The California Institute of Technology v. Broadcom Limited et al
Plaintiff: The California Institute of Technology
Defendant: Broadcom Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited and Cypress Semiconductor Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv03714
Filed: May 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1367 ORDER GRANTING CALTECHS APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL, #1341 by Judge George H. Wu: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff California Institute of Technologys (Plaintiff or Caltech) Application to File Under Seal, and the following documents are hereby SEALED: Caltechs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment ofNoninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,421,032 (Opposition). See order for further details. (shb)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1366 ORDER GRANTING CALTECHS APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu. Having considered the papers, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff California Instituteof Technologys (Plaintiff or Caltech) Application to File Under Seal, and the following documents are hereby SEALED: Caltechs Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff Caltechs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Copying Secondary Consideration of Non-Obviousness (CaltechsOpposition). See order for details. (shb)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1365 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: GRANTING #1326 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. (shb)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1364 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: GRANTING #1329 BROADCOM AND APPLES MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. (shb)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1363 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: GRANTING #1320 BROADCOM AND APPLE'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. (shb)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1362 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: GRANTING #1331 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. (shb)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1361 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: GRANTING #1345 CALTECH'E APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (shb)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1360 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: GRANTING #1347 CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (shb)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1359 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: GRANTING #1352 APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (shb)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1358 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1318 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1357 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: granting #1321 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1356 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: granting #1312 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1355 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: granting #1308 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1354 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1353 served on 7/25/2019. (Briggs, Todd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1353 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Joint Report in Response to June 17, 2019 Minute Order under seal #1352 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Joint Report)(Briggs, Todd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1352 APPLICATION to file document Joint Report in Response to June 17, 2019 Minute Order under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Joint Report, #2 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1351 JOINT REPORT of Response to June 17, 2019 Minute Order filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Briggs, Todd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1350 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever and Stay Caltech's Claims Against Apple #1306 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Dowd, James)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1349 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1346 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1348 served on 7/19/2019. (Briggs, Todd)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1348 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #1347 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum, #2 Unredacted Document Statement of Facts, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. A, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. C)(Briggs, Todd)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1347 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Memorandum, #2 Redacted Document Statement of Facts, #3 Redacted Document Ex. A, #4 Redacted Document Ex. C, #5 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1346 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #1345 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum, #2 Unredacted Document Declaration, #3 Unredacted Document Statement of Facts)(Briggs, Todd)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1345 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Memorandum, #2 Redacted Document Declaration, #3 Redacted Document Statement of Facts, #4 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1344 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #1340 Caltech's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Pre-Suit Indirect Infringement and No Willfulness served on 7/19/2019. (Briggs, Todd)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1343 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #1342 Caltech's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,421,032 served on 7/19/2019. (Briggs, Todd)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1342 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Caltechs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,421,032 under seal #1341 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opposition, #2 Unredacted Document Response to Statement of Undisputed Fact, #3 Unredacted Document Declaration of Dr. Shoemake, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit 5, #5 Unredacted Document Exhibit 6)(Briggs, Todd)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1341 APPLICATION to file document Caltechs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,421,032 under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Opposition, #2 Redacted Document Response to Statement of Undisputed Fact, #3 Redacted Document Declaration of Dr. Shoemake, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit 5, #5 Redacted Document Exhibit 6, #6 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1340 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Pre-Suit Indirect Infringement and No Willfulness under seal #1339 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opposition, #2 Unredacted Document Response to Statement of Undisputed Fact, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit 1, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit 3, #5 Unredacted Document Exhibit 4, #6 Unredacted Document Exhibit 5)(Briggs, Todd)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1339 APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Pre-Suit Indirect Infringement and No Willfulness under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Opposition, #2 Redacted Document Response to Statement of Undisputed Fact, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit 1, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit 3, #5 Redacted Document Exhibit 4, #6 Redacted Document Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1338 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1327 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #1333 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #1322 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #1332 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1319 served on July 18, 2019. (Dowd, James)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1337 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Noninfringement for U.S. Patent No. 7,421,032 #1240 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Redacted Document Statement of Facts, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Redacted Document Exhibit 5, #9 Redacted Document Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1336 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to NO PRE-SUIT INDIRECT INFRINGEMENT AND NO WILLFULNESS #1218 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Redacted Document Statement of Facts, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Redacted Document Exhibit 3, #6 Redacted Document Exhibit 4, #7 Redacted Document Exhibit 5, #8 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1335 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Caltechs Purported Copying Secondary Consideration of Non-Obviousness #1249 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Statement of Facts, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit C)(Briggs, Todd)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1334 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to No Recovery of Pre-Suit Damages on U.S. Patent No. 7,116,710 #1226 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Declaration, #2 Redacted Document Statement of Facts)(Briggs, Todd)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1333 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Caltech's Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Lorin Hitt, Dr. Wayne Stark, Dr. Andrew Blanksby, and Mr. Vincent Thomas Relating to Damages under seal #1331 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opposition, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. 1, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. 2, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 4, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. 5, #6 Unredacted Document Ex. 6, #7 Unredacted Document Ex. 18)(Thompson, Aaron)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1332 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Broadcom And Apples Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Strike Certain Opinions Other Than Those Related To Non-Infringement Of Dr. Wayne Stark And Dr. Andrew Blanksby under seal #1329 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opposition, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit 1, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit 3, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit 4, #5 Unredacted Document Exhibit 5, #6 Unredacted Document Exhibit 7, #7 Unredacted Document Exhibit 8, #8 Unredacted Document Exhibit 9)(Selwyn, Mark)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1331 APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Caltech's Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Lorin Hitt, Dr. Wayne Stark, Dr. Andrew Blanksby, and Mr. Vincent Thomas Relating to Damages under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Opposition, #3 Redacted Document Ex. 1, #4 Redacted Document Ex. 2, #5 Redacted Document Ex. 4, #6 Redacted Document Ex. 5, #7 Redacted Document Ex. 6, #8 Redacted Document Ex. 18)(Thompson, Aaron)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1330 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions Relating to Damages #1224 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thompson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12 (Part 1), #14 Exhibit 12 (Part 2), #15 Exhibit 12 (Part 3), #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18)(Thompson, Aaron)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1329 APPLICATION to file document Broadcom And Apples Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Strike Certain Opinions Other Than Those Related To Non-Infringement Of Dr. Wayne Stark And Dr. Andrew Blanksby under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Opposition, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit 1, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit 3, #5 Redacted Document Exhibit 4, #6 Redacted Document Exhibit 5, #7 Redacted Document Exhibit 7, #8 Redacted Document Exhibit 8, #9 Redacted Document Exhibit 9)(Selwyn, Mark)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1328 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions Other Than Those Related to Non-Infringement of Defendants Experts Dr. Wayne Stark and Dr. Andrew Blanksby #1220 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, #2 Exhibit 1 - Redacted, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 - Redacted, #5 Exhibit 4 - Redacted, #6 Exhibit 5 - Redacted, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7 - Redacted, #9 Exhibit 8 - Redacted, #10 Exhibit 9 - Redacted)(Selwyn, Mark)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1327 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of Marking under seal #1326 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opposition, #2 Unredacted Document Response to Statement of Facts)(Dowd, James)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1326 APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of Marking under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Opposition, #3 Redacted Document Response to Statement of Facts)(Dowd, James)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1325 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to The Issue of Marking #1215 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Response to Statement of Facts)(Dowd, James)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1324 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,, #1323 served on 7/18/19. (Briggs, Todd)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1323 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #1321 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opp to MTE Teece, #2 Exhibit A to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #3 Exhibit B to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #4 Exhibit C to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #5 Exhibit D to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #6 Exhibit E to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #7 Exhibit F to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #8 Exhibit G to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #9 Exhibit H to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #10 Exhibit I to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #11 Exhibit J to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #12 Exhibit K to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #13 Exhibit L to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #14 Exhibit M to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #15 Exhibit N to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #16 Exhibit P to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #17 Exhibit Q to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece)(Briggs, Todd)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1322 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document BROADCOM AND APPLES OPPOSITION TO CALTECHS MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF DEFENDANTS EXPERT VINCENT THOMAS under seal #1320 filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8)(Selwyn, Mark)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1321 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Opp to MTE Teece, #2 Exhibit A to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #3 Exhibit B to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #4 Exhibit C to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #5 Exhibit D to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #6 Exhibit E to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #7 Exhibit F to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #8 Exhibit G to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #9 Exhibit H to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #10 Exhibit I to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #11 Exhibit J to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #12 Exhibit K to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #13 Exhibit L to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #14 Exhibit M to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #15 Exhibit N to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #16 Exhibit P to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #17 Exhibit Q to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #18 Proposed Order re Appl to File Under Seal)(Briggs, Todd)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1320 APPLICATION to file document BROADCOM AND APPLES OPPOSITION TO CALTECHS MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF DEFENDANTS EXPERT VINCENT THOMAS under seal filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8)(Selwyn, Mark)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1319 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Validity under seal #1318 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opposition, #2 Unredacted Document Statement of Facts, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. 1, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 2)(Dowd, James)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1318 APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Validity under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Opposition, #3 Redacted Document Statement of Facts, #4 Redacted Document Ex. 1, #5 Redacted Document Ex. 2)(Dowd, James)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1317 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions Of Dr. David J. Teece #1244 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #2 Exhibit A to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #3 Exhibit B to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #4 Exhibit C to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #5 Exhibit D to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #6 Exhibit E to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #7 Exhibit F to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #8 Exhibit G to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #9 Exhibit H to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #10 Exhibit I to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #11 Exhibit J to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #12 Exhibit K to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #13 Exhibit L to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #14 Exhibit M to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #15 Exhibit N to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #16 Exhibit O to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #17 Exhibit P to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece, #18 Exhibit Q to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Teece)(Briggs, Todd)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1316 OPPOSITION TO CALTECHS MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF DEFENDANTS EXPERT VINCENT THOMAS re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendants' Expert Vincent Thomas #1233 filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Selwyn, Mark)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1315 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to of Validity #1228 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Response to Statement of Facts, #2 Declaration of Dowd, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Dowd, James)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1314 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #1313 served on 7/18/19. (Briggs, Todd)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1313 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #1312 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opp to MTE Lawton, #2 Exhibit A to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #3 Exhibit B to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #4 Exhibit C to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #5 Exhibit D to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #6 Exhibit E to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #7 Exhibit F to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #8 Exhibit G to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #9 Exhibit H to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #10 Exhibit I to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #11 Exhibit J to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #12 Exhibit K to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton)(Briggs, Todd)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1312 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Opp to MTE Lawton, #2 Exhibit A to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #3 Exhibit B to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #4 Exhibit C to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #5 Exhibit D to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #6 Exhibit E to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #7 Exhibit F to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #8 Exhibit G to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #9 Exhibit H to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #10 Exhibit I to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #11 Exhibit J to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #12 Exhibit K to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #13 Proposed Order re Appl to File Under Seal)(Briggs, Todd)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1311 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Catharine M. Lawton #1253 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #2 Exhibit A to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #3 Exhibit B to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #4 Exhibit C to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #5 Exhibit D to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #6 Exhibit E to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #7 Exhibit F to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #8 Exhibit G to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #9 Exhibit H to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #10 Exhibit I to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #11 Exhibit J to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton, #12 Exhibit K to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Lawton)(Briggs, Todd)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1310 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #1309 served on 7/18/19. (Asperger, James)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1309 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #1308 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opp to Severance and Stay, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl ISO Opp to Severance and Stay, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl ISO Opp to Severance and Stay, #4 Exhibit 3 to Decl ISO Opp to Severance and Stay, #5 Exhibit 4 to Decl ISO Opp to Severance and Stay, #6 Exhibit 5 to Decl ISO Opp to Severance and Stay, #7 Exhibit 6 to Decl ISO Opp to Severance and Stay)(Asperger, James)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1308 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opp to Severance and Stay, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl ISO Opp to Severance and Stay, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl ISO Opp to Severance and Stay, #4 Exhibit 3 to Decl ISO Opp to Severance and Stay, #5 Exhibit 4 to Decl ISO Opp to Severance and Stay, #6 Exhibit 5 to Decl ISO Opp to Severance and Stay, #7 Exhibit 6 to Decl ISO Opp to Severance and Stay, #8 Proposed Order re Appl to File Under Seal)(Asperger, James)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1307 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever and Stay Caltech's Claims Against Apple #1306 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Opp to Severance and Stay, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl ISO Opp to Severance and Stay, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl ISO Opp to Severance and Stay, #4 Exhibit 3 to Decl ISO Opp to Severance and Stay, #5 Exhibit 4 to Decl ISO Opp to Severance and Stay, #6 Exhibit 5 to Decl ISO Opp to Severance and Stay, #7 Exhibit 6 to Decl ISO Opp to Severance and Stay)(Asperger, James)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1306 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever and Stay Caltech's Claims Against Apple filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. Motion set for hearing on 8/8/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Dowd, James)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1304 Joint REPORT of Regarding Confidentiality of Final Ruling On: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment as to No Inequitable Conduct filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Asperger, James)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1303 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CALTECH'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF LARRY S. NIXON re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Larry S. Nixon #1246 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Asperger, James)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1305 SEALED MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H. Wu. (mrgo)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1301 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - ORDER STRIKING MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT #1289 by Judge George H. Wu. Defendants' failure to meet the motion cutoff alone is sufficient basis to support striking Defendants' motion. However, the context of Defendants' delay offers additional reasons on the merits (e.g. lack of good cause for lack of diligence, likely additional delay of schedule, and undue prejudice) that would independently support denial of Defendants' motion. For these reasons, the Court DENIES Defendants' Motion. (mrgo)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1300 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Document,, #1295 , Sealed Document,,, #1294 , Sealed Document,, #1298 , Sealed Document,, #1299 , Sealed Document,, #1296 , Sealed Document, #1297 , Sealed Document, #1293 served on June 28, 2019. (Dowd, James)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1299 SEALED DOCUMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Catharine M. Lawton #1253 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1276 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 16, #13 Exhibit 25, #14 Exhibit 26)(Dowd, James)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1298 SEALED DOCUMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions Of Dr. David J. Teece #1244 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1274 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10 Part 1, #11 Exhibit 10 Part 2, #12 Exhibit 10 Part 3, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 18)(Dowd, James)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1297 SEALED DOCUMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Caltechs Purported Copying Secondary Consideration of Non-Obviousness #1249 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1265 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Facts, #2 Exhibit 5)(Dowd, James)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1296 SEALED DOCUMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Noninfringement for U.S. Patent No. 7,421,032 #1240 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1273 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Facts, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit S-2 Part 1, #7 Exhibit S-2 Part 2, #8 Exhibit S-3)(Dowd, James)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1295 SEALED DOCUMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to No Recovery of Pre-Suit Damages on U.S. Patent No. 7,116,710 #1226 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1270 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Facts, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit S-2, #8 Exhibit S-3)(Dowd, James)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1302 ORDER DENYING BROADCOM AND APPLE'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL #1290 by Judge George H. Wu. (yl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1294 SEALED DOCUMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to NO PRE-SUIT INDIRECT INFRINGEMENT AND NO WILLFULNESS #1218 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1277 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Facts, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit 20, #17 Exhibit 21, #18 Exhibit 22, #19 Exhibit 23 Part 1, #20 Exhibit 23 Part 2, #21 Exhibit 24, #22 Exhibit 26, #23 Exhibit 27, #24 Exhibit 28, #25 Exhibit 29)(Dowd, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1293 SEALED DOCUMENT Offer of Proof re Miscellaneous Document #1237 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1272 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dowd, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1292 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1291 served on June 27, 2019. (Dowd, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1291 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #1290 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Motion to Amend, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. C, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. D, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. E, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. G, #6 Unredacted Document Ex. H)(Dowd, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1290 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Motion to Amend, #3 Redacted Document Ex.C, #4 Redacted Document Ex.D, #5 Redacted Document Ex.E, #6 Redacted Document Ex.G, #7 Redacted Document Ex.H)(Dowd, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1289 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. Motion set for hearing on 8/8/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Supplement Amended Answer, #3 Declaration of Dowd, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Proposed Order) (Dowd, James)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1288 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, Granting Stipulation Regarding Schedule for Apple and Broadcom's Motion to Sever and Stay Caltech's Claims Against Apple and Status Conference #1278 . The Court sets the schedule as follows: Status Conference set for 8/8/2019 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1287 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: Granting #1262 Defendants' APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1286 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document, #1285 , Sealed Document,,, #1283 , Sealed Document,, #1282 served on June 25, 2019. (Asperger, James)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1285 SEALED DOCUMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Larry S. Nixon #1246 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1275 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology.(Briggs, Todd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1284 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document, #1279 , Sealed Document, #1281 , Sealed Document, #1280 served on 6/25/2019. (Asperger, James)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1283 SEALED DOCUMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions Other Than Those Related to Non-Infringement of Defendants Experts Dr. Wayne Stark and Dr. Andrew Blanksby #1220 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1268 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Biddinger Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Biddinger Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Biddinger Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to Biddinger Declaration, #5 Exhibit E to Biddinger Declaration, #6 Exhibit F to Biddinger Declaration, #7 Exhibit G to Biddinger Declaration, #8 Exhibit J to Biddinger Declaration, #9 Exhibit K to Biddinger Declaration, #10 Exhibit L to Biddinger Declaration)(Briggs, Todd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1282 SEALED DOCUMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to of Validity #1228 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1266 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Validity, #2 Exhibit D to Briggs Declaration, #3 Exhibit E to Briggs Declaration, #4 Exhibit F to Briggs Declaration, #5 Exhibit G to Briggs Declaration, #6 Exhibit I to Briggs Declaration)(Briggs, Todd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1281 SEALED DOCUMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendants' Expert Vincent Thomas #1233 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1271 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F)(Asperger, James)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1280 SEALED DOCUMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions Relating to Damages #1224 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1269 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Asperger, James)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1279 SEALED DOCUMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to The Issue of Marking #1215 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1267 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B.1, #4 Exhibit B.2, #5 Exhibit B.3, #6 Exhibit B.4, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F.1, #11 Exhibit F.2)(Asperger, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1278 Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Hearing on Motion to Sever and Stay and Status Conference filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Aaron)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1277 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1219 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1276 ORDER GRANTING BROADCOM AND APPLE'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1254 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1275 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1247 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1274 ORDER GRANTING BROADCOM AND APPLE'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1245 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1273 ORDER GRANTING BROADCOM AND APPLE'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1241 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1272 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1238 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1271 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1234 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1270 ORDER GRANTING BROADCOM AND APPLE'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1232 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1269 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1225 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1268 ORDER CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1221 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1267 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1216 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1266 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1230 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1265 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1251 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1264 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc.((as to Counterclaim Doc No 32 filed 8/1/16)), Apple Inc.((as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)), Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation((as to Counterclaim Doc No 32 filed 8/1/16)), Broadcom Corporation((as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)), Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1263 served on 6/21/2019. (Thompson, Aaron)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1263 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF Joint APPLICATION to file document Confidentiality of Final Ruling under seal #1262 filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Thompson, Aaron)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1262 Joint APPLICATION to file document Confidentiality of Final Ruling under seal filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1)(Thompson, Aaron)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1261 Joint APPLICATION to file document Confidentiality of Final Ruling under seal filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1)(Thompson, Aaron)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1260 JOINT REPORT of Confidentiality of Final Ruling filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Thompson, Aaron)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1259 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Catharine M. Lawton #1253 , APPLICATION to file document Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Catharine M. Lawton under seal #1254 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Noninfringement for U.S. Patent No. 7,421,032 #1240 , APPLICATION to file document Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement for U.S. Patent No. 7,421,032 under seal #1241 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions Of Dr. David J. Teece #1244 , APPLICATION to file document Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. David J. Teece under seal #1245 , APPLICATION to file document Offer of Proof under seal #1238 served on June 21, 2019. (Selwyn, Mark)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1258 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1252 served on June 21, 2019. (Thompson, Aaron)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1257 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #1236 served on June 21, 2019. (Dowd, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1256 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Catharine M. Lawton under seal #1254 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. 3, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. 4, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 5, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. 6, #6 Unredacted Document Ex. 7, #7 Unredacted Document Ex. 8, #8 Unredacted Document Ex. 9, #9 Unredacted Document Ex. 10, #10 Unredacted Document Ex. 11, #11 Unredacted Document Ex. 12, #12 Unredacted Document Ex. 13, #13 Unredacted Document Ex. 16, #14 Unredacted Document Ex. 25, #15 Unredacted Document Ex. 26)(Selwyn, Mark)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1255 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,, #1223 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #1231 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1248 served on June 20, 2019. (Briggs, Todd)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1254 APPLICATION to file document Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Catharine M. Lawton under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1253 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Catharine M. Lawton filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Selwyn, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18 (Part 1), #21 Exhibit 18 (Part 2), #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Proposed Order) (Selwyn, Mark)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1252 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Partial Summary Judgment on Caltechs Purported Copying Secondary Consideration of Non-Obviousness under seal #1251 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum, #2 Unredacted Document Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit 5)(Thompson, Aaron)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1251 APPLICATION to file document Partial Summary Judgment on Caltechs Purported Copying Secondary Consideration of Non-Obviousness under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Memorandum, #3 Redacted Document Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit 5)(Thompson, Aaron)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1250 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. David J. Teece under seal #1245 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. 1, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. 2, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 3, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. 4, #6 Unredacted Document Ex. 5, #7 Unredacted Document Ex. 6, #8 Unredacted Document Ex. 7, #9 Unredacted Document Ex. 8, #10 Unredacted Document Ex. 9, #11 Unredacted Document Ex. 10 (Part 1), #12 Unredacted Document Ex. 10 (Part 2), #13 Unredacted Document Ex. 10 (Part 3), #14 Unredacted Document Ex. 11, #15 Unredacted Document Ex. 12, #16 Unredacted Document Ex. 13, #17 Unredacted Document Ex. 18)(Selwyn, Mark)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1249 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Caltechs Purported Copying Secondary Consideration of Non-Obviousness filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Memorandum, #2 Redacted Document Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #3 Declaration of Aaron S. Thompson, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5 - Redacted, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Declaration of Dr. Adrian Stephens, #15 Exhibit A-1, #16 Exhibit A-2, #17 Proposed Order) (Thompson, Aaron)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1248 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Ex. 4 of Shyr Declaration ISO Caltech's Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Larry S. Nixon under seal #1247 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4 to Shyr Declaration)(Briggs, Todd)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1247 APPLICATION to file document Ex. 4 of Shyr Declaration ISO Caltech's Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Larry S. Nixon under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Ex. 4 to Shyr Declaration ISO Caltech's Motion to Exclude)(Briggs, Todd)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1246 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Larry S. Nixon filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Caltech's Motion to Exclude The Opinions of Larry S. Nixon, #2 Declaration of Margaret Shyr in Support of Caltech's Motion to Exclude, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 1 to Shyr Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2 to Shyr Declaration, #6 Exhibit 3 to Shyr Declaration, #7 Exhibit 4 to Shyr Declaration) (Briggs, Todd)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1245 APPLICATION to file document Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. David J. Teece under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1244 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions Of Dr. David J. Teece filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Selwyn, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Proposed Order) (Selwyn, Mark)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1243 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #1217 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1235 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #1227 served on 06/20/2019. (Asperger, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1242 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement for U.S. Patent No. 7,421,032 under seal #1241 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Unredacted Document Statement of Facts, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. 5, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 6, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. 7, #6 Unredacted Document Ex. 8, #7 Unredacted Document Ex. S-2 (Part 1), #8 Unredacted Document Ex. S-2 (Part 2), #9 Unredacted Document Ex. S-3)(Dowd, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1241 APPLICATION to file document Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement for U.S. Patent No. 7,421,032 under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dowd, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1240 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Noninfringement for U.S. Patent No. 7,421,032 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Supplement Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration of Dowd, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Declaration of Stark, #13 Exhibit S-1, #14 Exhibit S-2 (Part 1), #15 Exhibit S-2 (Part 2), #16 Exhibit S-3, #17 Proposed Order) (Dowd, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1239 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Offer of Proof under seal #1238 filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Offer of Proof, #2 Exhibit 1)(Thompson, Aaron)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1238 APPLICATION to file document Offer of Proof under seal filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Offer of Proof, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Aaron)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1237 Offer of Proof re Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dowd Decl., #2 Exhibit 1 (proposed to be sealed))(Thompson, Aaron)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1236 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion for Summary Judgment of No Recovery of Pre-Suit Damages on U.S. Patent No. 7,116,710 under seal #1232 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum, #2 Unredacted Document Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit 2, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit 3, #5 Unredacted Document Exhibit 4, #6 Unredacted Document Exhibit 5, #7 Unredacted Document Exhibit 6, #8 Unredacted Document Exhibit S-2, #9 Unredacted Document Exhibit S-3)(Dowd, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1235 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendants' Expert Vincent Thomas under seal #1234 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. A, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. B, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. C, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. E, #6 Unredacted Document Ex. F)(Asperger, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1234 APPLICATION to file document Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendants' Expert Vincent Thomas under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Memorandum, #2 Redacted Document Ex. A, #3 Redacted Document Ex. B, #4 Redacted Document Ex. C, #5 Redacted Document Ex. E, #6 Redacted Document Ex. F, #7 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1233 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendants' Expert Vincent Thomas filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Proposed Order) (Asperger, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1232 APPLICATION to file document Motion for Summary Judgment of No Recovery of Pre-Suit Damages on U.S. Patent No. 7,116,710 under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Memorandum, #3 Redacted Document Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit 2, #5 Redacted Document Exhibit 3, #6 Redacted Document Exhibit 4, #7 Redacted Document Exhibit 5, #8 Redacted Document Exhibit 6, #9 Redacted Document Exhibit S-2, #10 Redacted Document Exhibit S-3)(Dowd, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1231 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document in support of Caltech's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment of Validity under seal #1230 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Motion For Partial Summary Judgment of Validity, #2 Unredacted Document Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion For Partial Summary Judgment of Validity, #3 Exhibit D to Briggs Declaration, #4 Exhibit E to Briggs Declaration, #5 Exhibit F to Briggs Declaration, #6 Exhibit G to Briggs Declaration, #7 Exhibit I to Briggs Declaration)(Briggs, Todd)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1230 APPLICATION to file document in support of Caltech's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment of Validity under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Motion For Partial Summary Judgment of Validity, #3 Redacted Document Statement Of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion For Partial Summary Judgment of Validity, #4 Exhibit D to Briggs Declaration, #5 Exhibit E to Briggs Declaration, #6 Exhibit F to Briggs Declaration, #7 Exhibit G to Briggs Declaration, #8 Exhibit I to Briggs Declaration)(Briggs, Todd)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1229 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANTS Apple Inc.((as to Counterclaim Doc No 32 filed 8/1/16)), Apple Inc.((as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)), Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation((as to Counterclaim Doc No 32 filed 8/1/16)), Broadcom Corporation((as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)), Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,, #1222 served on 06/20/2019. (Thompson, Aaron)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1228 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to of Validity filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Motion For Partial Summary Judgment of Validity, #2 Statement Of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion For Partial Summary Judgment of Validity, #3 Declaration of Todd Briggs in Support of Plaintiffs Motion For Partial Summary Judgment of Validity, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit A to Briggs Declaration, #6 Exhibit B to Briggs Declaration, #7 Exhibit C to Briggs Declaration, #8 Exhibit D to Briggs Declaration, #9 Exhibit E to Briggs Declaration, #10 Exhibit F to Briggs Declaration, #11 Exhibit G to Briggs Declaration, #12 Exhibit H to Briggs Declaration, #13 Exhibit I to Briggs Declaration, #14 Exhibit J to Briggs Declaration, #15 Exhibit K to Briggs Declaration, #16 Exhibit L to Briggs Declaration, #17 Exhibit M to Briggs Declaration) (Briggs, Todd)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1227 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Hitt, Dr. Stark, Dr. Blanksby, and Mr. Thomas Relating to Damages under seal #1225 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. A, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. B, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. C, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. D, #6 Unredacted Document Ex. E, #7 Unredacted Document Ex. F, #8 Unredacted Document Ex. G, #9 Unredacted Document Ex. H, #10 Unredacted Document Ex. I, #11 Unredacted Document Ex. J)(Asperger, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1226 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to No Recovery of Pre-Suit Damages on U.S. Patent No. 7,116,710 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Memorandum, #2 Redacted Document Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #3 Declaration of James M. Dowd, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2 - Redacted, #6 Exhibit 3 - Redacted, #7 Exhibit 4 - Redacted, #8 Exhibit 5 - Redacted, #9 Exhibit 6 - Redacted, #10 Declaration of Dr. Wayne Stark, #11 Exhibit S-1, #12 Exhibit S-2 - Redacted, #13 Exhibit S-3 - Redacted, #14 Proposed Order) (Dowd, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1225 APPLICATION to file document Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Hitt, Dr. Stark, Dr. Blanksby, and Mr. Thomas Relating to Damages under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Memorandum, #3 Redacted Document Ex. A, #4 Redacted Document Ex. B, #5 Redacted Document Ex. C, #6 Redacted Document Ex. D, #7 Redacted Document Ex. E, #8 Redacted Document Ex. F, #9 Redacted Document Ex. G, #10 Redacted Document Ex. H, #11 Redacted Document Ex. I, #12 Redacted Document Ex. J)(Asperger, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1224 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions Relating to Damages filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Proposed Order) (Asperger, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1223 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document relating to Motion and Motion to Strike Certain Opinions Other Than Those Related to Non-Infringement of Defendants Experts Dr. Wayne Stark and Dr. Andrew Blanksby under seal #1221 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff Caltechs Motion to Strike Certain Opinions Other Than Those Related to Non-Infringement of Defendants Experts Dr. Wayne Stark and Dr. Andrew Blanksby, #2 Exhibit A to Biddinger Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Biddinger Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Biddinger Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Biddinger Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Biddinger Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Biddinger Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Biddinger Declaration, #9 Exhibit J to Biddinger Declaration, #10 Exhibit K to Biddinger Declaration, #11 Exhibit L to Biddinger Declaration)(Briggs, Todd)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1222 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to file document MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT OF NO PRE-SUIT INDIRECT INFRINGEMENT AND NO WILLFULNESS under seal #1219 filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Supplement Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 20, #19 Exhibit 21, #20 Exhibit 22, #21 Exhibit 23 (Part 1), #22 Exhibit 23 (Part 2), #23 Exhibit 24, #24 Exhibit 26, #25 Exhibit 27, #26 Exhibit 28, #27 Exhibit 29)(Thompson, Aaron)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1221 APPLICATION to file document relating to Motion and Motion to Strike Certain Opinions Other Than Those Related to Non-Infringement of Defendants Experts Dr. Wayne Stark and Dr. Andrew Blanksby under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1220 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions Other Than Those Related to Non-Infringement of Defendants Experts Dr. Wayne Stark and Dr. Andrew Blanksby filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff Caltechs Motion to Strike Certain Opinions Other Than Those Related to Non-Infringement of Defendants Experts Dr. Wayne Stark and Dr. Andrew Blanksby, #2 Declaration of Brian Biddinger in Support of Caltechs Motion to Strike Certain Opinions Other Than Those Related to Non-Infringement of Defendants Experts Dr. Wayne Stark and Dr. Andrew Blanksby, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit A to Biddinger Declaration, #5 Exhibit B to Biddinger Declaration, #6 Exhibit C to Biddinger Declaration, #7 Exhibit D to Biddinger Declaration, #8 Exhibit E to Biddinger Declaration, #9 Exhibit F to Biddinger Declaration, #10 Exhibit G to Biddinger Declaration, #11 Exhibit H to Biddinger Declaration, #12 Exhibit I to Biddinger Declaration, #13 Exhibit J to Biddinger Declaration, #14 Exhibit K to Biddinger Declaration, #15 Exhibit L to Biddinger Declaration) (Briggs, Todd)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1219 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to file document MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT OF NO PRE-SUIT INDIRECT INFRINGEMENT AND NO WILLFULNESS under seal filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Motion, #3 Redacted Document Statement of Facts, #4 Redacted Document Declaration, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21, #21 Exhibit 22, #22 Exhibit 23, #23 Exhibit 24, #24 Exhibit 26, #25 Exhibit 27, #26 Exhibit 28, #27 Exhibit 29)(Thompson, Aaron)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1218 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to NO PRE-SUIT INDIRECT INFRINGEMENT AND NO WILLFULNESS filed by DEFENDANTS Apple Inc.((as to Counterclaim Doc No 32 filed 8/1/16)), Apple Inc.((as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)), Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation((as to Counterclaim Doc No 32 filed 8/1/16)), Broadcom Corporation((as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)), Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Broadcom Limited. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Motion, #2 Redacted Document Statement of Facts, #3 Redacted Document Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Proposed Order) (Thompson, Aaron)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1217 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of Marking under seal #1216 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum, #2 Unredacted Document Statement of Facts, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. A, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. B (Part 1), #5 Unredacted Document Ex. B (Part 2), #6 Unredacted Document Ex. B (Part 3), #7 Unredacted Document Ex. B (Part 4), #8 Unredacted Document Ex. C, #9 Unredacted Document Ex. D, #10 Unredacted Document Ex. E, #11 Unredacted Document Ex. F (Part 1), #12 Unredacted Document Ex. F (Part 2))(Asperger, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1216 APPLICATION to file document Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of Marking under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Memorandum, #2 Redacted Document Statement of Facts, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Document Ex. A, #5 Redacted Document Ex. B, #6 Redacted Document Ex. C, #7 Redacted Document Ex. D, #8 Redacted Document Ex. E, #9 Redacted Document Ex. F)(Asperger, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1215 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to The Issue of Marking filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Redacted Document, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I) (Asperger, James)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1210 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, The California Institute of Technology(a California corporation (as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)) for Court Reporter. Court will contact Robin Ramirez at robinramirez@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Shyr, Margaret)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1214 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER REGARDING JUNE 13, 2019 JOINT REPORT AND OTHER ONGOING ISSUES by Judge George H. Wu. (Status Report due by 7/25/2019. Status Conference set for 8/1/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1213 MINUTES OF CALTECH'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF VALIDITY ON CLAIMS 20 AND 22 OF THE '710 PATENT UNDER 35 U.S.C. 103 BASED ON IPR ESTOPPEL UNDER 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) #844 ; PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF VALIDITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. 103 BASED ON IPR ESTOPPEL UNDER 35 U.S.C. 315(E)(2) FOR U.S. PATENT NO. 7,916,781 #845 ; DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) #887 ; DEFENDANTS' MOTION SEEKING PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S DECEMBER 28, 2018 ORDER REGARDING IPR ESTOPPEL OF CERTAIN CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 7,916,781 AND 7,421,032 #888 ; CALTECH'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INEQUITABLE CONDUCT #942 ; DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO JOINT INFRINGEMENT #959 ; DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE INFRINGEMENT OPINIONS OF DR. MICHAEL TANNER #964 ; CALTECH'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE IMPROPER CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPINIONS OF DR. STARK AND DR. BLANKSBY #968 ; CALTECH'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' EVIDENCE AND EXPERT TESTIMONY CONCERNING LATE-DISCLOSED NON-INFRINGING ALTERNATIVE #971 CALTECH'S MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF DEFENDANTS' EXPERTS BRENDAN FREY AND WAYNE STARK #974 ; CALTECH'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS' LATE-PRODUCED DOCUMENTS AND DR. HENRY PFISTER'S UNTIMELY EXPERT DEPOSITION TESTIMONY #1024 . Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu: taking under advisement #844 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; taking under advisement #845 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; taking under advisement #942 for Summary Judgment; taking under advisement #942 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; granting #959 for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #964 MOTION to Exclude; denying #968 MOTION to Exclude; denying #971 MOTION ; taking under advisement #974 MOTION ; taking under advisement #1024 MOTION to Exclude; Motion. (See document for full details) Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1212 SEALED DOCUMENT. (mrgo)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1211 MINUTES OF BROADCOM'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT AS TO EXTRATERRITORIAL SALES #975 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Tentative circulated is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. Broadcom's Motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1209 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited for Court Reporter. Court will contact Erik Marshall at erik.marshall@wilmerhale.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Dowd, James)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1208 Joint REPORT of Regarding Narrowing of Issues Based on First Round Motions filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Asperger, James)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1207 SEALED AMENDED MINUTES held before Judge George H. Wu re: Motion Hearing, #1206 . (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 of 2, #2 Attachment 2 of 2) (mrgo)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1206 MINUTES OF CALTECH'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF VALIDITY ON CLAIMS 20 AND 22 OF THE '710 PATENT UNDER 35 U.S.C. 103 BASED ON IPR ESTOPPEL UNDER 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) #844 ; PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF VALIDITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. 103 BASED ON IPR ESTOPPEL UNDER 35 U.S.C. 315(E)(2) FOR U.S. PATENT NO. 7,916,781 #845 ; DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) #887 ; DEFENDANTS' MOTION SEEKING PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURTS DECEMBER 28, 2018 ORDER REGARDING IPR ESTOPPEL OF CERTAIN CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 7,916,781 AND 7,421,032 #888 ; CALTECH'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INEQUITABLE CONDUCT #942 ; DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO JOINT INFRINGEMENT #959 ; DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE INFRINGEMENT OPINIONS OF DR. MICHAEL TANNER #964 ; CALTECH'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE IMPROPER CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPINIONS OF DR. STARK AND DR. BLANKSBY #968 ; CALTECH'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS EVIDENCE AND EXPERT TESTIMONY CONCERNING LATE-DISCLOSED NON-INFRINGING ALTERNATIVE CALTECH'S MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF DEFENDANTS' EXPERTS BRENDAN FREY AND WAYNE STARK #974 ; BROADCOM'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT AS TO EXTRATERRITORIAL SALES #975 ; CALTECH'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS' LATE-PRODUCED DOCUMENTS AND DR. HENRY PFISTERS UNTIMELY EXPERT DEPOSITION TESTIMONY #1024 Motion Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court's Tentative Rulings are circulated. Court hears oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, the Motions are continued to June 17, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie E Thibodeaux. (lom)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1205 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited for Court Reporter. Court will contact Erik Marshall at erik.marshall@wilmerhale.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Dowd, James)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1204 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, The California Institute of Technology(a California corporation (as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)) for Court Reporter. Court will contact Robin Ramirez at robinramirez@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Shyr, Margaret)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1203 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Defendant's Ex Parte Application to File a Response to CalTech's Supplemental Brief #1201 is granted. The merits of the matter will be addressed at the June 6, 2019 hearing. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 28, 2019 Filing 1202 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file RESPONSE TO CALTECHS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING EXCLUSION OF DR. PFISTERS ALLEGED EXPERT TESTIMONY #1201 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Briggs, Todd)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1201 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file RESPONSE TO CALTECHS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING EXCLUSION OF DR. PFISTERS ALLEGED EXPERT TESTIMONY filed by DEFENDANTS Apple Inc.((as to Counterclaim Doc No 32 filed 8/1/16)), Apple Inc.((as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)), Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation((as to Counterclaim Doc No 32 filed 8/1/16)), Broadcom Corporation((as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)), Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Dowd, James)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1200 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendants Apple Inc.((as to Counterclaim Doc No 32 filed 8/1/16)), Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation((as to Counterclaim Doc No 32 filed 8/1/16)), Broadcom Corporation, re Sealed Document, #1199 , Errata, #1198 served on 5/24/19. (Dowd, James)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1199 SEALED DOCUMENT Errata to Under Seal Exhibits re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1090 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,,,,, #1081 filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Defendants Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dkt. 1081-05 (Ex. 8), #2 Exhibit Dkt. 1081-12 (Ex. 17))(Dowd, James)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1198 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Broadcom Corporation. correcting Objection/Opposition (Motion related),, #1070 , Declaration,,,,, #1078 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket 888-7 (Ex. 5), #2 Exhibit Docket 1078-04 (Ex. 4), #3 Exhibit Docket 1078-20 (Ex. 20), #4 Exhibit Docket 1078-34 (Ex. 35), #5 Exhibit Docket 1078-35 (Ex. 36), #6 Exhibit Docket 1078-56 (Ex. 57))(Dowd, James)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1197 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, Granting Stipulation Regarding Hearing on Disputes Relating to Drs. Pfister's and Siegel's Document Productions and Depositions and Known or Used Listing of Evidence #1193 . Hearing set for 6/6/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (twdb)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1196 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technologyto Supplement,, #1186 Defendants' List of Particularized Evidence in Support of its Known or used Invalidity Theories (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Mitzenmacher, #2 Exhibit 1)(Briggs, Todd)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1195 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Document, #1194 served on May 21, 2019. (Dowd, James)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1194 SEALED DOCUMENT re Supplement,, #1186 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1192 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8)(Dowd, James)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1193 Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Hearing Regarding Disputes Relating to Drs. Pfister's and Siegel's Document Productions and Depositions and "Known or Used" Listing of Evidence filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Aaron)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1192 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1187 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1191 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Late Produced Documents and Dr. Henry Pfister's Untimely Expert Deposition Testimony #1024 Pursuant to the Order Regarding Pfister/Siegel #1172 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Asperger, James)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1190 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. correcting Supplement,, #1186 (Attachments: #1 Appendix E (Clean), #2 Appendix E (Redline), #3 Appendix F (Clean), #4 Appendix F (Redline), #5 Appendix G (Clean), #6 Appendix G (Redline), #7 Appendix H (Clean), #8 Appendix H (Redline))(Dowd, James)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1189 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1188 served on May 17, 2019. (Dowd, James)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1188 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #1187 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Ex. 4, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. 6, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. 7, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 8)(Dowd, James)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1187 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Ex. 4, #3 Redacted Document Ex. 6, #4 Redacted Document Ex. 7, #5 Redacted Document Ex. 8)(Dowd, James)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1186 SUPPLEMENT to Motion Related Document,,,,, #1118 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Hearing,, #1172 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E, #6 Appendix F, #7 Appendix G, #8 Appendix H, #9 Declaration of Dowd, #10 Exhibit 1, #11 Exhibit 2, #12 Exhibit 3, #13 Exhibit 4, #14 Exhibit 5, #15 Exhibit 6, #16 Exhibit 7, #17 Exhibit 8)(Dowd, James)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1185 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Document, #1182 , Sealed Document, #1183 , Sealed Document, #1184 served on May 15, 2019. (Dowd, James)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1184 SEALED DOCUMENT Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement As To Extraterritorial Sales re Reply (Motion related),, #1154 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1168 filed by Defendants Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Facts, #2 Exhibit Q, #3 Exhibit R, #4 Exhibit S, #5 Exhibit T, #6 Exhibit U, #7 Exhibit V)(Dowd, James)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1183 SEALED DOCUMENT Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of No Joint Infringement re Reply (Motion related), #1137 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1163 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Facts, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Dowd, James)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1182 SEALED DOCUMENT Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Infringement Opinions of Dr. Michael Tanner re Reply (Motion related), #1133 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1162 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5)(Dowd, James)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1181 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Reply, #1180 served on 5/14/19. (Briggs, Todd)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1180 SEALED REPLY RE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to No Inequitable Conduct (Partial) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to No Inequitable Conduct #942 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1167 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Response to Statement of Genuine Disputes, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit F)(Briggs, Todd)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1179 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Reply, #1175 served on 5/14/2019. (Briggs, Todd)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1178 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Reply, #1174 served on 5/14/2019. (Briggs, Todd)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1177 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Reply, #1176 served on 5/14/2019. (Asperger, James)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1176 SEALED REPLY RE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Late-Disclosed Non-Infringing Alternative #971 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1165 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology.(Asperger, James)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1175 SEALED REPLY RE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions of Defendants Experts Brendan Frey and Wayne Stark #974 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1164 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit D)(Briggs, Todd)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1174 SEALED REPLY RE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Improper Claim Construction Opinions of Dr. Stark and Dr. Blanksby #968 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1166 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology.(Briggs, Todd)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1173 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #1171 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1171 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Derek L Shaffer on behalf of Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology (Attorney Derek L Shaffer added to party The California Institute of Technology(pty:pla))(Shaffer, Derek)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1172 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER REGARDING PFISTER/SIEGEL DISCOVERY DISPUTES AND "KNOWN OR USED" LISTING OF EVIDENCE by Judge George H. Wu. Having considered the lengthy documents filed by the parties, the Court, for reasons of case management and judicial economy, rules as follows: (see document for details). The hearing on the parties' disputes relating to Pfister and Siegel3 is CONTINUED to May 30, 2019 at 8:30am. The parties should also be prepared to discuss issues relating to estoppel at that time. (mrgo)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1170 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Document #1169 served on May 13, 2019. (Dowd, James)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1169 SEALED DOCUMENT re Response #1124 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #1132 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited.(Dowd, James)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1168 ORDER GRANTING BROADCOM'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1158 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1167 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1155 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1166 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1150 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1165 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1145 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1164 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1142 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1163 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1138 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1162 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1134 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1161 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, The California Institute of Technology(a California corporation (as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)), The California Institute of Technology(a California corporation (as to Counterclaim Doc No 60 filed 9/21/16)) for Court Reporter. Court will contact Robin Ramirez at robinramirez@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Briggs, Todd)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1160 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc.((as to Counterclaim Doc No 32 filed 8/1/16)), Apple Inc.((as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)), Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation((as to Counterclaim Doc No 32 filed 8/1/16)), Broadcom Corporation((as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)), Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,, #1159 served on May 10, 2019. (Dowd, James)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1159 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Broadcoms Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement as to Extraterritorial Sales under seal #1158 filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Broadcoms Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement as to Extraterritorial Sales, #2 Unredacted Document Broadcoms Responses to Caltechs Statement of Facts and Conclusions of Law, #3 Exhibit Q, #4 Exhibit R, #5 Exhibit S, #6 Exhibit T, #7 Exhibit U, #8 Exhibit V)(Dowd, James)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1158 APPLICATION to file document Broadcoms Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement as to Extraterritorial Sales under seal filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document, #3 Redacted Document, #4 Exhibit Q, #5 Exhibit R, #6 Exhibit S, #7 Exhibit T, #8 Exhibit U, #9 Exhibit V)(Dowd, James)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1157 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1156 served on 5/10/19. (Briggs, Todd)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1156 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #1155 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Reply ISO MSJ re No Inequitable Conduct, #2 Unredacted Document Response to Statement of Genuine Disputes, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit F)(Briggs, Todd)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1155 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Reply ISO MSJ re No Inequitable Condcut, #2 Redacted Document, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1154 REPLY IN SUPPORT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Non-Infringement as to Extraterritorial Sales #975 filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit P, #4 Exhibit Q, #5 Exhibit R, #6 Exhibit S, #7 Exhibit T, #8 Exhibit U, #9 Exhibit V)(Dowd, James)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1153 REPLY In support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to No Inequitable Conduct (Partial) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to No Inequitable Conduct #942 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document, #2 Declaration ISO Reply ISO MSJ re IC, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)(Briggs, Todd)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1152 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1151 served on 5/9/2019. (Briggs, Todd)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1151 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Reply in Support of Exclude Improper Claim Construction Opinions of Dr. Stark and Dr. Blanksby under seal #1150 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Reply)(Briggs, Todd)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1150 APPLICATION to file document Reply in Support of Exclude Improper Claim Construction Opinions of Dr. Stark and Dr. Blanksby under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Reply, #2 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1149 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Improper Claim Construction Opinions of Dr. Stark and Dr. Blanksby #968 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd. M. Briggs, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Briggs, Todd)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1148 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #1146 served on May 9, 2019. (Briggs, Todd)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1147 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1143 served on May 9, 2019. (Briggs, Todd)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1146 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Caltechs Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Strike Defendants Evidence and Expert Testimony Concerning Late-Disclosed Non-Infringing Alternative under seal #1145 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Caltechs Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Strike Defendants Evidence and Expert Testimony Concerning Late-Disclosed Non-Infringing Alternative)(Briggs, Todd)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1145 APPLICATION to file document Caltechs Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Strike Defendants Evidence and Expert Testimony Concerning Late-Disclosed Non-Infringing Alternative under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1144 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Late-Disclosed Non-Infringing Alternative #971 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Briggs, Todd)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1143 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Caltechs Reply Memorandum in Support of Caltechs Motion and Shyr Dec. Exs. A and D under seal #1142 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Caltechs Reply Memorandum in Support of Caltechs Motion, #2 Exhibit A to Shyr Declaration ISO Caltech's Reply, #3 Exhibit D to Shyr Declaration ISO Caltech's Reply)(Briggs, Todd)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1142 APPLICATION to file document Caltechs Reply Memorandum in Support of Caltechs Motion and Shyr Dec. Exs. A and D under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Reply ISO Motion to Strike Frey/Stark, #2 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1141 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions of Defendants Experts Brendan Frey and Wayne Stark #974 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Margaret Shyr, #2 Exhibit A to Shyr Dec. [Public], #3 Exhibit B to Shyr Dec., #4 Exhibit C to Shyr Dec., #5 Exhibit D to Shyr Dec. [Public])(Briggs, Todd)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1140 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1139 served on May 9, 2019. (Dowd, James)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1139 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #1138 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Reply, #2 Unredacted Document Statement of Facts, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. 1, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 3, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. 4)(Dowd, James)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1138 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Reply, #3 Redacted Document Statement of Facts, #4 Redacted Document Ex. 1, #5 Redacted Document Ex. 3, #6 Redacted Document Ex. 4)(Dowd, James)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1137 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to No Joint Infringement #959 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Facts, #2 Declaration of Dowd, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Dowd, James)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1136 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1135 served on May 9, 2019. (Dowd, James)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1135 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #1134 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Reply, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. 5)(Dowd, James)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1134 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Reply, #3 Redacted Document Ex. 5)(Dowd, James)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1133 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Infringement Opinions of Dr. Michael Tanner #964 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dowd, #2 Exhibit 5)(Dowd, James)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1132 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL #1125 by Judge George H. Wu. It is hereby ORDERED that the application is GRANTED. The following materials shall be filed under seal: Portions of Defendants' Response Brief Regarding Dr. Pfister's and Dr. Siegel's Documents designated in yellow highlighting. (lom)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1131 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL #1123 by Judge George H. Wu. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff California Institute of Technology's (Plaintiff or Caltech) Application to File Under Seal, and the following documents are hereby SEALED: Exhibit 33 to the Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of Caltech's Responsive Supplemental Brief Regarding Its Motion To Exclude Defendants' Untimely Production Of Documents From Their Expert Dr. Henry Pfister. (lom)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1130 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration #1129 served on 5/6/2019. (Briggs, Todd)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1129 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #1123 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 33)(Briggs, Todd)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1128 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1126 served on May 6, 2019. (Dowd, James)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1127 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technologyto Supplement, #1106 Regarding its Motion to Exclude Defendants' Untimely Production of Documents (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 31, #3 Exhibit 32, #4 Exhibit 33, #5 Exhibit 34, #6 Exhibit 35, #7 Exhibit 36)(Briggs, Todd)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1126 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #1125 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Response)(Dowd, James)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1125 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Response)(Dowd, James)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1124 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limitedto Supplement(Motion related),, #1109 Regarding Dr. Pfister's and Dr. Siegel's Documents (Dowd, James)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1123 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1122 SEALED DOCUMENT re Supplement, #1106 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1117 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7)(Dowd, James)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1121 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING PERTAINING TO DRS. PFISTER'S AND SIEGEL'S DOCUMENT PRODUCTIONS AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Reschedule #1115 . Simultaneous responses limited to seven pages by Plaintiff Caltech and Defendants Broadcom and Apple due May 6, 2019. Hearing on additional briefing May 16, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. (mrgo)
May 5, 2019 Filing 1120 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document, #1119 served on 5/5/2019. (Briggs, Todd)
May 5, 2019 Filing 1119 SEALED DOCUMENT re Supplement(Motion related),, #1109 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1116 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 17, #6 Exhibit 18, #7 Exhibit 21)(Briggs, Todd)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1118 BROADCOMS AND APPLES PROFFER REGARDING KNOWN OR USED INVALIDITY re MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #830 #888 filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52)(Dowd, James)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1117 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1107 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1116 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH's APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu #1111 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1115 Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Additional Briefing filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Aaron)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1114 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1113 served on 5/1/2019. (Briggs, Todd)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1113 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #1111 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Ex. 7, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. 8, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. 10, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 11, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. 15, #6 Unredacted Document Ex. 17, #7 Unredacted Document Ex. 18, #8 Unredacted Document Ex. 21)(Briggs, Todd)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1112 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1108 served on April 30, 2019. (Dowd, James)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1111 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1110 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Document, #1103 , Sealed Document, #1102 , Sealed Document,, #1101 , Sealed Document,,,, #1104 served on April 30, 2019. (Dowd, James)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1109 SUPPLEMENT to Report at Dkt. 1083 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30)(Briggs, Todd)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1108 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #1107 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Supplemental Brief, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. 1, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. 2, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 5, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. 6, #6 Unredacted Document Ex. 7)(Dowd, James)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1107 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Supplement, #3 Redacted Document Ex. 1, #4 Redacted Document Ex. 2, #5 Redacted Document Ex. 5, #6 Redacted Document Ex. 6, #7 Redacted Document Ex. 7)(Dowd, James)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1106 SUPPLEMENT to Report,, #1083 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dowd, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Dowd, James)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1105 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limitedto Supplement(Motion related), #1084 Regarding Caltech's Motion to Exclude Dr. Henry Pfister's Deposition Testimony (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Dowd, James)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1104 SEALED DOCUMENT re Objection/Opposition (Motion related),, #1070 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1090 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Facts, #2 Declaration of Thompson, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 13, #11 Exhibit 15, #12 Exhibit 17, #13 Exhibit 23, #14 Exhibit 24, #15 Exhibit 28, #16 Exhibit 29, #17 Exhibit 30, #18 Exhibit 31, #19 Exhibit 32, #20 Exhibit 33, #21 Exhibit 37, #22 Exhibit 38, #23 Exhibit 39, #24 Exhibit 40, #25 Exhibit 41, #26 Exhibit 42, #27 Exhibit 43, #28 Exhibit 44, #29 Exhibit 45, #30 Exhibit 46, #31 Exhibit 47, #32 Exhibit 48, #33 Exhibit 54, #34 Exhibit 58, #35 Exhibit 61, #36 Exhibit F-2, #37 Exhibit F-3, #38 Exhibit F-4, #39 Exhibit F-5, #40 Exhibit F-6, #41 Exhibit F-12, #42 Exhibit L-2, #43 Exhibit L-3)(Dowd, James)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1103 SEALED DOCUMENT re Response in Opposition to Motion, #1064 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1089 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Blanksby, #2 Declaration of Stark, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 9)(Dowd, James)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1102 SEALED DOCUMENT re Response in Opposition to Motion, #1059 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1085 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Dowd, James)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1101 SEALED DOCUMENT re Objection/Opposition (Motion related),, #1052 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #1092 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 13, #11 Exhibit 14, #12 Exhibit 15, #13 Exhibit 16)(Dowd, James)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1098 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1093 served on 4/26/19. (Asperger, James)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1097 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Opposition,, #1095 served on 4/26/2019. (Briggs, Todd)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1096 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document, #1094 served on 4/26/2019. (Asperger, James)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1095 SEALED OPPOSITION RE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to No Joint Infringement #959 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1087 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Response to Defendants' Statement of Fact and Law and Caltech's Statement of Fact and Law, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Briggs, Todd)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1094 SEALED DOCUMENT re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #1057 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1088 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Briggs Decl ISO Opp to Motion to Exclude Opinions of Tanner)(Asperger, James)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1093 SEALED DOCUMENT re Objection/Opposition (Motion related),,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1050 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1086 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document SOF and SOL ISO Opp to MSJ re Alleged Extraterritorial Sales, #2 Declaration of Lawton ISO ISO Opp to MSJ re Alleged Extraterritorial Sales, #3 Exhibit 1 (part 1) to Lawton Decl ISO Opp to MSJ re Alleged Extraterritorial Sales, #4 Exhibit 1 (part 2) to Lawton Decl ISO Opp to MSJ re Alleged Extraterritorial Sales, #5 Exhibit 2 to Lawton Decl ISO Opp to MSJ re Alleged Extraterritorial Sales, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15, #21 Exhibit 16, #22 Exhibit 17, #23 Exhibit 18, #24 Exhibit 19, #25 Exhibit 20, #26 Exhibit 21, #27 Exhibit 22, #28 Exhibit 23, #29 Exhibit 24, #30 Exhibit 25, #31 Exhibit 26, #32 Exhibit 27, #33 Exhibit 28, #34 Exhibit 29, #35 Exhibit 30, #36 Exhibit 31, #37 Exhibit 32, #38 Exhibit 33, #39 Exhibit 34, #40 Exhibit 35, #41 Exhibit 36, #42 Exhibit 37, #43 Exhibit 38, #44 Exhibit 39, #45 Exhibit 40, #46 Exhibit 41, #47 Exhibit 42, #48 Exhibit 43, #49 Exhibit 44, #50 Exhibit 46, #51 Exhibit 47, #52 Exhibit 48, #53 Exhibit 49, #54 Exhibit 50, #55 Exhibit 51, #56 Exhibit 52, #57 Exhibit 53, #58 Exhibit 54, #59 Exhibit 55, #60 Exhibit 56, #61 Exhibit 57, #62 Exhibit 58, #63 Exhibit 59, #64 Exhibit 60, #65 Exhibit 61, #66 Exhibit 62, #67 Exhibit 63, #68 Exhibit 64, #69 Exhibit 65, #70 Exhibit 66, #71 Exhibit 67, #72 Exhibit 69, #73 Exhibit 70, #74 Exhibit 73, #75 Exhibit 74, #76 Exhibit 75, #77 Exhibit 76, #78 Exhibit 77, #79 Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit 80, #81 Exhibit 81, #82 Exhibit 82, #83 Exhibit 83, #84 Exhibit 84, #85 Exhibit 85, #86 Exhibit 86, #87 Exhibit 87, #88 Exhibit 88, #89 Exhibit 89, #90 Exhibit 90, #91 Exhibit 91, #92 Exhibit 92, #93 Exhibit 93, #94 Exhibit 94, #95 Exhibit 95, #96 Exhibit 96, #97 Exhibit 97, #98 Exhibit 98, #99 Exhibit 101, #100 Exhibit 102, #101 Exhibit 103, #102 Exhibit 104, #103 Exhibit 105, #104 Exhibit 107, #105 Exhibit 108, #106 Exhibit 109, #107 Exhibit 110, #108 Exhibit 111, #109 Exhibit 112, #110 Exhibit 113, #111 Exhibit 114, #112 Exhibit 115, #113 Exhibit 116, #114 Exhibit 117, #115 Exhibit 118, #116 Exhibit 119, #117 Exhibit 120, #118 Exhibit 123, #119 Exhibit 124, #120 Exhibit 127, #121 Exhibit 128, #122 Exhibit 129, #123 Exhibit 130, #124 Exhibit 131, #125 Exhibit 132, #126 Exhibit 133, #127 Exhibit 134, #128 Exhibit 135, #129 Exhibit 136, #130 Exhibit 137, #131 Exhibit 138, #132 Exhibit 140, #133 Exhibit 141, #134 Exhibit 142, #135 Exhibit 143, #136 Exhibit 144, #137 Exhibit 145, #138 Exhibit 146, #139 Exhibit 166, #140 Exhibit 167, #141 Exhibit 168, #142 Exhibit 169, #143 Exhibit 170, #144 Exhibit 171, #145 Exhibit 172)(Asperger, James)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1100 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Simultaneous briefs limited to 12 pages are to be filed by April 30, 2019 and address the question stated by the Court at the hearing and the related matters discussed by Court and counsel at the hearing. Simultaneous responses limited to seven pages are to be filed by May 3, 2019. A hearing is set for May 9, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Further scheduling will also be set on May 9, 2019. (See document for details)Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1099 MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 60(a) #952 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court's Order Regarding Motion for Clarification is circulated and attached hereto. Motion is GRANTED. Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1091 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, The California Institute of Technology(a California corporation (as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)) for Court Reporter. Court will contact Robin Ramirez at robinramirez@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Shyr, Margaret)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 ORDER GRANTING APPLE'S AND BROADCOM'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL #1053 by Judge George H. Wu. It is hereby ORDERED that the application is GRANTED. The following materials shall be filed under seal: Apple's and Broadcom's Opposition to Caltech's Motion to Strike Defendants' Evidence Regarding the Direct Encoder Design (Apple'sand Broadcom's Opposition); and Exhibits 1-3, 5-8 and 11-16 to the Declaration of James M. Dowd in Support of Apple's and Broadcom's Opposition. (lom)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1090 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1080 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 ORDER GRANTING BROADCOM'S AND APPLE'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1066 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1088 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1060 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1087 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1056 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1086 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1051 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1085 ORDER GRANTING APPLE'S AND BROADCOM'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1062 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1084 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Late Produced Documents and Dr. Henry Pfister's Untimely Expert Deposition Testimony #1024 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Caltech's Table Identifying Expert Testimony in Dr. Pfisters Deposition Testimony, #2 Proposed Order Excluding Portions of Dr. Henry Pfisters Expert Testimony)(Asperger, James)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1083 JOINT REPORT of Outstanding Issues Relating to Siegel and Pfister Document Productions and Depositions filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd Briggs In Support of Caltech's Portion of the Joint Report, #2 Exhibit A to Briggs Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Briggs Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Briggs Decl., #5 Exhibit A to Defendants' Portion of the Joint Report, #6 Exhibit B to Defendants' Portion of the Joint Report, #7 Exhibit C to Defendants' Portion of the Joint Report, #8 Exhibit D to Defendants' Portion of the Joint Report, #9 Exhibit E to Defendants' Portion of the Joint Report)(Asperger, James)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1082 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,, #1054 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1065 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,,,,, #1081 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #1068 served on April 23, 2019. (Dowd, James)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1081 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Relating to Defendants' Opposition to Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct under seal #1080 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opposition, #2 Unredacted Document Statement of Facts and Conclusions of Law, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. 5, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 6, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. 8, #6 Unredacted Document Ex. 9, #7 Unredacted Document Ex. 10, #8 Unredacted Document Ex. 11, #9 Unredacted Document Ex. 12, #10 Unredacted Document Ex. 13, #11 Unredacted Document Ex. 15, #12 Unredacted Document Ex. 17, #13 Unredacted Document Ex. 23, #14 Unredacted Document Ex. 24, #15 Unredacted Document Ex. 28, #16 Unredacted Document Ex. 29, #17 Unredacted Document Ex. 30, #18 Unredacted Document Ex. 31, #19 Unredacted Document Ex. 32, #20 Unredacted Document Ex. 33, #21 Unredacted Document Ex. 37, #22 Unredacted Document Ex. 38, #23 Unredacted Document Ex. 39, #24 Unredacted Document Ex. 40, #25 Unredacted Document Ex. 41, #26 Unredacted Document Ex. 42, #27 Unredacted Document Ex. 43, #28 Unredacted Document Ex. 44, #29 Unredacted Document Ex. 45, #30 Unredacted Document Ex. 46, #31 Unredacted Document Ex. 47, #32 Unredacted Document Ex. 48, #33 Unredacted Document Ex. 54, #34 Unredacted Document Ex. 58, #35 Unredacted Document Ex. 61, #36 Unredacted Document Ex. F-2, #37 Unredacted Document Ex. F-3, #38 Unredacted Document Ex. F-4, #39 Unredacted Document Ex. F-5, #40 Unredacted Document Ex. F-6, #41 Unredacted Document Ex. F-12, #42 Unredacted Document Ex. L-2, #43 Unredacted Document Ex. L-3)(Thompson, Aaron)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1080 APPLICATION to file document Relating to Defendants' Opposition to Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Aaron)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1079 DECLARATION of Larry Nixon re Objection/Opposition (Motion related),, #1070 to Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L-1, #2 Exhibit L-2, #3 Exhibit L-3)(Thompson, Aaron)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1078 DECLARATION of Aaron Thompson re Objection/Opposition (Motion related),, #1070 to Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 23, #23 Exhibit 24, #24 Exhibit 25, #25 Exhibit 26, #26 Exhibit 27, #27 Exhibit 28, #28 Exhibit 29, #29 Exhibit 30, #30 Exhibit 31, #31 Exhibit 32, #32 Exhibit 33, #33 Exhibit 34, #34 Exhibit 35, #35 Exhibit 36, #36 Exhibit 37, #37 Exhibit 38, #38 Exhibit 39, #39 Exhibit 40, #40 Exhibit 41, #41 Exhibit 42, #42 Exhibit 43, #43 Exhibit 44, #44 Exhibit 45, #45 Exhibit 46, #46 Exhibit 47, #47 Exhibit 48, #48 Exhibit 49, #49 Exhibit 50, #50 Exhibit 51, #51 Exhibit 52, #52 Exhibit 53, #53 Exhibit 54, #54 Exhibit 55, #55 Exhibit 56, #56 Exhibit 57, #57 Exhibit 58, #58 Exhibit 59, #59 Exhibit 60, #60 Exhibit 61, #61 Exhibit 62, #62 Exhibit 63)(Thompson, Aaron)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1077 DECLARATION of Dr. Brendan Frey re Objection/Opposition (Motion related),, #1070 to Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F-1, #2 Exhibit F-2, #3 Exhibit F-3, #4 Exhibit F-4, #5 Exhibit F-5, #6 Exhibit F-6, #7 Exhibit F-7, #8 Exhibit F-8, #9 Exhibit F-9, #10 Exhibit F-10, #11 Exhibit F-11, #12 Exhibit F-12)(Thompson, Aaron)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1076 DECLARATION of Dr. Paul Siegel re Objection/Opposition (Motion related),, #1070 to Caltech Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S-1, #2 Exhibit S-2, #3 Exhibit S-3)(Thompson, Aaron)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1075 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1073 served on 4/23/2019. (Asperger, James)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1074 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1061 served on 4/23/2019. (Asperger, James)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1072 DECLARATION of Wayne Stark re Response in Opposition to Motion, #1064 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Dowd, James)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1071 DECLARATION of Andrew Blanksby re Response in Opposition to Motion, #1064 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Dowd, James)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1070 OPPOSITION in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to No Inequitable Conduct (Partial) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to No Inequitable Conduct #942 filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Statement of Disputed Facts [proposed to be sealed])(Thompson, Aaron)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1069 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document #1067 Caltech Exhibit 3 to April 17, 2019 Joint Report served on 4/22/2019. (Briggs, Todd)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1073 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #1051 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opp to MSJ re Sales, #2 Unredacted Document SOF and SOL ISO Opp to MSJ re Sales, #3 Declaration Lawton Decl ISO Opp to MSJ re Sales, #4 Exhibit 1 (part 1) to Lawton Decl ISO Opp to MSJ re Sales, #5 Exhibit 1 (part 2) to Lawton Decl ISO Opp to MSJ re Sales, #6 Exhibit 2 to Lawton Decl ISO Opp to MSJ re Sales, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 11, #18 Exhibit 12, #19 Exhibit 13, #20 Exhibit 14, #21 Exhibit 15, #22 Exhibit 16, #23 Exhibit 17, #24 Exhibit 18, #25 Exhibit 19, #26 Exhibit 20, #27 Exhibit 21, #28 Exhibit 22, #29 Exhibit 23, #30 Exhibit 24, #31 Exhibit 25, #32 Exhibit 26, #33 Exhibit 27, #34 Exhibit 28, #35 Exhibit 29, #36 Exhibit 30, #37 Exhibit 31, #38 Exhibit 32, #39 Exhibit 33, #40 Exhibit 34, #41 Exhibit 35, #42 Exhibit 36, #43 Exhibit 37, #44 Exhibit 38, #45 Exhibit 39, #46 Exhibit 40, #47 Exhibit 41, #48 Exhibit 42, #49 Exhibit 43, #50 Exhibit 44, #51 Exhibit 46, #52 Exhibit 47, #53 Exhibit 48, #54 Exhibit 49, #55 Exhibit 50, #56 Exhibit 51, #57 Exhibit 52, #58 Exhibit 53, #59 Exhibit 54, #60 Exhibit 55, #61 Exhibit 56, #62 Exhibit 57, #63 Exhibit 58, #64 Exhibit 59, #65 Exhibit 60, #66 Exhibit 61, #67 Exhibit 62, #68 Exhibit 63, #69 Exhibit 64, #70 Exhibit 65, #71 Exhibit 66, #72 Exhibit 67, #73 Exhibit 69, #74 Exhibit 70, #75 Exhibit 73, #76 Exhibit 74, #77 Exhibit 75, #78 Exhibit 76, #79 Exhibit 77, #80 Exhibit 79, #81 Exhibit 80, #82 Exhibit 81, #83 Exhibit 82, #84 Exhibit 83, #85 Exhibit 84, #86 Exhibit 85, #87 Exhibit 86, #88 Exhibit 87, #89 Exhibit 88, #90 Exhibit 89, #91 Exhibit 90, #92 Exhibit 91, #93 Exhibit 92, #94 Exhibit 93, #95 Exhibit 94, #96 Exhibit 95, #97 Exhibit 96, #98 Exhibit 97, #99 Exhibit 98, #100 Exhibit 101, #101 Exhibit 102, #102 Exhibit 103, #103 Exhibit 104, #104 Exhibit 105, #105 Exhibit 107, #106 Exhibit 108, #107 Exhibit 109, #108 Exhibit 110, #109 Exhibit 111, #110 Exhibit 112, #111 Exhibit 113, #112 Exhibit 114, #113 Exhibit 115, #114 Exhibit 116, #115 Exhibit 117, #116 Exhibit 118, #117 Exhibit 119, #118 Exhibit 120, #119 Exhibit 123, #120 Exhibit 124, #121 Exhibit 127, #122 Exhibit 128, #123 Exhibit 129, #124 Exhibit 130, #125 Exhibit 131, #126 Exhibit 132, #127 Exhibit 133, #128 Exhibit 134, #129 Exhibit 135, #130 Exhibit 136, #131 Exhibit 137, #132 Exhibit 138, #133 Exhibit 140, #134 Exhibit 141, #135 Exhibit 142, #136 Exhibit 143, #137 Exhibit 144, #138 Exhibit 145, #139 Exhibit 146, #140 Exhibit 166, #141 Exhibit 167, #142 Exhibit 168, #143 Exhibit 169, #144 Exhibit 170, #145 Exhibit 171, #146 Exhibit 172)(Asperger, James)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1068 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #1066 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opposition, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. 1, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. 2, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 3, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. 4, #6 Unredacted Document Ex. 5, #7 Unredacted Document Ex. 6, #8 Unredacted Document Ex. 7, #9 Unredacted Document Ex. 9, #10 Unredacted Document Blanksby Declaration, #11 Unredacted Document Stark Declaration)(Dowd, James)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1067 SEALED DOCUMENT Caltech Exhibit 3 re Report, #1043 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1049 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology.(Briggs, Todd)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1066 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dowd, James)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1065 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #1062 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opposition, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. 1, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. 2, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 3, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. 4, #6 Unredacted Document Ex. 5)(Selwyn, Mark)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1064 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Improper Claim Construction Opinions of Dr. Stark and Dr. Blanksby #968 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dowd, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Dowd, James)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1063 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,, #1058 to file document Caltech's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of No Joint Infringement under seal served on 4/22/2019. (Briggs, Todd)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1062 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Opposition, #3 Redacted Document Ex. 1, #4 Redacted Document Ex. 2, #5 Redacted Document Ex. 3, #6 Redacted Document Ex. 4, #7 Redacted Document Ex. 5)(Selwyn, Mark)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1061 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #1060 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opp to MTE Tanner, #2 Exhibit A to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Tanner)(Asperger, James)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1060 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Opp to MTE Tanner, #2 Exhibit A to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Tanner, #3 Proposed Order Granting Appl to File Under Seal - Opp to MTE Tanner)(Asperger, James)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1059 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions of Defendants Experts Brendan Frey and Wayne Stark #974 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Selwyn, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Selwyn, Mark)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1058 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Caltech's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of No Joint Infringement under seal #1056 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opposition, #2 Unredacted Document Response to Defendants' Statement of Fact and Law and Caltech's Statement of Fact and Law, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. 1, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 2, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. 3, #6 Unredacted Document Ex. 4, #7 Unredacted Document Ex. 5, #8 Unredacted Document Ex. 6, #9 Unredacted Document Ex. 7, #10 Unredacted Document Ex. 8, #11 Unredacted Document Ex. 9, #12 Unredacted Document Ex. 10, #13 Unredacted Document Ex. 11, #14 Unredacted Document Ex. 12, #15 Unredacted Document Ex. 13, #16 Unredacted Document Ex. 14)(Briggs, Todd)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1057 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Infringement Opinions of Dr. Michael Tanner #964 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Opp to MTE Tanner, #2 Exhibit A to Decl ISO Opp to MTE Tanner)(Asperger, James)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1056 APPLICATION to file document Caltech's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of No Joint Infringement under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Opposition, #2 Redacted Document Response to Defendants' Statement of Fact and Law and Caltech's Statement of Fact and Law, #3 Redacted Document Ex. 1, #4 Redacted Document Ex. 2, #5 Redacted Document Ex. 3, #6 Redacted Document Ex. 4, #7 Redacted Document Ex. 5, #8 Redacted Document Ex. 6, #9 Redacted Document Ex. 7, #10 Redacted Document Ex. 8, #11 Redacted Document Ex. 9, #12 Redacted Document Ex. 10, #13 Redacted Document Ex. 11, #14 Redacted Document Ex. 12, #15 Redacted Document Ex. 13, #16 Redacted Document Ex. 14, #17 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1055 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to No Joint Infringement #959 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Response to Defendants' Statement of Fact and Law and Caltech's Statement of Fact and Law, #2 Declaration of Todd M. Briggs, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1054 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Motion to Strike Late Disclosed Non-Infringing Alternative under seal #1053 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opposition, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. 1, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. 2, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 3, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. 5, #6 Unredacted Document Ex. 6, #7 Unredacted Document Ex. 7, #8 Unredacted Document Ex. 8, #9 Unredacted Document Ex. 11, #10 Unredacted Document Ex. 12, #11 Unredacted Document Ex. 13, #12 Unredacted Document Ex. 14, #13 Unredacted Document Ex. 15, #14 Unredacted Document Ex. 16)(Dowd, James)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1053 APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Motion to Strike Late Disclosed Non-Infringing Alternative under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dowd, James)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1052 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Late-Disclosed Non-Infringing Alternative #971 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dowd, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16)(Dowd, James)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1051 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Opp to MSJ re Sales, #2 Redacted Document SOF and SOL ISO Opp to MSJ re Sales, #3 Declaration Lawton Decl ISO Opp to MSJ re Sales, #4 Exhibit 1 to Lawton Decl ISO Opp to MSJ re Sales, #5 Exhibit 2 to Lawton Decl ISO Opp to MSJ re Sales, #6 Proposed Order Granting Appl to File Under Seal re Opp to MSJ re Sales, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 11, #18 Exhibit 12, #19 Exhibit 13, #20 Exhibit 14, #21 Exhibit 15, #22 Exhibit 16, #23 Exhibit 17, #24 Exhibit 18, #25 Exhibit 19, #26 Exhibit 20, #27 Exhibit 21, #28 Exhibit 22, #29 Exhibit 23, #30 Exhibit 23, #31 Exhibit 25, #32 Exhibit 26, #33 Exhibit 27, #34 Exhibit 28, #35 Exhibit 29, #36 Exhibit 30, #37 Exhibit 31, #38 Exhibit 32, #39 Exhibit 33, #40 Exhibit 34, #41 Exhibit 35, #42 Exhibit 36, #43 Exhibit 37, #44 Exhibit 38, #45 Exhibit 39, #46 Exhibit 40, #47 Exhibit 41, #48 Exhibit 42, #49 Exhibit 43, #50 Exhibit 44, #51 Exhibit 46, #52 Exhibit 47, #53 Exhibit 48, #54 Exhibit 49, #55 Exhibit 50, #56 Exhibit 51, #57 Exhibit 52, #58 Exhibit 53, #59 Exhibit 54, #60 Exhibit 55, #61 Exhibit 56, #62 Exhibit 57, #63 Exhibit 58, #64 Exhibit 59, #65 Exhibit 60, #66 Exhibit 61, #67 Exhibit 62, #68 Exhibit 63, #69 Exhibit 64, #70 Exhibit 65, #71 Exhibit 66, #72 Exhibit 67, #73 Exhibit 69, #74 Exhibit 70, #75 Exhibit 73, #76 Exhibit 74, #77 Exhibit 75, #78 Exhibit 76, #79 Exhibit 77, #80 Exhibit 79, #81 Exhibit 80, #82 Exhibit 81, #83 Exhibit 82, #84 Exhibit 83, #85 Exhibit 84, #86 Exhibit 85, #87 Exhibit 86, #88 Exhibit 87, #89 Exhibit 88, #90 Exhibit 89, #91 Exhibit 90, #92 Exhibit 91, #93 Exhibit 92, #94 Exhibit 93, #95 Exhibit 94, #96 Exhibit 95, #97 Exhibit 96, #98 Exhibit 97, #99 Exhibit 98, #100 Exhibit 101, #101 Exhibit 102, #102 Exhibit 103, #103 Exhibit 104, #104 Exhibit 105, #105 Exhibit 107, #106 Exhibit 108, #107 Exhibit 109, #108 Exhibit 110, #109 Exhibit 111, #110 Exhibit 112, #111 Exhibit 113, #112 Exhibit 114, #113 Exhibit 115, #114 Exhibit 116, #115 Exhibit 117, #116 Exhibit 118, #117 Exhibit 119, #118 Exhibit 130, #119 Exhibit 123, #120 Exhibit 124, #121 Exhibit 127, #122 Exhibit 128, #123 Exhibit 129, #124 Exhibit 130, #125 Exhibit 131, #126 Exhibit 132, #127 Exhibit 133, #128 Exhibit 134, #129 Exhibit 135, #130 Exhibit 136, #131 Exhibit 137, #132 Exhibit 138, #133 Exhibit 140, #134 Exhibit 141, #135 Exhibit 142, #136 Exhibit 143, #137 Exhibit 144, #138 Exhibit 145, #139 Exhibit 146, #140 Exhibit 166, #141 Exhibit 167, #142 Exhibit 168, #143 Exhibit 169, #144 Exhibit 170, #145 Exhibit 171, #146 Exhibit 172)(Asperger, James)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1050 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Non-Infringement as to Extraterritorial Sales #975 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Response to SOF and SOL ISO Opposition, #2 Declaration Lawton Decl ISO Opp to MSJ re Sales, #3 Exhibit 1 to Lawton Decl ISO Opp to MSJ re Sales, #4 Exhibit 2 to Lawton Decl ISO Opp to MSJ re Sales, #5 Declaration Decl ISO Opp to MSJ re Sales, #6 Exhibit List of Exhibits to Decl ISO Opp to MSJ re Sales, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 11, #18 Exhibit 12, #19 Exhibit 13, #20 Exhibit 14, #21 Exhibit 15, #22 Exhibit 16, #23 Exhibit 17, #24 Exhibit 18, #25 Exhibit 19, #26 Exhibit 20, #27 Exhibit 21, #28 Exhibit 22, #29 Exhibit 23, #30 Exhibit 24, #31 Exhibit 25, #32 Exhibit 26, #33 Exhibit 27, #34 Exhibit 28, #35 Exhibit 29, #36 Exhibit 30, #37 Exhibit 31, #38 Exhibit 32, #39 Exhibit 33, #40 Exhibit 34, #41 Exhibit 35, #42 Exhibit 36, #43 Exhibit 37, #44 Exhibit 38, #45 Exhibit 39, #46 Exhibit 40, #47 Exhibit 41, #48 Exhibit 42, #49 Exhibit 43, #50 Exhibit 44, #51 Exhibit 45, #52 Exhibit 46, #53 Exhibit 47, #54 Exhibit 48, #55 Exhibit 49, #56 Exhibit 50, #57 Exhibit 51, #58 Exhibit 52, #59 Exhibit 53, #60 Exhibit 54, #61 Exhibit 55, #62 Exhibit 56, #63 Exhibit 57, #64 Exhibit 58, #65 Exhibit 59, #66 Exhibit 60, #67 Exhibit 61, #68 Exhibit 62, #69 Exhibit 63, #70 Exhibit 64, #71 Exhibit 65, #72 Exhibit 66, #73 Exhibit 67, #74 Exhibit 68, #75 Exhibit 69, #76 Exhibit 70, #77 Exhibit 71, #78 Exhibit 72, #79 Exhibit 73, #80 Exhibit 74, #81 Exhibit 75, #82 Exhibit 76, #83 Exhibit 77, #84 Exhibit 78, #85 Exhibit 79, #86 Exhibit 80, #87 Exhibit 81, #88 Exhibit 82, #89 Exhibit 83, #90 Exhibit 84, #91 Exhibit 85, #92 Exhibit 86, #93 Exhibit 87, #94 Exhibit 88, #95 Exhibit 89, #96 Exhibit 90, #97 Exhibit 91, #98 Exhibit 92, #99 Exhibit 93, #100 Exhibit 94, #101 Exhibit 95, #102 Exhibit 96, #103 Exhibit 97, #104 Exhibit 98, #105 Exhibit 99, #106 Exhibit 100, #107 Exhibit 101, #108 Exhibit 102, #109 Exhibit 103, #110 Exhibit 104, #111 Exhibit 105, #112 Exhibit 106, #113 Exhibit 107, #114 Exhibit 108, #115 Exhibit 109, #116 Exhibit 110, #117 Exhibit 111, #118 Exhibit 112, #119 Exhibit 113, #120 Exhibit 114, #121 Exhibit 115, #122 Exhibit 116, #123 Exhibit 117, #124 Exhibit 118, #125 Exhibit 119, #126 Exhibit 120, #127 Exhibit 121, #128 Exhibit 122, #129 Exhibit 123, #130 Exhibit 124, #131 Exhibit 125, #132 Exhibit 126, #133 Exhibit 127, #134 Exhibit 128, #135 Exhibit 129, #136 Exhibit 130, #137 Exhibit 131, #138 Exhibit 132, #139 Exhibit 133, #140 Exhibit 134, #141 Exhibit 135, #142 Exhibit 136, #143 Exhibit 137, #144 Exhibit 138, #145 Exhibit 139, #146 Exhibit 140, #147 Exhibit 141, #148 Exhibit 142, #149 Exhibit 143, #150 Exhibit 144, #151 Exhibit 145, #152 Exhibit 146, #153 Exhibit 147, #154 Exhibit 148, #155 Exhibit 149, #156 Exhibit 150, #157 Exhibit 151, #158 Exhibit 152, #159 Exhibit 153, #160 Exhibit 154, #161 Exhibit 155, #162 Exhibit 156, #163 Exhibit 157, #164 Exhibit 158, #165 Exhibit 159, #166 Exhibit 160, #167 Exhibit 161, #168 Exhibit 162, #169 Exhibit 163, #170 Exhibit 164, #171 Exhibit 165, #172 Exhibit 166, #173 Exhibit 167, #174 Exhibit 168, #175 Exhibit 169, #176 Exhibit 170, #177 Exhibit 171, #178 Exhibit 172)(Asperger, James)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1049 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1044 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1048 MINUTES OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Plaintiff will provide the Court with Dr. Pfister's consulting agreement by 3:00 p.m. today. Counsel are reminded to file a seven-page report as to what disputes remain following the deposition of Dr. Siegel by noon on April 23, 2019. A hearing on these issues is set for April 25, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1047 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The following call-in information may be used for hearing set for this morning at 10:00 a.m.: Tel No. 866-434-5269; Access Code: 9692487. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 17, 2019 Filing 1046 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1045 served on 4/17/2019. (Briggs, Todd)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1045 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Caltech Exhibit 3 to Joint Report of Use of Source Code and Documents Produced at Pfister Deposition During April 19, 2019 Siegel Deposition under seal #1044 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Caltech Exhibit 3)(Briggs, Todd)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1044 APPLICATION to file document Caltech Exhibit 3 to Joint Report of Use of Source Code and Documents Produced at Pfister Deposition During April 19, 2019 Siegel Deposition under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Exhibit 3, #2 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1043 JOINT REPORT of Use of Source Code and Documents Produced at Pfister Deposition During April 19, 2019 Siegel Deposition filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Briggs, Todd)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1041 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document,, #1040 served on April 17, 2019. (Asperger, James)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1040 SEALED DOCUMENT re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Date #1018 , APPLICATION to file document under seal #1019 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1037 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Briggs Dec. ISO Motion, #2 Exhibit C to Briggs Dec. ISO Motion, #3 Exhibit V to Briggs Dec. ISO Motion, #4 Exhibit W to Briggs Dec. ISO Motion, #5 Exhibit 2 to Briggs Dec. ISO Ex Parte)(Asperger, James)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1039 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document #1038 served on 4/17/2019. (Briggs, Todd)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1038 SEALED DOCUMENT re Stipulation for Admissions #1013 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1035 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Briggs, Todd)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1042 MINUTES OF CALTECH'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS' LATE-PRODUCED DOCUMENTS AND DR. HENRY PFISTER'S UNTIMELY EXPERT DEPOSITION TESTIMONY #1024 (By Telephone) Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. Caltech's Motion is TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Counsel will meet and confer and attempt to resolve disputes relating to Dr. Siege's deposition discussed on the record. If urgent matters relating to his deposition are not resolved through meet and confer discussions, counsel are to file a three-page joint submission by April 17, 2019 and a further telephonic hearing will be held on April 18, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel are to file a seven-page report as to what disputes remain following the deposition of Dr. Siegel by noon on April 23, 2019. A hearing on these issues is set for April 25, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1019 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1036 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE REPORT ADDRESSING DR. SHOEMAKE'S NEW COPYING THEORIES by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Reschedule, #1017 ; the Court hereby sets April 26, 2019 as the date for Defendants to serve the responsive report. (mrgo)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1035 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1014 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1034 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The time to appear for CALTECHS MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS LATE-PRODUCED DOCUMENTS AND DR. HENRY PFISTERS UNTIMELY EXPERT DEPOSITION TESTIMONY #1024 , set for April 16, 2019, is changed from 9:30 a.m. to 2:00 p.m. Counsel may use same call-in information previously provided. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 15, 2019 Filing 1033 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The following call-in information may be used for hearing set for April 16, 2019 at 9:30 a.m.:Tel No. 866-434-5269; Access Code: 9692487. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 12, 2019 Filing 1032 OPPOSITION TO re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Late Produced Documents and Dr. Henry Pfister's Untimely Expert Deposition Testimony #1024 filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Dowd, James)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1031 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document,, #1030 served on 4/11/2019. (Asperger, James)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1030 SEALED DOCUMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Late Produced Documents and Dr. Henry Pfister's Untimely Expert Deposition Testimony #1024 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #1028 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B to Briggs Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #2 Exhibit H to Briggs Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #3 Exhibit I to Briggs Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony)(Asperger, James)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1029 REPLY In Support Of MOTION to Clarify Dkt. No. 849, The Court's January 18, 2019 Final Ruling on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment #952 filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Dowd, James)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1028 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL #1025 by Judge George H. Wu. The following documents are hereby SEALED: Highlighted portions of Caltech's Memorandum in Support of Caltech's Motion to Exclude Defendants' Late-Produced Documents and Dr. Henry Pfister's Untimely Expert Deposition Testimony (Caltech's Motion); and Exhibits B, H and I of the Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of Caltech's Motion. (lom)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1027 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,, #1026 served on April 10, 2019. (Asperger, James)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1026 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Defendants' Late Produced Documents and Dr. Henry Pfister's Untimely Expert Deposition Testimony and Briggs Dec. Exs. B, H, and I under seal #1025 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Defendants' Late Produced Documents and Dr. Henry Pfister's Untimely Expert Deposition Testimony, #2 Exhibit B to Briggs Dec. ISO Caltech's Motion to Exclude, #3 Exhibit H to Briggs Dec. ISO Caltech's Motion to Exclude, #4 Exhibit I to Briggs Dec. ISO Caltech's Motion to Exclude)(Asperger, James)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1025 APPLICATION to file document Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Defendants' Late Produced Documents and Dr. Henry Pfister's Untimely Expert Deposition Testimony and Briggs Dec. Exs. B, H, and I under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Defendants' Late Produced Documents and Dr. Henry Pfister's Untimely Expert Deposition Testimony, #2 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1024 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Late Produced Documents and Dr. Henry Pfister's Untimely Expert Deposition Testimony filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. Motion set for hearing on 4/16/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude, #2 Declaration of Todd M. Briggs ISO Caltech's Motion to Exclude, #3 Exhibit A to Briggs Dec., #4 Exhibit B to Briggs Dec., #5 Exhibit C to Briggs Dec., #6 Exhibit D to Briggs Dec., #7 Exhibit E to Briggs Dec., #8 Exhibit F to Briggs Dec., #9 Exhibit G to Briggs Dec., #10 Exhibit H to Briggs Dec., #11 Exhibit I to Briggs Dec., #12 Exhibit J to Briggs Dec., #13 Proposed Order) (Asperger, James)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1023 STATEMENT Regarding Schedule For Caltech's Motion to Exclude [Joint Statement] filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology (Asperger, James)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION (DOCKET NO. 1018) by Judge George H. Wu re. The CourtDENIES the ex parte application and ORDERS as follows: By April 10, 2019 at noon, the parties shall meet and confer regarding whether relevant deadlines can be modified (including the date of Dr. Pfister's deposition and the deadline for Defendants to file their listing of particularized evidence for their "known or used" prior art invalidity theory) to accommodate additional time for the parties' document dispute to be heard. If the parties reach agreement, they shall file a stipulation by close of business on April 10, 2019. Defendants' opposition to the Motion to Exclude shall be filed by April 12, 2019 and shall not exceed five pages. No reply will be permitted. A TELEPHONIC hearing for the motion to exclude will be set for TUESDAY, April 16, 2019 at 9:30 AM. (mrgo)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1021 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #1020 served on 4/8/2019. (Asperger, James)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1020 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #1019 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #2 Exhibit A to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #3 Exhibit C to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #4 Exhibit V to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #5 Exhibit W to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #6 Exhibit 2 to Decl ISO Ex Parte Application)(Asperger, James)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1019 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #2 Exhibit A to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #3 Exhibit C to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #4 Exhibit V to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #5 Exhibit W to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #6 Exhibit 2 to Decl ISO Ex Parte Application, #7 Proposed Order Granting Application to File Under Seal)(Asperger, James)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1018 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Date filed by plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ISO Ex Parte App for Expedited Briefing, #2 Declaration ISO Ex Parte App for Expedited Briefing, #3 Exhibit 1 to Decl ISO Ex Parte App for Expedited Briefing, #4 Exhibit 2 to Decl ISO Ex Parte App for Expedited Briefing, #5 Exhibit 3 to Decl ISO Ex Parte App for Expedited Briefing, #6 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte App for Expedited Briefing, #7 Notice of Motion and Motion re MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #8 Memorandum Memo ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #9 Declaration ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #10 Exhibit A to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #11 Exhibit B to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #12 Exhibit C to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #13 Exhibit D to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #14 Exhibit E to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #15 Exhibit F to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #16 Exhibit G to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #17 Exhibit H to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #18 Exhibit I to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #19 Exhibit J to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #20 Exhibit K to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #21 Exhibit L to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #22 Exhibit M to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #23 Exhibit N to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #24 Exhibit O to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #25 Exhibit P to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #26 Exhibit Q to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #27 Exhibit R to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #28 Exhibit S to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #29 Exhibit T to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #30 Exhibit U to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #31 Exhibit V to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #32 Exhibit W to Decl ISO MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony, #33 Proposed Order Granting MTE Pfister Documents and Testimony) (Asperger, James)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1017 STIPULATION to Reschedule Date for Defendants to Serve Responsive Report Addressing Dr. Shoemake's New Copying Theories filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Aaron)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1016 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1015 served on 4/4/2019. (Briggs, Todd)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1015 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #1014 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Stipulation Regarding Representative Products for the Purposes of Evaluating Infringement or Non-Infringement, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit 1)(Briggs, Todd)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1014 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Stipulation Regarding Representative Products for the Purposes of Evaluating Infringement or Non-Infringement, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1013 Joint STIPULATION for Admissions of the Parties filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Briggs, Todd)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1012 OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Clarify Dkt. No. 849, The Court's January 18, 2019 Final Ruling on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment #952 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Asperger, James)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1011 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited for Court Reporter. Court will contact Erik Marshall at erik.marshall@wilmerhale.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Dowd, James)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1010 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court, as indicated on the record, ORDERS that Defendants may serve a single, narrowly-tailored supplemental expert report solely in response to Shoemake's new copying theories. Counsel are to meet and stipulate to the date for Defendants to serve a responsive report, or submit a single-page document with each side's position, by April 5, 2019. The Court will not allow additional discovery as to the University of Arizona Individuals. Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1009 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Document,, #1008 , Sealed Document, #1007 , Sealed Document, #1006 served on April 2, 2019. (Dowd, James)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1008 SEALED DOCUMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Non-Infringement as to Extraterritorial Sales #975 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,, #992 filed by Defendants Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M)(Dowd, James)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1007 SEALED DOCUMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Infringement Opinions of Dr. Michael Tanner #964 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #991 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Dowd, James)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1006 SEALED DOCUMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to No Joint Infringement #959 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #990 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Dowd, James)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H. Wu: Attached hereto is the Courts Thoughts Regarding Parties March 29, 2019 Joint Report, for April 2, 2019 10:00 a.m. Telephonic Hearing. (jag)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1004 SECOND JOINT REPORT of the Parties in Response to March 18, 2019 Minute Order filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Asperger, James)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1003 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The following call-in information may be used for hearing set for April 2, 2019 at 10:00 a.m.:Tel No. 866-434-5269; Access Code: 9692487. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 29, 2019 Filing 1002 JOINT REPORT of Further Discovery filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Thompson, Aaron)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1001 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document,,, #1000 served on March 28, 2019. (Briggs, Todd)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1000 SEALED DOCUMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions of Defendants Experts Brendan Frey and Wayne Stark #974 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #989 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Shyr Dec. ISO Motion, #2 Exhibit B to Shyr Dec. ISO Motion, #3 Exhibit C to Shyr Dec. ISO Motion, #4 Exhibit D to Shyr Dec. ISO Motion, #5 Exhibit E to Shyr Dec. ISO Motion, #6 Exhibit I to Shyr Dec. ISO Motion, #7 Exhibit M to Shyr Dec. ISO Motion, #8 Exhibit N to Shyr Dec. ISO Motion, #9 Exhibit O to Shyr Dec. ISO Motion, #10 Exhibit P to Shyr Dec. ISO Motion, #11 Exhibit Q to Shyr Dec. ISO Motion, #12 Exhibit R to Shyr Dec. ISO Motion, #13 Exhibit S to Shyr Dec. ISO Motion, #14 Exhibit U to Shyr Dec. ISO Motion)(Briggs, Todd)
March 28, 2019 Filing 999 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document, #998 served on 3/28/2019. (Briggs, Todd)
March 28, 2019 Filing 998 SEALED DOCUMENT Memorandum re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Improper Claim Construction Opinions of Dr. Stark and Dr. Blanksby #968 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #987 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 10)(Briggs, Todd)
March 28, 2019 Filing 997 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document, #996 served on 3/28/2019. (Asperger, James)
March 28, 2019 Filing 996 SEALED DOCUMENT re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #988 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 15, #13 Exhibit 16, #14 Exhibit 17, #15 Exhibit 18, #16 Exhibit 19, #17 Exhibit 20)(Asperger, James)
March 27, 2019 Filing 995 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document, #993 served on March 27, 2019. (Asperger, James)
March 27, 2019 Filing 994 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to No Inequitable Conduct (Partial) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to No Inequitable Conduct #942 (Briggs, Todd)
March 27, 2019 Filing 993 SEALED DOCUMENT First Joint Report Regarding The Remaining Asserted Claims, Page Limits, Trial Date, and Proposed Stipulations re Report, #953 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #986 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Briggs, Todd)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 992 ORDER GRANTING BROADCOM'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants Broadcom Limited's, Broadcom Corporation's, and Avago Technologies Limited's Application To File Documents Under Seal #977 is GRANTED. The following materials shall be filed under seal: (1) Memorandum Of Points & Authorities In Support Of Broadcom's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement As To Extraterritorial Sales ("Broadcom's Brief"); (2) Broadcom's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts And Conclusions Of Law In Support Of Broadcom's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement As To Extraterritorial Sales; and (3) Exhibits A, C, E, F, G, H, I, J, K, L, and M to the Dowd Declaration. (gk)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 991 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants Broadcom Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Avago Technologies Limited, and Apple Inc.'s Application to File Documents Under Seal #965 is GRANTED. The following materials shall be filed under seal: (1) Defendants' Motion to Exclude Infringement Opinions of Dr. Michael Tanner ("Defendants' Motion"); (2) Exhibits 1-3 to the Declaration of James M. Dowd in Support of Defendants' Motion; and (3) Portions of Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of James M. Dowd in Support of Defendants' Motion. (gk)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 990 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Broadcom Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Avago Technologies Limited, and Apple Inc.'s Application To File Documents Under Seal #960 is GRANTED. The following materials shall be filed under seal: (1) Portions of Defendants' Statement of Uncontroverted Facts And Conclusions Of Law In Support Of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Of No Joint Infringement ("Motion"); and (2) Exhibits 1-4 to the James M. Dowd Declaration in Support of Defendants' Motion. (gk)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 989 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff California Institute of Technology's Application to File Under Seal #976 , and the following documents are hereby SEALED: (1) Highlighted portions of Caltech's Memorandum in Support of Caltech's Motion To Strike Certain Opinions of Defendants' Experts Brendan Frey and Wayne Stark ("Caltech's Motion"); (2) Exhibits A-E, I, M-S, U to the Declaration of Margaret Shyr in Support of Caltech's Motion. (gk)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 988 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff California Institute of Technology's Application to File Under Seal #972 , and the following documents are hereby SEALED: (1) Highlighted portions of Caltech's Memorandum in Support of Caltech's Motion to Strike Defendants' Evidence and Expert Testimony Concerning Late-Disclosed Non-Infringing Alternative ("Caltech's Motion"); and (2) Exhibits 2-5, 7-13, and 15-20 to the Declaration of Margaret Shyr in Support of Caltech's Motion. (gk)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 987 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff California Institute of Technology's Application to File Under Seal #969 , and the following documents are hereby SEALED: (1) Highlighted portions of Caltech's Memorandum in Support of Caltech's Motion to Exclude Improper Claim Construction Opinions of Dr. Stark and Dr. Blanksby ("Caltech's Motion"); and (2) Exhibits 1-5 and 10 to the Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of Caltech's Motion. (gk)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 986 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff California Institute of Technology's Application to File Under Seal #954 , and the following documents are hereby SEALED: (1) Highlighted portions of the First Joint Report Regarding the Remaining Asserted Claims, Page Limits for Motions, Trial Date, And Proposed Stipulations ("Joint Report"); (2) Exhibit 1 to the Joint Report; and (3) Exhibit 2 to the Joint Report. (gk)
March 26, 2019 Filing 985 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) IN CHAMBERS - FINAL RULING RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. SHOEMAKE'S SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT #893 by Judge George H. Wu: The Court DENIES Defendants Motion to Strike. The Court ORDERS the parties to file a Joint Report by noon on Friday, March 29, 2019 regarding their meet and confer efforts, including proposed timing for the further discovery and disclosures permitted by this Order. A telephonic status conference regarding the parties anticipated joint report is SET FOR Tuesday, April 2, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (shb)
March 26, 2019 Filing 983 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #973 served on 3/26/19. (Asperger, James)
March 26, 2019 Filing 982 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #979 served on March 26, 2019. (Dowd, James)
March 26, 2019 Filing 981 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,, #978 served on March 26, 2019. (Briggs, Todd)
March 26, 2019 Filing 980 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #970 served on March 25, 2019. (Briggs, Todd)
March 26, 2019 Filing 979 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement as to Extraterritorial Sales under seal #977 filed by Defendants Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Statement of Facts, #2 Unredacted Document Memorandum, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. A, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. C, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. E, #6 Unredacted Document Ex. F, #7 Unredacted Document Ex. G, #8 Unredacted Document Ex. H, #9 Unredacted Document Ex. I, #10 Unredacted Document Ex. J, #11 Unredacted Document Ex. K, #12 Unredacted Document Ex. L, #13 Unredacted Document Ex. M)(Dowd, James)
March 25, 2019 Filing 984 MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. SHOEMAKE'S SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT #893 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. For reasons stated on the record, Defendants' Motion is TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Court to issue ruling. Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (lom)
March 25, 2019 Filing 978 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff Caltechs Motion to Strike Certain Opinions of Defendants Experts Brendan Frey and Wayne Stark and Exs. In Support of Motion under seal #976 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff Caltechs Motion to Strike Certain Opinions of Defendants Experts Brendan Frey and Wayne Stark, #2 Exhibit A to Shyr Dec., #3 Exhibit B to Shyr Dec., #4 Exhibit C to Shyr Dec., #5 Exhibit D to Shyr Dec., #6 Exhibit E to Shyr Dec., #7 Exhibit I to Shyr Dec., #8 Exhibit M to Shyr Dec., #9 Exhibit N to Shyr Dec., #10 Exhibit O to Shyr Dec., #11 Exhibit P to Shyr Dec., #12 Exhibit Q to Shyr Dec., #13 Exhibit R to Shyr Dec., #14 Exhibit S to Shyr Dec., #15 Exhibit U to Shyr Dec.)(Briggs, Todd)
March 25, 2019 Filing 977 APPLICATION to file document Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement as to Extraterritorial Sales under seal filed by Defendants Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Statement of Facts, #3 Redacted Document Memorandum, #4 Redacted Document Ex. A, #5 Redacted Document Ex. C, #6 Redacted Document Ex. E, #7 Redacted Document Ex. F, #8 Redacted Document Ex. G, #9 Redacted Document Ex. H, #10 Redacted Document Ex. I, #11 Redacted Document Ex. J, #12 Redacted Document Ex. K, #13 Redacted Document Ex. L, #14 Redacted Document Ex. M)(Dowd, James)
March 25, 2019 Filing 976 APPLICATION to file document Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff Caltechs Motion to Strike Certain Opinions of Defendants Experts Brendan Frey and Wayne Stark and Exs. In Support of Motion under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff Caltechs Motion to Strike Certain Opinions of Defendants Experts Brendan Frey and Wayne Stark, #3 Exhibit A to Shyr Dec., #4 Exhibit B to Shyr Dec., #5 Exhibit C to Shyr Dec., #6 Exhibit D to Shyr Dec., #7 Exhibit E to Shyr Dec., #8 Exhibit I to Shyr Dec., #9 Exhibit M to Shyr Dec., #10 Exhibit N to Shyr Dec., #11 Exhibit O to Shyr Dec., #12 Exhibit P to Shyr Dec., #13 Exhibit Q to Shyr Dec., #14 Exhibit R to Shyr Dec., #15 Exhibit S to Shyr Dec., #16 Exhibit U to Shyr Dec.)(Briggs, Todd)
March 25, 2019 Filing 975 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Non-Infringement as to Extraterritorial Sales filed by Defendants Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. Motion set for hearing on 6/6/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Facts, #2 Memorandum, #3 Declaration of Dowd, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Proposed Order) (Dowd, James)
March 25, 2019 Filing 974 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions of Defendants Experts Brendan Frey and Wayne Stark filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. Motion set for hearing on 6/6/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff Caltechs Motion to Strike Certain Opinions of Defendants Experts Brendan Frey and Wayne Stark, #3 Declaration of Margaret Shyr in Support of Plaintiff Caltechs Motion to Strike Certain Opinions of Defendants Experts Brendan Frey and Wayne Stark, #4 Exhibit A to Shyr Dec., #5 Exhibit B to Shyr Dec., #6 Exhibit C to Shyr Dec., #7 Exhibit D to Shyr Dec., #8 Exhibit E to Shyr Dec., #9 Exhibit F to Shyr Dec., #10 Exhibit G to Shyr Dec., #11 Exhibit H to Shyr Dec., #12 Exhibit I to Shyr Dec., #13 Exhibit J to Shyr Dec., #14 Exhibit K to Shyr Dec., #15 Exhibit L to Shyr Dec., #16 Exhibit M to Shyr Dec., #17 Exhibit N to Shyr Dec., #18 Exhibit O to Shyr Dec., #19 Exhibit P to Shyr Dec., #20 Exhibit Q to Shyr Dec., #21 Exhibit R to Shyr Dec., #22 Exhibit S to Shyr Dec., #23 Exhibit T to Shyr Dec., #24 Exhibit U to Shyr Dec.) (Briggs, Todd)
March 25, 2019 Filing 973 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #972 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ISO MTS Late-Disclosed NIA, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit 18, #17 Exhibit 19, #18 Exhibit 20)(Asperger, James)
March 25, 2019 Filing 972 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ISO MTS Late-Disclosed NIA, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit 18, #17 Exhibit 19, #18 Exhibit 20, #19 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
March 25, 2019 Filing 971 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Late-Disclosed Non-Infringing Alternative filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. Motion set for hearing on 6/6/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ISO MTS Late-Disclosed NIA, #2 Declaration ISO MTS Late-Disclosed NIA, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Proposed Order) (Asperger, James)
March 25, 2019 Filing 970 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document in Support of Caltech's Motion to Exclude Improper Claim Construction Opinions of Dr. Stark and Dr. Blanksby under seal #969 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum in Support of Caltech's Motion to Exclude Improper Claim Construction Opinions of Dr. Stark and Dr. Blanksby, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. 1, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. 2, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 3, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. 4, #6 Unredacted Document Ex. 5, #7 Unredacted Document Ex. 10)(Briggs, Todd)
March 25, 2019 Filing 969 APPLICATION to file document in Support of Caltech's Motion to Exclude Improper Claim Construction Opinions of Dr. Stark and Dr. Blanksby under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Memorandum in Support of Caltech's Motion to Exclude Improper Claim Construction Opinions of Dr. Stark and Dr. Blanksby, #3 Redacted Document Ex. 1, #4 Redacted Document Ex. 2, #5 Redacted Document Ex. 3, #6 Redacted Document Ex. 4, #7 Redacted Document Ex. 5, #8 Redacted Document Ex. 10)(Briggs, Todd)
March 25, 2019 Filing 968 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Improper Claim Construction Opinions of Dr. Stark and Dr. Blanksby filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. Motion set for hearing on 6/6/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration Todd M. Briggs, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Proposed Order) (Briggs, Todd)
March 25, 2019 Filing 967 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #966 served on March 25, 2019. (Dowd, James)
March 25, 2019 Filing 966 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion to Exclude Infringement Opinions of Dr. Michael Tanner under seal #965 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. 1, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. 2, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 3, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. 4)(Dowd, James)
March 25, 2019 Filing 965 APPLICATION to file document Motion to Exclude Infringement Opinions of Dr. Michael Tanner under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Memorandum, #3 Redacted Document Ex. 1, #4 Redacted Document Ex. 2, #5 Redacted Document Ex. 3, #6 Redacted Document Ex. 4)(Dowd, James)
March 25, 2019 Filing 964 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Infringement Opinions of Dr. Michael Tanner filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. Motion set for hearing on 6/6/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Dowd, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Proposed Order) (Dowd, James)
March 25, 2019 Filing 963 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #961 served on March 25, 2019. (Dowd, James)
March 25, 2019 Filing 962 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, The California Institute of Technology(a California corporation (as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)) for Court Reporter. Court will contact Robin Ramirez at robinramirez@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Shyr, Margaret)
March 25, 2019 Filing 961 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion for Summary Judgment of No Joint Infringement under seal #960 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Statement of Facts, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. 1, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. 2, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 3, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. 4)(Dowd, James)
March 25, 2019 Filing 960 APPLICATION to file document Motion for Summary Judgment of No Joint Infringement under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Statement of Facts, #3 Redacted Document Ex. 1, #4 Redacted Document Ex. 2, #5 Redacted Document Ex. 3, #6 Redacted Document Ex. 4)(Dowd, James)
March 25, 2019 Filing 959 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to No Joint Infringement filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. Motion set for hearing on 6/6/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Supplement Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration of Dowd, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Proposed Order) (Dowd, James)
March 22, 2019 Filing 958 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document,, #957 served on March 22, 2019. (Briggs, Todd)
March 22, 2019 Filing 957 SEALED DOCUMENT re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #950 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to No Inequitable Conduct (Partial) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to No Inequitable Conduct #942 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law In Support of Caltech's MSJ of No Inequitable Conduct, #2 Exhibit 7 to Shyr Dec., #3 Exhibit 8 to Shyr Dec., #4 Exhibit 9 to Shyr Dec., #5 Exhibit 35 to Shyr Dec., #6 Exhibit 38 to Shyr Dec., #7 Exhibit 41 to Shyr Dec., #8 Exhibit 47 to Shyr Dec.)(Briggs, Todd)
March 22, 2019 Filing 956 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #955 served on March 22, 2019. (Briggs, Todd)
March 22, 2019 Filing 955 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document First Joint Report and Exs. 1-2 under seal #954 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document First Joint Report Regarding The Remaining Claims, page Limits For Motions, Trial Date, and Proposed Stipulations, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Briggs, Todd)
March 22, 2019 Filing 954 APPLICATION to file document First Joint Report and Exs. 1-2 under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document First Joint Report Regarding the Remaining Asserted Claims, Page Limits For Motions, Trial Date, and Proposed Stipulations)(Briggs, Todd)
March 22, 2019 Filing 953 First Joint REPORT of The Remaining Asserted Claims, Page Limits for Motions, Trial Date, and Proposed Stipulations filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 [Redacted], #2 Exhibit 2 [Redacted])(Briggs, Todd)
March 21, 2019 Filing 952 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Clarify Dkt. No. 849, The Court's January 18, 2019 Final Ruling on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. Motion set for hearing on 4/25/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Dowd, James)
March 18, 2019 Filing 951 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING REMAINING MOTION PRACTICE AND CASE SCHEDULE held before Judge George H. Wu. The parties are ORDERED to prepare and file a second joint report by April 1, 2019 consistent with discussion at the hearing (including remaining issues identified in Tentative Order that are not addressed in first joint report). Court Reporter: Katie E Thibodeaux. (lom)
March 18, 2019 Filing 949 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited for Court Reporter. Court will contact Erik Marshall at erik.marshall@wilmerhale.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Dowd, James)
March 18, 2019 Filing 948 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, The California Institute of Technology(a California corporation (as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)) for Court Reporter. Court will contact Robin Ramirez at robinramirez@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Shyr, Margaret)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 950 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: granting #943 APPLICATION to Seal Document. The following documents are hereby SEALED: Highlighted portions of Caltech's Memorandum in Support of Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct (Caltech's Motion). Highlighted portions of Caltech's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Caltech's Motion; Exhibits 7, 8, 9, 35, 38, 41, and 47 to the Declaration of Margaret Shyr in Support of Caltech's Motion. (lom)
March 15, 2019 Filing 947 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Document #946 served on March 15, 2019. (Dowd, James)
March 15, 2019 Filing 946 SEALED DOCUMENT re Reply (Motion related), #932 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #937 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited.(Dowd, James)
March 15, 2019 Filing 945 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,, #944 served on March 15, 2019. (Asperger, James)
March 15, 2019 Filing 944 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document in Support of Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct under seal #943 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum in Support of Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct, #2 Unredacted Document Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct, #3 Exhibit 7 to Shyr Dec ISO MSJ, #4 Exhibit 8 to Shyr Dec ISO MSJ, #5 Exhibit 9 to Shyr Dec ISO MSJ, #6 Exhibit 35 to Shyr Dec ISO MSJ, #7 Exhibit 38 to Shyr Dec ISO MSJ, #8 Exhibit 41 to Shyr Dec ISO MSJ, #9 Exhibit 47 to Shyr Dec ISO MSJ)(Asperger, James)
March 15, 2019 Filing 943 APPLICATION to file document in Support of Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application to Seal, #2 Redacted Document Memorandum in Support of Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct, #3 Redacted Document Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct)(Asperger, James)
March 14, 2019 Filing 942 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to No Inequitable Conduct (Partial) , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to No Inequitable Conduct filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. Motion set for hearing on 4/25/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Caltech's Motion [Redacted], #2 Redacted Document Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Declaration of Margaret Shyr ISO Motion, #5 Exhibit 1 to Shyr Dec., #6 Exhibit 2 to Shyr Dec., #7 Exhibit 3 to Shyr Dec., #8 Exhibit 4 to Shyr Dec., #9 Exhibit 5 to Shyr Dec., #10 Exhibit 6 to Shyr Dec., #11 Exhibit 7 to Shyr Dec., #12 Exhibit 8 to Shyr Dec., #13 Exhibit 9 to Shyr Dec., #14 Exhibit 10 to Shyr Dec., #15 Exhibit 11 to Shyr Dec., #16 Exhibit 12 to Shyr Dec., #17 Exhibit 13 to Shyr Dec., #18 Exhibit 14 to Shyr Dec., #19 Exhibit 15 to Shyr Dec., #20 Exhibit 16 to Shyr Dec., #21 Exhibit 17 to Shyr Dec., #22 Exhibit 18 to Shyr Dec., #23 Exhibit 19 to Shyr Dec., #24 Exhibit 20 to Shyr Dec., #25 Exhibit 21 to Shyr Dec., #26 Exhibit 22 to Shyr Dec., #27 Exhibit 23 to Shyr Dec., #28 Exhibit 24 to Shyr Dec., #29 Exhibit 25 to Shyr Dec., #30 Exhibit 26 to Shyr Dec., #31 Exhibit 27 to Shyr Dec., #32 Exhibit 28 to Shyr Dec., #33 Exhibit 29 to Shyr Dec., #34 Exhibit 30 to Shyr Dec., #35 Exhibit 31 to Shyr Dec., #36 Exhibit 32 to Shyr Dec., #37 Exhibit 33-1 to Shyr Dec., #38 Exhibit 33-2 to Shyr Dec., #39 Exhibit 34 to Shyr Dec., #40 Exhibit 35 to Shyr Dec., #41 Exhibit 36 to Shyr Dec., #42 Exhibit 37 to Shyr Dec., #43 Exhibit 38 to Shyr Dec., #44 Exhibit 39 to Shyr Dec., #45 Exhibit 40 to Shyr Dec., #46 Exhibit 41 to Shyr Dec., #47 Exhibit 42 to Shyr Dec., #48 Exhibit 43 to Shyr Dec., #49 Exhibit 44 to Shyr Dec., #50 Exhibit 45 to Shyr Dec., #51 Exhibit 46 to Shyr Dec., #52 Exhibit 47 to Shyr Dec., #53 Declaration of Aamod Khandekar ISO Caltech's Motion, #54 Exhibit A to Khandekar Dec., #55 Exhibit B to Khandekar Dec., #56 Exhibit C to Khandekar Dec., #57 Exhibit D1 to Khandekar Dec., #58 Exhibit D2 to Khandekar Dec., #59 Exhibit D3 to Khandekar Dec, #60 Declaration of Hui Jin ISO Caltech's Motion, #61 Exhibit A to Jin Dec., #62 Exhibit B to Jin Dec., #63 Exhibit C1 to Jin Dec., #64 Exhibit C2 to Jin Dec., #65 Exhibit C3 to Jin Dec., #66 Exhibit C4 to Jin Dec., #67 Exhibit C5 to Jin Dec., #68 Exhibit C6 to Jin Dec.) (Asperger, James)
March 14, 2019 Filing 941 JOINT REPORT of Issues Per Dkt. 936 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Briggs, Todd)
March 14, 2019 Filing 940 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 1/10/19 2:05 pm; 3/11/19 10:29 am re Transcript #938 , #939 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 14, 2019 Filing 939 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/11/19 10:29 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/12/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
March 14, 2019 Filing 938 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1/10/19 2:05 pm. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/12/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 937 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL #933 by Judge George H. Wu. It is hereby ORDERED that the application is GRANTED. The following materials shall be filed under seal: Portions of the Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. Shoemake's Second Supplemental Expert Report ("Defendants' Reply") designated in yellow highlighting. (lom)
March 11, 2019 Filing 936 MINUTES OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) #887 ; DEFENDANTS' MOTION SEEKING PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S DECEMBER 28, 2018 ORDER REGARDING IPR ESTOPPEL OF CERTAIN CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 7,916,781 AND 7,421,032 #888 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The joint report should include a listing of each motion each party intends to file by the summary judgment deadline and a 1-2 sentence summary of the content of that motion. The parties might also consider including an anticipated page length for each of the filed motions. The joint report should also include a proposed deadline for Defendants to file and serve their listing of particularized evidence for their "known or used" prior art (Pfister/Pfister Slides and Frey/Frey Slides) in support of their obviousness invalidity theories, and a proposed deadline for Plaintiff to file a response to that listing. The parties should also consider discussing other scheduling issues and providing a summary of their discussions in the joint report. A status conference is set for March 18, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Telephone appearances are allowed provided advanced notice is given to the clerk. Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (lom)
March 11, 2019 Filing 935 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #934 served on March 11, 2019. (Dowd, James)
March 11, 2019 Filing 934 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #933 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Reply)(Dowd, James)
March 11, 2019 Filing 933 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Reply)(Dowd, James)
March 11, 2019 Filing 932 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Shoemake's Second Supplemental Report #893 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dowd, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Dowd, James)
March 11, 2019 Filing 931 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document, #930 served on March 11, 2019. (Briggs, Todd)
March 11, 2019 Filing 930 SEALED DOCUMENT re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,,, #921 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #926 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Briggs Dec., #2 Exhibit B to Briggs Dec., #3 Exhibit C to Briggs Dec., #4 Exhibit E to Briggs Dec., #5 Exhibit R to Briggs Dec., #6 Exhibit S to Briggs Dec., #7 Exhibit T to Briggs Dec.)(Briggs, Todd)
March 11, 2019 Filing 929 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited for Court Reporter. Court will contact Erik Marshall at Erik.Marshall@wilmerhale.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Dowd, James)
March 11, 2019 Filing 928 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintff The California Institute of Technology, The California Institute of Technology(a California corporation (as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)) for Court Reporter. Court will contact Robin Ramirez at robinramirez@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Briggs, Todd)
March 6, 2019 Filing 927 NOTICE of Response to Caltech's Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Caltech's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment of Validity Under IPR Estoppel, Caltech's Supplemental Brief in Support of those Motions, and Caltech's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Dowd, James)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 926 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu granting #922 APPLICATION (bm)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 925 ORDER TO CONTINUE THE HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR CERTIFICATION UNDER 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) (DKT. 887) AND PARTIALRECONSIDERATION OF THE COURTS DECEMBER 28, 2018 ORDER REGARDING IPR ESTOPPEL (DKT. 888) TO MARCH 11, 2019 by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Continue, #918 :The Court hereby continues the hearing on Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Motion for Certification from March 7, 2019 until March 11, 2019 at 8:30 AM. (bm)
March 5, 2019 Filing 924 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,, #923 served on March 5, 2019. (Briggs, Todd)
March 5, 2019 Filing 923 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Caltech's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. Shoemake's Second Supplemental Expert Report and Exhibits A, B, C, E, R, S, and T under seal #922 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Caltech's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. Shoemake's Second Supplemental Expert Report, #2 Exhibit A to Briggs Declaration ISO Caltech's Opposition, #3 Exhibit B to Briggs Declaration ISO Caltech's Opposition, #4 Exhibit C to Briggs Declaration ISO Caltech's Opposition, #5 Exhibit E to Briggs Declaration ISO Caltech's Opposition, #6 Exhibit R to Briggs Declaration ISO Caltech's Opposition, #7 Exhibit S to Briggs Declaration ISO Caltech's Opposition, #8 Exhibit T to Briggs Declaration ISO Caltech's Opposition)(Briggs, Todd)
March 5, 2019 Filing 922 APPLICATION to file document Caltech's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. Shoemake's Second Supplemental Expert Report and Exhibits A, B, C, E, R, S, and T under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application to Seal, #2 Redacted Document Caltech's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike)(Briggs, Todd)
March 4, 2019 Filing 921 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Shoemake's Second Supplemental Report #893 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Briggs Decl ISO Opposition to Mot. to Strike Portions of Shoemake Supplemental, #2 Exhibit A to Briggs Decl, #3 Exhibit B to Briggs Decl, #4 Exhibit C to Briggs Decl, #5 Exhibit D to Briggs Decl, #6 Exhibit E to Briggs Decl, #7 Exhibit F to Briggs Decl, #8 Exhibit G to Briggs Decl, #9 Exhibit H to Briggs Decl, #10 Exhibit I to Briggs Decl, #11 Exhibit J to Briggs Decl, #12 Exhibit K to Briggs Decl, #13 Exhibit L to Briggs Decl, #14 Exhibit M to Briggs Decl, #15 Exhibit N to Briggs Decl, #16 Exhibit O to Briggs Decl, #17 Exhibit P to Briggs Decl, #18 Exhibit Q to Briggs Decl, #19 Exhibit R to Briggs Decl, #20 Exhibit S to Briggs Decl, #21 Exhibit T to Briggs Decl)(Briggs, Todd)
March 4, 2019 Filing 920 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Document, #919 served on March 4, 2019. (Dowd, James)
March 4, 2019 Filing 919 SEALED DOCUMENT re Reply (Motion related), #909 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #916 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dowd, James)
March 4, 2019 Filing 918 STIPULATION to Continue Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. 888) and Motion for Certification (Dkt. 887) from March 7, 2019 to March 11, 2019 at 8:30 AM Re: MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #830 #888 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) #887 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
February 28, 2019 Filing 917 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) #887 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Dowd, James)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 916 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #910 APPLICATION to Seal Document. The following materials shall be filed under seal: (see document for list). (mrgo)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 915 ORDER TO CONTINUE THE HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE (DKT. 893) TO MARCH 25, 2019 by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Continue, #908 . (Motion continued to 3/25/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
February 26, 2019 Filing 914 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority Regarding Caltech's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Certification filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Briggs, Todd)
February 26, 2019 Filing 913 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority Regarding Caltech's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment of Validity Under IPR Estoppel, Caltech's Supplemental Brief in Support of those Motions, and Caltech's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Briggs, Todd)
February 26, 2019 Filing 912 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #911 served on February 25, 2019. (Dowd, James)
February 25, 2019 Filing 911 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #910 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Reply, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. 1)(Dowd, James)
February 25, 2019 Filing 910 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Reply, #3 Redacted Document Ex. 1)(Dowd, James)
February 25, 2019 Filing 909 REPLY in Support of MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #830 #888 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dowd, #2 Exhibit 1)(Dowd, James)
February 22, 2019 Filing 908 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date for Defendants' Motion (Dkt. 893) from March 18, 2019 to March 25, 2019 Re: MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Shoemake's Second Supplemental Report #893 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Continue Hearing)(Briggs, Todd)
February 22, 2019 Filing 907 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Document, #906 served on February 22, 2019. (Dowd, James)
February 22, 2019 Filing 906 SEALED DOCUMENT Memorandum re MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Shoemake's Second Supplemental Report #893 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #902 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 14, #6 Exhibit 16, #7 Exhibit 20)(Dowd, James)
February 21, 2019 Filing 905 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #830 #888 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of Caltech's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration, #2 Exhibit A to Briggs Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Briggs Decl.)(Briggs, Todd)
February 21, 2019 Filing 904 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) #887 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Briggs, Todd)
February 21, 2019 Filing 903 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limitedto Supplement(Motion related),, #891 Regarding IPR Estoppel (Dowd, James)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 902 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: HAVING CONSIDERED Defendants' papers in connection with Defendants Broadcom Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Avago Technologies Limited, and Apple Inc.s (Defendants) Application to File Documents Under Seal, it is hereby ORDERED that the application is GRANTED. (See order for further details) (yl)
February 20, 2019 Filing 901 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Document, #900 served on February 20, 2019. (Dowd, James)
February 20, 2019 Filing 900 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 4 re MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #830 #888 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #899 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited.(Dowd, James)
February 18, 2019 Filing 898 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 02/07/2019 8:30 a.m. re Transcript #897 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Hourigan, Terri) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 18, 2019 Filing 897 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02/07/2019 at 8:30 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Terri Hourigan, phone number hourigan.terri@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2019. (Hourigan, Terri)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 899 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: The following materials shall be filed under seal: Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of James Dowd in Support of Defendants Motion Seeking Partial Reconsideration of the Court's December 28, 2018 Order Regarding IPR Estoppel of Certain Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,916,781 and 7,421,032. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
February 15, 2019 Filing 896 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #895 served on February 15, 2019. (Dowd, James)
February 15, 2019 Filing 895 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #894 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. 1, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. 3, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 4, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. 5, #6 Unredacted Document Ex. 14, #7 Unredacted Document Ex. 16, #8 Unredacted Document Ex. 20)(Dowd, James)
February 15, 2019 Filing 894 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Memorandum, #3 Redacted Document Ex. 1, #4 Redacted Document Ex. 3, #5 Redacted Document Ex. 4, #6 Redacted Document Ex. 5, #7 Redacted Document Ex. 14, #8 Redacted Document Ex. 16, #9 Redacted Document Ex. 20)(Dowd, James)
February 15, 2019 Filing 893 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Shoemake's Second Supplemental Report filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. Motion set for hearing on 3/18/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Dowd, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Proposed Order)(Dowd, James)
February 14, 2019 Filing 892 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #890 served on February 14, 2019. (Dowd, James)
February 14, 2019 Filing 891 SUPPLEMENT to Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to OF VALIDITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. 103 BASED ON IPR ESTOPPEL UNDER 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) FOR U.S. PATENT NO. 7,916,781 #845 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Validity on Claims 20 and 22 of the '710 Patent Under 35 U.S.C. 103 Based on IPR Estoppel Under 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) #844 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Briggs, Todd)
February 14, 2019 Filing 890 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #889 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit 4)(Dowd, James)
February 14, 2019 Filing 889 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit 4)(Dowd, James)
February 14, 2019 Filing 888 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #830 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. Motion set for hearing on 3/7/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Dowd, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Proposed Order)(Dowd, James)
February 14, 2019 Filing 887 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. Motion set for hearing on 3/7/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Dowd, James)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 886 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING PERTAINING TO ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BASED ON IPR ESTOPPEL by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Hearing, #885 . Defendants Motion for Reconsideration of the Estoppel Order as it Relates to Pfister/Pfister Slides Due 2/14/19. Caltech's Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration Due 2/21/19. Defendants Reply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration due 2/25/19. Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration 3/7/19, at 8:30 a.m. (mrgo)
February 11, 2019 Filing 885 Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,, #884 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dowd, James)
February 7, 2019 Filing 884 MINUTES OF CALTECH'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF VALIDITY ON CLAIMS 20 AND 22 OF THE '710 PATENT UNDER 35 U.S.C. 103 BASED ON IPR ESTOPPEL UNDER 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) #844 ; CALTECH'S RENEWED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF VALIDITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. 103 BASED ON IPR ESTOPPEL UNDER 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) FOR U.S. PATENT NO. 7,916,781 #845 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Motions are TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Court to issue ruling after parties' additional briefing on issues related to the Motions is received. Defendants are permitted to file a Motion for Reconsideration of the Estoppel Order (Docket No. 830) as it relates to Pfister/Pfister Slides, not to exceed 12 pages. Any such Motion must include a stated basis as to why reconsideration is appropriate under the standard provided by Local Rule 7-13. Plaintiff will be permitted to file a response. A Hearing on the Motion for Reconsideration is set for March 7, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. The final briefing on the Motion is due by February 25, 2019. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (mrgo)
February 7, 2019 Filing 883 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 02/07/2019 8:30 a.m. re Transcript #882 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Hourigan, Terri) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 7, 2019 Filing 882 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02/07/2019 8:30 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Terri Hourigan, phone number hourigan.terri@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2019. (Hourigan, Terri)
February 7, 2019 Filing 881 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, The California Institute of Technology(a California corporation (as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)) for Court Reporter. Court will contact Robin Ramirez at robinramirez@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Shyr, Margaret)
February 7, 2019 Filing 880 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited for Court Reporter. Court will contact Erik Marshall at erik.marshall@wilmerhale.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Dowd, James)
February 6, 2019 Filing 879 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document,, #877 served on February 6, 2019. (Asperger, James)
February 6, 2019 Filing 878 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document, #876 served on February 6, 2019. (Asperger, James)
February 6, 2019 Filing 877 SEALED DOCUMENT re Reply (Motion related),,, #863 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #875 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Shyr Declaration ISO Caltech's Reply, #2 Exhibit B to Shyr Declaration ISO Caltech's Reply, #3 Exhibit C to Shyr Declaration ISO Caltech's Reply, #4 Exhibit E to Shyr Declaration ISO Caltech's Reply, #5 Exhibit F to Shyr Declaration ISO Caltech's Reply, #6 Exhibit G to Shyr Declaration ISO Caltech's Reply)(Asperger, James)
February 6, 2019 Filing 876 SEALED DOCUMENT re Reply (Motion related),,, #864 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #874 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C to Shyr Declaration ISO Caltech's Reply, #2 Exhibit D to Shyr Declaration ISO Caltech's Reply, #3 Exhibit E to Shyr Declaration ISO Caltech's Reply)(Asperger, James)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 875 ORDER GRANTING CALTECHS APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: Having considered the papers, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff California Institute of Technology's Application to File Under Seal, and the following documents are hereby SEALED: Highlighted portions of Caltech's Reply in Support of Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (See order for further details)granting #867 APPLICATION to Seal Document (yl)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 874 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #865 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (See document for details) (mrgo)
February 1, 2019 Filing 873 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Opposition,, #871 , Sealed Opposition, #872 served on February 1, 2019. (Dowd, James)
February 1, 2019 Filing 872 SEALED OPPOSITION RE Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to OF VALIDITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. 103 BASED ON IPR ESTOPPEL UNDER 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) FOR U.S. PATENT NO. 7,916,781 #845 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #862 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited.(Dowd, James)
February 1, 2019 Filing 871 SEALED OPPOSITION RE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Validity on Claims 20 and 22 of the '710 Patent Under 35 U.S.C. 103 Based on IPR Estoppel Under 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) #844 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #861 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 12 Part 1, #4 Exhibit 12 Part 2)(Dowd, James)
February 1, 2019 Filing 870 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #866 served on February 1, 2019. (Asperger, James)
February 1, 2019 Filing 869 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #868 served on February 1, 2019. (Asperger, James)
February 1, 2019 Filing 868 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Caltech's Reply in Support of Renewed Motion and Exhibits A-C, E-G under seal #867 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Reply in Support of Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit A to Shyr Declaration ISO Reply, #3 Exhibit B to Shyr Declaration ISO Reply, #4 Exhibit C to Shyr Declaration ISO Reply, #5 Exhibit E to Shyr Declaration ISO Reply, #6 Exhibit F to Shyr Declaration ISO Reply, #7 Exhibit G to Shyr Declaration ISO Reply)(Asperger, James)
February 1, 2019 Filing 867 APPLICATION to file document Caltech's Reply in Support of Renewed Motion and Exhibits A-C, E-G under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Plaintiff's Reply ISO Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment)(Asperger, James)
February 1, 2019 Filing 866 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Reply in Support of Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Validity on Claims 20 and 22 of the '710 Patent Under 35 U.S.C. 103 Based on IPR Estoppel Under 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) and Exh #865 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Reply in Support of Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Validity on Claims 20 and 22 of the '710 Patent Under 35 U.S.C. 103 Based on IPR Estoppel Under 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2), #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E)(Briggs, Todd)
February 1, 2019 Filing 865 APPLICATION to file document Reply in Support of Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Validity on Claims 20 and 22 of the '710 Patent Under 35 U.S.C. 103 Based on IPR Estoppel Under 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) and Exhibits Filed Concurrently Therewith under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Reply in Support of Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Validity on Claims 20 and 22 of the '710 Patent Under 35 U.S.C. 103 Based on IPR Estoppel Under 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2))(Briggs, Todd)
January 31, 2019 Filing 864 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Validity on Claims 20 and 22 of the '710 Patent Under 35 U.S.C. 103 Based on IPR Estoppel Under 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) #844 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Reply Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, #2 Declaration of Margaret Shyr in Support of Caltech's Reply Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit A to Shyr Decl., #4 Exhibit B to Shyr Decl., #5 Exhibit C to Shyr Decl., #6 Exhibit D to Shyr Decl., #7 Exhibit E to Shyr Decl., #8 Exhibit F to Shyr Decl., #9 Exhibit G to Shyr Decl., #10 Exhibit H to Shyr Decl., #11 Exhibit I to Shyr Decl., #12 Exhibit J to Shyr Decl.)(Briggs, Todd)
January 31, 2019 Filing 863 REPLY in support Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to OF VALIDITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. 103 BASED ON IPR ESTOPPEL UNDER 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) FOR U.S. PATENT NO. 7,916,781 #845 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Reply Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conconclusions of Law, #2 Declaration of Margaret Shyr ISO Reply, #3 Exhibit A to Shyr Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Shyr Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Shyr Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Shyr Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Shyr Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Shyr Declaration, #9 Exhibit G to Shyr Declaration, #10 Exhibit H to Shyr Declaration, #11 Exhibit I to Shyr Declaration)(Asperger, James)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 862 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #858 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 861 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #855 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
January 25, 2019 Filing 860 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #859 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #856 served on January 25, 2019. (Dowd, James)
January 24, 2019 Filing 859 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #858 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opposition)(Dowd, James)
January 24, 2019 Filing 858 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Opposition)(Dowd, James)
January 24, 2019 Filing 857 OPPOSITION to Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to OF VALIDITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. 103 BASED ON IPR ESTOPPEL UNDER 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) FOR U.S. PATENT NO. 7,916,781 #845 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Dowd, James)
January 24, 2019 Filing 856 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #855 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opposition, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. 3, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. 5, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 12 Part 1, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. 12 Part 2)(Dowd, James)
January 24, 2019 Filing 855 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Opposition, #3 Redacted Document Ex. 3, #4 Redacted Document Ex. 5, #5 Redacted Document Ex. 12)(Dowd, James)
January 24, 2019 Filing 854 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Validity on Claims 20 and 22 of the '710 Patent Under 35 U.S.C. 103 Based on IPR Estoppel Under 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) #844 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Declaration of Dowd, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11 Part 1, #14 Exhibit 11 Part 2, #15 Exhibit 11 Part 3, #16 Exhibit 11 Part 4, #17 Exhibit 11 Part 5, #18 Exhibit 11 Part 6, #19 Exhibit 12, #20 Exhibit 13)(Dowd, James)
January 22, 2019 Filing 853 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document,,, #852 served on January 22, 2019. (Briggs, Todd)
January 22, 2019 Filing 852 SEALED DOCUMENT re Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to OF VALIDITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. 103 BASED ON IPR ESTOPPEL UNDER 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) FOR U.S. PATENT NO. 7,916,781 #845 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #850 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D to Shyr Decl. ISO Caltech's Motion, #2 Exhibit E to Shyr Decl. ISO Caltech's Motion, #3 Exhibit G to Shyr Decl. ISO Caltech's Motion, #4 Exhibit I to Shyr Decl. ISO Caltech's Motion, #5 Exhibit J to Shyr Decl. ISO Caltech's Motion, #6 Exhibit L to Shyr Decl. ISO Caltech's Motion, #7 Exhibit M to Shyr Decl. ISO Caltech's Motion)(Briggs, Todd)
January 22, 2019 Filing 851 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Todd M Briggs counsel for Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, Counter Defendants The California Institute of Technology, The California Institute of Technology, The California Institute of Technology. Charles McLean Stiernberg, Jr. is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff California Institute of Technology. (Briggs, Todd)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 850 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL #846 by Judge George H. Wu. The Court Grants Plaintiff Application to File Under Seal, and the following documents are hereby SEALED: Highlighted portions of Caltechs Memorandum in Support of Caltech's Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Validity Under 35 U.S.C. 103 Based on IPR Estoppel Under 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) For U.S. Patent No. 7,916,781 (Caltechs Renewed Motion); Exhibits D, E, G, I, J, L and M to the Declaration of Margaret Shyr in Support of Caltech's Renewed Motion. (lom)
January 18, 2019 Filing 849 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - FINAL RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. 101 OF ASSERTED CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NO.7,916,781 by Judge George H. Wu. Attached hereto is the Court's Final Ruling on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. 101 of Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No.7,916,781 - After Consideration of Parties' Supplemental Briefing and Evidence, Including Evidence Presented at November 15, 2018 Hearing and Argument Presented at December 6, 2018 Hearing. Defendants Renewed 101 Motion #845 is DENIED. (lom) Modified on 1/18/2019 (lom).
January 18, 2019 Filing 848 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #847 served on January 18, 2018. (Asperger, James)
January 17, 2019 Filing 847 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Document Caltech's Memorandum ISO Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Validity Under 35 U.S.C. 103 Based on IPR Estoppel 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) FOR U.S. PATENT NO. 7,916,781 and Exhibits Filed Concur #846 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum ISO Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Validity Under 35 U.S.C. 103 Based on IPR Estoppel 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) FOR U.S. PATENT NO. 7,916,781, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit J, #7 Exhibit L, #8 Exhibit M)(Asperger, James)
January 17, 2019 Filing 846 APPLICATION to file document Document Caltech's Memorandum ISO Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Validity Under 35 U.S.C. 103 Based on IPR Estoppel 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) FOR U.S. PATENT NO. 7,916,781 and Exhibits Filed Concurrently Therewith under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Caltech's Memorandum ISO Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Validity Under 35 U.S.C. 103 Based on IPR Estoppel 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) FOR U.S. PATENT NO. 7,916,781)(Asperger, James)
January 17, 2019 Filing 845 Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to OF VALIDITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. 103 BASED ON IPR ESTOPPEL UNDER 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) FOR U.S. PATENT NO. 7,916,781 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. Motion set for hearing on 2/7/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ISO Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Validity Based on IPR Estoppel, #2 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law ISO Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #3 Declaration of Margaret Shyr ISO Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Validity Based on IPR Estoppel, #4 Exhibit A to Shyr Declaration, #5 Exhibit B to Shyr Declaration, #6 Exhibit C to Shyr Declaration, #7 Exhibit D to Shyr Declaration, #8 Exhibit E to Shyr Declaration, #9 Exhibit F to Shyr Declaration, #10 Exhibit G to Shyr Declaration, #11 Exhibit H to Shyr Declaration, #12 Exhibit I to Shyr Declaration, #13 Exhibit J to Shyr Declaration, #14 Exhibit K to Shyr Declaration, #15 Exhibit L to Shyr Declaration, #16 Exhibit M to Shyr Declaration, #17 Exhibit N to Shyr Declaration, #18 Proposed Order) (Asperger, James) Modified on 2/11/2019 (mrgo).
January 17, 2019 Filing 844 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Validity on Claims 20 and 22 of the '710 Patent Under 35 U.S.C. 103 Based on IPR Estoppel Under 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. Motion set for hearing on 2/7/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, #3 Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Validity on Claims 20 and 22 of the '710 Patent, #4 Exhibit A to Briggs Decl., #5 Exhibit B to Briggs Decl., #6 Exhibit C to Briggs Decl., #7 Exhibit D to Briggs Decl., #8 Exhibit E to Briggs Decl., #9 Exhibit F to Briggs Decl., #10 Exhibit G to Briggs Decl., #11 Exhibit H to Briggs Decl., #12 Exhibit I to Briggs Decl., #13 Exhibit J to Briggs Decl., #14 Exhibit K to Briggs Decl., #15 Exhibit L to Briggs Decl., #16 Exhibit M to Briggs Decl., #17 Exhibit N to Briggs Decl., #18 Exhibit O to Briggs Decl., #19 Exhibit P to Briggs Decl., #20 Proposed Order) (Briggs, Todd)
January 15, 2019 Filing 842 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited for Court Reporter. Court will contact Erik Marshall at Erik.Marshall@wilmerhale.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Dowd, James)
January 10, 2019 Filing 843 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING #833 hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. After conferring with counsel, the Court adopts the attached schedule. (See attached) Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
January 10, 2019 Filing 841 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, The California Institute of Technology(a California corporation (as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)) for Court Reporter. Court will contact Robin Ramirez at robinramirez@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Shyr, Margaret)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 840 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR REMAINING EXPERT DISCOVERY, SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND DAUBERT MOTIONS by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Reschedule #831 . Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions Due by 1/24/2019. Oppositions to Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions Due by 2/14/2019. Replies to Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions Due by 3/7/2019. (mrgo)
January 8, 2019 Filing 839 AMENDED MINUTES held before Judge George H. Wu re: Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines, #838 . Defendants' Motion to Certify #832 , is taken off-calendar. (mrgo)
January 8, 2019 Filing 838 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING #833 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. Hearing is held off the record. Court and counsel confer. The Court continues the hearing to January 10, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel are to advise the clerk by 10:00 a.m. on Thursday re general scheduling. Court Reporter: None Present. (mrgo)
January 7, 2019 Filing 837 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) #832 to January 17, 2019 #833 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of Opposition)(Briggs, Todd)
January 7, 2019 Filing 836 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court sets a TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RE DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING #833 for 1/8/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Counsel are to dial-in using the following information: Tel. No. 866-434-5269; Access Code: 9692487. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 7, 2019 Filing 835 STATEMENT of Notice of Intent to File an Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) #832 to January 17, 2019 #833 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Asperger, James)
January 7, 2019 Filing 834 NOTICE of Decision: Final Written Decisions in Inter Partes Review of U.S. Pat. No. 7,116,710 Finding That Selected Claims Are Not Invalid filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Asperger, James)
January 5, 2019 Filing 833 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) #832 to January 17, 2019 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Choy, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Dowd, James)
January 4, 2019 Filing 832 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 1/17/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Dowd, James)
January 4, 2019 Filing 831 Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Expert Discovery and Motion Due Dates filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Aaron)
December 28, 2018 Filing 830 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) FINAL RULING ON: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #740 by Judge George H. Wu. For the reasons stated in this Order, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment except as to Defendants' invalidity ground against Claims 13 and 22 of the '781 Patent based on Divsalar, Frey/Frey Slides, and Ping. *See order for complete ruling.* (vdr)
December 21, 2018 Filing 829 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H. Wu: - FINAL RULING ON: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. SHOEMAKES MARKING REPORT AND EXCLUDE LATEPRODUCED SOURCE CODE #749 ; CALTECHS MOTION TO STRIKE DR. STARKS EXPERTREPORT ON MARKING ISSUES, AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE DR. SHOEMAKES REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT ON MARKING ISSUES #754 . Attached hereto is the Courts Final Ruling Following the December 6, 2018 Hearing. The Court wouldDENY Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Dr. Starks Expert Report on Marking Issues (Docket No. 754-1) and DENY Defendants Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. Shoemakes Marking Report and Exclude Late Source Code (Docket No. 749-1). In order to cure any lingering prejudice to Plaintiff, it will be giventhe opportunity to address the allegations disclosed in Defendants Supplemental Stark Report in a supplemental report of its own. Any such report must be served by January 11, 2019. (lc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 827 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 11/15/18 9:36 am; 12/6/18 10:29 am re Transcript #825 , #826 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 10, 2018 Filing 826 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/6/18 10:29 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
December 10, 2018 Filing 825 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/15/18 9:36 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
December 6, 2018 Filing 828 *AMENDED* MINUTES OF Caltech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Validity Under 35 USC 103 Based on IPR Estoppel Under 35 USC 315(e)(2) #740 ; Defendants Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. Shoemake's Marking Report and Exclude Late Produced Source Code #749 ; Caltech's Motion to Strike Dr. Stark's Expert Report on Marking Issues, and Opposition to Defendants Motion to Strike Dr. Shoemake's Rebuttal Expert Report on Marking Issues #754 before Judge George H. Wu: The Motions are TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Court to issue ruling. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (jp) Modified on 12/14/2018 (mrgo).
December 6, 2018 Filing 824 MINUTES OF CALTECHS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (740), DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE (749) and CALTECHS MOTION TO STRIKE DR. STARK'S EXPERT REPORT ON MARKING ISSUES, AND OPPOSITION (754) held before Judge George H. Wu: The Court's Tentative Ruling is circulated. The Courts Further Thoughts on 101 Issue is circulated and attached hereto. Court hears oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, the Motions are TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Court to issue ruling. Upon receipt of this order, Counsel are to contact the clerk as to their position regarding the highlighted under seal portions of the circulated tentative ruling. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (yl)
December 6, 2018 Filing 823 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, The California Institute of Technology(a California corporation (as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)) for Court Reporter. Court will contact Robin Ramirez at robinramirez@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Shyr, Margaret)
December 6, 2018 Filing 822 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited for Court Reporter. Court will contact Erik Marshall at erik.marshall@wilmerhale.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Dowd, James)
December 5, 2018 Filing 821 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Document, #820 served on December 5, 2018. (Dowd, James)
December 5, 2018 Filing 820 SEALED DOCUMENT re Response, #812 , Supplement(Motion related), #809 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #818 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Frey)(Dowd, James)
December 3, 2018 Filing 819 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limitedto Notice (Other) #811 Regarding Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment (Dowd, James)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 818 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #813 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (See document for details) (mrgo)
November 29, 2018 Filing 817 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Reply #816 served on November 29, 2018. (Dowd, James)
November 29, 2018 Filing 816 SEALED REPLY RE Supplement(Motion related), #789 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #810 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited.(Dowd, James)
November 28, 2018 Filing 815 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #814 served on November 28, 2018. (Dowd, James)
November 28, 2018 Filing 814 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #813 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Response, #2 Unredacted Document Frey Declaration)(Dowd, James)
November 28, 2018 Filing 813 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Response, #3 Redacted Document Frey Declaration)(Dowd, James)
November 28, 2018 Filing 812 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limitedto Supplement(Motion related), #809 Regarding Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Frey)(Dowd, James)
November 27, 2018 Filing 811 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Asperger, James)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 810 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #799 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (See document for details) (mrgo)
November 23, 2018 Filing 809 SUPPLEMENT Caltech's Second Supplemental Brief in Support of its Opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Michael Mitzenmacher, #2 Declaration Dr. Matthew Shoemake, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B (Part 1 of 2), #5 Exhibit B (Part 2 of 2))(Asperger, James)
November 21, 2018 Filing 808 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Opposition, #806 , Sealed Document, #807 served on November 21, 2018. (Dowd, James)
November 21, 2018 Filing 807 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit A to Notice of Supplemental Evidence re Notice (Other), #785 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #794 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited.(Dowd, James)
November 21, 2018 Filing 806 SEALED OPPOSITION RE Response in Opposition to Motion,, #776 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #796 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5)(Dowd, James)
November 21, 2018 Filing 805 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document, #804 served on November 21, 2018. (Asperger, James)
November 21, 2018 Filing 804 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit A to Caltechs Response To Defendants Notice of Supplemental Evidence re Supplement(Motion related), #789 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #795 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology.(Asperger, James)
November 21, 2018 Filing 803 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Opposition, #802 served on 11/21/2018. (Briggs, Todd)
November 21, 2018 Filing 802 SEALED OPPOSITION RE Response in Opposition to Motion, #779 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #793 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit X to Briggs Decl ISO Caltech's Opp to Mtn to Strike)(Briggs, Todd)
November 20, 2018 Filing 801 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #800 served on November 20, 2018. (Dowd, James)
November 20, 2018 Filing 800 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #799 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Reply)(Dowd, James)
November 20, 2018 Filing 799 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Reply)(Dowd, James)
November 20, 2018 Filing 798 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to of Validity Under 35 U.S.C. 103 Based on IPR Estoppel Under 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) #740 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of Caltech's Reply, #2 Exhibit A to Briggs Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Briggs Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Briggs Decl.)(Briggs, Todd)
November 20, 2018 Filing 797 REPLY filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited to Supplement(Motion related), #789 Regarding Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment That The Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 7,916,781 Are Not Patent Eligible Under 35 U.S.C. 101 (Dowd, James)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 796 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOITON TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL #777 by Judge George H. Wu (lc)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 795 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL #790 by Judge George H. Wu (lc)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 794 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL #786 by Judge George H. Wu (lc)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 793 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu (lc)
November 19, 2018 Filing 792 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #791 served on November 19, 2018. (Asperger, James)
November 19, 2018 Filing 791 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibit A to Caltechs Response To Defendants Notice of Supplemental Evidence in Support of Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Claims for U.S. Patent No. 7,916,781 Are Not Patent Eligible Under 35 U.S. #790 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Caltechs Response To Defendants Notice of Supplemental Evidence in Support of Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Claims for U.S. Patent No. 7,916,781 Are Not Patent Eligible Under 35 U.S.C. 101)(Asperger, James)
November 19, 2018 Filing 790 APPLICATION to file document Exhibit A to Caltechs Response To Defendants Notice of Supplemental Evidence in Support of Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Claims for U.S. Patent No. 7,916,781 Are Not Patent Eligible Under 35 U.S.C. 101 under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit A to Caltech's Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Evidence)(Asperger, James)
November 19, 2018 Filing 789 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF U.S. PAT. 7,916,781 ARE INVALID UNDER 35 U.S.C. 101 #108 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Asperger, James)
November 16, 2018 Filing 788 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #787 served on November 16, 2018. (Dowd, James)
November 16, 2018 Filing 787 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #786 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Ex. A)(Dowd, James)
November 16, 2018 Filing 786 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Ex. A)(Dowd, James)
November 16, 2018 Filing 785 NOTICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. of Supplemental Evidence in Support of Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 7,916,781 are Not Patent Eligible Under 35 U.S.C. 101 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dowd, James)
November 15, 2018 Filing 784 MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,916,781 ARE NOT PATENT ELIGIBLE UNDER 35 U.S.C. 101 #544 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. Defendants' Motion is TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Plaintiff will file its supplemental within a week of this order. Defendants will have three business days thereafter to respond. Court to issue ruling. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
November 15, 2018 Filing 783 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #782 served on 11/15/2018. (Briggs, Todd)
November 15, 2018 Filing 782 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #781 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Caltech's Opposition to Motion to Strike, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. X to Briggs Decl ISO Caltech's Opposition to Motion to Strike)(Briggs, Todd)
November 15, 2018 Filing 781 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Caltech's Opposition to Motion to Strike, #2 Redacted Document Ex. X to Briggs Decl ISO Opposition to Motion to Strike, #3 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
November 15, 2018 Filing 780 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #778 served on November 15, 2018. (Dowd, James)
November 15, 2018 Filing 779 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Strike Regarding Marking #749 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Briggs Decl ISO Caltech's Opp to Motion to Strike, #2 Exhibit Ex. X to Briggs Decl ISO Caltech's Opp to Motion to Strike)(Briggs, Todd)
November 15, 2018 Filing 778 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #777 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opposition, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit 4, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit 5)(Dowd, James)
November 15, 2018 Filing 777 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Opposition, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit 4, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit 5)(Dowd, James)
November 15, 2018 Filing 776 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Dr. Starks Expert Report on Marking Issues, and Opposition to Defendants Motion to Strike Dr. Shoemakes Rebuttal Expert Report on Marking Issues MOTION to Strike Regarding Marking #749 #754 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dowd, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Dowd, James)
November 15, 2018 Filing 775 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited for Court Reporter. Court will contact Erik Marshall at Erik.Marshall@wilmerhale.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Dowd, James)
November 15, 2018 Filing 774 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, The California Institute of Technology(a California corporation (as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)) for Court Reporter. Court will contact Robin Ramirez at robinramirez@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Shyr, Margaret)
November 8, 2018 Filing 773 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Document,, #772 served on November 8, 2018. (Dowd, James)
November 8, 2018 Filing 772 SEALED DOCUMENT Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re IPR Estoppel re Objection/Opposition (Motion related),,,,,, #767 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #771 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 29, #8 Exhibit 30, #9 Exhibit 31, #10 Exhibit 32, #11 Exhibit 34, #12 Exhibit 42, #13 Exhibit 54, #14 Exhibit 56, #15 Exhibit 62)(Dowd, James)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 771 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: #768 . Portions of Defendants Opposition and Exhibits. (see attached for further details) (pj)
November 6, 2018 Filing 770 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,, #769 served on November 6, 2018. (Dowd, James)
November 6, 2018 Filing 769 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal #768 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opposition, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit 5, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit 6, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit 7, #5 Unredacted Document Exhibit 8, #6 Unredacted Document Exhibit 10, #7 Unredacted Document Exhibit 11, #8 Unredacted Document Exhibit 29, #9 Unredacted Document Exhibit 30, #10 Unredacted Document Exhibit 31, #11 Unredacted Document Exhibit 32, #12 Unredacted Document Exhibit 34, #13 Unredacted Document Exhibit 42, #14 Unredacted Document Exhibit 54, #15 Unredacted Document Exhibit 56, #16 Unredacted Document Exhibit 62)(Dowd, James)
November 6, 2018 Filing 768 APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Opposition, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit 5, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit 6, #5 Redacted Document Exhibit 7, #6 Redacted Document Exhibit 8, #7 Redacted Document Exhibit 10, #8 Redacted Document Exhibit 11, #9 Redacted Document Exhibit 29, #10 Redacted Document Exhibit 30, #11 Redacted Document Exhibit 31, #12 Redacted Document Exhibit 32, #13 Redacted Document Exhibit 34, #14 Redacted Document Exhibit 42, #15 Redacted Document Exhibit 54, #16 Redacted Document Exhibit 56, #17 Redacted Document Exhibit 62)(Dowd, James)
November 6, 2018 Filing 767 Opposition in Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to of Validity Under 35 U.S.C. 103 Based on IPR Estoppel Under 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) #740 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #2 Declaration of Dowd, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Exhibit 46, #49 Exhibit 47, #50 Exhibit 48, #51 Exhibit 49, #52 Exhibit 50, #53 Exhibit 51, #54 Exhibit 52, #55 Exhibit 53, #56 Exhibit 54, #57 Exhibit 55, #58 Exhibit 56, #59 Exhibit 57, #60 Exhibit 58, #61 Exhibit 59, #62 Exhibit 60, #63 Exhibit 61, #64 Exhibit 62)(Dowd, James)
October 31, 2018 Filing 766 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Document, #765 served on October 31, 2018. (Dowd, James)
October 31, 2018 Filing 765 SEALED DOCUMENT re MOTION to Strike Regarding Marking #749 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #761 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 16, #6 Exhibit 17, #7 Exhibit 18, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 20)(Dowd, James)
October 29, 2018 Filing 764 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document,,, #763 served on October 29, 2018. (Asperger, James)
October 29, 2018 Filing 763 SEALED DOCUMENT Memorandum in Support re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Dr. Starks Expert Report on Marking Issues, and Opposition to Defendants Motion to Strike Dr. Shoemakes Rebuttal Expert Report on Marking Issues MOTION to Strike Regarding Marking #749 #754 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #762 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Briggs Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Briggs Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Briggs Declaration, #4 Exhibit E to Briggs Declaration, #5 Exhibit F to Briggs Declaration, #6 Exhibit H to Briggs Declaration, #7 Exhibit M to Briggs Declaration, #8 Exhibit N to Briggs Declaration, #9 Exhibit O to Briggs Declaration, #10 Exhibit S to Briggs Declaration, #11 Exhibit U to Briggs Declaration, #12 Exhibit V to Briggs Declaration, #13 Exhibit W to Briggs Declaration)(Asperger, James)
October 29, 2018 Filing 759 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/22/18 8:51 am re Transcript #758 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 29, 2018 Filing 758 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/22/18 8:51 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 762 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #755 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (See document for details) (mrgo)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 761 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #751 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (See document for details) (mrgo)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 760 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULES FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF VALIDITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. 103 BASED ON IPR ESTOPPEL UNDER 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2), AND FOR THE PARTIES' MOTIONS RELATED TO THE EXPERT REPORTS OF DR. SHOEMAKE AND DR. STARK ON PATENT MARKING by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Reschedule, #750 . Motion hearing set for 12/6/18, at 8:30 a.m. (See document for additional deadlines) (mrgo)
October 25, 2018 Filing 757 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,, #756 served on October 25, 2018. (Asperger, James)
October 25, 2018 Filing 756 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Memorandum In Support of Caltechs Motion to Strike Dr. Starks Expert Report on Marking Issues, and Opposition to Defendants Motion to Strike Dr. Shoemakes Rebuttal Expert Report on Marking Issues and Exhibits in Support #755 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Caltechs Motion to Strike Dr. Starks Expert Report on Marking Issues, and Opposition to Defendants Motion to Strike Dr. Shoemakes Rebuttal Expert Report on Marking Issues, #2 Exhibit A to Briggs Dec. in Support of Caltech's Motion ("Briggs Dec."), #3 Exhibit B to Briggs Dec., #4 Exhibit C to Briggs Dec., #5 Exhibit E to Briggs Dec., #6 Exhibit F to Briggs Dec., #7 Exhibit H to Briggs Dec., #8 Exhibit M to Briggs Dec., #9 Exhibit N to Briggs Dec., #10 Exhibit O to Briggs Dec., #11 Exhibit S to Briggs Dec., #12 Exhibit U to Briggs Dec., #13 Exhibit V to Briggs Dec., #14 Exhibit W to Briggs Dec.)(Asperger, James)
October 25, 2018 Filing 755 APPLICATION to file document Memorandum In Support of Caltechs Motion to Strike Dr. Starks Expert Report on Marking Issues, and Opposition to Defendants Motion to Strike Dr. Shoemakes Rebuttal Expert Report on Marking Issues and Exhibits in Support under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Memorandum In Support of Caltechs Motion to Strike Dr. Starks Expert Report on Marking Issues, and Opposition to Defendants Motion to Strike Dr. Shoemakes Rebuttal Expert Report on Marking Issues, #3 Exhibit A to Briggs Declaration ISO Caltech's Motion to Strike ("Briggs Dec."), #4 Exhibit B to Briggs Dec., #5 Exhibit C to Briggs Dec., #6 Exhibit E to Briggs Dec., #7 Exhibit F to Briggs Dec., #8 Exhibit H to Briggs Dec., #9 Exhibit M to Briggs Dec., #10 Exhibit N to Briggs Dec., #11 Exhibit O to Briggs Dec., #12 Exhibit S to Briggs Dec., #13 Exhibit U to Briggs Dec., #14 Redacted Document Exhibit V to Briggs Dec., #15 Exhibit W to Briggs Dec.)(Asperger, James)
October 25, 2018 Filing 754 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Dr. Starks Expert Report on Marking Issues, and Opposition to Defendants Motion to Strike Dr. Shoemakes Rebuttal Expert Report on Marking Issues MOTION to Strike Regarding Marking #749 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. Motion set for hearing on 12/6/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Caltechs Motion to Strike Dr. Starks Expert Report on Marking Issues, and Opposition to Defendants Motion to Strike Dr. Shoemakes Rebuttal Expert Report on Marking Issues, #2 Proposed Order GRANTING Caltechs Motion to Strike Dr. Starks Expert Report on Marking Issues, and DENYING Defendants Motion to Strike Dr. Shoemakes Rebuttal Expert Report on Marking Issues, #3 Declaration OF TODD M. BRIGGS In Support of Caltechs Motion to Strike Dr. Starks Expert Report on Marking Issues, and Opposition to Defendants Motion to Strike Dr. Shoemakes Rebuttal Expert Report on Marking Issues, #4 Exhibit A to Briggs Declaration, #5 Exhibit B to Briggs Declaration, #6 Exhibit C to Briggs Declaration, #7 Exhibit D to Briggs Declaration, #8 Exhibit E to Briggs Declaration, #9 Exhibit F to Briggs Declaration, #10 Exhibit G to Briggs Declaration, #11 Exhibit H to Briggs Declaration, #12 Exhibit I to Briggs Declaration, #13 Exhibit J to Briggs Declaration, #14 Exhibit K to Briggs Declaration, #15 Exhibit L to Briggs Declaration, #16 Exhibit M to Briggs Declaration, #17 Exhibit N to Briggs Declaration, #18 Exhibit O to Briggs Declaration, #19 Exhibit P to Briggs Declaration, #20 Exhibit Q to Briggs Declaration, #21 Exhibit R to Briggs Declaration, #22 Exhibit S to Briggs Declaration, #23 Exhibit T to Briggs Declaration, #24 Exhibit U to Briggs Declaration, #25 Exhibit V to Briggs Declaration, #26 Exhibit W to Briggs Declaration) (Asperger, James)
October 25, 2018 Filing 753 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #752 served on October 25, 2018. (Dowd, James)
October 25, 2018 Filing 752 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #751 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. 1, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. 10, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 14, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. 15, #6 Unredacted Document Ex. 16, #7 Unredacted Document Ex. 17, #8 Unredacted Document Ex. 18, #9 Unredacted Document Ex. 19, #10 Unredacted Document Ex. 20)(Dowd, James)
October 25, 2018 Filing 751 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Ex. 1, #3 Redacted Document Ex. 10, #4 Redacted Document Ex. 14, #5 Redacted Document Ex. 15, #6 Redacted Document Ex. 16, #7 Redacted Document Ex. 17, #8 Redacted Document Ex. 18, #9 Redacted Document Ex. 19, #10 Redacted Document Ex. 20)(Dowd, James)
October 25, 2018 Filing 750 STIPULATION to Reschedule BRIEFING SCHEDULES FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF VALIDITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. 103 BASED ON IPR ESTOPPEL UNDER 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2), AND FOR THE PARTIES MOTIONS RELATED TO THE EXPERT REPORTS OF DR. SHOEMAKE AND DR. STARK ON PATENT MARKING filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order BRIEFING SCHEDULES FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF VALIDITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. 103 BASED ON IPR ESTOPPEL UNDER 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2), AND FOR THE PARTIES MOTIONS RELATED TO THE EXPERT REPORTS OF DR. SHOEMAKE AND DR. STARK ON PATENT MARKING)(Asperger, James)
October 25, 2018 Filing 749 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Regarding Marking filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. Motion set for hearing on 12/6/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Dowd, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Proposed Order)(Dowd, James)
October 25, 2018 Filing 748 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Hal Smith on behalf of Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited (Attorney Michael Hal Smith added to party Apple Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Michael Hal Smith added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Hal Smith added to party Avago Technologies Limited(pty:cc), Attorney Michael Hal Smith added to party Avago Technologies Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Hal Smith added to party Broadcom Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney Michael Hal Smith added to party Broadcom Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Hal Smith added to party Broadcom Limited(pty:dft))(Smith, Michael)
October 23, 2018 Filing 747 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited for Court Reporter. Court will contact Erik Marshall at Erik.Marshall@wilmerhale.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Dowd, James)
October 22, 2018 Filing 746 MINUTES OF CALTECH'S MOTION TO ENFORCE THE AGREEMENT REGARDING THE DEPOSITION OF DR. HENRY PFISTER AND COMPEL DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF DR. HENRY PFISTER #685 ; CALTECH'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE EXPERT DISCLOSURE OF DR. ANDREW BLANKSBY AND BAR EXPERT TESTIMONY #689 held before Judge George H. Wu. Court hears oral argument. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lom)
October 22, 2018 Filing 745 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, The California Institute of Technology(a California corporation (as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)), The California Institute of Technology(a California corporation (as to Counterclaim Doc No 32 filed 8/1/16)), The California Institute of Technology(a California corporation (as to Counterclaim Doc No 60 filed 9/21/16)) for Court Reporter. Court will contact Robin Ramirez at robinramirez@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Shyr, Margaret)
October 21, 2018 Filing 744 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Valerie Roddy on behalf of Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology (Attorney Valerie Roddy added to party The California Institute of Technology(pty:pla))(Roddy, Valerie)
October 19, 2018 Filing 743 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Deepa Acharya on behalf of Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, Counter Defendant The California Institute of Technology (Attorney Deepa Acharya added to party The California Institute of Technology(pty:pla), Attorney Deepa Acharya added to party The California Institute of Technology(pty:cd))(Acharya, Deepa)
October 18, 2018 Filing 742 SUPPLEMENT Caltech's Responsive Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 7,916,781 Are Not Patent Eligible Under 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd M. Briggs, #2 Exhibit A to Briggs Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Briggs Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Briggs Decl., #5 Exhibit D to Briggs Decl., #6 Exhibit E to Briggs Decl., #7 Exhibit F to Briggs Decl., #8 Exhibit G to Briggs Decl., #9 Exhibit H to Briggs Decl., #10 Exhibit I to Briggs Decl., #11 Declaration of Matthew B. Shoemake, Ph.D)(Briggs, Todd)
October 18, 2018 Filing 741 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limitedto Supplement(Motion related),,,,,, #710 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Frey, #2 Declaration of Dowd, #3 Exhibit MM, #4 Exhibit NN, #5 Exhibit OO, #6 Exhibit PP, #7 Exhibit QQ, #8 Exhibit RR, #9 Exhibit SS, #10 Exhibit TT, #11 Exhibit UU, #12 Exhibit VV, #13 Exhibit WW)(Dowd, James)
October 16, 2018 Filing 740 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to of Validity Under 35 U.S.C. 103 Based on IPR Estoppel Under 35 U.S.C. 315(e)(2) filed by plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. Motion set for hearing on 12/6/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, #3 Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit A to Briggs Decl., #5 Exhibit B to Briggs Decl., #6 Exhibit C to Briggs Decl., #7 Exhibit D to Briggs Decl., #8 Exhibit E to Briggs Decl., #9 Exhibit F to Briggs Decl., #10 Exhibit G to Briggs Decl., #11 Exhibit H to Briggs Decl., #12 Exhibit I to Briggs Decl., #13 Exhibit J to Briggs Decl., #14 Exhibit K to Briggs Decl., #15 Exhibit L to Briggs Decl., #16 Exhibit M to Briggs Decl., #17 Exhibit N to Briggs Decl., #18 Exhibit O to Briggs Decl., #19 Exhibit P to Briggs Decl., #20 Exhibit Q to Briggs Decl., #21 Exhibit R to Briggs Decl., #22 Exhibit S to Briggs Decl., #23 Exhibit T to Briggs Decl., #24 Exhibit U to Briggs Decl., #25 Exhibit V to Briggs Decl., #26 Exhibit W to Briggs Decl., #27 Exhibit X to Briggs Decl., #28 Exhibit Y to Briggs Decl., #29 Exhibit Z to Briggs Decl., #30 Exhibit AA to Briggs Decl., #31 Exhibit BB to Briggs Decl., #32 Exhibit CC to Briggs Decl., #33 Exhibit DD to Briggs Decl., #34 Exhibit EE to Briggs Decl., #35 Exhibit FF to Briggs Decl., #36 Exhibit GG to Briggs Decl., #37 Exhibit HH to Briggs Decl., #38 Proposed Order) (Briggs, Todd)
October 15, 2018 Filing 739 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Document, #738 served on October 15, 2018. (Dowd, James)
October 15, 2018 Filing 738 SEALED DOCUMENT in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. 101 re Supplement(Motion related), #714 , Order, #732 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K, #2 Exhibit L, #3 Exhibit BB, #4 Exhibit DD, #5 Exhibit JJ)(Dowd, James)
October 13, 2018 Filing 737 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document #736 served on October 13, 2018. (Asperger, James)
October 13, 2018 Filing 736 SEALED DOCUMENT Caltechs Reply in Support of Caltechs Motion re Reply (Motion related),, #727 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #735 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology.(Asperger, James)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 735 ORDER GRANTING CALTECHS APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #728 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
October 10, 2018 Filing 734 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document,, #733 served on October 10, 2018. (Asperger, James)
October 10, 2018 Filing 733 SEALED DOCUMENT Caltechs Opening Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendants Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 7,916,781 are not Patent Eligible under 35 U.S.C. 101 re Supplement(Motion related),,,,,, #710 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #731 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Matthew B. Shoemake Regarding 101 Eligibility of US Patent 7,916,781, #2 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of Caltechs Opening Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendants Renewed Motion for Summary Judgmen)(Asperger, James)
October 8, 2018 Filing 730 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #729 served on October 8, 2018. (Asperger, James)
October 8, 2018 Filing 729 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Caltech's Reply in Support of Caltech's Motion to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby and Bar Expert Testimony under seal #728 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Caltech's Reply in Support of Caltech's Motion to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby and Bar Expert Testimony)(Asperger, James)
October 8, 2018 Filing 728 APPLICATION to file document Caltech's Reply in Support of Caltech's Motion to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby and Bar Expert Testimony under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Caltech's Application to File Under Seal, #2 Redacted Document Reply in Support of Caltech's Motion to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby and Bar Expert Testimony)(Asperger, James)
October 8, 2018 Filing 727 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby and Bar Expert Testimony #689 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd Briggs in Support of Caltech's Reply in Support of Caltech's Motion to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby and Bar Expert Testimony, #2 Exhibit 12 to Briggs Declaration, #3 Exhibit 13 to Briggs Declaration, #4 Exhibit 14 to Briggs Declaration, #5 Exhibit 15 to Briggs Declaration, #6 Exhibit 16 to Briggs Declaration, #7 Exhibit 17 to Briggs Declaration)(Asperger, James)
October 8, 2018 Filing 726 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #725 served on October 8, 2018. (Briggs, Todd)
October 8, 2018 Filing 725 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Reply ISO Mtn re Pfister Deposition under seal #724 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document SEALED Reply ISO Mtn re Pfister Deposition)(Briggs, Todd)
October 8, 2018 Filing 724 APPLICATION to file document Reply ISO Mtn re Pfister Deposition under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document PUBLIC Reply ISO Mtn re Pfister Deposition, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order ISO Application to File Under Seal - Reply ISO Mtn re Pfister Deposition)(Briggs, Todd)
October 8, 2018 Filing 723 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION to Compel Deposition of Dr. Henry Pfister #685 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Briggs, Todd)
October 8, 2018 Filing 722 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. correcting APPLICATION to file document in connection with DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ISO RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT under seal #715 , Supplement(Motion related), #714 (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document)(Dowd, James)
October 8, 2018 Filing 721 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Opposition,, #720 served on October 8, 2018. (Dowd, James)
October 8, 2018 Filing 720 SEALED OPPOSITION RE APPLICATION to file document Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Caltech's Motion to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby and Exhibits 1, 2, 3, 4, 9, and 10 to the Declaration of Jams M. Dowd in Support of Defendants' #707 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #719 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 10)(Dowd, James)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 732 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu, re APPLICATION to file document in connection with DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ISO RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT under seal #715 . (mrgo)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 731 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #711 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
October 5, 2018 Filing 718 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANTS' Apple Inc.((as to Counterclaim Doc No 32 filed 8/1/16)), Apple Inc.((as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)), Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation((as to Counterclaim Doc No 32 filed 8/1/16)), Broadcom Corporation((as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)), Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #716 served on 10/04/2018. (Dowd, James)
October 5, 2018 Filing 717 DECLARATION of James Dowd re Supplement(Motion related), #714 DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ISO RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit JJ, #37 Exhibit KK, #38 Exhibit LL)(Dowd, James)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #707 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo) Modified on 10/10/2018 (mrgo).
October 4, 2018 Filing 716 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document in connection with DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ISO RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT under seal #715 filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Dowd, James)
October 4, 2018 Filing 715 APPLICATION to file document in connection with DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ISO RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT under seal filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration)(Dowd, James)
October 4, 2018 Filing 714 SUPPLEMENT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ISO DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Attachment)(Dowd, James)
October 4, 2018 Filing 713 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #712 served on October 4, 2018. (Asperger, James)
October 4, 2018 Filing 712 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document in Connection with Caltech's Opening Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendants Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 7,916,781 are not Patent Eligible under 35 U.S.C. #711 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Caltech's Opening Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendants Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 7,916,781 are not Patent Eligible under 35 U.S.C. 101, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit J to Briggs Decl., #3 Unredacted Document Declaration of Dr. Matthew Shoemake)(Briggs, Todd)
October 4, 2018 Filing 711 APPLICATION to file document in Connection with Caltech's Opening Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendants Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 7,916,781 are not Patent Eligible under 35 U.S.C. 101 under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Caltech's Application to File Under Seal, #2 Redacted Document Caltechs Opening Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendants Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 7,916,781 are not Patent Eligible under 35 U.S.C. 101, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit J to Briggs Decl., #4 Redacted Document Declaration of Dr. Matthew Shoemake)(Asperger, James)
October 4, 2018 Filing 710 SUPPLEMENT Caltech's Opening Supplemental Brief In Opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 7,916,781 are not Patent Eligible under 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd M. Briggs, #2 Exhibit A to Briggs Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Briggs Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Briggs Decl., #5 Exhibit D to Briggs Decl., #6 Exhibit E to Briggs Decl., #7 Exhibit F to Briggs Decl., #8 Exhibit G to Briggs Decl., #9 Exhibit H to Briggs Decl., #10 Exhibit I to Briggs Decl., #11 Redacted Document Exhibit J to Briggs Decl., #12 Exhibit K to Briggs Decl., #13 Exhibit L to Briggs Decl., #14 Exhibit M to Briggs Decl., #15 Exhibit N to Briggs Decl., #16 Exhibit O to Briggs Decl., #17 Exhibit P to Briggs Decl., #18 Exhibit Q to Briggs Decl., #19 Redacted Document Declaration of Dr. Matthew Shoemake, #20 Exhibit 1 to Shoemake Decl., #21 Exhibit 2 to Shoemake Decl., #22 Exhibit 3 to Shoemake Decl., #23 Exhibit 4 to Shoemake Decl., #24 Exhibit 5 to Shoemake Decl., #25 Exhibit 6 to Shoemake Decl., #26 Exhibit 7 to Shoemake Decl., #27 Exhibit 8 to Shoemake Decl., #28 Exhibit 9 to Shoemake Decl., #29 Exhibit 10 to Shoemake Decl., #30 Exhibit 11 to Shoemake Decl., #31 Exhibit 12 to Shoemake Decl., #32 Exhibit 13 to Shoemake Decl., #33 Exhibit 14 to Shoemake Decl., #34 Exhibit 15 to Shoemake Decl., #35 Exhibit 16 to Shoemake Decl., #36 Exhibit 17 to Shoemake Decl., #37 Declaration of Dr. Michael Mitzenmacher, #38 Exhibit 1 to Mitzenmacher Decl.)(Asperger, James)
October 2, 2018 Filing 709 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #708 served on 10/01/2018. (Dowd, James)
October 1, 2018 Filing 708 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Caltech's Motion to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby and Exhibits 1, 2, 3, 4, 9, and 10 to the Declaration of Jams M. Dowd in Support of Defendants' #707 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Opposition to Caltech's Motion to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby, #2 Exhibit 1 Unredacted, #3 Exhibit 2 Unredacted, #4 Exhibit 3 Unredacted, #5 Exhibit 4 Unredacted, #6 Exhibit 9 Unredacted, #7 Exhibit 10 Unredacted)(Dowd, James)
October 1, 2018 Filing 707 APPLICATION to file document Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Caltech's Motion to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby and Exhibits 1, 2, 3, 4, 9, and 10 to the Declaration of Jams M. Dowd in Support of Defendants' Opposition under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Opposition to Caltech's Motion to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby, #3 Declaration of Blanksby, #4 Declaration of Dowd, #5 Exhibit 1 Redacted, #6 Exhibit 2 Redacted, #7 Exhibit 3 Redacted, #8 Exhibit 4 Redacted, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9 Redacted, #14 Exhibit 10 Redacted, #15 Exhibit 11)(Dowd, James)
October 1, 2018 Filing 706 OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Compel Deposition of Dr. Henry Pfister #685 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dowd, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Dowd, James)
October 1, 2018 Filing 705 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Claim 6 of U.S. Patent No. 7,916,781 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Asperger, James)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 704 ORDER REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-11 by Judge George H. Wu re: Stipulation to Continue, #697 . HAVING CONSIDERED the parties' stipulation regarding the continuance of the noticed hearings for Caltech's Motion to Enforce the Agreement Regarding the Deposition of Dr. Henry Pfister and Compel Deposition Testimony of Dr. Henry Pfister ("Pfister Motion to Compel") (Dkt. No. 685) and Caltech's Motion to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby and Bar Expert Testimony ("Blanksby Motion to Strike") (Dkt. No. 689), the Court hereby continues the hearing dates from October 18, 2018 to October 22, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. (mrgo)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 703 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL SCHEDULE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Order #702 . (Motions for Summary Judgment due by 1/14/2019. Jury Trial set for 5/8/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (See document for additional deadlines and hearings) (mrgo)
September 26, 2018 Filing 702 Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding Extension of Pretrial and Trial Schedule Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-1 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 701 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu. On September 10, 2018, the Court issued a minute order on various discovery motions in this case that continued the trial date in this matter from February 19, 2019 to March 19, 2019 and continued the final pretrial conference from February 5, 2019 to March 5, 2019. See Docket No. 673. The Court instructed "[c]ounsel... to meet and confer and file a proposed amended scheduling order as soon as conveniently possible." See id. at 2. Two weeks have passed, and the parties have not submitted a schedule. But apparently in the interim, there has been time for Plaintiff to prepare and file two more discovery motions. The Court is not going to wait for a repeat of what happened this spring (where counsel chose not to submit a joint proposed revised schedule for months and only after further instruction from the Court). Counsel have until Wednesday, September 26, 2018 to submit a revised proposed schedule, or the Court will reconsider its deadline extensions in this case. (mrgo)
September 24, 2018 Filing 700 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document,,, #699 , Sealed Document,, #698 served on September 24, 2018. (Asperger, James)
September 24, 2018 Filing 699 SEALED DOCUMENT Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Caltech's re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby and Bar Expert Testimony #689 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #696 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd Briggs in Support of Caltech's Motion to Strike Blanksby, #2 Exhibit 1 to Briggs Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 to Briggs Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 to Briggs Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 to Briggs Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6 to Briggs Declaration, #7 Exhibit 7 to Briggs Declaration, #8 Exhibit 8 to Briggs Declaration, #9 Exhibit 9 to Briggs Declaration, #10 Exhibit 10 to Briggs Declaration)(Asperger, James)
September 24, 2018 Filing 698 SEALED DOCUMENT Memorandum in Support of Caltech's Motion to Enforce the Agreement Regarding the Deposition of Dr. Henry Pfister and Compel Deposition Testimony of Dr. Henry Pfister re MOTION to Compel Deposition of Dr. Henry Pfister #685 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #695 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Briggs Declaration ISO Caltech's Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit B to the Briggs Declaration ISO Caltech's Motion to Compel)(Briggs, Todd)
September 24, 2018 Filing 697 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Dates for Caltech's Motions (Dkts. 685, 689) from October 18, 2018 to October 22, 2018 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby and Bar Expert Testimony #689 , MOTION to Compel Deposition of Dr. Henry Pfister #685 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Continuance of Hearings)(Briggs, Todd)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 696 ORDER GRANTING CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #690 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (See document for details) (mrgo)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 695 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #686 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (See document for details) (mrgo)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 694 ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS RELATING TO DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,916,781 ARE NOT PATENT ELIGIBLE UNDER 35 U.S.C. 101 PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Continue, #693 . HAVING CONSIDERED the parties' stipulation regarding the deadline for supplemental briefing on Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, the Court hereby orders that the simultaneous supplemental briefing on Defendants' Motion will be filed by September 27, 2018, and simultaneous responsive briefs are due by October 11, 2018. (mrgo)
September 21, 2018 Filing 693 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date and Deadline for Supplemental Briefs Relating to Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dowd, James)
September 20, 2018 Filing 692 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,, #691 served on September 20, 2018. (Asperger, James)
September 20, 2018 Filing 691 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document in Connection with Caltech's Motion to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby and Bar Expert Testimony under seal #690 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Caltech's Motion to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby and Bar Expert Testimony, #2 Unredacted Document Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of Caltech's Motion to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby and Bar Expert Testimony, #3 Exhibit 1 to Briggs Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Briggs Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Briggs Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Briggs Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Briggs Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Briggs Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Briggs Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Briggs Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Briggs Declaration)(Asperger, James)
September 20, 2018 Filing 690 APPLICATION to file document in Connection with Caltech's Motion to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby and Bar Expert Testimony under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Caltech's Application to File Under Seal, #2 Redacted Document Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Caltech's Motion to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby and Bar Expert Testimony, #3 Redacted Document Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of Caltech's Motion to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby and Bar Expert Testimony, #4 Exhibit 1 to Briggs Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Briggs Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Briggs Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to Briggs Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to Briggs Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 to Briggs Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 to Briggs Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 to Briggs Declaration, #12 Exhibit 10 to Briggs Declaration)(Asperger, James)
September 20, 2018 Filing 689 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby and Bar Expert Testimony filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/18/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Caltech's Motion to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby and Bar Expert Testimony, #2 Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of Caltech's Motion to Strike the Expert Disclosure of Dr. Andrew Blanksby and Bar Expert Testimony, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Briggs Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to the Briggs Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to the Briggs Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to the Briggs Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to the Briggs Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to the Briggs Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 to the Briggs Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 to the Briggs Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 to the Briggs Declaration, #12 Exhibit 10 to the Briggs Declaration, #13 Exhibit 11 to the Briggs Declaration, #14 Proposed Order Granting Caltech's Motion to Strike) (Asperger, James)
September 20, 2018 Filing 688 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #687 served on 9/20/2018. (Briggs, Todd)
September 20, 2018 Filing 687 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #686 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum SEALED Memo ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition, #2 Exhibit SEALED Ex A ISO Briggs Decl ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition, #3 Exhibit SEALED Ex B ISO Briggs Decl ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition)(Briggs, Todd)
September 20, 2018 Filing 686 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex A ISO Briggs Decl ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition, #2 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex B ISO Briggs Decl ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition, #3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting App to File Under Seal - Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition)(Briggs, Todd)
September 20, 2018 Filing 685 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Deposition of Dr. Henry Pfister filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/18/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex A ISO Briggs Decl ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition, #2 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex B ISO Briggs Decl ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition, #3 Exhibit Ex C ISO Briggs Decl ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition, #4 Exhibit Ex D ISO Briggs Decl ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition, #5 Exhibit Ex E ISO Briggs Decl ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition, #6 Exhibit Ex F ISO Briggs Decl ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition, #7 Exhibit Ex G ISO Briggs Decl ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition, #8 Exhibit Ex H ISO Briggs Decl ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition, #9 Exhibit Ex I ISO Briggs Decl ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition, #10 Exhibit Ex J ISO Briggs Decl ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition, #11 Exhibit Ex K ISO Briggs Decl ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition, #12 Exhibit Ex L ISO Briggs Decl ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition, #13 Exhibit Ex M ISO Briggs Decl ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition, #14 Exhibit Ex N ISO Briggs Decl ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition, #15 Exhibit Ex O ISO Briggs Decl ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition, #16 Declaration Decl of Briggs ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition, #17 Memorandum PUBLIC Memo ISO Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition, #18 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Caltech's Mtn to Enforce Agreement and Compel Deposition)(Briggs, Todd)
September 19, 2018 Filing 684 Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding Deadline for Supplemental Briefs Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-1 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dowd, James)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 683 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PAGE LIMITS FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFS RELATING TO DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,916,781 ARE NOT PATENT ELIGIBLE UNDER 35 U.S.C. 101 by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Order, #680 . Both Defendants and Plaintiff may each file a supplemental brief on September 20, 2018 not to exceed 20 pages and a supplemental responsive brief on October 5, 2018 not to exceed 15 pages. (mrgo)
September 17, 2018 Filing 682 NOTICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. of Election of Prior Art Pursuant to Dkt. 673 (Dowd, James)
September 17, 2018 Filing 681 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES DEFENDANTS RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,916,781 ARE NOT PATENT ELIGIBLE UNDER 35 U.S.C. 101 #544 previously scheduled for 10/15/2018 to 10/25/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 14, 2018 Filing 680 Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding Page Limits for Additional Briefs Relating to Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgement that the Asserted Claims of US Patent NO. 7,916,781 are not Patent Eligible under 35 USC 101 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dowd, James)
September 14, 2018 Filing 679 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: DEFENDANT CALTECHS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN #661 , and the APPLICATIONS TO SEAL #662 #668 , are DENIED as MOOT. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 11, 2018 Filing 678 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 7/16/18 9:17 am; 8/30/18 9:37 am re Transcript #677 , #676 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 11, 2018 Filing 677 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 08/30/18 9:37 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2018. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
September 11, 2018 Filing 676 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/16/18 9:17 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2018. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
September 11, 2018 Filing 675 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/10/18 10:05 am re Transcript #674 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 11, 2018 Filing 674 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/10/18 10:05 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2018. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
September 10, 2018 Filing 673 MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER #563 ; CALTECH'S MOTION TO AMEND FINAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS #564 ; CALTECH'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. BRENDAN FREY REGARDING INVALIDITY OF PATENTS-IN-SUIT #599 ; DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE UNTIMELY EXPERT OPINIONS AND CONTENTIONS [600, U/S 608] Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling, as modified on the record. Defendants' Motion for an Order Enforcing the Scheduling Order and for a Protective Order #563 , is DENIED; Caltech's Motion to Amend Final Infringement Contentions #564 , is GRANTED; Caltech's Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Dr. Brendan Frey Regarding Invalidity of Patents-in-Suit #599 , is DENIED. However, the Court will allow an amended expert report as to Dr. Frey; Defendants' Motion to Strike Untimely Expert Opinions and Contentions #608 , is DENIED. Counsel are to meet and confer and file a proposed amended scheduling order as soon as conveniently possible. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lom)
September 10, 2018 Filing 672 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation for Court Reporter. Court will contact Erik Marshall at erik.marshall@wilmerhale.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Dowd, James)
September 10, 2018 Filing 671 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, The California Institute of Technology(a California corporation (as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)) for Court Reporter. Court will contact Robin Ramirez at robinramirez@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Briggs, Todd)
September 8, 2018 Filing 670 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #669 served on 9/07/2018. (Thompson, Aaron)
September 7, 2018 Filing 669 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Ex Parte re Surreply under seal #668 filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ISO Opposition to Surreply, #2 Exhibit A to Dowd Decl.)(Thompson, Aaron)
September 7, 2018 Filing 668 APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Ex Parte re Surreply under seal filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Opposition, #2 Exhibit A)(Thompson, Aaron)
September 7, 2018 Filing 667 DECLARATION of Dowd re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #666 filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thompson, Aaron)
September 7, 2018 Filing 666 Opposition in opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on to September 10, 2018 #661 re Ex Parte Application for Surreply filed by Counter Claimants Apple Inc., Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Thompson, Aaron)
September 7, 2018 Filing 665 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Cypress Semiconductor Corporation filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology.(Briggs, Todd)
September 7, 2018 Filing 664 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #663 served on September 7, 2018. (Asperger, James)
September 7, 2018 Filing 663 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 1-2 to the Declaration of Brian Biddinger in Support of Caltech's Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time, Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply, and Proposed Sur-Reply (Dkt. 661) under seal #662 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 of Declaration of Brian Biddinger in Support of Ex Parte Application, Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply, Proposed Sur-Reply, #2 Exhibit 2 of Declaration of Brian Biddinger in Support of Ex Parte Application, Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply, Proposed Sur-Reply)(Asperger, James)
September 7, 2018 Filing 662 APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 1-2 to the Declaration of Brian Biddinger in Support of Caltech's Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time, Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply, and Proposed Sur-Reply (Dkt. 661) under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
September 7, 2018 Filing 661 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on to September 10, 2018 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Biddinger in Support of Ex Parte Application, Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply, Proposed Sur-Reply, #2 Exhibit 1 to Biddinger Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Biddinger Declaration, #4 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time, #5 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply, #6 Proposed Sur-Reply, #7 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply) (Asperger, James)
August 31, 2018 Filing 659 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation for Court Reporter. Court will contact Erik Marshall at erik.marshall@wilmerhale.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Dowd, James)
August 31, 2018 Filing 658 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, The California Institute of Technology(a California corporation (as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)) for Court Reporter. Court will contact Robin Ramirez at robinramirez@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Briggs, Todd)
August 30, 2018 Filing 660 MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,916,781 ARE NOT PATENT ELIGIBLE UNDER 35 U.S.C. 101 #544 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court's Tentative Ruling is circulated and attached hereto. Court hears oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, Defendants' Motion is continued to October 15, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. Simultaneous supplemental briefing limited to 15 pages will be filed by September 20, 2018, and simultaneous responsive briefs limited to 20 pages are due by October 5, 2018. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
August 29, 2018 Filing 657 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, re Sealed Reply, #656 , Sealed Reply, #655 served on August 29, 2018. (Dowd, James)
August 29, 2018 Filing 656 SEALED REPLY RE MOTION for Protective Order for Third-Party Discovery #563 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #651 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(Dowd, James)
August 29, 2018 Filing 655 SEALED REPLY RE MOTION to Strike Untimely Expert Opinions and Contentions #600 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #652 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M.3, #2 Exhibit N.2, #3 Exhibit P.3)(Dowd, James)
August 28, 2018 Filing 654 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document, #653 served on 08/28/2018. (Asperger, James)
August 28, 2018 Filing 653 SEALED DOCUMENT Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Final Infringement Contentions re Reply (Motion related) #639 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #650 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology.(Asperger, James)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 652 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #641 APPLICATION to Seal Document. HAVING CONSIDERED Defendants' papers in connection with Defendants Broadcom Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Avago Technologies Limited, Apple Inc., and Cypress Semiconductor Corporation's ("Defendants") Application to File Documents Under Seal, it is hereby ORDERED that the application is GRANTED. The following materials shall be filed under seal: (see document for list). (mrgo)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 651 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #645 APPLICATION to Seal Document. HAVING CONSIDERED Defendants' papers in connection with Defendants Broadcom Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Avago Technologies Limited, Apple Inc., and Cypress Semiconductor Corporation's ("Defendants") Application to File Documents Under Seal, it is hereby ORDERED that the application is GRANTED. The following materials shall be filed under seal: (see document for list). (mrgo)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 650 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #642 APPLICATION to Seal Document. Having considered the papers, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff California Institute of Technology's ("Plaintiff" or "Caltech") Application to File Under Seal, and the following documents are hereby SEALED: Highlighted portions of Caltech's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Final Infringement Contentions. (mrgo)
August 28, 2018 Filing 649 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #646 served on 08/28/2018. (Asperger, James)
August 28, 2018 Filing 648 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #647 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #644 served on August 28, 2018. (Dowd, James)
August 27, 2018 Filing 647 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Reply in Support of Motion for an Order Enforcing the Scheduling Order and for a Protective Order under seal #645 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Reply, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Dowd, James)
August 27, 2018 Filing 646 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Final Infringement Contentions under seal #642 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Final Infringement Contentions)(Asperger, James)
August 27, 2018 Filing 645 APPLICATION to file document Reply in Support of Motion for an Order Enforcing the Scheduling Order and for a Protective Order under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dowd, James)
August 27, 2018 Filing 644 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Untimely Expert Opinions and Contentions under seal #641 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Reply, #2 Exhibit M.3, #3 Exhibit N.2, #4 Exhibit P.3)(Dowd, James)
August 27, 2018 Filing 643 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. correcting Reply (Motion related),, #638 Corrected Exhibit Q to the Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of Caltech's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Dr. Brendan Frey Regarding Invalidity of Patents-in-Suit (Briggs, Todd)
August 27, 2018 Filing 642 APPLICATION to file document Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Final Infringement Contentions under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Final Infringement Contentions)(Asperger, James)
August 27, 2018 Filing 641 APPLICATION to file document Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Untimely Expert Opinions and Contentions under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dowd, James)
August 27, 2018 Filing 640 REPLY in Support of MOTION for Protective Order for Third-Party Discovery #563 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dowd, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Dowd, James)
August 27, 2018 Filing 639 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Final Infringement Contentions #564 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Asperger, James)
August 27, 2018 Filing 638 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Dr. Brendan Frey Regarding Invalidity of Patents-in-Suit #599 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of Caltech's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Dr. Brendan Frey Regarding Invalidity of Patents-in-Suit, #2 Exhibit P of Briggs Declaration, #3 Exhibit Q of Briggs Declaration)(Briggs, Todd)
August 27, 2018 Filing 637 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Strike Untimely Expert Opinions and Contentions #600 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Choy, #2 Exhibit M.3, #3 Exhibit N.2, #4 Exhibit P.3)(Dowd, James)
August 27, 2018 Filing 636 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document,,,, #635 served on August 27, 2018. (Asperger, James)
August 27, 2018 Filing 635 SEALED DOCUMENT re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,,,, #620 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #634 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 of the Belanger Declaration in Support of Caltech's Opposition, #2 Exhibit A of the Biddinger Declaration, #3 Exhibit D of the Biddinger Declaration, #4 Exhibit E of the Biddinger Declaration, #5 Exhibit F of the Biddinger Declaration, #6 Exhibit G of the Biddinger Declaration, #7 Exhibit H of the Biddinger Declaration, #8 Exhibit I of the Biddinger Declaration, #9 Exhibit J of the Biddinger Declaration, #10 Exhibit K of the Biddinger Declaration, #11 Exhibit M of the Biddinger Declaration, #12 Exhibit N of the Biddinger Declaration, #13 Exhibit P of the Biddinger Declaration, #14 Exhibit Q of the Biddinger Declaration, #15 Exhibit R of the Biddinger Declaration, #16 Exhibit S of the Biddinger Declaration, #17 Exhibit T of the Biddinger Declaration)(Asperger, James)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 634 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #622 APPLICATION to Seal Document. Having considered the papers, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff California Institute of Technology's ("Plaintiff" or "Caltech") Application to File Under Seal, and the following documents are hereby SEALED: (see document for details). (mrgo)
August 24, 2018 Filing 633 NOTICE of Final Written Decision in Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. 7,421,032 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Final Written Decision in IPR2017-00728)(Asperger, James)
August 22, 2018 Filing 632 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, re Sealed Document, #631 , Sealed Opposition, #630 served on August 22, 2018. (Dowd, James)
August 22, 2018 Filing 631 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 1, 5, and 7 re Response in Opposition to Motion,, #616 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #627 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 7)(Dowd, James)
August 22, 2018 Filing 630 SEALED OPPOSITION RE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Final Infringement Contentions #564 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #626 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation.(Dowd, James)
August 21, 2018 Filing 629 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Opposition,,,, #628 served on 08/21/2018. (Briggs, Todd)
August 21, 2018 Filing 628 SEALED OPPOSITION RE MOTION for Protective Order for Third-Party Discovery #563 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #625 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SEALED Ex. A ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #2 Exhibit SEALED Ex. B ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #3 Exhibit SEALED Ex. F ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #4 Exhibit SEALED Ex. G ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #5 Exhibit SEALED Ex. H ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #6 Exhibit SEALED Ex. I ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #7 Exhibit SEALED Ex. J ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #8 Exhibit SEALED Ex. K ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #9 Exhibit SEALED Ex. L ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #10 Exhibit SEALED Ex. M ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #11 Exhibit SEALED Ex. N ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #12 Exhibit SEALED Ex. S ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #13 Exhibit SEALED Ex. V ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #14 Exhibit SEALED Ex. W ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition)(Briggs, Todd)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 627 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #617 APPLICATION to Seal Document. The following materials shall be filed under seal: Exhibits 1, 5, and 7 to the Declaration of James M. Dowd in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Dr. Frey. (rfi)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #612 APPLICATION to Seal Document. The following materials shall be filed under seal: The designated portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Final Infringement Contentions (Motion); Exhibits A-B to the Declaration of James M. Dowd in Support of Defendants' Motion (Dowd Declaration). (rfi)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 625 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #611 APPLICATION to Seal Document. The Court grants the Plaintiff California Institute of Technologys Application to File Under Seal. #614 (rfi)
August 21, 2018 Filing 624 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,,,, #623 served on August 21, 2018. (Asperger, James)
August 21, 2018 Filing 623 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Memorandum in Support of Caltech's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike Expert Opinions and Contentions and Materials Filed in Support under seal #622 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Belanger Declaration, #2 Unredacted Document Memorandum in Support of Caltech's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike Expert Opinions and Contentions, #3 Exhibit A to Biddinger Dec. ISO Caltech's Opposition, #4 Exhibit D to Biddinger Dec. ISO Caltech's Opposition, #5 Exhibit E to Biddinger Dec. ISO Caltech's Opposition, #6 Exhibit F to Biddinger Dec. ISO Caltech's Opposition, #7 Exhibit G to Biddinger Dec. ISO Caltech's Opposition, #8 Exhibit H to Biddinger Dec. ISO Caltech's Opposition, #9 Exhibit I to Biddinger Dec. ISO Caltech's Opposition, #10 Exhibit J to Biddinger Dec. ISO Caltech's Opposition, #11 Exhibit K to Biddinger Dec. ISO Caltech's Opposition, #12 Exhibit M to Biddinger Dec. ISO Caltech's Opposition, #13 Exhibit N to Biddinger Dec. ISO Caltech's Opposition, #14 Exhibit P to Biddinger Dec. ISO Caltech's Opposition, #15 Exhibit Q to Biddinger Dec. ISO Caltech's Opposition, #16 Exhibit R to Biddinger Dec. ISO Caltech's Opposition, #17 Exhibit S to Biddinger Dec. ISO Caltech's Opposition, #18 Exhibit T to Biddinger Dec. ISO Caltech's Opposition)(Asperger, James)
August 20, 2018 Filing 622 APPLICATION to file document Memorandum in Support of Caltech's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike Expert Opinions and Contentions and Materials Filed in Support under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Memorandum in Support of Caltech's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike Expert Opinions and Contentions)(Asperger, James) Modified on 8/21/2018 (rfi).
August 20, 2018 Filing 621 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, served on August 20, 2018. (Dowd, James)
August 20, 2018 Filing 620 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Strike Untimely Expert Opinions and Contentions #600 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Brian Biddinger, #2 Exhibit A to Biddinger Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Biddinger Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Biddinger Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Biddinger Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Biddinger Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Biddinger Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Biddinger Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Biddinger Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Biddinger Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to Biddinger Declaration, #12 Exhibit K to Biddinger Declaration, #13 Exhibit L to Biddinger Declaration, #14 Exhibit M to Biddinger Declaration, #15 Exhibit N to Biddinger Declaration, #16 Exhibit O to Biddinger Declaration, #17 Exhibit P to Biddinger Declaration, #18 Exhibit Q to Biddinger Declaration, #19 Exhibit R to Biddinger Declaration, #20 Exhibit S to Biddinger Declaration, #21 Exhibit T to Biddinger Declaration, #22 Declaration of Phil Belanger, #23 Exhibit 1 of Belanger Declaration (Filed Under Seal))(Asperger, James)
August 20, 2018 Filing 619 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,, #614 served on 08/20/2018. (Briggs, Todd)
August 20, 2018 Filing 618 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits to Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Dr. Brendan Frey Regarding Invalidity of the Patents-In-Suit under seal #617 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 [Confidential], #2 Exhibit 1 [Public], #3 Exhibit 5 [Confidential], #4 Exhibit 5 [Public], #5 Exhibit 7 [Confidential], #6 Exhibit 7 [Public])(Dowd, James)
August 20, 2018 Filing 617 APPLICATION to file document Exhibits to Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Dr. Brendan Frey Regarding Invalidity of the Patents-In-Suit under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dowd, James)
August 20, 2018 Filing 616 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Dr. Brendan Frey Regarding Invalidity of Patents-in-Suit #599 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dowd, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Dowd, James)
August 20, 2018 Filing 615 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Final Infringement Contentions #564 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Dowd, James)
August 20, 2018 Filing 614 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Enforce Scheduling Order under seal #611 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SEALED Ex. A ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #2 Exhibit SEALED Ex. B ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #3 Exhibit SEALED Ex. F ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #4 Exhibit SEALED Ex. G ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #5 Exhibit SEALED Ex. H ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #6 Exhibit SEALED Ex. I ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #7 Exhibit SEALED Ex. J ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #8 Exhibit SEALED Ex. K ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #9 Exhibit SEALED Ex. L ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #10 Exhibit SEALED Ex. M ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #11 Exhibit SEALED Ex. N ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #12 Exhibit SEALED Ex. S ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #13 Exhibit SEALED Ex. V ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition, #14 Exhibit SEALED Ex. W ISO Briggs Decl ISO Opposition)(Briggs, Todd)
August 20, 2018 Filing 613 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Motion to Amend Final Infringement Contentions under seal #612 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum [Redacted], #2 Memorandum [Confidential])(Dowd, James)
August 20, 2018 Filing 612 APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Motion to Amend Final Infringement Contentions under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dowd, James)
August 20, 2018 Filing 611 APPLICATION to file document Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Enforce Scheduling Order under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff's Application to File Under Seal - Opp to Mtn to Enforce Scheduling Order, #2 Memorandum PUBLIC Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Enforce Scheduling Order, #3 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. A ISO Brigs Decl ISO Opposition, #4 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. B ISO Brigs Decl ISO Opposition, #5 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. F ISO Brigs Decl ISO Opposition, #6 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. G S ISO Brigs Decl ISO Opposition, #7 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. H SO Brigs Decl ISO Opposition, #8 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. I ISO Brigs Decl ISO Opposition, #9 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. J ISO Brigs Decl ISO Opposition, #10 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. K ISO Brigs Decl ISO Opposition, #11 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. L ISO Brigs Decl ISO Opposition, #12 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. M ISO Brigs Decl ISO Opposition, #13 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. N ISO Brigs Decl ISO Opposition, #14 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. S ISO Brigs Decl ISO Opposition, #15 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. V ISO Brigs Decl ISO Opposition, #16 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. W ISO Brigs Decl ISO Opposition)(Briggs, Todd)
August 20, 2018 Filing 610 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Protective Order for Third-Party Discovery #563 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl of Briggs ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Enforce Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. A ISO Briggs Decl, #3 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. B ISO Briggs Decl, #4 Exhibit Ex. C ISO Briggs Decl, #5 Exhibit Ex. D ISO Briggs Decl, #6 Exhibit Ex. E ISO Briggs Decl, #7 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. F ISO Briggs Decl, #8 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. G ISO Briggs Decl, #9 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. H ISO Briggs Decl, #10 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. I ISO Briggs Decl, #11 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. J ISO Briggs Decl, #12 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. K ISO Briggs Decl, #13 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. L ISO Briggs Decl, #14 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. M ISO Briggs Decl, #15 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. N ISO Briggs Decl, #16 Exhibit Ex. O ISO Briggs Decl, #17 Exhibit Ex. P ISO Briggs Decl, #18 Exhibit Ex. Q ISO Briggs Decl, #19 Exhibit Ex. R ISO Briggs Decl, #20 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. S ISO Briggs Decl, #21 Exhibit Ex. T ISO Briggs Decl, #22 Exhibit Ex. U ISO Briggs Decl, #23 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. V ISO Briggs Decl, #24 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. W ISO Briggs Decl, #25 Exhibit Ex. X ISO Briggs Decl, #26 Exhibit Ex. Y ISO Briggs Decl, #27 Exhibit Ex. Z ISO Briggs Decl, #28 Exhibit Ex. AA ISO Briggs Decl, #29 Exhibit Ex. BB ISO Briggs Decl, #30 Exhibit Ex. CC ISO Briggs Decl, #31 Exhibit Ex. DD ISO Briggs Decl)(Briggs, Todd)
August 16, 2018 Filing 609 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, re SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Untimely Expert Opinions and Contentions re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #607 #608 served on August 16, 2018. (Dowd, James)
August 16, 2018 Filing 608 SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Untimely Expert Opinions and Contentions re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #607 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 9/10/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit L, #11 Exhibit M (Part 1), #12 Exhibit M (Part 2), #13 Exhibit N, #14 Exhibit P (Part 1), #15 Exhibit P (Part 2), #16 Exhibit Q, #17 Exhibit R, #18 Exhibit S, #19 Exhibit T, #20 Exhibit W)(Dowd, James)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 607 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL #601 by Judge George H. Wu. It is hereby ORDERED that the application is GRANTED. The following materials shall be filed under seal: The designated portions of Defendants' Motion to Strike Untimely Expert Opinions and Contentions (Motion); Exhibits A-D to the Declaration of James M. Dowd in Support of Defendants' Motion (Dowd Declaration); Exhibits F-J to the Dowd Declaration; Exhibits L-N to the Dowd Declaration; Exhibit P-T to the Dowd Declaration; and The designated portions of Exhibit W to the Dowd Declaration. (lom)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER REGARDING CONTINUATION OF HEARING DATE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Continue, #597 . Hearing on Defendants' Motion For An Order Enforcing The Scheduling Order And For A Protective Order (Dkt. 563) and Plaintiff's Motion To Amend Final Infringement Contentions (Dkt. 564) continued to 9/10/18, at 8:30 a.m. (mrgo)
August 10, 2018 Filing 605 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION to Strike Untimely Expert Opinions and Contentions #600 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. Other error(s) with document(s): The document image states "Motion to Strike Untimely Expert Opinions and Contentions" instead of Memorandum. Document also indicates "FILED UNDER SEAL" instead of being labeled "Redacted Memorandum...". In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
August 9, 2018 Filing 604 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #544 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Dowd, James)
August 8, 2018 Filing 603 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #602 served on August 8, 2018. (Dowd, James)
August 7, 2018 Filing 602 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion to Strike Untimely Expert Opinions and Contentions under seal #601 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M (Part 1), #13 Exhibit M (Part 2), #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit P (Part 1), #16 Exhibit P (Part 2), #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit W)(Dowd, James)
August 7, 2018 Filing 601 APPLICATION to file document Motion to Strike Untimely Expert Opinions and Contentions under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. Application set for hearing on 9/10/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dowd, James)
August 7, 2018 Filing 600 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Untimely Expert Opinions and Contentions filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 9/10/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Dowd, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Proposed Order)(Dowd, James)
August 7, 2018 Filing 599 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Dr. Brendan Frey Regarding Invalidity of Patents-in-Suit filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. Motion set for hearing on 9/10/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Caltech's Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Dr. Brendan Frey Regarding Invalidity of Patents-in-Suit, #2 Proposed Order Granting Caltech's Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Dr. Brendan Frey Regarding Invalidity of Patents-in-Suit, #3 Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of Caltech's Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Dr. Brendan Frey Regarding Invalidity of Patents-in-Suit, #4 Exhibit A of Briggs Declaration, #5 Exhibit B of Briggs Declaration, #6 Exhibit C of Briggs Declaration, #7 Exhibit D of Briggs Declaration, #8 Exhibit E of Briggs Declaration, #9 Exhibit F of Briggs Declaration, #10 Exhibit G of Briggs Declaration, #11 Exhibit H of Briggs Declaration, #12 Exhibit I of Briggs Declaration, #13 Exhibit J of Briggs Declaration, #14 Exhibit K of Briggs Declaration, #15 Exhibit L of Briggs Declaration, #16 Exhibit M of Briggs Declaration, #17 Exhibit N of Briggs Declaration, #18 Exhibit O of Briggs Declaration) (Asperger, James)
August 7, 2018 Filing 598 NOTICE of Final Written Decisions in Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. 7,421,032 B2 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Asperger, James)
August 7, 2018 Filing 597 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date re Dkts. 563 & 564 from 8/30/2018 to 9/10/2018 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dowd, James)
July 26, 2018 Filing 596 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #544 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact, #2 Declaration of Todd M. Briggs, #3 Exhibit A to Briggs Decl., #4 Exhibit B to Briggs Decl., #5 Exhibit C to Briggs Decl., #6 Exhibit D to Briggs Decl., #7 Exhibit E to Briggs Decl., #8 Exhibit F to Briggs Decl., #9 Declaration of Matthew B. Shoemake, Ph.D., #10 Exhibit 1 to Shoemake Decl., #11 Exhibit 2 to Shoemake Decl.)(Briggs, Todd)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 595 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL RELIEF REGARDING EXHIBIT 341 by Judge George H. Wu. (jag)
July 25, 2018 Filing 594 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, re Sealed Opposition, #593 served on July 25, 2018. (Dowd, James)
July 25, 2018 Filing 593 SEALED OPPOSITION RE Sealed Document, #586 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #592 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dowd, James)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #589 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
July 24, 2018 Filing 591 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #590 served on July 24, 2018. (Dowd, James)
July 24, 2018 Filing 590 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Response to Caltech's Supplemental Brief in Support of Additional Relief Regarding Exhibit 341 under seal #589 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Response [Under Seal], #2 Unredacted Document Ex. A [Under Seal])(Dowd, James)
July 24, 2018 Filing 589 APPLICATION to file document Response to Caltech's Supplemental Brief in Support of Additional Relief Regarding Exhibit 341 under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Response, #3 Redacted Document Ex. A)(Dowd, James)
July 24, 2018 Filing 588 OPPOSITION to Caltech's Supplemental Brief in Support of Additional Relief Regarding Exhibit 341 [Dkt. 579] filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dowd, #2 Exhibit A [Public], #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Dowd, James)
July 24, 2018 Filing 587 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document, #586 served on July 24, 2018. (Asperger, James)
July 24, 2018 Filing 586 SEALED DOCUMENT Supplemental Brief in Support of Additional Relief Regarding Exhibit 341 re Supplement(Motion related), #579 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #585 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of Caltech's Supplemental Brief)(Asperger, James)
July 23, 2018 Filing 584 DECLARATION of James M. Dowd in Support of APPLICATION to file document Supplemental Brief in Support of Additional Relief and Supporting Declaration under seal #580 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Dowd, James)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #580 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
July 20, 2018 Filing 583 NOTICE of Corporate Name Change filed by Defendant Broadcom Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Selwyn, Mark)
July 19, 2018 Filing 582 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #581 served on July 19, 2018. (Asperger, James)
July 19, 2018 Filing 581 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Supplemental Brief in Support of Additional Relief and Supporting Declaration under seal #580 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Supplemental Brief in Support of Additional Relief Regarding Exhibit 341, #2 Unredacted Document Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of Caltech's Supplemental Brief)(Asperger, James)
July 19, 2018 Filing 580 APPLICATION to file document Supplemental Brief in Support of Additional Relief and Supporting Declaration under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application to File Under Seal, #2 Redacted Document Supplemental Brief in Support of Additional Relief Regarding Exhibit 341, #3 Redacted Document Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of Caltech's Supplemental Brief)(Asperger, James)
July 19, 2018 Filing 579 SUPPLEMENT Brief in Support of Additional Relief Pursuant to Order (Dkt. 576) filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd Briggs in Support of Caltech's Supplemental Brief)(Asperger, James)
July 19, 2018 Filing 577 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation for Court Reporter. Court will contact Erik Marshall at erik.marshall@wilmerhale.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Dowd, James)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Order, #575 . (Discovery cut-off 10/8/2018. Motions due by 10/18/2018. Pretrial Conference reset for 2/5/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (See document for additional deadlines and hearings) (mrgo)
July 16, 2018 Filing 576 MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE TESTIMONY AND BRIEFING DISCLOSING PRIVILEGED INFORMATION FROM EXHIBIT 341 #530 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. However, Plaintiff will have until July 19, 2018 to file any request for additional relief. Defendants will respond by July 24, 2018. The Court sets a nonappearance status conference for July 30, 2018. Court to issue ruling. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
July 16, 2018 Filing 575 Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding Extension of Pretrial Schedule Pursuant To L.R. 7-1 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dowd, James)
July 16, 2018 Filing 574 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Document,, #573 served on 7/16/2018. (Briggs, Todd)
July 16, 2018 Filing 573 SEALED DOCUMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Final Infringement Contentions #564 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #572 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit J, #7 Exhibit K, #8 Exhibit L, #9 Exhibit M, #10 Exhibit N, #11 Exhibit O, #12 Exhibit P, #13 Exhibit R, #14 Exhibit S, #15 Exhibit T, #16 Exhibit U, #17 Exhibit V, #18 Exhibit W, #19 Exhibit Z)(Briggs, Todd)
July 16, 2018 Filing 571 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, The California Institute of Technology(a California corporation (as to Counterclaim Doc No 47 filed 8/31/16)) for Court Reporter. Court will contact Robin Ramirez at robinramirez@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Shyr, Margaret)
July 16, 2018 Filing 570 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER #563 , and CALTECHS MOTION TO AMEND FINAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS #564 previously scheduled for 08/09/2018 830 to 8/30/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 16, 2018 Filing 569 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #568 served on 7/16/2018. (Dowd, James)
July 16, 2018 Filing 568 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Final Infringement Contentions and Supporting Exhibits under seal #565 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation.(Dowd, James)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #565 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (See document for list of documents) (mrgo)
July 12, 2018 Filing 567 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff The California Institute of Technology, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,, #566 served on 7/12/2018. (Briggs, Todd)
July 12, 2018 Filing 566 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Final Infringement Contentions and Supporting Exhibits under seal #565 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Final Infringement Contentions, #2 Exhibit C of Briggs Decl., #3 Exhibit D of Briggs Decl., #4 Exhibit E of Briggs Decl., #5 Exhibit F of Briggs Decl., #6 Exhibit I of Briggs Decl., #7 Exhibit J of Briggs Decl., #8 Exhibit K of Briggs Decl., #9 Exhibit L of Briggs Decl., #10 Exhibit M of Briggs Decl., #11 Exhibit N of Briggs Decl., #12 Exhibit O of Briggs Decl., #13 Exhibit P of Briggs Decl., #14 Exhibit R of Briggs Decl., #15 Exhibit S of Briggs Decl., #16 Exhibit T of Briggs Decl., #17 Exhibit U of Briggs Decl., #18 Exhibit V of Briggs Decl., #19 Exhibit W of Briggs Decl., #20 Exhibit Z of Briggs Decl.)(Briggs, Todd)
July 12, 2018 Filing 565 APPLICATION to file document Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Final Infringement Contentions and Supporting Exhibits under seal filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Final Infringement Contentions)(Briggs, Todd)
July 12, 2018 Filing 564 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Final Infringement Contentions filed by plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. Motion set for hearing on 8/9/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Amend Final Infringement Contentions, #2 Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of Caltech's Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Final Infringement Contentions, #3 Exhibit A of Briggs Decl., #4 Exhibit B of Briggs Decl., #5 Exhibit C of Briggs Decl., #6 Exhibit D of Briggs Decl., #7 Exhibit E of Briggs Decl., #8 Exhibit F of Briggs Decl., #9 Exhibit G of Briggs Decl., #10 Exhibit H of Briggs Decl., #11 Exhibit I of Briggs Decl., #12 Exhibit J of Briggs Decl., #13 Exhibit K of Briggs Decl., #14 Exhibit L of Briggs Decl., #15 Exhibit M of Briggs Decl., #16 Exhibit N of Briggs Decl., #17 Exhibit O of Briggs Decl., #18 Exhibit P of Briggs Decl., #19 Exhibit Q of Briggs Decl., #20 Exhibit R of Briggs Decl., #21 Exhibit S of Briggs Decl., #22 Exhibit T of Briggs Decl., #23 Exhibit U of Briggs Decl., #24 Exhibit V of Briggs Decl., #25 Exhibit W of Briggs Decl., #26 Exhibit X of Briggs Decl., #27 Exhibit Y of Briggs Decl., #28 Exhibit Z of Briggs Decl., #29 Proposed Order) (Briggs, Todd)
July 12, 2018 Filing 563 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for Third-Party Discovery filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 8/9/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Dowd, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Proposed Order)(Dowd, James)
July 6, 2018 Filing 562 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, re Sealed Document, #559 , Sealed Document, #557 , Sealed Document, #560 , Sealed Document, #556 , Sealed Document, #558 served on July 6, 2018. (Dowd, James)
July 6, 2018 Filing 560 SEALED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT F TO THE DECLARATION OF JASON CHOY re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #544 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #553 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation.(Choy, Jason)
July 6, 2018 Filing 559 SEALED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT E TO THE DECLARATION OF JASON CHOY re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #544 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #553 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation.(Choy, Jason)
July 6, 2018 Filing 558 SEALED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT C TO THE DECLARATION OF JASON CHOY re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #544 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #553 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation.(Choy, Jason)
July 6, 2018 Filing 557 SEALED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT B TO THE DECLARATION OF JASON CHOY re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #544 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #553 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation.(Choy, Jason)
July 6, 2018 Filing 556 SEALED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT A TO THE DECLARATION OF JASON CHOY re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #544 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #553 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation.(Choy, Jason)
July 6, 2018 Filing 555 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, re Sealed Reply, #554 served on July 6, 2018. (Dowd, James)
July 6, 2018 Filing 554 SEALED REPLY RE MOTION to Strike Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #500 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #378 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,, #310 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #473 , Sealed Document, #445 , Seal #530 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #552 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation.(Dowd, James)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 561 ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR RENEWED SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION #551 by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets the following dates: Defendants' Opening Brief July 2, 2018; Caltech's Opposition Brief July 26, 2018; Defendants' Reply Brief August 9, 2018 [Court ordered; see Dkt. 531]; Hearing August 30, 2018 [Court ordered; see Dkt. 531]. (lom)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL #546 by Judge George H. Wu. It is hereby ORDERED that the application is GRANTED. Exhibits A, B, C, E and F to the Declaration of Jason Choy in Support of Defendants' Renewed Motion For Summary Judgment That The Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 7,916,781 Are Not Patent Eligible Under U.S.C. 101 shall be filed under seal. (lom)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL #542 by Judge George H. Wu. It is hereby ORDERED that the application is GRANTED. The portions of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Testimony And Briefing Disclosing Privileged Information From Exhibit 341 that Defendants designated shall be redacted and filed under seal. (lom)
July 3, 2018 Filing 551 STIPULATION for Order Setting Briefing Schedule for Renewed Summary Judgment Motion Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark)
July 3, 2018 Filing 550 NOTICE of Final Written Decisions in Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. 7,916,781 filed by Plaintiff The California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Final Written Decision in IPR2017-00297, #2 Exhibit B - Final Written Decision in IPR2017-00423)(Asperger, James)
July 3, 2018 Filing 549 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #547 served on July 3, 2018. (Dowd, James)
July 3, 2018 Filing 548 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #543 served on July 2, 2018. (Dowd, James)
July 3, 2018 Filing 547 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits A, B, C, E, and F to the Declaration of Jason Choy under seal #546 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit A, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit B, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit C, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit E, #5 Unredacted Document Exhibit F)(Choy, Jason)
July 2, 2018 Filing 546 APPLICATION to file document Exhibits A, B, C, E, and F to the Declaration of Jason Choy under seal filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A-Public, #3 Exhibit B-Public, #4 Exhibit C-Public, #5 Exhibit E-Public, #6 Exhibit F-Public)(Choy, Jason)
July 2, 2018 Filing 545 PROPOSED ORDER re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #544 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Dowd, James)
July 2, 2018 Filing 544 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 8/30/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #3 Declaration of Dr. Brendan Frey, #4 Declaration of Jason Choy, #5 Exhibit A- Public, #6 Exhibit B- Public, #7 Exhibit C- Public, #8 Exhibit D- Public, #9 Exhibit E- Public, #10 Exhibit F- Public) (Dowd, James)
July 2, 2018 Filing 543 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Testimony and Briefing Disclosing Privileged Information from Exhibit 341 under seal #542 filed by Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Unredacted Version of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Testimony and Briefing Disclosing Privileged Information from Exhibit 341)(Dowd, James)
July 2, 2018 Filing 542 APPLICATION to file document Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Testimony and Briefing Disclosing Privileged