William G. Colson, Jr. et al v. Samson Hair Restoration, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dorothy R. Colson, William G. Colson, Jr. and W. Thomas Farley Judgment Creditor and Assignee of Record doing business as T and J Judgment Enforcers
Defendant: Samson Hair Restoration, LLC, Geoffrey D. Stiller, Uplift Cosmetic Surgery, Samson Medical Group, Professional Corporation, Sampson Medical Group Corporation and Laser and Skin Center, PLLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv08489
Filed: November 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: George H King
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 52 Mail Returned addressed to W. Thomas Farley re USM-285 Service of non-complaint documents - Executed #51 (hr)
October 7, 2021 Filing 51 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) returned executed upon JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. on 9/15/2021. (iv)
October 7, 2021 Filing 50 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) returned executed upon Bank of America on 9/15/2021. (iv)
September 28, 2021 Filing 49 Mail Returned addressed to W. Thomas Farley re Order #48 (hr)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION #47 by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The judgment debtor examination of Samson is continued as follows: Date: January 12, 2022, Time: 10:00 a.m., Location: 255 East Temple Street, Courtroom 540, Los Angeles, California 90012. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (clee)
September 20, 2021 Filing 47 First STIPULATION to Continue JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION from September 22, 2021 to January 12, 2022 Re: Order on Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam #34 filed by Defendant Samson Hair Restoration, LLC.(Attorney Khachik Akhkashian added to party Samson Hair Restoration, LLC(pty:dft))(Akhkashian, Khachik)
September 1, 2021 Filing 46 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Assignee of Record G R Isidro, re document of information of the Judgment Debtor Exam, 35 served on 8/30/2021. (shb)
August 27, 2021 Filing 45 Mail Returned addressed to W. Thomas Farley re Notice of Document Discrepancies - Granting,, #25 (shb)
August 27, 2021 Filing 44 Mail Returned addressed to W. Thomas Farley re Notice of Reassignment of Case #26 (shb)
August 20, 2021 Filing 43 Mail Returned addressed to W. Thomas Farley re Order on Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam #34 (hr)
August 20, 2021 Filing 42 Mail Returned addressed to W. Thomas Farley re Subpoena Request (AO 88) #32 (hr)
August 20, 2021 Filing 41 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Assignee of Record G R Isidro, re 1) Order to Appear for Examination of Judgment Debtor #34 , 2) Subpoena to Produce Documents, et al., 3) Attachments 1 to 4 served on 8/13/21 upon Tina Akhkashian/Samson Hair Restoration LLC. (hr)
August 20, 2021 Filing 40 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Assignee of Record G R Isidro, re 1) Order to Appear for Examination of Judgment Debtor #34 , 2) Subpoena to Produce Documents, et al., 3) Attachments 1 to 4 served on 8/13/21 upon William McCullough/CEO/Samson Hair Restoration, LLC. (hr)
August 17, 2021 Filing 39 Mail Returned addressed to W. Thomas Farley re Subpoena Request #31 (hr)
August 17, 2021 Filing 38 Mail Returned addressed to W. Thomas Farley re Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution #30 (hr)
August 17, 2021 Filing 37 Mail Returned addressed to W. Thomas Farley re APPLICATION for Judgment Debtor Exam as to Samson Hair Restoration, LLC #29 (hr)
August 12, 2021 Filing 36 Writ of Execution Issued against Laser and Skin Center, PLLC, Sampson Medical Group Corporation, Samson Hair Restoration, LLC, Samson Medical Group, Professional Corporation, Geoffrey D. Stiller, Uplift Cosmetic Surgery re: Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution #30 . (hr)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. In addition to filing the required proof of service of the Order to Appear for Examination, Assignee of Record shall establish electronic or verbal contact with the Judgment Debtor by no later than 7 calendar days before the scheduled proceeding. Thereafter, Assignee of Record shall advise the Courtroom Deputy Clerk whether the parties will be prepared and present for the hearing. If Assignee of Record is unable to serve or make contact with the Judgment Debtor, Assignee of Record shall contact the Courtroom Deputy Clerk to seek continuance or vacate the hearing. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (clee) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR #29 by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 9/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 540, 5th Floor, Roybal Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (clee)
August 10, 2021 Filing 33 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION for Judgment Debtor Exam as to Samson Hair Restoration, LLC #27 by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The document is stricken. (clee)
August 9, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for Judgment Debtor Exam as to Samson Hair Restoration, LLC #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Writ of Execution and Subpoenas were erroneously scanned and attached to the Application for Judgment Debtor Exam #27 . The documents shall be re-filed with the file date of July 27, 2021.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
August 5, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE filed. Pursuant to document # 25 filed 08/04/2021. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to conduct judgment debtor examination. Case number will now read 2:13-cv-08489 GHK(SKx). (rn)
August 4, 2021 Filing 24 Mail Returned addressed to W. Thomas Farley re Order on Motion for Order,,, #23 (shb)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER, #22 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that C.M. Liang, Los Angeles County Registration Process Server Red. No. 2018279690, Sarah Larios, San Bernardino County Registration Process Server Reg No. 1827 or any registered process server who is at least 18 years of age, of suitable discretion and not a party to the within action, be authorized and appointed to serve any and all judgment enforcement documents or items necessary in the above case. The U.S. Marshal has requested that the Court appoint Registered Process Servers to serve any and all Bank Levies. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the U.S. Marshals Office shall remain the Levying Officer. IT IS SO ORDERED. See order for more details. (shb)
July 2, 2021 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ORDER FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER filed by Interested Party G R Isidro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (shb)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS Order Regarding G.R. Isidros Notice of and Acknowledgmentof Assignment of Judgment and Proof of Service by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Court, sua sponte, reverses the prior rejection of the documents titled Notice of and Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment and Proof of Service that were submitted by G.R. Isidro and received on January 22, 2021. See Dkt. # 15. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Notice of and Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment and Proof of Service1 shall be filed and processed. Isidro shall immediately notify, in writing, all parties that were previously served with these documents that said documents have now been filed with the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. See order for further details. (shb)
March 17, 2021 Filing 19 Mail Returned addressed to W. Thomas Farley re Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting, #13 (shb)
March 17, 2021 Filing 18 Mail Returned addressed to W. Thomas Farley re Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting, #14 (shb)
March 16, 2021 Filing 17 Mail Returned addressed to W. Thomas Farley re Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order #15 . (iv)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, ORDERING Letter to Court, File on Demand Notice and Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment submitted by Interested Party G R Isidro received on February 19, 2021 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Local Rule 83-2.5 - No letters to the judge; G.R. Isidro is not a party to the action. (shb)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, ORDERING Notice of and Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment; Proof of Service submitted by G.R. Isidro-Assignee of Record re Plaintiffs Dorothy R. Colson, William G. Colson, Jr received on 1/22/21 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: G.R. Isidro is not a party to the action. (lom)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Chief Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: re Proof of Service. The document is NOT to be filed, but instead, REJECTED, and is ORDERED returned to counsel. Counsel shall immediately notify, in writing, all parties previously served with the attached documents that said document have not been filed with the COurt. (shb)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, ORDERING Notice and Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment submitted by Plaintiffs Dorothy R. Colson, William G. Colson, Jr received on December 16, 2020 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Fed. R. Civ. P. 5 - No proof of service attached to document(s). (shb)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 Mail Returned addressed to W. Thomas Farley re Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting, #11 (shb)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The request for Order for service of Process by Registered Process Server re G. R. Isidro is not a party to the action. The document is NOT to be filed but instead REJECTED and is Ordered Returned to counsel. Counsel shall immediately notify, in writing all parties previously served with the attached documents that said document have not been filed with the Court. (shb)
December 12, 2013 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL filed by Plaintiffs served Writ of Execution, Notice of Levy, Exemptions from the Enforcement of Judgments, Claim of Exemption Current Dollar amounts of Exemptions from Enforcement of Judgments on 12/10/13. (ir)
December 12, 2013 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Dorothy R. Colson, William G. Colson, Jr, W. Thomas Farley served Writ of Execution, Notice of Levy, Memorandum of Garnishee served on Felix Sandoval, Assistant Branch Manager on 12/10/13. (ir)
December 12, 2013 Filing 8 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) returned executed upon Wells Fargo Bank (Bank Levy on accounts) at 988 N Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 on 12/10/13. Remarks: Served 12/10/13; Mailed 12/10/13. (ir)
December 5, 2013 Filing 7 WRIT of Execution issued. The pending REQUEST for Writ of Execution #6 and associated hearing date have been terminated. (bp)
December 5, 2013 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT AND REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION filed by Plaintiffs Dorothy R. Colson, William G. Colson, Jr. (bp)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge George H. King: Application for service of process by Registered Process Server #4 . Gitta Williams and Cyntia Erickson are hereby authorized to serve legal process in this matter including writs of execution. The US Marshal's Service shall remain the levying officer. (ir)
November 15, 2013 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROCESS SERVER filed by plaintiff W. Thomas Farley. Lodged proposed order. (esa)
November 15, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE of Judge Assignment by Clerk. New case number is 2:13-cv-8489 GHK. (esa)
November 15, 2013 MISCELLANEOUS CASE REOPENED (esa)
October 18, 2013 Filing 2 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT filed by creditor W. Thomas Farley: William G. Colson, Jr. and Dorothy R. Colson, the Plaintiff in the above action, do hereby grant and convey all rights, titles, and ownership of said judgment to: W. Thomas Farley dba T and J Judgment Enforcers, 817 S. Los Angeles St., 2D, Los Angeles, CA 90014. 213.986.6020. (bm)
October 8, 2013 Filing 1 CERTIFICATION OF JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiffs William G. Colson, Jr, Dorothy R. Colson; received from Western District of North Carolina, case number 3:12-cv-123-FDW-DCK; entered in the sending district on 7/29/13; entered in this district on 8/16/13.(esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William G. Colson, Jr. et al v. Samson Hair Restoration, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samson Hair Restoration, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey D. Stiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uplift Cosmetic Surgery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samson Medical Group, Professional Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sampson Medical Group Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laser and Skin Center, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy R. Colson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William G. Colson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. Thomas Farley Judgment Creditor and Assignee of Record doing business as T and J Judgment Enforcers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?