Marilyn Gladle v. U. S. Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Plaintiff: |
Marilyn Gladle |
Defendant: |
Stephen R Bauman, Bette Lane Turzan and Mary Moore, Robert A McDonald and U. S. Department of Veterans Affairs |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00057 |
Filed: |
January 5, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Frederick F. Mumm |
Presiding Judge: |
Christina A. Snyder |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 16, 2020 |
Filing
152
MINUTES OF SECRETARY'S MOTION IN LIMINE 140 Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder. The Court GRANTS the Secretary's motion in limine to the extent that Gladle seeks to admit to the jury evidence of the amount of back pay she seeks under the Rehabilitation Act. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (lom)
|
March 20, 2019 |
Filing
97
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: RE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT 89 . The Court finds this motion appropriate for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing date of March 25, 2019 is vacated. The Court hereby DENIES defendants motion to dismiss. (lc)
|
August 6, 2018 |
Filing
73
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT 65 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. In accordance with the foregoing, the Court hereby GRANTS plaintiff's motion for leave to file the proposed supplemental complaint. Plaintiff may file the supplemental complaint on or before August 10, 2018. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
|
April 19, 2016 |
Filing
35
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT 32 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: In accordance with the foregoing, the Court GRANTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE defendant's motion to dismiss the FAC. Plaintiff is hereby granted twenty-one (21) days to file an amended complaint addressing the deficiencies identified herein. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of plaintiff's complaint with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (clee)
|
January 4, 2016 |
Filing
28
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court GRANTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for failure to comply with Rule 8 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 25 . Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 30 days complying with the requirements of Rule 8. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of Plaintiff's complaint with prejudice. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?