Melissia Henson et al v. Fidelity National Financial, Inc.
Plaintiff: Melissia Henson and Keith Turner
Defendant: Fidelity National Financial Inc
Case Number: 2:2014cv01240
Filed: February 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ralph Zarefsky
Presiding Judge: Otis D. Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 35 AND ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING AND DECISION 36 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II . (lc). Modified on 6/18/2014 .(lc).
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS 29 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court therefore STRIKES the purported under-seal filings located at docket entries 41, 42,1 and 43. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC INSTRUCTIONS THEREIN re under seal filings) (lc) .Modified on 6/13/2014. (lc).
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS 29 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II . (lc). Modified on 4/29/2014 (lc).
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 6 Motion to Change Venue and TRANSFERRING Venue to the Central District of California signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/18/2014. (Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/20/2014.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melissia Henson et al v. Fidelity National Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissia Henson
Represented By: Mieke K Malmberg
Represented By: Bruce R MacLeod
Represented By: Elizabeth Susan Lachman
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Turner
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Elizabeth Susan Lachman
Represented By: Bruce R MacLeod
Represented By: Mieke K Malmberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Financial Inc
Represented By: Michael J Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?