December 20, 2018 |
Filing
337
AMENDED JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge Percy Anderson by Judge Percy Anderson. Pursuant to this Court's Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED: 1. Plaintiff Public Employees for Envir onmental Responsibility is dismissed for lack of standing. 2. Defendants Ben Drati, in his official capacity as Superintendent of the Santa Monica-Malibu Unified School District (the "District"), Melody Canady, the District's Assist ant Superintendent, and Jon Kean, Laurie Lieberman, Craig Foster, Maria Leon-Vazquez, Richard Tahvildaran-Jesswein, Oscar De La Torre, and Ralph Mechur, in their official capacities as members of the Santa Monica-Malibu Unified School District Board of Education (collectively "Defendants") are: (see documents for details). (mrgo)
|
September 1, 2016 |
Filing
307
JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge Percy Anderson, in favor of plaintiff America Unites for Kids against Craig Foster, Jan Maez, Jose Escarce, Laurie Lieberman, Maria Leon-Vazquez, Oscar De La Torre, Ralph Mechur, Richard Tahvildaran-Jesswein, Sandra Lyon Related to: Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law 306 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mrgo)
|
February 24, 2016 |
Filing
150
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich, re: Notice of Lodging, 149 . (mz)
|
December 21, 2015 |
Filing
76
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Percy Anderson: Before the Court is a Motion for Sanctions filed by defendants Sandra Lyon, Jan Maez, LaurieLieberman, Jose Escarce, Craig Foster, Maria Leon-Vazquez, Richard Tahvildaran-Jesswein, Oscar d e la Torre, and Ralph Mechur 68 . Defendants seek sanctions,up to and including terminating sanctions, against plaintiffs America Unites for Kids and Public Employees for Environmental Responsibility. Defendants' Motion for Sanctions 68 is gr anted in part, and denied in part. The Court will not issue terminating sanctions at this time. Instead, the Court imposes the lesser sanctions as detailed in this Order. The Court further orders that, no later than December 28, 2015, all samples gat hered during any unauthorized testing be turned over to Defendants' counsel. Defendants' counsel shall maintain custody of the samples pending further order of this Court. See document for details. Court Reporter: Shayna Montgomery. (smo)
|
September 30, 2015 |
Filing
67
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Percy Anderson: Before the Court is a Motion for Reconsideration filed by plaintiffs America Unites for Kids and Public Employees for Environmental Responsibility 63 . Plaintiffs seek reconsideration of a portion of th e Court's June 15, 2015 minute order denying the Motion to Dismiss filed by defendants Sandra Lyon, Jan Maez, Laurie Lieberman, Jose Escarce, Craig Foster, Maria Leon-Vazquez, Richard Tahvildaran-Jesswein, Oscar de la Torre, and Ralph Mechur. Pu rsuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for September 21, 2015, is vacated, and the matter taken off cal endar. The Court's phasing of discovery, and making the invasive testing of caulk dependent upon threshold evidence obtained from air and surface wipe testing, is within the Court's "broad discretion." The Court committed no clear error in phasing and limiting discovery as it has. The Court therefore denies Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration. See document for details. (smo)
|