Miram Yanikian et al v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Miram Yanikian and Lianna Yanikian
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company and Does 1 through 100, Inclusive
Not Yet Classified: ASO Mark Loeterman
Case Number: 2:2016cv03030
Filed: May 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Beverly Reid O'Connell
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2017 Filing 100 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/9/2017 at 1:46 p.m. and 6/9/2017 at 3:39 p.m. re Transcript #98 , #99 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Ponce, Myra) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 26, 2017 Filing 99 PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT (Testimony of Gagik Khoudian) for proceedings held on 6/9/2017 at 3:39 p.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Myra L. Ponce, CSR, RDR, CRR, e-mail address myraponce@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2017. (Ponce, Myra)
June 26, 2017 Filing 98 PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT (Testimony of Miram Yanikian) for proceedings held on 6/9/2017 at 1:46 p.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Myra L. Ponce, CSR, RDR, CRR, e-mail address myraponce@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2017. (Ponce, Myra)
June 22, 2017 Filing 97 JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AGAINST PLAINTIFFS by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that judgment be entered in favor of Defendant, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, and against Plaintiffs MIRAM AND LIANNA YANIKIAN, and that Plaintiffs shall take nothing from Allstate, and Allstate shall recover from Plaintiffs all applicable costs, to be determined hereafter. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED FORTHWITH. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp)
June 20, 2017 Filing 96 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Judgment re Jury Verdict #93 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment)(Willis, Joshua)
June 15, 2017 Filing 95 LIST OF EXHIBITS AND WITNESSES at trial. (rfi)
June 15, 2017 Filing 94 RECEIPT FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS to Counsel Upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial; Pursuant to stipulation of counsel and/or by Order of the Court, all exhibits listed on Joint exhibits list are returned to counsel for respective party(ies). (rfi)
June 15, 2017 Filing 93 REDACTED JURY VERDICT in favor of Defendant Allstate Insurance Company and against Lianna Yanikian AND Miram Yanikian. (rfi)
June 15, 2017 Filing 92 SEALED JURY VERDICT in favor of Defendant Allstate Insurance Company and against Lianna Yanikian and Miram Yanikian. (rfi)
June 15, 2017 Filing 91 Jury Notes # ONE filed. (rfi)
June 15, 2017 Filing 90 SEALED Jury Notes # ONE filed. (rfi)
June 15, 2017 Filing 89 JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Given) by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (rfi)
June 15, 2017 Filing 88 MINUTES OF JURY TRIAL, DAY FOUR, held and completed before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: Verdict reached. Jury FINDS: IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT. Jury polled. Defendant is to lodge a Proposed Judgment by June 22, 2017. #79 Court Reporter: Myra Ponce.
June 14, 2017 Filing 87 MINUTES OF JURY TRIAL, DAY THREE held before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce/Miranda Algorri. (rfi)
June 13, 2017 Filing 86 MINUTES OF JURY TRIAL, DAY TWO before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial continued to 6/14/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. MOTION for Order for prohibit expert witnesses testifying to new reports filed by plaintiff, Docket No. #80 is DENIED #80 Court Reporter: Myra Ponce/Miranda Algorri. (rfi)
June 13, 2017 Filing 85 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by plaintiff Lianna Yanikian, Miram Yanikian.. (Sales, Sassoon)
June 12, 2017 Filing 84 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for prohibit expert witnesses testifying to new reports #80 filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua N. Willis, #2 Exhibit A- Rule 26 Report, #3 Exhibit B- Revised Daly Report, #4 Exhibit C- Revised Mitchel Report, #5 Exhibit D- Correspondence to Sales, #6 Exhibit E- Delivery Confirmation)(Willis, Joshua)
June 12, 2017 Filing 83 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the basis of: FRCP Rule 50(a) #79 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Miram Yanikian Trial Testimony, #2 Exhibit B- Gagik Khoudian Trial Testimony)(Willis, Joshua)
June 12, 2017 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the basis of: FRCP Rule 50(a) #79 filed by Plaintiffs Lianna Yanikian, Miram Yanikian. (Sales, Sassoon)
June 11, 2017 Filing 80 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for prohibit expert witnesses testifying to new reports filed by plaintiff Lianna Yanikian, Miram Yanikian. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sales, Sassoon)
June 9, 2017 Filing 81 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 1st Day held before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: Jury empanelled and sworn. Opening statements made. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Plaintiff(s) rest. Case continued to 6/13/2017 at 9:00 AM., for further trial/further jury deliberation. Court and counsel confer regarding jury instructions; Court sets deadline for plaintiff to file a written response to defendant's motion for judgment by 9:00 AM., Monday; hearing 8:30 am Tuesday. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (jp)
June 9, 2017 Filing 79 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the basis of: FRCP Rule 50(a) filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 6/9/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Willis, Joshua)
June 7, 2017 Filing 78 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS) MEMORANDUM RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: The Court GRANTS in part Defendant MIL2 #62 , and thus preclude Plaintiffs from offering the List into evidence. However, the Court notes that Plaintiffs may offer otherwise admissible evidence of personal property loss at trial. (jp)
June 7, 2017 Filing 77 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. The Court, on its own motion, continues the Jury Trial in this matter to Friday, 6/9/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. The parties and counsel are ORDERED to appear on Friday, June 9, 2017 at 9:00 a.m.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 2, 2017 Filing 76 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Original Deposition Transcript of Raymond Khoudian re Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #17 (Willis, Joshua)
June 1, 2017 Filing 75 TRIAL BRIEF filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company.. (Willis, Joshua)
June 1, 2017 Filing 74 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Certified Deposition Transcripts re Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #17 (Willis, Joshua)
June 1, 2017 Filing 73 REVISED JOINT Exhibit List filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company.. (Willis, Joshua)
May 16, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Documents Not Exchanged During Discovery Nor Identified in Accordance with Rule 26 of the FRCP #62 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Deposition Transcript-Mihram Yanikian)(Willis, Joshua)
May 15, 2017 Filing 72 MINUTES OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE HEARING #49 #62 held before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Court questions counsel as stated in court and on the record on motions in limine and invites counsel to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. The Court rules as indicated. The Jury Instruction Conference was held. The Jury Trial will commence on June 8, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (rfi)
May 10, 2017 Filing 70 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Testimony by Plaintiffs Unqualified Expert Witness Matthew Highsmith #49 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Marked Deposition Transcript of Matthew Highsmith)(Willis, Joshua)
May 9, 2017 Filing 69 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Documents Not Exchanged During Discovery Nor Identified in Accordance with Rule 26 of the FRCP #62 filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Willis, Joshua)
May 8, 2017 Filing 68 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Testimony by Plaintiffs Unqualified Expert Witness Matthew Highsmith #49 filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua N. Willis)(Willis, Joshua)
May 8, 2017 Filing 67 PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY VERDICT filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Willis, Joshua)
May 8, 2017 Filing 66 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Allstate's Disputed set) filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company.. (Willis, Joshua)
May 8, 2017 Filing 65 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Joint set) filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company.. (Willis, Joshua)
May 8, 2017 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Documents Not Exchanged During Discovery Nor Identified in Accordance with Rule 26 of the FRCP #62 filed by Plaintiffs Lianna Yanikian, Miram Yanikian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sassoon Sales)(Sales, Sassoon)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER approved by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Jury Trial set for 6/6/2017 08:30 AM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (rfi)
May 5, 2017 Filing 62 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Documents Not Exchanged During Discovery Nor Identified in Accordance with Rule 26 of the FRCP filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua N. Willis, #2 Proposed Order)(Willis, Joshua)
May 2, 2017 Filing 60 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by plaintiff Lianna Yanikian, Miram Yanikian.. (Sales, Sassoon)
May 1, 2017 Filing 61 MINUTES OF Pretrial Conference held before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: The Court orders counsel for the plaintiffs to have an interpreter present, and ADVANCES the hearing on disputed jury instructions to 5/15/2017 at 1:30 PM. The Jury Trial remains set for 6/6/2017. *See Order for further details.* Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (cw)
May 1, 2017 Filing 59 Opposition to motion in limine to disqualify expert Highsmith opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Testimony by Plaintiffs Unqualified Expert Witness Matthew Highsmith #49 filed by Plaintiffs Lianna Yanikian, Miram Yanikian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Miran Yanikian, #2 Declaration of Sassoon Sales)(Sales, Sassoon)
May 1, 2017 Filing 58 STATEMENT the Case filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company (Willis, Joshua)
May 1, 2017 Filing 57 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company.. (Willis, Joshua)
April 26, 2017 Filing 56 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Final PreTrial Conference Order)(Willis, Joshua)
April 26, 2017 Filing 55 Witness List filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company.. (Willis, Joshua)
April 26, 2017 Filing 54 JOINT Exhibit List for Trial filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company.. (Willis, Joshua)
April 25, 2017 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by plaintiff Lianna Yanikian, Miram Yanikian. (Sales, Sassoon)
April 24, 2017 Filing 52 DECLARATION of K. Kalani Patterson re Filing of Joint Exhibit, Witness List, Jury Instructions and Proposed Pre Trial Conference Order filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B- Correspondence, #3 Exhibit C- Draft Joint Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit D- Draft Joint Witness List, #5 Exhibit E- Draft PTC Order, #6 Exhibit F- Draft Joint Jury Instructions, #7 Exhibit G- Correspondence)(Willis, Joshua)
April 24, 2017 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Willis, Joshua)
April 24, 2017 Filing 50 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Testimony by Plaintiffs Unqualified Expert Witness Matthew Highsmith #49 filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Willis, Joshua)
April 24, 2017 Filing 49 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Testimony by Plaintiffs Unqualified Expert Witness Matthew Highsmith filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2017 at 03:00 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua N. Willis, #2 Proposed Order)(Willis, Joshua)
April 21, 2017 Filing 48 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion for relief from the Summary Judgment Order. The hearing scheduled for April 24, 2017 is hereby VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. #43 (rfi)
April 10, 2017 Filing 47 REPLY opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Motion Hearing with html form,, #39 #43 filed by Plaintiffs Lianna Yanikian, Miram Yanikian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sassoon Sales)(Sales, Sassoon)
April 3, 2017 Filing 46 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Motion Hearing with html form,, #39 #43 filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua N. Willis, #2 Declaration of Shirley Carpenter-Bridwell, #3 Exhibit A-I to Declaration of Shirley Carpenter-Bridwell)(Willis, Joshua)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation to Continue #42 IT IS HEREBY SO ORDERED, that the designation of expert witnesses and exchange of Rule 26 Reports take place on April 3, 2017, and expert discovery in the above referenced case including depositions be completed by April 22, 2017. (rfi)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation to Continue, #41 IT IS HEREBY SO ORDERED, that the meeting of counsel shall take place on April 6, 2017 at 11:00 a.m., which is 25 days prior to the Pretrial Conference set by the Court on May 1, 2017. (rfi)
March 27, 2017 Filing 43 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Motion Hearing with html form,, #39 filed by plaintiff Lianna Yanikian, Miram Yanikian. Motion set for hearing on 4/24/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion) (Sales, Sassoon)
March 24, 2017 Filing 42 STIPULATION to Continue Expert Disclosure Date from 3/27/17 to 4/3/17 filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tamborelli, John)
March 23, 2017 Filing 41 STIPULATION to Continue Meeting of Counsel Date from March 22, 2017 to April 6, 2017 filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney John V Tamborelli added to party Allstate Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Tamborelli, John)
March 15, 2017 Filing 40 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: The Court GRANTS in part Defendant's Motion. Allstate is entitled to partial summary judgment with respect to the following claims: (1) breach of the covenant of good faith and fair dealing; (2) fraud; and, (3) punitive damages. Defendant's Motion is DENIED with respect to all other claims. IT IS SO ORDERED. #28 (rfi)
February 27, 2017 Filing 39 MINUTES OF MOTION HEARING Hearing held before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: re: DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT (filed 12/28/2016) #28 Court questions counsel as stated in court and on the record on the motion(s) and invites counsel to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. The matter is taken under submission, a written order to follow. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (rfi)
February 16, 2017 Filing 38 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: denying #36 EX PARTE APPLICATION. (rfi)
February 15, 2017 Filing 37 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file reply re plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment #36 filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Willis, Joshua)
February 14, 2017 Filing 36 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file reply re plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment filed by plaintiff Lianna Yanikian, Miram Yanikian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sales, Sassoon)
February 13, 2017 Filing 35 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #28 filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua N. Willis, #2 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS)(Willis, Joshua)
February 8, 2017 Filing 34 notice of correction re motion for summary judgment filed by Plaintiffs Lianna Yanikian, Miram Yanikian re: MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #33 (Sales, Sassoon)
February 6, 2017 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #28 filed by Plaintiffs Lianna Yanikian, Miram Yanikian. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts in opposition to Defendant's motion for summary adjudication, #2 Declaration Declarations in opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Sales, Sassoon)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: ORDER RE MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S DISCOVERY RULING #25 The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion. The Court VACATES the hearing set for January 9, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rfi)
January 5, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE TO PARTIES by Chief U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. Effective, January 4, 2017, Judge Walsh will be located at the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, COURTROOM 790 on the 7th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 790 of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 1st floor of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse. Magistrate Judge Walsh's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Isabel Martinez, may be reached at (213) 894-8958. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 29, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #28 re Memorandum of Points and Authorities, and Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts and Conclusions of Law (Willis, Joshua)
December 28, 2016 Filing 29 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #28 filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Willis, Joshua)
December 28, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, #3 Declaration of Anthony Cannon, #4 Declaration of Edward Carrasco, #5 Declaration of Brian Daly, #6 Declaration of Custodian of Records Hany Dahroug, #7 Declaration of Joshua Willis, #8 Proposed Order Granting Summary Judgment, #9 Proposed Order Granting Partial Summary Judgment) (Willis, Joshua)
December 19, 2016 Filing 27 REPLY in support of Motion for Review of magistrate judge's discovery decision filed by Plaintiffs Lianna Yanikian, Miram Yanikian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit in support of motion for review)(Sales, Sassoon)
December 12, 2016 Filing 26 OPPOSITION to Plaintiffs' Motion for Review of Magistrate's Order filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Willis, Joshua)
December 5, 2016 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Review filed by Plaintiffs Lianna Yanikian, Miram Yanikian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit re Motion for Review, #2 Notice re Motion for Review)(Sales, Sassoon)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Re Order Re: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Allstate Insurance Company to Produce Claim File by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh: The Court has received the parties' emails regarding a discovery dispute about certain documents in the claims file that Defendant Allstate Insurance Company has refused to produce, citing the attorney-client privilege and the attorney work product doctrine. At the Courts request, Defendant has produced the documents in camera along with a privilege log. Allstate is ordered to produce them no later than November 28, 2016. Plaintiffs' counsel's request for sanctions is denied. (im)
October 24, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Effective October 31, 2016, Judge O'Connell will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 7C on the 7th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 7C of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 22, 2016 Filing 22 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. The Court corrects a clerical error in the Civil Jury Trial Order. The date for the filing of the Motions in Limine is APRIL 17, 2017. The hearing on the Motions in Limine remains set for May 22, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. #17 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 9/22/2016 (rfi).
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOR PROTECTION OF PRIVATE INFORMATION AND ORDER THEREON by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. re Stipulation for Protective Order #20 . (sbou)
September 15, 2016 Filing 20 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Willis, Joshua)
August 30, 2016 Filing 19 REPORT of JOINT SCHEDULING MEDIATION REPORT PURSUANT TO COURTS ORDER FOR CIVIL JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Willis, Joshua)
August 25, 2016 Filing 18 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Mark Loeterman: Mediation held on August 23, 2016. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.(Killefer, Gail)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR CIVIL JURY TRIAL by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: Amended Pleadings due by 11/21/2016. Discovery cut-off 3/27/2017. Exhibit List due by 4/24/2017. Witness List due by 4/24/2017. Motions in Limine to be filed by 4/24/2017., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/24/2017. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 4/10/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2017at 3:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 6/6/2017 at 8:30 AM. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2017 at 01:30 PM. (jp)
August 22, 2016 Filing 16 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE (Held and Completed) before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: Court conducts Scheduling Conference. Counsel are reminded to fully comply with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 26(a). Counsel inform the Court that their selection for a settlement procedure pursuant to Local Rule 16-14 is Attorney Settlement Officer Panel. Counsel shall file a Joint Report setting forth the outcome of any settlement discussions, the likelihood of possible further discussions and any help the Court may provide with regard to settlement negotiations not later than seven (7) days after the settlement conference. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (jp)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. (shb)
August 16, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Mark Loeterman has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
August 10, 2016 Filing 13 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Mark Loeterman may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Miram Yanikian(Sales, Sassoon)
June 30, 2016 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company.. (Willis, Joshua)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND JOINT REPORT by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (rfi)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES upon filing of the complaint by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (rfi)
May 19, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:16-cv-03030 BRO(PJWx). (rn)
May 13, 2016 Filing 8 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company.(Willis, Joshua)
May 6, 2016 Filing 7 STATEMENT of Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge re: Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form #6 . (Willis, Joshua)
May 3, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent) (et)
May 3, 2016 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Allstate Insurance Company, Does 1 through 100, inclusive amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiffs Miram Yanikian, Lianna Yanikian. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/18/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #5](et)
May 3, 2016 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Allstate Insurance Company, Does 1 through 100, inclusive., filed by Plaintiffs Miram Yanikian, Lianna Yanikian. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/2/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #2] (et)
May 3, 2016 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 5/3/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1-Notice to Adverse Party of Removal (Exhs A-D), #2 Exhibit A2-Notice to Adverse Party of Removal (Exhs E-G))(Willis, Joshua)
May 3, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company, (Willis, Joshua)
May 3, 2016 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company identifying Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Willis, Joshua)
May 3, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Willis, Joshua)
May 3, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC608917 Receipt No: 0973-17753264 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons, #2 Exhibit B-Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-State Court File, #4 Exhibit D-Demurrer, #5 Exhibit E-First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit F-Westlaw-SecretaryOfState, #7 Exhibit G-Kuebler Case) (Attorney Joshua N Willis added to party Allstate Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Willis, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miram Yanikian et al v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory M MacGregor
Represented By: John V Tamborelli
Represented By: Joshua N Willis
Represented By: Deborah A Berthel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miram Yanikian
Represented By: Sassoon Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lianna Yanikian
Represented By: Sassoon Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ASO Mark Loeterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?