Phillips 66 Company v. Santa Mariah Corp. et al
Plaintiff: |
Phillips 66 Company |
Defendant: |
Rafeek Iskander and Santa Mariah Corp. |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv00945 |
Filed: |
February 10, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Fernando M. Olguin |
Presiding Judge: |
Sheri Pym |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 10, 2017 |
Filing
38
JUDGMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin that: (1) Default judgment shall be entered in favor of plaintiff and against defendant Santa Mariah Corporation in the total amount of $259,320.55, plus.59% post-judgment interest. (2) All claims for relief against defendant Rafeek Iskander are dismissed with prejudice. (3) Plaintiff shall serve defendants with a copy of this Judgment in such a manner as to make it operative in any future proceedings. (jp)
|
July 11, 2016 |
Filing
32
ORDER REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD by Judge Fernando M. Olguin that: (1) All pending motions are denied without prejudice. (2) This action shall be removed from this court active caseload until further application by the parties or order of the court. The court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party in the action. (3) Counsel shall file a joint status report with the court on 9/1/2016, and every one-hundred and twenty (120) days thereafter until completion of the bankruptcy proceedings. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
|
April 27, 2016 |
Filing
20
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL RE: LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before May 4, 2016, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecuti on. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b), the court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of plaintiff's response, if plaintiff/defendant files: An answer by the following defendant(s): Santa Mariah Corp.; Plaintiff's application for entry of default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a): Santa Mariah Corp. on or before the date indicated above, the court will consider this a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. (jloz)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?