November 26, 2014 |
Filing
93
PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS ARRIBA SPORTS DOING BUSINESS AS SOCCER WAREHOUSE, ON CONSENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Arriba Sports and all of its agents, officers, employees, representatives,successors, assigns, attorneys, and all other persons acting for, with, by, through, or under authority from Arriba Sports, or in concert or participation with Arriba Sports, and each of them, are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED and RESTRAINED from: ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (pj)
|
November 12, 2014 |
Filing
87
PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS MAPLE SPORTS, INC. AND IMRAN JAVED,INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS MAPLE SPORTS, INC., ON CONSENT filed by Judge Stephen V. Wilson (pj)
|
August 19, 2014 |
Filing
67
PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS RAYMUNDOS SOCCER AND MARCOS GONZALEZ, INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS RAYMUNDOS SOCCER, ON CONSENT filed by Judge Stephen V. Wilson IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that:1. Raymundos Soccer and all of their agents, of ficers, employees,representatives, successors, assigns, attorneys, and all other persons acting for, with, by, through, or under authority from Raymundos Soccer, or in concert orparticipation with Raymundos Soccer, and each of them, are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED and RESTRAINED, from:(SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) The claims asserted in adidass Complaint are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party bearing its own costs, including attorneys fees. (pj)
|
July 23, 2014 |
Filing
53
PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINSTDEFENDANTS MUNDO DEPORTIVO ZAVA IMPORTS INC., DOING BUSINESS AS ARZA SOCCER, AND ARTURO ZAVALA, INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS MUNDO DEPORTIVO ZAVA IMPORTS INC. AND ARZA SOCCER, ONCONSENT filed by Judge Stephen V. Wi lson Mundo Deportivo and all of their agents, officers, employees, representatives, successors, assigns, attorneys, and all other persons acting for, with, by, through, or under authority from Mundo Deportivo, or in concert or participation with Mundo Deportivo, and each of them, are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED andRESTRAINED, from (see attached for further details) (pj)
|
July 10, 2014 |
Filing
41
IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflected below. Accordingly, the Co urt, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than July 24, 2014 why this action should not be dismissed as to Defendant Mundo Deportivo Zava Imports Inc served on 6/6/2014, answer due 6/27/2014, Defendant Meca Imports Inc. served on 6/9/2014, answer due 6/30/2014, Defendant Cool Wholesale served on 6/9/2014, answer due 6/30/2014, Defendant Rimab Sports served on 6/9/2014, answer due 6/30/2014, Defendant Marcos Gonzalez served on 6/9/2014, answer due 6/30/2 014, Defendant Raymundo's Soccer served on 6/9/2014, answer due 6/30/2014, Defendant Fidel Gonzalez served on 6/9/2014, answer due 6/30/2014, Defendant Najam Javed served on 6/9/2014, answer due 6/30/2014, Defendant Imran Javed served on 6/9/201 4, answer due 6/30/2014, Defendant Maple Sports Inc served on 6/9/2014, answer due 6/30/2014, Defendant Equipe Imports Inc served on 6/10/2014, answer due 7/1/2014, and Defendant Arturo Zavala served on 6/10/2014, answer due 7/1/2014, for lack of prosecution. (pc)
|