Luis Osollo v. Linda Darling-Hammond et al
Plaintiff: Luis Osollo
Defendant: Linda Darling-Hammond, Richard A. Vladovic, Mistie Barela, C. Michael Conney, Bill Carvajales, Bonnie Klatt, Blanche Butler, Mario Torres, Constance Blackburn, A. I. Doe, Steve Zimmer, Tamar Galatzan, L. C., Dr. Doe Ross, Alicia Hinde, Justo Avila, Timothy Sullivan, George Mc Kenna, III, Alex Conteras, Monica Garcia, Felipe Barragan, M. M. Doe, Helio Brasil, Haydee Rodriguez, Mary Jane Roberts, Georgette Imura, Rodonna Van Pelt, Annie Webb, Jerry Doe, N. G. Doe, K. B., Steve Zimer, Jose Gonzalez, Katherine Esquire, Shane Martin, Bennett Kayser, Katherine Pavidis, Juliet Tiffany-Morales, Richard Zeiger, Juliet Tiffany -Morales, Davis Doe, Monica Ratcliff, Kathleen Harris, Doe Defendant The Partnership for Los Angeles Schools, Barbara Kilponen, Tine Sloan, J. Michelle Woods, Sheila Ryskamp, Catherine Sumpter, Tillie Soliz, Alex Contreras, Ira Berman, Kirsten Barnes, Jane Number 2 Doe and Jane Doe Number 1
Case Number: 2:2016cv03045
Filed: May 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: S James Otero
2 Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL INFORMA PAUPERIS: 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Judge S. James Otero, re REFERRAL NOTICE re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #138 . The Court has considered the motion and the motion is GRANTED. The Court declines to certify that the proposed appeal is "not taken in good faith" within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). The within moving party is authorized to prosecute an appeal in forma pauperis to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit without pre-payment of any fees or costs and without giving security therefor. (hr)
August 7, 2018 Filing 139 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Avi Burkwitz counsel for Defendants Justo Avila, Justo Avila, Ira Berman, Ira Berman, Alex Conteras, Alex Contreras, Mario Torres, Mario Torres. Natalie Ursula Luongo, Esq. is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Ira Berman, Justo Avila, Alexander Contreras, and Mario Torres. (Burkwitz, Avi)
August 7, 2018 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. Re Complaint - (Referred), #1 . Proposed Order re IFP Appeal forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(dc)
August 2, 2018 Filing 138 REFERRAL NOTICE re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #133 RECEIVED from 9th Circuit Court. Referred to the District Court for the limited purpose of determining whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal or whether the appeal is frivolous or taken in bad faith. If the district court elects to revoke in forma pauperis status, the district court is requested to notify this court and the parties of such determination within 21 days of the date of this referral. If the district court does not revoke in forma pauperis status, such status will continue automatically for this appeal. (mat)
July 27, 2018 Filing 137 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 18-56018 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #133 as to plaintiff Luis Osollo. (lc)
July 25, 2018 Filing 136 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #135 . The following error(s) was/were found: This form since has been up-dated. Please see court's website for an up-dated form. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
July 25, 2018 Filing 135 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Avi Burkwitz counsel for Defendants Justo Avila, Justo Avila, Ira Berman, Ira Berman, Alex Conteras, Alex Contreras, Mario Torres, Mario Torres. Natalie Ursula Luongo, Esq. is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Ira Berman, Justo Avila, Alexander Contreras, and Mario Torres. (Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party Alex Conteras(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party Alex Contreras(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party Mario Torres(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party Mario Torres(pty:dft))(Burkwitz, Avi)
July 18, 2018 Filing 134 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #133 served on 7/18/2018. (car)
July 18, 2018 Filing 133 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. Appeal of Judgment #132 Filed On: 6/19/2018 ; Entered On: 6/22/2018; Fee Waived See doc. 5. (car)
June 19, 2018 Filing 132 JUDGMENT by Judge S. James Otero, Pursuant to the Order Accepting Findings and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge, IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that this action is dismissed with prejudice. #131 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (es)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE #122 by Judge S. James Otero. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motions to Amend his complaints and file a Fifth and Sixth Amended Complaints (Electronic Case Filing Numbers 102 and 117) are DENIED, and, Defendants Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs 4AC [Electronic Case Filing Numbers 107, 108, 109] be GRANTED; and Judgment be entered DISMISSING this action with prejudice. (es)
April 9, 2018 Filing 130 RESPONSE to Defendants' Objections to the Report and Recommendation of the Honorable United States Magistrate Judge, Shashi H. Kewalramani; & Provisional Request to Supplement Pleadings Under FRCP Rules 15(a)(2); 15(d); & 21 in the Event that the Honorable United States Magistrate Judge, Shashi H. Kewalramani Grants Plaintiff's Request to Specify that the Motion to Dismiss is Granted "Without" Prejudice FRCP Rules 15(a)(2); 15(d); & 21 filed by Plaintiff Luis Osolloto (mt)
April 4, 2018 Filing 129 OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation (Issued),, #122 Of the Magistrate Judge on the Motion to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Kirsten Barnes(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Constance Blackburn(in Individual Capacity), Helio Brasil(in Individual Capacity), C. Michael Conney(in Individual Capacity), Linda Darling-Hammond(in Individual Capacity ), Jose Gonzalez(in Individual Capacity), Kathleen Harris(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Alicia Hinde(in Individual Capacity), Georgette Imura(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Bonnie Klatt(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Shane Martin(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Katherine Pavidis, Mary Jane Roberts(in Individual Capacity), Haydee Rodriguez(in Individual Capacity), Sheila Ryskamp(in Official Capacities as members of the Committee of Credentials), Tine Sloan(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Tillie Soliz(in Individual Capacity), Juliet Tiffany -Morales, Rodonna Van Pelt(in Individual Capacity), Richard Zeiger.(Aronis, Stephen)
March 27, 2018 Filing 128 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Justo Avila, Justo Avila, Ira Berman, Ira Berman, Alex Conteras, Alex Contreras, Mario Torres, Mario Torresto Objection to Report and Recommendations #124 , Report and Recommendation (Issued),, #122 (Luongo, Natalie)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, re Notice (Other),,,,, #126 (dc)
March 23, 2018 Filing 126 NOTICE of Motion and Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Defendant Kirsten Barnes(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Constance Blackburn(in Individual Capacity), Helio Brasil(in Individual Capacity), C. Michael Conney(in Individual Capacity), Linda Darling-Hammond(in Individual Capacity ), Jose Gonzalez(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Kathleen Harris(in Individual Capacity ), Alicia Hinde(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Georgette Imura(in Individual Capacity), Bonnie Klatt(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Shane Martin(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Katherine Pavidis, Mary Jane Roberts(in Individual Capacity), Haydee Rodriguez(in Individual Capacity), Sheila Ryskamp(in Individual Capacity), Tine Sloan(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Tillie Soliz(in Individual Capacity), Juliet Tiffany -Morales, Rodonna Van Pelt(in Individual Capacity), Richard Zeiger. (Aronis, Stephen)
March 23, 2018 Filing 125 REPLY TO OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation (Issued),, #122 filed by Defendants Kirsten Barnes(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Constance Blackburn(in Individual Capacity), Helio Brasil(in Individual Capacity), C. Michael Conney(in Individual Capacity), Linda Darling-Hammond(in Individual Capacity ), Jose Gonzalez(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Kathleen Harris(in Individual Capacity ), Alicia Hinde(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Georgette Imura(in Individual Capacity), Bonnie Klatt(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Shane Martin(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Katherine Pavidis, Mary Jane Roberts(in Individual Capacity), Haydee Rodriguez(in Individual Capacity), Sheila Ryskamp(in Official Capacities as members of the Committee of Credentials), Tine Sloan(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Tillie Soliz(in Individual Capacity), Juliet Tiffany -Morales, Rodonna Van Pelt(in Individual Capacity), Richard Zeiger. (Aronis, Stephen)
March 13, 2018 Filing 124 OBJECTIONS to the Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge, the Honorable Shashi H. Kewalramani filed by Plaintiff Luis Osollo.(lwag)
February 27, 2018 Filing 123 NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani and Lodging of Proposed Judgment and Order. Objections to R&R due by 3/13/2018 (dc)
February 27, 2018 Filing 122 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. Re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint #107 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint #109 , REQUEST #117 , REQUEST for Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint #121 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave #102 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint #108 , Complaint - (Referred), #1 (dc)
February 26, 2018 Filing 121 REQUEST for Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Justo Avila (in individual capacity ), Justo Avila (in official capacity), Ira Berman(in individual capacity), Ira Berman(in official capacity), Alex Conteras, Alex Contreras, Mario Torres(in individual capacity), Mario Torres(in official capacity). (Luongo, Natalie)
September 29, 2017 Filing 120 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave #102 filed by Defendants Justo Avila, Justo Avila, Ira Berman, Ira Berman, Alex Conteras, Alex Contreras, Mario Torres, Mario Torres. (Luongo, Natalie)
September 29, 2017 Filing 119 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint #109 filed by Defendants Justo Avila, Justo Avila, Ira Berman, Ira Berman, Alex Conteras, Alex Contreras, Mario Torres, Mario Torres. (Luongo, Natalie)
September 28, 2017 Filing 118 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo, re REQUEST #117 served on 9/28/17. (iva)
September 28, 2017 Filing 117 REQUEST for Leave to File 6th Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Amended Complaint) (iva)
September 21, 2017 Filing 116 OPPOSITION Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Kirsten Barnes, Constance Blackburn, Helio Brasil, C. Michael Conney, Linda Darling-Hammond, Jose Gonzalez, Kathleen Harris, Alicia Hinde, Georgette Imura, Bonnie Klatt, Shane Martin, Katherine Pavidis, Mary Jane Roberts, Haydee Rodriguez, Sheila Ryskamp, Tine Sloan, Tillie Soliz, Juliet Tiffany-Morales, Rodonna Van Pelt, Richard Zeiger. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Juliet Tiffany-Morales (pty:dft))(Aronis, Stephen)
September 21, 2017 Filing 115 Opposition In opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave #102 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Kirsten Barnes, Constance Blackburn, Helio Brasil, C. Michael Conney, Linda Darling-Hammond, Jose Gonzalez, Kathleen Harris, Alicia Hinde, Georgette Imura, Bonnie Klatt, Shane Martin, Katherine Pavidis, Mary Jane Roberts, Haydee Rodriguez, Sheila Ryskamp, Tine Sloan, Tillie Soliz, Juliet Tiffany -Morales, Rodonna Van Pelt, Richard Zeiger. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Aronis, Stephen)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS: Order Re: Plaintiffs Motion to Amend and Defendants Motions to Dismiss Briefing Schedule by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani:On August 2, 2017, Defendants Ira Berman, Justo Avila, Alexander Contreras, and Mario Torres filed a Motion to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint. Dkt. 109. The Court hereby ORDERS as follows: (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (dc)
August 22, 2017 Filing 113 DECLARATION of Luis Osollo filed by Plaintiff Luis Osollo in support of Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint #108 by Members of the Commission on Teacher Credentialing and Members of the Committee of Credential. (ad)
August 22, 2017 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint #107 by Members of the Commission on Teacher Credentialing and Members of the Committee of Credential filed by Plaintiff Luis Osollo. (ad)
August 22, 2017 Filing 111 OPPOSITION to Defendants Alexander Contreras, Mario Torres, Ira Isaac Berman, Justo Humberto Avila's NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint #109 filed by Plaintiff Luis Osollo. (ad)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE - OCMJ# 17-092 by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF THE CALENDAR of Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, this case is transferred from the calendar of Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings authorized by statute, local rules and general orders. All documents subsequently filed shall bear this new case designation 2:16-cv-03045 SJO (SHK) absent further order of the Court. (esa)
August 2, 2017 Filing 109 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Justo Avila (in individual capacity ), Justo Avila (in official capacity), Ira Berman(in individual capacity), Ira Berman(in official capacity), Alex Conteras, Alex Contreras, Mario Torres(in individual capacity), Mario Torres(in official capacity). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party Alex Conteras(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party Alex Contreras(pty:dft)) (Luongo, Natalie)
August 2, 2017 Filing 108 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Kirsten Barnes(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Constance Blackburn(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Helio Brasil(in Individual Capacity), C. Michael Conney(in Individual Capacity), Linda Darling-Hammond(in Individual Capacity ), Jose Gonzalez(in Individual Capacity), Kathleen Harris(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Alicia Hinde(in Individual Capacity), Georgette Imura(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Bonnie Klatt(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Shane Martin(in Individual Capacity), Katherine Pavidis, Mary Jane Roberts(in Individual Capacity), Haydee Rodriguez(in Individual Capacity), Sheila Ryskamp(in Official Capacities as members of the Committee of Credentials), Tine Sloan(in Individual Capacity), Tillie Soliz(in Individual Capacity), Juliet Tiffany -Morales, Rodonna Van Pelt(in Official Capacities as members of the Committee of Credentials), Richard Zeiger. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint, #3 Declaration) (Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Constance Blackburn(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Kathleen Harris(pty:dft)) (Aronis, Stephen)
August 2, 2017 Filing 107 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Kirsten Barnes(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Constance Blackburn(in Individual Capacity), Helio Brasil(in Individual Capacity), C. Michael Conney(in Individual Capacity), Linda Darling-Hammond(in Individual Capacity ), Jose Gonzalez(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Kathleen Harris(in Individual Capacity ), Alicia Hinde(in Individual Capacity), Georgette Imura(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Bonnie Klatt(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Shane Martin(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Katherine Pavidis, Mary Jane Roberts(in Individual Capacity), Haydee Rodriguez(in Individual Capacity), Sheila Ryskamp(in Official Capacities as members of the Committee of Credentials), Tine Sloan(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Tillie Soliz(in Individual Capacity), Juliet Tiffany -Morales, Rodonna Van Pelt(in Individual Capacity), Richard Zeiger. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint, #3 Declaration) (Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Jose Gonzalez(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Alicia Hinde(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Georgette Imura(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Bonnie Klatt(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Shane Martin(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Katherine Pavidis (pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Tine Sloan(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Rodonna Van Pelt(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Richard Zeiger(pty:dft)) (Aronis, Stephen)
July 20, 2017 Filing 106 PROOF OF SERVICE re Fourth Amended Complaint #95 and Summons #101 filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo, served on 07/19/17. (afe)
July 18, 2017 Filing 105 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo, re Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support #103 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave #102 , Declaration #104 served on 07/18/17. (afe)
July 18, 2017 Filing 104 Plaintiff's DECLARATION in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint #102 filed by Plaintiff Luis Osollo. (afe)
July 18, 2017 Filing 103 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint #102 filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. (afe)
July 18, 2017 Filing 102 Plaintiff's NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (afe) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/19/2017: #2 LODGED Proposed Fifth Amended Complaint (Part 1), #3 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave #102 ) (afe).
June 19, 2017 Filing 101 21 DAY Summons Issued re Fourth Amended Complaint #95 .(afe)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER RE CIVIL RIGHTS CASE by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Plaintiff is advised that the Court has determined that his Fourth Amended Complaint #95 , filed on April 25, 2017, may only be served upon the following defendants - in their individual capacity - by serving counsel of record for the defendants: (See Order for complete details). (afe)
May 24, 2017 Filing 99 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo, re Additional Evidence Requested #98 served on 05/24/17. (afe)
May 24, 2017 Filing 98 ADDITIONAL Evidence Requested Pursuant to Docket Order #96 filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. (afe)
May 18, 2017 Filing 97 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #96 (Aronis, Stephen)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: INCOMPLETE DOCUMENTS ATTACHED TO FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The parties are advised that by no later than May 26, 2017, they may submit to the Court the complete version of the Committee of Credentials's letter and all its attachments, including the Findings. (See Minute Order for complete details) (afe)
April 25, 2017 Filing 95 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants amending Third Amended Complaint #93 , filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. (afe)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER DISMISSING THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Plaintiff's TAC (Dkt. No. #93 ) is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. If Plaintiff still wishes to pursue this action, he shall file a Fourth Amended Complaint within twenty (20) days, which cures the pleading defects discussed herein. (See Order for complete details) (afe)
February 17, 2017 Filing 93 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Amending Second Amended Complaint #53 , filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(afe)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge S. James Otero for Report and Recommendation (Issued), #86 . IT IS ORDERED that: (1) The Rule 41(b) Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants McKenna, Garcia, Zimmer, Ratliff, Vladovic, Berman, Avila, Barragan, Woods and Torres (Dkt. No. 82) is DENIED without prejudice; (2) The Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants McKenna, Garcia, Zimmer, Ratliff, Vladovic, Berman, Avila, Barragan and Woods (Dkt. No. 58) is GRANTED; (3) Plaintiffs claims against Defendants McKenna, Garcia, Zimmer, Ratliff, Vladovic, Woods, Barragan, Barela-Johnson, Sullivan, Butler, Heckenberg-Garner, Sumpter, Webb, Carvajales, Jerry, Davis, K.B., L.C., Jane Doe No. 1, A.I., M.M., N.G., and Jane Doe No. 2, Plaintiffs First and Fourth Claims, his state law claims, and his official capacity claims against the CTC and COC members are DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; and (4) Plaintiffs Second, Third and Fifth Claims ARE DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Third Amended Complaint that cures the pleading defects discussed in the Report and Recommendation no later than thirty (30) days from the date or this Order. (mz)
January 17, 2017 Filing 91 REPLY TO OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation (Issued) #86 filed by Defendants Justo Avila (in individual capacity ), Felipe Barragan(in official capacity), Ira Berman(in official capacity), Monica Garcia(in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), George Mc Kenna, III(in Individual Capacity), Monica Ratcliff (in Individual Capacity), Mario Torres(in individual capacity), Richard A. Vladovic (in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), J. Michelle Woods(in official capacity), Steve Zimmer. (Luongo, Natalie)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar, ORDERING 1) Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint 2)Declaration of Luis Osollo in Support of Third Amended Complaint submitted by Plaintiff Luis Osollo received on 1/13/17 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: No leave to file a Third Amended Complaint on courts docket. (mz)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar ORDERING Plaintiff's Objections to Report and Recommendation of a United States Magistrate Judge submitted by Plaintiff Luis Osollo received on 01/11/17 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (afe)
January 11, 2017 Filing 89 Plaintiff's OBJECTIONS to Report and Recommendation (Issued) #86 filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo.(afe)
January 3, 2017 Filing 87 NOTICE of Change of New Telephone Number filed by Plaintiff Luis Osollo. (afe)
December 14, 2016 Filing 86 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF AUNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE issued by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (See Report for complete details) (afe)
December 14, 2016 Filing 85 NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Objections to R&R due by 1/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Report and Recommendation) (afe)
November 28, 2016 Filing 84 Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition of Moving Defendants' Ex Parte Application for an Order of Dismissal of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Luis Osollo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(afe)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The Court DENIES Defendants' Ex Parte Application #82 because Defendants have failed to demonstrate that they are entitled to ex parte relief. Plaintiff is provided until November 28, 2016 to file an Opposition to the motion to dismiss and advised that failure to timely file an Opposition may be deemed as consent to the granting of the Motion. (See Minute Order for complete details) (afe)
November 4, 2016 Filing 82 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, with Prejudice, Under F.R.C.P., Rule 41(b) for Failure to Comply with the Federal Rules and this Court's Orders filed by Defendants Justo Avila (in individual capacity ), Justo Avila (in official capacity), Felipe Barragan(in official capacity), Felipe Barragan(in individual capacity ), Ira Berman(in individual capacity), Ira Berman(in official capacity), Monica Garcia(in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), Monica Garcia(in Individual Capacity), George Mc Kenna, III(in Individual Capacity), George Mc Kenna, III(in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), Monica Ratcliff (in Individual Capacity), Monica Ratcliff (in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District), Mario Torres(in individual capacity), Mario Torres(in official capacity), Richard A. Vladovic (in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), Richard A. Vladovic (in Individual Capacity), J. Michelle Woods(in official capacity), J. Michelle Woods(in individual capacity ), Steve Zimer, Steve Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Natalie U. Luongo, Esq. in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order) (Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party Mario Torres(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party Mario Torres(pty:dft)) (Luongo, Natalie)
November 2, 2016 Filing 81 PROOF OF SERVICE as to defendant Catherine Sumpter filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. (afe)
November 1, 2016 Filing 80 PROOF OF SERVICE as to defendant Steven Justin Zimmer filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. (afe)
November 1, 2016 Filing 79 PROOF OF SERVICE as to defendant Monica Garcia filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. (afe)
November 1, 2016 Filing 78 PROOF OF SERVICE as to defendant George J McKenna, III filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. (afe)
November 1, 2016 Filing 77 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Avi Burkwitz counsel for Defendants Justo Avila, Justo Avila, Felipe Barragan, Felipe Barragan, Ira Berman, Ira Berman, Monica Garcia, Monica Garcia, George Mc Kenna, III, George Mc Kenna, III, Monica Ratcliff, Monica Ratcliff, Richard A. Vladovic, Richard A. Vladovic, J. Michelle Woods, J. Michelle Woods, Steve Zimer, Steve Zimmer. Adding Avi Burkwitz as counsel of record for George McKenna III, Monica Garcia, Steve Zimmer, Monica Ratliff, Dr. Richard A. Vladovic, Ira Berman, Justo Avila, Felipe Barragan and Michelle Woods for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants George McKenna, III Monica Garcia, Steve Zimmer, Monica Ratliff, Dr. Richard A. Vladovic, Ira Berman, Justo Avila, Felipe Barragan and Michelle Woods. (Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party Justo Avila (pty:dft), Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party Justo Avila (pty:dft), Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party Felipe Barragan(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party Felipe Barragan(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party Ira Berman(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party Ira Berman(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party Monica Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party Monica Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party George Mc Kenna, III(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party George Mc Kenna, III(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party Monica Ratcliff (pty:dft), Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party Monica Ratcliff (pty:dft), Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party Richard A. Vladovic (pty:dft), Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party Richard A. Vladovic (pty:dft), Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party J. Michelle Woods(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party J. Michelle Woods(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party Steve Zimer(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party Steve Zimmer(pty:dft))(Burkwitz, Avi)
November 1, 2016 Filing 72 NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge S. James Otero. Effective November 7, 2016, Judge Otero will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 10C on the 10th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 10C of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 31, 2016 Filing 76 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. Defendant Ira Bruce Berman served on 10/13/16. (afe)
October 31, 2016 Filing 75 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. Defendant Richard A. Vladovic served on 10/18/16. (afe)
October 31, 2016 Filing 74 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. Defendant Mario Torres served on 10/13/16. (afe)
October 31, 2016 Filing 73 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. Defendant Blanche W. Butler served on 10/27/16. (afe)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. *NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT* Defendants' Ex Parte Application #68 is GRANTED. Plaintiff, Luis Osollo and anyone acting on his behalf or direction, is prohibited from harassing, directly contacting, and/or personally serving papers upon Defendants GEORGE MCKENNA, III, MONICA GARCIA, STEVE ZIMMER, MONICA RATLIFF (erroneously sued as MONICA RATCLIFF), DR. RICHARD A. VLADOVIC, IRA BERMAN, JUSTO AVILA, FELIPE BARRAGAN, MARIO TORRES and DR. J. MICHELLE WOODS or any other Defendant named in the Second Amended Complaint pending before this Court. (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS) (afe)
October 26, 2016 Filing 70 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo, re Response #69 served on 10/26/16. (afe)
October 26, 2016 Filing 69 RESPONSE to Defendant LAUSD Officials' Ex Parte Application to Preclude Plaintiff from Serving his Summons and Second Amended Complaint #68 filed by Plaintiff Luis Osollo. (afe)
October 26, 2016 Filing 68 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Precluding Plaintiff, Or Anyone Acting on His Behalf From Harassing, Directly Contacting and/or Serving Pleadings on Represented Parties in Accordance with the Court's Directive and F.R.C.P. Rule 5 filed by Defendants Justo Avila (in individual capacity ), Justo Avila (in official capacity), Felipe Barragan(in official capacity), Felipe Barragan(in individual capacity ), Ira Berman(in individual capacity), Ira Berman(in official capacity), Monica Garcia(in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), Monica Garcia(in Individual Capacity), George Mc Kenna, III(in Individual Capacity), George Mc Kenna, III(in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), Monica Ratcliff (in Individual Capacity), Monica Ratcliff (in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District), Richard A. Vladovic (in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), Richard A. Vladovic (in Individual Capacity), J. Michelle Woods(in official capacity), J. Michelle Woods(in individual capacity ), Steve Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Natalie U. Luongo, Esq. in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application for an Order Precluding Plaintiff and Anyone Acting on His Behalf From Harassing, Directly Contacting, and/or Serving Pleadings on Represented Parties, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Declaration of Defendant Dr. Richard A. Vladovic in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application, #7 Declaration of Defendant Ira Berman in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application, #8 Proposed Order) (Luongo, Natalie)
October 10, 2016 Filing 67 REPLY Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (to Second Amended Complaint) #58 filed by Defendants Justo Avila, Justo Avila, Felipe Barragan, Felipe Barragan, Ira Berman, Ira Berman, Monica Garcia, Monica Garcia, George Mc Kenna, III, George Mc Kenna, III, Monica Ratcliff, Monica Ratcliff, Richard A. Vladovic, Richard A. Vladovic, J. Michelle Woods, J. Michelle Woods, Steve Zimer, Steve Zimmer. (Luongo, Natalie)
October 3, 2016 Filing 66 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo, re Memorandum in Opposition #65 served on 09/10/16. (afe)
October 3, 2016 Filing 65 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss #58 filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(afe)
September 30, 2016 Filing 64 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Luis Osollo, re: Second Amended Complaint, #53 served on 9/10/16. (mz)
September 30, 2016 Filing 63 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Luis Osollo, re: Second Amended Complaint, #53 served on 9/10/16. (mz)
September 30, 2016 Filing 62 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Luis Osollo, re: Second Amended Complaint, #53 served on 9/10/16. (mz)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Plaintiff is provided until October 13, 2016, to file an Opposition. (See Order for complete details) (afe)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar: denying #56 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File. (mz)
September 14, 2016 Filing 59 Defendants' CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Justo Avila (in individual capacity ), Justo Avila (in official capacity), Felipe Barragan(in official capacity), Felipe Barragan(in individual capacity ), Ira Berman(in individual capacity), Ira Berman(in official capacity), Monica Garcia(in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), Monica Garcia(in Individual Capacity), George Mc Kenna, III(in Individual Capacity), George Mc Kenna, III(in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), Monica Ratcliff (in Individual Capacity), Monica Ratcliff (in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District), Richard A. Vladovic (in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), Richard A. Vladovic (in Individual Capacity), J. Michelle Woods(in official capacity), J. Michelle Woods(in individual capacity ), Steve Zimer, Steve Zimmer, identifying Luis Osollo (Plaintiff); George McKenna III (Defendant); Monica Garcia (Defendant); Steve Zimmer (Defendant); Monica Ratliff (erroneously sued as "Monica Ratcliff") (Defendant); Dr. Richard A. Vladovic (Defendant); Ira Berman (Defendant); Justo Avila (Defendant); J. Michelle Woods (Defendant); and Felipe Barragan (Defendant). (Luongo, Natalie)
September 14, 2016 Filing 58 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (to Second Amended Complaint) filed by Defendants Justo Avila (in individual capacity ), Justo Avila (in official capacity), Felipe Barragan(in official capacity), Felipe Barragan(in individual capacity ), Ira Berman(in individual capacity), Ira Berman(in official capacity), Monica Garcia(in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), Monica Garcia(in Individual Capacity), George Mc Kenna, III(in Individual Capacity), George Mc Kenna, III(in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), Monica Ratcliff (in Individual Capacity), Monica Ratcliff (in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District), Richard A. Vladovic (in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), Richard A. Vladovic (in Individual Capacity), J. Michelle Woods(in official capacity), J. Michelle Woods(in individual capacity ), Steve Zimer, Steve Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party J. Michelle Woods(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party J. Michelle Woods(pty:dft)) (Luongo, Natalie)
September 13, 2016 Filing 57 SUMMONS ISSUED filed by Plaintiff Luis Osollo. (mz) Modified on 9/14/2016 (mz).
September 12, 2016 Filing 56 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Respond to the Second Amended Complaint filed by Attorney for Defendants Kirsten Barnes(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Constance Blackburn(in Individual Capacity), Helio Brasil(in Individual Capacity), C. Michael Conney(in Individual Capacity), Linda Darling-Hammond(in Individual Capacity ), Jose Gonzalez(in Individual Capacity), Kathleen Harris(in Individual Capacity ), Alicia Hinde(in Official Capacities as members of the California Commission On Teacher Credentialing), Georgette Imura(in Individual Capacity), Bonnie Klatt(in Individual Capacity), Shane Martin(in Individual Capacity), Mary Jane Roberts(in Individual Capacity), Haydee Rodriguez(in Individual Capacity), Sheila Ryskamp(in Official Capacities as members of the Committee of Credentials), Tine Sloan(in Individual Capacity), Tillie Soliz(in Individual Capacity), Juliet Tiffany -Morales, Rodonna Van Pelt(in Official Capacities as members of the Committee of Credentials). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Kirsten Barnes(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Constance Blackburn(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Helio Brasil(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party C. Michael Conney(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Jose Gonzalez(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Kathleen Harris(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Alicia Hinde(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Georgette Imura(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Bonnie Klatt(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Shane Martin(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Mary Jane Roberts(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Haydee Rodriguez(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Sheila Ryskamp(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Tine Sloan(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Tillie Soliz(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Juliet Tiffany -Morales(pty:dft)) (Aronis, Stephen)
September 8, 2016 Filing 55 AMENDED CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiff Luis Osollo. Amendment to Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 . (mz)
August 31, 2016 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Luis Osollo in Support of Second Amended Complaint #53 filed by Plaintiff Luis Osollo. (afe)
August 31, 2016 Filing 53 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants amending First Amended Complaint #6 , filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. (afe)
August 2, 2016 Filing 52 NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. In light of the Court's ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND #51 , the EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File #22 is DENIED as moot. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (afe) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Plaintiff's FAC (Dkt. No. #6 ) is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. If Plaintiff still wishes to pursue this action, he shall file a Second Amended Complaint within thirty (30) days. The Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. #16 ) is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's First Request for Extension of Time for Service of Process (Dkt. No. #7 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (See Order for complete details) (Attachments: #1 Civil Rights Complaint (Blank)) (afe)
July 29, 2016 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo as to Constance Blackburn(in Individual Capacity) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen Aronis, Deputy Attorney General. (afe)
July 29, 2016 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo as to Tine Sloan(in Individual Capacity) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen Aronis, Deputy Attorney General. (afe)
July 29, 2016 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo as to Linda Darling-Hammond (in Individual Capacity ) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen Aronis, Deputy Attorney General. (afe)
July 29, 2016 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo as to Kathleen Harris(in Individual Capacity ) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen Aronis, Deputy Attorney General. (afe)
July 29, 2016 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo as to Bonnie Klatt(in Individual Capacity) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen Aronis, Deputy Attorney General. (afe)
July 29, 2016 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo as to Kirsten Barnes(in Individual Capacity) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen Aronis, Deputy Attorney General. (afe)
July 29, 2016 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo as to C. Michael Conney(in Individual Capacity) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen Aronis, Deputy Attorney General. (afe)
July 29, 2016 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo as to Jose Gonzalez(in Individual Capacity) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen Aronis, Deputy Attorney General. (afe)
July 29, 2016 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo as to Georgette Imura (in Individual Capacity) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen Aronis, Deputy Attorney General. (afe)
July 29, 2016 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo as to Richard Zegget(in Individual Capacity) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen Aronis, Deputy Attorney General. (afe)
July 29, 2016 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo as to Juliet Tiffany-Morales, waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen Aronis, Deputy Attorney General. (afe)
July 29, 2016 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo as to Tillie Soliz (in Individual Capacity) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen Aronis, Deputy Attorney General. (afe)
July 29, 2016 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo as to Sheila Ryskamp(in Individual Capacity) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen Aronis, Deputy Attorney General. (afe)
July 29, 2016 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo as to Haydee Rodriguez(in Individual Capacity), waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen Aronis, Deputy Attorney General. (afe)
July 29, 2016 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo as to Mary Jane Roberts (in Individual Capacity), waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen Aronis, Deputy Attorney General. (afe)
July 29, 2016 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo as to Shane Martin (in Individual Capacity) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen Aronis, Deputy Attorney General. (afe)
July 29, 2016 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo as to Alicia Hinde(in Individual Capacity), waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen Aronis, Deputy Attorney General. (afe)
July 29, 2016 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo as to Helio Brasil(in Individual Capacity), waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen Aronis, Deputy Attorney General. (afe)
July 29, 2016 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Petitioner's EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time #22 filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. (afe)
July 29, 2016 Filing 23 PETITIONER'S DECLARATION in Support of his EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time #22 filed by Plaintiff Luis Osollo. (afe)
July 29, 2016 Filing 22 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time for Services of Process of Summons and Complaint Against Defendants filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (afe)
July 26, 2016 Filing 50 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo, re First REQUEST for Extension of Time for Services of Process of Summons and Complaint #7 served on 07/23/16. (afe)
July 26, 2016 Filing 49 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo, re First REQUEST for Extension of Time for Services of Process of Summons and Complaint #7 served on 07/25/16. (afe)
July 26, 2016 Filing 48 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo, re First REQUEST for Extension of Time for Services of Process of Summons and Complaint #7 served on 07/24/16. (afe)
July 26, 2016 Filing 47 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo, re First REQUEST for Extension of Time for Services of Process of Summons and Complaint #7 served on 07/22/16. (afe)
July 26, 2016 Filing 46 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo, re First REQUEST for Extension of Time for Services of Process of Summons and Complaint #7 served on 07/23/16. (afe)
July 26, 2016 Filing 45 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo, re First REQUEST for Extension of Time for Services of Process of Summons and Complaint #7 served on 07/23/16. (afe)
July 26, 2016 Filing 44 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo, re First REQUEST for Extension of Time for Services of Process of Summons and Complaint #7 served on 07/22/16. (afe)
July 26, 2016 Filing 43 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo, re First REQUEST for Extension of Time for Services of Process of Summons and Complaint #7 served on 07/22/16. (afe)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Defendant's request for an extension of time #18 is granted; and Defendant Barragan shall file his response no later than August 29, 2016. Any other LAUSD Defendant that will be represented by Peterson Bradford Burkwitz who has been, or will be, served prior to August 8, 2016, may also have an extension of time up through and including August 29, 2016 to file a response. (afe)
July 20, 2016 Filing 20 LODGED Notice of Dismissal as to Barbara Kilponen, Doe Defendant known only as Dr. Doe Ross or K. Ross and Doe Defendant Partnership for Los Angeles Schools filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. (afe)
July 20, 2016 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE as to Richard A. Vladovic served on 07/17/16 filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. (afe)
July 20, 2016 Filing 18 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 8/29/2016 re Amended Complaint #6 filed by Defendants Justo Avila (in individual capacity ), Justo Avila (in official capacity), Felipe Barragan(in official capacity), Felipe Barragan(in individual capacity ), Ira Berman(in individual capacity), Ira Berman(in official capacity), Monica Garcia(in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), Monica Garcia(in Individual Capacity), George Mc Kenna, III(in Individual Capacity), George Mc Kenna, III(in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), Monica Ratcliff (in Individual Capacity), Monica Ratcliff (in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District), Richard A. Vladovic (in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), Richard A. Vladovic (in Individual Capacity), Steve Zimer, Steve Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Natalie U. Luongo, Esq. in Support of Defendant Felipe Barragan's Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time To Respond to the First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party Felipe Barragan(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party Felipe Barragan(pty:dft)) (Luongo, Natalie)
July 18, 2016 Filing 17 Defendant's CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Justo Avila (in individual capacity ), Justo Avila (in official capacity), Ira Berman(in individual capacity), Ira Berman(in official capacity), Monica Garcia(in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), Monica Garcia(in Individual Capacity), George Mc Kenna, III(in Individual Capacity), George Mc Kenna, III(in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), Monica Ratcliff (in Individual Capacity), Monica Ratcliff (in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District), Richard A. Vladovic (in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), Richard A. Vladovic (in Individual Capacity), Steve Zimer, Steve Zimmer, identifying Luis Osollo (Plaintiff); George McKenna III (Defendant); Monica Garcia (Defendant); Steve Zimmer (Defendant); Monica Ratliff (erroneously sued as "Monica Ratcliff") (Defendant); Dr. Richard A. Vladovic (Defendant); Ira Berman (Defendant); and Justo Avila. (Luongo, Natalie)
July 18, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (to First Amended Complaint) filed by Defendants Justo Avila (in individual capacity ), Justo Avila (in official capacity), Ira Berman(in individual capacity), Ira Berman(in official capacity), Monica Garcia(in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), Monica Garcia(in Individual Capacity), George Mc Kenna, III(in Individual Capacity), George Mc Kenna, III(in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), Monica Ratcliff (in Individual Capacity), Monica Ratcliff (in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District), Richard A. Vladovic (in Official Capacities as members of the Governing Board of the Los Angeles Unified School District ), Richard A. Vladovic (in Individual Capacity), Steve Zimer, Steve Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party Justo Avila (pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party Justo Avila (pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party Ira Berman(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party Ira Berman(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party Monica Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party Monica Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party George Mc Kenna, III(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party George Mc Kenna, III(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party Monica Ratcliff (pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party Monica Ratcliff (pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party Richard A. Vladovic (pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party Richard A. Vladovic (pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party Steve Zimer(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Ursula Luongo added to party Steve Zimmer(pty:dft)) (Luongo, Natalie)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Defendant's request for an extension of time #14 is granted; and, Defendant shall file her response no later than August 29, 2016. (afe)
July 14, 2016 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Respond to the First Amended Complaint filed by Attorney for Defendant Rodonna Van Pelt(in Official Capacities as members of the Committee of Credentials). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Rodonna Van Pelt(pty:dft)) (Aronis, Stephen)
July 14, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Attorney for Defendant Linda Darling-Hammond(in Individual Capacity ), (Attorney Stephen A Aronis added to party Linda Darling-Hammond(pty:dft))(Aronis, Stephen)
July 11, 2016 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE as to Justo Avila served on 07/07/16 filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. (afe)
July 11, 2016 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE as to Rodonna Van Pelt served on 06/26/., served on 06/26/16. (afe)
July 11, 2016 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed as to Alex Contreras served on 06/26/16 by plaintiff Luis Osollo. (afe)
July 11, 2016 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE as to Ira Berman served on 07/10/16 filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo.(afe)
July 11, 2016 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE as to Felipe Barragan served on 06/27/16 filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. (afe)
July 7, 2016 Filing 7 First REQUEST for Extension of Time for Services of Process of Summons and Complaint Against Defendants filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (afe)
June 15, 2016 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending Complaint - (Referred) #1 ; JURY DEMAND, filed by plaintiff Luis Osollo. (afe)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 is hereby GRANTED. (afe)
May 3, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car)
May 3, 2016 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Luis Osollo (car)
May 3, 2016 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis With Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Luis Osollo. (car)
May 3, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Defendants. Case assigned to Judge S. James Otero and referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar, filed by Plaintiff Luis Osollo. (car) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/8/2016) (lmh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2016: #1 Complaint Part 1) (lmh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luis Osollo v. Linda Darling-Hammond et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Darling-Hammond
Represented By: Stephen A Aronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Vladovic
Represented By: Natalie Ursula Luongo
Represented By: Avi Burkwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mistie Barela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Michael Conney
Represented By: Stephen A Aronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Carvajales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Klatt
Represented By: Stephen A Aronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanche Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Torres
Represented By: Natalie Ursula Luongo
Represented By: Avi Burkwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constance Blackburn
Represented By: Stephen A Aronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. I. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Zimmer
Represented By: Natalie Ursula Luongo
Represented By: Avi Burkwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamar Galatzan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Doe Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Hinde
Represented By: Stephen A Aronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justo Avila
Represented By: Natalie Ursula Luongo
Represented By: Avi Burkwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Mc Kenna, III
Represented By: Natalie Ursula Luongo
Represented By: Avi Burkwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Conteras
Represented By: Natalie Ursula Luongo
Represented By: Avi Burkwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Garcia
Represented By: Natalie Ursula Luongo
Represented By: Avi Burkwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felipe Barragan
Represented By: Natalie Ursula Luongo
Represented By: Avi Burkwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. M. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helio Brasil
Represented By: Stephen A Aronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haydee Rodriguez
Represented By: Stephen A Aronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Jane Roberts
Represented By: Stephen A Aronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgette Imura
Represented By: Stephen A Aronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodonna Van Pelt
Represented By: Stephen A Aronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. G. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Zimer
Represented By: Natalie Ursula Luongo
Represented By: Avi Burkwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Gonzalez
Represented By: Stephen A Aronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Martin
Represented By: Stephen A Aronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennett Kayser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Pavidis
Represented By: Stephen A Aronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juliet Tiffany-Morales
Represented By: Stephen A Aronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Zeiger
Represented By: Stephen A Aronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juliet Tiffany -Morales
Represented By: Stephen A Aronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Ratcliff
Represented By: Natalie Ursula Luongo
Represented By: Avi Burkwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Harris
Represented By: Stephen A Aronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendant The Partnership for Los Angeles Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Kilponen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tine Sloan
Represented By: Stephen A Aronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Michelle Woods
Represented By: Natalie Ursula Luongo
Represented By: Avi Burkwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Ryskamp
Represented By: Stephen A Aronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Sumpter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tillie Soliz
Represented By: Stephen A Aronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Contreras
Represented By: Natalie Ursula Luongo
Represented By: Avi Burkwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ira Berman
Represented By: Natalie Ursula Luongo
Represented By: Avi Burkwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirsten Barnes
Represented By: Stephen A Aronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Number 2 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Number 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Osollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?