British Broadcasting Corporation et al v. Scott Stander et al
Plaintiff: British Broadcasting Corporation, BBC Worldwide, Ltd., DWTS Productions, LLC and BBC Worldwide Productions, LLC
Defendant: Scott Stander, The Stander Group, Inc. and Scott Stander & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01935
Filed: March 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2017 Filing 78 CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that: (1) The DWTS Marks Are Valid And Enforceable. The DWTS Marks are famous, valid, and enforceable. (2) Permanent Injunction Against SS and A. SS and A, and all of its agents, employees, representatives, customers, successors, assigns, attorneys, and all other persons acting for, with, by, through, or under authority from SS and A, or in concert or participation with SS&A, shall immediately and permanently cease and refrain. (3) SS and A shall pay the BBC Entities the agreed upon sum by the date set forth in the Settlement Agreement. (SEE ATTACHMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (jp)
June 26, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction)(Hwang, Rex)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: The Stipulation to Extend Time to Re-Open Action if Settlement Is Not Consummated #75 is GRANTED. The Parties shall have until 6/29/2017 to re-open the action if settlement is not consummated. (cw)
May 30, 2017 Filing 75 Joint STIPULATION for Order Extending Time to Re-Open Action if Settlement is Not Consummated filed by Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hwang, Rex)
April 19, 2017 Filing 73 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Justin Thiele at jthiele@glaserweil.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court recorder. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Request for Transcript of Sealed Settlement Conference)(Hwang, Rex)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting Request for Transcript of Sealed Settlement Conference by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: granting #71 REQUEST for Order. (sp)
April 18, 2017 Filing 71 REQUEST for Order for Release of Transcript of Sealed Settlement Conference filed by Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hwang, Rex)
March 31, 2017 Filing 70 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing). (Attachments: #1 Order Dismissing Action) (jp)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin that the instant action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 60 days from the filing date of this Order, to re-open the action if settlement is not consummated. The court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin Re: Answer and Counterclaim #64 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): incorrectly docketed. (vdr)
March 29, 2017 Filing 68 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. Case called. Counsel make their appearances. The Court hears discussion. Parties retire to chambers to proceed with the settlement conference. Settlement is reached. Court Recorder: Courtsmart. (sp)
March 29, 2017 Filing 66 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer and Counterclaim #64 . The following error(s) was found: (1) Defendant failed to answer the question correctly during docketing re counterclaim. (2) Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (jp)
March 28, 2017 Filing 65 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: denying #59 APPLICATION to Seal Document. "BBC's Application for Leave to File Documents Under Seal," filed 3/21/17, is denied. (sp)
March 27, 2017 Filing 64 [DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN] ANSWER to Amended Complaint #30 JURY DEMAND. Answer and Counter-Complaint filed by Defendant The Stander Group, Inc.(Babos, Peter) Modified on 3/30/2017 (vdr).
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR THE DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANTS SCOTT STANDER AND THE STANDER GROUP, INC #62 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, the Court hereby orders the following: (1) The deadline for fact discovery is extended to April 13, 2017, for the sole purpose of allowing the BBC Entities to take the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of Defendant The Stander Group, Inc. on April 12, 2017 and the deposition of Defendant Scott Stander on April 13, 2017; (2) No other deadlines in this action will be altered by this stipulation. (jp)
March 24, 2017 Filing 62 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Discovery Deadline Solely for the Depositions of Defendants Scott Stander and The Stander Group, Inc. filed by Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica)
March 22, 2017 Filing 61 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: denying #58 Ex Parte Application for Sanctions. Accordingly, the Application is denied without prejudice. Furthermore, to the extent Plaintiff continues to request potentially dispositive preclusion sanctions, Plaintiff's request should be directed to the District Judge in the first instance. The Magistrate Judge lacks authority to grant such relief, absent the consent of the litigants. Finally, the parties must comply with paragraph 4 of the Minute Order filed June 21, 2016, before pursuing any renewed motion or application. See Order for details. (dml)
March 21, 2017 Filing 60 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document Exhibit B to the Declaration of Rex Hwang ISO Ex Parte Application for Evidentiary and Monetary Sanctions under seal #59 filed by Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit B to the Declaration of Rex Hwang ISO Ex Parte Application for Evidentiary and Monetary Sanctions)(Hwang, Rex)
March 21, 2017 Filing 59 EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document Exhibit B to the Declaration of Rex Hwang ISO Ex Parte Application for Evidentiary and Monetary Sanctions under seal filed by Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Exhibit B to the Declaration of Rex Hwang ISO Ex Parte Application for Evidentiary and Monetary Sanctions, #2 Proposed Order)(Hwang, Rex)
March 21, 2017 Filing 58 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Sanctions Against Defendants The Stander Group, Inc. filed by Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rex Hwang, #2 Proposed Order)(Hwang, Rex)
March 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING MOTION #33 TO DISMISS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. The settlement conference is set for Wednesday, 3/29/17, at 1:30 p.m., in Courtroom 20, U.S. Courthouse, 312 N. Spring St., Los Angeles, CA. A settlement conference statement of each party must be submitted directly to the chambers of the settlement judge (Room 342), or, in the alternative, faxed directly to the chambers of the settlement judge (213-894-3335), no later than 5:00 p.m. on 3/22/17. (sp)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick re Stipulation for Protective Order #54 . (sp)
March 6, 2017 Filing 54 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica)
February 28, 2017 Filing 53 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. The Court has read and considered all papers filed in support of and in opposition to "Plaintiff British Broadcasting Corporation's Motion to Compel Interrogatory Responses and Production of Documents Against Defendant The Stander Group, Inc. and Request for Sanctions", filed 2/10/17. The previously noticed 3/3/17 hearing date is vacated. The Court has taken the Motion under submission without oral argument. Within 14 days of the date of this Order, TSG shall serve complete responses without objection to Document Requests Nos. 1-41, inclusive. At the same time, to the extent not done previously, TSG shall produce all documents within TSG's possession, custody or control responsive to those Document Requests. Prior to the production ordered herein, TSG shall in good faith undertake a reasonable and diligent search for responsive documents additional to the documents previously produced. (sp)
February 17, 2017 Filing 52 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff British Broadcasting Corporation re: MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses and Production of Documents #46 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brittany Elias)(Van Loon, Erica)
February 17, 2017 Filing 51 opposition Opposition re: MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses and Production of Documents #46 Exh 3 to Babos Decl filed by Defendant The Stander Group, Inc.. (Babos, Peter)
February 17, 2017 Filing 50 opposition opposition re: MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses and Production of Documents #46 Exh 2, Part 2 to Babos Decl filed by Defendant The Stander Group, Inc.. (Babos, Peter)
February 17, 2017 Filing 49 opposition opposition re: MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses and Production of Documents #46 Exh 2, Part 1 to Babos Decl filed by Defendant The Stander Group, Inc.. (Babos, Peter)
February 17, 2017 Filing 48 opposition re: MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses and Production of Documents #46 Exh 1 to Babos Decl. filed by Defendant The Stander Group, Inc.. (Babos, Peter)
February 17, 2017 Filing 47 SUPPLEMENT Brief in Opposition to Pl Motion to Compel filed by Defendant The Stander Group, Inc.. (Babos, Peter)
February 10, 2017 Filing 46 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses and Production of Documents filed by Plaintiff British Broadcasting Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2017 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation, #2 Declaration of Rex Hwang and Exhibits A-K, #3 Exhibit L (Part 1) to the Hwang Declaration, #4 Exhibit L (Part 2) to the Hwang Declaration, #5 Exhibit M-Q to the Hwang Declaration, #6 Exhibit R-U to the Hwang Declaration, #7 Exhibit V to the Hwang Declaration, #8 Exhibit W to the Hwang Declaration, #9 Declaration of Brittany Elias, #10 Declaration of Peter J. Babos, #11 Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica)
January 27, 2017 Filing 45 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brittany Marie Elias counsel for Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC. Adding Brittany Marie Elias as counsel of record for Plaintiffs British Broadcasting Corporation, BBC Worldwide, Ltd. and DWTS Productions, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs British Broadcasting Corporation, BBC Worldwide, Ltd. and DWTS Productions, LLC. (Attorney Brittany Marie Elias added to party BBC Worldwide, Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Brittany Marie Elias added to party British Broadcasting Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Brittany Marie Elias added to party DWTS Productions, LLC(pty:pla))(Elias, Brittany)
December 8, 2016 Filing 44 NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Effective December 15, 2016, Judge Olguin will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 6D on the 6th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 6D of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Jury Trial is set for 10/10/2017 at 8:15 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for deadlines and requirements imposed.* (vdr)
November 28, 2016 Filing 41 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC.. (Van Loon, Erica)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 12/8/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (jloz)
September 27, 2016 Filing 39 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss #33 is taken off the 9/29/2016 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 9/29/2016. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 15, 2016 Filing 38 REPLY to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant The Stander Group, Inc.. (Babos, Peter)
September 8, 2016 Filing 37 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #33 Plaintiffs' Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Action Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) And 12(b)(6) filed by Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G of Request for Judicial Notice)(Van Loon, Erica)
September 8, 2016 Filing 36 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #33 filed by Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erica J. Van Loon, #2 Exhibit 1-5 to the Van Loon Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica)
August 17, 2016 Filing 35 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Pursuant to the Notice of Errata #34 , the Motion to Dismiss #33 is reset for hearing to 9/29/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 16, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE Errata filed by Defendants The Stander Group, Inc.. (Babos, Peter)
August 15, 2016 Filing 33 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants The Stander Group, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/15/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration) (Babos, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2016: #3 Clearer Image of Motion) (vdr).
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, approving Stipulation #31 . (vdr)
August 8, 2016 Filing 31 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to Meet and Confer re Stander's Proposed Motion to Dismiss DWTS' Second Amended Complaint from August 8, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. to August 10, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. Re: Order #29 filed by Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica)
August 1, 2016 Filing 30 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Scott Stander & Associates, Inc., Scott Stander, The Stander Group, Inc., amending First Amended Complaint #18 with JURY DEMAND, filed by plaintiffs British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC, BBC Worldwide, Ltd. (jp)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION #28 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
July 29, 2016 Filing 28 Joint STIPULATION for Leave to to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A to Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants shall file their Answer to the First Amended Complaint or a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 no later than July 28, 2016. 2. In the event defendants wish to re-file their motion to dismiss, then counsel for the parties shall, on July 21, 2016, at 10:00 a.m., meet and confer in person at the offices of defendants' counsel to discuss defendants motion to dismiss. 3. Defendants are hereby advised that if they fail to file their Answer or Rule 12 motion by the deadline set forth above, default may be entered against defendants. In the event defendants do not file an Answer or Rule 12 motion by the deadline set forth above, then plaintiffs shall, after meeting and conferring with defendants' counsel, file an application for entry of default no later than August 4, 2016. (jloz)
July 8, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Scott Stander & Associates, Inc., Scott Stander, The Stander Group, Inc #24 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Defendant filed Opposition to the Request dated 7/7/2016. Plaintiff may submit an appropriate pleading for the Court's consideration with Proposed Default by Court and e-mailed to a Judge Olguin generic email addresses a WordPerfect or Microsoft Word version of the document. (jp)
July 7, 2016 Filing 25 Opposition Opposition re: APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Scott Stander & Associates, Inc., Scott Stander, The Stander Group, Inc. #24 filed by Defendant The Stander Group, Inc.. (Babos, Peter)
July 6, 2016 Filing 24 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Scott Stander & Associates, Inc., Scott Stander, The Stander Group, Inc. filed by Plaintiffs British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC, BBC Worldwide, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erica J. Van Loon, #2 Proposed Order) (Van Loon, Erica)
June 21, 2016 Filing 23 Opposition Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Defendants' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #20 #21 filed by Defendant The Stander Group, Inc.. (Babos, Peter)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION #21 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Having reviewed and considered all the briefing filed with respect to plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Strike Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #21 ), the court is troubled by the parties' apparent inability to engage in a good faith meet and confer process. Accordingly, the court hereby ORDERS as follows: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Document No. #20 ) is denied without prejudice for failure to meet and confer as required by Local Rule 7-3 and the Court's Order of May 9, 2016. (See Dkt. 17, Court's Order of May 9, 2016, at 3). Defendants shall file their Answer to the First Amended Complaint or a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 no later than June 27, 2016. Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Strike Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Document No. #21 ) is denied as moot. (jloz)
June 17, 2016 Filing 21 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Defendants' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #20 filed by Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rex Hwang, #2 Exhibit 1-3 to Hwang Declaration, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Strike) (Van Loon, Erica)
June 15, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants The Stander Group, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/28/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Babos, Peter)
May 26, 2016 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC, (Van Loon, Erica)
May 26, 2016 Filing 18 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Scott Stander, The Stander Group, Inc., Scott Stander & Associates, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC, BBC Worldwide, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-I)(Van Loon, Erica)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Document No. 14) is granted, and the hearing on defendants Motion, currently set for May 19, 2016, is hereby vacated. The Complaint (Dkt. 1) is dismissed with leave to amend. If plaintiffs still wish to pursue this action, they are granted until May 26, 2016, to file a First Amended Complaint attempting to cure, to the extent they believe is warranted by existing law, the alleged defects outlined in defendants Motion. (kss)
April 28, 2016 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 Plaintiffs' Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Opposition To Motion To Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E of Request for Judicial Notice)(Van Loon, Erica)
April 28, 2016 Filing 15 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 filed by Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erica J. Van Loon, #2 Exhibit 1-3 of the Van Loon Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica)
April 20, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant The Stander Group, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/19/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attorney Peter J Babos added to party The Stander Group, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Babos, Peter)
April 4, 2016 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC, BBC Worldwide, Ltd., upon Defendant The Stander Group, Inc. served on 3/30/2016, answer due 4/20/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Liliana Gomez, Assistant to Peter J. Babos, Esq., Attorney for Defendant The Stander Group, Inc., Authorized to Accept Service on Behalf of The Stander Group, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Van Loon, Erica)
April 4, 2016 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC, BBC Worldwide, Ltd., upon Defendant Scott Stander served on 3/30/2016, answer due 4/20/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Liliana Gomez, Assistant to Peter J. Babos, Esq., Attorney for Defendant Scott Stander, Authorized to Accept Service on Behalf of Scott Stander in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Van Loon, Erica)
March 31, 2016 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. All pleadings filed in this matter should contain the case number and the assigned judges' initials to ensure proper routing of documents. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV14-08047 FMO (Ex). Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV16-01935 FMO (Ex). Signed by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (mg)
March 22, 2016 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Scott Stander, The Stander Group, Inc. (car)
March 22, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
March 22, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
March 21, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC. Related Case(s): 2:14-cv-08047-FMO (Ex) (Van Loon, Erica)
March 21, 2016 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC. (Van Loon, Erica)
March 21, 2016 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC. (Van Loon, Erica)
March 21, 2016 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC, (Van Loon, Erica)
March 21, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs BBC Worldwide, Ltd., British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC. (Van Loon, Erica)
March 21, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-17501453 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs British Broadcasting Corporation, DWTS Productions, LLC, BBC Worldwide, Ltd.. (Attorney Erica J Van Loon added to party BBC Worldwide, Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Erica J Van Loon added to party British Broadcasting Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Erica J Van Loon added to party DWTS Productions, LLC(pty:pla))(Van Loon, Erica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: British Broadcasting Corporation et al v. Scott Stander et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: British Broadcasting Corporation
Represented By: Erica J Van Loon
Represented By: Rex Hwang
Represented By: Nicholas Edward Huskins
Represented By: Brittany Marie Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BBC Worldwide, Ltd.
Represented By: Erica J Van Loon
Represented By: Rex Hwang
Represented By: Nicholas Edward Huskins
Represented By: Brittany Marie Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DWTS Productions, LLC
Represented By: Erica J Van Loon
Represented By: Rex Hwang
Represented By: Nicholas Edward Huskins
Represented By: Brittany Marie Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BBC Worldwide Productions, LLC
Represented By: Erica J Van Loon
Represented By: Rex Hwang
Represented By: Nicholas Edward Huskins
Represented By: Brittany Marie Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Stander
Represented By: Peter J Babos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Stander Group, Inc.
Represented By: Peter J Babos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Stander & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Peter J Babos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?