Americans for Prosperity Foundation v. Kamala Harris

Plaintiff: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Case Number: 2:2014cv09448
Filed: December 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Referring Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2016 Filing 196 First AMENDED DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Defendant Kamala Harris re #189 (Attachments: #1 Transcript Designation Form 2)(Gordon, Alexandra)
June 6, 2016 Filing 195 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Kamala Harris for Court Reporter. Court will contact Nick Newlin at Nick.Newlin@doj.ca.gov with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Gordon, Alexandra)
June 1, 2016 Filing 194 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 16-55786 cross appeal, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #192 as to Cross-Appellant Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (mat)
May 31, 2016 Filing 193 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #192 . (Shaffer, Derek)
May 31, 2016 Filing 192 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. Appeal of Permanent Injunction,,, #184 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-17907938.) (Shaffer, Derek)
May 19, 2016 FILING FEE PAID for Notice of Appeal to Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. Receipt No. 0973-17849034 for $505 filing fee. (Gordon, Alexandra)
May 18, 2016 Filing 191 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 16-55727, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #189 as to defendant Kamala Harris. (mat)
May 18, 2016 (Gordon, Alexandra)
May 18, 2016 Filing 190 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #189 . (Gordon, Alexandra)
May 18, 2016 Filing 189 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. Appeal of Order on Motion in Limine to Exclude,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Motion Hearing,, #150 , Order on Motion to Compel,,, #77 , Permanent Injunction,,, #184 , Order on Motion to Compel,,,, Order on Motion for Reconsideration of Discovery Matter,,,, Motion Hearing,,, #115 . (Appeal fee of $505 paid.) (Gordon, Alexandra)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANY MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES UNTIL AFTER RESOLUTION OF ALL APPEALS FROM 4/21/2016 JUDGMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real: The parties' Stipulation to Extend Time to File Any Motion for Attorneys' Fees Until After Resolution of All Appeals from the 4/21/2016 Judgment #187 is hereby granted. Pursuant to Local Rule 54-10, the time to file any motion for attorneys' fees is extended until 28 days after the latest date on which (a) the deadline for filing an appeal from the 4/21/2016 judgment expires, (b) the Court of Appeals issues its mandate and the deadline for filing a petition for certiorari expires, (c) the Supreme Court of the United States denies any timely petition for certiorari, or (d) the Supreme Court of the United States issues a certified judgment that requires no further action from the Court of Appeals. (gk)
May 2, 2016 Filing 187 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shaffer, Derek)
April 27, 2016 Filing 186 PLAINTIFF'S RECEIPT FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS to Counsel Upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial; Pursuant to stipulation of counsel and/or by Order of the Court, all exhibits listed on the joint exhibits list are returned to counsel for respective party(ies). (gk)
April 27, 2016 Filing 185 DEFENDANT'S RECEIPT FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS to Counsel Upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial; Pursuant to stipulation of counsel and/or by Order of the Court, all exhibits listed on the joint exhibits list are returned to counsel for respective party(ies). (gk) Modified on 4/28/2016 (gk).
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER FOR JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF by Judge Manuel L. Real: This Court grants Americans For Prosperity Foundation's ("AFP") motion for a permanent injunction to enjoin the Attorney General of California from demanding its Schedule B form. After conducting a full bench trial, this Court finds the Attorney General's Schedule B disclosure requirement unconstitutional as-applied to AFP. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Attorney General is Permanently Enjoined from Requiring AFP to File with the Registry a Periodic Written Report Containing a Copy of its Schedule B to IRS Form 990. AFP Shall No Longer Be Considered Deficient or Delinquent in its Reporting Requirement because it Does Not File its Confidential Schedule B with the Attorney General. Each Party Shall Bear its Own Costs. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (gk)
April 18, 2016 Filing 183 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal #35 CCA # 15-55446. The judgment of the 9th Circuit Court, entered December 29, 2015, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of the 9th CCA issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Each party shall bear its own costs on appeal. [See USCA Opinion #85 ORDERS VACATED](mat)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #35 filed by Kamala Harris. CCA # 15-55446. Appellants' petition for panel rehearing and rehearing en banc, filed January 11, 2016, is DENIED. (mat)
March 15, 2016 Filing 178 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Containing Defendant's Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law re Bench Trial - Completed (Court Decision),,, #176 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Post-Trial Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law)(Gordon, Alexandra)
March 14, 2016 Filing 177 NOTICE OF LODGING filed containing Proposed Post-Trial Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law re Bench Trial - Completed (Court Decision),,, #176 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Post-Trial Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Shaffer, Derek)
March 8, 2016 Filing 175 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 02/23/2016 Volume 1; 02/24/2016 Volume 1; 02/25/2016 Volume 2; 02/26/2016; 03/03/2016 Volume 1 re Transcript #171 , #172 , #174 , #170 , #173 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Montgomery, Shayna) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 8, 2016 Filing 174 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 03/03/2016 - 10:04 A.M. TRIAL DAY 5 VOLUME 1 Court Reporter: Shayna Montgomery, E-mail: shaynamontgomery@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2016. (Montgomery, Shayna)
March 8, 2016 Filing 173 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02/26/2016 - 10:02 A.M. TRIAL DAY 4 Court Reporter: Shayna Montgomery, E-mail: shaynamontgomery@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2016. (Montgomery, Shayna)
March 8, 2016 Filing 172 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02/25/2016 - 1:36 P.M. TRIAL DAY 3 VOLUME 2 Court Reporter: Shayna Montgomery, E-mail: shaynamontgomery@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2016. (Montgomery, Shayna)
March 8, 2016 Filing 171 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02/24/2016 - 9:08 A.M. TRIAL DAY 2 VOLUME 1 Court Reporter: Shayna Montgomery, E-mail: shaynamontgomery@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2016. (Montgomery, Shayna)
March 8, 2016 Filing 170 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02/23/2016 - 10:01 A.M. TRIAL DAY 1 VOLUME 1 Court Reporter: Shayna Montgomery, E-mail: shaynamontgomery@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2016. (Montgomery, Shayna)
March 8, 2016 Filing 169 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 2/23/16 Volume 2; 2/24/16 Volume 2; 2/25/16 Volume 1; 3/3/16 Volume 2; 3/4/16 re Transcript #165 , #164 , #166 , #167 , #168 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Zurborg, Carol) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 8, 2016 Filing 168 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/4/16 10:27 a.m. TRIAL DAY 6 Court Reporter: Carol Jean Zurborg, phone number (213) 894-3539. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2016. (Zurborg, Carol)
March 8, 2016 Filing 167 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/3/16 1:09 p.m. TRIAL DAY 5 VOLUME 2 Court Reporter: Carol Jean Zurborg, phone number (213) 894-3539. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2016. (Zurborg, Carol)
March 8, 2016 Filing 166 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/25/16 9:09 a.m. TRIAL DAY 3 VOLUME 1 Court Reporter: Carol Jean Zurborg, phone number (213) 894-3539. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2016. (Zurborg, Carol)
March 8, 2016 Filing 165 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/24/16 10:56 a.m. TRIAL DAY 2 VOLUME 2 Court Reporter: Carol Jean Zurborg, phone number (213) 894-3539. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2016. (Zurborg, Carol)
March 8, 2016 Filing 164 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/23/16 1:08 p.m. TRIAL DAY 1 VOLUME 2 Court Reporter: Carol Jean Zurborg, phone number (213) 894-3539. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2016. (Zurborg, Carol)
March 4, 2016 Filing 176 MINUTES OF Court Trial (6th Day) held and completed before Judge Manuel L. Real: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Closing arguments made by plaintiff(s) and defendant(s). Filed Witness & Exhibit Lists. Findings, Conclusions of Law & Judgment to be prepared by plaintiff(s) and defendant(s). Case submitted. Clerk reviewed admitted exhibits with counsel to be submitted to the Jury/Court for deliberation/findings. Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, and Judgment shall be lodged on or before MARCH 15, 2016. Deposition Transcripts of Tim Phillips, Christopher Fink, Robert Heaton, Victor Bernson, and David Spady admitted as exhibits. The Clerk will contact counsel to pick up the exhibits. Exhibit Release Form will be signed and filed at that time. Court Reporter: Carol Zurborg. (lom)
March 3, 2016 Filing 163 MINUTES OF Court Trial (5th day )held before Judge Manuel L. Real. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Case continued to March 4, 2016 at 10:00 A.M. for further trial. Witnesses: Kevis Foley; Christopher Harryman, David Eller. Court Reporter: Shayna Montgomery / Carol Zurborg. (lom)
February 26, 2016 Filing 162 MINUTES OF Court Trial (4th day) held before Judge Manuel L. Real: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Witnesses: Belinda Johns, Sonja Berndt Bench Trial continued to 3/3/2016 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. Court Reporter: Shayna Montgomery. (gk)
February 25, 2016 Filing 161 MINUTES OF Court Trial (3rd day) held before Judge Manuel L. Real: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Plaintiff(s) rest. Witnesses: James Pope; Paul Schervish. Witnesses by deposition: Susan Allen, Steve Bauman, Jami Cantore, David Eller, Kevis Foley, Chris Harryman, Tania Ibanez, Belinda Johns, Robert Ralls. Bench Trial continued to 2/26/2016 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. Court Reporter: Shayna Montgomery / Carol Zurborg. (gk)
February 24, 2016 Filing 160 MINUTES OF Court Trial-2nd day held before Judge Manuel L. Real: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Bench Trial continued to 2/25/2016 at 9:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. Court Reporter: Shayna Montgomery / Carol Zurborg. (iv)
February 24, 2016 Filing 159 NOTICE OF LODGING filed with Revised Deposition Designations re Notice of Lodging #155 (Shaffer, Derek)
February 23, 2016 Filing 158 MINUTES OF COURT TRIAL (1st Day) held before Judge Manuel L. Real: Opening statements made. Witneses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Bench Trial continued to 2/24/2016 at 9:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. Court Reporter: Shayna Montgomery / Carol Zurborg. (iv)
February 23, 2016 Filing 157 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Exhibit A to Defendant's Deposition Designations re Notice of Lodging #156 (Soichet, Emmanuelle)
February 23, 2016 Filing 156 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Defendant's Deposition Designations in Advance of February 23, 2016 Trial re Order,,,, Set/Reset Hearing,,, #95 (Soichet, Emmanuelle)
February 23, 2016 Filing 155 NOTICE OF LODGING filed for Plaintiff's Deposition Designations in Advance of February 23, 2016 Trial re Order,,,, Set/Reset Hearing,,, #95 (Shaffer, Derek)
February 19, 2016 Filing 154 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion to Submit Direct Testimony of Witnesses in Written Form filed 2/17/2016 #149 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. The trial date is currently set for 2/23/2016 at 9:00 AM. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
February 18, 2016 Filing 153 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings FEBRUARY 16, 2016, 10:11 a.m. re Transcript #151 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (MacNeil, Sandra) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 18, 2016 Filing 152 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Submit Direct Testimony of Trial Witnesses in Written Form #149 filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Soichet, Emmanuelle)
February 17, 2016 Filing 151 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on FEBRUARY 16, 2016, 10:11 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: SANDRA MACNEIL, phone number 213-894-5949; MACNEILSANDY@GMAIL.COM. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2016. (MacNeil, Sandra)
February 17, 2016 Filing 149 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Submit Direct Testimony of Trial Witnesses in Written Form filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ISO Submitting Direct Testimony In Written Form, #2 Proposed Order) (Shaffer, Derek)
February 17, 2016 Filing 148 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Kamala Harris for Court Reporter. Court will contact Emmanuelle Soichet at emmanuelle.soichet@doj.ca.gov with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Soichet, Emmanuelle)
February 17, 2016 Filing 147 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation for Court Reporter. Court will contact Carolyn Thomas at carolynthomas@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Thomas, Carolyn)
February 16, 2016 Filing 150 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Manuel L. Real: The Court DENIES the following motions for the reasons as stated on the record: Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 1 #117 ; Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 2 #118 ; Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 3 #119 ; and Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 #121 . The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2 #122 and Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 3 #123 for the reasons as stated on the record. Court Reporter: Sandra MacNeil. (gk)
February 12, 2016 Filing 146 SEALED DOCUMENT Response of Defendant Kamala D. Harris to Plaintiffs Motion in Limine (#3) to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Foundations or Related (C)(4)s Political Activites; Exhibits G Through I re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,, #145 filed by Defendant Kamala Harris.(Calia, Kevin)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PORTIONS OF DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) UNDER SEAL by Judge Manuel L. Real: Defendant Attorney General Kamala D. Harris's Application for Leave to File Portions of Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (#3) Under Seal #142 is granted. Defendant may file the following materials under seal: (1) The proposed unredacted version of Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (#3); (2) Exhibit G to the Declaration of Kevin A. Calia in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (#3); (3) Exhibit H to the Declaration of Kevin A. Calia in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (#3); and (4) Exhibit I to the Declaration of Kevin A. Calia in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (#3). (gk)
February 11, 2016 Filing 144 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed 2/9/2016 #136 . The following error(s) was found: This document tendered for the judge's approval should have been submitted as a separate PDF attachment to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
February 11, 2016 Filing 143 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Defendant's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law #134 . The following error(s) was found: This document tendered for the judge's approval should have been submitted as a separate PDF attachment to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (iv)
February 11, 2016 Filing 142 APPLICATION for Leave to file App. for Leave to File Port. of Def's Resp. to Plnt's Motion in Limine #3 filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. Application set for hearing on 2/16/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin A. Calia to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order to File Under Seal, #3 Redacted Document Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (#3), #4 Redacted Document Declaration of Kevin A. Calia in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (#3), #5 Redacted Document Exhibits A through C to Declaration of Kevin A. Calia in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (#3), #6 Redacted Document Exhibits D through F to Declaration of Kevin A. Calia in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (#3), #7 Redacted Document Exhibits G through I to Declaration of Kevin A. Calia in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (#3), #8 Unredacted Document Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (#3), #9 Unredacted Document Declaration of Kevin A. Calia in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (#3), #10 Unredacted Document Exhibits A through C to Declaration of Kevin A. Calia in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (#3), #11 Unredacted Document Exhibits D through F to Declaration of Kevin A. Calia in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (#3), #12 Unredacted Document Exhibits G through I to Declaration of Kevin A. Calia in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (#3)) (Calia, Kevin)
February 10, 2016 Filing 141 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #140 filed by Defendant Kamala Harris.(Soichet, Emmanuelle)
February 10, 2016 Filing 140 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Document)(Soichet, Emmanuelle)
February 10, 2016 Filing 139 SCHEDULING NOTICE ADVANCING TIME OF HEARING TO 10:00 A.M., re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence Not Produced in Discovery #118 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Foundation's or Americans for Prosperity's Purportedly Political Activities #123 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence Regarding Purported Donor and Potential Donor Threats and Fears #117 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of the Attorney General's Investigative Uses of Schedule B #121 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Testimony By Dr. Paul Schervish #119 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence of Proposed Rulemaking #122 by Judge Manuel L. Real. Counsel and parties are notified that the FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE along with Plaintiff and Defendant's Motions in Limine are hereby advanced AS TO THE TIME ONLY, to 10:00 A.M. The date of hearing remains the same. Counsel shall appear at the new time on the same date. (Final Pretrial Conference and Motions set for hearing on 2/16/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real.) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 10, 2016 Filing 138 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Foundation's or Americans for Prosperity's Purportedly Political Activities #123 filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Shaffer, Derek)
February 10, 2016 Filing 137 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence of Proposed Rulemaking #122 filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Shaffer, Derek)
February 9, 2016 Filing 136 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation (Shaffer, Derek)
February 9, 2016 Filing 135 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Foundation's or Americans for Prosperity's Purportedly Political Activities #123 filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Calia, Kevin)
February 9, 2016 Filing 134 Defendant's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
February 9, 2016 Filing 133 TRIAL BRIEF filed by Defendant Kamala Harris.. (Gordon, Alexandra)
February 9, 2016 Filing 132 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence of Proposed Rulemaking #122 filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
February 9, 2016 Filing 131 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of the Attorney General's Investigative Uses of Schedule B #121 filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Soichet, Emmanuelle)
February 9, 2016 Filing 130 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Testimony By Dr. Paul Schervish #119 filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Shaffer, Derek)
February 9, 2016 Filing 129 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence Not Produced in Discovery #118 filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shaffer, Derek)
February 9, 2016 Filing 128 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence Regarding Purported Donor and Potential Donor Threats and Fears #117 filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shaffer, Derek)
February 8, 2016 Filing 127 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shaffer, Derek)
February 4, 2016 Filing 126 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION to Compel Discovery Re: Defendant's Privilege Assertions #86 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Soichet, Emmanuelle)
February 3, 2016 Filing 125 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion to Compel,,,, Order on Motion for Reconsideration of Discovery Matter,,,, Motion Hearing,,, #115 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration and Continuance)(Shaffer, Derek)
February 3, 2016 Filing 124 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Orders re MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence Regarding Purported Donor and Potential Donor Threats and Fears #117 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Testimony By Dr. Paul Schervish #119 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence Not Produced in Discovery #118 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion In Limine Number One to Exclude Evidence Regarding Purported Donor and Potential Donor Threats and Fears, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion In Limine Number Two to Exclude Evidence Not Produced in Discovery, #3 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion In Limine Number Three Re: Exclusion of Testimony by Dr. Paul Schervish)(Soichet, Emmanuelle)
February 2, 2016 Filing 123 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Foundation's or Americans for Prosperity's Purportedly Political Activities filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. Motion set for hearing on 2/16/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Shaffer, Derek)
February 2, 2016 Filing 122 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence of Proposed Rulemaking filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. Motion set for hearing on 2/16/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Shaffer, Derek)
February 2, 2016 Filing 121 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of the Attorney General's Investigative Uses of Schedule B filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. Motion set for hearing on 2/16/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Shaffer, Derek)
February 2, 2016 Filing 120 DECLARATION of Jose A. Zelidon-Zepeda In Support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence Regarding Purported Donor and Potential Donor Threats and Fears #117 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Testimony By Dr. Paul Schervish #119 filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
February 2, 2016 Filing 119 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Testimony By Dr. Paul Schervish filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. Motion set for hearing on 2/16/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real.(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
February 2, 2016 Filing 118 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence Not Produced in Discovery filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. Motion set for hearing on 2/16/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real.(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
February 2, 2016 Filing 117 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence Regarding Purported Donor and Potential Donor Threats and Fears filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. Motion set for hearing on 2/16/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real.(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
February 2, 2016 Filing 116 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Kamala Harris for Court Reporter. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Gordon, Alexandra)
February 1, 2016 Filing 115 MINUTES OF Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Re: Defendant's Privilege Assertions #86 ; 2) Defendant Kamala Harris' Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order on Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery, Order Discovery Responses, and Continuing Pretrial and Trial Dates; Or, In the Alternative, Vacating Pretrial and Trial Dates Pending the Issuance of the Mandate #98 hearing held before Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court DENIES both Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery #86 and Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order #98 , for the reasons as stated on the record. Counsel for both plaintiff and defendant shall, respective to each parties' motion, submit an order consistent with the Court's ruling Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (lom)
February 1, 2016 Filing 114 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation for Court Reporter. Court will contact Carolyn Thomas at carolynthomas@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Thomas, Carolyn)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO WAIVE ORAL ARGUMENT RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL REGARDING DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG #106 by Judge Manuel L. Real. (gk)
January 27, 2016 Filing 112 SCHEDULING NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING, re: Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order on Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery, Ordering Discovery Responses, and Continuing Pretrial and Trial Dates, Or, In the Alternative, Vacating Pretrial and Trial Dates #98 . Counsel and parties are notified that a hearing on Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order (Dckt No. #98 ) shall be heard at the same time as Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery (Dckt No. #86 ), and is hereby set on MONDAY, FEBRUARY 1, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. (Motion set for hearing on 2/1/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real.) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 26, 2016 Filing 111 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Shaffer, Derek)
January 26, 2016 Filing 110 Witness List filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation.. (Shaffer, Derek)
January 26, 2016 Filing 109 Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation.. (Shaffer, Derek)
January 26, 2016 Filing 108 Witness List filed by Defendant Kamala Harris.. (Soichet, Emmanuelle)
January 26, 2016 Filing 107 Exhibit List filed by Defendant Kamala Harris.. (Soichet, Emmanuelle)
January 26, 2016 Filing 106 STIPULATION to Waive Oral Argument on MOTION to Compel Discovery Re: Defendant's Privilege Assertions #86 filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shaffer, Derek)
January 14, 2016 Filing 105 REPLY in Support of MOTION for Reconsideration OF THE COURT'S ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY, ORDERING DISCOVERY RESPONSES, AND CONTINUING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES; OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, VACATING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES PENDING THE ISSU #98 filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Gordon, Alexandra)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Manuel L. Real: granting #102 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric C. Lyttle on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Harold Barza as local counsel. (lt)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER ON THE PARTIES' STIPULATION TO SHORTEN TIME ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY by Judge Manuel L. Real. Per the parties' stipulation #99 , the Court grants the request to shorten time on Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of Court Order on Defendants Motion to Compel Discovery. The Motion for Reconsideration of Court Order on Defendants Motion to Compel Discovery has been filed. Plaintiffs opposition is due on January 11, 2016, by 5:00 p.m. Pacific Time. Any reply is due on January 14, 2016. The Court will set a hearing date, if necessary, once the motion has been fully briefed. IT IS SO ORDERED. (iv)
January 12, 2016 Filing 102 APPLICATION for attorney Eric C. Lyttle to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-17086320 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Barza, Harold)
January 11, 2016 Filing 101 NOTICE OF LODGING filed containing combined Petition for Panel Rehearing and Rehearing En Banc re USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order, #85 (Shaffer, Derek)
January 11, 2016 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Reconsideration OF THE COURT'S ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY, ORDERING DISCOVERY RESPONSES, AND CONTINUING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES; OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, VACATING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES PENDING THE ISSU #98 filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit s to Opposition)(Shaffer, Derek)
January 6, 2016 Filing 99 STIPULATION for Order Shortening time on Motion for Reconsideration of Court Order on Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
January 6, 2016 Filing 98 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration OF THE COURT'S ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY, ORDERING DISCOVERY RESPONSES, AND CONTINUING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES; OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, VACATING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES PENDING THE ISSUANCE OF THE MANDATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
January 6, 2016 Filing 97 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (Declaration, Exhibit 4, Exhibit 5) under seal #96 filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Unredacted Document)(Soichet, Emmanuelle)
January 6, 2016 Filing 96 APPLICATION to file document (Declaration, Exhibit 4, Exhibit 5) under seal filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document, #3 Redacted Document, #4 Redacted Document)(Soichet, Emmanuelle)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER ENJOINING ATTORNEY GENERAL FROM PUBLICLY DISCLOSING SCHEDULE B FORMS by Judge Manuel L. Real: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Attorney General shall be permitted to obtain and use Plaintiff's Schedule B forms for its nonpublic enforcement purposes, but is strictly prohibited from making the Schedule B information public in any manner or under any circumstances. (gk)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO COMPLETE DISCOVERY AND TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY AND TO CONTINUE THE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE by Judge Manuel L. Real. THE STIPULATION IS HEREBY GRANTED. (1) the time to complete fact witness and expert witness depositions is extended to January 18, 2016, which shall serve as the new discovery cut-off date solely for purposes of deposition; (2) exhibit lists and witness lists shall be filed and served on January 26, 2016; (3) the pre-trial conference order shall be lodged on February 6, 2016; (4) trial briefs and proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law shall be filed and served on February 9, 2016; (5) the final pre-trial conference is continued until February 16, 2016 at 11:00 A.M.; (6) a bench trial will commence, at the time previously scheduled and ordered, on February 23, 2016 at 9:00 A.M. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
January 4, 2016 Filing 93 Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation.. (Shaffer, Derek)
January 4, 2016 Filing 92 Witness List filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation.. (Shaffer, Derek)
January 4, 2016 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Shaffer, Derek)
January 4, 2016 Filing 90 Exhibit List filed by Defendant Kamala Harris.. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
January 4, 2016 Filing 89 Witness List filed by Defendant Kamala Harris.. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
January 4, 2016 Filing 88 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
December 31, 2015 Filing 87 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Discovery Re: Defendant's Privilege Assertions #86 filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Forst for Plaintiff, #2 Declaration of J. Zelidon-Zepeda for Defendant)(Shaffer, Derek)
December 31, 2015 Filing 86 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Discovery Re: Defendant's Privilege Assertions filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. Motion set for hearing on 2/1/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shaffer, Derek)
December 29, 2015 Filing 85 OPINION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #35 filed by Kamala Harris. CCA # 15-55446 and 15-55911. We (9th CCA) vacate the district court's orders granting preliminary injunctions and instruct the district court to enter new orders preliminarily enjoining the Attorney General only from making Schedule B information public. ORDERS VACATED. [See document for all details] (mat)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal #35 filed by Kamala Harris. CCA # 15-55446 and 15-55911. 15-55446, motion to stay the district court proceedings, filed October 22, 2015, is DENIED. Motion for judicial notice, filed June 24, 2015, is GRANTED. 15-55911, Thomas More Law Center's motion to supplement the record, filed September 2, 2015, is DENIED. (mat)
December 22, 2015 Filing 83 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Pre-Trial Conference from January 25, 2016 to February 16, 2016 Re: Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only,, #51 filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shaffer, Derek)
November 12, 2015 Filing 82 Joint Report Regarding Extension of Time to Produce Remaining Discovery filed by Defendant Kamala Harris (Gordon, Alexandra)
November 5, 2015 Filing 81 NOTICE OF LODGING filed containing Motion to Stay Papers Filed in the Ninth Circuit re Order on Motion to Stay Case, #50 (Shaffer, Derek)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, re Stipulation for Order #79 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED:(1) Defendants time to produce any remaining discovery shall be extendedpast October 30, 2015;(2) Defendant will undertake her best efforts to produce any remainingdiscovery on an expedited, rolling basis;(3) The parties will meet and confer no later than November 5, 2015, on the status and timing of Defendants remaining production and Defendants proposeddate to complete its production;(4) The parties will promptly report the outcome of this meet and confer tothe Court. (pj)
October 29, 2015 Filing 79 STIPULATION for Order Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to Produce Remaining Discovery filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Extension of Time to Produce Remaining Discovery)(Gordon, Alexandra)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS by Judge Manuel L. Real. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Compel Responses to First Set of Discovery Requests is DENIED in part, and GRANTED in part. (Dkt. No. #56 ). Defendant is ORDERED to narrow the scope of Interrogatory No. 6 and Request for Production No. 9, so as to limit the required production only to relevant information, and to serve these revised requests, or a notice of their withdrawal, by October 14, 2015. Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete discovery production of all outstanding Interrogatories and Requests for Production, consistent with this order, and to provide the completed discovery and comprehensive privilege log by October 30, 2015. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL REQUESTED DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT by Judge Manuel L. Real. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Requested Discovery from Defendant is GRANTED. (Dkt. No. #59 ). Defendant must complete all discovery production, including the production of a complete privilege log, by October 30, 2015. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
October 6, 2015 Filing 75 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Compel Requested Discovery from Defendant #59 Supplemental Response filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Manuel L. Real: granting #69 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Keith H. Forst on behalf of Plaintiffs, designating Harold Barza as local counsel. (lt)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT TITLED Letter to Judge #73 by Judge Manuel L. Real. The following document(s) Letter to Judge #73 filed 10/02/2015, be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.5, letters cannot be written to the Judge as a form of communication. Improper filing procedure. Counsel is directed to review the Central District's Local Rules. (cch)
October 2, 2015 Filing 73 (STRICKEN BY ORDER DATED 10-05-15 #74 ) Letter to Court filed by Defendant Kamala Harris AG Letter to Court re Plaintiff's Sur-Reply (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) Modified on 10/5/2015 (cch).
October 1, 2015 Filing 72 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Requested Discovery from Defendant #59 filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Barza, Harold)
September 29, 2015 Filing 71 SCHEDULING NOTICE TAKING MOTIONS UNDER SUBMISSION ON THE PAPERS WITHOUT NEED OF ORAL ARGUMENT. The Court has determined that Defendant Kamala Harris' Motion to Compel Responses to First Sets of Discovery Requests #56 and Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation's Motion to Compel Requested Discovery from Defendant #59 set for hearing on October 5, 2015 at 10:00 A.M., are suitable for a decision on the papers as filed by all parties, without the need for oral argument; therefore, the said Motions are taken UNDER SUBMISSION on the papers as filed, and the hearing date of October 5, 2015 is VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The Court will issue its ruling on the matter in due course. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 28, 2015 Filing 70 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Keith H. Forst to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16520869 paid.) #69 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: No signatures on Application. Applicant and local counsel failed to sign the application. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Applicants (1) note that electronic signatures are not accepted. (G-64). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
September 28, 2015 Filing 69 APPLICATION for attorney Keith H. Forst to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16520869 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Barza, Harold)
September 21, 2015 Filing 68 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Requested Discovery from Defendant #59 filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Barza, Harold)
September 21, 2015 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Requested Discovery from Defendant #59 filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Calia, Kevin)
September 21, 2015 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel Responses to First Sets of Discovery Requests #56 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting Defendant's Motion to Compel Responses to First Set of Discovery Requests filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
September 15, 2015 Filing 65 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Defendant Attorney General Kamala Harris re MOTION to Compel Responses to First Sets of Discovery Requests #56 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Li, Peiyin)
September 15, 2015 Filing 64 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation re MOTION to Compel Requested Discovery from Defendant #59 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barza, Harold)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real re Miscellaneous Document #61 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): (1) Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): Proposed orders cannot be filed without the Judge's ruling on the order. The proposed order should be formally lodged by uploading it as a separate attachment to a notice of lodging. (cch) Modified on 9/15/2015 (cch).
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real re Motion Related Document #58 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): (1) Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): Proposed orders cannot be filed without the Judge's ruling on the order. The proposed order should be formally lodged by uploading it as a separate attachment to a notice of lodging. (cch)
September 14, 2015 Filing 61 (STRICKEN BY ORDER DATED 9/15/2015 #63 ) PROPOSED ORDER re MOTION to Compel Requested Discovery from Defendant #59 filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Barza, Harold) Modified on 9/15/2015 (cch). Modified on 9/15/2015 (cch).
September 14, 2015 Filing 60 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Requested Discovery from Defendant #59 filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of P. Patty Li in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit s to the Declaration of P. Patty Li)(Barza, Harold)
September 14, 2015 Filing 59 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Requested Discovery from Defendant filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Barza, Harold)
September 14, 2015 Filing 58 (STRICKEN BY ORDER DATED 9/15/15 #62 )Proposed Order filed by Defendant Kamala Harris re: MOTION to Compel Responses to First Sets of Discovery Requests #56 (Li, Peiyin) Modified on 9/15/2015 (cch).
September 14, 2015 Filing 57 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Responses to First Sets of Discovery Requests #56 filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of P. Patty Li in Support of Defendant Attorney General Kamala D. Harris's Motion to Compel)(Li, Peiyin)
September 14, 2015 Filing 56 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Responses to First Sets of Discovery Requests filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Li, Peiyin)
September 14, 2015 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda on behalf of Defendant Kamala Harris (Attorney Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda added to party Kamala Harris(pty:dft))(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
September 14, 2015 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin A Calia on behalf of Defendant Kamala Harris (Attorney Kevin A Calia added to party Kamala Harris(pty:dft))(Calia, Kevin)
September 14, 2015 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Emmanuelle Sarah Soichet on behalf of Defendant Kamala Harris (Attorney Emmanuelle Sarah Soichet added to party Kamala Harris(pty:dft))(Soichet, Emmanuelle)
September 14, 2015 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Peiyin Patty Li on behalf of Defendant Kamala Harris (Attorney Peiyin Patty Li added to party Kamala Harris(pty:dft))(Li, Peiyin)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) SETTING PRE-TRIAL & TRIAL DATES by Judge Manuel L. Real. COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that this action is hereby placed on calendar for FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE on JANUARY 25, 2016 AT 11:00 A.M. Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit Lists and Witness Lists shall be filed and served on or before JANUARY 4, 2016, which date will also serve as the discovery cut-off date in this action. There is no Motion Cut-Off Date set. PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER shall be lodged with this Court on or before JANUARY 15, 2016. JURY TRIAL DATE is set as FEBRUARY 23, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cch)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL by Judge Manuel L. Real denying #41 Motion to Stay Case: In sum, each of the factors is neutral regarding or weighs against staying proceedings pending appeal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal, (Dkt. No. 41) is DENIED. (see document for further details) (bm)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real (pj)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING THE PRODUCTION OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND OTHER MATERIALS by Judge Manuel L. Real, (pj)
May 13, 2015 Filing 47 SCHEDULING NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING AND TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION ON THE PAPERS WITHOUT NEED OF ORAL ARGUMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court has determined that Defendant's Motion to Stay Case Pending Appeal #41 set for hearing on May 18, 2015 at 10:00 A.M., is suitable for a decision on the papers as filed by all parties, without the need for oral argument; therefore, the said Motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION on the papers as filed, and the hearing date of May 18, 2015 is VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The Court will issue its ruling on the matter in due course. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 12, 2015 Filing 46 Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding the Production of Electronically Stored Information and Other Materials filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation.(Barza, Harold)
May 12, 2015 Filing 45 Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation.(Barza, Harold)
May 4, 2015 Filing 44 REPLY in Support MOTION to Stay Case pending Appeal #41 filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Gordon, Alexandra)
April 15, 2015 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Stay Case pending Appeal #41 filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Harold Barza, #2 Proposed Order Denying Stay Pending Appeal)(Barza, Harold)
April 15, 2015 Filing 42 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Following April 1, 2015 Early Meeting ; estimated length of trial 3 days, filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation.. (Barza, Harold)
April 8, 2015 Filing 41 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Appeal filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. Motion set for hearing on 5/18/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Gordon, Alexandra)
April 1, 2015 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #35 as to Defendant Kamala Harris; Receipt Number: LA114346 in the amount of $505. (car)
March 26, 2015 Filing 38 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Kamala Harris Court Reporter. Court will contact Nicholas Newlin at nick.newlin@doj.ca.gov with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Opinion of the Court on 2/17/15. Other: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction 2/17/15. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Gordon, Alexandra)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #35 filed by Kamala Harris. CCA # 15-55446.A review of this courts docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees for this appeal remain due. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in this court proof of such payment. Failure to pay the fees shall result in the automatic dismissal of the appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. [See document for all details](mat)
March 25, 2015 Filing 39 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-55446, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #35 as to defendant Kamala Harris. (mat)
March 25, 2015 Filing 37 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to defendant Kamala Harris, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #35 . (mat)
March 24, 2015 Filing 36 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #35 . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Gordon, Alexandra)
March 24, 2015 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. Appeal of Preliminary Injunction, #33 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Gordon, Alexandra)
March 16, 2015 Filing 34 ANSWER filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gordon, Alexandra)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #15 by Judge Manuel L. Real It is hereby ORDERED that the Attorney General is preliminarily enjoined from demanding, and or from taking any action to implement or to enforce her demand for a copy of the Foundation's Schedule B to IRS From 990 or any other document that would disclose the names and addresses of the Foundation's donors, until this Court issues a final judgment. (pj)
February 18, 2015 Filing 32 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. correcting Objection #31 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Errata and Correction to Defendants Objection to Proposed Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Certificate of Service)(Gordon, Alexandra)
February 18, 2015 Filing 31 OBJECTIONS to Notice of Lodging #30 Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gordon, Alexandra)
February 17, 2015 Filing 30 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Motion Hearing, #29 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction)(Barza, Harold)
February 17, 2015 Filing 29 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #15 FILED 12/15/15granting #15 held before Judge Manuel L. Real: Counsel submit on the papers. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #15 , for reasons as stated on the record. Plaintiff's counsel shall submit a proposed order consistent with Court's ruling.Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (yl)
February 17, 2015 Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation Court Reporter. Court will contact Carolyn Homer Thomas at carolynthomas@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: 2/17/2015. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Thomas, Carolyn)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO CROSS-EXAMINE DEFENDANT'S DECLARANTS by Judge Manuel L. Real. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundations request to cross-examine Ms. Kevis Foley and Mr. Steve Bauman, (Dkt. No. #24 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Ms. Kevis Foley and Mr. Steve Bauman appear for cross-examination at the 10:00 AM hearing on February 17, 2015. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
February 3, 2015 Filing 26 REPLY in Support MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Attorney General's Required Disclosure of Schedule B . Motion #15 filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Harold Barza)(Barza, Harold)
February 3, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE Objection to Plaintiff's Request to Cross-Examine Defendant's Declarants filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra Robert Gordon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proof of Service)(Gordon, Alexandra)
January 29, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE of Request to Cross-Examine Defendant's Declarants Under Local Rule 7-8 filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Harold Barza, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Harold Barza, #3 Proposed Order)(Barza, Harold)
January 21, 2015 Filing 23 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Attorney General's Required Disclosure of Schedule B . Motion #15 filed by Defendant Kamala Harris. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra Robert Gordon in Support of Defendant Attorney General Kamala D. Harris's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Declaration of Kevis Foley in Support of Defendant Attorney General Kamala D. Harris's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Declaration of Steve Bauman in Support of Defendant Attorney General Kamala D. Harris's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Defendant's Objections to Evidence Submitted in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Proof of Service)(Gordon, Alexandra)
January 8, 2015 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Errata, #20 , Errata, #21 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
January 6, 2015 Filing 21 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. correcting APPLICATION for attorney Jonathan Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14905522 paid.) #8 Corrected to attach the Maryland certificate of good standing. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from DC, #2 Certificate of Good Standing from Maryland)(Barza, Harold)
January 6, 2015 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. correcting APPLICATION for attorney William A. Burck to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14905520 paid.) #7 Corrected to attach the New York certificate of good standing. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Original Certificate of Good Standing from DC, #2 Supplement Additional Certificate of Good Standing from New York)(Barza, Harold)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND FOR DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT #18 by Judge Manuel L. Real. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: (1) The Attorney Generals opposition to the Foundations motion for a preliminary injunction will be due on January 21, 2015; (2) The Foundations reply in support of the motion for a preliminary injunction will be due on February 3, 2015; (3) The hearing on the motion for a preliminary injunction will be on Tuesday, February 17, 2015 at 10:00 a.m.; and (4) The Attorney Generals responsive pleading to the Complaint will be due 21 days after this Court resolves the motion for a preliminary injunction. (shb)
December 19, 2014 Filing 18 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 21, 2015 re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Attorney General's Required Disclosure of Schedule B . Motion #15 filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barza, Harold)
December 18, 2014 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alexandra Robert Gordon on behalf of Defendant Kamala Harris (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Alexandra Robert Gordon added to party Kamala Harris(pty:dft))(Gordon, Alexandra)
December 15, 2014 Filing 16 OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 served on 12/15/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judge Real's Order Re: Notice to Counsel)(Barza, Harold)
December 15, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Attorney General's Required Disclosure of Schedule B . Motion filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. Motion set for hearing on 1/20/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ISO Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration Bernson Declaration ISO Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration Fink Declaration ISO Preliminary Injunction, #4 Declaration Holden Declaration ISO Preliminary Injunction, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Affidavit Proof of Service)(Barza, Harold)
December 12, 2014 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation, upon Defendant Kamala Harris served on 12/10/2014, answer due 12/31/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon D.Ruiz, Clerk, Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Barza, Harold)
December 12, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Jonathan Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14905522 paid.) #8 . The following error(s) was found: Case number is incorrect or missing.Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Applicant failed to supply Good Standing Certificates for each of the state bar for each of the states that the attorney is admitted of that particular state bar. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
December 12, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney William A. Burck to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14905520 paid.) #7 . The following error(s) was found: Case number is incorrect or missing.Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment.Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Applicant failed to supply Good Standing Certificates for each of the state bar for each of the states that the attorney is admitted of that particular state bar. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real: granting #8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan Cooper on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Harold Barza as local counsel. (lt)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real: granting #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William Burck on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Harold Barza as local counsel. (lt)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
December 10, 2014 Filing 8 APPLICATION for attorney Jonathan Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14905522 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Barza, Harold)
December 10, 2014 Filing 7 APPLICATION for attorney William A. Burck to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14905520 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Barza, Harold)
December 10, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Jonathan Cooper for Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (esa)
December 10, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney William Burck for Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (esa)
December 10, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Summons Request, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Interested Parties and Notice of Pendency were attached to the Complaint. These documents should have been filed and docketed separately. Each of these documents should have been entered under its proper event. The date on the summons should be left blank. No further action is required by counsel regarding these items in this instance. (esa) Modified on 12/10/2014 (esa).
December 10, 2014 Filing 3 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Kamala Harris. (esa)
December 10, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa)
December 9, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-14897188 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Americans for Prosperity Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-K of Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Interested Parties, #5 Notice of Pendency) (Attorney Harold A Barza added to party Americans for Prosperity Foundation(pty:pla))(Barza, Harold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Americans for Prosperity Foundation v. Kamala Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Represented By: William Burck
Represented By: Jonathan Cooper
Represented By: Keith H Forst
Represented By: Carolyn Homer Thomas
Represented By: Derek l Shaffer
Represented By: Eric C Lyttle
Represented By: Harold A Barza
Represented By: Carolyn M Homer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Represented By: Emmanuelle Sarah Soichet
Represented By: Kevin A Calia
Represented By: Alexandra Robert Gordon
Represented By: Tamar Pachter
Represented By: Peiyin Patty Li
Represented By: Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?