Sensa Products v. Alan Hirsch, et al
Plaintiff: |
Sensa Products |
Defendant: |
Does and Alan Hirsch |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv07117 |
Filed: |
September 9, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Charles F. Eick |
Presiding Judge: |
George H. King |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 31, 2017 |
Filing
35
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, 34 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (pso)
|
December 22, 2016 |
Filing
29
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS by Judge George H. King. On June 8, 2016, we issued our scheduling order in which we directed the parties to comply with Local Rule 16-15 by no later than December 19, 2016. We specifically ordered th e parties to ensure that they clear a date for settlement conference with Magistrate Judge Charles Eick that complies with the foregoing deadline. We further ordered counsel to file a joint status report with the court within 48 hours of terminati on of settlement discussions. It appears that no activities have occurred in this case since June 16, 2016 when Plaintiff filed its initial disclosures (Dkt. No. 28). We are advised that the parties have failed to clear a date for settlement confer ence with Judge Eick by December 19, 2016, or any at all. In fact, to date there has been no settlement conference before Judge Eick. Moreover, no post-settlement conference joint status report has been filed. Accordingly, Plaintiff and its counsel and defendant Alan Hirsch, in pro per, shall all SHOW CAUSE, in writing, within 10 days hereof, why each should not be sanctioned for its/his failure to comply with our June 8,2016 scheduling order as set forth above. Failure to timely and adequa tely show cause as required herein will result in the imposition of an appropriate sanction against the offending party or counsel, including terminating sanctions against the plaintiff, the entry of default against the defendant, and/or an appropriate monetary sanction against the offending party or counsel. (pso)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?