J Paul Getty Trust et al v. Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves
Plaintiff: J Paul Getty Trust and J Paul Getty Museum
Defendant: Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves
Case Number: 2:2013cv06561
Filed: September 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary A Feess
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2014 Filing 34 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff J Paul Getty Trust. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Li, Luis)
September 19, 2014 Filing 33 NOTICE of Case Status filed by Plaintiff J Paul Getty Trust. (Li, Luis)
July 22, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE of Case Status filed by Plaintiff J Paul Getty Trust. (Li, Luis)
June 24, 2014 Filing 31 DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED as to *Defendant Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves* (smo)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess: Plaintiff was ordered to show cause why the Court should not dismiss the case. On 6/18/2014, plaintiff filed the required Request for Clerk to Enter Default [27 and 28], which sufficiently addresses the Order to Show Cause. Accordingly, the Court's Order to Show Cause is VACATED. For good cause shown, the Court grants plaintiff's Request for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Geraud Marid De Sabran-Ponteves. The Clerk is instructed to issue a default by clerk pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 55(a). Plaintiff is reminded to timely seek default judgment, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b) or notify the Court that default judgment will not be sought, at which point the clerk will close this matter. (smo)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Response to Order to Show Cause, #28 , REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves, #27 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Response (Non-Motion) UNDER Other Filings --> Miscellaneous Filings (Non-Motion) re doc #28. Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely.Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): Document #27 proposed order is not submitted as an attachment, Default would be determined by District Judge because of foreign service. Document #28 docket entry states matter is a Noticed Motion. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lw)
June 18, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order to Show Cause re: default judgment RESPONSE OF PLAINTIFF TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Plaintiff J Paul Getty Trust. Motion set for hearing on 6/18/2014 at 03:30 PM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (Li, Luis)
June 18, 2014 Filing 27 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves filed by Plaintiff J Paul Getty Trust. Request set for hearing on 6/18/2014 at 03:30 PM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luis Li)(Li, Luis)
May 29, 2014 Filing 26 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Gary A. Feess: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION Plaintiff(s) are ORDERED to show cause why this case should not be dismissed, for lack of prosecution. Link v. Wabash R. Co., 370 U.S. 626 (1962) (court has inherent power to dismiss for lack of prosecution on its own motion). In this matter: Defendant(s) did not answer the complaint, yet Plaintiff(s) have failed to request entry of default, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). Plaintiff(s) can satisfy this order by seeking entry of default or by dismissing the complaint. Plaintiffs must respond to this order within 20 days. Failure to respond to this OSC will be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 6/18/2014. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 18, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE HARDER MIRELL & ABRAMS LLP'S RESPONSE TO AND NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S APRIL 17, 2014, ORDER RE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves. (Mirell, Douglas)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER re: Motion to Withdraw as Counsel by Judge Gary A. Feess: Court GRANTS the motion to withdraw #21 . HMA is ORDERED (1) to provide both Plaintiff and the Court with Defendants contact information, so that he may receive future court filings, and (2) to provide Sabran-Pontevs with this order. HMA shall comply with this order no later than Friday, April 25, 2014. The hearing currently scheduled for Monday, April 28, 2014, is hereby VACATED. (smo)
April 4, 2014 Filing 23 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS. In accordance with the Notice to Filer Of Deficiencies In Electronically Filed Documents #22 re MOTION of Harder Mirell & Abrams LLP to Withdraw as Attorney #21 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED The document is accepted as filed. (cb)
April 3, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION of Harder Mirell & Abrams LLP to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Geraud Marie de Sabran-Ponteves #21 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is not timely. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lw)
April 1, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Harder Mirell & Abrams LLP to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Geraud Marie de Sabran-Ponteves filed by Defendant Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves. Motion set for hearing on 4/28/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Mirell, Douglas)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation to Stay Case #19 : Based upon the stipulation of the parties, and good cause appearing therefor, the above-captioned action shall be and is hereby stayed through and including Monday, April 7, 2014. (bm)
February 5, 2014 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Negotiation of a Non-Litigated Resolution filed by DEFENDANT Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Stipulation To Stay Action)(Mirell, Douglas)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE AND FILING OF RESPONSE TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer #17 , by Judge Gary A. Feess: Based upon the stipulation of the parties, and good cause appearing therefor, the time for filing and serving a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is hereby further extended to Wednesday, February 5, 2014. (bm)
January 29, 2014 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves answer now due 2/5/2014, filed by DEFENDANT Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Extend Time for Service and Filing of Response to First Amended Complaint)(Mirell, Douglas)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Stipulation #14 . Time for filing and serving a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint is hereby extended to January 29, 2014 by Judge Gary A. Feess. (ir)
January 22, 2014 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff J Paul Getty Museum, J Paul Getty Trust, served on October 31, 2013. (Li, Luis)
January 22, 2014 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves answer now due 1/29/2014, filed by PLAINTIFF Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Extend Time for Service and Filing of Response to First Amended Complaint)(Mirell, Douglas)
January 2, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of address by Jeffrey Ian Abrams attorney for Defendant Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves. Changing attorneys address to 1925 Century Park East, Suite 800, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Defendant Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves. (Abrams, Jeffrey)
January 2, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of address by Douglas E Mirell attorney for Defendant Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves. Changing attorneys address to 1925 Century Park East, Suite 800, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Defendant Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves. (Attorney Douglas E Mirell added to party Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves(pty:dft))(Mirell, Douglas)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess: granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #10 , Defendant Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves response to the First Amended Complaint due 1/22/2014. (lw)
November 22, 2013 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 01/22/14 re Amended Complaint, #7 filed by DEFENDANT Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation)(Attorney Jeffrey Ian Abrams added to party Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves(pty:dft))(Abrams, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2013 Filing 9 Demand for Jury Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 38(b) filed by Plaintiff J Paul Getty Trust (Li, Luis)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES: (In Chambers)ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On September 16, 2013, the Court ordered Plaintiff to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction due to Plaintiff's failure to allege the citizenship of its Trustees #5 . (Docket No. 5, [09/16/2013 Order] at 2.) Plaintiff timely responded on September 23, 2013, also amending its complaint to allege the citizenship of each of its Trustees, as well as the citizenship of Defendant #6 . (Docket No. 6, [Response to Order to Show Cause]; Docket No. 7, [First Amended Complaint] 23-26.) Based on the newly alleged citizenship, it appears that this Court has subject matter jurisdiction. The Court's September 16, 2013, Order to Show Cause is accordingly VACATED IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Gary A. Feess. (ir)
September 23, 2013 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves; Party J Paul Getty Museum terminated amending Complaint #1 , filed by plaintiff J Paul Getty Trust. (bm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2013: #1 Summons on First Amended Complaint) (bm).
September 23, 2013 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint, #7 as to Defendant Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves. (bm)
September 23, 2013 Filing 6 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs J Paul Getty Museum, J Paul Getty Trustto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #5 TO SEPTEMBER 16, 2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Li, Luis)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Gary A. Feess: The Court therefore cannot determine whether it has jurisdiction over the present case. Plaintiffs are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs' response is due by the close of business on Monday, September 23, 2013. Failure to respond will be deemed consent to dismissal of the action. re: Complaint - (Discovery), #1 . (bp)
September 6, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
September 6, 2013 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs J Paul Getty Museum, J Paul Getty Trust. (et) (mg).
September 6, 2013 Filing 2 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendant Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves. (et)
September 6, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves. Case assigned to Judge Gary A. Feess for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs J Paul Getty Trust, J Paul Getty Museum.(et) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J Paul Getty Trust et al v. Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J Paul Getty Trust
Represented By: Amelia L B Sargent
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Levin
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Fred A Rowley, Jr
Represented By: Luis Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J Paul Getty Museum
Represented By: Amelia L B Sargent
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Levin
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Fred A Rowley, Jr
Represented By: Luis Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geraud Marie De Sabran-Ponteves
Represented By: Douglas E Mirell
Represented By: Jeffrey Ian Abrams
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Eagan Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?