SkyBus Jet Cargo Inc. v. Aergo International Pty Ltd et al
Plaintiff: SkyBus Jet Cargo Inc.
Defendant: Aergo International Pty Ltd and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2016cv02865
Filed: April 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2017 Filing 38 JUDGMENT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Defendant Aergo International PTY, Ltd.'s ("Defendant") Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Forum Non Conveniens ("Motion") was granted. Therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (cr)
April 5, 2017 Filing 37 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiff Skybus Jet Cargo Inc. re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #36 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended [Proposed] Judgment Granting Aergo International Pty Ltd's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Forum Non Conveniens)(Fischer, Michael)
March 3, 2017 Filing 36 AMENDED MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DIMSISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FORUM NON CONVENIENS (DKT. #13 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Motion is GRANTED, with the dismissal stayed for 30 days from the entry of this Order to permit Plaintiff to commence a new action in an appropriate forum while this action remains pending. Accordingly, counsel shall confer and lodge a proposed judgment by April 5, 2017. The notice shall indicated wh ether the parties agree upon the form of judgment or whether objections will be filed by April 12, 2017. #34 . (ake)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER RE SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT. #28 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. [See order for rulings] (ake)
March 3, 2017 Filing 34 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DIMSISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FORUM NON CONVENIENS (DKT. 13) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Motion is GRANTED, with the dismissal stayed for 30 days from the entry of this Order to permit Plaintiff to commence a new action in an appropriate forum while this action remains pending. Accordingly, counsel shall confer and lodge a proposed judgment by April 5, 2017. The notice shall indicated whether the parties agree upon the form of judgment or whether objections will be filed by April 12, 2017. (bp)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER NOTIFYING PARTIES OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR COURT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Effective December 19, 2016, Judge Kronstadt will relocate to the 1st Street Courthouse. His new address is 350 W. 1st Street, Courtroom 10B, Los Angeles, California 90012. All mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the mailbox for this Court outside the Clerk's Office, which is located on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 31, 2016 Filing 32 MINUTES OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FORUM NON CONVENIENS (DKT. 13) held before Judge John A. Kronstadt. The motion hearing is held. The Court states its tentative views that it is inclined to grant Specifically Appearing Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Forum Non Conveniens (the "Motion") on forum non conveniens grounds and, therefore, would not rule on the personal jurisdiction issue. Counsel address the Court. The Court takes the Motion UNDER SUBMISSION and a ruling will be issued. The scheduling conference is not held. The Court has reviewed the parties' October 21, 2016 Joint Report but defers setting dates until the ruling on the Motion is issued. Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (bp)
October 26, 2016 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Hernan Lopez in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Forum Non Conveniens; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #13 filed by Plaintiff SkyBus Jet Cargo Inc.. (Fischer, Michael)
October 26, 2016 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Supplemental Declaration of Nick Leach in support of Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Forum Non Conveniens; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #13 filed by Plaintiff SkyBus Jet Cargo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G to Supplemental Declaration of Leach, #2 Exhibit H to Supplemental Declaration of Leach, #3 Exhibit I to Supplemental Declaration of Leach, #4 Exhibit J to Supplemental Declaration of Leach)(Fischer, Michael)
October 21, 2016 Filing 29 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report, filed by Plaintiff SkyBus Jet Cargo Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fischer, Michael)
October 20, 2016 Filing 28 Objection in support of re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Forum Non Conveniens; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #13 SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Defendant Aergo International Pty Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Specially Appearing Defendant's Evidentiary Objections to Declarations Submitted by Plaintiff in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(McIntire, Ronald)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL TO COMPLY WITH STANDING ORDER 10.C.iii by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court has received Specially Appearing Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Declarations Submitted by Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #24 ). However, Defendants have failed to comply with this Court's Standing Orders 10.c.iii and Exhibit F. Counsel shall file any evidentiary objections, in conformance with this Courts Standing Orders, on or before October 20, 2016, at 12pm. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc4, ) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE RULE 26(f)/16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (DKT. #25 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Request is DENIED. The parties are HEREBY ORDERED to file a joint report no later than October 21, 2016 and to appear at the October 31, 2016 Scheduling Conference. (ah)
October 10, 2016 Filing 25 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Rule 16(b)/26(f) Scheduling Conference and Associated Deadlines from October 31, 2016 to when is convenient for Court Re: Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 16 filed by Plaintiff SkyBus Jet Cargo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fischer, Michael)
September 26, 2016 Filing 24 OBJECTION in support of re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Forum Non Conveniens; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #13 SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Defendant Aergo International Pty Ltd. (McIntire, Ronald)
September 26, 2016 Filing 23 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Forum Non Conveniens; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #13 filed by Defendant Aergo International Pty Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of of Andrew James Shute, #2 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Peter Cedergren, #3 Exhibit 1 to Cedergren Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Cedergren Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Cedergren Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Cedergren Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to Cedergren Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to Cedergren Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 to Cedergren Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 to Cedergren Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 to Cedergren Declaration)(McIntire, Ronald)
August 25, 2016 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Allan McKeown in support of opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Forum Non Conveniens; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #13 filed by Plaintiff SkyBus Jet Cargo Inc.. (Fischer, Michael)
August 25, 2016 Filing 21 DECLARATION of James Tsolakis in support of opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Forum Non Conveniens; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #13 filed by Plaintiff SkyBus Jet Cargo Inc.. (Fischer, Michael)
August 25, 2016 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Michael Fischer in support of Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Forum Non Conveniens; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #13 filed by Plaintiff SkyBus Jet Cargo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Fischer, Michael)
August 25, 2016 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Declaration of Nick Leach in support of Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Forum Non Conveniens; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #13 filed by Plaintiff SkyBus Jet Cargo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Fischer, Michael)
August 25, 2016 Filing 18 Plaintiff's in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Forum Non Conveniens; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #13 filed by Plaintiff SkyBus Jet Cargo Inc.. (Fischer, Michael)
July 14, 2016 Filing 17 STIPULATED PER STANDING ORDER: JOINT STIPULATION TO BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR AERGO INTERNATIONAL PTY LTD'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FORUM NON CONVENIENS re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Forum Non Conveniens; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #13 filed by Defendant Aergo International Pty Ltd. (McIntire, Ronald)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FORUM NON CONVENIENS (DKT. #13 ) AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from October 24, 2016 to October 31, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel shall refer to the Court's Standing Order with respect to the briefing schedule for motions. The Scheduling Conference is also continued to October 31, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. The parties' Joint Rule 16b/26f Report shall be filed no later than October 21, 2016. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f)/16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report due October 14, 2016. Scheduling Conference set for October 24, 2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ah)
July 7, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Aergo International Pty Ltd, (McIntire, Ronald)
July 7, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Forum Non Conveniens; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant Aergo International Pty Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marlena Moore, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Marlena Moore, #3 Declaration of Peter Cedergren, #4 Exhibit Exhibits 1-48 to Declaration of Peter Cedergren, #5 Declaration of Andrew James Shute, #6 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Andrew James Shute, #7 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Andrew James Shute, #8 Declaration of Matthew John Wilcox, #9 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Matthew John Wilcox) (McIntire, Ronald)
June 24, 2016 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Aergo International Pty Ltd answer now due 7/7/2016, filed by Defendant Aergo International Pty Ltd.(McIntire, Ronald)
June 10, 2016 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff SkyBus Jet Cargo Inc., upon Defendant Aergo International Pty Ltd served on 5/17/2016, answer due 6/28/2016. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons returned. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Service of Summons and Complaint on Aergo International PTY LTD)(Klein, Neil)
May 27, 2016 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Aergo International Pty Ltd answer now due 6/28/2016, filed by Defendant Aergo International Pty Ltd.(Attorney Ronald A McIntire added to party Aergo International Pty Ltd(pty:dft))(McIntire, Ronald)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ah)
April 27, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Civil Cover Sheet was e-filed upside down. Correction has been made document replaced. (car)
April 27, 2016 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Aergo International Pty Ltd. (car)
April 27, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 27, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
April 26, 2016 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff SKYBUS JET CARGO INC.. (Klein, Neil)
April 26, 2016 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff SKYBUS JET CARGO INC., (Klein, Neil)
April 26, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SKYBUS JET CARGO INC.. (Klein, Neil) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/27/2016) (car).
April 26, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-17712817 - Fee: $400. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Neil B Klein added to party SKYBUS JET CARGO INC.(pty:pla))(Klein, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SkyBus Jet Cargo Inc. v. Aergo International Pty Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aergo International Pty Ltd
Represented By: Marlena McMurchie Moore
Represented By: Ronald A McIntire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SkyBus Jet Cargo Inc.
Represented By: Michael Robert Fischer
Represented By: Neil B Klein
Represented By: Maria Del Rocio Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?