February 16, 2018 |
Filing
176
JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT CHARLOTTE RUSSE, INC. 73 by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that Plaintiff Jitrade, Inc. shall recover from Defendant Charlotte Russe, Inc. the sum of three thousand five hundred and 00/100 dollars ($3,500.00), inclusive of all costs then accrued, which costs include attorney's fees awardable under statute. Plaintiff may file a bill of costs and a motion for attorney fees within 21 days from the issuance of the judgment. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (kti)
|
July 13, 2017 |
Filing
99
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee.Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before July 27, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed as to defendants Charlotte Russe, Inc., MI In Fashion, Inc., and Hyun S. Lee for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this Order To Show Cause, on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: An answer by the following defendant(s): Charlotte Russe, Inc., MI In Fashion, Inc., and Hyun S. Lee; Plaintiff's application for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (clee)
|
May 22, 2017 |
Filing
74
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before June 5, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed as to defendants Kakipo, Inc. and Xianyu Shao for lack of prosecution. See document for details. (smo)
|
February 27, 2017 |
Filing
51
(IN CHAMBERS) - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Absent a showing of good cause, an action must be dismissed without prejudice if the summons and complaint are not served on a defendant within 90 days after the complaint is filed. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Generally, defendant must answer the complaint within 21 days after service (60 days if the defendant is the United States). In the present case, it appears that one or more of these time per iods has not been met. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before March 13, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed as to defendants Charlotte Russe, Inc., MI In Fashion, Inc., and Hyu n S. Lee for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this Order To Show Cause, on or before the above date, as evidence t hat the matter is being prosecuted diligently: An answer by the following defendant(s): Charlotte Russe, Inc., MI In Fashion, Inc., and Hyun S. Lee; Plaintiff's application for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (clee)
|
December 5, 2016 |
Filing
40
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian re Stipulation for Protective Order 39 . See order for details. (hr)
|