Salvador Joel Padilla v. City of Oxnard et al
Plaintiff: Lacara and Salvador Joel Padilla
Defendant: CITY OF OXNARD, Does 1-10, inclusive, Oxnard Police Department, Jeri Williams and David Lacara
Not Yet Classified: Anoiel Khorshid
Case Number: 2:2016cv04105
Filed: June 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RE: STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE #43 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED that the entire action is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1). The court will not retain jurisdiction over this action. (lom)
December 12, 2017 Filing 43 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by Plaintiff Salvador Joel Padilla.(Vogel, Brian)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Re: Joint Stipulation #41 to Dismiss Chief Jeri Williams and Officer lacara by Judge Fernando M. Olguin as follows: (1) The defendants CHIEF JERI WILLIAMS and OFFICER DAVID LACARA are dismissed with prejudice from this action; (2) This Dismissal constitutes a general mutual release and a mutual waiver of all costs, court fees, and attorneys fees arising out of this matter as to defendants. (jp)
October 5, 2017 Filing 41 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Jeri Williams(Chief, an official), David Lacara filed by Defendants Jeri Williams(Chief, an official), David Lacara. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramirez, Eugene)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Case Terminated; Made JS-6) (vdr)
September 1, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE of Settlement (JOINT CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST TO STAY PROCEEDINGS) filed by Defendants City of Oxnard, David Lacara, Oxnard Police Department, Jeri Williams(Chief, an official). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kornblau, Andrea)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 9/7/2017. (vdr)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Re Stipulation #36 for Partial Dismissal With Prejudice as to plaintiffs Second, third, and Fourth Claims for Relief as to Plaintiff Salvador Padilla by Judge Fernando M. Olguin that 1) Plaintiff's Second Claim for Relief for Abuse of Process and Malicious Prosecution is dismissed with prejudice; 2) Plaintiff's Third Claim for Relief for Municipal Defendant Liability is dismissed with prejudice; and 3) Plaintiff's Fourth Claim for Relief for Supervisory Liability is dismissed with prejudice. (jp)
August 18, 2017 Filing 36 Joint STIPULATION for Order For Partial Dismissal With Prejudice As To Plaintiffs' Second, Third, and Fourth Claims For Relief As To Plaintiff Salvador Padilla filed by Defendants City of Oxnard, David Lacara, Oxnard Police Department, Jeri Williams(Chief, an official). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kornblau, Andrea)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO TAKE CERTAIN DEPOSITIONS AFTER THE EXISTINGDISCOVERY CUTOFF DATE #34 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin that (1) The depositions of Enrique Martinez, Leonor Martinez, Salvador Padilla,Sr., Chad Ordelheide, the Person(s) Most Knowledgeable as designated by Defendant Oxnard Police Department, and emergency personnel who treated Plaintiff at the scene of the incident may be taken after the discovery cut-off date of June 1, 2017, until August 14, 2017. (2) The ADR deadline of June 1, 2017, is extended to August 30, 2017. (jp)
May 26, 2017 Filing 34 Joint STIPULATION for Order To Take Certain Depositions After The Existing Discovery Cutoff Date filed by Defendants City of Oxnard, David Lacara, Oxnard Police Department, Jeri Williams(Chief, an official). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kornblau, Andrea)
May 17, 2017 Filing 33 Effective May 24, 2017, Judge MacKinnon will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 840 on the 8th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 840 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 12, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Anoiel Khorshid has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, Re: Stipulation #30 . Jury Trial continued to 12/12/2017 at 8:45 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for continued dates and deadlines.* (vdr)
March 23, 2017 Filing 30 Joint STIPULATION for Order TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE TO CONTINUE ALL PENDING DEADLINES AND THE TRIAL DATE filed by Defendants City of Oxnard, David Lacara, Oxnard Police Department, Jeri Williams(Chief, an official). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kornblau, Andrea)
February 24, 2017 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Monica de Leon counsel for Defendants City of Oxnard, David Lacara, Oxnard Police Department, Jeri Williams, Jeri Williams. Monica de Leon is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants City of Oxnard, David Lacara, Oxnard Police Department, Jeri Williams. (de Leon, Monica)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS RE: JOINT STIPULATION #27 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Jury Trial continued to 11/14/2017 at 8:30 AM; Pretrial Conference continued to 10/27/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for continued deadlines.* (vdr)
February 14, 2017 Filing 27 Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule /Modify Scheduling Order filed by plaintiff Salvador Joel Padilla. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vogel, Brian)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CORRECTED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon re Stipulation for Protective Order #25 . (ib)
January 6, 2017 Filing 25 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants City of Oxnard, David Lacara, Oxnard Police Department, Jeri Williams(Chief, an official). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Corrected re Confidential Documents)(Kornblau, Andrea)
December 16, 2016 Filing 24 Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants City of Oxnard, David Lacara, Oxnard Police Department, Jeri Williams(Chief, an official). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Confidential Documents)(Attorney Andrea Katherine Kornblau added to party City of Oxnard (pty:dft), Attorney Andrea Katherine Kornblau added to party David Lacara(pty:dft), Attorney Andrea Katherine Kornblau added to party Oxnard Police Department(pty:dft), Attorney Andrea Katherine Kornblau added to party Jeri Williams(pty:dft))(Kornblau, Andrea)
December 8, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Effective December 15, 2016, Judge Olguin will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 6D on the 6th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 6D of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Jury Trial set for 9/12/2017 at 8:15 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for dates, deadlines and requirements imposed.* (vdr)
August 25, 2016 Filing 20 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Salvador Joel Padilla.. (Vogel, Brian)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, re Stipulation #18 . The Scheduling Conference is continued to 9/15/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
August 19, 2016 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from September 8, 2016 to September 15, 2016 filed by Defendants City of Oxnard, David Lacara, Oxnard Police Department, Jeri Williams(Chief, an official). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramirez, Eugene)
August 8, 2016 Filing 17 REFUND OF $400.00 made payable on 08/08/2016 to Brian Vogel for payment made on 06/09/2016 Re: APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid #8 . (rdj)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 9/8/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
August 3, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants City of Oxnard, David Lacara, Oxnard Police Department, Jeri Williams(Chief, an official), (de Leon, Monica)
August 3, 2016 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendants City of Oxnard, David Lacara, Oxnard Police Department, Jeri Williams(Chief, an official).(Attorney Monica de Leon added to party City of Oxnard (pty:dft), Attorney Monica de Leon added to party David Lacara(pty:dft), Attorney Monica de Leon added to party Oxnard Police Department(pty:dft), Attorney Monica de Leon added to party Jeri Williams(pty:dft))(de Leon, Monica)
July 13, 2016 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Salvador Joel Padilla, upon Defendant Oxnard Police Department served on 7/13/2016, answer due 8/3/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diane Burns, Front Desk in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vogel, Brian)
July 13, 2016 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Salvador Joel Padilla, upon Defendant David Lacara served on 7/13/2016, answer due 8/3/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diane Burns, Front Desk in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vogel, Brian)
July 13, 2016 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Salvador Joel Padilla, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diane Burns, Front Desk in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vogel, Brian)
July 13, 2016 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Salvador Joel Padilla, upon Defendant Jeri Williams(Chief, an official) served on 7/13/2016, answer due 8/3/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diane Burns, Front Desk in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vogel, Brian)
July 13, 2016 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Salvador Joel Padilla, upon Defendant City of Oxnard served on 7/13/2016, answer due 8/3/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Duane Koziel, City Clerk's Office Assistant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vogel, Brian)
July 6, 2016 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid filed by Plaintiff Salvador Joel Padilla. (Vogel, Brian)
June 20, 2016 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. All pleadings filed in this matter should contain the case number and the assigned judges' initials to ensure proper routing of documents. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jloz) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 13, 2016 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants City of Oxnard, David Lacara, Oxnard Police Department, Jeri Williams(Chief, an official), Jeri Williams(Chief, an individual ). (car)
June 13, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
June 9, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Salvador Joel Padilla, (Vogel, Brian)
June 9, 2016 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Salvador Joel Padilla. (Vogel, Brian)
June 9, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Salvador Joel Padilla. (Vogel, Brian)
June 9, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-17973514 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Salvador Joel Padilla. (Attorney Brian Arnold Vogel added to party Salvador Joel Padilla(pty:pla))(Vogel, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salvador Joel Padilla v. City of Oxnard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Joel Padilla
Represented By: Brian Arnold Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF OXNARD
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Monica de Leon
Represented By: Andrea Katherine Kornblau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxnard Police Department
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Monica de Leon
Represented By: Andrea Katherine Kornblau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeri Williams
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Monica de Leon
Represented By: Andrea Katherine Kornblau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lacara
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Monica de Leon
Represented By: Andrea Katherine Kornblau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Anoiel Khorshid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?