AIG Property Casualty Company v. William H Cosby et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: AIG Property Casualty Company
Defendant: William H. Cosby and Janice Dickinson
Case Number: 2:2015cv04842
Filed: June 26, 2015
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Beverly Reid O'Connell
Referring Judge: Rozella A. Oliver
Nature of Suit: Insurance

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2015 12 Featured Case MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. On July 7, 2015, plaintiff AIG Property Casualty Company ("AIG Property") submitted an ex parte application for a protective order authorizing the continued redaction of portions of the insurance policies attached as exhibits to AIG Property's complaint, filed on June 26, 2015 (the "Complaint"). (ECF No. 11.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that AIG Property shall maintain the redactions in the AIG Property policies filed as exhibits to the Complaint in this action and shall not produce unredacted copies of these exhibits unless so ordered by this Court. 11 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (gr)
July 7, 2015 11 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff AIG Property Casualty Company. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Ex Parte Application for Protective Order, # 2 Declaration of James P. Wagoner In Support of Ex Parte Application for Protective Order, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of James P. Wagoner In Support of Ex Parte Application for Protective Order, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of James P. Wagoner In Support of Ex Parte Application for Protective Order, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of James P. Wagoner In Support of Ex Parte Application for Protective Order, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration of James P. Wagoner In Support of Ex Parte Application for Protective Order, # 7 Exhibit E to Declaration of James P. Wagoner In Support of Ex Parte Application for Protective Order, # 8 Exhibit F to Declaration of James P. Wagoner In Support of Ex Parte Application for Protective Order, # 9 Exhibit G to Declaration of James P. Wagoner In Support of Ex Parte Application for Protective Order, # 10 Proposed Order) (Wagoner, James)
June 30, 2015 10 Featured Case STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES upon filing of the complaint by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. All proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judge's Chambers email at BRO_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judge's procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (rfi)
June 29, 2015 9 Featured Case ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 14-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as CV15-04842 BRO (RAOx). (mg)
June 26, 2015 8 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions Or Proceedings filed by Plaintiff AIG Property Casualty Company. (Wagoner, James)
June 26, 2015 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendants William H. Cosby, Janice Dickinson. (rn)
June 26, 2015 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (rn)
June 26, 2015 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (rn)
June 26, 2015 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 3 filed by Plaintiff AIG Property Casulaty Company. (Attachments: # 1 Summons of Dickinson)(Wagoner, James)
June 26, 2015 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff AIG Property Casulaty Company, identifying American International Group, Inc.. (Wagoner, James)
June 26, 2015 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff AIG Property Casulaty Company. (Wagoner, James)
June 26, 2015 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-15982178 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff AIG Property Casulaty Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C to Complaint) (Attorney James P Wagoner added to party AIG Property Casulaty Company(pty:pla))(Wagoner, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIG Property Casualty Company v. William H Cosby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: Lejf Edwin Knutson
Represented By: Graham Van Leuven
Represented By: James P Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H. Cosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?