Helmet Venture Inc. v. Jafrum International Inc et al
Plaintiff: |
Helmet Venture Inc. |
Defendant: |
Does and Jafrum International Inc |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv01307 |
Filed: |
February 20, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen J. Hillman |
Presiding Judge: |
R. Gary Klausner |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 1, 2016 |
Filing
104
CERTIFICATION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. It is Ordered that Tegol, Inc. shall appear on 9/12/16, at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom of the Honorable R. Gary Klausner, U.S. District Judge, and then and there shall show cause, if there be any, why Tegol should not be adjudged in contempt by reason of the facts certified herein. (See document for further details.) (sp)
|
December 15, 2015 |
Filing
61
CONSOLIDATED JUDGMENT by Judge R. Gary Klausner. On September 4, 2015, this Court entered judgment against Plaintiff and in Defendant's favor for attorneys' fees in the amount of $35,1010.50 (Dkt. 52) On December 4, 2015, this Court en tered judgment against Plaintiff and in Defendant's favor for additional attorneys' fees in the amount of $7,729.50. (Dkt. 59.) The Court now enters this consolidated, final judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that th is Consolidated Judgment be and is hereby entered in favor of Defendant Jafrum International, Inc., that Plaintiff Helmet Venture, Inc. take nothing, and that Jafrum International, Inc. recover its reasonable attorneys' fees in the total amount of $42,831.00., in favor of Helmet Venture Inc. against Jafrum International Inc in the principal amount of $42,831.00, interest in the amount of $0.00, attorneys fees of $0.00, costs of $0.00 for a total judgment of $42,831.00. (bp)
|
December 4, 2015 |
Filing
59
JUDGMENT by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Defendant Jafrum International,Inc. that Plaintiff Helmet Venture, Inc. take nothing, and that Jafrum International, Inc. recover its reasonable attorneys' fees in the amount of $7,729.50 58 . (pso)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?