Brighton Collectibles, LLC v. Believe Production, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Plaintiff Brighton Collectibles, LLC |
Defendant: |
Believe Production, Inc. and Does |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00579 |
Filed: |
January 26, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen J. Hillman |
Presiding Judge: |
Christina A. Snyder |
Nature of Suit: |
Copyright |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 15, 2018 |
Filing
160
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES (Dkt. 148 , filed November 20, 2017) DEFENDANT MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT (Dkt. 150 , filed November 20, 2017) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court GRANTS Brighton motion for attorneys fees and AWARDS Brighton $235,481.25 in fees. However, the Court declines to award Brighton requested non-taxable costs. In addition, the Court DENIES Believe motion to amend the judgment pursuant to Rule 59(e). (jp)
|
October 16, 2017 |
Filing
147
JUDGMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court hereby enters judgment in favor of plaintiff Brighton Collectibles, LLC ("Brighton") and against defendant Believe Productions, Inc. ("Believe") on Brighton's claims for copyri ght infringement, false designation of origin, and unfair competition. Believe is liable to Brighton in the amount of $17.57 in actual damages and $161,383.50 in Defendant's profits for a total of $161,401.07 plus post-judgment interest at the statutory rate. The Court defers consideration of any award of attorney's fees and costs and will amend this judgment, if necessary, following a ruling on any post-trial motion for relief brought by either party. (gk)
|
February 6, 2017 |
Filing
91
MINUTES OF Pretrial Conference and Motion Hearing Re: Defendant's Motions in Limine 1-3, and Plaintiff's Motions in Limine 1-2 held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Defendant's first 64 and second motions in limine 65 are DENIED. The Court reserves ruling on defendant's third motion in limine 66 until it is clear whether plaintiff can lay foundation demonstrating that it is not hearsay. Plaintiff's first motion in limine, to exclude the Nunes Survey results 73 , is DENIED. Plaintiff's second motion in limine 74 is GRANTED. The Court hereby continues the Jury Trial to 4/18/2017 09:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing
90
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony 52 is DENIED. Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 56 is also DENIED. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
|
August 30, 2016 |
Filing
38
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND 33 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a first amended complaint is GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
|
November 16, 2015 |
Filing
24
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar re Amended Stipulation for Protective Order 23 . (See Order for complete details) (afe)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?