Lorena Armijo et al v. ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan et al
Plaintiff: Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Kristen Andrich, Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Frank Scognamillo, Nancy Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Mathew Jurevich, Linda Scognamillo, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc. and Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc.
Defendant: ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan, CIGNA, Inc., Robert L Stephens, Michael H Weechsler, James C McKenna, TC3 Health, Inc., Pacific Maritime Association, Michael H Wechsler, ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan and Zenith American Solutions, Inc.
Undetermined: Ronald G Dean
Case Number: 2:2015cv01403
Filed: February 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 297 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by plaintiff Kristen Andrich (Rozansky, Daniel)
December 17, 2018 Filing 296 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by plaintiff Kristen Andrich. Appeal of Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Sealed Motion (Generic sealed motion type event),, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #292 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22910272.) (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement)(Rozansky, Daniel)
December 17, 2018 Filing 295 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Kristen Andrich. correcting Notice (Other) #293 (Rozansky, Daniel)
December 14, 2018 Filing 294 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number TBD, as to Plaintiff Lorena Armijo for Court Reporter. Court will contact Celina Kirchner at ckirchner@stubbsalderton.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Rozansky, Daniel)
December 4, 2018 Filing 293 NOTICE Notice of Appeal filed by plaintiff Kristen Andrich. (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement)(Rozansky, Daniel)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #238 #243 #249 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court rules upon the Motions as follows: Plaintiffs' Motion is DENIED. The Plan Defendants' Motion is GRANTED. Zenith's Motion is GRANTED. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv)
October 29, 2018 Filing 291 MINUTES OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT ZENITH AMERICAN SOLUTIONS #238 ; MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFENDANT ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN #243 ; MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF #249 ; MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #264 held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case called, and counsel make their appearance. The Court hears oral argument from counsel and takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv)
October 24, 2018 Filing 290 SCHEDULING NOTICE ADVANCING TIME OF HEARING ONLY by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's own motion, the Motions #238 #243 #249 #264 set for hearing on October 29, 2018 will be ADVANCED and heard at 9:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 17, 2018 Filing 289 NOTICE of Withdrawal Of Christina Melnykovych's Supplemental Expert Report In Support of Motion, Attached as Exhibit O to Declaration of Christopher Lee [Dkt No. 241-8] filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan), Robert L Stephens(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan), Michael H Wechsler. (Lee, Christopher)
October 15, 2018 Filing 288 REPLY to Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement, #2 Separate Statement, #3 Evidentiary Objections)(Kirchner, Celina)
October 15, 2018 Filing 287 SUPPLEMENT to SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION For Summary Judgment re Order, #237 #243 Supplemental Declaration of Christina Melnykovych Related To Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. (Lee, Christopher)
October 15, 2018 Filing 286 SUPPLEMENT to SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION For Summary Judgment re Order, #237 #243 Supplemental Declaration of Al Holifield Related To Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. (Lee, Christopher)
October 15, 2018 Filing 285 REPLY In Support of SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION For Summary Judgment re Order, #237 #243 filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. (Lee, Christopher)
October 15, 2018 Filing 284 REPLY In Support of Zenith MSJ NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint Alternatively as to First Claim for Relief and/or Third Claim for Relief #238 filed by Defendant Zenith American Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Response to Pltffs Statement of Fact, #2 Response to Pltffs Evidentiary Objections to Dec of Knezevic)(Green, Horace)
October 11, 2018 Filing 283 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint Alternatively as to First Claim for Relief and/or Third Claim for Relief #238 filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement, #2 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Rozansky, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28)(Kirchner, Celina)
October 11, 2018 Filing 282 Opposition Opposition re: SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION For Summary Judgment re Order, #237 #243 filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement, #2 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Rozansky, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32)(Kirchner, Celina)
October 11, 2018 Filing 281 SEALED OPPOSITION RE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint Alternatively as to First Claim for Relief and/or Third Claim for Relief #238 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,,,, #279 filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement, #2 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Rozansky, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit 19, #17 Exhibit 20, #18 Exhibit 22, #19 Exhibit 23, #20 Exhibit 25, #21 Exhibit 27)(Kirchner, Celina)
October 11, 2018 Filing 280 SEALED OPPOSITION RE SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION For Summary Judgment re Order, #237 #243 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,,,, #279 filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement, #2 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Rozansky, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21, #21 Exhibit 22, #22 Exhibit 23, #23 Exhibit 25, #24 Exhibit 27 (part 1), #25 Exhibit 27 (part 2), #26 Exhibit 30, #27 Exhibit 31, #28 Exhibit 32)(Kirchner, Celina)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS AND EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO ZENITH AMERICAN SOLUTIONS, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #267 ; PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS AND EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAN DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #272 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The First Application is GRANTED. The Second Application is also GRANTED. (iv)
October 2, 2018 Filing 278 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. Amendment to MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #266 (Attachments: #1 Declaration - Amended Attachment 4 to Docket 266 - Amended Declaration of Christopher Lee ISO The Plan Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment)(Lee, Christopher)
September 30, 2018 Filing 277 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. correcting Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, #269 (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement in Opposition to Zenith's Motion for Summary Judgment [269-1], #2 Exhibit 26 to the Declaration of Daniel Rozansky in Opposition to Zenith's Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. 269-3], #3 Exhibit 27 to the Declaration of Daniel Rozansky in Opposition to Zenith's Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. 269-3], #4 Exhibit 28 to the Declaration of Daniel Rozansky in Opposition to Zenith's Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. 269-3])(Kirchner, Celina)
September 30, 2018 Filing 276 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Declaration and Exhibits in Support of Opposition to Defendant Zenith's Motion for Summary Judgment under seal #267 filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit 1, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit 3, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit 4, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit 5, #5 Unredacted Document Exhibit 6, #6 Unredacted Document Exhibit 8, #7 Unredacted Document Exhibit 9, #8 Unredacted Document Exhibit 10, #9 Unredacted Document Exhibit 11, #10 Unredacted Document Exhibit 14, #11 Unredacted Document Exhibit 15, #12 Unredacted Document Exhibit 16, #13 Unredacted Document Exhibit 17, #14 Unredacted Document Exhibit 19, #15 Unredacted Document Exhibit 20, #16 Unredacted Document Exhibit 25, #17 Proposed Order)(Kirchner, Celina)
September 30, 2018 Filing 275 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. correcting Response in Opposition to Motion, #271 relating to the Separate Statement in Opposition and Declaration of Daniel Rozansky in Opposition to The Plan Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. 243] (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement, #2 Declaration Daniel Rozansky, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit 1, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit 2, #5 Redacted Document Exhibit 3, #6 Unredacted Document Exhibit 4, #7 Unredacted Document Exhibit 5, #8 Unredacted Document Exhibit 6, #9 Redacted Document Exhibit 7, #10 Redacted Document Exhibit 8, #11 Redacted Document Exhibit 9, #12 Redacted Document Exhibit 10, #13 Redacted Document Exhibit 11, #14 Redacted Document Exhibit 12, #15 Redacted Document Exhibit 13, #16 Redacted Document Exhibit 14, #17 Unredacted Document Exhibit 15, #18 Redacted Document Exhibit 16, #19 Redacted Document Exhibit 17, #20 Redacted Document Exhibit 18, #21 Redacted Document Exhibit 19, #22 Redacted Document Exhibit 20, #23 Redacted Document Exhibit 21, #24 Redacted Document Exhibit 22, #25 Redacted Document Exhibit 23, #26 Unredacted Document Exhibit 24, #27 Redacted Document Exhibit 25, #28 Unredacted Document Exhibit 26, #29 Redacted Document Exhibit 27, #30 Unredacted Document Exhibit 28, #31 Unredacted Document Exhibit 29, #32 Redacted Document Exhibit 30, #33 Redacted Document Exhibit 21, #34 Redacted Document Exhibit 32)(Kirchner, Celina)
September 30, 2018 Filing 274 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document and all Exhibits to the Declaration of Dan Rozansky under seal under seal #272 filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit 1, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit 2, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit 3, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit 7, #5 Unredacted Document Exhibit 8, #6 Unredacted Document Exhibit 9, #7 Unredacted Document Exhibit 10, #8 Unredacted Document Exhibit 11, #9 Unredacted Document Exhibit 12, #10 Unredacted Document Exhibit 13, #11 Unredacted Document Exhibit 14, #12 Unredacted Document Exhibit 16, #13 Unredacted Document Exhibit 17, #14 Unredacted Document Exhibit 18, #15 Unredacted Document Exhibit 19, #16 Unredacted Document Exhibit 20, #17 Unredacted Document Exhibit 21, #18 Unredacted Document Exhibit 22, #19 Unredacted Document Exhibit 23, #20 Unredacted Document Exhibit 25, #21 Unredacted Document Exhibit 27 part 1, #22 Unredacted Document Exhibit 27 part 2, #23 Unredacted Document Exhibit 30, #24 Unredacted Document Exhibit 31, #25 Unredacted Document Exhibit 32, #26 Proposed Order)(Kirchner, Celina)
September 29, 2018 Filing 273 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document and all Exhibits to the Declaration of Dan Rozansky under seal under seal #272 filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 8)(Kirchner, Celina)
September 29, 2018 Filing 272 APPLICATION to file document and all Exhibits to the Declaration of Dan Rozansky under seal under seal filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kirchner, Celina)
September 29, 2018 Filing 271 OPPOSITION to APPLICATION to Supplement Application for Leave To File Under Seal re APPLICATION to file document portions of Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment, Separate Statement, Supporting Exhibits to Declarations of Christopher Lee, John Barto #241 and DKt. 242 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Kirchner, Celina)
September 28, 2018 Filing 270 OPPOSITION to SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION For Summary Judgment re Order, #237 #243 filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Evidentiary Objections to Barton Dec)(Kirchner, Celina)
September 28, 2018 Filing 269 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint Alternatively as to First Claim for Relief and/or Third Claim for Relief #238 filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement in Opposition, #2 Evid Objections, #3 Declaration Rozansky Dec., #4 Memorandum Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Redacted Document Exhibit 5, #9 Memorandum Exhibit 6, #10 Declaration 7, #11 Redacted Document Exhibit 8, #12 Redacted Document Exhibit 9, #13 Redacted Document Exhibit 10, #14 Redacted Document Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Redacted Document Exhibit 14, #18 Redacted Document Exhibit 15, #19 Redacted Document Exhibit 16, #20 Redacted Document Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Memorandum Exhibit 19, #23 Redacted Document Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Redacted Document Exhibit 25)(Kirchner, Celina)
September 28, 2018 Filing 268 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Declaration and Exhibits in Support of Opposition to Defendant Zenith's Motion for Summary Judgment under seal #267 filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 10, #7 Exhibit 11, #8 Exhibit 14, #9 Exhibit 15, #10 Exhibit 16, #11 Exhibit 17, #12 Exhibit 19, #13 Exhibit 20, #14 Exhibit 25)(Kirchner, Celina)
September 28, 2018 Filing 267 APPLICATION to file document Declaration and Exhibits in Support of Opposition to Defendant Zenith's Motion for Summary Judgment under seal filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kirchner, Celina)
September 28, 2018 Filing 266 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment #264 filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Facts, #2 Declaration Declaration of Catherine Knezevic, #3 Declaration Declaration of Justin Keelty, #4 Declaration Declaration of Chistopher Lee)(Lee, Christopher)
September 28, 2018 Filing 265 OPPOSITION Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment #249 filed by Defendant Zenith American Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Facts in Opposition)(Green, Horace)
September 13, 2018 Filing 264 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Separate Statement, #2 Redacted Document Declaration of Daniel Rozansky, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Redacted Document Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Redacted Document Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I part 1, #12 Exhibit I part 2, #13 Exhibit J part 1, #14 Exhibit J part 2, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N part 1, #19 Exhibit N part 2, #20 Exhibit O part 1, #21 Exhibit O part 2, #22 Exhibit P, #23 Exhibit Q, #24 Exhibit R, #25 Redacted Document Exhibit S, #26 Redacted Document Exhibit T, #27 Redacted Document Exhibit U, #28 Exhibit V, #29 Exhibit W, #30 Exhibit X, #31 Exhibit Y, #32 Exhibit Z, #33 Exhibit AA, #34 Redacted Document Exhibit BB, #35 Redacted Document Exhibit CC, #36 Redacted Document Exhibit DD, #37 Exhibit EE, #38 Exhibit FF, #39 Proposed Order) (Kirchner, Celina)
September 13, 2018 Filing 263 SEALED DOCUMENT Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Separate Statement in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Declaration of Daniel Rozansky in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment with Exhibits E,G,S,T,U,X,BB,CC and DD filed under seal re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,, Order on Motion to Supplement,,,,, #252 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #262 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,,,, #257 filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Separate Statement, #2 Declaration Daniel Rozansky, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit S, #6 Exhibit T, #7 Exhibit U, #8 Exhibit X, #9 Exhibit BB, #10 Exhibit CC, #11 Exhibit DD, #12 Proof of Service)(Kirchner, Celina)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS AND EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #260 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Second Amended Application is GRANTED, and may file under seal the designated portions of Exhibits E, G, S, T, U, X, BB, CC, and DD. (iv)
September 10, 2018 Filing 261 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF Amended APPLICATION to file document Exhibits in Support of MSJ under seal #260 filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit S, #4 Exhibit T, #5 Exhibit U, #6 Exhibit X, #7 Exhibit BB, #8 Exhibit CC, #9 Exhibit DD)(Kirchner, Celina)
September 10, 2018 Filing 260 Amended APPLICATION to file document Exhibits in Support of MSJ under seal filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit S, #4 Exhibit T, #5 Exhibit U, #6 Exhibit X, #7 Exhibit BB, #8 Exhibit CC, #9 Exhibit DD, #10 Proposed Order)(Kirchner, Celina)
September 5, 2018 Filing 259 EXHIBIT A-B to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint Alternatively as to First Claim for Relief and/or Third Claim for Relief #238 Exhibits A-B to REDACTED Dec of Catherine Knezevic filed by Defendant Zenith American Solutions, Inc.. (Green, Horace)
September 5, 2018 Filing 258 DECLARATION of Catherine Knezevic In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint Alternatively as to First Claim for Relief and/or Third Claim for Relief #238 REDACTED Declaration of Catherine Knezevic filed by Defendant Zenith American Solutions, Inc.. (Green, Horace)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: AMENDED APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS AND EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #253 #256 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Amended Application is therefore GRANTED in part, only to the extent that Exhibits E, G, K, N, S, T, U, W, X, Y, BB, CC, DD, and FF contain protected health information. However, to the extent any of these documents contain information that Plaintiffs merely indicate generally is confidential and proprietary pursuant to the Protective Order, the Amended Application is DENIED. (iv)
August 31, 2018 Filing 256 Amended APPLICATION to file document MSJ Supporting Documents under seal filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement ISO MSJ, #2 Declaration ISO MSJ, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit K, #6 Exhibit N (part 1), #7 Exhibit N (part 2), #8 Exhibit S-U, #9 Exhibit W-Y, #10 Exhibit BB-DD, #11 Exhibit FF, #12 Proposed Order)(Rozansky, Daniel)
August 31, 2018 Filing 255 Request to Seal Docket No. 253 re: Amended APPLICATION to file document MSJ Supporting Documents under seal #253 (Rozansky, Daniel)
August 30, 2018 Filing 254 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF Amended APPLICATION to file document MSJ Supporting Documents under seal #253 filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement ISO MSJ, #2 Declaration Declaration ISO MSJ, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit K, #6 Exhibit N (part 1), #7 Exhibit N (part 2), #8 Exhibit S, #9 Exhibit T, #10 Exhibit U, #11 Exhibit W, #12 Exhibit X, #13 Exhibit Y, #14 Exhibit BB, #15 Exhibit CC, #16 Exhibit DD, #17 Exhibit FF)(Rozansky, Daniel)
August 30, 2018 Filing 253 Amended APPLICATION to file document MSJ Supporting Documents under seal filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement ISO MSJ, #2 Declaration Declaration ISO MSJ, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit K, #6 Exhibit N (part 1), #7 Exhibit N (part 2), #8 Exhibit S-U, #9 Exhibit W-Y, #10 Exhibit BB-DD, #11 Exhibit FF, #12 Proposed Order)(Rozansky, Daniel)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: THE PLAN DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL #239 ; SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER LEE IN SUPPORT OF PLAN DEFENDANTS APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL #241 ; PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS AND EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #246 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Plan Defendants' Application is GRANTED. The Plan Defendants may file portions of the five documents they list in their application under seal. Plaintiffs' Application is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part without prejudice. (iv)
August 28, 2018 Filing 251 SUPPLEMENT to APPLICATION to file document portions of Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment, Separate Statement, Supporting Exhibits to Declarations of Christopher Lee, John Barton and Catherine Knezevic under seal #239 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER LEE filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. (Lee, Christopher)
August 28, 2018 Filing 250 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document MSJ under seal #246 filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement (Unredacted), #2 Declaration Declaration of Daniel A. Rozansky (Unredacted), #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I (part 1), #12 Exhibit I (part 2), #13 Exhibit J (part 1), #14 Exhibit J (part 2), #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N (part 1), #19 Exhibit N (part 2), #20 Exhibit O (part 1), #21 Exhibit O (part 2), #22 Exhibit P, #23 Exhibit Q, #24 Exhibit R, #25 Exhibit S, #26 Exhibit T, #27 Exhibit U, #28 Exhibit V, #29 Exhibit W, #30 Exhibit X, #31 Exhibit Y, #32 Exhibit Z, #33 Exhibit AA, #34 Exhibit BB, #35 Exhibit CC, #36 Exhibit DD, #37 Exhibit EE, #38 Exhibit FF)(Rozansky, Daniel)
August 28, 2018 Filing 249 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel A. Rozansky (Redacted), #2 Separate Statement (Redacted), #3 Proposed Order) (Rozansky, Daniel)
August 28, 2018 Filing 248 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo (Rozansky, Daniel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 247 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document MSJ under seal #246 filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 MSJ (Unredacted))(Rozansky, Daniel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 246 APPLICATION to file document MSJ under seal filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Attorney Daniel A Rozansky added to party Lorena Armijo(pty:pla))(Rozansky, Daniel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 245 NOTICE of Errata To Correct Typographical Error in Defendants' Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan), Robert L Stephens(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan), Michael H Wechsler. (Lee, Christopher)
August 27, 2018 Filing 244 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION For Summary Judgment re Order, #237 #243 filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Request For Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit B To Request For Judicial Notice)(Lee, Christopher)
August 27, 2018 Filing 243 SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION For Summary Judgment re Order, #237 filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #2 Unredacted Document Declaration of Christopher Lee, #3 Unredacted Document Part 1 of Exhibits to the Declaration of Christopher Lee, #4 Unredacted Document Part 2 of Exhibits to the Declaration of Christopher Lee, #5 Unredacted Document Declaration of John Barton, #6 Unredacted Document Part 1 of Exhibits to the Declaration of John Barton, #7 Unredacted Document Part 2 of Exhibits to the Declaration of John Barton, #8 Unredacted Document Declaration of Catherine Knezevic, #9 Unredacted Document Exhibits to the Declaration of Catherine Knezevic, #10 Unredacted Document Declaration of Barbara Mathey, #11 Unredacted Document Proposed Judgment)(Lee, Christopher)
August 27, 2018 Filing 242 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document portions of Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment, Separate Statement, Supporting Exhibits to Declarations of Christopher Lee, John Barton and Catherine Knezevic under seal #239 filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Motion For Summary Judgment, #2 Unredacted Document Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #3 Unredacted Document Declaration of Christopher Lee, #4 Unredacted Document Part 1 of Exhibits to the Declaration of Christopher Lee, #5 Unredacted Document Part 2 of Exhibits to the Declaration of Christopher Lee, #6 Unredacted Document Declaration of John Barton, #7 Unredacted Document Part 1 of Exhibits to the Declaration of John Barton, #8 Unredacted Document Part 2 of Exhibits to the Declaration of John Barton, #9 Unredacted Document Declaration of Catherine Knezevic, #10 Unredacted Document Exhibits to the Declaration of Catherine Knezevic)(Lee, Christopher)
August 27, 2018 Filing 241 APPLICATION to Supplement Application for Leave To File Under Seal re APPLICATION to file document portions of Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment, Separate Statement, Supporting Exhibits to Declarations of Christopher Lee, John Barton and Catherine Knezevic under seal #239 filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan), Robert L Stephens(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan), Michael H Wechsler. Application set for hearing on 10/29/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Motion For Summary Judgment, #2 Redacted Document Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #3 Redacted Document Declaration of Christopher Lee, #4 Redacted Document Part 1 of Exhibits to the Declaration of Christopher Lee, #5 Redacted Document Part 2 of Exhibits to the Declaration of Christopher Lee, #6 Redacted Document Part 3 of Exhibits to the Declaration of Christopher Lee, #7 Redacted Document Part 4 of Exhibits to the Declaration of Christopher Lee, #8 Redacted Document Part 5 of Exhibits to the Declaration of Christopher Lee, #9 Redacted Document Declaration of John Barton, #10 Redacted Document Part 1 of Exhibits to the Declaration of John Barton, #11 Redacted Document Part 2 of Exhibits to the Declaration of John Barton, #12 Redacted Document Declaration of Catherine Knezevic, #13 Redacted Document Exhibits to Declaration of Catherine Knezevic) (Lee, Christopher)
August 27, 2018 Filing 240 JOINDER filed by Defendant Zenith American Solutions, Inc. joining in APPLICATION to file document portions of Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment, Separate Statement, Supporting Exhibits to Declarations of Christopher Lee, John Barton and Catherine Knezevic under seal #239 . (Green, Horace)
August 27, 2018 Filing 239 APPLICATION to file document portions of Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment, Separate Statement, Supporting Exhibits to Declarations of Christopher Lee, John Barton and Catherine Knezevic under seal filed by Defendant ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Lee In Support of Application For Leave To File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Application to File Under Seal)(Lee, Christopher)
August 27, 2018 Filing 238 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint Alternatively as to First Claim for Relief and/or Third Claim for Relief filed by Defendant Zenith American Solutions, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MPA iso MSJ, #2 Supplement SUF and COL iso MSJ, #3 Declaration Dec of Horace W Green iso MSJ, #4 Declaration Dec of Catherine Knezevic iso MSJ, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order on MSJ, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment on MSJ) (Green, Horace)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR ALL PARTIES' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #236 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Summary judgment briefing schedule: Filing Deadline: August 27, 2018. Opposition: September 28, 2018. Reply: October 15, 2018. (iv)
August 17, 2018 Filing 236 Joint STIPULATION to Amend the Briefing Schedule filed by Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kirchner, Celina)
August 9, 2018 Filing 235 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Timothy Roy Laquer counsel for Defendant TC3 Health, Inc.. Brittain W Sexton is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant TC3 Health, Inc.. (Attorney Timothy Roy Laquer added to party TC3 Health, Inc.(pty:dft))(Laquer, Timothy)
July 31, 2018 Filing 234 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Celina Christine Kirchner counsel for Plaintiff Lorena Armijo. Adding Celina Kirchner as counsel of record for Plaintiff, Armijo for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Armijo. (Attorney Celina Christine Kirchner added to party Lorena Armijo(pty:pla))(Kirchner, Celina)
July 30, 2018 Filing 233 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michelle Chung counsel for Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo. Michelle Chung is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Kathleen Mitchell, Nancy Jurevich, Frank Scognamillo. (Chung, Michelle)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND REMAINING PROCEDURAL DEADLINES #231 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine December 17, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. Trial Date (Est. 10-14 Days) January 15, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
June 25, 2018 Filing 231 STIPULATION to Continue Trial from December 4, 2018 to January 14, 2019 Re: Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings #222 filed by defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan), Robert L Stephens(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan), Michael H Wechsler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Stipulation To Continue Trial and Remaining Procedural Deadlines)(Lee, Christopher)
June 23, 2018 Filing 230 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Ronald G Dean: Mediation held on June 22, 2018. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link: #MediationParticipantSurvey(Dean, Ronald)
February 26, 2018 Filing 229 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Daniel A Rozansky counsel for Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo. Filed by Plaintiff Stubbs Alderton & Markiles, LLP. (Rozansky, Daniel)
February 26, 2018 Filing 228 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eleanor Morton counsel for Defendant ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. David Ta is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. (Attorney Eleanor Morton added to party ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan(pty:dft))(Morton, Eleanor)
February 23, 2018 Filing 227 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Rozansky counsel for Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo. Adding Daniel A. Rozansky as counsel of record for Kristen Andrich, Kathleen Mitchell, Nancy Jurevich, Frank Scognamillo for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Kathleen Mitchell, Nancy Jurevich, Frank Scognamillo. (Attorney Daniel A Rozansky added to party Kristen Andrich(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Rozansky added to party Nancy Jurevich(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Rozansky added to party Kathleen Mitchell(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Rozansky added to party Frank Scognamillo(pty:pla))(Rozansky, Daniel)
February 23, 2018 Filing 226 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michelle Chung counsel for Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo. David S. Harris is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Kathleen Mitchell, Nancy Jurevich, Frank Scognamillo. (Chung, Michelle)
January 24, 2018 Filing 225 NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for April 30, 2018.(Dean, Ronald)
December 11, 2017 Filing 224 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Ronald G Dean has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
November 20, 2017 Filing 223 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Ronald G. Dean may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo(Chung, Michelle)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER RE JURY TRIAL - I. ORDER RE DEADLINES ; II. ORDER RE TRIAL PREPARATION; III. ORDER GOVERNING CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. See document for set deadlines and requirements. (lom)
October 30, 2017 Filing 221 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Scheduling Conference held. The Court sets dates. Please see separate Order Re Jury Trial, also filed today. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (lom)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 9/24/2018. (yl)
October 27, 2017 Filing 219 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: On the Court's own motion, the TIME for the Scheduling Conference on 10/30/2017 is moved to 11:30 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 20, 2017 Filing 218 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10-14 days, filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo.. (Harris, David)
October 3, 2017 Filing 217 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's own motion, a Scheduling Conference is set for October 30, 2017 at 11:00AM. Counsel are ordered to confer and e-file a revised Joint Rule 26(f) Report no later than October 20, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 1, 2017 Filing 216 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION #157 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Lead Plaintiffs Motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part #188 . (pj)
July 31, 2017 Filing 215 MINUTES OF Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification #188 before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Courtroom Deputy Clerk distributes the Court's tentative ruling prior to the case being called. Case called, and counsel make their appearance. The Court hears oral argument from counsel and takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (jp)
July 21, 2017 Filing 214 NOTICE of Change of address by Joseph A Creitz attorney for Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Nancy Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Frank Scognamillo, Linda Scognamillo. Changing attorneys address to Creitz & Serebin LLP, 100 Pine Street, Suite 1250, San Francisco, CA 94111. Filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Nancy Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Frank Scognamillo, Linda Scognamillo. (Creitz, Joseph)
July 13, 2017 Filing 213 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: On the Court's own motion, the hearing on the Motion for Class Certification #188 is continued to 7/31/2017 at 9:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 7, 2017 Filing 212 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo, re Sealed Reply, #211 served on July 7, 2017. (Harris, David)
July 7, 2017 Filing 211 SEALED REPLY RE SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Class Certification and Exhibits to the Declaration of David S. Harris re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #187 #188 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #210 filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - J)(Harris, David)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Application to File Under Seal Portions of Documents and Exhibits Submitted with Plaintiffs' Reply in support of their Motion for Class Certification #207 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (jp)
June 30, 2017 Filing 209 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #208 , APPLICATION to file document Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Exhibits under seal #207 served on 6/30/2017. (Harris, David)
June 30, 2017 Filing 208 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Exhibits under seal #207 filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit B - J)(Harris, David)
June 30, 2017 Filing 207 APPLICATION to file document Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Exhibits under seal filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Application to File Under Seal, #2 Redacted Document Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification, #3 Unredacted Document Supplemental Declaration of David S. Harris, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit A, #5 Redacted Document Exhibits B - J)(Harris, David)
June 27, 2017 Filing 206 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CLASS CERTIFICATION; DECLARATION OF DANIEL BLOUIN AND DECLARATION OF JOHN BARTON under seal #199 filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Peters, Kristen)
June 27, 2017 Filing 205 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CLASS CERTIFICATION; DECLARATION OF DANIEL BLOUIN AND DECLARATION OF JOHN BARTON under seal #199 filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A though E, #2 Exhibit F through L, #3 Exhibit M through Q, #4 Exhibit R though V, #5 Exhibit V2 through Z, #6 Exhibit AA through JJ)(Peters, Kristen)
June 27, 2017 Filing 204 SEALED OPPOSITION RE SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Class Certification and Exhibits to the Declaration of David S. Harris re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #187 #188 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #203 filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler.(Peters, Kristen)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Application for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of: (1) Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification; (2) The Exhibits to the Declaration of Daniel Blouin; and (3) The Declaration of John Barton by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (jp)
June 6, 2017 Filing 202 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan), Robert L Stephens(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan), Michael H Wechsler, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,, #201 , APPLICATION to file document OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CLASS CERTIFICATION; DECLARATION OF DANIEL BLOUIN AND DECLARATION OF JOHN BARTON under seal #199 served on 06/06/2017. (Peters, Kristen)
June 5, 2017 Filing 201 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CLASS CERTIFICATION; DECLARATION OF DANIEL BLOUIN AND DECLARATION OF JOHN BARTON under seal #199 filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opposition to Motion to Class Certification, #2 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Blouin, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibits A-E to Declaration of Daniel Blouin, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibits F-L to Declaration of Daniel Blouin, #5 Unredacted Document Exhibits M-Q to Declaration of Daniel Blouin, #6 Unredacted Document Exhib its R-V to Declaration of Daniel Blouin, #7 Unredacted Document Exhibits V2 - Z to Declaration of Daniel Blouin, #8 Unredacted Document Exhibits AA-JJ to Declaration of Daniel Blouin, #9 Unredacted Document Declaration of John Barton)(Peters, Kristen)
June 5, 2017 Filing 200 OPPOSITION IN OPPOSITION re: SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Class Certification and Exhibits to the Declaration of David S. Harris re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #187 #188 filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler, Michael H Weechsler. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Blouin, #2 Exhibit Redacted ExhibitsA to K to Declaration of Daniel Blouin, #3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits L-S to Declaration Daniel Blouin, #4 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits T-U to Declaration of Daniel Blouin, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits V-W to Declaration of Daniel Blouin, #6 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits X-Z to Declaration of Daniel Blouin, #7 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits AA-JJ to Declaration of Daniel Blouin, #8 Declaration Redacted Declaration of John Barton, #9 Exhibit Exhibits 1-7 to John Barton Declaration, #10 Exhibit Exhibits 8-11 to John Barton)(Peters, Kristen)
June 5, 2017 Filing 199 APPLICATION to file document OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CLASS CERTIFICATION; DECLARATION OF DANIEL BLOUIN AND DECLARATION OF JOHN BARTON under seal filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Opposition to Motion to Class Certification, #2 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Blouin in Support of Opposition, #3 Redacted Document Exhibits A-K to Declartion of Daniel Blouin in Support of Opposition, #4 Redacted Document Exhibits L - S to Declaration of Daniel Blouin in Support of Opposition, #5 Redacted Document Exhibits T - U to Declartion of Daniel Blouin in Support of Opposition, #6 Redacted Document Exhbiits V and W to Declaration of Daniel Blouin in Opposition, #7 Redacted Document Exhibits X-Z to Declaration of Daniel Blouin, #8 Redacted Document Exhibits AA to JJ to Declaration of Daniel Blouin, #9 Redacted Document Declaration of John Barton, #10 Proposed Order)(Peters, Kristen)
June 5, 2017 Filing 198 DECLARATION of Catherine Knezevic in opposition to SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Class Certification and Exhibits to the Declaration of David S. Harris re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #187 #188 filed by Defendant Zenith American Solutions, Inc.. (Green, Horace)
June 5, 2017 Filing 197 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Class Certification and Exhibits to the Declaration of David S. Harris re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #187 #188 Supplemental MPA in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Zenith American Solutions, Inc.. (Green, Horace)
May 19, 2017 Filing 196 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan), Robert L Stephens(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan), Michael H Wechsler, re Errata, #195 , APPLICATION to file document EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE OF DEFENDANTS ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN, MICHAEL H. WECHSLER, ROBERT L. STEPHENS, AND JAMES C. MCKENNA under seal #193 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #194 served on May 19, 2017. (Peters, Kristen)
May 19, 2017 Filing 195 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. correcting APPLICATION to file document EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE OF DEFENDANTS ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN, MICHAEL H. WECHSLER, ROBERT L. STEPHENS, AND JAMES C. MCKENNA under seal #193 (Peters, Kristen)
May 19, 2017 Filing 194 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE OF DEFENDANTS ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN, MICHAEL H. WECHSLER, ROBERT L. STEPHENS, AND JAMES C. MCKENNA under seal #193 filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Expert Witness Disclosure of Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, Michael H. Wechsler, Robert L. Stephens, and James C. McKenna)(Peters, Kristen)
May 19, 2017 Filing 193 APPLICATION to file document EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE OF DEFENDANTS ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN, MICHAEL H. WECHSLER, ROBERT L. STEPHENS, AND JAMES C. MCKENNA under seal filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen M. Peters, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Document Expert Witness Disclosure of Defendants ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN, MICHAEL H. WECHSLER, ROBERT L. STEPHENS, AND JAMES C. MCKENNA)(Peters, Kristen)
May 18, 2017 Filing 192 DISCLOSURE of EXPERT WITNESS filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler (Peters, Kristen)
April 17, 2017 Filing 191 NOTICE of Reservation of Right to Designate Rebuttal Expert Witnesses filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo. (Chung, Michelle)
April 17, 2017 Filing 190 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michelle Chung counsel for Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo. Adding Michelle Chung as counsel of record for Plaintiffs: Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo. (Attorney Michelle Chung added to party Kristen Andrich(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle Chung added to party Nancy Jurevich(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle Chung added to party Kathleen Mitchell(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle Chung added to party Frank Scognamillo(pty:pla))(Chung, Michelle)
April 11, 2017 Filing 189 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo, re SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Class Certification and Exhibits to the Declaration of David S. Harris re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #187 #188 served on April 11, 2017. (Harris, David)
April 11, 2017 Filing 188 SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Class Certification and Exhibits to the Declaration of David S. Harris re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #187 filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo. Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to David Harris Declaration, #2 Exhibit B-1 to David Harris Declaration, #3 Exhibit B-2 to David Harris Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to David Harris Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to David Harris Declaration, #6 Exhibit E-1 to David Harris Declaration, #7 Exhibit E-2 to David Harris Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to David Harris Declaration, #9 Exhibit G to David Harris Declaration, #10 Exhibit H to David Harris Declaration, #11 Exhibit I to David Harris Declaration, #12 Exhibit J to David Harris Declaration, #13 Exhibit K to David Harris Declaration, #14 Exhibit L to David Harris Declaration, #15 Exhibit M to David Harris Declaration, #16 Exhibit N to David Harris Declaration, #17 Exhibit O to David Harris Declaration, #18 Exhibit P to David Harris Declaration, #19 Exhibit Q to David Harris Declaration, #20 Exhibit S to David Harris Declaration, #21 Exhibit T to David Harris Declaration, #22 Exhibit U to David Harris Declaration, #23 Exhibit V to David Harris Declaration, #24 Exhibit W to David Harris Declaration)(Harris, David)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs Application to File Under Seal Portions of Documents and Exhibits in support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification #184 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald that said portions of the declarations and exhibits be filed with the Clerk of the Court under seal pursuant to Civil L.R. 79-5.1. (jp)
April 10, 2017 Filing 186 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,, #185 , APPLICATION to file document Motion for Class Certification and Exhibits under seal #184 served on 04/10/17. (Harris, David)
April 10, 2017 Filing 185 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion for Class Certification and Exhibits under seal #184 filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet of David Harris in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E-1, #8 Exhibit E-2, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W)(Harris, David)
April 10, 2017 Filing 184 APPLICATION to file document Motion for Class Certification and Exhibits under seal filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of David Harris to file under seal, #3 Redacted Document Motion for Class Certification Redacted, #4 Unredacted Document Declaration of Michael Sherman, #5 Unredacted Document Declaration of Joseph Creitz, #6 Unredacted Document Declaration of David Harris, #7 Redacted Document Exhibits A-Q to the Declaration of David Harris, #8 Unredacted Document Exhibit R to the Declaration of David Harris, #9 Redacted Document Exhibits S-W to the Declaration of David Harris, #10 Unredacted Document Proposed Order to Motion for Class Certification)(Harris, David)
March 22, 2017 Filing 183 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court conducted a telephonic hearing on the defense motion to compel depositions of two non-party physicians. (Docket # 179.) (See Minute Order for further details) granting #179 Motion to Compel Deposition Court Recorder: CS 3/22/2017. (vm)
March 15, 2017 Filing 182 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Deposition of Oscar Leal, M.D. and Karapet Dermendjian, M.D. #179 filed by Nonparties Oscar Leal and Karapet Dermendjian and filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David S. Harris)(Harris, David)
March 15, 2017 Filing 181 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel, #175 filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo. (Harris, David)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: E-MAIL REQUEST TO QUASH SUBPOENA by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm)
March 8, 2017 Filing 179 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Deposition of Oscar Leal, M.D. and Karapet Dermendjian, M.D. filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan), Robert L Stephens(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan), Michael H Wechsler. Motion set for hearing on 3/22/2017 at 09:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D.Blouin, #2 Exhibits 1 - 5 of Declaration of D. Blouin, #3 Proposed Order)(Lee, Christopher)
March 8, 2017 Filing 178 NOTICE of Change of address by Daniel M Blouin attorney for Defendant ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Changing attorneys address to 233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 8000, Chicago, IL 60606. Filed by Defendant ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. (Blouin, Daniel)
March 3, 2017 Filing 177 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. COUNSEL ARE ADVISED THAT The Court's Order #154 , dated November 21, 2016, remains in effect. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 3, 2017 Filing 176 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Counsel are advised the Scheduling Conference set for April 10, 2017, was set in error. The Court's Order #154 of July 27, 2017, remains in effect. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 3/3/2017 (rs).
March 1, 2017 Filing 175 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Nancy Jurevich, Kathleen Mitchell, Frank Scognamillo. Motion set for hearing on 3/22/2017 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Exhibits)(Harris, David)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2017 at 11:00 AM. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (jp)
February 28, 2017 Filing 173 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,, #169 Answer to Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Zenith American Solutions, Inc..(Green, Horace)
February 27, 2017 Filing 172 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,, #169 filed by Plan Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan), Robert L Stephens(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan), Michael H Wechsler.(Attorney Kristen M Peters added to party James C McKenna(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M Peters added to party Robert L Stephens(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M Peters added to party Michael H Wechsler(pty:dft))(Peters, Kristen)
February 22, 2017 Filing 171 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Minute Order for details) dismissed as moot #163 Motion to Compel Deposition (vm)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER RE: DEPOSITIONS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court will conduct a conference call on Wednesday, February 22, at 2 p.m. PT, to discuss the pending motion. (Docket # 163.) (See Minute Order for further details) re: MOTION to Compel Deposition of Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Oscar I. Leal, M.D., APC, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., and Karapet Dermendjian, APC #163 (vm)
February 13, 2017 Filing 169 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants James C McKenna(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan), James C McKenna(individually), Robert L Stephens(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan), Robert L Stephens(individually), Michael H Wechsler, Michael H Weechsler, Zenith American Solutions, Inc. amending Amended Complaint/Petition,, #85 , filed by Plaintiffs Frank Scognamillo, Kristen Andrich, Kathleen Mitchell, Nancy Jurevich(Attorney David S Harris added to party Nancy Jurevich(pty:pla), Attorney David S Harris added to party Frank Scognamillo(pty:pla))(Harris, David)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MINUTES (In Chambers): ORDER RE SUBSTITUTION AND AMENDMENT #160 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. For the foregoing reasons, the Motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Linda Scognamillo, Mathew Jurevich, and the Provider Plaintiffs, i.e., Ralph Mayer, M.C., Inc., Oscar I. Leal, M.D., P.C., Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., and Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., are DISMISSED without prejudice. Frank Scognamillo, as trustee of the Frank A. Scognamillo and Linda L. Scognamillo Living Trust, shall be SUBSTITUTED in place of Plaintiff Linda Scognamillo. Nancy Jurevich shall be SUBSTITUTED in place of Mathew Jurevich. Plaintiffs shall file the Proposed Third Amended Complaint, absent the claims for accounting and readjudication/reevaluation, on or before February 13, 2017. (lom)
February 6, 2017 Filing 167 MINUTES OF MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PLAINTIFF, TO DISMISS CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS, TO AMEND AMENDED COMPLAINT #160 Hearing held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Courtroom Deputy Clerk distributes the Court's tentative ruling prior to the case being called. Case called, and counsel make their appearance. The Court hears oral argument from counsel and takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (jy)
January 27, 2017 Filing 166 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Compel Deposition of Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Oscar I. Leal, M.D., APC, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., and Karapet Dermendjian, APC #163 filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David S. Harris (and Exhibits))(Harris, David)
January 23, 2017 Filing 165 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Substitute Plaintiff Frank Scognamillo, as Trustee of the Frank A. Scognamillo and Linda L. Scognamillo Living Trust for Plaintiff Linda Scognamillo NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Lorena Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., Marcella Armijo, John Bohm, M.D., Oscar I Leal, M.D., Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc. NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint/Petition,, #85 #160 filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David S. Harris)(Harris, David)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER RE: CASE SCHEDULING by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The parties will promptly inform Judge Wilner after the hearing with Judge Fitzgerald when they receive a dispositive ruling from the district judge. (See Minute Order for further details) re: MOTION to Compel Deposition of Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Oscar I. Leal, M.D., APC, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., and Karapet Dermendjian, APC #163 (vm)
January 23, 2017 Filing 163 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Deposition of Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Oscar I. Leal, M.D., APC, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., and Karapet Dermendjian, APC filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna(individually), Robert L Stephens(individually), Michael H Wechsler. Motion set for hearing on 2/6/2017 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel M. Blouin)(Escarez, Joseph)
January 13, 2017 Filing 162 OPPOSITION BY ALL DEFENDANTS re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Substitute Plaintiff Frank Scognamillo, as Trustee of the Frank A. Scognamillo and Linda L. Scognamillo Living Trust for Plaintiff Linda Scognamillo NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Lorena Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., Marcella Armijo, John Bohm, M.D., Oscar I Leal, M.D., Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc. NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint/Petition,, #85 #160 filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel M. Blouin, #2 Declaration of C. Mark Humbert)(Escarez, Joseph)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER RE: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court conferred with the parties regarding the status of the case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 22, 2016 Filing 160 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Substitute Plaintiff Frank Scognamillo, as Trustee of the Frank A. Scognamillo and Linda L. Scognamillo Living Trust for Plaintiff Linda Scognamillo , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Lorena Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., Marcella Armijo, John Bohm, M.D., Oscar I Leal, M.D., Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc. , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint/Petition,, #85 filed by Plaintiffs Mathew Jurevich, Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., Marcella Armijo, John Bohm, M.D., Oscar I Leal, M.D., Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Kathleen Mitchell, Linda Scognamillo. Motion set for hearing on 2/6/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David S. Harris (and Exhibits), #2 Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order) (Harris, David)
December 20, 2016 Filing 159 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The telephone conference set for December 20, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. has been rescheduled to January 11, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER RE: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court conferred with counsel regarding the status of the case. The Court sets a further telephonic status conference on December 20, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 9, 2016 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Ta on behalf of Defendant ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Attorney David Ta added to party ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan(pty:dft))(Ta, David)
December 7, 2016 Filing 156 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Telephone Conference set for December 13, 2016 at 8:30 AM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 21, 2016 Filing 155 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case called, and counsel state their appearances. The Status Conference re the Joint Stipulation #148 is held. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court will sign the order. Court Reporter: Nichole Forrest. (lom)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER Re Joint Stipulation to Amend the Scheduling Order #148 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald as follows: Class Discovery Cutoff 9excluding experts) 3/21/2017. Plaintiffs File Class Certification motions 4/10/2017. Plaintiffs Disclosure of Class Certification Expert Submission of Class Certification Expert Report 4/17/2017. Plaintiffs Disclosure of Class Certification Expert Submission of Class Certification Expert Report 5/18/2017. Defendants file Opposition 6/5/2017. Defendants file Opposition 6/26/2017. Plaintiffs File Reply 6/30/2017. Hearing 7/24/2017 at 10:00 AM. (jp)
November 18, 2016 Filing 153 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Joseph A. Creitz and Lisa S. Serebin on behalf of Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. Filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo (Harris, David)
November 18, 2016 Filing 152 SCHEDULING NOTICE RE TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE CALL INFORMATION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The dial-in information for 11/21/16 at 11:30am is: Dial: (213)894-0800; Meeting ID: 1112#; User Password: 3500#. Should counsel have trouble connecting to the call, immediately please email the Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Sanchez, immediately. rita_sanchez@cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 10, 2016 Filing 151 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald re: Stipulation to Continue #148 . The Court sets a Telephone Conference for 11/21/2016 at 11:30 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jloz) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 10, 2016 Filing 150 NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Effective November 17, 2016, Judge Fitzgerald will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 5A on the 5th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 5A of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 10, 2016 Filing 149 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Horace Wade Green counsel for Defendant Zenith American Solutions, Inc.. Adding Horace W. Green as counsel of record for Defendant Zenith American Solutions, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Zenith American Solutions, Inc.. (Attorney Horace Wade Green added to party Zenith American Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Green, Horace)
November 7, 2016 Filing 148 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Class Discovery and Certification Deadlines filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harris, David)
October 21, 2016 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kristen M Peters on behalf of Defendant ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Attorney Kristen M Peters added to party ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan(pty:dft))(Peters, Kristen)
August 4, 2016 Filing 146 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael A Sherman counsel for Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. David S. Gubman is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs. (Sherman, Michael)
July 28, 2016 Filing 145 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Lee counsel for Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Pacific Maritime Association, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. Filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, Pacific Maritime Association, Michael H. Weschler, Robert L. Stephens, and James C. McKenna. (Attorney Christopher Lee added to party ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Lee added to party James C McKenna(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Lee added to party Pacific Maritime Association(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Lee added to party Robert L Stephens(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Lee added to party Michael H Wechsler(pty:dft))(Lee, Christopher)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Re Joint Stipulation to Amend the Scheduling Order #143 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. 9See attachment of this Order for further details). (jp)
July 26, 2016 Filing 143 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Class Discovery and Certification Deadlines filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harris, David)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting #139 Non-Resident Attorney Daniel M. Blouin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, designating Jonathan A. Braunstein as local counsel. (lt)
June 3, 2016 Filing 141 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin J Lesinski counsel for Defendant ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Filed by DEFENDANT ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. (Lesinski, Kevin)
June 3, 2016 Filing 140 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel M. Blouin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Weechsler (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-17933413) #139 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Other error(s) with document(s): Wechsler, Stephens and McKenna are terminated parties. (lt)
June 3, 2016 Filing 139 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel M. Blouin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Weechsler (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-17933413) fil ed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna(individually), Robert L Stephens(individually), Michael H Weechsler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Attorney Jonathan A Braunstein added to party James C McKenna(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan A Braunstein added to party Robert L Stephens(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan A Braunstein added to party Michael H Weechsler(pty:dft)) (Braunstein, Jonathan)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Order for details) re Stipulation for Protective Order #137 (vm)
May 26, 2016 Filing 137 Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo.(Attorney David S Harris added to party Kristen Andrich(pty:pla), Attorney David S Harris added to party Lorena Armijo(pty:pla), Attorney David S Harris added to party Marcella Armijo(pty:pla), Attorney David S Harris added to party Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney David S Harris added to party John Bohm, M.D.(pty:pla), Attorney David S Harris added to party Karapet Dermendjian, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney David S Harris added to party Mathew Jurevich(pty:pla), Attorney David S Harris added to party Oscar I Leal, M.D.(pty:pla), Attorney David S Harris added to party Kathleen Mitchell(pty:pla), Attorney David S Harris added to party Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney David S Harris added to party Linda Scognamillo(pty:pla))(Harris, David)
May 25, 2016 Filing 136 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read as CV15-01403 MWF (MRWx). (mg)
May 11, 2016 Filing 135 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael A Sherman counsel for Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. Preston H. Lim is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs. (Sherman, Michael)
May 6, 2016 Filing 134 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/28/16 re Transcript #133 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (nja) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 6, 2016 Filing 133 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/28/16. Court Reporter: NAREN JANSEN, phone number narenjusdc@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/6/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2016. (nja)
March 28, 2016 Filing 132 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Class Certification Expert Discovery cut-off 1/16/2017. Class Motions due by 10/24/2016. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (See document for further deadlines)Court Reporter: Naren L Jansen. (mrgo)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than: To be determined at a later date. (mrgo)
March 14, 2016 Filing 130 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiffs and filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler, Zenith American Solutions, Inc... (Lesinski, Kevin)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: A Scheduling Conference is set for 3/28/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Joint Rule 26(f) Report is due 3/14/2016. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cw)
February 23, 2016 Filing 128 ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by DEFENDANTS ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna(individually), Pacific Maritime Association, Robert L Stephens(individually), Michael H Wechsler.(Lesinski, Kevin)
February 23, 2016 Filing 127 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,, #85 filed by defendant Zenith American Solutions, Inc..(Humbert, Charles)
February 3, 2016 Filing 126 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: the Motions are GRANTED in part without leave to amend. The Motions are DENIED to the extent they seek dismissal of Plaintiffs'claims at this juncture because (1) "ancillary" medical services performed in connection with pre-authorized procedures were not themselves pre-authorized; (2) Provider Plaintiffs lack derivative standing; (3) the Plan's anti-assignment provision is valid and enforceable; and (4) Individual and Provider Plaintiffs cannot recover the same benefits. Plan Defendants and Defendant Zenith shall answer the SAC on or before 2/23/2016. All other Defendants and claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. (jp)
February 1, 2016 Filing 125 MINUTES OF Motion to dismiss Case #88 , #89 , #90 , #92 before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Courtroom Deputy Clerk distributes the Court's tentative ruling prior to the case being called. Case called, and counsel state their appearances. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (jp)
January 15, 2016 Filing 124 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo, re Statement, #121 Frank Scognamillo served on December 17, 2015. (Sherman, Michael)
January 15, 2016 Filing 123 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael G Cross counsel for Defendants ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan, James C McKenna, Pacific Maritime Association, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. Michael G. Cross is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan, Pacific Maritime Association, Michael H. Wechsler, Robert L. Stephens, and James C. McKenna. (Cross, Michael)
January 14, 2016 Filing 122 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: On the Court's own motion, and pursuant to the Court's Scheduling Notice entered 11/4/2015 109 , the hearing on Motions to Dismiss #88 #89 #90 and #92 is reset for 2/1/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 11, 2015 Filing 121 STATEMENT of Fact of Death filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo (Sherman, Michael)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MINUTES (In Chambers): ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM LOCAL RULE 23-3 #110 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Accordingly, the Motion is GRANTED. The Court will discuss the class certification schedule at the Rule 26(f) conference. (lom)
December 7, 2015 Filing 119 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 #110 filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael A. Sherman in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Relief from Local Rule 23-3)(Sherman, Michael)
December 1, 2015 Filing 118 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Response in Opposition to Motion, #113 #117 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used: Civil > Motion and Related Filings > Other > Opposition. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (jloz)
November 30, 2015 Filing 117 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Response in Opposition to Motion, #113 filed by defendant CIGNA, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/21/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Doren, Richard)
November 30, 2015 Filing 116 TC3 HEALTH, INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM LOCAL RULE 23-3 In Opposition To re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 #110 filed by Defendant TC3 Health, Inc.. (Capozzola, Damian)
November 30, 2015 Filing 115 Joinder in PMA and Plan Defendants' Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 #110 filed by Defendant Zenith American Solutions, Inc.. (Humbert, Charles)
November 30, 2015 Filing 114 DECLARATION of KEVIN J. LESINSKI IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 #110 filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Pacific Maritime Association, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lesinski, Kevin)
November 30, 2015 Filing 113 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 #110 filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Pacific Maritime Association, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Weechsler. (Lesinski, Kevin)
November 19, 2015 Filing 112 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM LOCAL RULE 23-3 re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 #110 filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. (Sherman, Michael)
November 19, 2015 Filing 111 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 #110 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other: Proposed Order shall be filed as separate attachment to the e-filed "Notice of Motion and Motion for Relief and/or NOTICE OF LODGING". and e-mailed to a Judge Fitzgerald generic email addresses a WordPerfect or Microsoft Word version of the document.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (jp)
November 18, 2015 Filing 110 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. Motion set for hearing on 12/21/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael A. Sherman, #2 Exhibit of David S. Gubman) (Sherman, Michael)
November 4, 2015 Filing 109 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's own motion, the hearing on the Motions to Dismiss #88 #89 #90 #92 is taken off calendar. The Court will issue an order resetting the hearing at a later date. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HACE VICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting #107 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brittain W Sexton on behalf of TC3 Health, Inc, designating Damian D. Capozzola as local counsel. (lom)
October 29, 2015 Filing 107 APPLICATION for attorney Sexton, Brittain W. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16701595 paid.) filed by Defendant TC3 Health, Inc.. Application set for hearing on 11/9/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Application Of Non-Resident Attorney To Appear In A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Capozzola, Damian)
October 26, 2015 Filing 106 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Against TC3 #88 filed by Defendant TC3 Health, Inc.. (Capozzola, Damian)
October 26, 2015 Filing 105 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Pliantiffs' second amended complaint #92 //REPLY OF CIGNA, INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO CIGNA'S SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Defendant CIGNA, Inc.. (Doren, Richard)
October 26, 2015 Filing 104 REPLY in Support of ZENITH AMERICAN SOLUTIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (FRCP RULES 12(b)(6) AND 9(b)) filed by Defendant Zenith American Solutions, Inc.. (Humbert, Charles)
October 26, 2015 Filing 103 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Pacific Maritime Association and Each of the First, Second, and Seventh Claims Alleged Against it in Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Joinder in Co-Defendants #90 filed by Defendant Pacific Maritime Association. (Lesinski, Kevin)
October 26, 2015 Filing 102 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and Each of the First, Second, Third, Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Claims Therein; Memorandum of Points and Authorities by #89 filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. (Lesinski, Kevin)
October 14, 2015 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christin J Hill on behalf of Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, Pacific Maritime Association, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler (Attorney Christin J Hill added to party ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Christin J Hill added to party James C McKenna(pty:dft), Attorney Christin J Hill added to party Pacific Maritime Association(pty:dft), Attorney Christin J Hill added to party Robert L Stephens(pty:dft), Attorney Christin J Hill added to party Michael H Wechsler(pty:dft))(Hill, Christin)
October 8, 2015 Filing 100 OPPOSITION in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Pliantiffs' second amended complaint #92 Plaintiffs' Opposition to CIGNA and Zenith's Motions to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. (Sherman, Michael)
October 8, 2015 Filing 99 OPPOSITION in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Pacific Maritime Association and Each of the First, Second, and Seventh Claims Alleged Against it in Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Joinder in Co-Defendants #90 Plaintiffs' Opposition to PMA's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. (Sherman, Michael)
October 8, 2015 Filing 98 OPPOSITION in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and Each of the First, Second, Third, Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Claims Therein; Memorandum of Points and Authorities by #89 Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Plan's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. (Sherman, Michael)
October 8, 2015 Filing 97 OPPOSITION in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Against TC3 #88 Plaintiffs' Opposition to TC3's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. (Sherman, Michael)
October 6, 2015 Filing 96 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/6/2015 at 3:44 p.m. re Transcript #95 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Ponce, Myra) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 6, 2015 Filing 95 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/6/2015 at 3:44 p.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Myra Ponce, e-mail address myraponce@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/27/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2016. (Ponce, Myra)
September 24, 2015 Filing 94 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael A Sherman counsel for Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. Harris L. Cohen, Esq. is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs. (Sherman, Michael)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER ON STIPULATION RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE PER COURT ORDER #87 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants shall have up to and including September 21, 2015 within which to file responses to the Seconded Amended Complaint; 2. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including October 8, 2015 to file any opposition to any motion filed by Defendants in response to the Second Amended Complaint; 3. Defendants shall have up to and including October 26, 2015 to file any reply in support of any motion filed by Defendants in response to the Second Amended Complaint; 4. Defendants shall set the hearing on any motion filed in response to the Second Amended Complaint for November 9, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
September 18, 2015 Filing 92 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Pliantiffs' second amended complaint filed by Defendant CIGNA, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/9/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF CIGNA, INC., TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) (Doren, Richard)
September 18, 2015 Filing 91 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS the Seventh Claim for Relief in Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by defendant Zenith American Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Humbert, Charles)
September 18, 2015 Filing 90 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Pacific Maritime Association and Each of the First, Second, and Seventh Claims Alleged Against it in Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Pacific Maritime Association. Motion set for hearing on 11/9/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lesinski, Kevin)
September 18, 2015 Filing 89 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and Each of the First, Second, Third, Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Claims Therein; Memorandum of Points and Authorities by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna(individually), Robert L Stephens(individually), Michael H Wechsler. Motion set for hearing on 11/9/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kevin J Lesinski added to party ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan(pty:dft)) (Lesinski, Kevin)
September 18, 2015 Filing 88 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Against TC3 filed by Defendant TC3 Health, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/9/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Against TC3) (Capozzola, Damian)
September 17, 2015 Filing 87 STIPULATION for Order To Set Briefing Schedule in Response to Court Order filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Stipulation Re: Briefing Schedule Per Court Order)(Sherman, Michael)
September 16, 2015 Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo Court Reporter. Court will contact Julie Ziegler at jziegler@stubbsalderton.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: August 6, 2015. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Sherman, Michael)
September 4, 2015 Filing 85 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition,,,, #35 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Mathew Jurevich, Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., Marcella Armijo, John Bohm, M.D., Oscar I Leal, M.D., Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Kathleen Mitchell, Linda Scognamillo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Sherman, Michael)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Re Motions to Dismiss #46 , #47 , #48 , #49 , #51 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: (See attachment Minute Order for further details). Plaintiffs may amend the claims that have been dismissed, except as to equitable estoppel and quasi-contract. Should Plaintiffs wish to amend, they shall file a Second Amended Complaint with 14 days of the filing of this Order. Defendants' response shall be filed within 14 days of being served with the Second Amended Complaint. Otherwise, Defendants shall file their Answers to the FAC within 14 days of being informed by Plaintiffs of their intent to proceed on their remaining claims. There may be a Second Amended Complaint, but there will be no Third. Any future successful motion to dismiss shall be granted without leave to amend. (jp)
August 11, 2015 Filing 83 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph A Escarez counsel for Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna, James C McKenna, Pacific Maritime Association, Robert L Stephens, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. Adding Joseph A. Escarez as counsel of record for ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, Pacific Maritime Association, Michael H. Wechsler, Robert L.Stephens, and James C. McKenna for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, Pacific Maritime Association, Michael H. Wechsler, Robert L.Stephens, and James C. McKenna. (Attorney Joseph A Escarez added to party ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph A Escarez added to party James C McKenna(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph A Escarez added to party James C McKenna(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph A Escarez added to party Pacific Maritime Association(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph A Escarez added to party Robert L Stephens(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph A Escarez added to party Robert L Stephens(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph A Escarez added to party Michael H Wechsler(pty:dft))(Escarez, Joseph)
August 7, 2015 Filing 82 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Courtroom Deputy Clerk emailed the Court's tentative ruling to all counsel, prior to the hearing. Case called, and counsel state their appearances. For the reasons stated on the record,the Court takes the motions under submission. An order will issue as to Motions #46 #47 #48 #49 and #51 . Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (cw)
August 5, 2015 Filing 81 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CIGNA, Inc. (Doren, Richard)
August 5, 2015 Filing 80 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard Joseph Doren counsel for Defendant CIGNA, Inc.. Adding Richard J Doren; Timothy W. Loose as counsel of record for Cigna, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Cigna, Inc. (Doren, Richard)
July 30, 2015 Filing 79 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's own motion, the hearing on the Motions #46 #47 #48 #49 #51 is continued to August 6, 2015 at 3:30PM. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 29, 2015 Filing 78 SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION to TC3's Redaction of Portions of TC3-Zenith MSA. (gk)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Application to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to TC3's Redaction of Portions of TC3-Zenith MSA #76 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (jp)
July 27, 2015 Filing 75 REPLY In Support Of APPLICATION to Seal #67 filed by Defendant TC3 Health, Inc.. (Capozzola, Damian)
July 24, 2015 Filing 76 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to TC3's Redaction of Portions of TC3-Zenith MSA filed by plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
July 24, 2015 Filing 74 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo of Plaintiffs' Application to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to TC3's Redaction of Portions of TC3-Zenith MSA. (Sherman, Michael)
July 24, 2015 Filing 73 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Case #46 Plaintiffs' Opposition to TC3's Redaction of Portions of TC3-Zenith MSA filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. (Sherman, Michael)
July 24, 2015 Filing 72 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo of Plaintiffs' Opposition to TC3's Redaction of Portions of TC3-Zenith MSA. (Sherman, Michael)
July 20, 2015 Filing 71 SEALED DOCUMENT - UNDER SEAL. (gk)
July 20, 2015 Filing 70 SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER. (gk)
July 20, 2015 Filing 69 DECLARATION of LOUISE DOBBE in support of TC3 Health, Inc's UNOPPOSED APPLICATION to File Master Services Agreement Under Seal #67 filed by Defendant TC3 Health, Inc. (jp) Modified on 7/21/2015 (iv).
July 20, 2015 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Support of APPLICATION to File Master Services Agreement Under Seal #67 filed by Defendant TC3 Health, Inc. (jp) Modified on 7/21/2015 (iv).
July 20, 2015 Filing 67 NOTICE OF UNOPPOSED APPLICATION AND UNOPPOSED APPLICATION to File Master Services Agreement Under Seal filed by Defendant TC3 Health, Inc. (jp) Modified on 7/21/2015 (iv).
July 17, 2015 Filing 66 REPLY in support of MOTION to Dismiss Case #47 filed by Defendant Zenith American Solutions, Inc.. (Humbert, Charles)
July 17, 2015 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan, ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan, James C McKenna(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan), Pacific Maritime Association, Robert L Stephens(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan), Michael H Wechsler, re Reply (Motion related),,, #61 , Reply (Motion related), #60 , Errata #62 , Reply (Motion related), #63 served on 07/17/2015. (Braunstein, Jonathan)
July 17, 2015 Filing 64 REPLY filed by Defendant CIGNA, Inc. /Reply of Cigna, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Cigna's Motion to Dismiss (Doren, Richard)
July 17, 2015 Filing 63 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Each of the First, Second, and Seventh Claims in Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #51 [Corrected] filed by Defendant Pacific Maritime Association. (Braunstein, Jonathan)
July 17, 2015 Filing 62 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Pacific Maritime Association. correcting Reply (Motion related), #60 (Braunstein, Jonathan)
July 17, 2015 Filing 61 REPLY in Support MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Each of the First, Second, Third, Fifth, Sixth, Seventh, Eighth and Ninth Claims Therein; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #49 filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler, ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. (Attorney Jonathan A Braunstein added to party ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan A Braunstein added to party James C McKenna(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan A Braunstein added to party Robert L Stephens(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan A Braunstein added to party Michael H Wechsler(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan A Braunstein added to party ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan(pty:dft))(Braunstein, Jonathan)
July 17, 2015 Filing 60 REPLY in Support MOTION to Dismiss Each of the First, Second, and Seventh Claims in Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #51 filed by Defendant Pacific Maritime Association. (Attorney Jonathan A Braunstein added to party Pacific Maritime Association(pty:dft))(Braunstein, Jonathan)
July 17, 2015 Filing 59 REPLY in support of MOTION to Dismiss Case #46 filed by Defendant TC3 Health, Inc.. (Capozzola, Damian)
July 17, 2015 Filing 58 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant TC3 Health, Inc. of Unopposed Application To File Master Services Agreement Under Seal (with Supporting Memorandum, Declaration of Louise Dobbe, Unredacted Master Services Agreement, and Proposed Order). (Capozzola, Damian)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. CV13-07369 FMO (PJWx). (mg)
July 2, 2015 Filing 56 OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Dismiss Each of the First, Second, and Seventh Claims in Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #51 Plaintiffs' Opposition to PMA's Motion to Dismiss; Declaration of Michael A. Sherman In Support Thereof filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 3), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 3), #3 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 3))(Sherman, Michael)
July 2, 2015 Filing 55 OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Each of the First, Second, Third, Fifth, Sixth, Seventh, Eighth and Ninth Claims Therein; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #49 Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Plan's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. (Sherman, Michael)
July 2, 2015 Filing 54 OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #48 Plaintiffs' Opposition to CIGNA's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. (Sherman, Michael)
July 2, 2015 Filing 53 OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Dismiss Case #47 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Zenith's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. (Sherman, Michael)
July 2, 2015 Filing 52 OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Dismiss Case #46 Plaintiffs' Opposition to TC3's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Marcella Armijo, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., John Bohm, M.D., Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Oscar I Leal, M.D., Kathleen Mitchell, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Linda Scognamillo. (Sherman, Michael)
June 3, 2015 Filing 51 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Each of the First, Second, and Seventh Claims in Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Pacific Maritime Association. Motion set for hearing on 8/3/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Pacific Maritime Association's Motion to Diismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Lesinski, Kevin)
June 3, 2015 Filing 50 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan, James C McKenna(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan), James C McKenna(individually), Pacific Maritime Association, Robert L Stephens(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan), Robert L Stephens(individually), Michael H Wechsler, Michael H Weechsler, identifying ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan and Pacific Maritime Association. (Attorney Kevin J Lesinski added to party Michael H Weechsler(pty:dft))(Lesinski, Kevin)
June 3, 2015 Filing 49 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Each of the First, Second, Third, Fifth, Sixth, Seventh, Eighth and Ninth Claims Therein; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan, James C McKenna(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan), Robert L Stephens(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan), Michael H Wechsler. Motion set for hearing on 8/3/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of John Barton in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of John Barton, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of John Barton, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration of John Barton, #5 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Request for Judicial Notice, #10 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Attorney Kevin J Lesinski added to party James C McKenna(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin J Lesinski added to party Robert L Stephens(pty:dft))(Lesinski, Kevin)
June 3, 2015 Filing 48 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant CIGNA, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/3/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion of CIGNA, Inc., toDismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint)(Attorney Richard Joseph Doren added to party CIGNA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Doren, Richard)
June 3, 2015 Filing 47 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Zenith American Solutions, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/3/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Catherin Knezevic in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Humbert, Charles)
June 3, 2015 Filing 46 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant TC3 Health, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/3/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plan Documents, #2 Exhibit Master Services Agreement, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Against TC3)(Capozzola, Damian)
May 22, 2015 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael G Cross on behalf of Defendants ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan, James C McKenna, Pacific Maritime Association, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler (Attorney Michael G Cross added to party ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Michael G Cross added to party James C McKenna(pty:dft), Attorney Michael G Cross added to party Pacific Maritime Association(pty:dft), Attorney Michael G Cross added to party Robert L Stephens(pty:dft), Attorney Michael G Cross added to party Michael H Wechsler(pty:dft))(Cross, Michael)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON ANY MOTION FILED IN RESPONSE TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Upon Stipulation #42 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that each Defendant shall have up to and including 6/3/2015 to answer, file a motion, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint #35 . Plaintiffs shall have up to and including 7/3/2015 to file any oppositions to any motion filed by Defendants in response to the Amended Complaint. Each Defendant shall have up to and including 7/17/2015 to file any reply in support of any motion it filed in response to the Amended Complaint. Each Defendant shall set the hearing on any motion it files in response to the Amended Complaint for 8/3/2015 at 10:00 AM. (gk)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting #41 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney E. Steele Clayton, IV on behalf of Defendant TC3 Health Inc., designating Damian D. Capozzola as local counsel. (lt)
May 15, 2015 Filing 42 Joint STIPULATION for Order RE Briefing Schedule on any Motion Filed in Response to Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Pacific Maritime Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Belzer, Aaron)
May 14, 2015 Filing 41 Second APPLICATION for attorney Clayton, E. Steele, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant TC3 Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice)(Capozzola, Damian)
May 11, 2015 Filing 40 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A),,, #39 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by May 15, 2015. Counsel shall also comply with the Local Rules and Judge Fitzgerald's Procedures and Schedules concerning mandatory chambers' copies and proposed orders. (lt)
May 11, 2015 Filing 39 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Clayton, E. Steele, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15692651 paid.) #38 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Failed to list all of the state courts where attorney is admitted. Attorney only listed Tennessee but did not list South Carolina, even though he is Inactive. Instructions call for attorney to "List all courts to which you have been admitted and the current status of your membership.' See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
May 9, 2015 Filing 38 DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER, DOCUMENT 40 , DATED 5/11/15 APPLICATION for attorney Clayton, E. Steele, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15692651 paid.) filed by Defendant TC3 Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice)(Capozzola, Damian) Modified on 5/11/2015 (lt).
May 6, 2015 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Peter W Saltzman on behalf of Defendant ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan (Attorney Peter W Saltzman added to party ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan(pty:dft))(Saltzman, Peter)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE SCHEDULE FOR RESPONDING TO AMENDED COMPLAINT #33 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Court held a telephonic hearing that day to discuss the schedule with counsel. Per the Courts statements at the hearing, the Stipulation is DENIED. The last day for Defendants to notice a hearing on any motion filed in response to the Amended Complaint is 8/3/2015. The filing date for any such motion shall be no earlier than 6/15/2015. Counsel are to meet and confer regarding a briefing schedule and submit that schedule to the Court by 5/18/2015. (jp)
April 30, 2015 Filing 35 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Plaintiffs amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Kathleen Mitchell, John Bohm, M.D., Marcella Armijo, Linda Scognamillo, Karapet Dermendjian, Inc., Mathew Jurevich, Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc., Oscar I Leal, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Attorney Michael A Sherman added to party Mathew Jurevich(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A Sherman added to party Linda Scognamillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A Sherman added to party Kathleen Mitchell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A Sherman added to party Marcella Armijo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A Sherman added to party Oscar I Leal, M.D.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A Sherman added to party Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A Sherman added to party John Bohm, M.D.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A Sherman added to party Karapet Dermendjian, Inc.(pty:pla))(Sherman, Michael)
April 28, 2015 Filing 34 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Case called, and counsel make their appearance. Court and counsel confer. For the reasons stated on the record, the Second Stipulation for Order re Filing of Amended Complaint #33 is DENIED. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Rosalyn Adams. (cw)
April 28, 2015 Filing 33 Second STIPULATION for Order Re: Filing of Amended Complaint, Time to File Motion or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint, and Setting Briefing Schedule on any Motion Filed To Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Pacific Maritime Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Belzer, Aaron)
April 23, 2015 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney D Ward Kallstrom, Jr counsel for Defendants ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan, James C McKenna, Pacific Maritime Association, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. Filed by Defendant ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan, Pacific Maritime Association, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. (Kallstrom, D)
April 23, 2015 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin J Lesinski counsel for Defendants ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan, James C McKenna, Pacific Maritime Association, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler. Filed by Defendants ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan, Pacific Maritime Association, James C McKenna, Robert L Stephens, Michael H Wechsler,. (Lesinski, Kevin)
April 22, 2015 Filing 30 (Attorney Kevin J Lesinski added to party ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin J Lesinski added to party James C McKenna(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin J Lesinski added to party Pacific Maritime Association(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin J Lesinski added to party Robert L Stephens(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin J Lesinski added to party Michael H Wechsler(pty:dft))(Lesinski, Kevin)
April 22, 2015 Filing 29 (Attorney D Ward Kallstrom, Jr added to party ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan(pty:dft), Attorney D Ward Kallstrom, Jr added to party James C McKenna(pty:dft), Attorney D Ward Kallstrom, Jr added to party Pacific Maritime Association(pty:dft), Attorney D Ward Kallstrom, Jr added to party Robert L Stephens(pty:dft), Attorney D Ward Kallstrom, Jr added to party Michael H Wechsler(pty:dft))(Kallstrom, D)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation Re: Filing of Amended Complaint, Time to File Motion or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint, and Settling Briefing Schedule on Any Motion Motion Filed in Response to Amended Complaint #24 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald that (1) Plaintiffs shall have up to and including April 30, 2015 to file andserve their Amended Complaint; (2) Defendants shall have up to and including June 1, 2015 to answer, file a motion, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint; (3) Plaintiffs shall have up to and including June 15, 2015 to file any opposition to any motion filed by Defendants in response to the Amended Complaint; (4) Defendants shall have up to and including June 29, 2015 to file any reply in support of any motion filed by Defendants in response to the Amended Complaint; (5) Defendants shall set the hearing on any motion filed by Defendants in response to the Amended Complaint for July 20, 2015 at 10:00 AM. (jp)
April 17, 2015 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eleanor Morton on behalf of Defendant ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan (Attorney Eleanor Morton added to party ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan(pty:dft))(Morton, Eleanor)
April 17, 2015 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lindsay R Nicholas on behalf of Defendant ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan (Attorney Lindsay R Nicholas added to party ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan(pty:dft))(Nicholas, Lindsay)
April 17, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christine S Hwang on behalf of Defendant ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan (Attorney Christine S Hwang added to party ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan(pty:dft))(Hwang, Christine)
April 16, 2015 Filing 24 Joint STIPULATION to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Joint Stipulation Re Filing of Amended Complaint, Time to File Motion or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint, and Setting Briefing Schedule on any Motion Filed in Response to Amended Complaint ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan, Pacific Maritime Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Aaron Belzer added to party ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Belzer added to party Pacific Maritime Association(pty:dft))(Belzer, Aaron)
April 3, 2015 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Zenith American Solutions, Inc., re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #22 served on 04/03/2015. (Humbert, Charles)
April 1, 2015 Filing 22 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Zenith American Solutions, Inc. answer now due 5/1/2015, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant Zenith American Solutions, Inc..(Attorney Charles Mark Humbert added to party Zenith American Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Humbert, Charles)
March 31, 2015 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant TC3 Health, Inc., re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #18 served on March 31, 2015. (Capozzola, Damian)
March 31, 2015 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, upon Defendant Pacific Maritime Association served on 3/23/2015, answer due 4/13/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Pacific Maritime Association, an Association, Substituted Service Accepted by Ruben Lastra, Director of Office Services, Authorized to Accept on Behalf of D. Ward Kallstrom, Esq. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed. Original Summons NOT returned. (Sherman, Michael)
March 31, 2015 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, upon Defendant ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan served on 3/23/2015, answer due 4/13/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Erroneously Sued as "ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan, an Employee Health and Welfare Plan Formed Pursuant to and Subject to the Employee Retirement Income Security Act"), Substituted Service Accepted by Ruben Lastra, Director of Office Services, Authorized to Accept on Behalf of D. Ward Kallstrom, Esq. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed. Original Summons NOT returned. (Sherman, Michael)
March 31, 2015 Filing 18 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Defendant TC3 Health, Inc..(Capozzola, Damian)
March 31, 2015 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, upon Defendant James C. McKenna Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James C. McKenna, Individually and in his Capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan, Substituted Service Accepted by Ruben Lastra, Director of Office Services, Authorized to Accept on Behalf of D. Ward Kallstrom, Esq. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed. Original Summons NOT returned. (Sherman, Michael) Modified on 4/1/2015 (jloz).
March 31, 2015 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, upon Defendant Robert L. Stephens(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan) served on 3/23/2015, answer due 4/13/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robert L. Stephens, Individually and in his Capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan, Substituted Service Accepted by Ruben Lastra, Director of Office Services, Authorized to Accept on Behalf of D. Ward Kallstrom, Esq. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed. Original Summons NOT returned. (Sherman, Michael)
March 31, 2015 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, upon Defendant Michael H Wechsler served on 3/23/2015, answer due 4/13/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael H. Wechsler, Individually and in his Capacity as Trustee of ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan, Substituted Service Accepted by Ruben Lastra, Director of Office Services, Authorized to Accept on Behalf of D. Ward Kallstrom, Esq. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Sherman, Michael)
March 31, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant TC3 Health, Inc., identifying Adminisource Communications, Inc.; Advanced Business Fulfillment, LLC; Capario, Inc.; Chamberlin Edmonds & Associates, Inc.; Change Healthcare Corporation; Chapin Revenue Cycle Management, LLC; Dakota Imaging LLC; Emdeon, Inc.; Emdeon Business Services LLC: Envoy LLC; EquiClaim LLC; eRx Network L.L.C.; eRx Network Canada, Inc.; Express Bill LLC; Goold Health Systems; Healthcare Technology Management Services LLC; IXT Solutions Inc., Kinetra LLC; MedE America of Ohio LLC, Medi LLC; Medi-Fax-EDI, LLC; Vieosoft, Inc.. (Capozzola, Damian)
March 31, 2015 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Damian D Capozzola counsel for Defendant TC3 Health, Inc.. Adding Damian Dominick Capozzola as attorney as counsel of record for TC3 Health, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant TC3 Health, Inc.. (Attorney Damian D Capozzola added to party TC3 Health, Inc.(pty:dft))(Capozzola, Damian)
March 27, 2015 Filing 12 OF SERVICE filed by defendant CIGNA, Inc., re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #11 PROOF OF SERVICE served on 3/27/15. (Loose, Timothy)
March 27, 2015 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to CIGNA, Inc. answer now due 5/1/2015, filed by defendant CIGNA, Inc..(Attorney Timothy William Loose added to party CIGNA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Loose, Timothy)
March 24, 2015 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, upon Defendant CIGNA, Inc. served on 3/11/2015, answer due 4/1/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mary Foran, Information Specialist, CT Corporation, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Sherman, Michael)
March 24, 2015 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, upon Defendant Zenith American Solutions, Inc. served on 3/12/2015, answer due 4/2/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gwen Butler, Authorized Representative, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Sherman, Michael)
March 22, 2015 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, upon Defendant TC3 Health, Inc. served on 3/11/2015, answer due 4/1/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kirstin Edralin, Registered Agent, CT Corporation System in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Sherman, Michael)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV14-02139 MWF (VBKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal and Judge Stephen V. Wilson to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV15-01403 MWF (VBKx). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (mg)
February 27, 2015 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants CIGNA, Inc., ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan, James C McKenna(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan), James C McKenna(individually), Pacific Maritime Association, Robert L Stephens(in his capacity as a Trustee of ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan), Robert L Stephens(individually), TC3 Health, Inc., Michael H Wechsler, Michael H Weechsler, Zenith American Solutions, Inc.. (ghap)
February 27, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (ghap)
February 26, 2015 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Sherman, Michael)
February 26, 2015 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc.. (Sherman, Michael)
February 26, 2015 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo, Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc.. (Sherman, Michael)
February 26, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-15282555 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc., Kristen Andrich, Lorena Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Michael A Sherman added to party Kristen Andrich(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A Sherman added to party Lorena Armijo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A Sherman added to party Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc.(pty:pla))(Sherman, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lorena Armijo et al v. ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILWU-PMA Coastwise Indemnity Plan
Represented By: Lindsay R Nicholas
Represented By: Michael G Cross
Represented By: Eleanor Morton
Represented By: Aaron Belzer
Represented By: Christine S Hwang
Represented By: Peter W Saltzman
Represented By: Jonathan A Braunstein
Represented By: D Ward Kallstrom, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin J Lesinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy William Loose
Represented By: Richard Joseph Doren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Stephens
Represented By: Michael G Cross
Represented By: Christin J Hill
Represented By: Christopher Lee
Represented By: Kristen M Peters
Represented By: Jonathan A Braunstein
Represented By: D Ward Kallstrom, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph A Escarez
Represented By: Kevin J Lesinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael H Weechsler
Represented By: Jonathan A Braunstein
Represented By: Kevin J Lesinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C McKenna
Represented By: Michael G Cross
Represented By: Christin J Hill
Represented By: Christopher Lee
Represented By: Kristen M Peters
Represented By: Jonathan A Braunstein
Represented By: D Ward Kallstrom, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph A Escarez
Represented By: Kevin J Lesinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TC3 Health, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Roy Laquer
Represented By: E Steele Clayton, IV
Represented By: Brittain W Sexton
Represented By: Damian D Capozzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Maritime Association
Represented By: Michael G Cross
Represented By: Christin J Hill
Represented By: Aaron Belzer
Represented By: Christopher Lee
Represented By: Jonathan A Braunstein
Represented By: D Ward Kallstrom, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph A Escarez
Represented By: Kevin J Lesinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael H Wechsler
Represented By: Michael G Cross
Represented By: Christin J Hill
Represented By: Christopher Lee
Represented By: Kristen M Peters
Represented By: Jonathan A Braunstein
Represented By: D Ward Kallstrom, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph A Escarez
Represented By: Kevin J Lesinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan
Represented By: Eleanor Morton
Represented By: Daniel M Blouin
Represented By: Christin J Hill
Represented By: David Ta
Represented By: Christopher Lee
Represented By: Kristen M Peters
Represented By: Jonathan A Braunstein
Represented By: Joseph A Escarez
Represented By: Kevin J Lesinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenith American Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Horace Wade Green
Represented By: Charles Mark Humbert
Represented By: Neil Turner Medeiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorena Armijo
Represented By: Preston H Lim
Represented By: Michael D McClelland
Represented By: Sahar Baddry Adabzadeh
Represented By: Lisa S Serebin
Represented By: Esmeralda Arias Alfaro
Represented By: David S Gubman
Represented By: David S Harris
Represented By: Harris Lindley Cohen
Represented By: Michael A Sherman
Represented By: Joseph A Creitz
Represented By: Daniel A Rozansky
Represented By: Celina Christine Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella Armijo
Represented By: Preston H Lim
Represented By: Lisa S Serebin
Represented By: David S Harris
Represented By: Michael A Sherman
Represented By: Joseph A Creitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Andrich
Represented By: Preston H Lim
Represented By: Michael D McClelland
Represented By: Sahar Baddry Adabzadeh
Represented By: Lisa S Serebin
Represented By: Esmeralda Arias Alfaro
Represented By: David S Gubman
Represented By: David S Harris
Represented By: Michelle Chung
Represented By: Harris Lindley Cohen
Represented By: Michael A Sherman
Represented By: Joseph A Creitz
Represented By: Daniel A Rozansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karapet Dermendjian, Inc.
Represented By: Preston H Lim
Represented By: Lisa S Serebin
Represented By: David S Harris
Represented By: Michael A Sherman
Represented By: Joseph A Creitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bohm, M.D.
Represented By: Preston H Lim
Represented By: Lisa S Serebin
Represented By: David S Harris
Represented By: Michael A Sherman
Represented By: Joseph A Creitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Scognamillo
Represented By: David S Harris
Represented By: Michelle Chung
Represented By: Daniel A Rozansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Jurevich
Represented By: David S Harris
Represented By: Michelle Chung
Represented By: Daniel A Rozansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar I Leal, M.D.
Represented By: Preston H Lim
Represented By: Lisa S Serebin
Represented By: David S Harris
Represented By: Michael A Sherman
Represented By: Joseph A Creitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Mitchell
Represented By: Preston H Lim
Represented By: Lisa S Serebin
Represented By: David S Harris
Represented By: Michelle Chung
Represented By: Michael A Sherman
Represented By: Joseph A Creitz
Represented By: Daniel A Rozansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew Jurevich
Represented By: Preston H Lim
Represented By: Lisa S Serebin
Represented By: David S Harris
Represented By: Michael A Sherman
Represented By: Joseph A Creitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Scognamillo
Represented By: Preston H Lim
Represented By: Lisa S Serebin
Represented By: David S Harris
Represented By: Michael A Sherman
Represented By: Joseph A Creitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Mayer, M.D., Inc.
Represented By: Preston H Lim
Represented By: Michael D McClelland
Represented By: Sahar Baddry Adabzadeh
Represented By: Lisa S Serebin
Represented By: Esmeralda Arias Alfaro
Represented By: David S Gubman
Represented By: David S Harris
Represented By: Harris Lindley Cohen
Represented By: Michael A Sherman
Represented By: Joseph A Creitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Hills Laser and Surgical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Preston H Lim
Represented By: Lisa S Serebin
Represented By: David S Harris
Represented By: Michael A Sherman
Represented By: Joseph A Creitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Ronald G Dean
Represented By: Ronald Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?