Moroccanoil, Inc. v. Groupon, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: |
Moroccanoil, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Does and Groupon, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv08078 |
Filed: |
October 14, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Andre Birotte |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael R. Wilner |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 27, 2017 |
Filing
156
PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST STAR BEST BUY INC. AND BEAUTY IT IS INC. filed by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation 155 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDICATED that a permanent injunction is hereby entered prohibiting Defendants Star Best Buy In c., a New York corporation, and Beauty It Is Inc., a New York corporation, (jointly and severally referred to as "Star/Beauty") as to Moroccanoil products, trademarks and trade dress, etc. This permanent injunction is the sole and final Jud gment against Star/Beauty. The Court hereby dismisses with prejudice all other claims against Star/Beauty from this action with prejudice; however, this Court retains exclusive jurisdiction for purposes of enforcement of this permanent injunction. Each Star/Beauty and Moroccanoil shall each bear its own attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses incurred in or relating to this action. See document for further details. (gk)
|
February 14, 2017 |
Filing
153
CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation 152 , Plaintiff Moroccanoil, Inc. ("Moroccanoil"), and Defendants Binyomin Lubin ("Lubin") and Benz Dealz LLC ("Benz Dealz") shall b ear their own respective costs and attorneys' fees in this action. This Consent Judgment shall constitute the sole final judgment of all claims between Moroccanoil, on the one hand, and Lubin and Benz Dealz, on the other hand, arising out of or related to Lubin and/or Benz Dealz's sale and disposition of the Accused Products, inclusive of all legal and equitable remedies. See document for injunction re MOROCCANOIL trademark, etc. (gk)
|
October 5, 2016 |
Filing
107
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before October 19, 2016,why this action should not be dismisse d for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of Plaintiff(s) response. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause will be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. (iv)
|
June 22, 2016 |
Filing
71
(IN CHAMBERS) Order To Show Cause Regarding Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before July 6, 2016, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of Plaintiff(s) response. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause will be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. (iv)
|
April 12, 2016 |
Filing
51
CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr in favor of Moroccanoil, Inc. against Pearl Enterprises, LLC Related to: Stipulation for Judgment 50 (bm)
|
February 19, 2016 |
Filing
31
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Order for details) re Stipulation for Protective Order 27 (vm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?