Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation
Plaintiff: Michael Mandahl, Kendall Snyder, Kamneel Maharaj, Bobby Brandon Armstrong, Travis Brissey, Kelly Moffett, Lourdes Vargas, Steven Craig, Maria Figueroa, Erin L Fanthorpe, Michael DeSouto, Reece Philip Thomson, Bill Holvey, Eric Graewingholt, Mary J Moran-Spicuzza, Peter Blumer, Chad McKinney, Nicole Marie Hunter, Hattie Williams, Eric Hadesh, Ursula Pyland, Lin McKinney, Randy Rickert, Brandon Potter, Stephen Hayes, Phillip Hoffman, Josipa Casey, Jeffrey Hathaway, Giuseppina Roberto, Melissa Leggett, Laura S Sutta, Gunther Krauth, Gayle A Stephenson, Luan Snyder, Donald Kendig, Edwin Naythons, Kim Iocovozzi, Joseph Bowe, Ayman Mousa, John Gentry, Rebecca Sanders, Donald Brown, Lydia Kievit, Steve B Perry, Brian Nguyen, Lillian E Levoff, John J Dixson, Michael Brein, Sam Hammond, Ronald J Burkard, Alberto Dominguez, Jerold Terhost, George Rudy, Eric J Olson, Brian Reeves, Joel A. Lipman, David E Hill, Debra Simmons, Danielle Kay Gilleland, James Bonsignore, Kevin Gobel, Abelardo Morales, Brian Weber, Gary Pincas, Daniel Baldeschi, Carolyn Hammond, Robert Trader, Herbert J Young, Cameron John Cestaro, Linda Ruth Scott, Colnett Brubaker, Orlando Elliott, Nomer Medina, Andres Villicana, Sean Goldsberry, Douglas Kurash, Kehlie R Espinosa, Thomas Ganim, Ryan Cross, Thomas Schille, Mordechai Schiffer, Sergio Torres, Ashley Cephas, Carlos Medina, Douglas A Patterson, Michael P Keeth, Richard Woodruff, James Gudgalis, Constance Martyn, Kaye Kurash, Evan Grogan, Marcell Chapman, Margaret Setser, E Brandon Bowron, Sameria Goff, Eric Larson, John Chapman, Nicholas McDaniel, Bradford L Hirsch, Bryan Zirkel, Ira D. Dunst, Kathleen Wilson, James Kundrat, John Kirk MacDonald, Shelly Henderson, Holly Amromin, Jeremy Wilton, Laura Gill, Adam Cloutier, Jennifer Myers, Catherine Bernard, Ken Smiley, Leslie Bayard, Alex Maturani, Mark Leggett, Michael Breien, Aaron Simmons, Tom Woodward, Marshall Lawrence Gordon, Tricia Fellers, Owen Chapman, Georgia L Thomas, Judith Stanton, Michelle Singleton, Andres Carullo, Roman Starno, Robert Smith, Maria Kotova, Nilufar Rezai, Dennis J. Murphy, Michael Washburn, Thomas Purdy, Kaylene P Brady, Ben Baker, Guillermo Quiroz, Rocco Renghini, Mary D'Angelo, Lisa Sands, Cynthia Navarro, Gregory M Sonstein, Linda Hasper, Richard Williams, Mary P. Hoessler and Jack Rottner
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company, -, KIA Motors America, Byung Mo Ahn, Sarah Kundrat, Kia Motors Corporation, Grossinger Autoplex Inc, John Krafcik, Thomas Loveless, Steven Wilhite and Hyundai Motor America
Petitioner: Greg Direnzo and Plaintiffs
Other: Caitlin Ahearn, Andrew York, Dana Roland, Louis Bird, Antonio Sberna and Peri Fetsch
In Re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation
Case Number: 2:2013ml02424
Filed: February 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 576 NOTICE of Change of address by Steve W Berman attorney for Plaintiffs Kaylene P Brady, Travis Brissey, Ronald J Burkard, Adam Cloutier, Steven Craig, John J Dixson, Erin L Fanthorpe, Eric Hadesh, Nicole Marie Hunter, Michael P Keeth, John Kirk MacDonald, Michael Mandahl, Nicholas McDaniel, Mary J Moran-Spicuzza, Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Gregory M Sonstein, Roman Starno, Gayle A Stephenson, Andres Villicana, Richard Williams. Changing attorneys address to 1301 2nd Ave., Ste. 2000 Seattle, WA 98101. Filed by Plaintiffs Kaylene P Brady, Travis Brissey, Ronald J Burkard, Adam Cloutier, Steven Craig, John J Dixson, Erin L Fanthorpe, Eric Hadesh, Nicole Marie Hunter, Michael P Keeth, John Kirk MacDonald, Michael Mandahl, Nicholas McDaniel, Mary J Moran-Spicuzza, Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Gregory M Sonstein, Roman Starno, Gayle A Stephenson, Andres Villicana, Richard Williams. (Berman, Steve)
October 2, 2018 Filing 575 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Scott M Grzenczyk counsel for Plaintiffs Ryan Cross, Phillip Hoffman, Lin McKinney, Abelardo Morales, Debra Simmons. Changing Firm Name to Girard Sharp LLP. Changing e-mail to scottg@girardsharp.com. Filed by Plaintiffs Lin McKinney, Ryan Cross, Phillip Hoffman, Debra Simmons, and Abelardo Morales. (Grzenczyk, Scott)
June 6, 2018 Filing 574 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney William H Anderson counsel for Plaintiff Gunther Krauth. Changing Address/Firm Name to 4730 Table Mesa Drive, Suite G200, Boulder, CO 80305/ Handley & Anderson PLLC. Changing Email to wanderson@hajustice.com. Filed by Plaintiff Gunther Krauth. (Anderson, William)
April 20, 2018 Filing 573 Mail Returned addressed to Sherri N Watts re Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail, 568 . (mrgo)
April 3, 2018 Filing 572 Notice of Electronic Filing re USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order,, #567 e-mailed to sherri@harrybrownlaw.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.1.1 < is not a valid mailbox' (delivery attempts: 0). The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 3, 2018 Filing 571 Notice of Electronic Filing re USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order,, #567 e-mailed to shawn@dwsalaw.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'The mail server could not deliver mail to shawn@dwsalaw.com. The account\nor domain may not exist, they may be blacklisted, or missing the proper dns\nentries.' (delivery attempts: 0). The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 3, 2018 Filing 570 Notice of Electronic Filing re USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order,, #567 e-mailed to jason@groweeisen.com bounced due to 550 5.1.10 RESOLVER.ADR.RecipientNotFound; Recipient jason@groweeisen.com not found by SMTP address lookup. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 3, 2018 Filing 569 Notice of Electronic Filing re USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order,, #567 e-mailed to jfrei-pearson@mpnsb.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.1.1 <: Recipient address rejected: User unknown in relay recipient table' (delivery attempts: 0). The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 3, 2018 Filing 568 Notice of Electronic Filing re USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order,, #567 e-mailed to jth@henrettalaw.com bounced due to 5.1.2 - Bad destination host 'DNS Hard Error looking up henrettalaw.com (MX): NXDomain' (delivery attempts: 0). The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #497 filed by Andrew York, Caitlin Ahearn. CCA # 15-56014. The Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief of Public Justice, the National Association of Consumer Advocates, the National Consumer Law Center, and the Impact Fund in Support Petitions for En Banc Rehearing is GRANTED. The Amicus Curiae brief re-submitted on March 21, 2018, shall be deemed filed as of the date of this order. (mrgo)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #497 filed by Andrew York, Caitlin Ahearn. CCA # 15-56014. The Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Rehearing En Banc is GRANTED. The petition for rehearing en banc shall be filed with the Clerk's Office no later than March 8, 2018. (mrgo)
January 23, 2018 Filing 565 OPINION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #498 filed by Antonio Sberna, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #497 filed by Andrew York, Caitlin Ahearn, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #505 filed by Linda Ruth Scott, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #500 filed by Peri Fetsch, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #506 filed by Michael DeSouto, Linda Ruth Scott, Joseph Bowe, Danielle Kay Gilleland, John Gentry, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #503 filed by Dana Roland. CCA # 15-56014 15-56025 15-56059 15-56061 15-56064 and 15-56067. VACATED AND REMANDED. (mat)
November 2, 2017 Filing 564 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Robert Ahdoot counsel for Plaintiff Laura S Sutta. Changing Address to 10728 Lindbrook Drive Los Angeles, California 90024. Filed by Plaintiff Robert Ahdoot. (Ahdoot, Robert)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal #498 filed by Antonio Sberna, Notice of Appeal #497 filed by Andrew York, Caitlin Ahearn, Notice of Appeal #505 filed by Linda Ruth Scott, Notice of Appeal #500 filed by Peri Fetsch, Notice of Appeal #506 filed by Michael DeSouto, Linda Ruth Scott, Joseph Bowe, Danielle Kay Gilleland, John Gentry, Notice of Appeal #503 filed by Dana Roland. CCA # 15-56014 15-56025 15-56059 15-56061 15-56064 and 15-56067. Appellees' motion to consolidate Nos. 15-56064 and 15-56067 with previously consolidated Nos. 15-56014, 15-56025, 15-56059, and 15-56061 is granted. [See document for all details] (mat)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 562 DISMISSAL ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, In light of the above, it is Ordered that In re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation, MDL 13-2424-GW(FFMx), is hereby DISMISSED. (pj)
November 3, 2015 Filing 561 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 1/9/2014 re Transcript #560 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (at) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 3, 2015 Filing 560 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1/9//2014. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: ROSALYN ADAMS, email address rosalyn.adams494@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/4/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2016. (at)
October 6, 2015 Filing 559 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings Thursday, May 23, 2013; 9:34 A.M. re Transcript #558 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Wilcox, Wil) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 6, 2015 Filing 558 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Thursday, May 23, 2013; 9:34 A.M. Court Reporter: Wil S. Wilcox, phone number 213-290-2849. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/27/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2016. (Wilcox, Wil)
October 5, 2015 Filing 557 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/6/13 9am re Transcript #556 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Kleeger, Sheri) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 5, 2015 Filing 556 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/6/13 9am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sheri Kleeger, phone number 213-894-6604. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/26/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2016. (Kleeger, Sheri)
October 5, 2015 Filing 555 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/28/13 9am re Transcript #554 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Kleeger, Sheri) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 5, 2015 Filing 554 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/28/13 9am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sheri kleeger, phone number 213-894-6604. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/26/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2016. (Kleeger, Sheri)
September 16, 2015 Filing 553 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/21/14 9:30 am re Transcript #552 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 16, 2015 Filing 552 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/21/14 9:30 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/7/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2015. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
September 16, 2015 Filing 551 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/25/13 1:36 pm; 9/26/13 10:20 am; 9/3/14 9:03 am; 5/7/15 10:19 am re Transcript #548 , #547 , #550 , #549 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 16, 2015 Filing 550 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/7/15 10:19 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/7/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2015. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
September 16, 2015 Filing 549 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/3/14 9:03 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/7/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2015. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
September 16, 2015 Filing 548 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/26/13 10:20 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/7/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2015. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
September 16, 2015 Filing 547 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/25/13 1:36 pm. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/7/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2015. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
September 15, 2015 Filing 546 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings September 10, 2014, 11:03 a.m. re Transcript #545 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mwo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 15, 2015 Filing 545 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on September 10, 2014, 11:03 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Marea Woolrich, mareawoolrich@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2015. (mwo)
September 14, 2015 Filing 544 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Order Dismissing Case, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings #543 . This case was closed in error which should have been closed in case number 2:13-cv-815-GW. This case will be reopened. (pj)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge George H. Wu, Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (kss)
September 11, 2015 Filing 542 First AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CIRCUIT filed by Objector Caitlin Ahearn, Andrew York. Amending Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #497 Filed On: 6/30/15; Entered On: 6/30/15; (Pentz, John)
September 3, 2015 Filing 541 First AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CIRCUIT filed by Objcetor Appellant Antonio Sberna. Amending Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #498 Filed On: 07/01/15; Entered On: 06/01/15 and 06/11/15; (Miller, Steve)
September 1, 2015 Filing 540 SEALED DOCUMENT - JOINT NOTICE OF LODGING the List of Class Members Requesting to be Excluded from the Settlement. (gk)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER GRANTING SETTLING PARTIES APPLICATION TO SEAL THE LIST OF CLASS MEMBERS REQUESTING TO BE EXCLUDED FROM THE SETTLEMENT by Judge George H. Wu: #537 (pj)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 538 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu: ORDER RE APPEALABILITY. (mat)
August 27, 2015 Filing 537 SETTLING PARTIES' JOINT APPLICATION TO SEAL filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company, KIA Motors America. (lom)
August 27, 2015 Filing 536 NOTICE OF LODGING filed (Public Redacted Version of Joint Notice of Lodging The List Of Class Members Requesting To Be Excluded From The Settlement) re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), #535 (Morgan, Shon)
August 27, 2015 Filing 535 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America of Settling Parties' Joint Application to Seal, Proposed Order Granting Settling Parties' Application to Seal, and Unredacted Version Of The Joint Notice Of Lodging The List Of Class Members Requesting To Be Excluded From The Settlement. (Morgan, Shon)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ORDER RECOMMENDING TO JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION: (1) TERMINATION OF MULTIDlSTRICT LITIGATION PROCEEDING No. 2424, and (2) REMAND OF CERTAIN TRANSFERRED CASES by Judge George H. Wu: This Court recommends to the JPML that t~e MDL case known as "In re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation" (MDL No. 2424) be terminated. Should the JPML accept this Court's recommendation to terminate this proceeding, the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Central District of California shall close MDL No. 2424, and dismiss all actions consolidated into the MDL except for those cases which will, pursuant to the order of the JPML, be remanded back to their originating courts. the Court recommends remanding to the Virginia courts the remaining portions of the Gentry, Abdurahman and Abdul-Mumit cases which would consist of the: (1) that portion of the class as defined in those cases which did not overlap with the class set out in MDL No. 2424 (i.e. persons who purchased 2011-2013 Hyundai Elantra vehicles in Virginia after the 11/2/2012 notice date), and (2) any class members in those cases who timely opted out of the settlement in this MDL. (gk)
August 18, 2015 Filing 533 REPORT of Liaison Counsel Listing Non-Settling Plaintiffs Supporting or Not Objecting to the Settlement filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Gibbs, Eric)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR INCENTIVE AWARDS FOR THE NAMED PLAINTIFFS IN HUNTER AND BRADY by Judge George H. Wu: The Court having granted the joint motion for final approval of the class settlement #444 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs Nicole Hunter, Kaylene Brady, Travis Brissey, Ronald Burkard, Adam Cloutier, Steven Craig, John Dixson, Erin Fanthorpe, Eric Hadesh, Michael Keeth, John Kirk MacDonald, Michael Mandahl, Nicholas McDaniel, Mary Moran-Spicuzza, Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Gregory Sonstein, Roman Starno, Gayle Stephenson, Andres Villicana, and Richard Williams from the Brady and Hunter actions are each awarded $1,250 for their respective contributions in representing and furthering the interests of the class. (gk)
August 7, 2015 Filing 531 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Motion Hearing,, Order on Motion for Settlement, #495 , MOTION for Settlement Approval #444 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morgan, Shon)
August 6, 2015 Filing 529 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Appellant Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott Court Reporter. Court will contact James Feinman at jb@jfeinman.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 9/10/14 by Marea Woolrich. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Feinman, James)
August 6, 2015 Filing 528 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Appellant Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott Court Reporter. Court will contact James Feinman at jb@jfeinman.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 1/9/14 by Rosalyn Adams. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Feinman, James)
August 6, 2015 Filing 527 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Appellant Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott Court Reporter. Court will contact James Feinman at jb@jfeinman.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 5/23/13 by Wil Wilcox. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Feinman, James)
August 6, 2015 Filing 526 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Appellant Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott Court Reporter. Court will contact James Feinman at jb@jfeinman.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 4/25/13, 9/26/13, 9/3/14, 10/6/14, 5/7/15 by Katie Thibodeaux. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Feinman, James)
August 6, 2015 Filing 525 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Appellant Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott Court Reporter. Court will contact James B. Feinman at jb@jfeinman.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 3/28/13. 6/6/13 by Sheri Kleeger. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Feinman, James)
August 6, 2015 Filing 524 TRANSCRIPT ORDER Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott Court Reporter. Court will contact James Feinman at jb@jfeinman.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Voir Dire on 9/10/14 by Marea Woolrich. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Feinman, James)
August 6, 2015 Filing 523 TRANSCRIPT ORDER Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott Court Reporter. Court will contact James Feinman at jb@jfeinman.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Voir Dire on 1/9/14 by Rosalyn Adams. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Feinman, James)
August 6, 2015 Filing 522 TRANSCRIPT ORDER Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott Court Reporter. Court will contact James Feinman at jb@jfeinman.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Voir Dire on 5/23/13 by Wil Wilcox. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Feinman, James)
August 6, 2015 Filing 521 TRANSCRIPT ORDER Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott Court Reporter. Court will contact James Feinman at jb@jfeinman.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Voir Dire on 4/25/13, 9/26/13, 9/3/14, 10/6/14, 5/7/15 by Katie Thibodeaux. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Feinman, James)
August 6, 2015 Filing 520 TRANSCRIPT ORDER Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott Court Reporter. Court will contact James Feinman at jb@jfeinman.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Voir Dire on 6/6/13 by Sheri Kleeger. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Feinman, James)
August 6, 2015 Filing 519 TRANSCRIPT ORDER Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott Court Reporter. Court will contact James Feinman at jb@jfeinman.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Voir Dire on 3/28/13 by Sheri Kleeger. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Feinman, James)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS by Judge George H. Wu: The attorneys' fees listed in this unified Order include certain fees awarded in the Court's prior Orders in this matter and do not grant a further fee award. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) Ahdoot & Wolfson, PC is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $5,000.00; and (2) Albukerk & Associates is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $1,200.00 and costs in the amount of $350.00; and (3) Berger & Montague, P.C. is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $26,397.00 and costs in the amount of $2,252.09; and (4) Berman DeValerio and Bell Davis Pitt are awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $205,000 and costs in the amount of $5,534,34; and (5) Bonsignore PLLC is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $162,500.00 and costs in the amount of $2707.35; and (6) Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel, LLP is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $250,000.00 and costs in the amount of $4,623.56; and (7) Crowley Norman LLP and Payne Mitchell Law Group, LLP, Doyle Lowther LLP, Mauriello Law Firm, APC, and Whatley Kallas, LLP are awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $346,000.00 and costs in the amount of $3,773.57; and (8) Davis & Norris LLP is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $138,305.00 and costs in the amount of $1,768.91; and (9) Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin, LLC is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $7,000.00 and costs in the amount of $507.66; and (10) Finkelstein, Blankinship, Frei-Pearson & Garber LLP is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $44,944.77 and costs in the amount of $1,005.11; and (11) Girard Gibbs LLP is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $1,257,000.00 and costs in the amount of $66,000.00; and (12) Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $5,000.00; and (13) Goldenberg Schneider, LPA, and Minnillo & Jenkins, LPA are awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $97,209.40 and costs in the amount of $3,420.36; and (14) Gustafson Gluek PLLC is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $33,884 and costs in the amount of $607.55; and (15) Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $2,700,000.00 and costs in the amount of $250,000.00; and (16) Henretta Law Offices is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $4,000.00 and costs in the amount of $593.30; and (17) Hyde & Swigart is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $5,000.00; and (18) John P. Nash, Attorney, Inc. is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $7,500.00 and costs in the amount of $806.00; and (19) Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $134,930.00 and costs in the amount of $8,318.84; and (20) Kazerouni Law Group, APC is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $5,000.00; and (21) Law Offices of Lewis G. Adler and Law Offices of Paul DePetris are awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $27,494.00 and costs in the amount of $3,204.54; and (22) Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $6,000.00 and costs in the amount of $1,000.00; and (23) Milstein Adelman, LLP is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $5,500.00 and costs in the amount of $739.00; and (24) MLG Automotive Law, APLC is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $2,500.00; and (25) Shepherd, Finkelman, Miller & Shah, LLP and Pomerantz LLP are awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $65,571.00 and costs in the amount of $3,001.92; and (26) Simmons Hanly Conroy and McCallum, Methvin & Terrell, P.C. are awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $189,691.00 and costs in the amount of $13,021.33; and (27) Tate Law Group, LLC, Savage & Turner, P.C., and Law Office of Drew McElroy are awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $40,348.00 and costs in the amount of $3,999.21. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: All fees and awards entered in this matter shall be paid consistent with Section 12.3 of the Amended Settlement Agreement filed on 10/23/2014 (Dkt. No. 354-1). (gk)
August 4, 2015 Filing 518 NOTICE OF LODGING filed (Notice of Lodging of [Proposed] Order regarding Attorneys' Fees and Costs) re Motion Hearing,,,,,,,,, Link Motions to Minutes,,,,,,,,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,,,,,,,,, Order on Application for Attorney Fees,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Request for Extension of Time to File Document,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,,, #437 , Notice (Other) #504 , Notice (Other) #490 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morgan, Shon)
July 31, 2015 Filing 517 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Objector Appellant Antonio Sberna Court Reporter. Court will contact Steve A. Miller at sampc01@gmail.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Miller, Steve)
July 29, 2015 Filing 516 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/19/15 9:57 am; 7/2/15 9:00 am re Transcript #514 , #515 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 29, 2015 Filing 515 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/19/15 9:57 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2015. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
July 29, 2015 Filing 514 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/2/15 9:00 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2015. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
July 16, 2015 Filing 513 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Motion Hearing,, Order on Motion for Settlement, #495 , Order, #494 , as to Objector/Appellant Peri Fetsch Court Reporter. Court will contact Matthew Kurilich at mattkurilich@gmail.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Kurilich, Jr, Matthew)
July 15, 2015 Filing 512 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/11/15 10:11 am re Transcript #511 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 15, 2015 Filing 511 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/11/15 10:11 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2015. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
July 10, 2015 Filing 510 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-56067, 9TH CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #506 (car)
July 10, 2015 Filing 509 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-56064, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #505 as to plaintiff Linda Ruth Scott. (mat)
July 9, 2015 Filing 508 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-56059, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #500 as to Objector Peri Fetsch. (car)
July 9, 2015 Filing 507 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-56061, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #503 as to Appellant Dana Roland. (mat)
July 8, 2015 Filing 506 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. Appeal of Motion Hearing,,,,,,,,, Link Motions to Minutes,,,,,,,,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,,,,,,,,, Order on Application for Attorney Fees,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Request for Extension of Time to File Document,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,,, #437 , Motion Hearing,, Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #502 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-16045445 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement)(Feinman, James)
July 8, 2015 Filing 505 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Linda Ruth Scott. Appeal of Motion Hearing,, Order on Motion for Settlement, #495 , Motion Hearing,,,,,,,,, Link Motions to Minutes,,,,,,,,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,,,,,,,,, Order on Application for Attorney Fees,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Request for Extension of Time to File Document,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,,, #437 , Order on Request to Lift Stay on Case,,,, Motion Hearing,,,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, #290 , Order, #494 , Order on Motion to Certify Class Action,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Settlement,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Suggestion of Remand,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, #317 , Motion Hearing,, Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #502 , Motion Hearing,,,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,,, #267 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-16045138 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement)(Feinman, James)
July 7, 2015 Filing 504 NOTICE of Filing of Declaration of Henretta Law Offices filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Thomas Henretta)(Gibbs, Eric)
July 3, 2015 Filing 500 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Appellant Peri Fetsch. Appeal of Order, #494 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-16025046 paid.) (Kurilich, Jr, Matthew)
July 2, 2015 Filing 503 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Objector Dana Roland. Appeal of Order, #494 Filed On: 6/11/15; Entered On: 6/12/15; Filing fee $505 Paid, receipt number LA119466. (car)
July 2, 2015 Filing 502 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS GENTRY, ET AL., AND ABUDL-MUMIT, ET AL.'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER RULING ON ATTORNEY FEES FOR JAMES B. FEINMAN #491 : CourtMotion Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu:; denying #491 for Reconsideration. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (shb)
July 2, 2015 Filing 501 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-56025, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #498 as to Appellant Antonio Sberna. (mat)
July 1, 2015 Filing 499 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-56014, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #497 as to Plaintiff Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation. (mat)
July 1, 2015 Filing 498 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Objector Antonio Sberna. Appeal of Order, #494 , Order,,,,,,, Judgment Index - Add Record,,,,,, #489 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-16013125 paid.) (Miller, Steve)
June 30, 2015 Filing 497 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Objector Caitlin Ahearn, Andrew York. Appeal of Order, #494 , Order,,,,,,, Judgment Index - Add Record,,,,,, #489 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-15999743 paid.) (Pentz, John)
June 29, 2015 Filing 496 NOTICE of Change of firm name and address by Derek Yeats Brandt attorney for Plaintiffs Bobby Brandon Armstrong, James Gudgalis, Carolyn Hammond, Sam Hammond, Mary P. Hoessler, James Kundrat, Mark Leggett, Melissa Leggett, Guillermo Quiroz, Lisa Sands, Richard Woodruff. Changing firm name to Brandt Law LLC and address to P.O. Box 487, Edwardsville, IL 62025. Filed by Plaintiffs Bobby Brandon Armstrong, James Gudgalis, Carolyn Hammond, Sam Hammond, Mary P. Hoessler, James Kundrat, Mark Leggett, Melissa Leggett, Guillermo Quiroz, Lisa Sands, Richard Woodruff. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Brandt, Derek)
June 11, 2015 Filing 495 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu: The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. The Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement #444 is GRANTED. Court to issue order. Plaintiffs will file a document which names the plaintiffs who support the settlement as soon as conveniently possible. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (gk)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge George H. Wu. It is hereby ORDERED as follows: The Court approves the terms of the Amended Settlement Agreement as fair, reasonable, and adequate as it applies to the Class Representatives and the members of the Class under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23. The Court further directs implementation of all terms and provisions of the Amended Settlement Agreement. (Refer to attached document for details.) (lom)
June 11, 2015 Filing 493 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Reconsideration Motion to Reconsider Tentative Ruling on Attorney Fees for James B. Feinman, and Memorandum in Support Thereof #491 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby in Opposition to Motion to Reconsider Tentative Ruling on Attorney Fees for James B. Feinman, #2 Exhibit One, #3 Exhibit Two, #4 Exhibit Three, #5 Exhibit Four, #6 Exhibit Five, #7 Exhibit Six)(Morgan, Shon)
June 4, 2015 Filing 492 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel for PLAINTIFFS GENTRY, ET AL., AND ABUDL-MUMIT, ET AL., failed to comply with Local Rule 6. For that reason, the Court CONTINUES the MOTION TO RECONSIDER RULING ON ATTORNEY FEES FOR JAMES B. FEINMAN #491 previously scheduled for 06/11/2015 to 7/2/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 3, 2015 Filing 491 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration Motion to Reconsider Tentative Ruling on Attorney Fees for James B. Feinman, and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. Motion set for hearing on 6/11/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One, #2 Exhibit Two, #3 Exhibit Three, #4 Exhibit Four, #5 Exhibit Five, #6 Exhibit Six)(Feinman, James)
June 2, 2015 Filing 490 NOTICE of Additional Incurred Fees and Costs filed by Plaintiff Kaylene P Brady, Nicole Marie Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Declaration of Robert B. Carey)(Carey, Robert)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND MODIFYING IN PART ESPINOSA PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL McCUNEWRIGHT, LLP'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES, AND SERVICE AWARD TO REPRESENTATIVE PLAINTIFFS by Judge George H. Wu: Upon the Espinosa Plaintiffs' Motion #377 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that McCuneWright, LLP's request for an award of attorneys' fees and reimbursement of litigation expenses is granted in part and modified in part. The Court determines that attorneys' fees should be awarded by a lodestar analysis. The 3,029.4 hours of work submitted by McCuneWright at the time of the filing of the attorneys' fee motion are reasonable. The hourly rates of McCuneWright attorneys that vary from $450 to $650 an hour are reasonable. The lodestar of $1,836,210 submitted in support of the request is reasonable and is approved. The Court further applies a 1.5521 multiplier to the lodestar and orders an attorneys' fee award to McCuneWright of $2,850,000 through the time of filing the attorneys' fee motion. McCuneWright may file a supplemental fee request with the Court for reimbursement of attorneys' fees and litigation costs necessarily and reasonably incurred between the date the attorney fee motion was filed and the conclusion of the case. McCuneWright, LLP, is awarded $93,550.02 in litigation expenses that are reasonable and were necessarily expended in the case. Plaintiff Levoff is awarded $5,000 and Plaintiff Ganim is awarded $5,000 for their respective contribution in representing and furthering the interests of the class. (gk)
May 29, 2015 Filing 488 Opposition of Linda Ruth Scott, Named Plaintiff in Gentry, et al v. Hyundai, to Approval of Proposed Nationwide Settlement re: MOTION for Settlement Approval #444 filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Linda Ruth Scott)(Feinman, James)
May 28, 2015 Filing 487 SEALED DOCUMENT- REPLY Declaration of Josheph R. Ashby in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement. (mat)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: Upon Defendants' Application #484 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Unredacted Versions of Exhibits 5 and 6 to the Reply Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement, are deemed filed under seal. (gk)
May 28, 2015 Filing 485 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Order Granting in Part and Modifying in Part Espinosa Plaintiffs' Counsel McCuneWright, LLP's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Service Award to Representative Plaintiffs re Motion Hearing,,,,, Link Non-Motion Documents to Minutes,,,,, Link Motions to Minutes,,,,, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,,,,,,,, #475 , MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Service Award To Representative Plaintiffs #377 , Supplement(Motion related), #457 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCune, Richard)
May 27, 2015 Filing 483 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) #481 , Reply (Motion related) #482 e-mailed to Attorney Emily J Kirk at ekirk@simmonsfirm.com bounced due to invalid email address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 26, 2015 Filing 484 APPLICATION TO SEAL filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company, KIA Motors America. (pj)
May 26, 2015 Filing 482 REPLY in Support MOTION for Settlement Approval #444 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11)(Morgan, Shon)
May 26, 2015 Filing 481 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #479 . The following error(s) was found:The Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information G-06 document should have been efile as a separate document. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom)
May 26, 2015 Filing 480 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America of Defendants Application to Seal, [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Application to Seal, and Unredacted Version of the Reply Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement Including Exhibits 5 to 11. (Morgan, Shon)
May 22, 2015 Filing 479 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James Ben Feinman counsel for Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. Andrew Daniel Finnicum is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff John Gentry, Linda Scott, Danielle Gilleland, Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Contact Information)(Feinman, James)
May 11, 2015 Filing 478 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Kehlie R Espinosa, Thomas Ganim, Lillian E Levoff Court Reporter. Court will contact Ann Smith at ams@mccunewright.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 05/07/15-Motion Hearing. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (McCune, Richard)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER RE: INCENTIVE AWARDS TO NAMED PLAINTIFFS #473 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs Gunther Krauth, Linda Hasper, Kelly Moffett, Evan Grogan, Laura Gill, Carlos Medina, Alberto Dominguez, Catherine Bernard, Michael Breien, Thomas Schille, Judith Stanton, Randy Rickert, Bryan Zirkel and Louis Bird are awarded incentive payments of $1,250 each. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER RE: MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS by Judge George H. Wu. Based on the files and records in this matter, including the Stipulation Re: Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs #472 entered into by counsel for the Krauth, Hasper and Bird Plaintiffs, represented by the Consumer Watchdog Legal Team, and Defendants Hyundai Motor America and Kia Motors America, Inc., IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The Consumer Watchdog Legal Team is awarded attorneys' fees and costs in the combined amount of $281,329.97. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
May 7, 2015 Filing 475 KRAUTH/HASPER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES AND COMPENSATION TO NAMED PLAINTIFFS #371 ; ESPINOSA PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL McCUNEWRIGHT, LLP'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES, AND SERVICE AWARD TO REPRESENTATIVE PLAINTIFFS #377 Motion Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court reviews and signs the Stipulation for Attorneys Fees #472 and the Statement re: Incentive Awards #473 , filed by the Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs. The Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs' Motion for Payment of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Compensation to Named Plaintiffs #371 is deemed MOOT. Court hears oral argument as to the Espinosa Plaintiffs' Counsels Motion. For reasons stated on the record, the McCuneWright, LLP's Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Service Award to Representative Plaintiffs #377 is GRANTED in the amount of $2,850,000. McCuneWrights will file a proposed order forthwith. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lom)
May 7, 2015 Filing 474 NOTICE of Filing of Declaration of Albukerk & Associates filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Gibbs, Eric)
May 5, 2015 Filing 473 STATEMENT of Re: Incentive Awards to Named Plaintiffs as requested in MOTION for Attorney Fees #371 filed by Plaintiffs Catherine Bernard, Michael Breien, Alberto Dominguez, Laura Gill, Evan Grogan, Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth, Carlos Medina, Kelly Moffett, Randy Rickert, Thomas Schille, Judith Stanton, Bryan Zirkel, Objector Louis Bird. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Antonini, Laura)
May 5, 2015 Filing 472 STIPULATION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiffs Catherine Bernard, Michael Breien, Alberto Dominguez, Laura Gill, Evan Grogan, Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth, Carlos Medina, Kelly Moffett, Randy Rickert, Thomas Schille, Judith Stanton, Bryan Zirkel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Antonini, Laura)
May 5, 2015 Filing 471 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Service Award To Representative Plaintiffs #377 McCuneWright, LLP's Response to Defendants' Reply to McCuneWright, LLP's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Baldeschi, Kehlie R Espinosa, Thomas Ganim, Lillian E Levoff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard D. McCune In Support, #2 Exhibit "1" to McCune Decl., #3 Exhibit "2" to McCune Decl.)(McCune, Richard)
May 4, 2015 Filing 470 Opposition Opposition to Motion for Final Approval re: MOTION for Settlement Approval #444 filed by Objectors Caitlin Ahearn, Andrew York. (Attorney John J Pentz added to party Caitlin Ahearn(pty:obj), Attorney John J Pentz added to party Andrew York(pty:obj))(Pentz, John)
May 4, 2015 Filing 469 NOTICE Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. Notice of Continuing Objection of JW Gentry and Linda Scott and Opposition to Motion for Final Approval on the Grounds Repeatedly Raised Prior to Preliminary Approval (Feinman, James)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL by Judge George H. Wu: Upon Stipulation #466 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall adhere to the following dates: Oppositions to Motion for Final Approval #444 to be filed 5/4/2015. Replies in Support of Motion for Final Approval to be filed 5/26/2015. (gk)
April 27, 2015 Filing 467 OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Settlement Approval #444 filed by Plaintiffs Catherine Bernard, Michael Breien, Alberto Dominguez, Laura Gill, Evan Grogan, Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth, Carlos Medina, Kelly Moffett, Randy Rickert, Thomas Schille, Judith Stanton, Bryan Zirkel, Objector Louis Bird. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Antonini, Laura)
April 26, 2015 Filing 466 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions and Replies to Motion for Final Approval filed by Plaintiffs Catherine Bernard, Michael Breien, Alberto Dominguez, Laura Gill, Evan Grogan, Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth, Carlos Medina, Kelly Moffett, Randy Rickert, Thomas Schille, Judith Stanton, Bryan Zirkel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Antonini, Laura)
April 23, 2015 Filing 465 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Attorney Fees #371 Defendants' Reply to the Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum re: Payment of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Morgan, Shon)
April 23, 2015 Filing 464 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Service Award To Representative Plaintiffs #377 Defendants' Reply to McCuneWright, LLP's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Morgan, Shon)
April 20, 2015 Filing 461 NOTICE of Errata RE Supplemental Brief in Support of Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs Motion for Payment of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses (Dkt. 459) filed by Plaintiffs Catherine Bernard, Michael Breien, Alberto Dominguez, Laura Gill, Evan Grogan, Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth, Carlos Medina, Kelly Moffett, Randy Rickert, Thomas Schille, Judith Stanton, Bryan Zirkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs Motion for Payment of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, #2 Exhibit Corrected Supplemental Declaration of Laura Antonini in Support of Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs Motion for Payment of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, #3 Exhibit Corrected Supplemental Declaration of William Anderson in Support of Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs Motion for Payment of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses)(Antonini, Laura)
April 17, 2015 Filing 463 SEALED DOCUMENT - UNREDACTED VERSION of Espinosa Plaintiffs' Counsel McCuneWright, LLP's Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees. (gk)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #460 APPLICATION to Seal Unredacted Version of Espinosa Plaintiffs' Counsel McCune Wright, LLP's Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion For Attorney Fees. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the unredacted versions of Espinosa Plaintiffs Counsel McCuneWright, LLPs Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion For Attorney Fees, is deemed filed under seal. (shb)
April 10, 2015 Filing 460 APPLICATION to Seal Unredacted Version of Espinosa Plaintiffs' Counsel McCune Wright, LLP's Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion For Attorney Fees; and filed by Espinosa Plaintiffs Daniel Baldeschi, Thomas Ganim, Lillian E Levoff. (pj)
April 9, 2015 Filing 459 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Attorney Fees #371 filed by Plaintiffs Catherine Bernard, Michael Breien, Alberto Dominguez, Laura Gill, Evan Grogan, Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth, Carlos Medina, Kelly Moffett, Randy Rickert, Thomas Schille, Judith Stanton, Bryan Zirkel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura Antonini in Support, #2 Declaration of William Anderson in Support, #3 Declaration of Anne Marie Murphy in Support, #4 Declaration of Steven M. Campora)(Antonini, Laura)
April 9, 2015 Filing 458 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Baldeschi, Kehlie R Espinosa, Thomas Ganim, Lillian E Levoff of [Unredacted] Espinosa Plainitffs' Counsel McCuneWright, LLP's Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion for Attorney Fees. (McCune, Richard)
April 9, 2015 Filing 457 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Service Award To Representative Plaintiffs #377 filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Baldeschi, Kehlie R Espinosa, Thomas Ganim, Lillian E Levoff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support, #2 Exhibit "1" to McCune Decl., #3 Exhibit "2" to McCune Decl.)(McCune, Richard)
April 8, 2015 Filing 456 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John S Lee counsel for Defendants Grossinger Autoplex Inc, Hyundai Motor America, John Krafcik. John S Lee is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Lee, John)
April 2, 2015 Filing 450 NOTICE of Filing of Additional Settlement Objections filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gibbs, Eric)
April 1, 2015 Filing 455 SEALED DOCUMENT-SEPARATE MEMORANDUM OFSETTLING PLAINTIFFS IN SUPPORT OF FINAL SETTLEMENT APPROVAL (pj)
April 1, 2015 Filing 454 SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT B to THE DECLARATION OF ROBERT B. CAREY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for FINAL Settlement Approval #444 (pj)
April 1, 2015 Filing 453 SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT A to THE DECLARATION OF ROBERT B. CAREY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for FINAL Settlement Approval #444 (pj)
April 1, 2015 Filing 452 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION of SANDY ZIELOMSKI IN SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT #444 (pj)
April 1, 2015 Filing 451 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION of PAUL KING IN SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT #444 (pj)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO SEAL MEMORANDUM AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF FINAL SETTLEMENT APPROVAL by Judge George H. Wu: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that (1) the Separate Memorandum of Settling Plaintiffs in Support of Final Settlement Approval, and (2) Exhibits A and B to the Declaration of Robert B. Carey in Support of Separate Memorandum of Settling Plaintiffs in Support of Final Settlement Approval are deemed filed under seal. #447 (pj)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The unredacted versions of the following documents are deemed filed under seal:a) Declaration of Sandy Zielomski in Support of Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement and Exhibit A; and b) Declaration of Paul King in Support of Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement and Exhibit A. #446 (pj)
March 31, 2015 Filing 445 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alan M Mansfield counsel for Plaintiff Jeremy Wilton. Kristen L. Libby is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs Jeremy Wilton, et al.. (Mansfield, Alan)
March 30, 2015 Filing 447 APPLICATION to SEAL memorandum and exhibits in support of final settlement approval filed by Plaintiffs Kaylene P Brady, Nicole Marie Hunter. (pj)
March 30, 2015 Filing 446 DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO SEAL filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company, KIA Motors America. Application set for hearing on 6/11/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (shb)
March 30, 2015 Filing 444 Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sandy Zielomski (Public Redacted Version), #2 Exhibit A to Zielomski Declaration (Public Redacted Version), #3 Declaration of Paul King (Public Redacted Version), #4 Exhibit A to King Declaration (Public Redacted Version), #5 Declaration of Linda S. Mullenix, #6 Exhibit A to Mullenix Declaration, #7 Exhibit B to Mullenix Declaration, #8 Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby, #9 Exhibit 1 to Ashby Declaration, #10 Exhibit 2 to Ashby Declaration, #11 Declaration 3 to Ashby Declaration, #12 Exhibit 4 to Ashby Declaration)(Morgan, Shon)
March 30, 2015 Filing 443 DECLARATION of Richard D. McCune re Memorandum in Support of Motion,, #441 Settling Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Settlement Approval filed by Plaintiffs Kaylene P Brady, Travis Brissey, Ronald J Burkard, Adam Cloutier, Steven Craig, John J Dixson, Erin L Fanthorpe, Thomas Ganim, Eric Hadesh, Nicole Marie Hunter, Michael P Keeth, Lillian E Levoff, John Kirk MacDonald, Michael Mandahl, Nicholas McDaniel, Mary J Moran-Spicuzza, Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Gregory M Sonstein, Roman Starno, Gayle A Stephenson, Andres Villicana, Richard Williams. (Carey, Robert)
March 30, 2015 Filing 442 DECLARATION of Robert B. Carey re Memorandum in Support of Motion,, #441 Settling Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Settlement Approval filed by Plaintiffs Kaylene P Brady, Travis Brissey, Ronald J Burkard, Adam Cloutier, Steven Craig, John J Dixson, Erin L Fanthorpe, Eric Hadesh, Nicole Marie Hunter, Michael P Keeth, John Kirk MacDonald, Michael Mandahl, Nicholas McDaniel, Mary J Moran-Spicuzza, Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Gregory M Sonstein, Roman Starno, Gayle A Stephenson, Andres Villicana, Richard Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal))(Carey, Robert)
March 30, 2015 Filing 441 MEMORANDUM in Support Separate Memorandum of Settling Plaintiffs in Support of Final Settlement Approval [Public Redacted Version] filed by Plaintiffs Kaylene P Brady, Travis Brissey, Ronald J Burkard, Adam Cloutier, Steven Craig, John J Dixson, Erin L Fanthorpe, Eric Hadesh, Nicole Marie Hunter, Michael P Keeth, John Kirk MacDonald, Michael Mandahl, Nicholas McDaniel, Mary J Moran-Spicuzza, Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Gregory M Sonstein, Roman Starno, Gayle A Stephenson, Andres Villicana, Richard Williams. (Carey, Robert)
March 30, 2015 Filing 440 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Kaylene P Brady, Travis Brissey, Ronald J Burkard, Adam Cloutier, Steven Craig, John J Dixson, Erin L Fanthorpe, Eric Hadesh, Nicole Marie Hunter, Michael P Keeth, John Kirk MacDonald, Michael Mandahl, Nicholas McDaniel, Mary J Moran-Spicuzza, Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Gregory M Sonstein, Roman Starno, Gayle A Stephenson, Andres Villicana, Richard Williams of (1) Separate Memorandum of Settling Plaintiffs in Support of Final Settlement Approval; (2) Exhibits A and B to the Declaration of Robert B. Carey in Support of Settling Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Settlement Approval; (3) Hunter and Brady Application to Seal; and (4) Proposed Order Granting Application to Seal. (Carey, Robert)
March 30, 2015 Filing 439 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America of Declaration of Sandy Zielomski in Support of Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement and Exhibit A; Declaration of Paul King in Support of Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement and Exhibit A; Defendants' Application to Seal; [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Application to Seal. (Morgan, Shon)
March 26, 2015 Filing 438 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Daniel Baldeschi, Kehlie R Espinosa, Thomas Ganim, Lillian E Levoff Court Reporter. Court will contact Ann Smith at ams@mccunewright.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 03/19/15-Motion Hearing. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (McCune, Richard)
March 19, 2015 Filing 437 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu: Plaintiff Kathleen Wilson's Motion for Attorney's Fees #369 is deemed MOOT. Settlement of the fees issue was reached between Wilsons counsel and Defendants. Hunter and Brady Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses #374 is GRANTED. Liaison Counsel and Certain Non-settling Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses #378 is: (1) GRANTED as to Liaison Counsel (i.e. Girard Gibbs) but Court notes that counsel's expenses are about $66,000 (which are also approved) rather than the $1,005 indicated in the partial tentative; (2) GRANTED as to the amounts as to all of the remaining non-settling plaintiffs' counsel (except as to Bonsignore, PLLC) that are sought in said counsel's motion (docket no. #378 ; and (3) as to the attorneys fees sought by Bonsignore, PLLC, that matter is deemed MOOT because counsel for Bonsignore, PLLC and Defendants inform the Court that they have reached a settlement of that issue. Gentry, et al. Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Expert Witness Fees, and Out-of-pocket Costs #393 is DENIED. The Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs' Motion for Payment of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Compensation to Named Plaintiffs #371 , and Espinosa Plaintiffs' Counsel McCuneWright, LLP's Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Service Award to Representative Plaintiffs #377 and Espinosa Plaintiffs' Counsel McCuneWright, LLP's Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Service Award to Representative Plaintiffs 5/7/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Plaintiffs' supplemental briefs will be filed by 4/9/2015. Defendants' response will be due on or before 4/23/2015. Court will prepare a final written decision covering all of its rulings regarding the six motions for attorneys' fees on or after 5/7/2015. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (gk)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 436 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu. Please read the attached Partial Tentative Ruling on Motions for Attorneys Fees in preparation for hearing set this morning for 9:30 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Tentative Ruling) (jag)
March 18, 2015 Filing 435 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; Parties are reminded that the time to appear at the various motions set for March 19, 2015 is at 9:30 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 18, 2015 Filing 434 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Service Award To Representative Plaintiffs #377 ESPINOSA PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL McCUNEWRIGHT, LLPS NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ESPINOSA PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FEES, EXPENSES, AND INCENTIVE AWARDS filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Baldeschi, Kehlie R Espinosa, Thomas Ganim, Lillian E Levoff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Exhibit "2")(Kim, Jae)
March 18, 2015 Filing 433 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Reply (Motion related), #431 of Sur-Reply of Defendants filed by Certain Plaintiffs Donald Brown, Cameron John Cestaro, Kim Iocovozzi, Constance Martyn, Jerold Terhost, Tom Woodward. Motion set for hearing on 3/19/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Bonsignore, Robert)
March 18, 2015 Filing 432 NOTICE of Filing of Settlement Objections filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 4), #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2 of 4), #3 Exhibit 1 (Part 3 of 4), #4 Exhibit 1 (Part 4 of 4))(Gibbs, Eric)
March 12, 2015 Filing 431 REPLY in Opposition MOTION for Attorney Fees #378 (Defandants' Sur-Reply in Opposition to Fee Applications of Certain Non-Settling Parties Represented by Bonsignore PLLC) filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael L. Kidney, #2 Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby (sur-reply), #3 Exhibit 2 to Ashby Declaration)(Morgan, Shon)
March 12, 2015 Filing 430 REPLY in Opposition MOTION for Attorney Fees #371 (Defendants' Sur-reply in Opposition to the Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Compensation of Named Plaintiffs) filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby (sur-reply), #2 Exhibit 21)(Morgan, Shon)
March 12, 2015 Filing 429 REPLY in Opposition MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Service Award To Representative Plaintiffs #377 (Defendants' Sur-Reply in Opposition to Espinosa Plaintiffs' Motion for Fees, Expenses, and Incentive Awards) filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Morgan, Shon)
March 11, 2015 Filing 428 SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBIT A to the Declaration of Laura Antonini in Support of Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Payment of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Compensation to Named Plaintiffs. (gk)
March 11, 2015 Filing 427 SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Laura Antonini in Support of Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Payment of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Compensation to Named Plaintiffs. (gk)
March 11, 2015 Filing 426 SEALED DOCUMENT - KRAUTH/HASPER PLAINTIFFS' REPLY in Support of Motion for Payment of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Compensation to Named Plaintiffs. (gk)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER GRANTING KRAUTH/HASPER PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: Upon Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs' Application #424 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following documents are deemed filed under seal: 1. Unredacted Version of Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Payment of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Compensation to Named Plaintiffs; (2) Unredacted Version of Declaration of Laura Antonini in Support of Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Payment of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Compensation to Named Plaintiffs; and (3) Exhibit A to the Declaration of Laura Antonini in Support of Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Payment of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Compensation to Named Plaintiffs. (gk)
March 6, 2015 Filing 424 KRAUTH/HASPER PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION to Seal filed by Plaintiffs. Lodged Proposed Order. (gk)
March 6, 2015 Filing 423 SEALED DOCUMENT - UNREDACTED VERSION OF ESPINOSA PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL McCuneWright, LLP's REPLY to Defendants' Opposition to Espinosa Plaintiffs' Motion for Fees, Expenses, and Incentive Awards. (gk)
March 6, 2015 Filing 422 SEALED DOCUMENT - UNREDACTED DECLARATION of Richard D. McCune in Support of Espinosa Plaintiffs' Counsel McCuneWright, LLP's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Espinosa Plaintiffs' Motion for Fees, Expenses, and Incentive Awards. (gk) Modified on 3/9/2015 (gk).
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER GRANTING ESPINOSA PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO SEAL: 1) Unredacted Version of Espinosa Plaintiffs' Counsel McCune Wright, LLP's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Espinosa Plaintiffs' Motion For Fees, Expenses, and Incentive Awards; and 2) Unredacted Version of Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support of Espinosa Plaintiffs' Counsel McCuneWright, LLP's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Espinosa Plaintiffs' Motion For Fees, Expenses, and Incentive Awards by Judge George H. Wu: Upon the Espinosa Plaintiffs' Application #415 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the unredacted version of Espinosa Plaintiffs' Counsel McCune Wright, LLP's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Espinosa Plaintiffs' Motion For Fees, Expenses, and Incentive Awards and Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support of Espinosa Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Espinosa Plaintiffs' Motion For Fees, Expenses, and Incentive Awards, is deemed filed under seal. (gk)
March 5, 2015 Filing 420 REPLY in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #371 Reimbursement of Expenses and Compensation to Named Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiffs Catherine Bernard, Michael Breien, Alberto Dominguez, Laura Gill, Evan Grogan, Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth, Carlos Medina, Kelly Moffett, Randy Rickert, Thomas Schille, Judith Stanton, Bryan Zirkel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura Antonini in Support, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Payment of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Compensation to Named Plaintiffs)(Antonini, Laura)
March 5, 2015 Filing 419 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Catherine Bernard, Michael Breien, Alberto Dominguez, Laura Gill, Evan Grogan, Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth, Carlos Medina, Kelly Moffett, Randy Rickert, Thomas Schille, Judith Stanton, Bryan Zirkel of Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs Application to Seal; [Proposed] Order Granting Application to Seal; Unredacted Version of Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Payment of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Compensation to Named Plaintiffs; Unredacted Version of Declaration of Laura Antonini in Support. (Antonini, Laura)
March 5, 2015 Filing 418 Objection of Louis Bird re: MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses #374 filed by Objector Louis Bird. (Attorney Laura Antonini added to party Louis Bird(pty:obj))(Antonini, Laura)
March 5, 2015 Filing 417 OBJECTIONS to class action settlement and request for attorneys fees filed by Objectors Caitlin Ahearn, Andrew York. (Pentz, John)
March 5, 2015 Filing 416 OBJECTIONS to Order,,,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,, #319 filed by Objector Antonio Sberna. (Miller, Steve)
March 2, 2015 Filing 414 re: MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Service Award To Representative Plaintiffs #377 , MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 , MOTION for Attorney Fees #378 , MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses #374 filed by Objector Peri Fetsch. (Attorney Matthew Kurilich, Jr added to party Peri Fetsch(pty:obj))(Kurilich, Jr, Matthew)
February 27, 2015 Filing 415 ESPINOSA PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO SEAL: 1) Unredacted Version of Espinosa Plaintiffs' Counsel McCuneWright, LLP's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Espinosa Plaintiffs' Motion For Fees, Expenses, and Incentive Awards; and 2) Unredacted Version of Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support of Espinosa Plaintiffs' Counsel McCuneWright, LLP's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Espinosa Plaintiffs' Motions for Fees, Expenses, and Incentive Awards filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Baldeschi, Thomas Ganim, Lillian E Levoff. (lom)
February 26, 2015 Filing 413 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Baldeschi, Kehlie R Espinosa, Thomas Ganim, Lillian E Levoff of Application to Seal; [Proposed] Order Granting Application to Seal; Unredacted versions of Espinosa Plaintiffs' Counsel McCuneWright LLP's Reply to Defendants Opposition to Espinosa Plaintiffs Motion For Fees, Expenses, And Incentive Awards; Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support. (McCune, Richard)
February 26, 2015 Filing 412 REPLY in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Service Award To Representative Plaintiffs #377 filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Baldeschi, Kehlie R Espinosa, Thomas Ganim, Lillian E Levoff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support, #2 Exhibit "1" to McCune Decl., #3 Exhibit "2" to McCune Decl., #4 Declaration of Elaine S. Kusel in Support)(McCune, Richard)
February 26, 2015 Filing 411 REPLY in Support MOTION for Attorney Fees #378 (Robert J. Bonsignore) filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gibbs, Eric)
February 26, 2015 Filing 410 REPLY in Support MOTION for Attorney Fees #378 filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gibbs, Eric)
February 26, 2015 Filing 409 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT Reply in Support of Payment of Attorneys' Fees and Costs for Virginia Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One, #2 Exhibit Two)(Feinman, James)
February 18, 2015 Filing 406 NOTICE of Change of other firm name or address information by John Nicolas Albukerk attorney for Plaintiff Nilufar Rezai. Changing E-Mail. Filed by Plaintiff Nilufar Rezai. (Albukerk, John)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER GRANTING KRAUTH/HASPER PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING DEADLINE by Judge George H. Wu, re REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Payment of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Compensation to Named Plaintiffs #403 . March 5, 2015: Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs Motion for Payment of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Compensation to Named Plaintiffs. (kss)
February 11, 2015 Filing 408 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF JOSEPH R ASHBY IN OPPOSITION TO THE KRAUTH/HASPER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES, AND COMPENSATION OF NAMED PLAINTIFFS #371 (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(pj)
February 11, 2015 Filing 407 SEALED DOCUMENT-DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO THE KRAUTH/HASPER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES AND COMPENSATION OF NAMED PLAINTIFFS #371 (pj)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The unredacted versions of the following documents are deemed filed under seal: a) Defendants' Opposition to the Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Compensation of Named Plaintiffs; b) Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby in Opposition to the Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Compensation of Named Plaintiffs and attached Exhibits; and c) Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby in Opposition to the Espinosa Plaintiffs' Motion for Fees, Expenses, and Incentive Award and attached Exhibits. #402 . (pj)
February 11, 2015 Filing 403 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Payment of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Compensation to Named Plaintiffs filed by Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs Catherine Bernard, Michael Breien, Alberto Dominguez, Laura Gill, Evan Grogan, Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth, Carlos Medina, Kelly Moffett, Randy Rickert, Thomas Schille, Judith Stanton, Bryan Zirkel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Laura Antonini, #2 Proposed Order)(Antonini, Laura)
February 5, 2015 Filing 402 APPLICATION for Leave to to Seal filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company, KIA Motors America. (lom)
February 5, 2015 Filing 401 DECLARATION of Gary Greenfield in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Fees, Expenses, and Incentive Awards MOTION for Attorney Fees #393 , MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Service Award To Representative Plaintiffs #377 , MOTION for Attorney Fees #378 , MOTION for Attorney Fees #371 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Greenfield Declaration)(Morgan, Shon)
February 5, 2015 Filing 400 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Attorney Fees #393 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby, #2 Exhibit 1 to Ashby Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Ashby Declaration)(Morgan, Shon)
February 5, 2015 Filing 399 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Attorney Fees #378 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby, #2 Exhibit 1 to Ashby Declaration)(Morgan, Shon)
February 5, 2015 Filing 398 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Service Award To Representative Plaintiffs #377 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby, #2 Exhibit 1 to Ashby Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Ashby Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Ashby Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Ashby Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Ashby Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Ashby Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Ashby Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Ashby Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Ashby Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Ashby Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Ashby Declaration)(Morgan, Shon)
February 5, 2015 Filing 397 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Attorney Fees #371 (Public Redacted Version) filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby, #2 Exhibit 1 to Ashby Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Ashby Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Ashby Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Ashby Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Ashby Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Ashby Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Ashby Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Ashby Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Ashby Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Ashby Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Ashby Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Ashby Declaration, #14 Exhibit 13 to Ashby Declaration, #15 Exhibit 14 to Ashby Declaration, #16 Exhibit 15 to Ashby Declaration, #17 Exhibit 16 to Ashby Declaration, #18 Exhibit 17 to Ashby Declaration, #19 Exhibit 18 to Ashby Declaration, #20 Exhibit 19 to Ashby Declaration, #21 Exhibit 20 to Ashby Declaration)(Morgan, Shon)
February 5, 2015 Filing 396 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America of Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby in Opposition to Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees; Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby in Opposition to Espinosa Plaintiffs' Motion for Fees; Defendants' Opposition to the Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees; Application to Seal; Proposed Order. (Morgan, Shon)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUING HEARING DATE RE MOTIONS FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS' FEES by Judge George H. Wu: Upon Stipulation #394 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall adhere to the following dates: Oppositions to Motions for Approval of Attorneys' Fees to be filed 2/5/2015. Replies in Support of Motions for Approval of Attorneys' Fees to be filed 2/26/2015. Hearing on Motions for Approval of Attorneys' Fees #369 , #371 , #374 , #377 , #378 , #393 set for 3/19/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (gk)
January 20, 2015 Filing 394 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date re Plaintiffs' Motions for Approval of Attorneys' Fees from February 26, 2015 to March 19, 2015 Re: Order,,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,, #366 filed by defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morgan, Shon)
January 15, 2015 Filing 393 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. Motion set for hearing on 2/26/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit One, #3 Exhibit Two, #4 Exhibit Three, #5 Declaration James B. Feinman, #6 Declaration Andrew D. Finnicum)(Feinman, James)
January 9, 2015 Filing 385 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth. Notice of Errata re Declarations in Support of Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs' Motion for Payment of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Compensation to Named Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of William Anderson, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Anne Marie Murphy)(Antonini, Laura)
January 8, 2015 Filing 384 NOTICE of Unredacted Version of the Declaration of Robert Bonsignore, Dkt. No. 379-4 filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Bonsignore)(Gibbs, Eric)
January 5, 2015 Filing 392 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF LAURA ANTONINI IN SUPPORT OF KRA UTH/HASPER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES AND COMPENSATION TO NAMED PLAINTIFFS #371 (pj)
January 5, 2015 Filing 391 SEALED DOCUMENT-MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF KRA UTH/HASPER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES AND COMPENSATION TO NAMED PLAINTIFFS #371 (pj)
January 5, 2015 Filing 390 SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT B TO THE DECLARATION OF ROBERT B. CAREY IN SUPPORT OF HUNTER AND BRADY PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS. FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES #374 (pj)
January 5, 2015 Filing 389 EXHIBIT A TO THE DECLARATION OF ROBERT B. CAREY IN SUPPORT OF HUNTER AND BRADY PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES #374 (pj)
January 5, 2015 Filing 388 SEALED DOCUMENT-HUNTER AND BRADY PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES #374 (pj)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER GRANTING KRAUTH/HASPER PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) #383 (pj)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION SEAL MEMORANDUM ANDEXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES by Judge George H. Wu: #382 (pj)
December 29, 2014 Filing 381 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj of Declaration of Robert J. Bonsignore in Support of Request for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (Dkt. No. 379-4). (Grzenczyk, Scott)
December 24, 2014 Filing 380 DECLARATION of Thomas Ganim In Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Service Award To Representative Plaintiffs #377 filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Baldeschi, Kehlie R Espinosa, Thomas Ganim, Lillian E Levoff. (McCune, Richard)
December 23, 2014 Filing 383 APPLICATION to SEAL filed by Plaintiffs Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth. (pj)
December 23, 2014 Filing 382 HUNTER AND BRADY PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO SEAL MEMORANDUM AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (pj)
December 23, 2014 Filing 379 DECLARATION of Non-Settling Plaintiffs (Compendium) in Support MOTION for Attorney Fees #378 filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Robert R. Ahdoot, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Michael Dell'Angelo, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Bryan A. Wood, #4 Exhibit 4 - (Redacted - Filed Under Seal ) - Declaration of Robert J. Bonsignore, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Bryan L. Clobes, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Richard E. Norman, #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of James Hail, #8 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Thomas D. Mauriello, #9 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Alan M. Mansfield, #10 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Courtney L. Peinhardt, #11 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Francis R. Greene, #12 Exhibit 12 - Declaration of Jeremiah Frei-Pearson, #13 Exhibit 13 - Declaration of Eric H. Gibbs, #14 Exhibit 14 - Declaration of March L. Godino, #15 Exhibit 15 - Declaration of Jeffrey S. Goldenbeg, #16 Exhibit 16 - Declaration of Jason S. Kilene, #17 Exhibit 17 - Declaration of Joshua B. Swigart, #18 Exhibit 18 - Declaration of John P. Nash, #19 Exhibit 19 - Declaration of Laurence D. King, #20 Exhibit 20 - Declaration of Abbas Kazerounian, #21 Exhibit 21 - Declaration of Todd M. Friedman, #22 Exhibit 22 - Declaration of Suren N. Weerasuriya, #23 Exhibit 23 - Declaration of Gillian L. Wade, #24 Exhibit 24 - Declaration of Jonathan A. Michaels, #25 Exhibit 25 - Declaration of Jayne A. Goldstein, #26 Exhibit 26 - Declaration of James C. Shah, #27 Exhibit 27 - Joint Declaration of Derek Y. Brandt and James M. Terrell, #28 Exhibit 28 - Declaration of Mark A. Tate)(Gibbs, Eric)
December 23, 2014 Filing 378 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiffs Kamneel Maharaj. Motion set for hearing on 2/26/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Scott Grzenczyk, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Proposed Order)(Gibbs, Eric)
December 23, 2014 Filing 377 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Service Award To Representative Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Baldeschi, Kehlie R Espinosa, Thomas Ganim, Lillian E Levoff. Motion set for hearing on 2/26/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William B. Rubenstein In Support, #2 Declaration of Lillian E. Levoff in Support, #3 Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support, #4 Exhibit "1" to McCune Decl, #5 Exhibit "2" to McCune Decl, #6 Exhibit "3" to McCune Decl, #7 Exhibit "4" to McCune Decl, #8 Exhibit "5" to McCune Decl, #9 Exhibit "6" to McCune Decl, #10 Exhibit "7" to McCune Decl, #11 Proposed Order)(Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party Thomas Ganim(pty:pla))(McCune, Richard)
December 23, 2014 Filing 375 DECLARATION of Robert B. Carey in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses #374 filed by Plaintiffs Kaylene P Brady, Travis Brissey, Ronald J Burkard, Adam Cloutier, Steven Craig, John J Dixson, Erin L Fanthorpe, Eric Hadesh, Nicole Marie Hunter, Michael P Keeth, John Kirk MacDonald, Michael Mandahl, Nicholas McDaniel, Mary J Moran-Spicuzza, Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Gregory M Sonstein, Roman Starno, Gayle A Stephenson, Andres Villicana, Richard Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (filed under seal), #2 Exhibit B (filed under seal), #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Carey, Robert)
December 23, 2014 Filing 374 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Hunter and Brady Plaintiffs Kaylene P Brady, Travis Brissey, Ronald J Burkard, Adam Cloutier, Steven Craig, John J Dixson, Erin L Fanthorpe, Eric Hadesh, Nicole Marie Hunter, Michael P Keeth, John Kirk MacDonald, Michael Mandahl, Nicholas McDaniel, Mary J Moran-Spicuzza, Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Gregory M Sonstein, Roman Starno, Gayle A Stephenson, Andres Villicana, Richard Williams. Motion set for hearing on 2/26/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses)(Carey, Robert)
December 23, 2014 Filing 373 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Kaylene P Brady, Travis Brissey, Ronald J Burkard, Adam Cloutier, Steven Craig, John J Dixson, Erin L Fanthorpe, Eric Hadesh, Nicole Marie Hunter, Michael P Keeth, John Kirk MacDonald, Michael Mandahl, Nicholas McDaniel, Mary J Moran-Spicuzza, Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Gregory M Sonstein, Roman Starno, Gayle A Stephenson, Andres Villicana, Richard Williams of Memorandum In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses; Exhibits A and B to the Carey Declaration in Support of the Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses; Application to Seal; and Proposed Order Granting Application to Seal. (Carey, Robert)
December 23, 2014 Filing 372 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Catherine Bernard, Michael Breien, Alberto Dominguez, Laura Gill, Evan Grogan, Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth, Carlos Medina, Kelly Moffett, Randy Rickert, Thomas Schille, Judith Stanton, Bryan Zirkel (Antonini, Laura)
December 23, 2014 Filing 371 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff Catherine Bernard, Michael Breien, Alberto Dominguez, Laura Gill, Evan Grogan, Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth, Carlos Medina, Kelly Moffett, Randy Rickert, Thomas Schille, Judith Stanton, Bryan Zirkel. Motion set for hearing on 2/26/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs' Motion for Payment of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Compensation to Named Plaintiffs, #2 Declaration of Laura Antonini, #3 Declaration of William Anderson, #4 Declaration of Anne Marie Murphy, #5 Declaration of Steven M. Campora, #6 Declaration of Richard M. Pearl)(Antonini, Laura)
December 23, 2014 Filing 370 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Catherine Bernard, Michael Breien, Alberto Dominguez, Laura Gill, Evan Grogan, Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth, Carlos Medina, Kelly Moffett, Randy Rickert, Thomas Schille, Judith Stanton, Bryan Zirkel (Antonini, Laura)
December 23, 2014 Filing 369 APPLICATION for Attorney Fees filed by plaintiff Kathleen Wilson. Application set for hearing on 2/26/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Paul DePetris, #3 Declaration of Lewis Adler, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibits 2 & 3)(Adler, Lewis)
December 19, 2014 Filing 368 (Attorney Robert J Bonsignore added to party Plaintiffs(pty:bkmov))(Bonsignore, Robert)
December 15, 2014 Filing 376 SEALED DOCUMENT- ORDER granting Plaintiff's Application to Seal and Motion for an Extension of Time to File Motion for Approval of Attorneys' Fees. (mat)
December 15, 2014 Filing 367 SEALED DOCUMENT- APPLICATION to Seal and Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Approval of Attorney's Fees. (mat)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct #365 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall adhere to the following dates: 1. December 23, 2014: Motions for Approval of Attorneys Fees to be filed. Non-Settling Plaintiffs may, but are not required to, file a consolidated brief along with supporting documentation for the individual requests for attorneys fees and expenses. 2. January 22, 2014: Oppositions to Motions for Approval of Attorneys Fees to be filed. 3. February 5, 2014: Replies in Support of Motions for Approval of Attorneys Fees to be filed. 4. February 26, 2014 at 8:30 a.m.: Hearing on Motions for Approval of Attorneys Fees. (pj)
December 11, 2014 Filing 365 STIPULATION to modify Briefing Schedule and Continuing Hearing Date regarding Motions for Attorneys Fees Order,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,, #353 filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gibbs, Eric)
December 10, 2014 Filing 364 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott of Motion for Extension of Time. (Feinman, James)
November 18, 2014 Filing 363 Report Regarding Call Center Personnel for Hyundai Class Members filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America (Morgan, Shon)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 14-80123. Petitioners' motion for leave to file a reply brief is granted. Order received in this district on 11/13/14. [See document for more details] (mat)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DENYING GENTRY PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STAY CASE #324 AND MOTION TO AMEND ORDER #338 by Judge George H. Wu: **See document for details** (jag)
November 3, 2014 Filing 360 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE of U.S. Environmental Protection Agency Settlement Agreement filed by Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs Catherine Bernard, Michael Breien, Alberto Dominguez, Laura Gill, Evan Grogan, Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth, Carlos Medina, Kelly Moffett, Randy Rickert, Thomas Schille, Judith Stanton, Bryan Zirkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Consent Decree, #3 Exhibit Notice of Lodging of Consent Decree)(Antonini, Laura)
October 28, 2014 Filing 359 NOTICE of Change of address by Daniel A Edelman attorney for Plaintiff Jack Rottner. Changing attorneys address to 20 S. Clark St., Suite 1500, Chicago, IL 60603. Filed by Plaintiff Jack Rottner. (Edelman, Daniel)
October 24, 2014 Filing 358 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/06/14 10:31 am re Transcript #357 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 24, 2014 Filing 357 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/06/14 10:31 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/14/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2015. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
October 24, 2014 Filing 356 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/29/14 11:06 am re Transcript #355 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 24, 2014 Filing 355 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/29/14 11:06 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRRf, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/14/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2015. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
October 23, 2014 Filing 354 Settling Parties' Submission of the Amended Settlement Agreement filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America (Attachments: #1 Amended Settlement Agreement with Exhibits A through K-2, #2 Exhibits L through M-2 to Amended Settlement Agreement)(Morgan, Shon)
October 22, 2014 Filing 352 NOTICE filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. Courtesy Copy of Motion and Reply Brief Filed in Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Feinman, James)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu,, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall adhere to the followingdates:1. Motion for Approval of Attorneys Fees to be filed by: December 16, 20142. Defendants to initiate mailing of class notice (Settlement Mailer andSettlement Mailer Email) by: January 5, 20153. Opposition to Motion for Approval of Attorneys Fees to be filed by:January 13, 20154. Reply in Support of Motion for Approval of Attorneys Fees to be filed by:January 27, 20155. Hearing on Motion for Approval of Attorneys Fees: February 12, 2015,9:30 a.m.6. Objections to be mailed by: March 5, 20157. Opt-outs to be mailed by: March 5, 20158. Intent to appear at Final Settlement Approval Hearing to be mailed by:March 5, 20159. Motion for Final Approval to be filed by: March 30, 201510. Opposition to Motion for Final Approval to be filed by: April 27, 2015 11. Reply in Support of Motion for Final Approval to be filed by: May 18,201512. Final Settlement Approval Hearing to be held: June 11, 2015, 9:30 a.m.13. By July 6, 2015, class members to: (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (pj)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 351 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: Gentry Plaintiffs, et al.'s Motion to Stay Proceeding in District Court Pending Resolution of FRCP 23(f)Petition on Appeal #324 and Virginia Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Order for August 29, 2014 to Contain Findings Required by 28 U.S.C.A. 1292(B) #338 , are presently set for October 23, 2014. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for October 23, 2014 is hereby VACATED and the matter is taken off-calendar. The matter will be deemed submitted on the vacated hearing date and the clerk will notify the parties when the Court has reached a decision. (jag)
October 20, 2014 Filing 350 NOTICE of Filing of Proposed Order Setting Schedule for Mailing Class Notice, Opt-Outs, Attorneys' Fees Motions, and Final Approval of Class Settlement filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morgan, Shon)
October 17, 2014 Filing 349 REPLY Virginians' Response to Hyundai's Opposition to the Motion to Amend Order of August 29, 2014 to Contain Findings Required by 28 U.S.C.A. 1292(b) filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. (Feinman, James)
October 17, 2014 Filing 348 JOINDER filed by Plaintiff Kaylene P Brady joining in Response in Opposition to Motion #346 . (Carey, Robert)
October 16, 2014 Filing 347 REPLY Virginians' Response to Hyundai's Opposition to Motion to Stay filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. (Feinman, James)
October 16, 2014 Filing 346 OPPOSITION to MOTION to AMEND Order of August 29, 2014 to Contain Findings Required by 28 U.S.C.A. 1292(b) #338 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Morgan, Shon)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 345 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: The Court has received the Virginia Plaintiffs Motion for Permission to File Motion to Amend Order for August 29, 2014 to Contain Findings Required by 28 U.S.C.A. 1292(b), filed on October 2, 2014 #337 . The motion is GRANTED. The Virginia Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Order is set for October 23,2014 at 8:30 a.m. (jag)
October 6, 2014 Filing 344 MINUTES OF Status Conference RE NOTICES held before Judge George H. Wu: Court and counsel confer re notices certifying settlement class. The Court signs the order submitted on October 1, 2014 [336-1]. A Final Approval Hearing is set for June 11, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. Further Order re Scheduling will be filed by defendants as soon as conveniently possibleCourt Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (pj)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER GRANTING APPROVAL OF THE SETTLEMENT NOTICE AND CLAIM DOCUMENTS by Judge George H. Wu, re Miscellaneous Document #341 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following documents are approved,subject to Settling Parties making the revisions set forth on the record during the September 29, 2014 hearing: (see attached for further details) (pj)
October 3, 2014 Filing 342 NOTICE of Defendants' Submission of Final Notice and Claim Documents filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Final Hyundai Long-Form Class Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Final Hyundai Settlement Mailer, #3 Exhibit 3 - Final Hyundai Claim Form, #4 Exhibit 4 - Final Kia Long-Form Class Notice, #5 Exhibit 5 - Final Kia Settlement Mailer, #6 Exhibit 6 - Final Kia Claim Form)(Morgan, Shon)
October 2, 2014 Filing 341 Settling Parties' Submission of the Unsigned Amended Settlement Agreement filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Unsigned Amended Settlement Agreement)(Morgan, Shon)
October 2, 2014 Filing 340 JOINDER filed by Plaintiff Kaylene P Brady joining in Response in Opposition to Motion, #339 . (Carey, Robert)
October 2, 2014 Filing 339 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Stay Case pending Pending Resolution of FRCP 23(f) Petition for Appeal Motion to Stay Proceeding in District Court Pending Resolution of FRCP 23(f) Petition for Appeal #324 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby, #2 Exhibit 1)(Morgan, Shon)
October 2, 2014 Filing 338 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Order of August 29, 2014 to Contain Findings Required by 28 U.S.C.A. 1292(b) filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One, #2 Exhibit Two)(Feinman, James)
October 2, 2014 Filing 337 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file to file Motion to Amend Motion for Permission to File Motion to Amend Order of August 29, 2014 to Contain Findings Required by U.S.C.A. 1292(b) filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Feinman, James)
October 1, 2014 Filing 336 NOTICE of Filing of Proposed Order Granting Approval of the Settlement Notice and Claim Documents filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morgan, Shon)
October 1, 2014 Filing 335 NOTICE re Settling Parties' Proposed Schedule for Mailing Class Notice, Opt-Outs, and for Final Approval of Class Settlement filed by defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Morgan, Shon)
September 30, 2014 Filing 333 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Aaron Simmons. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Dearman, Mark)
September 30, 2014 Filing 332 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mark J Dearman on behalf of Plaintiff Aaron Simmons (Attorney Mark J Dearman added to party Aaron Simmons(pty:pla))(Dearman, Mark)
September 29, 2014 Filing 334 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE NOTICES held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer re notices certifying settlement class. Amended notices and order will be filed forthwith. A proposed schedule will be filed by noon on October 1, 20 14. Scheduling Conference is set for October 6, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux (jag)
September 29, 2014 Filing 331 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE NOTICES held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer re notices certifying settlement class. Amended notices and order will be filed forthwith. A proposed schedule will be filed by noon on October 1, 2014. Scheduling Conference is set for October 6, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lom)
September 24, 2014 Filing 330 Settling Parties' Response to Krauth Plaintiffs' Comments Regarding Proposed Final Notice and Claim Documents filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America (Morgan, Shon)
September 23, 2014 Filing 329 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; Counsel for the Gentry Plaintiffs, et al., failed to comply with Local Rule 6. As a result, the Court sets a hearing on Plaintiffs' MOTION to Stay Case pending Pending Resolution of FRCP 23(f) Petition for Appeal #324 for 10/23/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to comply with L.R. 6.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 22, 2014 Filing 328 NOTICE of Settling Parties' Submission of Proposed Final Notice and Claim Documents filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Final Hyundai Long-Form Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Final Hyundai Short-Form Mailer, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Final Hyundai Claim Form, #4 Exhibit 4 - Proposed Final Kia Long-Form Notice, #5 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Final Kia Short-Form Mailer, #6 Exhibit 6 - Proposed Final Kia Claim Form)(Morgan, Shon)
September 19, 2014 Filing 327 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Steve B Perry pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Steve B Perry. (Carey, Robert)
September 19, 2014 Filing 326 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Colnett Brubaker pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Colnett Brubaker. (Carey, Robert)
September 19, 2014 Filing 325 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff E Brandon Bowron pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to E Brandon Bowron. (Carey, Robert)
September 19, 2014 Filing 324 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Pending Resolution of FRCP 23(f) Petition for Appeal Motion to Stay Proceeding in District Court Pending Resolution of FRCP 23(f) Petition for Appeal filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One)(Feinman, James)
September 10, 2014 Filing 323 MINUTES OF Status Conference RE NOTICES held before Judge George H. Wu: Court and counsel confer re notices certifying settlement class. Class counsel and counsel for defendantswill provide final drafts to liaison counsel by September 12, 2014. Plaintiffs comments to defendants will be provided by noon on September 22, 2014. Defendants response will be given by 5:00 p.m. on September 24, 2014. Hearing on September 29, 2014 will be held with settling plaintiffs, liaison counsel and defendants at 9:30 a.m. The status conference set for September 11, 2014 is TAKEN OFF-CALENDAR. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (pj)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu:, ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Status Conference set for 9/10/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. **SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS** (jag)
September 3, 2014 Filing 321 MINUTES OF Status Conference RE NOTICES held before Judge George H. Wu: Court and counsel confer re notices certifying settlement class. Corrected drafts of notices will be provided to the Court by noon on September 8, 2014. The status conference is continued to September 11, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. A final notice hearing is set for September 29, 2014. Court will provide time on September 11,2014. Court Reporter: Katie Thibideaux. (pj)
September 2, 2014 Filing 320 DECLARATION of Jason Erb re: Data from R.L. Polk & Co. in support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Morgan, Shon)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASS by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Capitalized terms not otherwise defined herein shall have the same meaning as et forth in the Settlement Agreement. Pursuant to the Settlement Agreement, the class has been defined as: All current and former owners and lessees of a Class Vehicle who were the owner or lessee, on or before November 2, 2013, of such Class Vehicle that was registered in the District of Columbia or one of the fifty (50) states of the United States, except that the following are excluded: (i) Rental Fleet Owners; (ii) government entities, except to the extent that a government entity is the owner or lessee of a Fleet Class Vehicle (in which case such government entity is not excluded from the Class); (iii) judges assigned to the MDL Litigation, including the judge or judges assigned to any lawsuit prior to the transfer of that lawsuit to the MDL Litigation; and (iv) persons who have previously executed a release of HMA or KMA that includes a claim concerning the fuel economy of such Class Vehicle (the "Class" or "Class Member") The Court has approved the manner of notice via a short-form mailer, email, and flyer at dealers, with the long-for notice made available on the settlement website. The Court will meet with Settling Parties and liaison counsel, Eric Gibbs, on September 3, 2014, at 9 a.m. to revise and finalize the notice and claim forms. The versions based on that meeting will be circulated for a 10-day review and comment period following the September 3, 2014 meeting.(SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS),, Set deadlines and hearings( Status Conference set for 9/3/2014 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (bp)
August 28, 2014 Filing 318 STATEMENT of Hyundai Motor America Regarding Mileage Data From R.L. Polk MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Morgan, Shon)
August 25, 2014 Filing 316 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice (Other) #315 e-mailed to Attorney Bryan L Clobes at bclobes@caffertyclobes.com and ktucker@caffertyclobes.com bounced due to invalid email. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 22, 2014 Filing 315 NOTICE of Filing of Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement and Certifying Settlement Class filed by defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morgan, Shon)
August 21, 2014 Filing 317 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS #184 ; PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND ORDER DIRECTING NOTICE TO THE CLASS #185 PLAINTIFFS' GENTRY, ET AL. V. HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA'S MOTION FOR SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND ENFORCEMENT OF STIPULATION IN OPEN COURT #230 ; GENTRY AND ABDUL-MUMIT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PREMISSION TO FILE MOTION TO COMPEL THE SETTLING PARTIES TO DISCLOSE THE RESULTS OF THEIR RECENT ATTORNEY FEE MEDIATION #298 . The Court's Further Consideration of: (1) Motion to Certify Class, (2) Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval, and (3) Plaintiff Gentry's Motion for Suggestion of Remand, is circulated and attached hereto. Oral argument is held. Based on the Court's Further Consideration, and for reasons stated on the record, the Court's determination is as follows: Plaintiffs' Motion for Certification of Settlement Class #184 is GRANTED; Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement and Order Directing Notice to the Class #185 is GRANTED; Plaintiffs' in Gentry, et al. v. Hyundai Motor America's Motion for Suggestion of Remand and Enforcement of Stipulation in Open Court #230 is GRANTED. Counsel for Defendants will file a proposed order forthwith; Gentry and Abdul-Mumit Plainfiffs' Motion for Permission to File Motion to Compel the Settling Parties to Disclose the Results of Their Recent Attorney Fee Mediation #209 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. A Status Conference re Notices is set for September 3, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. The settling parties, liaison counsel and defendants are ordered to be present. Court Reporter: Katie Thibedeaux. (bp)
August 20, 2014 Filing 314 Notice of Electronic Filing re Reply (Motion related), #313 e-mailed to Anna M. Kohut bounced due to invalid/rejected email. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 20, 2014 Filing 313 REPLY Support of MOTION for Leave to file Motion to Compel the Settling Parties to Disclose the Results of Their Recent Attorney Fee Mediation #298 Reply to Response from Liaison Counsel filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. (Feinman, James)
August 19, 2014 Filing 312 JOINDER filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj joining in Response in Opposition to Motion, #305 . (Gibbs, Eric)
August 18, 2014 Filing 311 STATEMENT of Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs re Settling Parties' Submission of Proposed Final Notice and Claim Documents ISO MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 filed by Plaintiffs Catherine Bernard, Michael Breien, Alberto Dominguez, Laura Gill, Evan Grogan, Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth, Carlos Medina, Kelly Moffett, Randy Rickert, Thomas Schille, Judith Stanton, Bryan Zirkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Antonini, Laura)
August 18, 2014 Filing 310 REPLY Support of MOTION for Leave to file Motion to Compel the Settling Parties to Disclose the Results of Their Recent Attorney Fee Mediation #298 Reply to Settling Parties' Opposition filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. (Feinman, James)
August 18, 2014 Filing 309 Notice of Electronic Filing re Supplement(Motion related) #308 e-mailed to Mark A. Tate bounced due to invalid/rejected email. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 18, 2014 Filing 308 SUPPLEMENT Briefing Regarding Cross-Jurisdictional Tolling filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. (Feinman, James)
August 15, 2014 Filing 307 DECLARATION of Jason R. Erb in support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Morgan, Shon)
August 15, 2014 Filing 306 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 , MOTION to Certify Class #184 (Defendant Hyundai Motor America's Supplemental Reply Regarding Claims of Virginia Opt-Outs) filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Morgan, Shon)
August 15, 2014 Filing 305 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Leave to file Motion to Compel the Settling Parties to Disclose the Results of Their Recent Attorney Fee Mediation #298 (Settling Parties' Opposition to Motion to Compel Disclosure of Results of Attorney Fee Mediation) filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Morgan, Shon)
August 15, 2014 Filing 304 NOTICE filed by defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Settling Parties' Submission of Proposed Final Notice and Claim Documents) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Final Long-Form Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Final Short-Form Mailer, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Final Claim Form, #4 Exhibit 4 - Krauth Plaintiffs' Proposed Further Revisions to Long-Form Notice, #5 Exhibit 5 - Krauth Plaintiffs' Proposed Further Revisions to Short-Form Mailer, #6 Exhibit 6 - Krauth Plaintiffs' Proposed Further Revisions to Claim Form)(Morgan, Shon)
August 15, 2014 Filing 303 REPLY MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 , MOTION to Certify Class #184 Reply to Hyundai's Supplemental Brief filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. (Feinman, James)
August 13, 2014 Filing 302 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 7/24/14 9:29 am re Transcript #301 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 13, 2014 Filing 301 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/24/14 9:29 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/13/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/11/2014. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
August 8, 2014 Filing 300 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 , MOTION to Certify Class #184 (Hyundai Motor America's Supplemental Brief Regarding Claims of Virginia Opt-Outs) filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby, #2 Exhibit 1 to Ashby Declaration)(Morgan, Shon)
August 8, 2014 Filing 299 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 , MOTION to Certify Class #184 Supplemental Response filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. (Feinman, James)
August 8, 2014 Filing 298 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Motion to Compel the Settling Parties to Disclose the Results of Their Recent Attorney Fee Mediation filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. Motion set for hearing on 8/21/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Motion to Compel, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit)(Feinman, James)
August 4, 2014 Filing 297 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 filed by Plaintiffs Kaylene P Brady, Travis Brissey, Ronald J Burkard, Adam Cloutier, Steven Craig, John J Dixson, Erin L Fanthorpe, Eric Hadesh, Nicole Marie Hunter, Michael P Keeth, John Kirk MacDonald, Michael Mandahl, Nicholas McDaniel, Mary J Moran-Spicuzza, Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Roman Starno, Gayle A Stephenson, Andres Villicana, Richard Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert B. Carey in Support of Settling Plaintiffs' Supplemental Damages Calculations in Support of Approval of Proposed Settlement)(Carey, Robert)
July 28, 2014 Filing 296 SEALED DOCUMENT- SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Joseph R. Ashby in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. (mat)
July 28, 2014 Filing 295 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Robert B Carey in Support of Settling Parties' Supplemental Reply Brief in Support of Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class. (mat)
July 28, 2014 Filing 294 SEALED DOCUMENT- SETTLING PARTIES' SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS. (mat)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA'S APPLICATION TO SEAL AMERICA'S APPLICATION TO SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The unredacted versions of the following documents are deemed filed under seal: Settling Parties' Reply: Brief in Support of Preliminary Approval ofClass Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class Exhibits 24 and 25 to the Second Sll-_Pplemental Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of SettlementClass Exhibits A through D to the Declaration of Robert B. Carey in Supportof Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Class #289 (pj)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER RE SETTLING PARTIES MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR THEIR SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS #285 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that settling parties may exceed the page limit for their concurrently filed supplemental reply brief in support of preliminary approval of class settlement and certification of settlement class, exclusive of the indices and exhibits. (lom)
July 24, 2014 Filing 293 AMENDED MINUTES PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS #184 ; PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASSSETTLEMENT AND ORDER DIRECTING NOTICE TO THE CLASS #185 ; PLAINTIFFS' IN GENTRY, ET AL. V. HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA'S MOTION FOR SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND ENFORCEMENT OF STIPULATION IN OPEN COURT #230 ; PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO LIFT STAY ON DISCOVERY FOR POST NOVEMBER 2, 2012 CLAIMS #275 held before Judge George H. Wu (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) #290 . (pj)
July 24, 2014 Filing 290 MINUTES OF MOTION HEARING held before Judge George H. Wu: Proceedings: Plaintiffs' Motion for Certification #184 ; Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement #185 ; Plaintiffs' Motion for Suggestion of Remand #230 , Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay on Case #275 . Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay on Case #275 is DENIED. Plaintiffs will provide defendants and file with the Court the final version of notices by 7/31/14. Responses to the notices will be filed and served by 8/11/14. The final version of the notices will be provided to the Court by 8/15/14. Plaintiffs will file their supplemental declaration re lump sum by 8/4/14. Simultaneous briefs re remand will be filed by 8/8/14. Simultaneous responses will be filed by 8/15/14. The above entitled motions #184 , #185 , #230 are continued to 8/21/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mg)
July 22, 2014 Filing 288 OPPOSITION opposition re: REQUEST to Lift Stay on Case re Lift Stay on Discovery for Post-November 2, 2012 Claims #275 , MOTION for Leave to file Motion to Lift Stay on Discovery for Post-November 2, 2012 Claims #274 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James F. Neale)(Morgan, Shon)
July 21, 2014 Filing 289 APPLICATION to file under seal: a) unredacted version of the Settling Parties' Reply Brief in Support of Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class; b) unredacted versions of Exhibits 24 and 25 to the Second Supplemental Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Class; and c) unredacted versions of Exhibits A through D to the Declaration of Robert B. Carey in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Class filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company. (lom)
July 21, 2014 Filing 287 Supplemental Opposition re: MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) of Post November 2, 2012 claims #230 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Morgan, Shon)
July 21, 2014 Filing 286 NOTICE REGARDING BRIEFING ON HMA'S PRIVILEGE LOG filed by defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Morgan, Shon)
July 21, 2014 Filing 285 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation FOR SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS filed by defendant Hyundai Motor America. Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morgan, Shon)
July 21, 2014 Filing 284 REPLY in support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 , MOTION to Certify Class #184 Supplemental Reply filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby, #2 Exhibit 23 to Ashby Declaration, #3 Exhibit 24 to Ashby Declaration, #4 Exhibit 25 to Ashby Declaration, #5 Declaration of Robert B. Carey, #6 Exhibit A to Carey Declaration, #7 Exhibit B to Carey Declaration, #8 Exhibit C to Carey Declaration, #9 Exhibit D to Carey Declaration)(Morgan, Shon)
July 21, 2014 Filing 283 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America (Morgan, Shon)
July 21, 2014 Filing 282 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/26/14 9:29 am re Transcript #281 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 21, 2014 Filing 281 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/26/14 9:29 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2014. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
July 18, 2014 Filing 280 STATEMENT of JOINDER ISO KRAUTH/HASPER PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO SETTLING PARTIES' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ISO MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Wilson. (Antonini, Laura)
July 18, 2014 Filing 279 DECLARATION of Laura Antonini ISO KRAUTH/HASPER PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO SETTLING PARTIES' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ISO MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 filed by Plaintiffs Catherine Bernard, Michael Breien, Alberto Dominguez, Laura Gill, Evan Grogan, Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth, Carlos Medina, Kelly Moffett, Randy Rickert, Thomas Schille, Judith Stanton, Bryan Zirkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Antonini, Laura)
July 18, 2014 Filing 278 DECLARATION of Harvey Rosenfield ISO KRAUTH/HASPER PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO SETTLING PARTIES' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ISO MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 filed by Plaintiffs Catherine Bernard, Michael Breien, Alberto Dominguez, Laura Gill, Evan Grogan, Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth, Carlos Medina, Kelly Moffett, Randy Rickert, Thomas Schille, Judith Stanton, Bryan Zirkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Antonini, Laura)
July 18, 2014 Filing 277 SUPPLEMENT RESPONSE TO SETTLING PARTIES SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Catherine Bernard, Michael Breien, Alberto Dominguez, Laura Gill, Evan Grogan, Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth, Carlos Medina, Kelly Moffett, Randy Rickert, Thomas Schille, Judith Stanton, Bryan Zirkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs' Proposed Short-Form Notice)(Antonini, Laura)
July 18, 2014 Filing 276 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 , MOTION to Certify Class #184 Supplemental Response Brief filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Feinman, James)
July 16, 2014 Filing 275 REQUEST to Lift Stay on Case re Lift Stay on Discovery for Post-November 2, 2012 Claims filed by Plaintiff Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. Request set for hearing on 7/24/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Hyundai Motor America, Inc., #2 Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Dealership Defendants, #3 Motion to Conduct Pre-Class Certification Discovery, #4 Plaintifs' Request for Admissions and Interrogatories to Defendant)(Feinman, James)
July 16, 2014 Filing 274 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Motion to Lift Stay on Discovery for Post-November 2, 2012 Claims filed by Plaintiff Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Feinman, James)
July 11, 2014 Filing 273 JOINDER in MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 in Support of Revised Notice and Claim Forms submitted as attachments to the Supplemental Brief in support of Preliminary Approval filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Gibbs, Eric)
July 10, 2014 Filing 272 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William H Anderson counsel for Plaintiff Gunther Krauth. Sandra W. Cuneo is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Gunther Krauth. (Anderson, William)
July 9, 2014 Filing 271 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 , MOTION to Certify Class #184 (Settling Parties' Supplemental Brief in Support of Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class) filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Short-Form Mailer), #2 Exhibit B (Email Notice), #3 Exhibit C (Long Form Notice), #4 Exhibit D (Claim Form), #5 Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby (Supplemental), #6 Exhibit 18 to Ashby Declaration, #7 Exhibit 19 to Ashby Declaration, #8 Exhibit 20 to Ashby Declaration, #9 Exhibit 21 to Ashby Declaration, #10 Exhibit 22 to Ashby Declaration)(Morgan, Shon)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER RE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUING HEARING DATEFOR THE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY SETTLEMENTAPPROVAL AND MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OFSETTLEMENT CLASS by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File #269 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall adhere to the following dates: 1. Settling parties supplemental briefs and revised notices and forms to be filed by July 9, 2014, 2. non-settling plaintiffs responses to be filed by July 18, 2014, 3. settling parties replies to be filed by noon on July 21, 2014, and 4. a continued hearing on July 24, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. (pj)
July 2, 2014 Filing 269 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Briefs and Revised Notice and Claim Forms filed by defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morgan, Shon)
June 26, 2014 Filing 268 AMENDED MINUTES held before Judge George H. Wu re: #267 . Settling Plaintiffs will have until July 7, 2014 to file their supplemental briefs and revised notice and forms. Responses by Non-settling Plaintiffs and Defendants will be filed by July 16, 2014. Any reply will be filed by noon on July 21, 2014. (jag)
June 26, 2014 Filing 267 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS #184 ; PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND ORDER DIRECTING NOTICE TO THE CLASS #185 ; PLAINTIFFS' IN GENTRY, ET AL. V. HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA'S MOTION FOR SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND ENFORCEMENT OF STIPULATION IN OPEN COURT #230 hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court's Tentative Ruling is circulated and attached hereto. Court hears oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, the above-entitled motions are continued to July 24, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiffs will have until July 7, 2014 to file their supplemental briefs and revised notice and forms. Responses will be filed by July 16, 2014. Any reply will be filed by noon on July 21, 2014. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lom)
June 25, 2014 Filing 266 OPPOSITION to Joint Notice of Filing of Revised Notice and Claim Documents filed by Plaintiffs Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs' Proposed Notice)(Antonini, Laura)
June 25, 2014 Filing 265 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor Americato Objections - non-motion #262 , Objections - non-motion, #260 (Defendants' Response to the Gentry Plaintiffs' Objection to the Standing of Settling Plaintiffs) (Morgan, Shon)
June 24, 2014 Filing 264 NOTICE Joint Notice of Filing of Revised Notice and Claim Documents filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Revised Long-Form Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 Short-Form Mailer, #3 Exhibit 3 Revised Claim Form)(Morgan, Shon)
June 23, 2014 Filing 262 OBJECTIONS Supplemental Authorities in Support of Objection to Standing of Settling Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. (Feinman, James)
June 20, 2014 Filing 260 OBJECTIONS to Settling Plaintiffs Attempt to Adjudicate and Release all Virginia Claims for Lack of Article III Standing filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. (Feinman, James)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #256 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John M. DeStefano on behalf of Plaintiffs, designating Elaine T. Byszewski as local counsel. (lt)
June 19, 2014 Filing 261 SEALED DOCUMENT- DEFENDANTS' JOINDER AND REPLY in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. (mat)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA'S APPLICATION TO SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: #255 . (pj)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: ORDERED that Settling Plaintiffs motion is granted. Settling Plaintiffs Replies are deemed timely as filed when the CMC/ECF system became available onSaturday, June 14, 2014. #254 (pj)
June 18, 2014 Filing 257 DECLARATION of Alan Vasquez in Support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 (for replies of Hyundai Motor America and Kia Motors America, Inc.) filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Morgan, Shon)
June 18, 2014 Filing 256 APPLICATION for attorney John M. DeStefano to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13984454 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Kaylene P Brady. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Elaine T Byszewski added to party Kaylene P Brady(pty:pla))(Byszewski, Elaine)
June 14, 2014 Filing 254 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File (1) Combined Reply In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Certification of Settlement Class and Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval as to Gentry Plaintiffs and (2) Reply In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement as to Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs filed by Settling Plaintiffs Kaylene P Brady, Travis Brissey, Ronald J Burkard, Adam Cloutier, Steven Craig, John J Dixson, Erin L Fanthorpe, Thomas Ganim, Eric Hadesh, Nicole Marie Hunter, Michael P Keeth, Lillian E Levoff, John Kirk MacDonald, Michael Mandahl, Nicholas McDaniel, Mary J Moran-Spicuzza, Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Gregory M Sonstein, Roman Starno, Gayle A Stephenson, Andres Villicana, Richard Williams. Motion set for hearing on 6/26/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carey, Robert)
June 14, 2014 Filing 253 REPLY In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement as to Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 filed by Plaintiffs Kaylene P Brady, Travis Brissey, Ronald J Burkard, Adam Cloutier, Steven Craig, John J Dixson, Erin L Fanthorpe, Thomas Ganim, Eric Hadesh, Nicole Marie Hunter, Michael P Keeth, Lillian E Levoff, John Kirk MacDonald, Michael Mandahl, Nicholas McDaniel, Mary J Moran-Spicuzza, Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Gregory M Sonstein, Roman Starno, Gayle A Stephenson, Andres Villicana, Richard Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ex. 1 Declaration of Richard D. McCune, #2 Declaration Ex. 2 Declaration of Robert B..Carey)(Carey, Robert)
June 14, 2014 Filing 252 REPLY Combined Reply In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Certification of Settlement Class and Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval as to Gentry Plaintiffs MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 , MOTION to Certify Class #184 filed by Plaintiffs Kaylene P Brady, Travis Brissey, Ronald J Burkard, Adam Cloutier, Steven Craig, John J Dixson, Erin L Fanthorpe, Thomas Ganim, Eric Hadesh, Nicole Marie Hunter, Michael P Keeth, Lillian E Levoff, John Kirk MacDonald, Michael Mandahl, Nicholas McDaniel, Mary J Moran-Spicuzza, Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Gregory M Sonstein, Roman Starno, Gayle A Stephenson, Andres Villicana, Richard Williams. (Carey, Robert)
June 13, 2014 Filing 255 APPLICATION to SEAL filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company. Lodged Proposed Order. (pj)
June 13, 2014 Filing 251 DECLARATION of Joseph R. Ashby in support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 , MOTION to Certify Class #184 (for replies of Hyundai Motor America and Kia Motors America, Inc.) filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Morgan, Shon)
June 13, 2014 Filing 250 REPLY in support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 (public redacted reply and joinder of Hyundai Motor America and Kia Motors America, Inc.) filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Morgan, Shon)
June 13, 2014 Filing 249 REPLY in support of MOTION to Certify Class #184 (and Joinder of Defendants Hyundai Motor America and Kia Motors America, Inc.) filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Morgan, Shon)
June 13, 2014 Filing 248 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 by Liaison Counsel filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric H. Gibbs in Support of Liaison Counsel's Response in Support of Proposed Settlement, #2 Exhibit A to F to the Declaration of Eric H. Gibbs in Support)(Gibbs, Eric)
June 13, 2014 Filing 247 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America of Defendants' Joinder and Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement; Hyundai Motor America's Application to Seal; [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Application to Seal. (Morgan, Shon)
June 12, 2014 Filing 246 REPLY to Hyundai's Opposition to Motion for Suggestion of Remand and Enforcement of Stipulation Made in Open Court filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One, #2 Exhibit Two)(Feinman, James)
June 6, 2014 Filing 245 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION of Laura Antonini in Support of Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs' Opposition to Brady/Hunter/Espinosa Plaintiffs' MOTION for Preliminary Approval. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(mg)
June 6, 2014 Filing 244 SEALED DOCUMENT-KRAUTH/HASPER PLAINTIFFS'OPPOSITION to Brady/Hunter/Espinosa Plaintiffs' MOTION for Preliminary Approval
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: Granting Krauth/Hasper Plaintiffs' #241 Application to Seal #241 . (mg)
June 5, 2014 Filing 242 OPPOSITION to MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) of Post November 2, 2012 claims #230 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shon Morgan, #2 Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby, #3 Exhibit 1 to Ashby Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Ashby Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Ashby Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Ashby Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to Ashby Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to Ashby Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 to Ashby Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 to Ashby Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 to Ashby Declaration, #12 Exhibit 10 to Ashby Declaration, #13 Exhibit 11 to Ashby Declaration, #14 Declaration of James F. Neale, #15 Exhibit 1 to Neale Declaration)(Morgan, Shon)
June 3, 2014 Filing 240 NOTICE of Errata filed by plaintiff Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth. (Antonini, Laura)
May 30, 2014 Filing 241 APPLICATION to Seal filed by Plaintiffs Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth et al Plaintiffs Lodged Lodged. (pj)
May 30, 2014 Filing 239 REPORT of LIAISON COUNSEL LISTING NON-SETTLING PLAINTIFFS SUPPORTING OR NOT OBJECTING TO THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Gibbs, Eric)
May 30, 2014 Filing 238 JOINDER filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Wilson joining in Response in Opposition to Motion #236 . (Antonini, Laura)
May 30, 2014 Filing 237 DECLARATION of Harvey Rosenfield re Response in Opposition to Motion #236 filed by Plaintiffs Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Antonini, Laura)
May 30, 2014 Filing 236 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 filed by Plaintiffs Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth. (Antonini, Laura)
May 30, 2014 Filing 235 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth of Application to Seal; Proposed Order; Unredacted Opposition to Brady/Hunter/Espinosa Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval; Declaration of Laura Antonini. (Antonini, Laura)
May 30, 2014 Filing 234 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of James B. Feinman, #3 Exhibit HagensBerman Website, #4 Exhibit Confidentiality Agreement, #5 Exhibit Revised Confidentiality Agreement)(Feinman, James)
May 30, 2014 Filing 233 NOTICE of Change of firm name and address by Todd S Garber attorney for Plaintiffs Eric Graewingholt, Bradford L Hirsch. Changing firm name to FINKELSTEIN, BLANKINSHIP, FREI-PEARSON & GARBER, LLP and address to 1311 MAMARONECK AVENUE, SUITE 220, WHITE PLAINS, NEW YORK, 10605. Filed by Plaintiffs Eric Graewingholt, Bradford L Hirsch. (Attorney Todd S Garber added to party Eric Graewingholt(pty:pla), Attorney Todd S Garber added to party Bradford L Hirsch(pty:pla))(Garber, Todd)
May 29, 2014 Filing 232 Notice of Electronic Filing re Response in Opposition to Motion #229 , Memorandum in Support of Motion #231 e-mailed to Attorney Sherri N Watts at swatts@tatelawgroup.com bounced due to invalid email. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to sherri@harrybrownlaw.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 29, 2014 Filing 231 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) of Post November 2, 2012 claims #230 filed by Plaintiff John Gentry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript of Stipulation)(Feinman, James)
May 29, 2014 Filing 230 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) of Post November 2, 2012 claims filed by Plaintiff John Gentry. Motion set for hearing on 6/26/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feinman, James)
May 29, 2014 Filing 229 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Certify Class #184 filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Website, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of James B. Feinman, #3 Exhibit Copies of Correspondence, #4 Exhibit Copies of Proof of Delivery, #5 Exhibit Senate Report re Class Action Fairness Act Report, #6 Exhibit Buyer's Orders)(Feinman, James)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUING HEARING DATE FOR THE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY SETTLEMENT APPROVAL AND MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Continue, #227 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall adhere to the followingdates:1. Non-settling plaintiffs opposition to be filed by May 30, 2014; 2. Settling parties replies to be filed by June 13, 2014; 3. Hearing on the motions is set for June 26, 2014, at 9 a.m., (pj)
May 6, 2014 Filing 227 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement and Motion for Certification of Settlement Class (and regarding briefing schedule) from June 19, 2014, at 9 a.m. to June 26, 2014, at 9 a.m. Re: MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 , MOTION to Certify Class #184 filed by defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morgan, Shon)
May 2, 2014 Filing 226 NOTICE OF FILING OF SECOND ADDENDUM TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT filed by defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Addendum to Proposed Settlement Agreement)(Morgan, Shon)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF' MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO CERTIFICATION OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT CLASS AND IN OPPOSITION TO THE PROPOSED NATIONWIDE SETTLEMENT SUBMITTED ON BEHALF OF THE 19,000 VIRGINIANS #222 by Judge George H. Wu. (lom)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): COURT ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. The Court has received a #222 Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Memorandum in Opposition to Certification of Proposed Settlement Class and in Opposition to the Proposed Nationwide Settlement that was filed by counsel representing the proposed Virginia plaintiff class members in the consolidated Gentry v. Hyundai Motor America case. Said motion is denied #222 . The Virginia Plaintiffs' attorneys fail to indicate precisely why they need to submit more than the twenty-five (25) pages (exclusive of indicies and exhibits) allowed by Central District Local Rule 11-6. It is expected that several of the plaintiff class groups from various states will file oppositions to certification of the proposed settlement class and/or the proposed nationwide settlement. It is expected that several of the plaintiff class groups will be making the same and/or very similar arguments as to many of the issues that will be raised. Therefore, the Court would advise the non-settling plaintiffs' counsel to confer and coordinate amongst themselves or through the liaison plaintiffs counsel such that there need not be repetitive arguments made in many of the briefs which will be filed to the class certification and settlement motions. Further, the Court would note that the Gentry Plaintiffs' counsel has failed to indicate the number of pages they would intend to exceed the 25 page limit. This Court is not in the habit of granting carte blanche permission to exceed page limits. (lom)
April 1, 2014 Filing 223 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 , MOTION to Certify Class #184 filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Feinman, James)
April 1, 2014 Filing 222 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation Opposition to Motion for Settlement Class and Preliminary Settlement Approval filed by plaintiff Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. Motion set for hearing on 6/19/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feinman, James)
April 1, 2014 Filing 221 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James Ben Feinman counsel for Plaintiffs Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto, John Gentry, Danielle Kay Gilleland, Linda Ruth Scott. Filed by Plaintiff John Gentry, Linda Scott, Danielle Gilleland, Joseph Bowe, Michael DeSouto. (Attorney James Ben Feinman added to party Joseph Bowe(pty:pla), Attorney James Ben Feinman added to party Michael DeSouto(pty:pla), Attorney James Ben Feinman added to party John Gentry(pty:pla), Attorney James Ben Feinman added to party Danielle Kay Gilleland(pty:pla), Attorney James Ben Feinman added to party Linda Ruth Scott(pty:pla))(Feinman, James)
March 28, 2014 Filing 219 DECLARATION of Eric H. Gibbs re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Stipulation to Reschedule,, #218 filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Gibbs, Eric)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Stipulation to Reschedule,, #218 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall adhere to the following dates: 1. Settling parties will file their Revised Agreement on or before May 2, 2014;2. Deadline for Non-Settling Plaintiffs to file Oppositions: 21 days after the Settling Parties file their Revised Agreement on or before May 23, 2014; 3. Deadline for Settling Parties to file Replies: 14 days after the deadline to file Oppositions, on or before June 6, 2014; 4. The hearing will be on June 19, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. (pj)
March 21, 2014 Filing 218 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions and Replies as to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 , MOTION to Certify Class #184 , STIPULATION to Reschedule Hearing on the Motions filed by Representative Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gibbs, Eric)
March 7, 2014 Filing 217 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Vivian S Lee counsel for Defendant KIA Motors America. Filed by Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc. (Lee, Vivian)
March 7, 2014 Filing 216 Mail Returned addressed to James E Barz. Reason: Vacant; Unable to forward. #213 (kss)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall adhere to the following dates regarding the Motion for Certification of Settlement Class (Dkt. No. 184) and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement and Order Directing Notice to the Class (Dkt. No.185)("Motions"). March 31, 2014: Deadline to file opposition to the Motions. April 17, 2014: Deadline to file replies in support of the Motions. May 1, 2014: Hearing on the Motions, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Stipulation to Reschedule,, #214 (bp)
March 3, 2014 Filing 214 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions and Replies as to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 , MOTION to Certify Class #184 , STIPULATION to Reschedule Hearing on the Motions filed by Representative Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gibbs, Eric)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUING HEARING DATE RE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY SETTLEMENT APPROVAL AND MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS by Judge George H. Wu, re, #212 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall adhere to the following dates regarding the Motion for Certification of Settlement Class (Dkt. No. 184) and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement and Order Directing Notice to the Class (Dkt. No. 185) (Motions). 1. March 10, 2014: Deadline to file opposition to the Motions. 2. March 27, 2014: Deadline to file replies in support of the Motions.3. April 10, 2014 at 8:30 a.m.: Hearing on the Motions (pj)
February 11, 2014 Filing 212 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions and Replies as to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement #185 , MOTION to Certify Class #184 , STIPULATION to Reschedule Hearing on the Motions filed by Representative Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gibbs, Eric)
January 30, 2014 Filing 211 REPORT filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Gibbs, Eric)
January 23, 2014 Filing 210 SEPARATION OF CLAIMS AND CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER by Jeffery N Luthi Clerk of the Panel Clerk of Court,, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Count I, wherein plaintiff seeks relief on behalf of a Warranty Class for alleged violations of New Jersey state law, is separated and remanded to the District of New Jersey (Kathleen Wilson (Related Case - CV 13-1625-GW(FFMx)) terminated). (pj)
January 22, 2014 Filing 208 NOTICE of Change of address by Joe R Whatley, Jr attorney for Plaintiff Jeremy Wilton. Changing attorneys address to 1180 Avenue of the Americas, 20th Floor, New York, NY 10036. Filed by Plaintiff Jeremy Wilton. (Whatley, Joe)
January 21, 2014 Filing 209 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of W. Gerald Flannery Regarding Hyundai Motor America Privilege Log Entry Nos. 10, 24 and 75. (mat)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA'S APPLICATION TO LODGE UNREDACTED DECLARATION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW AND TO FILE UNDER SEAL A REDACTED VERSION #205 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The following document is lodged under seal for in camera review by the Court: a. Unredacted copy of the declaration of Gerard Flannery. 2. The following document is deemed filed under seal: a. Redacted copy of the declaration of Gerard Flannery. (lom)
January 16, 2014 Filing 206 NOTICE OF FILING ADDENDUM TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Kaylene P Brady, Travis Brissey, Ronald J Burkard, Adam Cloutier, Steven Craig, John J Dixson, Erin L Fanthorpe, Thomas Ganim, Eric Hadesh, Nicole Marie Hunter, Michael P Keeth, Lillian E Levoff, John Kirk MacDonald, Michael Mandahl, Nicholas McDaniel, Mary J Moran-Spicuzza, Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Gregory M Sonstein, Roman Starno, Gayle A Stephenson, Andres Villicana, Richard Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Addendum to Settlement Agreement)(Carey, Robert)
January 15, 2014 Filing 205 APPLICATION TO LODGE UNREDACTED DECLARATION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW AND TO FILE UNDER SEAL A REDACTED VERSION filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company. Lodged Proposed Order. (pj)
January 15, 2014 Filing 204 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America of REDACTED UNDER SEAL VERSION OF DECLARATION OF W. GERALD FLANNERY, APPLICATION TO LODGE UNREDACTED DECLARATION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW AND TO FILE UNDER SEAL A REDACTED VERSION, PROPOSED ORDER. (Morgan, Shon)
January 10, 2014 Filing 203 SEALED DOCUMENT- DEFENDANTS' STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT (mat)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO SEAL #200 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The unredacted version of the following document is deemed filed under seal: a. Exhibit 1 to the defendants' joint status report. (lom)
January 10, 2014 Filing 201 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer re ongoing discovery issues outside the presence of Plaintiff's counsel. Plaintiffs return and the Court, as stated on the record, orders a further submission as to issue number two by the Departments on or before January 15, 2014. The Court will issue its ruling as to issue number four by January 17, 2014. Furthermore, Plaintiffs' Motion for Certification of Settlement Class #184 and Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement and Order Directing Notice to the Class #185 , presently set for January 23, 2014, are continued to March 24, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. Oppositions to the motions will be filed by February 24, 2014. Replies will be filed by March 13, 2014. Court Reporter: Rosalyn Adams. (bp)
January 10, 2014 Filing 199 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings December 9, 2013 at 9:46 a.m re Transcript #198 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Cuneo, Patricia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 10, 2014 Filing 198 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on December 9, 2013 at 9:46 a.m. Court Reporter: PAT CUNEO, CSR 1600, OFFICIAL REPORTER, website www.patcuneo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/31/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2014. (Cuneo, Patricia)
January 8, 2014 Filing 200 DEFENDANT HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA'S APPLICATION TO SEAL the concurrently submitted unredacted version of the Exhibit 1 to defendants' joint status report filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company. Lodged Proposed Order. (bp)
January 8, 2014 Filing 195 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company (Morgan, Shon)
January 8, 2014 Filing 194 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (UNDER SEAL/REDACTED))(Morgan, Shon)
January 8, 2014 Filing 193 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company (Morgan, Shon)
January 7, 2014 Filing 192 STATUS REPORT OF LIAISON COUNSEL filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Gibbs, Eric)
January 2, 2014 Filing 197 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS A through W to the Declaration of Robert B Carey in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7, Part 8, Part 9, Part 10, Part 11, Part 12, Part 13, Part 14, Part 15, Part 16, Part 17, Part 18, Part 19, Part 20, Part 21, Part 22, Part 23, Part 24, Part 25, Part 26, Part 27, Part 28, Part 29, Part 30, Part 31, Part 32, Part 33, Part 34, Part 35, Part 36)(mat)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION to SEAL exhibits to declaration of Robert B. Carey in support of Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary approval of class settlement. (mat) Modified on 1/10/2014 (mat).
December 30, 2013 Filing 190 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America of Exhibits To Notice Of In Camera Submission Of Documents Corresponding To Privilege Log Entries Selected By The Krauth And Hasper Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 HMA's Notice of In Camera Submission of Documents Corresponding To Privilege Log Entries Selected By Krauth and Hasper Plaintffs)(Morgan, Shon)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND ORDER DIRECTING NOTICE TO CLASS by Judge George H. Wu: #187 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (pj)
December 26, 2013 Filing 191 APPLICATION to SEAL exhibits to declaration of Robert B. Carey in support of Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary approval of class settlement. filed by Plaintiffs' Lodged Proposed Order. (pj)
December 26, 2013 Filing 188 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Kaylene P Brady, Travis Brissey, Ronald J Burkard, Adam Cloutier, Steven Craig, John J Dixson, Erin L Fanthorpe, Thomas Ganim, Eric Hadesh, Nicole Marie Hunter, Michael P Keeth, Lillian E Levoff, John Kirk MacDonald, Michael Mandahl, Nicholas McDaniel, Mary J Moran-Spicuzza, Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Gregory M Sonstein, Roman Starno, Gayle A Stephenson, Andres Villicana, Richard Williams of Application to Seal, Proposed Order, and Exhibits A through W. (Carey, Robert)
December 23, 2013 Filing 187 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement and Order Directing Notice to the Class filed by Plaintiff Kaylene P Brady, Travis Brissey, Ronald J Burkard, Adam Cloutier, Steven Craig, John J Dixson, Erin L Fanthorpe, Thomas Ganim, Eric Hadesh, Nicole Marie Hunter, Michael P Keeth, Lillian E Levoff, John Kirk MacDonald, Michael Mandahl, Nicholas McDaniel, Mary J Moran-Spicuzza, Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Gregory M Sonstein, Roman Starno, Gayle A Stephenson, Andres Villicana, Richard Williams. Motion set for hearing on 1/23/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carey, Robert)
December 23, 2013 Filing 186 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Gregory M Sonstein, Roman Starno, Gayle A Stephenson, Andres Villicana, Richard Williams of Exhibits A through W to Declaration of Robert B. Carey. (Carey, Robert)
December 23, 2013 Filing 185 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Settlement filed by Plaintiff Kaylene P Brady, Travis Brissey, Ronald J Burkard, Adam Cloutier, Steven Craig, John J Dixson, Erin L Fanthorpe, Thomas Ganim, Eric Hadesh, Nicole Marie Hunter, Michael P Keeth, Lillian E Levoff, John Kirk MacDonald, Michael Mandahl, Nicholas McDaniel, Mary J Moran-Spicuzza, Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Gregory M Sonstein, Roman Starno, Gayle A Stephenson, Andres Villicana, Richard Williams. Motion set for hearing on 1/23/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorites, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order)(Carey, Robert)
December 23, 2013 Filing 184 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Kaylene P Brady, Travis Brissey, Ronald J Burkard, Adam Cloutier, Steven Craig, John J Dixson, Erin L Fanthorpe, Thomas Ganim, Eric Hadesh, Nicole Marie Hunter, Michael P Keeth, Lillian E Levoff, John Kirk MacDonald, Michael Mandahl, Nicholas McDaniel, Mary J Moran-Spicuzza, Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Gregory M Sonstein, Roman Starno, Gayle A Stephenson, Andres Villicana, Richard Williams. Motion set for hearing on 1/23/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Attorney Robert B Carey added to party Travis Brissey(pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Carey added to party Ronald J Burkard(pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Carey added to party Adam Cloutier(pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Carey added to party Steven Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Carey added to party John J Dixson(pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Carey added to party Erin L Fanthorpe(pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Carey added to party Thomas Ganim(pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Carey added to party Lillian E Levoff(pty:pla))(Carey, Robert)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER OF REMAND by Judge George H. Wu, This Court, therefore, suggests that the JPML remand Count I in the above- captioned case to the transferor district court. The Clerk of this Court is hereby ORDERED to provide copies of this Entry to the transferor district court and to the Clerk of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Letter Transmittal) (pj)
December 9, 2013 Filing 182 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION REGARDING DISCOVERY #153 ; DEFENDANT KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE NON-SETTLING PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF #158 ; STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu: held before Judge George H. Wu: The Court's Tentative is circulated and attached hereto. Court hears oral argument. Based onthe Tentative and for reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' Motion Regarding Discovery is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendant KIA's motion to strike is deemedMOOT. A Scheduling Conference is set for January 9, 2014 at 9:30a.m. Joint Report as to each side's position re dates will be filed by January 7, 2014. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (pj)
December 9, 2013 Filing 181 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth Court Reporter. Court will contact Stacy Young at syoung@cpmlegal.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Murphy, Anne)
December 9, 2013 Filing 180 Joint STIPULATION for Order Suggestion of Remand filed by Defendant KIA Motors America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Suggestion of Remand)(Feeney, James)
December 6, 2013 Filing 168 Non-settling Plaintiffs' Opposition re: MOTION to Strike Supplement(Motion related),, #157 #158 filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott M. Grzenczyk in Support of Opposition)(Gibbs, Eric)
December 6, 2013 Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sara D Avila on behalf of Plaintiff Maria Figueroa (Avila, Sara)
December 2, 2013 Filing 158 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Supplement(Motion related),, #157 filed by defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby in Support of Motion to Strike, #2 Exhibit 1 to Ashby Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Morgan, Shon)
November 27, 2013 Filing 179 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF RON HAUGHEY IN SUPPORT OF HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA'S OPPOSITION TO NON-SETTLING PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL (pj)
November 27, 2013 Filing 178 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF MICHELE CAMERON (pj)
November 27, 2013 Filing 177 SEALED DOCUMENT-OF JASON R ERB IN SUPPORT HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA'S OPPOSITION TO NON-SETTLING PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL (pj)
November 27, 2013 Filing 176 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF BRYAN L CLOBES (pj)
November 27, 2013 Filing 175 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF SARA JONES IN SUPPORT OF HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA'S OPPOSITION TO NON-SETTLING PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL (pj)
November 27, 2013 Filing 174 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF SANDY ZIELOMSKI IN SUPPORT OF HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA'S OPPOSITION TO NON SETTLING PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL (pj)
November 27, 2013 Filing 173 SEALED DOCUMENT-DISCOVERY STIPULATION (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(pj)
November 27, 2013 Filing 172 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF JOSEPH R ASHBY IN SUPPORT OF HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA'S OPPOSITI9ON TO NON SETTLING PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL (Attachments: #1 Declaration Part2 of 2 Part 1, #2 Declaration Part 2 of 2 Part 2)(pj)
November 27, 2013 Filing 171 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF SCOTT GRZENCZYK (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(pj)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 SEALED DOCUMENT-ORDER GRANTING JOINT APPLICATION TO SEAL AND FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW by Judge George H. Wu: #169 (pj)
November 27, 2013 Filing 169 SEALED DOCUMENT-JOINT APPLICATION TO SEAL AND FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW (pj)
November 27, 2013 Filing 166 SEALED DOCUMENT- Documents filed Under Seal. (mat)
November 27, 2013 Filing 165 SEALED DOCUMENT - Documents filed Under Seal. (mat)
November 27, 2013 Filing 163 SEALED DOCUMENT- Documents filed Under Seal. (mat)
November 27, 2013 Filing 160 SEALED DOCUMENT -Documents filed Under Seal. (mat)
November 25, 2013 Filing 164 SEALED DOCUMENT - Documents file Under Seal. (mat)
November 25, 2013 Filing 162 SEALED DOCUMENT - Documents Under Seal. (mat)
November 25, 2013 Filing 161 SEALED DOCUMENT - Documents Filed Under Seal. (mat)
November 25, 2013 Filing 159 SEALED DOCUMENT - Documents filed Under Seal. (mat)
November 25, 2013 Filing 157 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Discovery #153 of Non-Settling Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum (Supplemental) of Liaison Counsel (REDACTED), #2 Declaration of Eric H. Gibbs in connection with Liaison Counsels Supplemental Discovery Memorandum, #3 Memorandum (Supplemental) of Krauth and Hasper Plaintiffs (REDACTED), #4 Declaration of Laura Antonini in connection with Liaison Counsels Supplemental Discovery Memorandum (Exhibit 2 Filed Under Seal), #5 Memorandum (Supplemental) of Figueroa (REDACTED), #6 Memorandum (Supplemental) of Alex Maturani (REDACTED))(Gibbs, Eric)
November 25, 2013 Filing 156 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James J Ison counsel for Plaintiff Gunther Krauth. JAMES J. ISON is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by PLAINTIFF Gunter Krauth. (Ison, James)
November 25, 2013 Filing 155 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj (Gibbs, Eric)
November 21, 2013 Filing 154 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION for Discovery #153 filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Grzenczyk and Exhibits A-R (UNDER SEAL/REDACTED), #2 Declaration of Joseph Ashby and Exhibits 1-11 (UNDER SEAL/REDACTED), #3 Declaration of William Anderson, #4 Declaration of Bryan Clobes and Exhibit A (REDACTED))(Gibbs, Eric)
November 21, 2013 Filing 153 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Discovery filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Gibbs, Eric)
November 21, 2013 Filing 152 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj of Joint Application to Seal And For In Camera Review; [Proposed] Order Granting Joint Application to Seal And For In Camera Review; Joint Discovery Stipulation; Exhibits B-D, F-M, and P-R to the Declaration of Scott Grzenczyk; Exhibits 1, 3 and 7-11 to the Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby; Exhibit A to the Declaration of Bryan Clobes; Declarations of Michele Cameron, Jason R. Erb, Ron Haughey, Sara Jones, and Sandy Zielomski. (Gibbs, Eric)
November 20, 2013 Filing 151 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth Court Reporter. Court will contact Stacy Young at syoung@cpmlegal.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Murphy, Anne)
November 7, 2013 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney J Thomas Henretta on behalf of Plaintiff Dennis J. Murphy (Attorney J Thomas Henretta added to party Dennis J. Murphy(pty:pla))(Henretta, J)
October 31, 2013 Filing 149 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Tina Wolfson counsel for Plaintiffs Jeffrey Hathaway, Laura S Sutta. Changing address to 1016 Palm Avenue, West Hollywood, CA 90069. Filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Hathaway and Laura S Sutta. (Wolfson, Tina)
October 31, 2013 Filing 148 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Robert Ahdoot counsel for Plaintiffs Jeffrey Hathaway, Laura S Sutta. Changing address to 1016 Palm Avenue, West Hollywood, CA 90069. Filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Hathaway and Laura S Sutta. (Ahdoot, Robert)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY SCHEDULE by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Discovery #146 see attached for further details (pj)
October 1, 2013 Filing 146 Joint STIPULATION for Discovery as to schedule filed by Individual and Representative Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gibbs, Eric)
October 1, 2013 Filing 145 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant KIA Motors America Court Reporter. Court will contact Vivian S. Lee at vlee@dykema.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Status Conference 9/26/13. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Lee, Vivian)
September 30, 2013 Filing 144 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth Court Reporter. Court will contact Stacy Young at syoung@cpmlegal.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: September 26, 2013 Status Conference. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Murphy, Anne)
September 26, 2013 Filing 143 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: Court and counsel confer re scheduling. The status conference is continued December 9, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. to resolve discovery issues. Reports are due by November 22, 2013. Court Reporter: Katie Thibedeaux. (pj)
September 25, 2013 Filing 142 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company. (Morgan, Shon)
September 24, 2013 Filing 141 STATUS REPORT OF SETTLING PLAINTIFFS filed by Plaintiffs E Brandon Bowron, Kaylene P Brady, Travis Brissey, Colnett Brubaker, Ronald J Burkard, Ashley Cephas, Adam Cloutier, Steven Craig, John J Dixson, Kehlie R Espinosa, Erin L Fanthorpe, Eric Hadesh, Nicole Marie Hunter, Michael P Keeth, John Kirk MacDonald, Michael Mandahl, Nicholas McDaniel, Mary J Moran-Spicuzza, Steve B Perry, Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Giuseppina Roberto, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Roman Starno, Gayle A Stephenson, Andres Villicana, Richard Williams. (Byszewski, Elaine)
September 24, 2013 Filing 140 STATUS REPORT BY LIAISON COUNSEL filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Gibbs, Eric)
August 27, 2013 Filing 139 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/15/13 9:45 a.m. re Transcript #138 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 27, 2013 Filing 138 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/15/13 9:45 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: DEBORAH K. GACKLE, CSR, RPR, phone number (213) 620-1149. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/17/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/27/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2013. (ha)
August 26, 2013 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Hae Sung Nam on behalf of Plaintiff Herbert J Young (Nam, Hae)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Discovery #134 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the dates currently set for presenting discoverydisputes to the Court [Dkt. # 131] are stricken. The confirmatory discovery interviews scheduled for August 29-30 and September 12-13 shall proceed. The Court sets a further status conference for September 26, 2013 at 9:30am. Liaison Counsel shall file a Status Report no later than noon on September 24, 2013. (pj)
August 20, 2013 Filing 134 Joint STIPULATION for Discovery as to witness interview schedule filed by Individual and Representative Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gibbs, Eric)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #133 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Hae Sung Nam on behalf of Herbert J. Young, designating Justin B. Farar as local counsel. (lt)
August 19, 2013 Filing 133 APPLICATION for attorney HAE SUNG NAM to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Plaintiff Herbert J Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Farar, Justin)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: denying #130 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Terming Attorney Hae Sung Nam. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.3.4 = This Court requires local counsel to maintain an office within the Central District. mr. King is in the Northern District. PHV Counsel will have until August 26, 2013 to comply with Local Rules. Fee shall returned by the Clerk if counsel has not complied. Fee shall be returned by the Clerk. (lt)
August 15, 2013 Filing 131 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H. Wu, Court and counsel confer re discovery issues. Parties will exchange documents regarding local interviews by August 21, 2013. Discovery disputes will be filed by 1:30 p.m. on August 22, 2013. Hearing regarding discovery as to local interviews will be held on August 26, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. In addition, parties will exchange documents regarding Korean interviews and file any discovery disputes as to the Korean interviews by September 3, 2013. Hearing regarding discovery as to the Korean interviews will be held on September 5, 2013 at 9:30 a.m.Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (pj)
August 15, 2013 Filing 130 APPLICATION for attorney HAE SUNG NAM to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-12555341 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Herbert J Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(King, Laurence)
August 14, 2013 Filing 129 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharajto Report, #128 of Defendants' filed on August 13, 2013 (Gibbs, Eric)
August 13, 2013 Filing 128 STATUS REPORT of CONFIRMATORY DISCOVERY filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Morgan, Shon)
August 13, 2013 Filing 127 STATUS REPORT BY LIAISON COUNSEL filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Gibbs, Eric)
July 24, 2013 Filing 126 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; Based on Liaison Counsel's Status Report #124 , the Status Conference previously scheduled for 07/25/2013 is CONTINUED to 8/15/2013 09:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 23, 2013 Filing 125 Notice of Electronic Filing re Status Report #124 e-mailed to ward.davis@belldavispitt.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 553-'RULE: Mailbox access for ward.davis@belldavispitt.com refused: user invalid'. Attorney still with firm, notification resent to ward.davis@belldavispitt.com. Did not bounce back, possible server problems on their end earlier. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 23, 2013 Filing 124 STATUS REPORT BY LIAISON COUNSEL filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Gibbs, Eric)
July 12, 2013 Filing 123 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; Based on Liaison Counsel's Status Report #122 , the Status Conference previously scheduled for 07/11/2013 is CONTINUED to 7/25/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 9, 2013 Filing 122 STATUS REPORT BY LIAISON COUNSEL filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Gibbs, Eric)
June 19, 2013 Filing 121 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; Based on Liaison Counsel's Status Report #120 , the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 06/20/2013 has been rescheduled to 7/11/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 19, 2013 Filing 120 STATUS REPORT BY LIAISON COUNSEL filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Gibbs, Eric)
June 7, 2013 Filing 119 Notice of Electronic Filing re Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120), #116 e-mailed to amansfield@whatleykallas.com, klibby@whatleykallas.com, jwhatley@whatleykallas.com bounced due to delivered expired; too many connections from your IP.. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to jwhatley@whatleykallas.com, amansfield@whatleykallas.com, klibby@whatleykallas.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 7, 2013 Filing 116 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant KIA Motors America Court Reporter. Court will contact Vivian S. Lee at vlee@dykema.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Status Conference. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Lee, Vivian)
June 6, 2013 Filing 118 Notice of Electronic Filing re Scheduling Conference, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #117 e-mailed to pjk@keatinglawgroup.com bounced due to matches a profile the Internet community may consider spam.. Primary e-mail address is correct. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to pjk@keatinglawgroup.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 6, 2013 Filing 117 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H. Wu, Court and counsel confer. For reasons stated on the record, the Scheduling Conference is continued to June 20, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. A Joint Report shall be filed by the parties by noon on June 17, 2013 regarding the status of the case, agreements, disputes, and positions of nonsettling plaintiffs. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (pj)
June 6, 2013 Filing 115 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj Court Reporter. Court will contact Julia Vitaro at jiv@girardgibbs.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Status Conference. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Gibbs, Eric)
June 6, 2013 Filing 114 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth Court Reporter. Court will contact Jackie Divinagracia at jdivinagracia@cpmlegal.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Status Conference. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Murphy, Anne)
June 6, 2013 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James Jeffrey Ison on behalf of Plaintiffs Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth (Ison, James)
June 6, 2013 Filing 112 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendants Grossinger Autoplex Inc, Hyundai Motor America Court Reporter. Court will contact Mariko Fonseca at marikofonseca@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: June 6, 2013 Scheduling Conference. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Morgan, Shon)
June 5, 2013 Filing 111 STATUS REPORT BY LIAISON COUNSEL filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E)(Gibbs, Eric)
June 5, 2013 Filing 109 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 04-11-2013 10:00 a.m. re Transcript #108 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(Duvall, Richard) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 5, 2013 Filing 108 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 04-11-2013 10:00 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: DEBORAH K. GACKLE, CSR, RPR, phone number (213) 620-1149. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/26/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2013. (Duvall, Richard)
June 3, 2013 Filing 110 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. Hearing is held off the record. Court hears oral argument. The Non-settling Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application #104 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Court Reporter: None Present. (kti)
June 3, 2013 Filing 107 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for STAYING INTERVIEWS #104 filed by Plaintiff Kaylene P Brady. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Carey, Robert)
June 3, 2013 Filing 106 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for STAYING INTERVIEWS #104 filed by Defendant KIA Motors America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lonnie, Dommond)
June 3, 2013 Filing 105 DECLARATION of ERIC H. GIBBS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for STAYING INTERVIEWS #104 filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G to the Declaration of Eric H. Gibbs in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Gibbs, Eric)
June 3, 2013 Filing 104 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for STAYING INTERVIEWS filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING INTERVIEWS)(Gibbs, Eric)
May 30, 2013 Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Scheduling Conference, Set/Reset Hearing,, #101 , as to defendant Hyundai Motor America Court Reporter. Court will contact Amy Kuzio at amykuzio@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Scheduling conference. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Morgan, Shon)
May 30, 2013 Filing 102 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth Court Reporter. Court will contact Stacy Young at syoung@cpmlegal.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Murphy, Anne)
May 23, 2013 Filing 101 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H. Court and counsel confer re discovery. For reasons stated on the record, the Scheduling Conference is continued to June 6, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. Liaison counsel will file a Report re Scheduling by noon on June 4, 2013. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (kti)
May 22, 2013 Filing 100 STATUS REPORT (Plaintiffs Brady, et al., HMA, KMA, and HKMC's Joint Status Report) filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company. (Morgan, Shon)
May 21, 2013 Filing 99 STATUS REPORT BY LIASON COUNSEL filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Gibbs, Eric)
May 21, 2013 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Thomas E Loeser on behalf of Plaintiffs E Brandon Bowron, Kaylene P Brady, Travis Brissey, Colnett Brubaker, Ronald J Burkard, Adam Cloutier, Steven Craig, John J Dixson, Erin L Fanthorpe, Eric Hadesh, Nicole Marie Hunter, Michael P Keeth, John Kirk MacDonald, Michael Mandahl, Nicholas McDaniel, Mary J Moran-Spicuzza, Steve B Perry, Gary Pincas, Brandon Potter, Thomas Purdy, Rocco Renghini, Giuseppina Roberto, Michelle Singleton, Ken Smiley, Roman Starno, Gayle A Stephenson, Andres Villicana, Richard Williams (Loeser, Thomas)
May 17, 2013 Filing 97 Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor Company, identifying Hyundai Mobis Co., Ltd., Kia Motors Corporation, Hyundai Motor America. (Morgan, Shon)
May 15, 2013 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jon A Tostrud on behalf of Plaintiffs Kevin Gobel, Eric Larson, Brian Weber (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tostrud, Jon)
May 9, 2013 Filing 95 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; Based on Liaison Counsel's Statement #93 , The Status Conference previously scheduled for 05/09/2013 is CONTINUED to 5/23/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 8, 2013 Filing 94 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Donald Brown, Cameron John Cestaro, Kim Iocovozzi, Constance Martyn, Jerold Terhost, Tom Woodward. (Bonsignore, Robert)
May 8, 2013 Filing 93 STATEMENT REGARDING MAY 9, 2013 STATUS CONFERENCE (Gibbs, Eric)
May 7, 2013 Filing 92 STATUS REPORT BY LIAISON COUNSEL filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Gibbs, Eric)
May 3, 2013 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert J Bonsignore on behalf of Plaintiffs Donald Brown, Cameron John Cestaro, Kim Iocovozzi, Constance Martyn, Jerold Terhost, Tom Woodward (Bonsignore, Robert)
May 3, 2013 Filing 90 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert J Bonsignore on behalf of Plaintiffs Bobby Brandon Armstrong, Daniel Baldeschi, Leslie Bayard, James Bonsignore, E Brandon Bowron, Kaylene P Brady, Michael Brein, Donald Brown, Andres Carullo, Cameron John Cestaro, Owen Chapman, Ira D. Dunst, Orlando Elliott, Kehlie R Espinosa, Tricia Fellers, Maria Figueroa, Thomas Ganim, Sean Goldsberry, Marshall Lawrence Gordon, Eric Graewingholt, James Gudgalis, Sam Hammond, Linda Hasper, Stephen Hayes, Mary P. Hoessler, Nicole Marie Hunter, Kim Iocovozzi, Lydia Kievit, Gunther Krauth, Douglas Kurash, Mark Leggett, Lillian E Levoff, Joel A. Lipman, Kamneel Maharaj, Constance Martyn, Alex Maturani, Jennifer Myers, Cynthia Navarro, Edwin Naythons, Eric J Olson, Guillermo Quiroz, Brian Reeves, Nilufar Rezai, Giuseppina Roberto, Jack Rottner, Rebecca Sanders, Margaret Setser, Aaron Simmons, Laura S Sutta, Jerold Terhost, Georgia L Thomas, Reece Philip Thomson, Sergio Torres, Robert Trader, Michael Washburn, Brian Weber, Kathleen Wilson, Jeremy Wilton, Richard Woodruff, Tom Woodward, Herbert J Young, Defendants Hyundai Motor America, KIA Motors America, In Re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation (Bonsignore, Robert)
May 3, 2013 Filing 89 Third NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert J Bonsignore on behalf of Plaintiffs Bobby Brandon Armstrong, Daniel Baldeschi, Leslie Bayard, James Bonsignore, E Brandon Bowron, Kaylene P Brady, Michael Brein, Donald Brown, Andres Carullo, Cameron John Cestaro, Owen Chapman, Ira D. Dunst, Orlando Elliott, Kehlie R Espinosa, Tricia Fellers, Maria Figueroa, Thomas Ganim, Sean Goldsberry, Marshall Lawrence Gordon, Eric Graewingholt, James Gudgalis, Sam Hammond, Linda Hasper, Stephen Hayes, Mary P. Hoessler, Nicole Marie Hunter, Kim Iocovozzi, Lydia Kievit, Gunther Krauth, Douglas Kurash, Mark Leggett, Lillian E Levoff, Joel A. Lipman, Kamneel Maharaj, Constance Martyn, Alex Maturani, Jennifer Myers, Cynthia Navarro, Edwin Naythons, Eric J Olson, Guillermo Quiroz, Brian Reeves, Nilufar Rezai, Giuseppina Roberto, Jack Rottner, Rebecca Sanders, Margaret Setser, Aaron Simmons, Laura S Sutta, Jerold Terhost, Georgia L Thomas, Reece Philip Thomson, Sergio Torres, Robert Trader, Michael Washburn, Brian Weber, Kathleen Wilson, Jeremy Wilton, Richard Woodruff, Tom Woodward, Herbert J Young, Defendants Hyundai Motor America, KIA Motors America, In Re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation (Bonsignore, Robert)
May 3, 2013 Filing 88 Second NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert J Bonsignore on behalf of Plaintiffs Bobby Brandon Armstrong, Daniel Baldeschi, Leslie Bayard, James Bonsignore, E Brandon Bowron, Kaylene P Brady, Michael Brein, Donald Brown, Andres Carullo, Cameron John Cestaro, Owen Chapman, Ira D. Dunst, Orlando Elliott, Kehlie R Espinosa, Tricia Fellers, Maria Figueroa, Thomas Ganim, Sean Goldsberry, Marshall Lawrence Gordon, Eric Graewingholt, James Gudgalis, Sam Hammond, Linda Hasper, Stephen Hayes, Mary P. Hoessler, Nicole Marie Hunter, Kim Iocovozzi, Lydia Kievit, Gunther Krauth, Douglas Kurash, Mark Leggett, Lillian E Levoff, Joel A. Lipman, Kamneel Maharaj, Constance Martyn, Alex Maturani, Jennifer Myers, Cynthia Navarro, Edwin Naythons, Eric J Olson, Guillermo Quiroz, Brian Reeves, Nilufar Rezai, Giuseppina Roberto, Jack Rottner, Rebecca Sanders, Margaret Setser, Aaron Simmons, Laura S Sutta, Jerold Terhost, Georgia L Thomas, Reece Philip Thomson, Sergio Torres, Robert Trader, Michael Washburn, Brian Weber, Kathleen Wilson, Jeremy Wilton, Richard Woodruff, Tom Woodward, Herbert J Young, Defendants Hyundai Motor America, KIA Motors America, In Re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation (Bonsignore, Robert)
May 3, 2013 Filing 87 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert J Bonsignore on behalf of Plaintiffs Bobby Brandon Armstrong, Daniel Baldeschi, Leslie Bayard, James Bonsignore, E Brandon Bowron, Kaylene P Brady, Michael Brein, Donald Brown, Andres Carullo, Cameron John Cestaro, Owen Chapman, Ira D. Dunst, Orlando Elliott, Kehlie R Espinosa, Tricia Fellers, Maria Figueroa, Thomas Ganim, Sean Goldsberry, Marshall Lawrence Gordon, Eric Graewingholt, James Gudgalis, Sam Hammond, Linda Hasper, Stephen Hayes, Mary P. Hoessler, Nicole Marie Hunter, Kim Iocovozzi, Lydia Kievit, Gunther Krauth, Douglas Kurash, Mark Leggett, Lillian E Levoff, Joel A. Lipman, Kamneel Maharaj, Constance Martyn, Alex Maturani, Jennifer Myers, Cynthia Navarro, Edwin Naythons, Eric J Olson, Guillermo Quiroz, Brian Reeves, Nilufar Rezai, Giuseppina Roberto, Jack Rottner, Rebecca Sanders, Margaret Setser, Aaron Simmons, Laura S Sutta, Jerold Terhost, Georgia L Thomas, Reece Philip Thomson, Sergio Torres, Robert Trader, Michael Washburn, Brian Weber, Kathleen Wilson, Jeremy Wilton, Richard Woodruff, Tom Woodward, Herbert J Young, Defendants Hyundai Motor America, KIA Motors America, In Re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation (Bonsignore, Robert)
April 29, 2013 Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant KIA Motors America Court Reporter. Court will contact Vivian S. Lee at vlee@dykema.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Scheduling Conference 4/25/13. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Lee, Vivian)
April 26, 2013 Filing 84 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Hyundai Motor America Court Reporter. Court will contact Amy Kuzio at amykuzio@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 4/25/13 Scheduling Conference. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Morgan, Shon)
April 26, 2013 Filing 83 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj Court Reporter. Court will contact Julia Vitaro at jiv@girardgibbs.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Scheduling Conference. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Gibbs, Eric)
April 26, 2013 Filing 82 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth Court Reporter. Court will contact Stacy Young at syoung@cpmlegal.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Scheduling Conference 4/25/13. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Murphy, Anne)
April 25, 2013 Filing 86 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer re discovery database. For reasons stated on the record, the Scheduling Conference is continued to May 9, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. Liaison counsel will file a Report re Scheduling by noon on May 7, 2013., The deadlines and hearings originally scheduled have been rescheduled Scheduling Conference set for 5/9/2013 09:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (bp)
April 24, 2013 Filing 81 STATUS REPORT (Plaintiffs Brady, et al., HMA, and KMA's Joint Status Report) filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Morgan, Shon)
April 23, 2013 Filing 80 STATUS REPORT BY LIAISON COUNSEL filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Gibbs, Eric)
April 19, 2013 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney R Dean Gresham on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Washburn (Gresham, R)
April 19, 2013 Filing 78 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The time to appear at the Scheduling Conference #76 , set for April 25, 2013, has changed from 9:30 a.m. to 1:30 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 15, 2013 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff Herbert J Young Court Reporter. Court will contact Suzanne Powley at spowley@kaplanfox.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Scheduling Conference 4/11/2013. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Farar, Justin)
April 12, 2013 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jason S Kilene on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Weber (Kilene, Jason)
April 12, 2013 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel E Gustafson on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Weber (Gustafson, Daniel)
April 11, 2013 Filing 76 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer re scheduling. For reasons stated on the record, the Scheduling Conference iscontinued to April 25, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. Liaison counsel will file a Report re Scheduling by noon on April 23, 2013. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (pj)
April 11, 2013 Filing 73 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant Hyundai Motor America Court Reporter. Court will contact Amy Kuzio at amykuzio@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: April 11, 2013 Scheduling Conference. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Morgan, Shon)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #55 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael L. Kidney on behalf of Defendant Hyundai Motor America, designating Shon Morgan as local counsel. (lt)
April 11, 2013 Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth Court Reporter. Court will contact Stacy Young at syoung@cpmlegal.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Scheduling Conference 4/11/13. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Murphy, Anne)
April 11, 2013 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney R Martin Weber, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Washburn (Weber, R)
April 11, 2013 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Richard E Norman on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Washburn (Norman, Richard)
April 11, 2013 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Justin Saif on behalf of Plaintiff Ira D. Dunst (Saif, Justin)
April 11, 2013 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bryan A Wood on behalf of Plaintiff Ira D. Dunst (Wood, Bryan)
April 10, 2013 Filing 66 STATUS REPORT (Plaintiff Brady, et al., and Hyundai/Kia's Joint Status Report) filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Morgan, Shon)
April 10, 2013 Filing 65 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America, re Notice of Appearance #64 served on 4/10/13. (Hansell, Dean)
April 10, 2013 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Dean Hansell on behalf of Defendant Hyundai Motor America (Hansell, Dean)
April 10, 2013 Filing 63 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Elaine S Kusel counsel for Plaintiff Kehlie R Espinosa. Filed by Plaintiffs Kehlie R. Espinosa (Kusel, Elaine)
April 10, 2013 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert Eugene Cartwright, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs James Bonsignore, Donald Brown, Cameron John Cestaro, Orlando Elliott, Tricia Fellers, Kim Iocovozzi, Constance Martyn, Jennifer Myers, Margaret Setser, Jerold Terhost, Tom Woodward (Cartwright, Robert)
April 10, 2013 Filing 61 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Dommond E Lonnie counsel for Defendant KIA Motors America. Adding Dommond E. Lonnie as attorney as counsel of record for Kia Motors America, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc. (Lonnie, Dommond)
April 10, 2013 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jae Kook Kim on behalf of Plaintiff Kehlie R Espinosa (Kim, Jae)
April 10, 2013 Filing 59 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Vivian S Lee counsel for Defendant KIA Motors America. Filed by Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc. (Lee, Vivian)
April 10, 2013 Filing 58 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney James Powell Feeney counsel for Defendant KIA Motors America. Adding James P. Feeney as attorney as counsel of record for Kia Motors America, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc. (Feeney, James)
April 10, 2013 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Richard D McCune, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Kehlie R Espinosa (McCune, Richard)
April 10, 2013 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Pamela Pressley on behalf of Plaintiffs Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth (Pressley, Pamela)
April 9, 2013 Filing 55 APPLICATION for attorney Michael L. Kidney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Morgan, Shon)
April 9, 2013 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jonathan W Cuneo on behalf of Plaintiff Gunther Krauth (Cuneo, Jonathan)
April 9, 2013 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney William H Anderson on behalf of Plaintiff Gunther Krauth (Anderson, William)
April 9, 2013 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sandra Watson Cuneo on behalf of Plaintiff Gunther Krauth (Cuneo, Sandra)
April 9, 2013 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Steven M Campora on behalf of Plaintiffs Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth (Campora, Steven)
April 9, 2013 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Craig C Sheffer on behalf of Plaintiffs Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth (Sheffer, Craig)
April 9, 2013 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Wesley W Barnett on behalf of Plaintiff Alex Maturani (Barnett, Wesley)
April 9, 2013 Filing 48 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Benjamin W Jeffers counsel for Defendant KIA Motors America. Adding Benjamin W. Jeffers as attorney as counsel of record for Kia Motors America, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc. (Jeffers, Benjamin)
April 9, 2013 Filing 47 STATUS REPORT BY LIAISON COUNSEL filed by Plaintiff Kamneel Maharaj. (Gibbs, Eric)
April 8, 2013 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Laura Antonini on behalf of Plaintiffs Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth (Antonini, Laura)
April 8, 2013 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Harvey Rosenfield on behalf of Plaintiffs Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth (Rosenfield, Harvey)
April 4, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sara D Avila on behalf of Plaintiff Maria Figueroa (Avila, Sara)
April 4, 2013 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sara D Avila on behalf of Plaintiff Maria Figueroa (Avila, Sara)
April 4, 2013 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Anne Marie Murphy on behalf of Plaintiffs Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth (Murphy, Anne)
April 4, 2013 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Anne Marie Murphy on behalf of Plaintiffs Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth (Murphy, Anne)
April 4, 2013 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Anne Marie Murphy on behalf of Plaintiffs Linda Hasper, Gunther Krauth (Murphy, Anne)
April 3, 2013 Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU: Constance Martyn v. Hyundai Motor America, SACV 13-475-GW(FFMx), is consolidated with the above-entitled action for pretrial purposes. Based on the March 28, 2013 hearing in In Re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation, MDL 13-2424-GW(FFMx), all cases involved in the Hyundai/Kia Economy Litigation will be consolidated with MDL 13-2424-GW(FFMx) for pretrial purposes. Parties are advised that all subsequent filings will be filed under the MDL. Notice of Appearances are required in order to receive electronic notice of all subsequent filings. The Court appoints Eric H. Gibbs as Plaintiffs Liaison counsel for purposes of settlement. A Scheduling Conference is set for April 11, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. (bp)
April 3, 2013 Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU: Tom Woodward v. Kia Motors America, Inc., SACV 13-443-GW(FFMx), is consolidated with the above-entitled action for pretrial purposes. Based on the March 28, 2013 hearing in In Re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation, MDL 13-2424-GW(FFMx), all cases involved in the Hyundai/Kia Economy Litigation will be consolidated with MDL 13-2424-GW(FFMx) for pretrial purposes. Parties are advised that all subsequent filings will be filed under the MDL. Notice of Appearances are required in order to receive electronic notice of all subsequent filings. The Court appoints Eric H. Gibbs as Plaintiffs Liaison counsel for purposes of settlement. A Scheduling Conference is set for April 11, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. (bp)
April 3, 2013 Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU: Cameron John Cestaro v. Hyundai Motor America, SACV13-442-GW(FFMx), is consolidated with the above-entitled action for pretrial purposes. Based on the March 28, 2013 hearing in In Re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation, MDL 13-2424-GW(FFMx), all cases involved in the Hyundai and Kia Economy Litigation will be consolidated with MDL 13-2424-GW(FFMx) for pretrial purposes. Parties are advised that all subsequent filings will be filed under the MDL. Notice of Appearances are required in order to receive electronic notice of all subsequent filings. The Court appoints Eric H. Gibbs as Plaintiffs' liaison counsel for purposes of settlement. A Scheduling Conference is set for April 11, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. (bp)
April 3, 2013 Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU: Donald Brown v. Kia Motors America, Inc., SACV13-441-GW(FFMx), is consolidated with the above-entitled action for pretrial purposes. Based on the March 28, 2013 hearing in In Re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation, MDL 13-2424-GW(FFMx), all cases involved in the Hyundai/Kia Economy Litigation will be consolidated with MDL 13-2424-GW(FFMx) for pretrial purposes. Parties are advised that all subsequent filings will be filed under the MDL. Notice of Appearances are required in order to receive electronic notice of all subsequent filings. The Court appoints Eric H. Gibbs as Plaintiffs' liaison counsel for purposes of settlement. A scheduling Conference is set for April 11, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. (bp)
April 3, 2013 Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU: Jerold Terhost v. Kia Motors America, Inc. SACV13-476-GW(FFMx), is consolidated with the above-entitled action for pretrial purposes. Based on the March 28, 2013 hearing in In Re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation, MDL 13-2424-GW(FFMx), all cases involved in the Hyundai/Kia Economy Litigation will be consolidated with MDL 13-2424-GW(FFMx) for pretrial purposes. Parties are advised that all subsequent filings will be filed under the MDL. Notice of Appearances are required in order to receive electronic notice of all subsequent filings. The Court appoints Eric H. Gibbs as Plaintiffs' liaison counsel for purposes of settlement. A scheduling Conference is set for April 11, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. (bp)
April 3, 2013 Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU: Maria Figueroa v. Hyndai Motor America, SACV13-373-GW(FFMx), is consolidated with the above-entitled action for pretrial purposes. Based on the March 28, 2013 hearing in In Re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation, MDL 13-2424-GW(FFMx), all cases involved in the Hyundai/Kia Economy Litigation will be consolidated with MDL-13-2424-GW(FFMx) for pretrial purposes. Parties are advised that all subsequent filing will be filed under the MDL. The Court appoints Eric H. Gibbs as Plaintiffs' liaison counsel for purposes of settlement. A scheduling Conference is set for April 11, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. (bp)
April 3, 2013 Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU: Jennifer Myers v. Hyundai Motor America, SACV13-444-GW(FFMx), is consolidated with the above-entitled action for pretrial purposes. As documents are routed using the judge's initials, it is important to use the correct initials on all subsequent filings. Based on the March 28, 2013 hearing in InRe: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Ecomony Litigation, MDL 13-2424-GW(FFMx), all cases involved in the Hyundai/Kia Economy Litigation will be consolidated with MDL 13-2424-GW(FFMx) for pretrial purposes. Parties are advised that all subsequent filings will be filed under the MDL. Notice of Appearances are required in order to receive electronic notice of all subsequent filings. The Court appoints Eric H. Gibbs as Plaintiffs' liaison counsel for purposes of settlement. A Scheduling Conference is set for April 11, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. Mr. Gibbs is required to file a Status Report re Settlement by noon on April 9, 2013. (bp)
April 3, 2013 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey Scott Goldenberg on behalf of Plaintiff Rebecca Sanders (Goldenberg, Jeffrey)
April 2, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Steve W Berman on behalf of Plaintiffs Kaylene P Brady, Nicole Marie Hunter (Berman, Steve)
April 2, 2013 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert B Carey on behalf of Plaintiffs Kaylene P Brady, Nicole Marie Hunter (Carey, Robert)
April 2, 2013 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Justin B Farar on behalf of Plaintiff Herbert J Young (Farar, Justin)
April 2, 2013 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine Sarah DiDonato on behalf of Plaintiff Jeremy Wilton (DiDonato, Katherine)
April 2, 2013 Filing 26 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney William James Doyle, II on behalf of Plaintiff Jeremy Wilton (Doyle, William)
April 1, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Kristin B Libby counsel for Plaintiff Jeremy Wilton. Adding Kristin B. Libby as attorney as counsel of record for Jeremy Wilton, et al. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jeremy Wilton, et al. (Libby, Kristin)
April 1, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Joe R Whatley, Jr counsel for Plaintiff Jeremy Wilton. Adding Joe R. Whatley as attorney as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Jeremy Wilton, et al. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Jeremy Wilton, et al. (Whatley, Joe)
April 1, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Alan M Mansfield counsel for Plaintiff Jeremy Wilton. Adding Alan M. Mansfield as attorney as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Jeremy Wilton, et al. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Jeremy Wilton, et al. (Mansfield, Alan)
March 28, 2013 Filing 32 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H. Wu,The Court consolidates the following additional related cases into the MDL action:Brian Weber, et al. v. Hyundai Motor America,: et al., SACV 13-27-GW(FFMx) Kamneel Maharaj, et a!. v. Hyundai Motor Company, et a!., SACV 13-70-GW(FFMx)Kim Iocovozzi v. Kia Motors America, Inc., SACV 13-159-GW(FFMx) Herbert J Young v. Kia Motors America, Inc., et al., CV 13-167-GW(FFMx)Linda Hasper, et al. v. Hyundai Motor Company, et al., SACV 13-220-GW(FFMx)Leslie Bayard, et al. v. Hyundai Motor Company, et al., SACV 13-257-GW(FFMx)TriciaFellers v. Kia Motors America, Inc., SACV 13-384-GW(FFMx)Orlando Elliott v. Hyundai Motor America, SACV 13-385-GW(FFMx)James Bonsignorev. Kia Motors America, Inc., SACV 13-386-GW(FFMx)Margqr~t Setser v. Kia Motors America, Inc., SACV 13-387-GW(FFMx) Guillermo Quiroz, et al. v. Kia Motors America, Inc. et al., SACV 12-2091-GW(FFMx)Douglas Kurash, et al.v. Hyundai Motor America, et al., SACV 12-2164-GW(FFMx)Andres Carullo, et al. v. Kia Motors America, Inc~ et al., SACV 12-2174-GW(FFMx} Laura S. Sutta, et al. v. Hyundai Motor America, SACV 13-417-GW(FFMx) Georgia L. Thomas, et al. v. Hyundai Motor Company, et al., SACV 12-2008-GW(FFMx)EricJ. Olson, et al. v. Hyundai Motor Company, et al., SACV 12-2025-GW(FFMx) Parties are advised that all subsequent filings will be filed under In Re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation, MDL 13-2424-GW(FFMx). Parties will file their respective Notice of Appearances. The Court appoints Eric H. Gibbs as liaison counsel for purposes of settlement. The Scheduling Conference is continued to April 11, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. Mr. Gibbs will file a Status Report re Settlement by noon on April 9, 2013.Defendants obligation to respond to the individual complaint(s) and discovery matters are stayed pending settlement in this action.Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (pj)
March 28, 2013 Filing 22 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation Court Reporter. Court will contact Amy Kuzio at amykuzio@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: Hearing March 28, 2013. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Morgan, Shon)
March 28, 2013 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance (Morgan, Shon)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu. On March 12, 2013, plaintiffs counsel filed a notice of appearance #18 #19 . The notices are hereby STRICKEN. Counsel shall continue to file subsequent documents in their respective cases, but shall not file documents in the MDL 13-2424 docket until further notice by the Court. (kti)
March 12, 2013 Filing 19 ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER #20 *** NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James C Shah on behalf of In Re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation (Shah, James) Modified on 3/13/2013 (kti).
March 12, 2013 Filing 18 ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER #20 *** NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jayne A Goldstein on behalf of In Re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation (Goldstein, Jayne) Modified on 3/13/2013 (kti).
March 11, 2013 Filing 17 STATEMENT Regarding Liaison Settlement Counsel filed by In Re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Firm Resume)(Gibbs, Eric)
March 8, 2013 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT FOR THE MAHARAJ PLAINTIFFS REGARDING DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED RULE 408 CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT filed by In Re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation. (Gibbs, Eric)
March 7, 2013 Filing 15 RESPONSE filed by In Re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation RESPONSE OF PLAINTIFFS BRADY ET AL. TO KRAUTH'S STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT RE "SETTLEMENT LIAISON COUNSEL" (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE OF PLAINTIFFS BRADY ET AL. TO KRAUTH'S STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT RE "SETTLEMENT LIAISON COUNSEL")(Byszewski, Elaine)
March 5, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 2/28/13 10:18 am re Transcript #13 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(Nirenberg, Cindy) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 5, 2013 Filing 13 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/28/13 10:18 am. Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg, website www.msfedreporter.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg, website www.msfedreporter.com, or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/26/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2013. (Nirenberg, Cindy)
March 4, 2013 Filing 12 Defendants Hyundai Motor America and Kia Motors America, Inc.'s Proposed Rule 408 Confidentiality Agreement (Morgan, Shon)
March 4, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings Thursday, February 14, 2013; 9:34 A.M. re Transcript #10 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(Wilcox, Wil) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 4, 2013 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Thursday, February 14, 2013; 9:34 A.M.. Court Reporter: Wil S. Wilcox, phone number 213-290-2849. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/25/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2013. (Wilcox, Wil)
February 28, 2013 Filing 9 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer re settlement between Defendant Hyundai Motor America, status of the cases within the MDL and those cases will soon be part of the MDL and as to leadership structure. Defendants will file a confidential agreement limited to settlement discovery by March 4, 2013. Plaintiffs will have until March 8, 2013 to approve and/or confer with defendants regarding said confidential agreement. Additionally, Plaintiffs' counsel will confer and agree on liaison counsel for settlement purposes only. Plaintiffs' joint agreement/disagreements will be filed by March 11, 2013. The scheduling conference is continued to March 28, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (bp)
February 27, 2013 Filing 8 OBJECTIONS to Status Report #6 re Proposed Leadership Structure filed by In Re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation. (Cartwright, Robert)
February 26, 2013 Filing 7 First REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel MARK TATE and R. BARLEY TURNER to act as lead counsel for Georgia and Tennessee Sub-Classes filed by KIM IOCOVOZZI Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation. Request set for hearing on 2/28/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Cartwright, Robert)
February 26, 2013 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT PLAINTIFFS' JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE BRIEF filed by In Re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Exhibit "2")(Kim, Jae)
February 26, 2013 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT of Kia Motors America, Inc. filed by In Re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation. (Feeney, James)
February 14, 2013 Filing 4 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: Court and counsel confer regarding the JPMLs decision and its effect on this case. The Court isadvised of settlement reached as to Defendant Hyundai Motors America. Parties will file a Joint Brief regarding the Settlement by noon on February 26, 2013. A Scheduling Conference is set for February 28, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. Additionally, Plaintiffs participating in settlement negotiations will provide the non settling Plaintiffs with the general term sheet by February 21, 2013Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
February 8, 2013 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu. On the Court's own motion, a status conference is set for February 14, 2013 at 9:30 a.m., such that the Court may be informed of the JPMLs decision and its effect on this case. Parties may appear telephonically provided that notice is given to the clerk by February 12, 2013. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 8, 2013 Filing 2 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (See order for details.) (kti)
February 6, 2013 Filing 1 CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation received creating Master Docket MDL 2424, In Re: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation. Case assigned to Judge George H. Wu for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Consolidating Cases: 2:12-cv-800; 8:12-cv-1909; 8:12-cv-1917; 8:12-cv-1930; 8:12-cv-1935; 8:12-cv-1963; 8:12-cv-1981; 2:13-cv-813; 2:13-cv-814; 2:13-cv-815; 2:13-cv-816; 2:13-cv-817. (esa) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/7/2013) (esa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyundai and Kia Fuel Economy Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mandahl
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: John M DeStefano
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Represented By: Robert B Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Snyder
Represented By: Joshua B Swigart
Represented By: Suren N Weerasuriya
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Matthew M Loker
Represented By: Robert L Hyde
Represented By: Nicholas J Bontrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamneel Maharaj
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Eric H Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Brandon Armstrong
Represented By: James M Terrell
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Derek Yeats Brandt
Represented By: Anna M Kohut
Represented By: Emily J Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Brissey
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: John M DeStefano
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Represented By: Robert B Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Moffett
Represented By: Pamela Pressley
Represented By: Niall P McCarthy
Represented By: Sandra Watson Cuneo
Represented By: Anne Marie Murphy
Represented By: Laura Antonini
Represented By: Harvey Rosenfield
Represented By: Eric James Buescher
Represented By: Steven M Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lourdes Vargas
Represented By: Joshua B Swigart
Represented By: Suren N Weerasuriya
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Matthew M Loker
Represented By: Robert L Hyde
Represented By: Nicholas J Bontrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Craig
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: John M DeStefano
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Represented By: Robert B Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Figueroa
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Sara D Avila
Represented By: Bryan L Clobes
Represented By: Allison Rachel Willett
Represented By: Gillian L Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin L Fanthorpe
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: John M DeStefano
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Represented By: Robert B Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael DeSouto
Represented By: Andrew D Finnicum
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Represented By: Eric H Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reece Philip Thomson
Represented By: Stuart McKinley Paynter
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Walter H Sargent
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Holvey
Represented By: Joshua B Swigart
Represented By: Suren N Weerasuriya
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Matthew M Loker
Represented By: Robert L Hyde
Represented By: Nicholas J Bontrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Graewingholt
Represented By: Jeremiah Frei-Pearson
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Todd S Garber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary J Moran-Spicuzza
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: John M DeStefano
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Represented By: Robert B Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Blumer
Represented By: Benjamin F Johns
Represented By: Matthew D Schelkopf
Represented By: Joseph G Sauder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad McKinney
Represented By: Lee A Cirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Marie Hunter
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: John M DeStefano
Represented By: Robert B Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hattie Williams
Represented By: Joshua B Swigart
Represented By: Suren N Weerasuriya
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Matthew M Loker
Represented By: Robert L Hyde
Represented By: Nicholas J Bontrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Hadesh
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: John M DeStefano
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Represented By: Robert B Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Pyland
Represented By: Joshua B Swigart
Represented By: Suren N Weerasuriya
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Matthew M Loker
Represented By: Robert L Hyde
Represented By: Nicholas J Bontrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lin McKinney
Represented By: Scott M Grzenczyk
Represented By: Dylan Hughes
Represented By: Eric H Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Rickert
Represented By: Pamela Pressley
Represented By: Niall P McCarthy
Represented By: Sandra Watson Cuneo
Represented By: Anne Marie Murphy
Represented By: Laura Antonini
Represented By: Harvey Rosenfield
Represented By: Eric James Buescher
Represented By: Steven M Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Potter
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: John M DeStefano
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Represented By: Robert B Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Hayes
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Kenneth G Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Hoffman
Represented By: Scott M Grzenczyk
Represented By: Dylan Hughes
Represented By: Eric H Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josipa Casey
Represented By: Joshua B Swigart
Represented By: Suren N Weerasuriya
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Matthew M Loker
Represented By: Robert L Hyde
Represented By: Nicholas J Bontrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Hathaway
Represented By: Marc L Godino
Represented By: Lionel Zevi Glancy
Represented By: Robert Ahdoot
Represented By: Casey Edwards Sadler
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giuseppina Roberto
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: Robert B Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Leggett
Represented By: Derek Yeats Brandt
Represented By: John Robert Phillips
Represented By: Emily J Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura S Sutta
Represented By: Marc L Godino
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Lionel Zevi Glancy
Represented By: Robert Ahdoot
Represented By: Casey Edwards Sadler
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gunther Krauth
Represented By: Craig C Sheffer
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Pamela Pressley
Represented By: Niall P McCarthy
Represented By: Sandra Watson Cuneo
Represented By: James J Ison
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Anne Marie Murphy
Represented By: Laura Antonini
Represented By: Harvey Rosenfield
Represented By: Eric James Buescher
Represented By: Steven M Campora
Represented By: William H Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle A Stephenson
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: John M DeStefano
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Represented By: Robert B Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luan Snyder
Represented By: Joshua B Swigart
Represented By: Suren N Weerasuriya
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Matthew M Loker
Represented By: Robert L Hyde
Represented By: Nicholas J Bontrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Kendig
Represented By: Thomas D Mauriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Naythons
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Michael M Weinkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Iocovozzi
Represented By: Robert Bartley Turner
Represented By: Mark A Tate
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Sherri N Watts
Represented By: Robert Eugene Cartwright, Jr
Represented By: Richard M Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bowe
Represented By: Andrew D Finnicum
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Represented By: Eric H Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayman Mousa
Represented By: Shanon J Carson
Represented By: Michael C Dell'Angelo
Represented By: Sarah R Schalman-Bergen
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gentry
Represented By: Andrew D Finnicum
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Represented By: Eric H Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Sanders
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Brown
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Robert Eugene Cartwright, Jr
Represented By: Richard M Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Kievit
Represented By: Benjamin F Johns
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Matthew D Schelkopf
Represented By: Joseph G Sauder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve B Perry
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: John M DeStefano
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Represented By: Robert B Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Nguyen
Represented By: Joshua B Swigart
Represented By: Suren N Weerasuriya
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Matthew M Loker
Represented By: Robert L Hyde
Represented By: Nicholas J Bontrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian E Levoff
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Elaine S Kusel
Represented By: Richard D McCune
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Represented By: Robert B Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J Dixson
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: John M DeStefano
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Represented By: Robert B Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Brein
Represented By: James J Ison
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Alan M Mansfield
Represented By: William James Doyle, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Hammond
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Derek Yeats Brandt
Represented By: John Robert Phillips
Represented By: Anna M Kohut
Represented By: Emily J Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J Burkard
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: John M DeStefano
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Represented By: Robert B Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Dominguez
Represented By: Pamela Pressley
Represented By: Niall P McCarthy
Represented By: Sandra Watson Cuneo
Represented By: Anne Marie Murphy
Represented By: Laura Antonini
Represented By: Harvey Rosenfield
Represented By: Eric James Buescher
Represented By: Steven M Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerold Terhost
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Robert Eugene Cartwright, Jr
Represented By: Richard M Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Rudy
Represented By: Shanon J Carson
Represented By: Michael C Dell'Angelo
Represented By: Sarah R Schalman-Bergen
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric J Olson
Represented By: Christopher Collins
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Rachel L Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Reeves
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Jason A Charpentier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel A. Lipman
Represented By: Joshua Richard Diller
Represented By: Mitchell Bruce Katten
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Peter Vincent Bustamante
Represented By: Richard F Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E Hill
Represented By: Lee A Cirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Simmons
Represented By: Scott M Grzenczyk
Represented By: Dylan Hughes
Represented By: Eric H Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Kay Gilleland
Represented By: Andrew D Finnicum
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Represented By: Eric H Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bonsignore
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Robert Eugene Cartwright, Jr
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Represented By: Richard M Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Gobel
Represented By: Jason S Kilene
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Represented By: Jon A Tostrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abelardo Morales
Represented By: Scott M Grzenczyk
Represented By: Dylan Hughes
Represented By: Eric H Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Weber
Represented By: Jason S Kilene
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Represented By: Jon A Tostrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Pincas
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: John M DeStefano
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Represented By: Robert B Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Baldeschi
Represented By: Elaine S Kusel
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Richard D McCune
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Hammond
Represented By: Derek Yeats Brandt
Represented By: John Robert Phillips
Represented By: Anna M Kohut
Represented By: Emily J Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Trader
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Alan M Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert J Young
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Laurence D King
Represented By: Justin B Farar
Represented By: Hae Sung Nam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron John Cestaro
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Robert Eugene Cartwright, Jr
Represented By: Richard M Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Ruth Scott
Represented By: Andrew D Finnicum
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Represented By: Eric H Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colnett Brubaker
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: John M DeStefano
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Elliott
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Robert Eugene Cartwright, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nomer Medina
Represented By: Joshua B Swigart
Represented By: Suren N Weerasuriya
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Matthew M Loker
Represented By: Robert L Hyde
Represented By: Nicholas J Bontrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Villicana
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: John M DeStefano
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Represented By: Robert B Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Goldsberry
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: William James Doyle, II
Represented By: James Robert Hail
Represented By: Alan M Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Kurash
Represented By: Shanon J Carson
Represented By: Michael C Dell'Angelo
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Sarah R Schalman-Bergen
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kehlie R Espinosa
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Elaine S Kusel
Represented By: Richard D McCune
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Ganim
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Richard D McCune
Represented By: Robert B Carey
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Cross
Represented By: Scott M Grzenczyk
Represented By: Dylan Hughes
Represented By: Eric H Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Schille
Represented By: Pamela Pressley
Represented By: Niall P McCarthy
Represented By: Sandra Watson Cuneo
Represented By: Anne Marie Murphy
Represented By: Laura Antonini
Represented By: Harvey Rosenfield
Represented By: Eric James Buescher
Represented By: Steven M Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mordechai Schiffer
Represented By: Christopher Collins
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Rachel L Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Torres
Represented By: Rick Woods
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Shawn B Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Cephas
Represented By: Stuart McKinley Paynter
Represented By: Walter H Sargent
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Medina
Represented By: Pamela Pressley
Represented By: Niall P McCarthy
Represented By: Sandra Watson Cuneo
Represented By: Anne Marie Murphy
Represented By: Laura Antonini
Represented By: Harvey Rosenfield
Represented By: Eric James Buescher
Represented By: Steven M Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas A Patterson
Represented By: Eric H Gibbs
Represented By: Edward B Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P Keeth
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: John M DeStefano
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Represented By: Robert B Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Woodruff
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Derek Yeats Brandt
Represented By: Deborah R Rosenthal
Represented By: Emily J Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gudgalis
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Derek Yeats Brandt
Represented By: Anna M Kohut
Represented By: Patrick J Keating
Represented By: Emily J Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Martyn
Represented By: Robert J Bonsignore
Represented By: Robert Eugene Cartwright, Jr
Represented By: Richard M Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaye Kurash
Represented By: Shanon J Carson
Represented By: Michael C Dell'Angelo
Represented By: Sarah R Schalman-Bergen
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Grogan
Represented By: Pamela Pressley
Represented By: Niall P McCarthy
Represented By: Sandra Watson Cuneo
Represented By: Anne Marie Murphy
Represented By: Laura Antonini
Represented By: Harvey Rosenfield
Represented By: