Vitaly Ivanovich Smagin v. Ashot Yegiazaryan
Petitioner: |
Vitaly Ivanovich Smagin |
Respondent: |
Ashot Yegiazaryan |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv09764 |
Filed: |
December 22, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Paul L. Abrams |
Presiding Judge: |
Manuel L. Real |
Nature of Suit: |
Arbitration |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 13, 2023 |
Filing
421
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Yegiazaiyan's latest actions, combined with his history of noncompliance, demonstrate a troubling disregard for the Court's authority. Therefore, the Court ORDERS Yegiazai yan to appear on 6/26/2023 at 1:30 PM. At that time, Yegiazaiyan will have the oppo1iunity to explain his actions, and the Court will determine whether additional sanctions - including incarceration - are likely to persuade Yegiazaiyan to comply with its orders. (jp)
|
June 5, 2023 |
Filing
415
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court therefore orders Smagin to show cause in writing why or why not enforcement of the above-mentioned agreement between the ITP and Yegiazaiyan is in the interest of justice. Smagin's response is due within 7 days of this Order's issuance. (jp)
|
June 8, 2020 |
Filing
283
(IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause by Judge R. Gary Klausner: This Court therefore Orders Mr. Gogokhia to show cause no later than 6/15/2020 as to why he should not be found in contempt. Such response shall be limited to 10 pages. The Court Orders Plaintiff to provide Vitaly Gogokhia a copy of this Order through his Nevis counsel no later than Tuesday, 6/9/2020, and to file a declaration with the Court affirming that he has done so. (See Civil Minutes for Further Specifics). (jp)
|
March 22, 2017 |
Filing
110
ORDER APPROVING PETITIONER'S AMOUNT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES by Judge Manuel L. Real: On 3/17/2016, this Court granted Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment 56 . That Order included an award of Petitioner's reasonable attorney's fees related to his Motion, in an amount to be submitted and approved by the Court. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondent Ashot Yegiazaryan pay Petitioner's reasonable attorney's fees in the amount of $133,323.40. (gk)
|
September 22, 2016 |
Filing
80
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY IN AID OF EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real, re Stipulation 79 . See document for details. (gk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?