.. (Luskin, Scott)
March 11, 2016 319 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings MONDAY, FEBRUARY 29, 2016 9:33 A.M. re Transcript 318 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Nirenberg, C) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 11, 2016 318 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on MONDAY, FEBRUARY 29, 2016 9:33 A.M. Official Court Reporter: C. NIRENBERG, CONTACT: www.msfedreporter.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Official Court Reporter: C. NIRENBERG, CONTACT: www.msfedreporter.com, or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/1/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2016. (Nirenberg, C)
March 9, 2016 317 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Chief Judge George H. King: [Proposed] Revised Order 313 Document is STRICKEN. PROPOSED ORDER SHOULD BE FILED AS A "NOTICE OF LODGING" AND ATTACH THE PROPOSED ORDER TO THE NOTICE. (dgon)
March 7, 2016 316 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge George H. King granting 301 MOTION for Settlement: A Final Approval Hearing shall be held before this Court on June 27, 2016 at 9:30 A.M. The Court also sets the following dates and deadlines: (see document for further details). (bm)
March 7, 2016 315 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: [Proposed] Revised Order 313 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below The correct event is: Notices-Notice of Lodging. Other: A stand-alone proposed order should be e-filed by submitting a Notice of Lodging with the separate, additional attachment of the proposed order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
March 4, 2016 314 NOTICE of Additional Signature Page to Revised Class Action Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
March 3, 2016 313 ***STRICKEN ON 03/09/2016*** [PROPOSED] REVISED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 301 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Manifold, Betsy) Modified on 3/10/2016 (dgon).
March 3, 2016 312 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Revised Class Action Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Manifold, Betsy)
February 29, 2016 311 MINUTES OF MOTION BY PLAINTIFFS FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT [DOC NO.301] Hearing held before Judge George H. King: Matter called. Counsel for the respective parties are present. The Court directs the parties to submit a revised settlement agreement with changes and/or revisions as indicated on the record. Counsel shall provide a WORD version of the proposed long form and short form notice to the Court as soon as possible. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (bm)
February 26, 2016 310 SEALED DOCUMENT Confidential Supplemental Agreement re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, 307 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel.(Manifold, Betsy)
February 26, 2016 309 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Redacted] Notice of Lodging of Requested in Camera Submission Under Seal in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, 307 (Manifold, Betsy)
February 26, 2016 308 Featured Case ORDER ON INTERVENORS STIPULATION by Judge George H. King, re Stipulation for Hearing 306 : NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. After considering the unopposed stipulation filed by Intervenors Association for Childhood Education International and The Hill Foundation, Inc., the Court grants the stipulation. No appearance by intervenors necesarry. (bm)
February 26, 2016 307 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re: Confidential Supplemental Agreement by Judge George H. King: In the materials submitted in support of Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement, the Parties state that they have entered into a Confidential Supplemental Agreement. (See Dkt. 302, Settlement Agreement 9.1.) We cannot fully evaluate the fairness of the settlement without examining the Confidential Supplemental Agreement. The Parties are hereby ORDERED to lodge a copy of the Confidential Supplemental Agreement in camera forthwith. (bm)
February 26, 2016 306 STIPULATION for Hearing re Motions Hearing regarding the Preliminary Approval of the Class Action - STIPULATION FOR INTERVERNERS TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY PHONE filed by Interveners The Association for Childhood Education International, The Hill Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Luskin, Scott)
February 23, 2016 305 DECLARATION of Tiffaney Janowicz in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 301 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Manifold, Betsy)
February 17, 2016 304 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Betsy C Manifold counsel for Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. Beth A. Landes will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp., et al. (Manifold, Betsy)
February 10, 2016 303 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION RE: LATE FILING OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL; CONTINUANCE OF STAY AND REQUEST TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING DATE AND by Judge George H. King, re Stipulation 300 : Pursuant to stipulation by the parties, the Declaration of Betsy C. Manifold, and good cause appearing therefor, the Court hereby orders the following: 1. As good cause exists for the delay of one court day in filing, Plaintiffs are permitted to file the attached Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; 2. Plaintiffs shall file the Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement no later than one court day after entry of this Court's order; 3. As the Court wishes to move this matter forward without delay and the Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval is unopposed, the date for hearing this Motion shall be shortened to February 29, 2016; and 4. Pending the hearing and Courts determination of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, stay of this action shall be continued except as necessary to implement the settlement. (bm)
February 8, 2016 302 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Class Action Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Manifold, Betsy)
February 8, 2016 301 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. Motion set for hearing on 3/14/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark C. Rifkin, # 2 Declaration of Daniel R. Roche, # 3 Declaration of James Chressanthis, # 4 Declaration of Rupa Marya, # 5 Declaration of Jennifer Nelson, # 6 Declaration of Robert Siegel, # 7 Proposed Order) (Manifold, Betsy)
February 8, 2016 300 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval, Joint STIPULATION to Continue Stay, Joint STIPULATION to Expedite Hearing Date filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Betsy C. Manifold, # 2 Proposed Order)(Manifold, Betsy)
January 29, 2016 299 Featured Case ORDER EXTENDING STAY OF ALL PROCEEDINGS by Judge George H. King, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File, 298 : Pursuant to stipulation by the parties and good cause appearing therefor, the Court hereby extends the stay of all proceedings in this matter until February 8, 2016. The Plaintiffs shall file the Motion for Preliminary Approval by February 5, 2016. (bm)
January 28, 2016 298 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation Extending Stay of All Proceedings filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rickert, Rachele)
January 5, 2016 297 SUPPLEMENT to APPLICATION for attorney Leonice A. Wurst to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) 284 filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs The Association for Childhood Education International, The Hill Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Luskin, Scott)
December 29, 2015 296 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS 286 RE: Application to appear Pro Hac Vice 284 by Clerk of Court. Counsel to adhere to the rules and procedures of the Court and provide certificates from the State bar for each of the States in which the applicant is a member pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3 (DE). (bm)
December 22, 2015 295 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re: Stay of Proceedings by Judge George H. King: Having considered this request, we hereby STAY all proceedings in this matter until February 1, 2016. We will consider extending the stay upon receipt of the preliminary approval motion. (see document for further details) (bm)
December 18, 2015 294 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Pursuant to December 8, 2015 Order (Dkt. 290) filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
December 14, 2015 293 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge George H. King: granting 282 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven E. Tiller on behalf of The Association for Childhood Education International and The Hill Foundation, Inc., designating Scott O. Luskin as local counsel. (lt)
December 14, 2015 292 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION for attorney Steven E. Tiller to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) 282 by Judge George H. King. The document is accepted as filed. (dgon)
December 9, 2015 291 FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc amending Amended Complaint, 95 , filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel, Majar Productions LLC(Manifold, Betsy)
December 8, 2015 290 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re: Joint Status Report Regarding Settlement by Judge George H. King: The Court has been advised that the PartiesPlaintiffs, Defendants, and the Intervenorshave agreed to settle this case. Based on this development, the Court orders as follows: 1. The Parties are relieved from filing trial briefs and the joint exhibit list. 2. The bench trial set for Tuesday, December 15, 2015 is hereby VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. No appearance is required at that time. 3. Within ten days hereof, counsel SHALL file a joint status report setting forth the Parties' proposed steps, and timing of those steps, to effectuate the settlement. (bm)
December 7, 2015 289 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend and File Fifth Amended Complaint (Dkt. 258) by Judge George H. King: Having weighed the factors relevant to determining whether to grant leave to amend, and in view of Rule 15(a)'s liberal amendment policy, we hereby GRANT Plaintiffs' Motion. Plaintiffs shall file the Fifth Amended Complaint within seven days hereof. Defendants shall respond to the complaint within thirty days thereafter. (see document for further details) (bm)
December 7, 2015 288 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) re: Motion to Intervene (Dkt. 266) by Judge George H. King granting 266 MOTION to Intervene: Having considered all the relevant factors under both Rule 24(a) and (b), Applicants' Motion is hereby GRANTED. (see document for further details) (bm)
December 4, 2015 287 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge George H. King: granting 284 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Leonice A. Wurst on behalf of Movant The Association for Childhood Education International and The Hill Foundation, Inc., designating Scott O. Luskin as local counsel. (lt)
December 3, 2015 286 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Leonice A. Wurst to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) 284 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: The applicant failed to provide certificates from the state bar for each of the States in which the applicant is a member of that particular bar. See LR 83-2.1.3.3 (DE). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
December 3, 2015 285 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge George H. King. On the court's own motion, The Association for Childhood Education International and The Hill Foundation, Inc's motion to Intervene 266 , noticed for hearing on DECEMBER 7, 2015, is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR and will be taken UNDER SUBMISSION without oral argument on that date pursuant to Local Rule 7-15. No appearance by counsel shall be necessary. The hearing date is vacated. Further briefing, if any, shall be filed in accordance with Local Rules as if the noticed hearing date had not been vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
December 2, 2015 284 APPLICATION for attorney Leonice A. Wurst to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Applicants The Association for Childhood Education International, The Hill Foundation, Inc.. Application set for hearing on 12/7/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Luskin, Scott)
November 30, 2015 283 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Steven E. Tiller to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) 282 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: The applicant failed to provide certificates from the state bar for each of the States in which the applicant is a member of that particular bar. See LR 83-2.1.3.3 (DC); Fee not paid. See LR 83-2.1.3.3 (c). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
November 30, 2015 282 APPLICATION for attorney Steven E. Tiller to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Applicant The Association for Childhood Education International, The Hill Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Luskin, Scott)
November 25, 2015 281 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. King: On the court's own motion, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint 258 , noticed for hearing on NOVEMBER 30, 2015, is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR and will be taken UNDER SUBMISSION without oral argument on that date pursuant to Local Rule 7-15. No appearance by counsel shall be necessary. The hearing date is vacated. Further briefing, if any, shall be filed in accordance with Local Rules as if the noticed hearing date had not been vacated. (bm)
November 25, 2015 280 SCHEDULING NOTICE Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint 258 set for hearing 11/30/15 is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR by Chief Judge George H. King THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 23, 2015 279 DECLARATION of Robert Siegel in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Motion for Leave to Amend and File Fifth Amended Complaint re Reply (Motion related), 270 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
November 23, 2015 278 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PLAINTIFF ROBERT SIEGEL'S DECLARATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF REPLY TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND FILE FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge George H. King granting 277 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File: HAVING FOUND GOOD CAUSE APPEARING in plaintiffs Good Morning To You Productions Corp., Robert Siegel, Rupa Marya, and Majar Productions, LLC's ("Plaintiffs") Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Robert Siegel's Declaration in Further Support of Reply to Motion for Leave to Amend and File Fifth Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application is GRANTED, as follows: 1. The declaration of Robert Siegel previously lodged with the Court shall be e-filed within one (1) court day of the entry of this Order. (bm)
November 19, 2015 277 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Declaration of Plaintiff Robert Siegel in Further Support of Reply to Motion for Leave to Amend and File Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Manifold Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application) (Manifold, Betsy)
November 13, 2015 276 STATUS REPORT (Joint) Regarding Settlement Discussions filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Klaus, Kelly)
November 13, 2015 275 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene [UNOPPOSED] 266 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
November 12, 2015 274 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge George H. King taking under submission 247 MOTION for Reconsideration: On the court's own motion, Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration Order re: Summary Judgment or, Alternatively to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal 247 , noticed for hearing on NOVEMBER 16, 2015, is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR and will be taken UNDER SUBMISSION without oral argument on that date pursuant to Local Rule 7-15. No appearance by counsel shall be necessary. The hearing date is vacated. Further briefing, if any, shall be filed in accordance with Local Rules as if the noticed hearing date had not been vacated. (bm)
November 12, 2015 273 DECLARATION of Rupa Marya in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Amended Complaint, 95 Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend and File Fifth Amended Complaint 258 Declaration of Rupa Marya in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Motion for Leave to Amend and File Fifth Amended Compalint filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
November 12, 2015 272 DECLARATION of James Chressanthis in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Amended Complaint, 95 Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend and File Fifth Amended Complaint 258 Declaration of James Chressanthis in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Motion for Leave to Amend and File Fifth Amended Compalint filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
November 12, 2015 271 OBJECTIONS to Request for Judicial Notice,, 265 Objections to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
November 12, 2015 270 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Amended Complaint, 95 Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend and File Fifth Amended Complaint 258 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
November 10, 2015 269 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings MONDAY, OCTOBER 19, 2015 9:39 A.M. re Transcript 268 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Nirenberg, C) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 10, 2015 268 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on MONDAY, OCTOBER 19, 2015 9:39 A.M. Court Reporter: C. NIRENBERG, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Court Reporter: C. NIRENBERG, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com, or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/11/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2016. (Nirenberg, C)
November 9, 2015 267 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Intervenor The Association for Childhood Education International, The Hill Foundation, Inc., (Luskin, Scott)
November 9, 2015 266 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene [UNOPPOSED] filed by Plaintiff Intervenor The Association for Childhood Education International, The Hill Foundation, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/7/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 4 Proposed Order on UnopposedMotion to Intervene) (Attorney Scott O Luskin added to party The Association for Childhood Education International(pty:intvp), Attorney Scott O Luskin added to party The Hill Foundation, Inc.(pty:intvp)) (Luskin, Scott)
November 9, 2015 265 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Amended Complaint, 95 Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend and File Fifth Amended Complaint 258 /Defendants Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Leave To Amend And File Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To Amend And File Fifth Amended Complaint)(Klaus, Kelly)
November 9, 2015 264 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Amended Complaint, 95 Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend and File Fifth Amended Complaint 258 /Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To Amend And File Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To Amend And File Fifth Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration Of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To Amend And File Fifth Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration Of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To Amend And File Fifth Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration Of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To Amend And File Fifth Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration Of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To Amend And File Fifth Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration Of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To Amend And File Fifth Amended Complaint, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration Of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To Amend And File Fifth Amended Complaint, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration Of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To Amend And File Fifth Amended Complaint, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration Of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To Amend And File Fifth Amended Complaint, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration Of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To Amend And File Fifth Amended Complaint, # 11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration Of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To Amend And File Fifth Amended Complaint, # 12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration Of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To Amend And File Fifth Amended Complaint)(Klaus, Kelly)
November 5, 2015 263 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, Order on Motion for Leave,,, Order on Motion for Consideration,,,,, 244 247 , Response in Support of Motion,, 261 /Defendants' Notice of Errata Regarding Citations In DKT Nos. 247 and 261 (Klaus, Kelly)
November 2, 2015 262 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION RE: (1) SHORTENED BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND FILE FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT AND (2) DEFENDANTS' RULE 12(b) MOTION by Judge George H. King. The Court GRANTS the relief sought therein and hereby enters the following Order: 1. The briefing schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend and File 6 Fifth Amended Complaint shall be as follows: Motion: October 29, 2015; Opposition: November 9, 2015; Reply: November 12, 2015. 2. The Court will notify the parties by separate Order if the Court decides to have a hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend and File Fifth Amended Complaint 258 , and if so, the date and time of such hearing. Alternatively, the Court may decide to Order that Motion submitted without a hearing. 3. Within 10 days of the Court's ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend and File Fifth Amended Complaint, Defendants may file a Motion to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint or Fifth Amended Complaint (whichever may be the operative complaint). (See attached document for details.) (lom)
November 2, 2015 261 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, Order on Motion for Leave,,, Order on Motion for Consideration,,,,, 244 247 /DEFENDANTS' REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION 1 FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURTS MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DKT. NO. 244) OR, ALTERNATIVELY, 2 TO CERTIFY ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Klaus, Kelly)
October 29, 2015 260 Joint STIPULATION to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend and File Fifth Amended Complaint and Defendants' Rule 12(b) Motion; Declaration of Betsy C. Manifold in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Manifold, Betsy)
October 29, 2015 259 DECLARATION of Betsy C. Manifold in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Amended Complaint, 95 Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend and File Fifth Amended Complaint 258 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Manifold, Betsy)
October 29, 2015 258 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Amended Complaint, 95 Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend and File Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. Motion set for hearing on 11/30/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Manifold, Betsy)
October 28, 2015 257 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel Court Reporter. Court will contact Windy Loritsch at loritsch@whafh.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 10/19/2015 Status Conference. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Manifold, Betsy)
October 28, 2015 256 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: REQUEST for Leave to file Brief of Amicus Curiae National Music Publishers Association 253 by Judge George H. King. Document is hereby STRICKEN. Counsel to adhere to the rules of the Court when e-filing. If parties are requesting a hearing date the document should be e-filed as a motion. (dgon)
October 27, 2015 255 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Request of National Music Publishers' Association for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Rifkin, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Manifold, Betsy)
October 27, 2015 254 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request for Leave to File Brief 253 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
October 26, 2015 253 ***STRICKEN ON 10/28/2015*** REQUEST for Leave to file Brief of Amicus Curiae National Music Publishers Association filed by Amicus Curiae National Music Publishers' Association. Request set for hearing on 11/16/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Beckman-Straus, Naomi) Modified on 10/28/2015 (dgon).
October 26, 2015 252 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Amicus Curiae National Music Publishers' Association, identifying None. (Attorney Naomi Elana Beckman-Straus added to party National Music Publishers' Association(pty:am))(Beckman-Straus, Naomi)
October 26, 2015 251 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Memorandum and Order re Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, to Certify Order for Immediate Interlocutory Appeal filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
October 26, 2015 250 STATUS REPORT /CORRECTED JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE PARTIES' POSITIONS AS TO SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Klaus, Kelly)
October 26, 2015 249 STATUS REPORT /JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE PARTIES' POSITIONS AS TO SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Klaus, Kelly)
October 19, 2015 248 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. King: I. Settlement Conference: The Parties SHALL submit a joint status report by October 26, 2015 explaining the Parties' positions as to whether discussion of settlement at this point will be fruitful, and if so, whether the Parties desire to proceed with settlement conferences before a magistrate judge or a private mediator. II. Fifth Amended Complaint: If the Parties stipulate to the filing of a Fifth Amended Complaint ("5AC"), the Parties SHALL lodge the stipulation and the 5AC by October 26, 2015. Defendants SHALL respond to the 5AC within thirty (30) days thereafter. If the Parties cannot reach a stipulation by October 26, 2015, the Plaintiffs SHALL file a motion for leave to file a 5AC within 21 days thereafter. We will waive L.R. 7-3's standstill requirement for purposes of this motion only. We will not have an extended briefing schedule. The Parties must comply with the briefing schedule set forth in the Local Rules. III. The Remainder of Claim I: Court trial for the remainder of the Claim I issues is set for December 15, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. The Parties SHALL file a trial brief of no more than seven (7) pages on the remaining issues to be tried at least seven (7) days before the trial date. At the same time, the Parties SHALL file a witness list and a joint exhibit list of all exhibits to be used at trial and provide us with copies of those exhibits. IV. Remaining Claims: The Parties SHALL complete all discovery on Claims II through VII on or before April 19, 2016. The Parties must designate their experts by March 1, 2016 and their rebuttal experts by March 22, 2016. If these deadlines appear insufficient once we have resolved any Rule 12 motions, the Parties shall bring this to our attention at that time. We will consider amending the dates in light of the circumstances. The Parties SHALL engage in a settlement conference, or a further settlement conference if the Parties had an earlier one, by no later than April 29, 2016. Court trial on all equitable claims is for May 31, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. We will set the jury trial on the legal claims thereafter, if necessary. V. Class Certification: Plaintiffs SHALL file their class certification motion by January 18, 2016. Defendants SHALL file their opposition by February 1, 2016. Plaintiffs SHALL file their reply by February 8, 2016. We will hold a hearing on the motion on February 22, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. We will reconsider these dates if necessary after we consider the Rule 12 motions. VI. Motion for Reconsideration or for Interlocutory Appeal: Defendants' request to stay all discovery responses until the resolution of their reconsideration motion is DENIED. Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg. (bm)
October 15, 2015 247 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, Order on Motion for Leave,,, Order on Motion for Consideration,,,,, 244 filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion 1 For Reconsideration Of Courts Memorandum And Order Re Cross-Motions For Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 244) Or, Alternatively, 2 To Certify Order For Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b)) (Klaus, Kelly)
October 9, 2015 246 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Pursuant to September 29, 2015 Scheduling Order (Dkt. 245) filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Manifold, Betsy)
September 29, 2015 245 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers) Order re: Joint Status Report and Status Conference by Judge George H. King. In light of our ruling on the Parties' Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment, the Parties are hereby ORDERED, within ten (10) days hereof, to file a Joint Status Report explaining their positions on the most efficient manner for the action to proceed. We hereby SET a status conference for Monday, October 19, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel shall be present and prepared to discuss the Report. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
September 22, 2015 244 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: (1) CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 179 ; (2) DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE 223 ; and (3) PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD 224 by Judge George H. King. In light of the foregoing, Defendants' Motion is DENIED and Plaintiffs' Motion is GRANTED as set forth above. Because Summy Co. never acquired the rights to the Happy Birthday lyrics, Defendants, as Summy Co.'s purported successors-in-interest, do not own a valid copyright in the Happy Birthday lyrics. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See attached document for details.) (lom)
September 22, 2015 243 MINUTES (In Chambers) Order Re: (1) Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence 197 and (2) Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application Seeking Leave to File Response Under L.R. 7-10 239 by Judge George H. King. In light of our concurrently filed Order regarding the Parties' Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment, Plaintiffs' above-captioned motions are DENIED as moot. (lom)
August 26, 2015 242 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge George H. King taking under submission 223 MOTION: On the court's own motion, Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment 223 , noticed for hearing on AUGUST 31, 2015, is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR and will be taken UNDER SUBMISSION without oral argument on that date pursuant to Local Rule 7-15. No appearance by counsel shall be necessary. The hearing date is vacated. Further briefing, if any, shall be filed in accordance with Local Rules as if the noticed hearing date had not been vacated. (bm)
August 25, 2015 241 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Response under L.R. 7-10 239 Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Klaus, Kelly)
August 24, 2015 240 DECLARATION of Betsy C. Manifold in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Response under L.R. 7-10 239 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Manifold, Betsy)
August 24, 2015 239 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Response under L.R. 7-10 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Manifold, Betsy)
August 17, 2015 238 DECLARATION of Adam Kaplan In Support of Defendants' Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion For Leave To File Supplemental Evidence In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 223 filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A To Declaration Of Adam Kaplan ISO Defendants' Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion For Leave To File Supplemental Evidence In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit B To Declaration Of Adam Kaplan ISO Defendants' Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion For Leave To File Supplemental Evidence In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit C To Declaration Of Adam Kaplan ISO Defendants' Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion For Leave To File Supplemental Evidence In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment)(Kaplan, Adam)
August 17, 2015 237 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 223 filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Klaus, Kelly)
August 10, 2015 236 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 223 Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
August 10, 2015 235 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Notifying Parties of Rejected Ex Parte Communications by Judge George H. King: On August 7, 2015, we received two unsolicited pieces of mail related to this matter. One, attached as Exhibit A, was from a "Ms. Irene Ujda." Two, attached as Exhibit B, was from a "Professor Deborah Gerhardt." Copies of the contents of the mailings are included in the attached exhibits. The personal address of Ms. Ujda has bee redacted in accordance with L.R. 5.2-1. We did not and will not consider the contents of either mailing in relation to this case. Both have been rejected and returned to their senders. (bm)
August 7, 2015 234 STATEMENT Defendants' Statement Regarding Plaintiffs' Submission Of Supplemental Evidence With Their Reply Supporting Their Ex Parte Application filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc re: Reply (Motion related), 232 . (Klaus, Kelly)
August 5, 2015 233 DECLARATION of Betsy C. Manifold in Further Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION MOTION for Consideration of Newly Discovered Evidence "Mistakenly" Withheld by Defendants During Discovery EX PARTE APPLICATION for Summary Judgment as to First Claim for Relief 224 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Exhibit I, # 4 Exhibit J, # 5 Exhibit K, # 6 Exhibit L)(Manifold, Betsy)
August 5, 2015 232 REPLY in Further Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION MOTION for Consideration of Newly Discovered Evidence "Mistakenly" Withheld by Defendants During Discovery EX PARTE APPLICATION for Summary Judgment as to First Claim for Relief 224 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
August 4, 2015 231 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 7/29/15 re Transcript 230 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 4, 2015 230 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on July 29, 2015. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: KHOWOONSUN CHONG, phone number 213-894-3507. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/25/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2015. (kch)
July 30, 2015 228 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel Court Reporter. Court will contact Betsy C. Manifold at manifold@whafh.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 7/29/2015 Supplemental Hearing on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Manifold, Betsy)
July 30, 2015 227 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Stephaniie Ferrell at stephanie.ferrell@mto.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 7/29/15 - Oral Argument. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Kaplan, Adam)
July 29, 2015 229 MINUTES OF HEARING RE: SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT held before Judge George H. King: Matter called. Counsel for the parties are present. Counsel for plaintiff shall file its reply to the defendant's opposition to the Ex Parte Application for Consideration of Newly Discovery Evidence, filed by Plaintiff on July 27, 2015 (Dkt. No. 224) within seven (7) days hereof. Court hears oral argument of counsel on supplemental briefing. Having heard from counsel, Court takes matter UNDER SUBMISSION. Court Reporter: Khowoonsun (Koni) Chong. (bm)
July 28, 2015 226 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION MOTION for Consideration of Newly Discovered Evidence "Mistakenly" Withheld by Defendants During Discovery EX PARTE APPLICATION for Summary Judgment as to First Claim for Relief 224 filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Klaus, Kelly)
July 27, 2015 225 DECLARATION of Betsy C. Manifold in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION MOTION for Consideration of Newly Discovered Evidence "Mistakenly" Withheld by Defendants During Discovery EX PARTE APPLICATION for Summary Judgment as to First Claim for Relief 224 filed by Plaintiffs Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Manifold, Betsy)
July 27, 2015 224 EX PARTE APPLICATION MOTION for Consideration of Newly Discovered Evidence "Mistakenly" Withheld by Defendants During Discovery, EX PARTE APPLICATION for Summary Judgment as to First Claim for Relief filed by Plaintiffs Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Manifold, Betsy)
July 23, 2015 223 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration KLAUS DECLARATION ISO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A TO KLAUS DECLARATION ISO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, # 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B TO KLAUS DECLARATION ISO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, # 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT C TO KLAUS DECLARATION ISO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, # 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT D TO KLAUS DECLARATION ISO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, # 6 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) (Klaus, Kelly)
June 26, 2015 222 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING DATE SET BY DKT. NO. 220 by Chief Judge George H. King: HAVING FOUND GOOD CAUSE appearing in the parties Joint Stipulation to Continue the Hearing Date Set by Dkt. No. 220, the Court GRANTS the relief sought therein and hereby enters this order continuing the oral argument ordered by Dkt. No. 220 to Wednesday, July 29, 2015 at 9:30 A.M. (dgon)
June 24, 2015 221 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date from July 7, 2015 to July 14, 2015 Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, 220 filed by defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Klaus, Kelly)
June 18, 2015 220 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Setting Hearing Re: Supplemental Briefing by Judge George H. King: We previously continued oral argument on the Parties' Joint Supplemental Brief to a date to be determined. (Dkt. 217.) The Parties are now ORDERED to attend oral argument on Tuesday, July 7, 2015 at 9:30 A.M. (bm)
June 15, 2015 219 SUPPLEMENT to Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Declaratory Judgment 179 Joint Supplemental Brief Filed Pursuant to Dkt No. 215 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
May 29, 2015 218 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Kara M Wolke counsel for Plaintiff Majar Productions LLC. Changing Firm Name to Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP. Filed by Plaintiff Majar Productions LLC. (Wolke, Kara)
May 22, 2015 217 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING OF FURTHER BRIEFING ORDERED BY DKT. NO. 215 AND TO CONTINUE THE HEARING DATE SET BY DKT. NO. 215 by Judge George H. King, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File 216 : NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. HAVING FOUND GOOD CAUSE appearing in the parties' Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing of Further Briefing Ordered by Dkt. No. 215 and to Continue the Hearing Date Set by Dkt. No. 215, the Court GRANTS the relief sought therein and hereby enters this order (1) continuing the deadline for the parties to file the joint supplementary brief ordered by Dkt. No. 215 to Monday, June 15, 2015; and (2) continuing the oral argument ordered by Dkt. No. 215. Date to be determined. (bm)
May 19, 2015 216 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File FURTHER BRIEFING ORDERED BY DKT. NO. 215 filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Klaus, Kelly)
May 18, 2015 215 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Re: Further Briefing on Summary Judgment Motion by Judge George H. King: On March 23, 2015, we took the Parties' Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment under submission. Reviewing the record, we do not believe the Parties have adequately addressed Plaintiffs' argument that Patty Hill abandoned the copyright to the Happy Birthday to You lyrics. The issue was barely discussed at oral argument and the summary judgment briefing frequently conflates the issue with the question of whether the copyright was lost due to general publication. Accordingly, we hereby ORDER the parties to meet and confer, preferably in person, and submit a joint supplementary brief of no more than twenty-four pages (divided evenly between the Parties) on the issue of abandonment within fourteen days hereof. The Parties are further ORDERED to attend oral argument on the issue on Tuesday, June 9, 2015 at 9:30 A.M. In their joint brief, the Parties shall bear in mind the following: (see document for further details) (bm)
May 4, 2015 214 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Marc L Godino counsel for Plaintiff Majar Productions LLC. Changing firm name to Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP. Filed by Plaintiff Majar Productions LLC. (Godino, Marc)
May 4, 2015 213 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Lionel Zevi Glancy counsel for Plaintiff Majar Productions LLC. Changing firm name to Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP. Filed by Plaintiff Majar Productions LLC. (Glancy, Lionel)
April 9, 2015 212 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel Court Reporter. Court will contact Betsy C. Manifold at manifold@whafh.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: 3/23/2015. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Manifold, Betsy)
March 27, 2015 211 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. Plaintiffs' Corrected Supplemental Exhibit to Amended Joint Evidentiary Appendix in Support of Notice of Cross-Motions and Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment Filed Pursuant to Court's Dec. 5, 2014 Order [Dkt. 185] as to Exhibit (non-trial),, 210 . (Rickert, Rachele)
March 26, 2015 210 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. Plaintiffs' Supplemental Exhibit to Amended Joint Evidentiary Appendix in Support of Notice of Cross-Motions and Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment Filed Pursuant to Court's Dec. 5, 2014 Order [Dkt. 185] as to Motion Related Document,, 187 , Motion Related Document,, 193 , Motion Related Document, 188 , Motion Related Document,, 190 , Motion Related Document, 194 , Motion Related Document, 191 , Motion Related Document,, 189 , Motion Related Document, 192 . (Manifold, Betsy)
March 25, 2015 209 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings MARCH 23, 2015 9:38 A.M. re Transcript 208 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 25, 2015 208 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on MARCH 23, 2015 9:38 A.M. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: KHOWOONSUN CHONG, CSR 12907, phone number 213-894-3507. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2015. (kch)
March 23, 2015 207 MINUTES OF Motion re: CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [DOCUMENT 179]; MOTION BY PLAINTIFF TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE [DOCUMENT 197] Hearing held before Judge George H. King: The Court hears oral argument of counsel in the above motions and now takes them under submission. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Khowoonsum Chong. (ab)
March 23, 2015 206 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc Court Reporter. Transcript portion requested: Other: 3/23/15. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Kaplan, Adam)
March 3, 2015 205 SCHEDULING NOTICE re: Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Declaratory Judgment 179 , MOTION for Order for to Exclude Evidence 197 previously scheduled for 2/9/2015 9:30 am has been RESET for hearing on 3/23/2015 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge George H. King. Counsel responsible for the conduct and trial of the above matter SHALL appear in person.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 6, 2015 204 SCHEDULING NOTICE re: Cross Motion for Summary Judgment (179) and Motion to Exclude 197 set for hearing on Monday, February 9, 2015 are TAKEN OFF CALENDAR pending further order of the Court to be RESET at a later date. By Chief Judge George H. King THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 30, 2015 203 NOTICE Joint Notice re: Deposition Transcript(s) Pursuant to L.R. 32-1 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
January 26, 2015 202 REPLY in support of MOTION for Order for to Exclude Evidence 197 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark C. Rifkin in Support of Reply in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence, # 2 Exhibit 51, C & D)(Manifold, Betsy)
January 16, 2015 201 NOTICE OF LODGING filed /DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF LODGING OF UNUSUAL EXHIBITS [A, B, C, & D] TO THE DECLARATION OF KELLY M. KLAUS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE re Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,, 200 (Klaus, Kelly)
January 16, 2015 200 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Order for to Exclude Evidence 197 /Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Jeremy Blietz ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence, # 3 Exhibit Ex. A to Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence, # 4 Exhibit Ex. B to Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence, # 5 Exhibit Ex. C to Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence, # 6 Exhibit Ex. D to Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence, # 7 Exhibit Ex. E to Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 43 to Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 94 to Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 95 to Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 98 to Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 105 to Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 108 to Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 110 to Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence, # 15 Exhibit Ex. 125 to Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence)(Klaus, Kelly)
January 16, 2015 199 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Warner Chappell Music Inc of Exhibits A through D to the Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence. (Klaus, Kelly)
December 22, 2014 198 DECLARATION of BETSY C. MANIFOLD in Support of MOTION for Order for to Exclude Evidence 197 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, 23, 44, # 2 Exhibit 48, 67-68, 71, 72, 87, 92, # 3 Exhibit 99-104, 106, 119)(Manifold, Betsy)
December 22, 2014 197 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Exclude Evidence filed by plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. Motion set for hearing on 2/9/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A to Proposed Order)(Manifold, Betsy)
December 18, 2014 196 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING DATE FOR THE PARTIES' CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 179 by Judge George H. King. The Court GRANTS the relief sought therein and hereby enters this order continuing the hearing date on the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment to February 9, 2015 at 9:30a.m. (lom)
December 18, 2014 195 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Non-Paper Physical Exhibits [Nos. 15, 25, 26, 30, 35, 39 & 41] and Notice of Manual Filing of Unusual Exhibits [Nos. 12, 19, 22, 44, 48, 55, 56, 57, 61, 67, 68 & 73] re Motion Related Document,, 190 , Motion Related Document,, 189 (Manifold, Betsy)
December 17, 2014 194 AMENDED JOINT EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTIONS AND CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED PURSUANT TO COURTS DEC. 5, 2014 ORDER [Dkt. 185] (VOLUME 8, EXS. 117-126, PAGES 1751-1947) re Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Declaratory Judgment 179 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix (Volume 8, Exs. 117-126))(Manifold, Betsy)
December 17, 2014 193 AMENDED JOINT EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTIONS AND CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED PURSUANT TO COURTS DEC. 5, 2014 ORDER [Dkt. 185] (VOLUME 7, EXS. 108-116, PAGES 1541-1750) re Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Declaratory Judgment 179 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix (Volume 7, Exs. 108-110), # 2 Appendix (Volume 7, Ex. 111), # 3 Appendix (Volume 7, Exs. 112-116A), # 4 Appendix olume 7, Exs. 116A-116B))(Manifold, Betsy)
December 17, 2014 192 AMENDED JOINT EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTIONS AND CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED PURSUANT TO COURTS DEC. 5, 2014 ORDER [Dkt. 185] (VOLUME 6, EXS. 100-107, PAGES 1200-1540) re Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Declaratory Judgment 179 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix (Volume 6, Exs. 100-107))(Manifold, Betsy)
December 17, 2014 191 AMENDED JOINT EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTIONS AND CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED PURSUANT TO COURTS DEC. 5, 2014 ORDER [Dkt. 185] (VOLUME 5, EXS. 82-99, PAGES 948-1141) re Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Declaratory Judgment 179 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix (Volume 5, Exs. 82-99))(Manifold, Betsy)
December 17, 2014 190 AMENDED JOINT EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTIONS AND CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED PURSUANT TO COURTS DEC. 5, 2014 ORDER [Dkt. 185] (VOLUME 4, EXS. 55-81, PAGES 707-947) re Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Declaratory Judgment 179 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix (Volume 4, Exs. 55-64), # 2 Appendix (Volume 4, Exs. 64-77), # 3 Appendix (Volume 4, Exs. 77-81))(Manifold, Betsy)
December 17, 2014 189 AMENDED JOINT EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTIONS AND CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED PURSUANT TO COURTS DEC. 5, 2014 ORDER [Dkt. 185] (VOLUME 3, EXS. 12-54, PAGES 487-706) re Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Declaratory Judgment 179 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix (Volume 3, Exs. 12-21), # 2 Appendix (Volume 3, Exs. 22-36), # 3 Appendix (Volume 3, Exs. 37-54))(Manifold, Betsy)
December 17, 2014 188 AMENDED JOINT EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTIONS AND CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED PURSUANT TO COURTS DEC. 5, 2014 ORDER [Dkt. 185] (VOLUME 2, EX. 11, PAGES 221-486) re Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Declaratory Judgment 179 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
December 17, 2014 187 AMENDED JOINT EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE CROSS-MOTIONS AND CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S DEC. 5, 2014 ORDER [Dkt. 185] (VOLUME 1, EXS. 1-10, PAGES 1-220 re Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Declaratory Judgment 179 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Volume 1 Exs. 5-7 cont, # 2 Appendix Volume 1, Ex. 7 cont., # 3 Appendix Volume 1, Ex. 7 cont., # 4 Appendix Volume 1, Ex. 7 cont.)(Manifold, Betsy)
December 16, 2014 186 Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING DATE FOR THE PARTIES CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Klaus, Kelly)
December 4, 2014 185 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Order re: (1) Joint Application to File Under Seal [Unredacted] Exhibits of Joint Evidentiary Appendix; (2) Notice of Manual Filing [Dkt. 167] by Judge George H. King: The Parties Application is hereby STRICKEN. The Parties SHALL within 14 days hereofeither submit a new Application identifying the compelling reasons for why we should seal thesedocuments or else file the documents publically. In the Application, the Parties must make a specificfactual showing as to their claimed compelling reasons for seeking to seal each document, or portionthereof, and include discussion of all relevant factors. If the Parties intend for an entire exhibit to besealed, they must make a showing commensurate with the broad scope of such a request. Failure toresubmit these documents will be deemed consent to the striking of any references to the documentsfrom the Parties Joint Brief and Statement of Uncontroverted Facts. The Notice and the submitted exhibits are herebySTRICKEN. The Parties SHALL within 14 days resubmit all documents in a manner that complieswith the Local Rules and otherwise clearly identifies the exhibits and the reason for their manual filing. (See document for further details) (bp)
December 4, 2014 184 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. correcting Statement (Motion related), 180 , Motion Related Document,, 174 , Motion Related Document, 181 ; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Manifold, Betsy)
December 1, 2014 183 JOINT STATEMENT of [CORRECTED] UNCONTROVERTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Declaratory Judgment 179 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
November 26, 2014 182 Amendment to Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Declaratory Judgment 179 CORRECTING ECF DKT. 181 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
November 25, 2014 181 CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Declaratory Judgment 179 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
November 25, 2014 180 JOINT STATEMENT of UNCONTROVERTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Declaratory Judgment 179 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
November 25, 2014 179 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Declaratory Judgment filed by plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. Motion set for hearing on 1/26/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Plaintiffs, # 2 Proposed Order Defendants)(Manifold, Betsy)
November 25, 2014 178 [REDACTED] JOINT EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION AND MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re APPLICATION for Leave to File Under Seal 158 VOLUME 8 OF 8 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix VOLUME 8 OF 8)(Manifold, Betsy)
November 25, 2014 177 [REDACTED] JOINT EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION AND MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re APPLICATION for Leave to File Under Seal 158 VOLUME 7 OF 8 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix VOLUME 7 OF 8)(Manifold, Betsy)
November 25, 2014 176 [REDACTED] JOINT EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION AND MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re APPLICATION for Leave to File Under Seal 158 VOLUME 6 OF 8 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix VOLUME 6 OF 8)(Manifold, Betsy)
November 25, 2014 175 [REDACTED] JOINT EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION AND MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re APPLICATION for Leave to File Under Seal 158 CORRECTED VOLUME 5 OF 8 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix CORRECTED VOLUME 5 OF 8, # 2 Appendix CORRECTED VOLUME 5 OF 8, # 3 Appendix CORRECTED VOLUME 5 OF 8, # 4 Appendix CORRECTED VOLUME 5 OF 8, # 5 Appendix CORRECTED VOLUME 5 OF 8)(Manifold, Betsy)
November 25, 2014 174 [REDACTED] JOINT EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION AND MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re APPLICATION for Leave to File Under Seal 158 VOLUME 5 OF 8 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix VOLUME 5 OF 8, # 2 Appendix VOLUME 5 OF 8, # 3 Appendix VOLUME 5 OF 8, # 4 Appendix VOLUME 5 OF 8, # 5 Appendix VOLUME 5 OF 8)(Manifold, Betsy)
November 25, 2014 173 [REDACTED] JOINT EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION AND MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re APPLICATION for Leave to File Under Seal 158 VOLUME 4 OF 8 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix VOLUME 4 OF 8, # 2 Appendix VOLUME 4 OF 8, # 3 Appendix VOLUME 4 OF 8, # 4 Appendix VOLUME 4 OF 8, # 5 Appendix VOLUME 4 OF 8)(Manifold, Betsy)
November 25, 2014 172 [REDACTED] JOINT EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION AND MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re APPLICATION for Leave to File Under Seal 158 VOLUME 3 OF 8 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix VOLUME 3 OF 8, # 2 Appendix VOLUME 3 OF 8, # 3 Appendix VOLUME 3 OF 8, # 4 Appendix VOLUME 3 OF 8, # 5 Appendix VOLUME 3 OF 8, # 6 Appendix VOLUME 3 OF 8)(Manifold, Betsy)
November 25, 2014 171 [REDACTED] JOINT EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION AND MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re APPLICATION for Leave to File Under Seal 158 VOLUME 2 OF 8 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix VOLUME 2 OF 8)(Manifold, Betsy)
November 25, 2014 170 [REDACTED] JOINT EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION AND MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re APPLICATION for Leave to File Under Seal 158 VOLUME 1 OF 8 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix VOLUME 1 OF 8 (EXS. 1 TO 5), # 2 Appendix VOLUME 1 OF 8 (EXS. 6-7), # 3 Appendix VOLUME 1 OF 8 (EXS. 8-10)(Manifold, Betsy)
November 25, 2014 169 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel of Exhibit 92 listed in the parties' Joint Evidentiary Appendix in Support of Notice of Motions and Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. (Manifold, Betsy)
November 25, 2014 168 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Lodging of Physical Exhibits Listed in Joint Evidentiary Appendix in Support of Notice of Motion and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Local Rule 11-5.1 re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), 167 (Manifold, Betsy)
November 25, 2014 167 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel of exhibits listed in the parties' Joint Evidentiary Appendix in Support of Notice of Motions and Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. (Manifold, Betsy)
November 20, 2014 166 Featured Case ORDER by Judge George H. King GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND SCHEDULING DEADLINES 165 . The Court GRANTS the relief sough therein and hereby enters the following order extending the scheduling order deadlines: File Joint Motion for Summary Judgment: November 25, 2014. (pso)
November 19, 2014 165 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Order Deadlines from 11/21/2014 to 11/25/2014 Re: Order, 152 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Manifold, Betsy)
November 7, 2014 164 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge George H. King re: Motion for Review of Magistrate Judge Wilners OrderRe: Discovery Motion 145 . Plaintiffs' Motion is DENIED. Judge Wilners Order is AFFIRMED. Refer to the Court's order for details. (pso)
October 13, 2014 163 STATUS REPORT PURSUANT TO AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (DKT. # 152) filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
September 11, 2014 162 Featured Case MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge George H. King: On the court's own motion, Plaintiffs Motion for Review of Magistrate Judges Order re: Discovery[145, 153], noticed for hearing on SEPTEMBER 14, 2014, are TAKEN OFF CALENDAR and will be taken UNDER SUBMISSION without oral argument on that date pursuant to Local Rule 7-15. No appearance by counsel shall be necessary. The hearing date is vacated. Further briefing, if any, shall be filed in accordance withLocal Rules as if the noticed hearing date had not been vacated. (shb)
August 29, 2014 160 REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF AND IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION MOTION for Review of [REDACTED] MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILNERS ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTION DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO OVERRULE DEFENDANTS CLAIM OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE [FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a); L.R. 72-2.1] 145 , MOTION for Review 153 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
August 26, 2014 161 SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBIT B and C to DECLARATION OF KELLY M KLAUS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILNER'S ORDER RE DISCOVERY MOTION DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO OVERRULE DEFENDANTS' CLAIM OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE 153 , filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (shb)
August 26, 2014 159 Featured Case ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 158 by Judge George H. King. Defendants' Application to file the following confidential material under seal is GRANTED. Pursuant to Docket No. 98, the Stipulated Protective Order approved and entered by this Court on May 5, 2014 in this matter, the following documents shall hereby be filed under seal: Exhibits B and C to the Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Review of Magistrate Judge Wilner's Order Re: Discovery Motion Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Overrule Defendants' Claim of Attorney-Client Privilege. (lom)
August 25, 2014 158 APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS B AND C TO THE DECLARATION OF KELLY M. KLAUS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILNER'S ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTION DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO OVERRULE DEFENDANTS' CLAIM OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (lom)
August 25, 2014 157 MEMORANDUM in Support /MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILNERS ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTION DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO OVERRULE DEFENDANTS CLAIM OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE filed by Defendant Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF KELLY M. KLAUS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILNERS ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTION DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO OVERRULE DEFENDANTS CLAIM OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE, # 2 Exhibit A to K. Klaus Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B - Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit C - Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit D to K. Klaus Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to K. Klaus Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to K. Klaus Declaration)(Klaus, Kelly)
August 25, 2014 156 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Warner Chappell Music Inc of Application and Proposed Order. (Klaus, Kelly)
August 25, 2014 155 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Warner Chappell Music Inc of EXHIBITS B AND C TO DECLARATION OF KELLY M. KLAUS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILNER'S ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTION DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO OVERRULE DEFENDANTS' CLAIM OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE. (Klaus, Kelly)
August 20, 2014 152 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND SCHEDULING DEADLINES 150 by Judge George H. King: Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: September 15, 2014; Expert Discovery Motions Deadline: October 3, 2014; Expert Discovery Cut-Off: October 13, 2014; File Joint Status Report: October 13, 2014; File Joint Motion for Summary;Judgment: November 21, 2014. (lc)
August 15, 2014 154 SEALED DOCUMENT- [UNREDACTED] DECLARATION of Mark C. Rifkin in Support of PLAINTIFFS' MOTION for Review of Magistrate Judge Wilner's Order Re: Discovery Motion Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Overrule Defendants' Claim of Attorney-Client Privilege [FED.R.CIV. P. 72(a); L.R. 72-2.1]. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat)
August 15, 2014 153 [UNREDACTED] PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of Magistrate Judge Wilner's Order Re: Discovery Motion [FED.R.CIV. P. 72(a); L.R. 72-2.1] Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Overrule Defendants' Claim of Attorney-Client Privilege; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; and [Proposed] Order Thereon. (mat)
August 15, 2014 151 Featured Case ORDER by Judge George H. King: granting 148 Application to File Certain Documents Under Seal (shb)
August 14, 2014 150 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Order Deadlines from per joint stipulation to per joint stipulation Re: Scheduling Conference, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, 92 filed by plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Betsy C. Manifold, # 2 Proposed Order)(Manifold, Betsy)
August 14, 2014 149 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Betsy C Manifold counsel for Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. GITI BAGHBAN is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs Good Morning To You Productions Corp., Robert Siegel, Rupa Marya, and Majar Productions LLC. (Manifold, Betsy)
August 13, 2014 147 Featured Case NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge George H. King ORDERING Plaintiff's Application to file Under Seal; Unredacted Declaration of Rifkin; Plaintiff's Notice of Motions submitted by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel received on 8/11/14 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (bp)
August 11, 2014 148 APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLAINTIFFS' [UNREDACTED] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILNER'S ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTION DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO OVERRULE DEFENDANTS' CLAIM OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE AND [UNREDACTED] DECLARATION OF MARK C. RIFKIN IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp. (bp)
August 11, 2014 146 DECLARATION of MARK C. RIFKIN in support of MOTION for Review of [REDACTED] MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILNERS ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTION DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO OVERRULE DEFENDANTS CLAIM OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE [FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a); L.R. 72-2.1] 145 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Manifold, Betsy)
August 11, 2014 145 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of [REDACTED] MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILNERS ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTION DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO OVERRULE DEFENDANTS CLAIM OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE [FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a); L.R. 72-2.1] filed by plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. Motion set for hearing on 9/15/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # 1 Addendum A, # 2 Proposed Order GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILNERS ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTION DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO OVERRULE DEFENDANTS CLAIM OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE AND PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO FILE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL [FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a); L.R. 72-2.1])(Manifold, Betsy)
August 11, 2014 144 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel, served on 08/11/2014. (Attachments: # 1 service list)(Manifold, Betsy)
August 11, 2014 143 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel of Application to File Under Seal [Unredacted] Notice of Motion and Motion for Review of Magistrate Judge Wilner's Order re: Discovery Motion & [Unredacted] Declaration of Mark C. Rifkin In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Review of Magistrate Judge Wilner's Order re: Discovery Motion. (Manifold, Betsy)
July 30, 2014 142 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 7/25/14 9:34 a.m. re Transcript 141 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 30, 2014 141 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/25/14 9:34 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/28/2014. (ha)
July 28, 2014 134 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Order on Motion for Order re Discovery Matter, Motion Hearing 132 , as to defendant Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Melinda E. LeMoine at melinda.lemoine@mto.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Hearing on Discovery Motion. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (LeMoine, Melinda)
July 28, 2014 133 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Order on Motion for Order re Discovery Matter, Motion Hearing 132 , as to plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Betsy C. Manifold at manifold@whafh.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: 07/25/14. Other: 07/25/14 Hearing on Discovery Motion. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Manifold, Betsy)
July 25, 2014 132 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Minute Order for further details) denying 123 Motion for Order Court Recorder: CS 7/25/2014. (vm)
July 22, 2014 140 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Melinda E. LeMoine in Support of Defendants' Supplemental Brief. (mat)
July 22, 2014 139 SEALED DOCUMENT- DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF (mat)
July 22, 2014 138 SEALED DOCUMENT- [UNREDACTED] SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support of Plaintiff's Motion by Order [Dkt. 123, 124] Dated July 9, 2014 [Dkt. 119] (mat) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2014: # 1 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 17) (mat).
July 22, 2014 131 Featured Case NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. ORDERING Declaration of LeMoine; Supplemental Brief; Proof of Service submitted by Defendant Warner Chappell Music Inc received on 7/22/2014 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. The Court accepts filing per previous order as noted on documents. (vm) (Main Document 131 replaced on 7/25/2014) (vm).
July 22, 2014 130 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc, Defendants' Supplemental Brief and Declaration of Melinda E. LeMoine in Support of Defendants' Supplemental Brief [filed under seal] served on July 22, 2014. (LeMoine, Melinda)
July 22, 2014 129 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel, re Supplement(Motion related),, 126 served on 07/22/14. (Manifold, Betsy)
July 22, 2014 128 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc of Defendants Supplemental Brief; LeMoine Decl. in support of Supplemental Brief; Exhibit A to LeMoine Declaration; Proof of Service. (LeMoine, Melinda)
July 22, 2014 127 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel of [UNREDACTED] SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION BY ORDER [DKT. 123, 124] DATED JULY 9, 2014 [DKT. 119]. (Manifold, Betsy)
July 22, 2014 126 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Order for (i) OVERRULING DEFENDANTS' CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE IN DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY A NON-PARTY, OR PERMITTING A SECOND RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TO DETERMINE THE FACTUAL BASIS FOR THAT CLAIM; (ii) GRANTING RELIEF FROM THE DISCOVERY CUTOFF 123 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Decl of Betsy C. Manifold, # 2 Exhibit 13, # 3 Exhibit 14, # 4 Exhibit 15, # 5 Exhibit 16, # 6 Exhibit 17 [REDACTED & FILED UNDER SEAL])(Manifold, Betsy)
July 22, 2014 125 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel of Exhibit 17 attached to the Supplemental Declaration of Betsy C. Manifold in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion (Dkts. 123-124). (Manifold, Betsy)
July 15, 2014 137 SEALED DOCUMENT- CONFIDENTIAL DECLARATION OF MARK C. RIFKIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION for Order for (i) OVERRULING DEFENDANTS' CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE IN DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY A NON-PARTY, OR PERMITTING A SECOND RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TO DETERMINE THE FACTUAL BASIS FOR THAT CLAIM; (ii) GRANTING RELIEF FROM THE DISCOVERY CUTOFF TO CONDUCT THAT DEPOSITION [ FED. R. CIV. P. 26(b)(5)(B) & Civ.L.R. 79-5.1]]. (mat)
July 15, 2014 136 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION OF KELLY M. KLAUS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION for Order for (i) OVERRULING DEFENDANTS' CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE IN DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY A NON-PARTY, OR PERMITTING A SECOND RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TO DETERMINE THE FACTUAL BASIS FOR THAT CLAIM; (ii) GRANTING RELIEF FROM THE DISCOVERY CUTOFF TO CONDUCT THAT DEPOSITION. (mat)
July 15, 2014 135 SEALED DOCUMENT- LOCAL RULE 37-2: JOINT STIPULATION for Order:(i) OVERRULING DEFENDANTS' CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE IN DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY A NON-PARTY, OR PERMITTING A SECOND RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TO DETERMINE THE FACTUAL BASIS FOR THAT CLAIM; (ii) GRANTING RELIEF FROM THE DISCOVERY CUTOFF TO CONDUCT THAT DEPOSITION. (mat)
July 15, 2014 124 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel of Joint Stipulation per Local Rule 37-2; Declaration of Mark C. Rifkin & Exhibits; Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus & Exhibits. (Manifold, Betsy)
July 15, 2014 123 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for (i) OVERRULING DEFENDANTS' CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE IN DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY A NON-PARTY, OR PERMITTING A SECOND RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TO DETERMINE THE FACTUAL BASIS FOR THAT CLAIM; (ii) GRANTING RELIEF FROM THE DISCOVERY CUTOFF TO CONDUCT THAT DEPOSITION [Local Rule 37-2 Joint Stipulation filed separately under seal] filed by plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. Motion set for hearing on 7/25/2014 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Betsy C. Manifold In Support of Motion for Order Overruling Privilege, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Proposed Order Plaintiffs, # 15 Proposed Order Defendants)(Manifold, Betsy)
July 15, 2014 122 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 7/9/14 10:08 a.m. re Transcript 121 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 15, 2014 121 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/9/14 10:08 a.m. phone number BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/5/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2014. (ha)
July 9, 2014 120 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Order on Ex Parte Application for Leave re Discovery Matter, Telephone Conference, Set/Reset Hearing,,, 119 , as to Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Adam Kaplan at adam.kaplan@mto.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Kaplan, Adam)
July 9, 2014 119 MINUTES OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Defendant will provide its portion of the joint filing to Plaintiff by or before July 15, 2014. Both parties may file supplemental briefs (not to exceed 10 pages) by noon on July 22, 2014. The motion hearing set for July 30 is rescheduled to July 25, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. granting 116 Ex Parte Application for LeaveCourt Recorder: CS 7/9/2014. (vm)
July 8, 2014 118 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Have Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Heard After the Discovery Cutoff Date 116 /DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF KELLY M. KLAUS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION, # 2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION)(Klaus, Kelly)
July 7, 2014 117 Featured Case ORDER RE: MOTION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Chief Judge King referred Plaintiff's ex parte motion (Docket # 116) to Judge Wilner for ruling. Defendant may file a response to the ex parte motion by noon on Tuesday, July 8, and deliver an electronic copy to Judge Wilner at MRW_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. The Court will conduct a telephonic status conference with the parties on Wednesday, July 9, at 10 a.m. The clerk will initiate the call. re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Have Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Heard After the Discovery Cutoff Date 116 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 3, 2014 116 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Have Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Heard After the Discovery Cutoff Date filed by plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Betsy C. Manifold in Support of Ex Parte Application, # 2 Exhibit 1 [Redacted] Discovery Motion, # 3 Proposed Order)(Manifold, Betsy)
June 26, 2014 115 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Minute Order for further details) withdrawing 101 Motion to Compel (vm)
June 25, 2014 114 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel,,, 101 filed by plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
June 24, 2014 113 Featured Case ORDER RE: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The parties informed the clerk that the pending discovery dispute has been resolved. The previously scheduled telephone conference set for June 27, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. is off calendar. Plaintiffs will file a notice of withdrawal of the pending motion (Docket 101). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 18, 2014 112 Featured Case ORDER RE: SCHEDULED TELEPHONE CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The previously scheduled telephone conference set for June 24, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. has been rescheduled. The matter is set for June 27, 2014 at 9:00 AM. The clerk will provide the parties' with call-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 17, 2014 111 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Telephone Conference set for June 24, 2014 at 10:00 AM. The clerk will provide the parties' with call-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 16, 2014 110 Featured Case ORDER RE: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The telephone conference set for June 17, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. is off calendar. Counsel will contact the clerk if a new date needs to be rescheduled for a telephone conference. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 11, 2014 109 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 06-06-2014; 2:01 P.M re Transcript 108 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Algorri, Miranda) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 11, 2014 108 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 06-06-2014; 2:01 P.M. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Dorothy Babykin, Courthouse Services, phone number 626-963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/2/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/12/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2014. (Algorri, Miranda)
June 9, 2014 107 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Warner Chappell Music Inc Court Smart (CS). Transcript portion requested: Other: 6/6/14 - Telephonic Hearing. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Kaplan, Adam)
June 9, 2014 106 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. To facilitate those discussions, and after consulting with Chief Judge King, the parties joint request to extend the discovery deadline for the first phase of the action is GRANTED. That discovery must now be completed by or before July 11, 2014. No other litigation deadlines are modified. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm)
June 6, 2014 105 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. A further telephone conference is set for June 17, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel has provided the court with call-in information. The motion hearing set for June 25, 2014 at 9:30 a.m is off calendar. (See Minute Order for further details) Court Recorder: CS 6/6/2014. (vm)
June 5, 2014 104 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. correcting MOTION to Compel (i) DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE WITHHELD DOCUMENTS; OR (ii) RELIEF FROM DISCOVERY CUTOFF TO CONDUCT COURT REVIEW IN CAMERA OF WITHHELD DOCUMENTS 101 Attaching Exh B to Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(Manifold, Betsy)
June 5, 2014 103 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Melinda E LeMoine counsel for Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. Filed by Defendants Warner/Chappell Music, Inc. and Summy-Birchard, Inc.. (Attorney Melinda E LeMoine added to party Summy-Birchard Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Melinda E LeMoine added to party Warner Chappell Music Inc(pty:dft))(LeMoine, Melinda)
June 5, 2014 102 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Telephone Conference set for June 6, 2014 at 2:00 PM. The parties will provide the clerk with call-in information.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 4, 2014 101 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel (i) DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE WITHHELD DOCUMENTS; OR (ii) RELIEF FROM DISCOVERY CUTOFF TO CONDUCT COURT REVIEW IN CAMERA OF WITHHELD DOCUMENTS filed by plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. Motion set for hearing on 6/25/2014 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Local Rule 37-2 Joint Stipulation, # 2 Exhibit A to Joint Stipulation, # 3 Exhibit B to Joint Stipulation, # 4 Declaration of Betsy C. Manifold in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion, # 5 Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion, # 6 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus, # 7 Declaration of Jeremy Blietz in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion, # 8 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion)(Manifold, Betsy)
May 7, 2014 100 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Daniel J Schacht counsel for Plaintiff Rupa Marya. Changing Firm Name to Donahue Fitzgerald LLP. Filed by Plaintiff Rupa Marya. (Schacht, Daniel)
May 6, 2014 99 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, 95 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO CLAIM ONE OF PLAINTIFFS' FOURTH AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc.(Klaus, Kelly)
May 5, 2014 98 Featured Case ORDER ENTERING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. HAVING FOUND GOOD CAUSE APPEARING in the parties stipulated protective order for discovery, the Court hereby orders that the protective order is deemed filed as of the date of entry of this order. re Stipulation for Protective Order 97 (vm)
May 2, 2014 97 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Manifold, Betsy)
April 29, 2014 96 Featured Case ORDER by Judge George H. King, re Stipulation to File Amended Pleadings 94 . 1. Pursuant to Rule 15(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiffs fourth amended complaint concurrently filed with the parties jointstipulation is hereby filed as of the date of entry of this order; 2. Defendants shall file an answer to Claim One of Plaintiffs fourth amended complaint within seven (7) days of the entry of this order and need notrespond to Plaintiffs other claims for relief in accordance with the Courts October 21, 2013 Order (Dkt. 71 at 4). (shb)
April 21, 2014 95 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc amending Amended Complaint, 75 , filed by plaintiffs Robert Siegel, Rupa Marya, Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC (Manifold, Betsy)
April 21, 2014 94 Joint STIPULATION to AMEND Amended Complaint, 75 , Answer to Complaint 79 filed by plaintiff Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Manifold, Betsy)
March 24, 2014 93 Featured Case ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge George H. King. A deadline for dispositive motions has been set in the above-captioned case. Any motion(s) for summary judgment SHALL comply with all Federal and Local Rules, as well as this Order. Please be advised that this Order contains requirements more specificthan the Local and Federal Rules. (See order for further details) (shb)
March 24, 2014 92 MINUTES OF (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ORDER ENTERING SCHEDULING DATES: Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H. King. After discussion with counsel, Court agrees to defer consideration of the statute of limitations defenses and class certification at this time. We now set the followingscheduling dates leading to the anticipated cross-motions for summary judgment in this phase one of this action only. If the summary judgment motions do not dispose of this first phase of this action, we will set further scheduling dates as needed. Any stipulation or motion to amend as to any claims, defenses and/or parties shall be lodged/filed by no later than April 24, 2014, failing which it shall be deemed that partys waiver of any such amendments in this action. All fact discovery shall be COMPLETED by no later than June 27, 2014. The parties shall designate their expert witnesses, and make the required disclosures, by no later than July 25, 2014, and do likewise for any rebuttal expert witnesses by no later than August 25, 2014. All expert discovery shall be COMPLETED by no later than September 26, 2014. By no later than September 26, 2014, counsel shall file a joint status report setting forth their views onwhether a settlement conference before summary judgment motions would be fruitful. Any motion for summary judgment shall be filed in compliance with the Local Rules, as well as our Order Re: Summary Judgment Motions issued concurrently herewith, by no later than November 14, 2014. (See order for further details).Court Reporter: N/A. (shb)
March 5, 2014 91 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. King: On February 20, 2014, the above scheduling conference was taken off calendar by the Court 90 . Counsel of record are hereby notified that the above matter is RESET for hearing on the Scheduling Conference for March 24, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel responsible for the conduct and trial of the above action shall appear on date and time specified herein. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kti)
February 20, 2014 90 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. King: On the Courts own motion, the above matter set for Scheduling Conference 80 on Monday, February 24, 2014, is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR and the hearing date is VACATED. No appearance by counsel will be necessary. The Court will issue such further order as deemed appropriate. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kti)
February 10, 2014 89 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan "JOINT REPORT ON PARTIES' PLANNING MEETING" filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel.. (Manifold, Betsy)
January 22, 2014 88 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION for attorney Beth A. Landes to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-12457507 paid.) 20 , Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice 24 filed by plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
January 22, 2014 87 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice 23 , APPLICATION for attorney Janine Pollack to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-12457434 paid.) 19 filed by plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
January 22, 2014 86 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION for attorney Mark C. Rifkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-12457377 paid.) 18 , Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice 22 filed by plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
January 16, 2014 85 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tina B Nieves counsel for Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. Tina B. Nieves is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs. (Nieves, Tina)
January 16, 2014 84 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Katherine J Odenbreit counsel for Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. Katherine J. Odenbreit is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs. (Odenbreit, Katherine)
January 16, 2014 83 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kathlynn Elizabeth Smith counsel for Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. Adding Kathlynn E. Smith as attorney as counsel of record for Rupa Mayra, Robert Siegel and Good Morning To You Productions Corp. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs. (Attorney Kathlynn Elizabeth Smith added to party Good Morning to You Productions Corp(pty:pla), Attorney Kathlynn Elizabeth Smith added to party Rupa Marya(pty:pla), Attorney Kathlynn Elizabeth Smith added to party Robert Siegel(pty:pla))(Smith, Kathlynn)
January 16, 2014 82 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alison C Gibbs counsel for Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. Adding Alison C. Gibbs as attorney as counsel of record for Rupa Mayra, Robert Siegel and Good Morning To You Productions Corp. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs. (Attorney Alison C Gibbs added to party Good Morning to You Productions Corp(pty:pla), Attorney Alison C Gibbs added to party Rupa Marya(pty:pla), Attorney Alison C Gibbs added to party Robert Siegel(pty:pla))(Gibbs, Alison)
January 16, 2014 81 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Omel Andres Nieves counsel for Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. Adding Omel A. Nieves as attorney as counsel of record for Rupa Mayra, Robert Siegel and Good Morning To You Productions Corp. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs. (Attorney Omel Andres Nieves added to party Good Morning to You Productions Corp(pty:pla), Attorney Omel Andres Nieves added to party Rupa Marya(pty:pla), Attorney Omel Andres Nieves added to party Robert Siegel(pty:pla))(Nieves, Omel)
December 13, 2013 80 Featured Case ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. King: Scheduling Conference set for 2/24/2014 01:30 PM before Judge George H. King. (rne)
December 11, 2013 79 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, 75 Defendants' Answer to Claim One of Plaintiffs' Third Amended Consolidated Complaint filed by defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc.(Klaus, Kelly)
November 21, 2013 78 Featured Case ORDER by Judge George H. King, pursuant to the parties' Stipulation 77 . Defendants shall have through and including 12/11/13 to answer or otherwise respond to the Third Amended Consolidated Complaint. (ir)
November 19, 2013 77 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 11, 2013 re Amended Complaint, 75 filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Kelly M. Klaus iso Stipulation, # 2 Proposed Order)(Klaus, Kelly)
November 12, 2013 76 Featured Case ORDER by Clerk of Court DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN AS DUPLICATIVE. THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT MANUALLY FILED ON 11/6/13. RE: Miscellaneous Document 72 (shb)
November 6, 2013 75 THIRD AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT against Defendant Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc amending Amended Complaint, 59 ; Jury Demand, filed by Plaintiffs Robert Siegel, Rupa Marya, Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC (Attorney Francis M Gregorek added to party Majar Productions LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Rachele R Rickert added to party Majar Productions LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Marisa C Livesay added to party Majar Productions LLC(pty:pla))(shb) (shb).
November 6, 2013 74 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel of THIRD AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT. (Manifold, Betsy)
November 6, 2013 73 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document 72 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): An initiating document was filed in this case. Pursuant to Local Rule 3-2, initiating documents (including amended complaints) shall be manually filed. This case is not exempted from Local Rule 3-2 and is not eligible for the Attorney Case Opening Pilot Program as set forth in Amended General Order 13-01. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (shb)
November 5, 2013 72 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN AS DUPLICATIVE ] - Third Amended Consolidated Complaint For Declaratory Judgment et al.; jury trial demanded filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel (Manifold, Betsy) Modified on 11/12/2013 (shb).
October 16, 2013 71 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Defendants Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint And/Or Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Proposed Class Definition(Dkt. 52) ORDER by Judge George H. King: Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to replead their two-step approach as articulated by Mr. Rifkin at the October 7, 2013 hearing. Plaintiffs are directed to pay particular attention to presenting their two-step approach clearly, directly, and free of any confusing or extraneous allegations. Defendants Motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Claim One and Claim Two are DISMISSED with leave to amend as to Plaintiffs Robert Siegel andMajar Productions, LLC. Plaintiffs are also GRANTED leave to amend to clearly set forth the twostepapproach to their claim for declaratory judgment. Plaintiffs SHALL file any amended complaintwithin 21 days hereof. Additionally, Claim One of Plaintiffs SAC is BIFURCATED from all other claims throughsummary judgment, and all other claims, including any discovery specific to such claims, are STAYEDuntil further order by this Court. As such, Defendants pending motions with respect to the stayedclaims are DENIED without prejudice as premature; Defendants may refile such motions after the stayis lifted. After Plaintiffs file their amended complaint, Defendants SHALL respond to Claim One ofPlaintiffs amended complaint within 21 days thereof. If Plaintiffs fail to timely file an amended complaint as ordered herein, the dismissal as againstPlaintiffs Siegel and Majar Productions, LLC SHALL automatically become dismissals with prejudice upon the expiration of said 21 days without further order of the Court (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) 52 (pj)
October 11, 2013 70 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings October 7, 2013; a.m. session re Transcript 69 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Rickey, Mary R.) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 11, 2013 69 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on October 7, 2013; a.m. session. Court Reporter: Mary R. Rickey, mary.usdc@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may also be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/1/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/11/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2014. (Rickey, Mary R.)
October 9, 2013 67 STATEMENT in Response to Plaintiffs' Submission of October 8, 2013 re: Notice (Other), 66 . (Klaus, Kelly)
October 8, 2013 66 NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION IN RESPONSE TO COURT'S REQUEST AT OCTOBER 7, 2013 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS filed by plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Majar Productions LLC, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
October 7, 2013 68 MINUTES OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT MOTION TO STRIKE PROPOSED CLASS DEFINITION 52 . Matter called. Counsel of record for the parties are present. Court hears oral argument. Having heard from counsel, the Court directs supplemental submission as stated on the record within the next two (2) days, Matter will stand submitted. held before Judge George H. King:Court Reporter: Mary Riordan Rickey. (bp)
September 25, 2013 65 MINUTEs: (In Chambers) CONTINUING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (E-FILED 8/30/13, Doc. #52): On the Court's own motion, Defendants' motion to dismiss Second Amended Consolidated Class action complaint and or motion to strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Class Definition 52 set for hearing on September 30, 2013 is hereby CONTINUED to October 7, 2013, at 9:30 a.m. by Judge George H. King. (ir)
September 16, 2013 64 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and/or Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Class Definition 52 filed by Defendants Summy-Birchard Inc, Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Klaus, Kelly)
September 9, 2013 63 DECLARATION of Betsy C. Manifold in support of plaintiffs' opposition MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and/or Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Class Definition 52 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Exhibit 4-5, # 3 Exhibit 6)(Manifold, Betsy)
September 9, 2013 62 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and/or Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Class Definition 52 In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition filed by plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
September 9, 2013 61 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and/or Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Class Definition 52 filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Manifold, Betsy)
September 6, 2013 60 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Order re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Interim Lead Counsel (Dkt.26) by Judge George H. King: Plaintiffs' Motion is GRANTED. Wold Halderstein is hereby appointed as interim lead class counsel and, as such Wolf Haldenstein shall have the following duties and responsibilities: (1) authority to speak for Plaintiffs in matters regarding pretrial and trial procedure and settlement negotiations; (2) make all work assignments in such a manner as to facilitate the orderly and efficient prosecution of this litigation and to avoid duplicative or unproductive effort. (3) coordinate all activities, appearances, and the dissemination of notices and orders of this Court on behalf of Plaintiffs (i.e., no motion, request for discovery, or other pretrial proceedings shall be initiated of filed by Plaintiffs except Wold Halderstein); (4) communications to and from this Court and for the creation and maintenance of a master service list of all parties and their respective counsel; and (5) Defendants' counsel may rely upon all agreements made with Wolf Halderstein, or other duly authorized representatives of plaintiffs, and such agreements shall be binding on all plaintiffs.granting [] Motion for Appointment of Counsel (bp)
September 5, 2013 58 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge George H. King. On the court's own motion, Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Wolf, Haldenstein, Adler, Freeman & Herz, LLP as Interim Lead Class Counsel 26 , noticed for hearing on SEPTEMBER 9, 2013, is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR and will be taken UNDER SUBMISSION without oral argument on that date. F.R.Civ.P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. No appearance by counsel shall be necessary. The hearing date is vacated. Further briefing, if any, shall be filed in accordance with Local Rules as if the noticed hearing date had not been vacated. (lom)
September 4, 2013 59 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Warner Chappell Music Inc, Summy-Birchard Inc amending Amended Complaint, 29 ; Jury Demand,filed by Plaintiffs Robert Siegel, Rupa Marya, Good Morning to You Productions Corp (shb)
September 4, 2013 57 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel of Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. (Manifold, Betsy)
September 3, 2013 56 Featured Case **NUNC PRO TUNC 8/30/13**ORDER GRANTING Stipulation Consolidating Related Actions for all purposes and Coordinating Schedule for Filing of and Response to Consolidated Second Amended Complaint 50 . The cases are consolidated to Lead Case No. 13-4460-GHK (MRWx), and the high-numbered case, CV 13-5164-GHK (MRWx) is hereby dismissed without prejudice (See document for further specific details) IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge George H. King. ( (ir)
August 30, 2013 55 OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Warner Chappell Music Inc, re MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and/or Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Class Definition 52 served on 8/30/2013. (Klaus, Kelly)
August 30, 2013 54 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and/or Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Class Definition 52 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Klaus, Kelly)
August 30, 2013 53 DECLARATION of Kelly M. Klaus in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and/or Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Class Definition 52 filed by Defendant Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Klaus, Kelly)
August 30, 2013 52 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and/or Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Class Definition filed by Defendants Warner Chappell Music Inc. Motion set for hearing on 9/30/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Klaus, Kelly)
August 29, 2013 51 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Warner Chappell Music Inc, (Kaplan, Adam)
August 28, 2013 50 Second STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to CV 13-05164-GHK (MRQx) with Lead Case CV 13-04460-GHK (MRWx) filed by plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Betsy C. Manifold In Support Thereof, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Consolidate Cases)(Manifold, Betsy)
August 28, 2013 49 Featured Case ORDER by Clerk of Court DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN. COUNSEL SHALL RE-FILE STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LOCAL RULES RE: Stipulation to Consolidate Cases, 34 (shb)
August 28, 2013 48 Featured Case ORDER by Clerk of Court: DOCUMENT ACCEPTED. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE ITS CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES BY NO LATER THAN AUGUST 29, 2013. RE: MOTION for Appointment of Counsel 39 (shb)
August 28, 2013 47 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by plaintiffs correcting proposed order re Stipulation to Consolidate Cases, 34 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Manifold, Betsy)
August 28, 2013 46 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proposed Order re Stipulation to Consolidate Cases [34-1]. The following error was found: Proposed Order (34-2) missing Title page. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ir)
August 22, 2013 45 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION for Appointment of Counsel 39 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): Civil Events - select Other Filings - Notices - Notice of Lodging and Attach the Proposed Order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (jp)
August 19, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER by Judge George H. King: granting 37 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Beth A. Landes on behalf of Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Robert Siegel and Rupa Marya, designating Katherine J. Odenbreit as local counsel. (lt)
August 19, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER by Judge George H. King: granting 36 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Janine Pollack on behalf of Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Robert Siegel and Rupa Marya, designating Katherine J. Odenbreit as local counsel. (lt)
August 19, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER by Judge George H. King: granting 35 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark C. Rifkin on behalf of Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Robert Siegel and Rupa Marya, designating Katherine J. Odenbreit as local counsel. (lt)
August 19, 2013 41 STATEMENT of No Position Regarding MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Wolf Haldenstein as Interim Lead Class Counsel 26 filed by Defendant Warner Chappell Music Inc. (Klaus, Kelly)
August 19, 2013 40 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Warner Chappell Music Inc. correcting MOTION for Appointment of Counsel 39 (Klaus, Kelly)
August 19, 2013 39 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Defendant Warner Chappell Music Inc. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Klaus, Kelly)
August 16, 2013 38 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tina B Nieves counsel for Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. Adding Tina B. Nieves as attorney as counsel of record for Plaintiffs and proposed class representatives Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel and Good Morning To You Productions Corp. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs and Proposed Class Representatives Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel and Good Morning To You Productions Corp.. (Nieves, Tina)
August 15, 2013 37 APPLICATION for attorney Beth A. Landes to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-12559680 paid.) filed by plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Odenbreit, Katherine)
August 15, 2013 36 APPLICATION for attorney Janine Pollack to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-12559586 paid.) filed by plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Odenbreit, Katherine)
August 15, 2013 35 APPLICATION for attorney Mark C. Rifkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-12559541 paid.) filed by plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Odenbreit, Katherine)
August 14, 2013 34 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER G-112-B] - STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to CV13-05164-GHK with Lead Case CV13-04460-GHK filed by plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Rupa Marya. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Betsy C. Manifold In Support of Thereof, # 2 Proposed Order Thereon)(Manifold, Betsy) Modified on 8/28/2013 (shb).
August 7, 2013 33 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Glenn D Pomerantz on behalf of Defendant Warner Chappell Music Inc (Pomerantz, Glenn)
August 7, 2013 32 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kelly M Klaus on behalf of Defendant Warner Chappell Music Inc (Klaus, Kelly)
August 7, 2013 31 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Adam I Kaplan on behalf of Defendant Warner Chappell Music Inc (Kaplan, Adam)
August 5, 2013 27 DECLARATION of Betsy C. Manifold in support of MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Wolf Haldenstein as Interim Lead Class Counsel 26 filed by Plaintiff Rupa Marya. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Declaration of Service)(Rickert, Rachele)
August 5, 2013 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Wolf Haldenstein as Interim Lead Class Counsel filed by plaintiffs Rupa Marya. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Service)(Rickert, Rachele)
August 5, 2013 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Katherine J Odenbreit counsel for Plaintiff Rupa Marya. Adding Katherine J. Odenbreit as attorney as counsel of record for Plaintifss and proposed class representatives Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel and Good Morning To You Productions Corp. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel and Good Morning To You Productions Corp.. (Odenbreit, Katherine)
July 30, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER by Judge George H. King: denying 19 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Terming Attorney Janine L Pollack. (rne)
July 29, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER by Judge George H. King: denying 20 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Terming Attorney Beth A Landes. (rne)
July 29, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER by Judge George H. King: denying 18 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Terming Attorney Mark C Rifkin. (rne)
July 26, 2013 30 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Good Morning to You Productions Corp, Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel, re Consolidated First Amended Complaint, 29 served on 7/26/2013 by US mail. (shb)
July 26, 2013 29 CONSOLIDATED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Warner Chappell Music Inc amending Complaint - (Discovery), 1 ; Jury Demand, filed by Plaintiffs Rupa Marya, Robert Siegel, Good Morning to You Productions Corp (shb)
July 26, 2013 28 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rupa Marya, identifying Other Affiliate Jennifer Nelson for Rupa Marya. (shb)
July 26, 2013 21 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Rupa Marya of Consolidated First Amended Complaint; Amended Summons; Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, etc.. (Manifold, Betsy)
July 25, 2013 20 APPLICATION for attorney Beth A. Landes to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-12457507 paid.) filed by plaintiff Rupa Marya. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Manifold, Betsy)
July 25, 2013 19 APPLICATION for attorney Janine Pollack to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-12457434 paid.) filed by plaintiff Rupa Marya. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Manifold, Betsy)
July 25, 2013 18 APPLICATION for attorney Mark C. Rifkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-12457377 paid.) filed by plaintiff Rupa Marya. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Manifold, Betsy)
July 16, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER by Judge George H. King. GOOD CAUSE APPEARING and pursuant to the parties' stipulation, IT IS SO ORDERED: 1. Siegel v. Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., Case No. CV-13-04418 GHK (MRW) and Marya v. Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., Case No. CV -13-04460 GHK (MRW) are consolidated for all purposes. 2. Nothing in Defendant's agreement to consolidation under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) shall be construed to indicate Defendant's agreement that class certificationis appropriate for either of the Related Actions, for the proposed consolidated class action, or for any other related action. 3. Plaintiffs shall file a Consolidated Complaint within ten (10) days of the entry of this order consolidating the aforementioned cases. 4. Defendant shall respond to the Consolidated Complaint within thirty (30) days of the filing of a Consolidated Complaint, or on or before August 30, 2013, whichever date is later. 5. Parties shall follow the briefing schedule per Local Rule and not deviate therefrom. We see no need for extended briefing insomuch as the parties will have met and conferred pursuant to L.R. 7-3 and will be fully advised of each others agreements and authorities. If the parties fail to fully discharge their obligation under L.R> 7-3 in good faith, any motion will be denied 6. The Low Numbered case, CV 13-4418 GHK is hereby dismissed without prejudice do the its consolidation with case CV 13-4418-GHK. Cases associated with Lead Case 13 (shb)
July 6, 2013 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rupa Marya, upon Defendant Warner Chappell Music Inc served on 6/21/2013, answer due 7/12/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant Warner/Chappell Music, Inc. c/o C T Corporation System, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons returned. (Manifold, Betsy)
July 5, 2013 15 Featured Case MINUTES: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS: These related cases are now pending before us. To date, no proof of service of the summons and thecomplaint on defendant has been filed by the plaintiff in either action. To ensure prompt disposition of these matters, and inasmuch as defendant appears to be readily available for service of process, we now ORDER the plaintiff in each action to serve the summons and complaint on defendant, forthwith, and to file proof of such service by no later than July 26, 2013, failing which plaintiff in each action shall show cause, in writing, by July 26, 2013 why service was not effected as ordered herein. Failure to timely file proper proofs of service or show cause as required herein will result in the dismissal of this/these action(s) for failure to diligently prosecute and for violation of our order. Once defendant has appeared in the actions, we will issue an order directing the parties to file a joint status report re: the desirability of consolidating these two actions IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge George H. King. (ir)
July 3, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT (See document for further details) by Judge George H. King. (ir)
June 25, 2013 13 NOTICE TO PARTIES that reference to the Court Directed ADR Program is vacated. Further ADR procedures shall be pursuant to Local Rule 16-15. (ir)
June 25, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 13-04418 GHK(MRWx). Case transferred from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm to Judge George H. King and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 13-04460 GHK(MRWx). Signed by Judge George H. King (rn)
June 21, 2013 11 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Giti Baghban for Plaintiff Rupa Marya. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return you completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (ghap)
June 21, 2013 10 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Beth A Landes for Plaintiff Rupa Marya. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return you completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (ghap)
June 21, 2013 9 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Janine Pollack for Plaintiff Rupa Marya. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return you completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (ghap)
June 21, 2013 8 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Mark C Rifkin for Plaintiff Rupa Marya. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return you completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (ghap)
June 20, 2013 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(ghap)
June 20, 2013 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Rupa Marya. (ghap)
June 20, 2013 5 NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION or Proceeding Pursuant to L.R. 83-1.4, filed by plaintiff Rupa Marya. (ghap) (jp).
June 20, 2013 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Rupa Marya. Related Case(s): 2:13-CV-4418 GHK (MRWx). (ghap) (jp).
June 20, 2013 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rupa Marya. (ghap) (jp).
June 20, 2013 2 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), 1 as to Defendant Warner Chappell Music Inc. (ghap)
June 20, 2013 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendant Warner Chappell Music Inc.Case assigned to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm.(Filing fee $ 400:PAID) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Rupa Marya.(ghap) (jp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rupa Marya v. Warner Chappell Music Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rupa Marya
Represented By: Francis M Gregorek
Represented By: William R Hill
Represented By: Marisa C Livesay
Represented By: Andrew Scott MacKay
Represented By: Betsy C Manifold
Represented By: Randall Scott Newman
Represented By: Rachele R Rickert
Represented By: Daniel J Schacht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chappell Music Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?