Veronica J. Rowe v. Randall D. Naiman et al
Plaintiff: |
Veronica J. Rowe |
Defendant: |
Does and Randall D. Naiman |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv02498 |
Filed: |
April 2, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen J. Hillman |
Presiding Judge: |
Otis D. Wright |
Nature of Suit: |
Racketeer/Corrupt Organization |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 4, 2017 |
Filing
43
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. In light of Plaintiff's pro se status, the Court provides one more opportunity for Plaintiff to show cause as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution . Plaintiff is cautioned that failure to timely respond to the Court's Order and/or prosecute this action will result in dismissal of Plaintiff's case. The Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, no later than October 11, 2017, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court also ORDERS Defendant to submit a declaration on, or before, October 11, 2017, advising whether Defendant has received any communications from Plaintiff since she filed her last status report on February 16, 2017. (smo)
|
September 1, 2017 |
Filing
42
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. The Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, no later than October 2, 2017, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. No hear ing will be held. In their response, Plaintiff should address the following issue in addition to any other issues they deem appropriate: (1) Why Plaintiff has failed to timely file a 90-day status report, as required by the Court's Order of August 15, 2014. (See ECF No. 22.) Failure to timely respond to this Order may result in dismissal of the case. (smo)
|
August 15, 2014 |
Filing
22
ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING APPEAL AND DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT 9 . The parties are ORDERED to file a status report every 90 days as to the status of the state case and, upon exhaustion of the related state-court appeals, one or both parties may file a motion to lift the stay by Judge Otis D. Wright, II . (lc). Modified on 8/15/2014 (lc).
|
April 29, 2014 |
Filing
7
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAININGORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc). Modified on 4/29/2014. (lc).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?