August 17, 2016 |
Filing
312
ORDER re: Melli Defendants' Amended Motion for Attorneys Fees 295 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: The Court GRANTS the Motion and awards $292,202.00 in attorney's fees and $1,080.71 in costs to Melli Defendants. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. (jre)
|
June 1, 2016 |
Filing
292
JUDGMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew in favor of Melli Yellow Pages, Inc., Studio Cinegraphic Los Angeles Inc, Seyed Ali Limonadi and against Ketab Corp. SEE JUDGMENT FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jre)
|
May 18, 2016 |
Filing
290
ORDER re: Mesriani Defendants Motion for Civil Contempt Sanctions and Order Enforcing Compliance with Court's Previous Order of February 1, 2016 249 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. This Court finds that Plaintiff substantially complied with the Fe bruary 1, 2016 Order requiring Plaintiff to deposit 125% of the attorneys' fee award into an escrow account. Moreover, the IOTA account ending with 492 is not controlled by Plaintiff, but by Plaintiff's attorney, who is an officer of this Court. Accordingly, the Court DENIES Mesriani Defendants' Motion 249 . However, Mesriani Defendants' Motion was not frivolous, and the Court DENIES both parties' requests for attorneys' fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT any withdrawal of the funds in Adli Law Group P.C.'s IOTA account ending with 492 is subject to Court order. (jre)
|
March 22, 2016 |
Filing
248
ORDER re: Plaintiff Ketab Corp.'s Motions in Limine [209, 210, 211] by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. 1)The Court GRANTS in part Plaintiff's Motion in Limine #1 209 . 2)The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion in Limine #2 210 . 3.The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion in Limine #3 211 . SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. (jre)
|
March 7, 2016 |
Filing
243
ORDER re: Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling on Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 195 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The Court, in itsdiscretion, finds that reconsideration of the Court's ruling on Defendants' MJP is unwarranted, and thusDENIES Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 195 . SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. (jre)
|
December 4, 2015 |
Filing
166
ORDER re: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Second Amended Counterclaim Against Ketab Corp. and Bijan Khalili 145 . The Court HEREBY GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss the SACC 145 in its entirety. All five Counterclaims are DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. The Court HEREBY GRANTS Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice 146 . SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER AND COMPLETE DETAILS. (jre)
|
November 30, 2015 |
Filing
164
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Defendants are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE for the failure to comply with the joint filing process and to submit a substantive response to the discovery motion by December 9, at 3:00 p.m. (See Order for further details) (vm)
|
August 28, 2015 |
Filing
133
ORDER re: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendants Amended Counterclaim Against Ketab Corp. and Bijan Khalili 120 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The Court HEREBY GRANTS Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Amended Counterclaim Against Keta b Corp. and Bijan Khalili 120 . The Court HEREBY DISMISSES WITH TWENTY (20) DAYS LEAVE TO AMEND from the date of this Order the following claims asserted by Counterclaimants in their Counterclaim 115 : (1) Violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code § 17200; (2) Cancellation of Registration. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER AND COMPLETE DETAILS. (jre)
|
August 26, 2015 |
Filing
132
ORDER re: Mesriani Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) 108 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The Court HEREBY GRANTSMesriani Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 108 in itsenti rety. Plaintiff's three remaining claims againstMesriani Defendants for (1) federal trademark dilution,(2) intentional interference with economic relations,and (3) negligent interference with economic relationsare HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. (jre)
|
May 20, 2015 |
Filing
104
ORDER re: Plaintiff's Application for a Certificate of Appealability Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) and Request for Stay of Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal 103 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. Plaintiff's Application for a Certificate of Appealability Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) and Request for Stay of ProceedingsPending Interlocutory Appeal 103 is HEREBY DENIED. (jre)
|
May 5, 2015 |
Filing
98
ORDER re: Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 63 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 63 . SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. (jre)
|