Fola Soares v. Bekins Moving Solutions Inc et al
Plaintiff: Fola Soares
Defendant: Bekins Moving Solutions Inc, David Hulbert an individual Erroneously Sued As David Hulbert doing business as Bekins Moving Solutions Inc and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Miles L. Kavaller and Debbie Young
Case Number: 2:2014cv05460
Filed: July 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: S James Otero
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2014 Filing 39 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(a)(ii) filed by plaintiff Fola Soares.(lc)
December 1, 2014 Filing 40 MINUTES OF Show Cause Hearing held before Judge S. James Otero:Pro per plaintiff is not present. Matter is placed on second call to provideplaintiff more time to appear. Matter recalled. Pro per plaintiff is not present. The Court reviews the case procedural history. Counsel for defendant advises the Court that the case is fully settled. The Court Order this matter dismissed with prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.)Court Reporter: Debbie Hino-Spaan. (lc)
December 1, 2014 Filing 38 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Allen G Haroutounian on behalf of Defendant Bekins Moving Solutions Inc (Attorney Allen G Haroutounian added to party Bekins Moving Solutions Inc(pty:dft))(Haroutounian, Allen)
November 17, 2014 Filing 37 MINUTES OF Show Cause Hearing held before Judge S. James Otero.Pro per plaintiff is not present.Counsel for defendant advises the Court that the case is fully settled. However that defendant has tried to contact the plaintiff many times in order for him to sign a joint stipulation pursuant to FRCP 41. The Court indicates that because the plaintiff is pro se and has appeared on a few other occasions in this court to pursue his claims, the Court will continue this matter one more time for an Order to Show Cause re dismissal. The Order to Show Cause hearing is continued to Monday, December 1, 2014 at 8:30 a.m.Court Reporter: Debbie Hino-Spaan. (lc)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero: Having been advised by the Mediator that this case has settled the Court vacates the Pretrial Conference and Trial dates and sets an Order to Show Cause hearing re dismissal on Monday, November 17, 2014 8:30 a.m. If the parties file the appropriate dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41 prior to this hearing date the Order to Show Cause shall be vacated. (lc) Modified on 11/7/2014 (lc).
November 4, 2014 Filing 35 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Debbie Young: Mediation held on October 28, 2014 and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judges deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case.(Killefer, Gail)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [Docket Nos. 19, 30] by Judge S. James Otero: Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the First Amended Complaint are GRANTED. Plaintiff should file his second amended complaint with the Clerk of Court and serve that complaint on the named Defendants forthwith. Once the newly named Defendants are served, the Court will consider continuing the trial date to allow Defendants time to prepare. (See document for further details) (bp)
October 28, 2014 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL re Subpoena-A0088 - To Appear and testify at a hearing or trial in a civil action to Mr. Timothy Bridges on 10/16/14 filed by Plaintiff Fola Soares. (lom)
October 28, 2014 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL re Discovery - A0088A (Subpoena - Deposition in a civil action); Subpoena-A0088 - To Appear and testify at a hearing or trial in a civil action to Mr. Andrew Bruns on 10/16/14 filed by Plaintiff Fola Soares. (lom)
October 28, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE OF ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION: The Court finds the suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing MOTION to AMEND COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff Fola Soares #30 , set for hearing on October 31, 2014. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 23, 2014 Filing 30 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND COMPLAINT -DOES BY NAME filed by plaintiff Fola Soares. Motion set for hearing on 10/31/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (lc)
October 23, 2014 Filing 29 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Miles L. Kavaller has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
October 20, 2014 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Allen G. Haroutounian re Exhibit List #26 , Witness List #27 , Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law #25 filed by Counter Claimant Bekins Moving Solutions Inc, Defendants Bekins Moving Solutions Inc, David Hulbert. (Haroutounian, Allen)
October 20, 2014 Filing 27 Witness List filed by Defendant Bekins Moving Solutions Inc, David Hulbert.. (Haroutounian, Allen)
October 20, 2014 Filing 26 Exhibit List of Defendant filed by Defendant Bekins Moving Solutions Inc, David Hulbert.. (Haroutounian, Allen)
October 20, 2014 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Counsel of record Bekins Moving Solutions Inc, David Hulbert. (Haroutounian, Allen)
October 10, 2014 Filing 24 NOTICE OF ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION: The Court finds the following matter suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing MOTION to AMEND COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff Fola Soares. #19 , set for hearing on October 20, 2014. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: denying #16 plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for defendants to return household possessions. (lc)
September 17, 2014 Filing 23 AMENDMENT COMPLAINT against defendants Fola Soares amending complaint within Notice of Removal, #1 ; JURY DEMAND, filed by plaintiff Fola Soares (lc)
September 17, 2014 Filing 22 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM; JURY DEMAND filed by counter defendant Fola Soares.(lc)
September 17, 2014 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Fola Soares, re MOTION to #19 served on 9/18/14. (lc)
September 17, 2014 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to AMEND COMPLAINT #19 filed by Plaintiff Fola Soares. (lc)
September 17, 2014 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff Fola Soares. Motion set for hearing on 10/20/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (lc)
September 15, 2014 Filing 17 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge S. James Otero. The Court sets the following schedule: pretrial conference: 11/10/14 9:00 AM; Jury trial: 11/18/14 9:00 AM. All discovery dispute to be brought before the Magistrate Judge assigned to the case; parties reminded of requirements of FRCP 26-1(a); counsel are advised all pretrial documents (as listed) must be filed in compliance with Courts Initial Standing order.Court Reporter: Debbie Hino-Spaan. (lc)
September 12, 2014 Filing 16 EX PARTE APPLICATION for an ex parte Order for defendants to return household possessions filed by plaintiff Fola Soares.(lc)
September 12, 2014 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Agung W Atmaja counsel for Defendant Bekins Moving Solutions Inc. Filed by Defendant Bekins Moving Solutions, Inc.. (Attorney Agung W Atmaja added to party Bekins Moving Solutions Inc(pty:dft))(Atmaja, Agung)
September 12, 2014 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 8 days, filed by Defendant Bekins Moving Solutions Inc.. (Atmaja, Agung)
September 11, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Report #12 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Joint Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
September 10, 2014 Filing 12 TO COURT PURSUANT TO RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Defendant Bekins Moving Solutions Inc. (Atmaja, Agung)
August 15, 2014 Filing 11 COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Fola Soares; Jury Demand, filed by Counterclaimant Bekins Moving Solutions Inc.(Garfinkel, Gregg)
August 15, 2014 Filing 10 ANSWER filed by Defendant Bekins Moving Solutions Inc, David Hulbert.(Garfinkel, Gregg)
July 25, 2014 Filing 9 REPLY filed by Defendants Bekins Moving Solutions Inc, David Hulbert to Objections - non-motion #8 (Garfinkel, Gregg)
July 23, 2014 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Bekins Moving Solutions Inc, David Hulbert, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) #4 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #5 served on 07/23/2014. (Garfinkel, Gregg)
July 22, 2014 Filing 8 OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 filed by Plaintiff Fola Soares. (lom)
July 17, 2014 Filing 6 SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge S. James Otero. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/1/2014. Scheduling Conference set for 9/15/2014 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
July 14, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 14, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (et)
July 14, 2014 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Bekins Moving Solutions Inc, David Hulbert. (et) (mg).
July 14, 2014 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for the County of Los Angeles, East District, Pomona Courthouse South, case number KC066936 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge S. James Otero, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. [Filing fee $400 PAID.], filed by Defendants David Hulbert, Bekins Moving Solutions Inc. (et) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fola Soares v. Bekins Moving Solutions Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fola Soares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bekins Moving Solutions Inc
Represented By: Gregg S Garfinkel
Represented By: Agung W Atmaja
Represented By: Allen G Haroutounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hulbert an individual Erroneously Sued As David Hulbert doing business as Bekins Moving Solutions Inc
Represented By: Gregg S Garfinkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Miles L. Kavaller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Debbie Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?