Urban Textile, Inc. v. Deb Shops SDW, LLC et al

Defendant: Does, Deb Shops SDW, LLC and Deb Shops SD, Inc.
Plaintiff: Urban Textile, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv00147
Filed: January 7, 2014
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Stephen J. Hillman
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Stipulation 56 , IT IS ORDERED that the case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs or fees to any party. (gk)
August 6, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) REMOVING ACTION FROM LIST OF ACTIVE CASES PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder: re Notice of Settlement 52 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (rne)
July 18, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to continue the deadlines for the parties to submit their briefs summarizing the results of jurisdictional discovery 38 is hereby DENIED. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
June 4, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich re Stipulation for Protective Order 27 (yb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Urban Textile, Inc. v. Deb Shops SDW, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Shops SDW, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Shops SD, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Urban Textile, Inc.
Represented By: Chan Yong Jeong
Represented By: Thomas H Rimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?