Morris Reese v. AT&T Mobility II LLC
Plaintiff: |
Morris Reese |
Defendant: |
AT&T Mobility II LLC |
Counter Claimant: |
AT&T Mobility II LLC |
Counter Defendant: |
Morris Reese |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv05198 |
Filed: |
July 18, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Paul L. Abrams |
Presiding Judge: |
Otis D. Wright |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 24, 2018 |
Filing
56
FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:1. Plaintiff Morris Reese shall take nothing; 2. Judgment is entered on behalf of all of the Defendants in this, thelead case (Sprint Nextel Corp. (2:13-cv-3811-ODW(PLAx))), as well as in thefollowing relate d cases: a. TracFone Wireless, Inc. (2:13-cv-5196-ODW(PLAx));b. Verizon Wireless Services LLC (2:13-cv-5197- ODW(PLAx)); c. AT&T Mobility II LLC (2:13-cv-5198-ODW(PLAx)); and d. T-Mobile USA (2:13-cv-5199-ODW(PLAx));3. Defendant AT&T Mobility II LLCs and T-Mobile USAs pending Motions to Amend are dismissed without prejudice (2:13-cv-5198-ODW-PLA ECF No. 49; 2:13-cv-5199-ODW-PLA, ECF No. 60); 4. The Defendants counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice; 5. All dates and deadlines are VACATED; and 6. The Clerk of the Court shall close each case pending resolution of any application for costs or fees. (lc)
|
April 9, 2018 |
Filing
55
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT y Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court GRANTS Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment.. The Court ORDERS the parties to file a joint status report no later than April 23, 2018, detailing what claims , if any, remain for the Court to resolve, including whether adjudication of Defendants AT&T and TMobiles pending motions to amend is necessary given the outcome of the Motion for Summary Judgment. If there are no further claims remaining, the parties shall submit a proposed final judgment for the Courts review. (lc) .Modified on 4/9/2018. (lc).
|
September 23, 2014 |
Filing
43
JUDGMENT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff Morris Reese shall take nothing; 2. Judgment for each of the Defendants in each of the following related cases: a. Sprint Nextel Corp. (2:13-cv-3811-ODW(PLAx)); b. TracFone Wire less, Inc. (2:13-cv-5196-ODW(PLAx)); c. Verizon Wireless Services LLC (2:13-cv-5197-ODW(PLAx)); d. AT&T Mobility II LLC (2:13-cv-5198-ODW(PLAx)); and e. T-Mobile USA (2:13-cv-5199-ODW(PLAx)). 3. Defendants' counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. 4. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. Related to: MOTION for Summary Judgment 28 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lom)
|
May 9, 2014 |
Filing
36
ORDER GRANTING AT&T Mobility II LLC. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 28 . A Judgment will issue. The parties are directed to file a joint status report detailing what issues, if any, remain for this Court to decide by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc). Modified on 5/9/2014. (lc).
|
February 26, 2014 |
Filing
26
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 25 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court ORDERS AT&Ts to notice its summary-judgment motion for hearing on Monday, April 14, 2014, to coordinate with the other defendants summary-judgment motions. (lc). Modified on 2/26/2014 (lc).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?