Guangyi Xu v. ChinaCache International Holdings Ltd et al

Plaintiff: Guangyi Xu
Defendant: Jing An, ChinaCache International Holdings Ltd, Song Wang and Ken Vincent Qingshi Zhang
Case Number: 2:2015cv07952
Filed: October 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Referring Judge: Rozella A. Oliver
Presiding Judge: Christina A. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTES OF Hearing on Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Indicative Ruling Supporting Fed.R.Civ.P. 62.1(a)(3) Regarding the Court's Willingness to Entertain Motions for Approval of Class Settlement 59 held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court finds that the circumstances of this case are appropriate for an indicative ruling. In order to facilitate a limited remand from the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals in Guangyi Xu v. ChinaCache Intl. Holdings Ltd., et al, (9th Cir. No. 17-552 95), the Court hereby issues an INDICATIVE RULING with respect to the proposed class settlement. Plaintiff's motion for an indicative ruling demonstrates that the proposed settlement raises substantial issues to be adjudicated, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1(a)(3), and the Court certifies that it would hear plaintiff's motion for preliminary approval of the proposed settlement if the Ninth Circuit chooses to remand. Plaintiff shall promptly notify the Ninth Circuit clerk of this ruling. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder RE: ChinaCache's Motion to Dismiss 46 . Defendant ChinaCache International Holdings Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. If plaintiff chooses to amend, plaintiff shall file the Third Amended Complaint on or before 1/30/2017. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTES OF DEFENDANT CHINACACHE'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (Dkt. 32 , filed April 4, 2016) Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: In accordance with the foregoing the Court GRANTS with out prejudice defendants motion to dismiss plaintiffs first amended complaint. Plaintiff is hereby granted thirty (30) days in which to file an amended complaint addressing the deficiencies identified herein. Failure to file an amended complaint may result in dismissal with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (clee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guangyi Xu v. ChinaCache International Holdings Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jing An
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChinaCache International Holdings Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Song Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Vincent Qingshi Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guangyi Xu
Represented By: Laurence M Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?