Terry Romero et al v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Romero, Terry Romero, John Fairlie and Parvin Mirabadi, MD doing business as Sunrise Surgical Center
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc. formerly known as Doe 1 doing business as Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey, Does 2 through 100, inclusive, Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Inc., California Physicians Service a California corporation doing business as Blue Shield, Blue Cross of California a corporation doing business as Anthem Blue Cross, Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma and Doe
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Elliot K Gordon
Case Number: 2:2016cv05623
Filed: July 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2018 Filing 63 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gillian H Clow counsel for Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma. Gillian H. Clow is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Gillian H. Clow. (Clow, Gillian)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER OR DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT OF CASE by Judge James V. Selna. re #61 (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb)
June 23, 2017 Filing 61 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Elliot K. Gordon: Mediation held on June 20, 2017 and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judges deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case.(Gordon, Elliot)
June 6, 2017 Filing 60 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56 filed by defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma. Motion set for hearing on 7/10/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts and Conclusions of Law, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Proposed Order) (Clow, Gillian)
May 4, 2017 Filing 59 WITNESS DISCLOSURE filed by Plaintiff Terry Romero (Attachments: #1 Declaration EXPERT REPORT)(Mirabel, Farrah)
March 31, 2017 Filing 58 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Elliot K. Gordon has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
March 30, 2017 Filing 57 NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for June 8, 2017.(Mirabel, Farrah)
February 21, 2017 Filing 56 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #35 Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma.(Clow, Gillian)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER FOR COURT TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (kt)
February 6, 2017 Filing 54 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge James V. Selna. The Court and counsel confer. The Court sets the following case management dates with the agreement of counsel Discovery cut-off 5/9/2017; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2017 at 11:00 AM; and the Court Trial set for 8/22/2017 at 8:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINES) Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (kt)
February 6, 2017 Filing 53 MINUTES OF Hearing on Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma's Motion to Dismiss. The Court DENIES the defendant's #43 MOTION to Dismiss and rules in accordance with the tentative ruling attached hereto. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (kt)
January 31, 2017 Filing 52 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Scheduling Conference Report ; estimated length of trial 1, filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Presumptive Schedule of Pretrial Dates)(Clow, Gillian)
January 17, 2017 Filing 51 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for 2/6/2017 at 1:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/1/2017. (kt)
January 12, 2017 Filing 49 (IN CHAMBERS) The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the hearing on Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma's MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #43 , previously scheduled for 1/23/2017 at 9:30 AM, to MONDAY, 2/6/2017 at 1:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna, in Courtroom 10C of the Ronald Reagan Federal Bldg. and Courthouse at 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, California. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#17-027) approved by Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips. IT IS ORDERED, with the concurrence of the Case Management and Assignment Committee, that this case be reassigned from the calendar of George H. King to the calendar of Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-05623 JVS(PJWx). (rn)
January 9, 2017 Filing 47 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #43 filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma. (Clow, Gillian)
January 5, 2017 Filing 46 NOTICE TO PARTIES by Chief U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. Effective, January 4, 2017, Judge Walsh will be located at the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, COURTROOM 790 on the 7th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 790 of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 1st floor of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse. Magistrate Judge Walsh's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Isabel Martinez, may be reached at (213) 894-8958. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 7, 2016 Filing 45 opposition opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #43 filed by Plaintiff Terry Romero. (Mirabel, Farrah)
December 2, 2016 Filing 44 Receipt of acknowledgment letter from Los Angeles County Superior Court, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Case No. BC607168. (bm)
November 30, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma. Motion set for hearing on 1/23/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Clow, Gillian)
November 30, 2016 Filing 42 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Terry Romero pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Terry Romero. (Mirabel, Farrah)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS' SERVICES DBA BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA AND BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA LIFE and HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY by Judge George H. King, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #40 : Upon the stipulation of the parties, and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the claims alleged in the First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Terry Romero against Defendants California Physicians' Services dba Blue Shield of California and Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company (collectively, "Blue Shield of California") are dismissed without prejudice. The First Amended Complaint is not dismissed as against any other defendants besides Blue Shield of California. (bm)
November 16, 2016 Filing 40 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company, California Physicians Service filed by defendant Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company, California Physicians Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Reid P Davis added to party Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Reid P Davis added to party California Physicians Service(pty:dft))(Davis, Reid)
November 14, 2016 Filing 39 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Los Angeles, CA 90012. (bm)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re: Motion to Remand (Dkt. 17) by Judge George H. King: This Matter is before us on Plaintiffs' motion to remand, (Dkt. 17.) On October 18, 2016, we denied remand as to Plaintiff Romero, severed and remanded Plaintiffs Mirabadi and Sunrise Surgical Center, and ordered Defendants to show cause as to our jurisdiction over Plaintiff Fairlie's claims. (Dkt. 29.) Defendants submitted two statements claiming that they do not know whether Fairlie has a plan covered under ERISA because he does not have a plan with any of them. (Dkts. 31 and 33.) They believe his plan is with Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey, which is a defendant that has not been served. They also request that we take no action with respect to Fairlie's claims until further information is known about his health plan. However, as there is no evidence that Fairlie's plan is subject to ERISA, there is no basis for our jurisdiction, and we cannot simply and indefinitely hold the case in limbo. We now SEVER Fairlie's claims from this action and REMAND them to the state court from which they were removed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk shall effect remand of Plaintiff Fairlie's claims forthwith. (bm)
November 3, 2016 Filing 37 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First Amended Complaint #34 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Docket entry text does not match caption of attached document. A Certificate of Interested Parties should be e-filed as a separate, stand alone document. Counsel re-filed First Amended Complaint as document #35 and Certificate of Interested Parties as document #36 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
October 31, 2016 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Terry Romero, (Mirabel, Farrah)
October 31, 2016 Filing 35 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against PLAINTIFF Terry Romero amending Complaint - (Discovery),,, filed by plaintiff Terry Romero(Mirabel, Farrah)
October 31, 2016 Filing 34 Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) #18 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Terry Romero. (Attachments: #1 Appendix CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES)(Mirabel, Farrah)
October 28, 2016 Filing 33 STATEMENT BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE AND CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS' SERVICE STATEMENT IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S OCTOBER 18, 2016 MINUTE ORDER filed by Defendants Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company, California Physicians Service re: Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,,,,, #29 . (Davis, Reid)
October 28, 2016 Filing 31 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma, Blue Cross of Californiato Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,,,,, #29 Statement re Plaintiff John Fairlie's Claims in Response to the Court's October 18, 2016 Minute Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Clow, Gillian)
October 27, 2016 Filing 32 Receipt of Acknowledgment of remand documents by Los Angeles Superior Court Central District, case no. BC607168. (lom)
October 18, 2016 Filing 30 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Los Angeles, CA 90012. (bm)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order re: Motion to Remand [Dkt. 17] and Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 18] by Judge George H. King: granting in part and denying in part #17 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court; granting #18 MOTION to Dismiss Case: Motion to Remand: Absent original or supplemental jurisdiction, we must sever and remand Provider Plaintiffs claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1441(c). We now SEVER the Provider Plaintiffs' claims from this action and REMAND them to the state court from which they were improvidently removed. Motion to Dismiss: Defendants' motion to dismiss as to Romero is GRANTED with leave to amend to state a claim for benefits under 29 U.S.C. 1132(a). Romero shall file her First Amended Complaint in compliance with this Order within 14 days hereof, or show cause in writing, within the same 14 days, why this action should not be dismissed for her failure to diligently prosecute, and for her failure to comply with this Order. Failure to file the First Amended Complaint or show cause as required by this Order will result in the dismissal of Romero's action at the expiration of the 14 days. If Romero timely files her First Amended Complaint, defendants shall respond to it within 30 days thereafter. Order to Show Cause as to Plaintiff Fairlie: Accordingly, Defendants shall show cause, in writing, within 10 days hereof, why we should not remand this action as to Fairlie for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to timely and adequately show cause as required herein shall be deemed Defendants' admission that this Court lacks jurisdiction, and Fairlie's claims will be severed and remanded pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1441(c). (see document for further details) (bm)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge George H. King. On the Court's own motion, the Motion by Plaintiffs to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #17 and the Motion by Defendant to Dismiss Case #18 , noticed for hearing on October 17, 2016, are TAKEN OFF CALENDAR and will be taken UNDER SUBMISSION without oral argument on that date pursuant to Local Rule 7-15. No appearance by counsel shall be necessary. The hearing date is vacated. Further briefing, if any, shall be filed in accordance with Local Rules as if the noticed hearing date had not been vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
October 3, 2016 Filing 27 REPLY in support of a motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) #18 filed by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma, Blue Cross of California, Blue Shield, Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company. (Attorney Gillian H Clow added to party Blue Shield(pty:dft), Attorney Gillian H Clow added to party Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Clow, Gillian)
October 3, 2016 Filing 26 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF A MOTION NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to LOS ANGELES SUPERIORCOURT #17 filed by Plaintiff Parvin Mirabadi, MD. (Mirabel, Farrah)
September 26, 2016 Filing 25 OPPOSITION opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to LOS ANGELES SUPERIORCOURT #17 Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Co., Anthem, Inc., Blue Cross of California dba Anthem Blue Cross, and Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahomas Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion Requesting Remand to the State Court filed by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma, Blue Cross of California, Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company. (Attorney Amir Shlesinger added to party Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Shlesinger, Amir)
September 21, 2016 Filing 24 OPPOSITION OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) #18 filed by Plaintiff Terry Romero. (Mirabel, Farrah)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND TO OCTOBER 17, 2016 by Judge George H. King, re Stipulation to Continue, #20 : The Court has considered the Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to October 17, 2016 submitted by Plaintiffs Terry Romero, John Fairlie, and Parvin Mirabadi, M.D. dba Sunrise Surgical Center ("Plaintiffs") and Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Co., Anthem, Inc., Blue Cross of California dba Anthem Blue Cross, and Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma ("Defendants"). For the reasons stated in the stipulation, and GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, the Court hereby APPROVES and GRANTS the stipulation. The hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand shall be continued from October 3, 2016 to October 17, 2016. (bm)
September 9, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to October 17, 2016 re Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A),,, #21 , Stipulation to Continue, #20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Clow, Gillian)
September 8, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Continue #20 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Proposed order was not submitted as a separate, additional attachment to the Stipulation. A stand-alone proposed order can be e-filed by submitting a Notice of Lodging with the separate, additional attachment of the proposed order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
September 7, 2016 Filing 20 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand from October 3, 2016 to October 17, 2016 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to LOS ANGELES SUPERIORCOURT #17 filed by defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma, Blue Cross of California.(Shlesinger, Amir)
September 2, 2016 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) #18 filed by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma, Blue Cross of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smersfelt, Kenneth)
September 2, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) filed by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma, Blue Cross of California. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order) (Smersfelt, Kenneth)
September 1, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to LOS ANGELES SUPERIORCOURT filed by PLAINTIFFS Parvin Mirabadi, MD. Motion set for hearing on 10/3/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Mirabel, Farrah)
August 30, 2016 Filing 16 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COUT #13 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT #14 by Clerk. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 9/2/16. L.R. 6-1: Unless otherwise provided by rule or order of the Court, no oral motions will be recognized and every motion shall be presented by written notice of motion. (lom)
August 30, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT #13 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT #14 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. L.R. 6-1: Unless otherwise provided by rule or order of the Court, no oral motions will be recognized and every motion shall be presented by written notice of motion. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom)
August 29, 2016 Filing 14 DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN, see docket entry no. #16 - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT filed by PLAINTIFFS Parvin Mirabadi, MD. (Mirabel, Farrah) Modified on 8/30/2016 (lom).
August 29, 2016 Filing 13 DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN, see docket entry no. #16 - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COUT filed by plaintiffs Parvin Mirabadi, MD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Mirabel, Farrah) Modified on 8/30/2016 (lom).
August 11, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE of Order re Case Management filed by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma, Blue Cross of California. (Smersfelt, Kenneth)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT by Judge George H. King: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge George H. King. The court fully adheres to Rule 1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, which, as amended as of December 1, 2015, requires that the Rules be "construed, administered, and employed by the court and the parties to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination ofevery action and proceeding." Counsel shall also be guided by the following special requirements, some of which are more specific than those set out in the Local Rules: (see document for further details) (bm)
August 2, 2016 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma answer now due 9/2/2016, re Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma.(Smersfelt, Kenneth)
August 1, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. King and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (ghap)
July 29, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company, California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield, (Attorney Jeffrey J Maurer added to party Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey J Maurer added to party California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield (pty:dft))(Maurer, Jeffrey)
July 29, 2016 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company, California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield (Maurer, Jeffrey)
July 29, 2016 Filing 6 JOINDER filed by Defendants Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company, California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 . (Maurer, Jeffrey)
July 28, 2016 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Inc., Blue Cross of California. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/16/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(ghap)
July 28, 2016 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by defendants Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company, California Physicians Service. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/12/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(ghap)
July 28, 2016 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT Complaint - (Discovery) plaintiff being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOE 1 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., filed by plaintiffs Parvin Mirabadi, MD, John Fairlie, Terry Romero. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/6/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(ghap)
July 28, 2016 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma, Blue Cross of California, Blue Shield, Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company, California Physicians Service, Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., filed by plaintiffs Parvin Mirabadi, MD, John Fairlie, Terry Romero. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/14/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap)
July 28, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Inc., BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS, identifying Anthem, Inc. (Attorney Kenneth N Smersfelt added to party Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth N Smersfelt added to party Anthem Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth N Smersfelt added to party BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS(pty:dft))(Smersfelt, Kenneth)
July 28, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma, identifying Health Care Service Corporation. (Smersfelt, Kenneth)
July 28, 2016 Filing 3 JOINDER filed by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Inc., BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 . (Smersfelt, Kenneth)
July 28, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma. (Smersfelt, Kenneth)
July 28, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, Central District, case number BC607168 with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 07/28/2016, receipt number 0973-18264488), filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tiffaney Snyder, #2 Summons and Complaint, #3 Amendment to Complaint, #4 California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield of California and Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company's Answer to Complaint, #5 Anthem Blue Cross Life & Health Insurance Company, Blue Cross of California dba Anthem Blue Cross and Anthem, Inc.'s Answer to Co mplaint, #6 Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement, #7 Notice & Acknowledgment, #8 Notice of Continuance of Hearing) (Attorney Kenneth N Smersfelt added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma(pty:dft))(Smersfelt, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry Romero et al v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth N Smersfelt
Represented By: Amir Shlesinger
Represented By: Gillian H Clow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc. formerly known as Doe 1 doing business as Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 2 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Amir Shlesinger
Represented By: Reid P Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey J Maurer
Represented By: John M LeBlanc
Represented By: Gillian H Clow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth N Smersfelt
Represented By: Amir Shlesinger
Represented By: Gillian H Clow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Physicians Service a California corporation doing business as Blue Shield
Represented By: Reid P Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey J Maurer
Represented By: John M LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross of California a corporation doing business as Anthem Blue Cross
Represented By: Kenneth N Smersfelt
Represented By: Amir Shlesinger
Represented By: Gillian H Clow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Shield
Represented By: Gillian H Clow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma
Represented By: Amir Shlesinger
Represented By: Kenneth N Smersfelt
Represented By: Gillian H Clow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Romero
Represented By: Farrah Mirabel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fairlie
Represented By: Farrah Mirabel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parvin Mirabadi, MD doing business as Sunrise Surgical Center
Represented By: Farrah Mirabel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Elliot K Gordon
Represented By: Elliot K Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?