Burberry Limited et al v. K-1 Inc et al

Plaintiff: Burberry Limited
Defendant: K-1 Inc, Does, Tirdad Ariavand, US Pulse, ZMZ Trading Inc and Bijan Zarrabi
Case Number: 2:2013cv04836
Filed: July 3, 2013
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Frederick F. Mumm
Presiding Judge: Fernando M. Olguin
Nature of Suit: Trademark

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin that this Permanent Injunction shall be and is hereby entered in the within action (see attached Permanent Injunction for further details). Defendants and their agents, ser vants, employees and all persons in active concert and participation with them who receive actual notice of the injunction are hereby restrained and enjoined. Each side shall bear its own fees and costs of suit. Except as provided herein, all claims alleged in the Complaint are dismissed with prejudice. This Injunction shall be deemed to have been served upon Defendants at the time of its execution by the Court. The above-captioned action, shall, upon motion by Burberry, be reopened should Defendants default under the terms of this Injunction or their Settlement Agreement with Burberry. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
November 26, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL RE: LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 12/2/2013. (jloz)
October 10, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL RE: LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 10/18/2013. (jloz)
October 8, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL RE: LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 10/31/2013. (jloz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burberry Limited et al v. K-1 Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K-1 Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tirdad Ariavand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Pulse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZMZ Trading Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bijan Zarrabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burberry Limited
Represented By: Nicole L Drey
Represented By: James Andrew Coombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?