Joseph Tierney v. Moschino S.p.A. et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Tierney
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive, Moschino S.p.A. and Jeremy Scott
Case Number: 2:2015cv05900
Filed: August 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The further status conference scheduled for 12/19/2016 at 1:30 PM is VACATED and OFF-CALENDAR, as it was set in error. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 15, 2016 Filing 73 SCHEDULING NOTICE A Further Status Conference is set for 1/9/2017 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 22, 2016 Filing 72 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Order of dismissal) (mrgo)
July 22, 2016 Filing 71 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Order of dismissal) (mrgo)
July 22, 2016 Filing 70 STIPULATED DISMISSAL by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, IT IS SO ORDERED. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo)
July 22, 2016 Filing 69 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney.(Patterson, S)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: In light of the notice of settlement, and the response thereto, the hearing on the Motion for Summary Judgment #56 is continued to August 15, 2016. A status conference regarding the settlement is set for July 25, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. The parties are advised that the motion hearing and the status conference will be vacated and no appearance will be required provided that a Stipulation to Dismiss is filed no later than July 22, 2016. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 29, 2016 Filing 67 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Moschino S.p.A.to Notice of Settlement #66 (Veverka, Charles)
June 29, 2016 Filing 66 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney. (Patterson, S)
June 27, 2016 Filing 65 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Jeremy Scott filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney.(Patterson, S)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Proceedings: Order Deferring Ruling on Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment #56 . The hearing scheduled for Monday, May 23, 2016 is CONTINUED to Monday, July 11, 2016 at 01:30 PM. (mg)
May 9, 2016 Filing 63 DEFENDANTS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS AND REQUEST TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE DECLARATIONS OF JOSEPH TIERNEY, JESSE CORY, AND DANIEL ARMAND SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendant Moschino S.p.A. re: Reply (Motion related), #62 (Veverka, Charles)
May 9, 2016 Filing 62 REPLY in Support Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Complaint #56 filed by Defendant Moschino S.p.A.. (Attachments: #1 Reply to Statement of Genuine Issues in Opposition, #2 Responses to Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections and Request to Strike, #3 Declaration of Elizabeth Mattie, #4 Declaration of Quincy J. Chuck)(Veverka, Charles)
May 9, 2016 Filing 61 REPLY in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Complaint #56 filed by Defendant Jeremy Scott. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Declaration of John Tehranian, #3 Declaration of Quincy Chuck, #4 Exhibit A to Chuck Decl., #5 Exhibit B to Chuck Decl., #6 Exhibit C to Chuck Decl., #7 Exhibit D to Chuck Decl., #8 Exhibit E to Chuck Decl.)(Tehranian, John)
May 4, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #59 . The following error was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Requests / Order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mg)
May 3, 2016 Filing 59 FRCP 56(d) Request for Discovery in opposition re: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Complaint #56 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney. (Patterson, S)
May 2, 2016 Filing 58 Opposition in opposition re: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Complaint #56 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Joseph Tierney, #2 Declaration Declaration of Jesse Cory, #3 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Armand, #4 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey Gluck, #5 Declaration Declaration of David Erikson, #6 Supplement Evidentiary Objections, #7 Supplement Separate Statement of Genuine Issues)(Patterson, S)
April 19, 2016 Filing 57 NOTICE of Settlement-in-Principle and Stipulation to Stay All Future Dates filed by Defendant Moschino S.p.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Veverka, Charles)
April 18, 2016 Filing 56 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by defendants Moschino S.p.A., Jeremy Scott. Motion set for hearing on 5/23/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, #3 Declaration of Jeremy Scott, #4 Declaration of Elizabeth Mattie, #5 Declaration of John Tehranian, #6 Proposed Order/Judgment) (Tehranian, John)
February 19, 2016 Filing 55 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Answer to Complaint #51 . Inadvertently the incorrect party Jeremy Scott was selected as counter defendant. The correct counter defendant is Joseph Tierney. Corrections has been made to the docket entry as well as to the docket sheet. (lom)
February 17, 2016 Filing 54 Plaintiff Joseph Tierney's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant Moschino S.p.A. filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney.(Patterson, S)
January 29, 2016 Filing 53 Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Moschino S.p.A., identifying Aeffe, S.p.A.. (Chuck, Quincy)
January 28, 2016 Filing 52 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #51 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: There is no caption as to the counterclaim parties. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom)
January 27, 2016 COUNTERCLAIM against Counter Defendant Joseph Tierney; Jury Demand filed by Counterclaimant Moschino S.p.A. (Answer and Counterclaim are efiled as one document, see docket entry no. #51 .) (lom) Modified on 2/19/2016 (lom).
January 27, 2016 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Moschino S.p.A..(Chuck, Quincy)
January 27, 2016 Filing 50 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 JURY DEMAND. filed by defendant Jeremy Scott.(Tehranian, John)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO DISMISS #14 #18 ; DENYING MOTIONS TO STRIKE #13 #19 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. In accordance with the foregoing, the Court DENIES Defendants' motions to dismiss and DENIES Defendants' special motions to strike. However, the Court finds that many of the aforementioned issues, along with Defendants' affirmative defenses, may be suitable for determination on an expedited basis. Therefore, the Court sets the following briefing schedule: Defendants shall file motions for summary judgment by Monday, April 18, 2016. Plaintiff shall file his oppositions by Monday, May 2, 2016. Defendants shall file their replies by Monday, May 9, 2016. The hearing on the motions shall be on Monday, May 23, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. (lom)
January 11, 2016 Filing 48 MINUTES OF #13 MOTION to Strike Unfair Competition; #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Jeremy Scott; #18 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Moschino S.p.A. Moschino S.p.A; #19 MOTION to Strike Complaint filed by Defendant Moschino S.p.A. Moschino S.p.A held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The motions are submitted. Order to issue. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (lom)
January 11, 2016 Filing 47 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Antoinette S Waller counsel for Plaintiff Joseph Tierney. Adding Antoinette Waller as counsel of record for Joseph Tierney for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney. (Attorney Antoinette S Waller added to party Joseph Tierney(pty:pla))(Waller, Antoinette)
January 7, 2016 Filing 46 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Quincy Justin Chuck counsel for Defendant Moschino S.p.A.. Adding Quincy Justin Chuck as counsel of record for Moschino, S.P.A. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Moschino, S.P.A.. (Attorney Quincy Justin Chuck added to party Moschino S.p.A.(pty:dft))(Chuck, Quincy)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue hearing on motions from 12/21/15 to 1/11/16 #44 is granted. Hearing on #13 MOTION to Strike Unfair Competition, Violation of Cal. Civil Code 3344 and Negligence Claims pursuant to Cal. Civ. Proc. Code 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP Statute) re Complaint filed by defendant Jeremy Scott; #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by defendant Jeremy Scott; #18 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Moschino S.p.A. Moschino S.p.A; and #19 MOTION to Strike Complaint Pursuant to Cal. Civ. Proc. Code 425.16 Complaint filed by Defendant Moschino S.p.A. Moschino S.p.Afiled by Defendant Moschino S.p.A. is continued to 01/11/2016 at 1:30 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 17, 2015 Filing 44 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue hearing on motions from 12/21/15 to 1/11/16 Re: Notice of Motion, #23 , Notice of Motion, #24 , Notice (Other) #26 , Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 34 , Notice (Other) #25 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration David Erikson) (Patterson, S)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #41 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark W. Ford on behalf of Defendant Moschino S.P.A., designating Tyson K. Hottinger as local counsel. (lt)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #40 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles James Veverka on behalf of Defendant Moschino S.P.A., designating Tyson K. Hottinger as local counsel. (lt)
December 11, 2015 Filing 41 APPLICATION for attorney Mark W. Ford to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16932280 paid.) filed by Defendant Moschino S.p.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hottinger, Tyson)
December 11, 2015 Filing 40 APPLICATION for attorney Charles J. Veverka to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16931817 paid.) filed by Defendant Moschino S.p.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hottinger, Tyson)
December 7, 2015 Filing 39 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #18 filed by Defendant Moschino S.p.A.. (Hottinger, Tyson)
December 7, 2015 Filing 38 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint Pursuant to Cal. Civ. Proc. Code 425.16 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #19 filed by Defendant Moschino S.p.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Maria Cristina Baldini)(Hottinger, Tyson)
December 7, 2015 Filing 37 DECLARATION of John Tehranian in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #14 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Unfair Competition, Violation of Cal. Civil Code 3344 and Negligence Claims pursuant to Cal. Civ. Proc. Code 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP Statute) re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #13 (Supplemental Declaration) filed by Defendant Jeremy Scott. (Tehranian, John)
December 7, 2015 Filing 36 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Unfair Competition, Violation of Cal. Civil Code 3344 and Negligence Claims pursuant to Cal. Civ. Proc. Code 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP Statute) re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #13 filed by Defendant Jeremy Scott. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Maria Cristina Baldini)(Tehranian, John)
December 7, 2015 Filing 35 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #14 filed by Defendant Jeremy Scott. (Tehranian, John)
December 4, 2015 Filing 34 SCHEDULING NOTICE re: MOTION to Strike Complaint Pursuant to Cal. Civ. Proc. Code 425.16 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #19 ; MOTION to Dismiss Case #18 ; MOTION to Strike Unfair Competition, Violation of Cal. Civil Code 3344 and Negligence Claims pursuant to Cal. Civ. Proc. Code 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP Statute) re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #13 , and MOTION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #14 : Hearing on the motions scheduled for 12/07/2015 at 1:30 p.m. has been rescheduled to 12/21/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 30, 2015 Filing 33 re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint Pursuant to Cal. Civ. Proc. Code 425.16 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #19 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Unfair Competition, Violation of Cal. Civil Code 3344 and Negligence Claims pursuant to Cal. Civ. Proc. Code 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP Statute) re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #13 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey Gluck, #2 Declaration Declaration of Joseph Tierney, #3 Declaration Declaration of David Erikson)(Patterson, S)
November 30, 2015 Filing 32 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #18 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #14 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David Erikson)(Patterson, S)
November 24, 2015 Filing 31 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Jeremy Scott. correcting Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #30 (Attachments: #1 Defendant Jeremy Scott's Amended/Corrected Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application)(Tehranian, John)
November 24, 2015 Filing 30 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue hearing on motions from December 21, 2015 Re: Declaration (Motion related), #21 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #14 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Str #27 filed by Defendant Jeremy Scott. (Tehranian, John)
November 24, 2015 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Peter R Afrasiabi counsel for Defendant Jeremy Scott. Adding Peter R. Afrasiabi as counsel of record for Defendant Jeremy Scott for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Jeremy Scott. (Attorney Peter R Afrasiabi added to party Jeremy Scott(pty:dft))(Afrasiabi, Peter)
November 23, 2015 Filing 28 NOTICE of Taking Deposition filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Patterson, S)
November 23, 2015 Filing 27 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue hearing on motions from December 21, 2015 Re: Declaration (Motion related), #21 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #14 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Unfair Competition, Violation of Cal. Civil Code 3344 and Negligence Claims pursuant to Cal. Civ. Proc. Code 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP Statute) re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #13 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #18 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint Pursuant to Cal. Civ. Proc. Code 425.16 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #19 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration David Erikson, #2 Notice of Request to Cross-Examine Declarants, #3 Proposed Order) (Patterson, S)
November 5, 2015 Filing 26 NOTICE Amended Notice of Hearing on Defendant Moschino's Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b)(6) filed by Defendant Moschino S.p.A.. (Hottinger, Tyson)
November 5, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE Amended Notice of Hearing on Defendant Moschino's Motion to Strike Complaint Pursuant to Cal. Civ. proc. Code Section 425.16 filed by Defendant Moschino S.p.A.. (Hottinger, Tyson)
October 30, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #14 (Amending Hearing Date) filed by Defendant Jeremy Scott. Motion set for hearing on 12/21/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Tehranian, John)
October 30, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Unfair Competition, Violation of Cal. Civil Code 3344 and Negligence Claims pursuant to Cal. Civ. Proc. Code 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP Statute) re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #13 (Amending Hearing Date) filed by Defendant Jeremy Scott. Motion set for hearing on 12/21/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Tehranian, John)
October 29, 2015 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #18 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint Pursuant to Cal. Civ. Proc. Code 425.16 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #19 filed by Defendant Moschino S.p.A.. (Hottinger, Tyson)
October 29, 2015 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Massimo Ferretti In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #18 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint Pursuant to Cal. Civ. Proc. Code 425.16 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #19 filed by Defendant Moschino S.p.A.. (Hottinger, Tyson)
October 29, 2015 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Tyson K. Hottinger In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #18 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint Pursuant to Cal. Civ. Proc. Code 425.16 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #19 filed by Defendant Moschino S.p.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hottinger, Tyson)
October 29, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint Pursuant to Cal. Civ. Proc. Code 425.16 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Moschino S.p.A. Moschino S.p.A.. Motion set for hearing on 12/7/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hottinger, Tyson)
October 29, 2015 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Moschino S.p.A. Moschino S.p.A.. Motion set for hearing on 12/7/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Tyson K Hottinger added to party Moschino S.p.A.(pty:dft)) (Hottinger, Tyson)
October 29, 2015 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Jeremy Scott, (Tehranian, John)
October 29, 2015 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Tyson K. Hottinger in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #14 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Unfair Competition, Violation of Cal. Civil Code 3344 and Negligence Claims pursuant to Cal. Civ. Proc. Code 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP Statute) re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #13 filed by Defendant Jeremy Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Tehranian, John)
October 29, 2015 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #14 filed by Defendant Jeremy Scott. (Tehranian, John)
October 29, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by defendant Jeremy Scott. Motion set for hearing on 12/7/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Tehranian, John)
October 29, 2015 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Unfair Competition, Violation of Cal. Civil Code 3344 and Negligence Claims pursuant to Cal. Civ. Proc. Code 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP Statute) re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Jeremy Scott. Motion set for hearing on 12/7/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jeremy Scott, #3 Declaration of Massimo Ferretti, #4 Proposed Order) (Tehranian, John)
September 28, 2015 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jeremy Scott answer now due 10/29/2015, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Jeremy Scott.(Attorney John Tehranian added to party Jeremy Scott(pty:dft))(Tehranian, John)
September 22, 2015 Filing 11 RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: mailed to Moschino S.p.A., via San Gregorio 28, Milan, MI 20124, Italy on 9/22/2015. (gk)
September 10, 2015 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney, upon Defendant Jeremy Scott served on 9/8/2015, answer due 9/29/2015. in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Patterson, S)
August 7, 2015 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Moschino S.p.A., Jeremy Scott. (pj)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 6, 2015 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Tierney. (Patterson, S)
August 5, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (et)
August 5, 2015 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Joseph Tierney. (Patterson, S)
August 5, 2015 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Joseph Tierney. (Patterson, S)
August 5, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney, (Patterson, S)
August 5, 2015 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney. (Patterson, S)
August 5, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16208156 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney S Ryan Patterson added to party Joseph Tierney(pty:pla))(Patterson, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph Tierney v. Moschino S.p.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moschino S.p.A.
Represented By: Charles J Veverka
Represented By: Tyson K Hottinger
Represented By: Quincy Justin Chuck
Represented By: Mark W Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Scott
Represented By: John Tehranian
Represented By: Peter R Afrasiabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Tierney
Represented By: David A Erikson
Represented By: S Ryan Patterson
Represented By: Antoinette S Waller
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gluck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?