Guillermo Robles v. Dominos Pizza LLC Featured Case
Plaintiff: Guillermo Robles
Defendant: Dominos Pizza LLC
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Michael G Balmages
Case Number: 2:2016cv06599
Filed: September 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
2 Judge: Frederick F Mumm
3 Judge: S James Otero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation to Continue Trial and Associated Pretrial Deadlines #191 . ( Motion hearing continued 11/29/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal., Final Pretrial Conference continued to 11/29/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal., Jury Trial continued to 12/14/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal.) All other associated pretrial deadlines are continued according to the new trial and pretrial conference dates. (twdb)
October 1, 2021 Filing 191 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial and Associated Pretrial Deadlines filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Trial and Associated Pretrial Deadlines)(Hurley, Gregory)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation to Continue Trial and Associated Pretrial Deadlines #189 . ( Motion hearing continued to 11/1/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal., Final Pretrial Conference continued to 11/1/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal., Jury Trial continued to 11/16/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal.) (twdb)
August 26, 2021 Filing 189 STIPULATION to Continue Trial Date filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Trial and Associated Pretrial Deadlines)(Hurley, Gregory)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: On the Court's own motion, the hearing on the Motions in Limine (Dkt. Nos. #117 , #118 , #119 , #122 , #123 , #124 , #125 , #154 , #155 , and #156 ) schedule for hearing on June 28, 2021 is hereby CONTINUED to August 30, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 23, 2021 Filing 187 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order (1) GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. #97 ); (2) DENYING Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. #101 ) and (3) VACATING the June 28, 2021 hearing. The Court ORDERS Defendant to bring its website into compliance with the WCAG 2.0 guidelines and to pay to Plaintiff $4000. (twdb)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. On the Court's own motion, the Final Pretrial Conference set June 28, 2021, is CONTINUED to September 27, 2021 at 11:00 A.M. The Jury Trial set for July 13, 2021 is CONTINUED to October 12, 2021 at 9:00 A.M. before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 17, 2021 Filing 185 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: The Hearing on the MOTION for Summary Judgment #97 , and MOTION for Summary Judgment #101 is CONTINUED from 6/21/2021 to 6/28/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 15, 2021 Filing 184 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Hurley, Gregory)
June 14, 2021 Filing 183 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Joint Proposed PreTrial Conference Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Manning, Joseph)
June 14, 2021 Filing 182 STATEMENT The Case filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles filed JOINTLY (Manning, Joseph)
June 14, 2021 Filing 181 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles.. (Manning, Joseph)
June 14, 2021 Filing 180 PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
June 14, 2021 Filing 179 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (DISPUTED set) filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles.. (Manning, Joseph)
June 14, 2021 Filing 178 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by JOINTLY Guillermo Robles.. (Manning, Joseph)
June 14, 2021 Filing 177 PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY VERDICT filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Hurley, Gregory)
June 14, 2021 Filing 176 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC.. (Hurley, Gregory)
June 14, 2021 Filing 175 Amended Joint Exhibit List filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC.. (Hurley, Gregory)
June 11, 2021 Filing 174 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: The HEARING on the MOTIONS for Summary Judgment #97 , #101 is CONTINUED from 6/14/2021 to 6/21/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 7, 2021 Filing 173 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Thurston v. Omni Jury Instruction of Unruh and Effective Comm Only)(Hurley, Gregory)
June 7, 2021 Filing 172 Witness List filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC.. (Hurley, Gregory)
June 7, 2021 Filing 171 OPPOSITION to Fifth MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of any of Defendant's policies, procedures, or practices regarding Digital accessibility #155 filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chilleen in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's MIL No. 5 - to Exclude Evidence of Defendant's Policies, Procedures or Practices Re Digital Accessibility, #2 Exhibit A - Maloney Transcript Volume I, #3 Exhibit B - Maloney Transcript Volume II, #4 Exhibit C - Defendant's Document Production DP000032-DP000037)(Hurley, Gregory)
June 7, 2021 Filing 170 OPPOSITION to Fourth MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence of Defendant's Expert's prior online orders #156 filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cannon in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's MIL No. 4 - to Exclude Defendant's Expert's Prior Online Orders, #2 Declaration of Chilleen in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's MIL No. 4 - to Exclude Defendant's Expert's Prior Online Orders, #3 Exhibit A - Exhibit B to Declaration of Manning, #4 Exhibit B - Defendant's Supplemental Expert Disclosures, #5 Exhibit C - Cannon Depo)(Hurley, Gregory)
June 7, 2021 Filing 169 Witness List filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles.. (Manning, Joseph)
June 7, 2021 Filing 168 JOINT Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles.. (Manning, Joseph)
June 7, 2021 Filing 167 Opposition In Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of Post-Complaint Visits to Website and/or Mobile Application #154 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
June 7, 2021 Filing 166 Opposition In Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Plaintiff's Alleged Call to Domino's Screen Reader Number #125 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
June 7, 2021 Filing 165 Opposition In Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Testimony Due to Failure to Preserve Evidence #123 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
June 7, 2021 Filing 164 Opposition In Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude WCAG #124 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
June 7, 2021 Filing 163 Opposition In Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Unplead Barriers #122 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
June 7, 2021 Filing 162 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
June 7, 2021 Filing 161 OPPOSITION to Third MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Motivation for visiting Defendant's Website or Mobile Application #119 filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chilleen in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's MIL No. 3 - to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Motivation for Visiting Website, #2 Exhibit A - List of Plaintiff's Lawsuits, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Lawsuit Complaints, #4 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Relevant Deposition Testimony Excerpts)(Hurley, Gregory)
June 7, 2021 Filing 160 OPPOSITION to Second MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Finances and Past Settlements #118 filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chilleen in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's MIL No. 2 - to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Finances and Past Settlement, #2 Exhibit A - List of Plaintiff's Lawsuits, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Lawsuit Complaints, #4 Exhibit C - Deposition Excerpts of Plaintiff's Relevant Testimony)(Hurley, Gregory)
June 7, 2021 Filing 159 OPPOSITION to First MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of or Reference to Plaintiff's other Lawsuits #117 filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chilleen in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's MIL No. One - to Exclude Evidence or Reference to Plaintiff's Lawsuits, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Lawsuits, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Lawsuit Complaints, #4 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Relevant Deposition Transcript Excerpts)(Hurley, Gregory)
June 4, 2021 Filing 158 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The HEARING on the MOTIONS for Summary Judgment #97 and #101 is CONTINUED from 6/7/2021 to 6/14/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 4, 2021 Filing 157 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gregory F Hurley counsel for Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. Bradley J. Leimkuhler is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Domino's Pizza LLC. (Hurley, Gregory)
May 28, 2021 Filing 156 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Fourth MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence of Defendant's Expert's prior online orders filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal.(Manning, Joseph)
May 28, 2021 Filing 155 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Fifth MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of any of Defendant's policies, procedures, or practices regarding Digital accessibility filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of JRM, #2 Exhibit A to Dec of JRM, #3 Exhibit B to Dec of JRM, #4 Exhibit C to Dec of JRM)(Manning, Joseph)
May 28, 2021 Filing 154 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of Post-Complaint Visits to Website and/or Mobile Application filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chilleen in Support of Defendant's MIL No. 5, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Chilleen - Plaintiff's Supp ROG Response)(Chilleen, Michael)
May 27, 2021 Filing 153 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion in Limine to Exclude, #121 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
May 27, 2021 Filing 152 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion in Limine to Exclude #120 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph) Modified on 5/27/2021 (lom). Modified on 5/27/2021 (lom).
May 21, 2021 Filing 151 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal re: The HEARING on the MOTIONS for Summary Judgment #97 , #101 is CONTINUED from 5/24/2021 to 6/7/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 13, 2021 Filing 150 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: the HEARING on the MOTIONS for Summary Judgment #97 and #101 is CONTINUED from 5/17/2021 to 5/24/2021 at 9:00 A.M. before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 7, 2021 Filing 149 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The HEARING on the MOTIONS for Summary Judgment #97 and #101 is CONTINUED from 5/10/2021 to 5/17/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. On the Court's own motion, the Motions for Summary Judgment (Dkt. Nos. #97 & #101 ) set for hearing on May 3, 2021, are hereby continued to May 10, 2021, at 9:00 A.M. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 23, 2021 Filing 147 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Status Report #146 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lodged)(Hurley, Gregory)
April 23, 2021 Filing 146 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Maloney, #2 Exhibit A - Spreadsheet to be Lodged)(Hurley, Gregory)
April 23, 2021 Filing 145 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. In view of Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eicks March 18, 2021 order, the Court reschedules the hearing on the Motions for Summary Judgment (Dkt. Nos. #97 , #101 ) for May 3, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff and Defendant to each file a status report concerning the impact of the recently-ordered discovery on the Motions for Summary Judgment by Friday, April 23, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick re: Stipulation for Discovery. #142 On March 2, 2021, Plaintiff filed the Joint Stipulation etc. ("the Motion"), which noticed a March 26, 2021 hearing date. The previously noticed March 26, 2021 hearing date is vacated. The Magistrate Judge has taken the Motion under submission without oral argument. For the reasons discussed, the Motion is granted in part and denied in part. (See document for details) (vmun)
March 2, 2021 Filing 142 STIPULATION for Discovery as to RE Defendants Deposition Testimony filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of JRM, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Manning, Joseph)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MINUTES re Order (1) GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Joint Stipulation (Dkt. No. 136); and (2) VACATING the March 1, 2021 Hearing (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: After considering the papers filed in support of and in opposition to the Motion, the Court GRANTS the Motion and reopens discovery for the sole purpose of litigating whether Plaintiff should be allowed to seek additional documents and deposition testimony as requested in the Joint Stipulation. The Court vacates the hearing set for March 1, 2021. (see document for further details) (bm)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. On the Court's own motion, the hearing on the Motion for Leave To File Joint Stipulation Re: Defendant's Deficient Deposition Testimony (Dkt. No. #136 ) set for hearing on 2/22/2021 is hereby continued to 3/1/2021 at 9:00 A.M. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 8, 2021 Filing 139 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file To File Joint Stipulation re Defendant's Deficient Deposition Testimony #136 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
February 1, 2021 Filing 138 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file To File Joint Stipulation re Defendant's Deficient Deposition Testimony #136 filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leimkuhler in Support of Opposition to Motion to Modify Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit A - 2017-03-09 Notice of Depo of PMK, #3 Exhibit b - 2019-11-06 Notice of Depo of PMK, #4 Exhibit c - 2019-11-20 Objections to Depo of PMK, #5 Exhibit D - 2020-02-06 Meet & Confer Letter, #6 Exhibit E - 2020-09-10 Second Notice of Depo of PMK, #7 Exhibit F - 2020-09-11 Objections to Notice of Depo of PMK, #8 Exhibit G - 2020-09-15 Email Re Depo, #9 Exhibit H - 2020-12-28 Meet and Confer Email, #10 Exhibit I - 2020-12-30 Meet and Confer Re Stip Email, #11 Exhibit J - 2021-01-11 Email Re Joint Stip, #12 Exhibit K - Excerpts from Maloney Depo Transcript, #13 Exhibit L - Privilege Log, #14 Exhibit M - Email Re Motion to Exclude)(Hurley, Gregory)
January 22, 2021 Filing 137 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The hearing on the MOTIONS for Summary Judgment #97 , #101 IS CONTINUED FROM 1/25/2021 TO 3/29/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 20, 2021 Filing 136 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file To File Joint Stipulation re Defendant's Deficient Deposition Testimony filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. Motion set for hearing on 2/22/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration OF Michael Manning, #3 Exhibit 1 to Dec of Michael Manning, #4 Proposed Order) (Manning, Joseph)
January 13, 2021 Filing 135 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Hurley, Gregory)
January 13, 2021 Filing 134 STATUS REPORT - Plaintiff's filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
December 30, 2020 Filing 133 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #97 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Manning, #2 Exhibit A to Dec of Michael Manning, #3 Exhibit B-1 To Dec of Michael Manning, #4 Exhibit B-2 to Dec of Michael Manning)(Manning, Joseph)
December 22, 2020 Filing 132 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: denying #131 . The Magistrate Judge is in receipt of Plaintiff's "Motion to Compel etc.", filed 12/21/20. According to the proposed order filed with the Motion, the Motion seeks an order requiring an additional production of documents (to occur more than three weeks before the noticed hearing on the Motion,) requiring additional deposition testimony and allowing an indefinite extension of the deadline for filing supplemental papers in connection with the motion for summary judgment pending before the District Judge. The Motion is denied without prejudice. (See document for further details.) (sp)
December 21, 2020 Filing 131 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. Motion set for hearing on 1/22/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Manning, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order)(Manning, Joseph)
November 2, 2020 Filing 130 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: re #99 . On 10/29/20, the District Judge referred to the Magistrate Judge Plaintiff's "Motion to Exclude Defense Expert Aaron Cannon" and "Motion for Sanctions", filed 9/28/20. The Magistrate Judge has read and considered all papers filed in support of and in opposition to the Motions and has taken the Motions under submission without oral argument. (See document for further details.) (sp)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. On the Court's own motion, the Motions for Summary Judgment (Dkt. Nos. #97 & #101 ) set for hearing on November 2, 2020, are hereby continued to January 25, 2021 at 9:00 A.M. The Court had inadvertently continued the hearing on the motions to January 27, 2021. The Court further orders Plaintiff and Defendant to each file a status report by January 13, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The Court hereby vacates the hearing on the Motion to Exclude Defense Expert (Dkt. No. #99 ) and Motion for Sanctions (Dkt. No. #100 ) scheduled for November 2, 2020. These motions are hereby referred Judge Charles F. Eick, for report and recommendation. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. On the Court's own motion, the Court continues the trial schedule as follows: the Final Pretrial Conference is continued to June 28, 2021, at 11:00 A.M. The Trial is continued to July 13, 2021, at 9:00 A.M. The Motions in Limine are set for hearing on June 28, 2021, at 11:00 A.M. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. On the Court's own motion, the Motions for Summary Judgment (Dkt. Nos. #97 & #101 ) set for hearing on November 2, 2020, are hereby continued to January 27, 2021 at 9:00 A.M. The Court further orders Plaintiff and Defendant to each file a status report by January 13, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 26, 2020 Filing 125 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Plaintiff's Alleged Call to Domino's Screen Reader Number filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leimkuhler in Support of Motion in Limine No. 4, #2 Exhibit A - Excerpt of Plaintiff's Depo Transcript, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Response to RFPDocs (Set One), #4 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Response to RFPDocs (Set Two), #5 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 4)(Hurley, Gregory)
October 26, 2020 Filing 124 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude WCAG filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leimkuhler in Support of Motion in Limine Number 2, #2 Exhibit A - Docket 66, #3 Exhibit B - Initial Expert Report, #4 Exhibit C - Excerpt from Musachio Depo, #5 Exhibit D - Robles v. Domino's, #6 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion in Limine Number 2)(Hurley, Gregory)
October 26, 2020 Filing 123 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Testimony Due to Failure to Preserve Evidence filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/23/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leimkuhler in Support of Motion in Limine Number 3, #2 Exhibit A - RFPDocs to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Response to RFPDocs, #4 Exhibit C - RFPDocs to Plaintiff (Set Two), #5 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Response to RFPDocs (Set Two), #6 Exhibit E - Depo Transcript Excerpts of Plaintiff, #7 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion in Limine Number 3)(Hurley, Gregory)
October 26, 2020 Filing 122 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Unplead Barriers filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leimkuhler iso Motion in Limine Number 1, #2 Exhibit A - Initial Expert Report, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Musachio, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Musachio iso Plaintiff's Opposition, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine Number 1)(Hurley, Gregory)
October 26, 2020 Filing 121 WITHDRAWN, see docket entry no. 153 - NOTICE OF MOTION AND Fifth MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Defendant's Corporate Representative Testimony filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal.(Manning, Joseph) Modified on 5/27/2021 (lom).
October 26, 2020 Filing 120 WITHDRAWN, see docket entry no. 152 - NOTICE OF MOTION AND Fourth MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Defendant's Expert Testimony filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal.(Manning, Joseph) Modified on 5/27/2021 (lom).
October 26, 2020 Filing 119 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Third MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Motivation for visiting Defendant's Website or Mobile Application filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal.(Manning, Joseph)
October 26, 2020 Filing 118 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Second MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Finances and Past Settlements filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal.(Manning, Joseph)
October 26, 2020 Filing 117 NOTICE OF MOTION AND First MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of or Reference to Plaintiff's other Lawsuits filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of JRM)(Manning, Joseph)
October 22, 2020 Filing 116 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: The hearing on the motions listed is continued to 11/2/2020, at 9:00 AM: 1) MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendants #100 , 2) MOTION for Summary Judgment #97 , 3) MOTION to Exclude DEFENSE EXPERT AARON CANNON #99 , 4) MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Complaint #101 . Motions set for hearing on 11/2/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 12, 2020 Filing 115 NOTICE OF LODGING filed In Support of Plaintiff's re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #97 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Depo Transcripts in Support of MSJ)(Manning, Joseph)
October 12, 2020 Filing 114 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude DEFENSE EXPERT AARON CANNON #99 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of JRM In Support of Motion to Exclude Defense Expert Aaron Cannon, #2 Exhibit A to Dec of JRM)(Manning, Joseph)
October 12, 2020 Filing 113 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendants #100 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of JRM In Support of Motion for Sanctions, #2 Exhibit A to Dec of JRM)(Manning, Joseph)
October 12, 2020 Filing 112 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #97 RE: Defendants response to Plaintiff's Separate Stmt filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
October 12, 2020 Filing 111 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #97 RE: Defendants Additional Material Facts filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
October 12, 2020 Filing 110 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #97 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of JRM In Support of MSJ, #2 Exhibit A to Dec of JRM, #3 Exhibit B to Dec of JRM, #4 Exhibit C to Dec of JRM, #5 Exhibit D to Dec of JRM)(Manning, Joseph)
October 9, 2020 Filing 109 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Complaint #101 filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Expert Musachio, #2 Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Mannining, #3 Evidentiary Objection to Declaration of Plaintiff Robles)(Hurley, Gregory)
October 5, 2020 Filing 108 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #97 filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leimkuhler in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit A - Deposition Excerpts of Plaintiff Robles, #3 Exhibit B - Excerpt of Expert Musachio's Deposition, #4 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Initial Expert Report, #5 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Response to RFPs, #6 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Response to RFPs, #7 Exhibit F - Excerpts of Expert Musachio's Deposition Ruby's Red Ribbon, #8 Declaration (Supplemental) of Expert Cannon, #9 Exhibit A - Receipts from Expert Cannon Pizza Orders, #10 Request for Judicial Notice, #11 Exhibit A - Boyd Letter, #12 Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Manning, #13 Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Musachio, #14 Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Plaintiff Robles, #15 Response to Plaintiff's Separate Statement in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)(Hurley, Gregory)
October 5, 2020 Filing 107 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude DEFENSE EXPERT AARON CANNON #99 filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leimkuhler in Support of Opposition to Exclude Defense Expert Aaron Canon, #2 Exhibit A - Email Re Meet and Confer, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Musachio Depo, #4 Exhibit C - Supplemental Expert Report)(Hurley, Gregory)
October 5, 2020 Filing 106 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendants #100 filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leimkuhler in Support of Opposition to Motion for Sanctions, #2 Exhibit A - Response to Depo Notice, #3 Exhibit B - Objection to Depo Notice, #4 Exhibit C - Ltr to Manning from Hurley, #5 Exhibit D - Email from Manning, #6 Exhibit E - Email from SMRH, #7 Exhibit F - PMK Depo Correspondence, #8 Exhibit G - Plaintiff's Depo)(Hurley, Gregory)
October 5, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles of CD. (Manning, Joseph)
October 5, 2020 Filing 104 Opposition In Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Complaint #101 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiffs Genuine Disputes in Support of Opposition to Def's MSJ, #2 Declaration of Musachio, #3 Declaration of Robles, #4 Exhibit 1 to Dec of Robles, #5 Declaration of JRM, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F)(Manning, Joseph)
September 30, 2020 Filing 103 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stacy Marie Dominguez counsel for Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. Adding Stacy Dominguez as counsel of record for Domino's Pizza LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Domino's Pizza LLC. (Attorney Stacy Marie Dominguez added to party Dominos Pizza LLC(pty:dft))(Dominguez, Stacy)
September 30, 2020 Filing 102 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude DEFENSE EXPERT AARON CANNON #99 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendants #100 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
September 28, 2020 Filing 101 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Complaint filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/26/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration of Deveraux in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Declaration of Roeser in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit A - Screenreader Message, #5 Declaration of Cannon in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #6 Exhibit A - Cannon Resume CV, #7 Exhibit B - Expert Report, #8 Exhibit C - Supplemental Expert Report, #9 Exhibit C - Video of Plaintiff's Expert to be Lodged, #10 Declaration of Leimkuhler in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #11 Exhibit A - Plaintiff Robles Depo Transcript Excerpts, #12 Seperate Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #13 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment) (Hurley, Gregory)
September 28, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendants filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. Motion set for hearing on 10/26/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Manning, #2 Exhibit A to Dec of Michael Manning, #3 Exhibit B to Dec of Michael Manning, #4 Exhibit C to Dec of Michael Manning) (Manning, Joseph)
September 28, 2020 Filing 99 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude DEFENSE EXPERT AARON CANNON filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. Motion set for hearing on 10/26/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Manning, #2 Exhibit A to Dec of Michael Manning, #3 Exhibit B to Dec of Michael Manning, #4 Exhibit C to Dec of Michael Manning) (Manning, Joseph)
September 28, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #97 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Depo Transcripts in Support of MSJ)(Manning, Joseph)
September 28, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. Motion set for hearing on 10/26/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Separate Stmt, #3 Declaration of JRM, #4 Exhibit A to Dec of JRM, #5 Exhibit B to Dec of JRM, #6 Exhibit C to Dec of JRM, #7 Declaration of Musachio, #8 Declaration of Robles, #9 Proposed Order) (Manning, Joseph)
September 25, 2020 Filing 96 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: re #90 Motion to Compel. On 9/3/20, the District Judge referred the Magistrate Judge "Defendant Domino Pizza LLC's Motion to Compel, etc.", filed 8/31/20. The Motion is now fully briefed and under submission. (See document for further details.) (sp)
September 22, 2020 Filing 95 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Compel Discover Responses #90 filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leimkuhler in Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit A - Excerpt of Depo Transcript of Robles)(Hurley, Gregory)
September 15, 2020 Filing 94 Opposition In Opposition re: MOTION to Compel Discover Responses #90 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Manning, #2 Exhibit A to Dec of Michael Manning, #3 Exhibit B to Dec of Michael Manning, #4 Exhibit C to Dec of Michael Manning, #5 Exhibit D to Dec of Michael Manning, #6 Declaration of Guillermo Robles)(Manning, Joseph)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: By 9/15/20, Plaintiff shall file opposition to "Defendant Domino's Pizza LLC's Motion to Compel, etc.", filed 8/31/20. By 9/22/20, Defendant may file a Reply to the Opposition. At that time, the Court will take the Motion under submission without oral argument, unless the Court otherwise orders. (ib)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses #90 filed on August 31, 2020, is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for report and recommendation. The hearing on this motion set before Judge Bernal on September 28, 2020, is hereby vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 1, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read as 2:16-cv-06599-JGB(Ex). (ap)
August 31, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Discover Responses filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/28/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel, #2 Declaration of Leimkuhler in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit A - RFPs to Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Responses to RFPs, #5 Exhibit C - ROGs to Plaintiff, #6 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Responses to ROGs, #7 Exhibit E - RFPs to Plaintiff - 2nd Set, #8 Exhibit F - Plaintiff Responses to RFPs - 2nd Set, #9 Exhibit G - Meet and Confer Emails, #10 Exhibit H - Email Re Depo, #11 Exhibit I - Meet and Confer, #12 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Compel)(Hurley, Gregory)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. On the Court's own motion the trial schedule is modified as follows: Trial is continued to 12/8/2020 at 9:00 a.m.; Final Pretrial Conference is continued to 11/23/2020 at 11:00 a.m.; Discovery Cut-Off: 9/21/2020; Dispositive Motion Cut-Off: 10/26/2020. The stipulation (Dkt. #87 ) and ex parte (Dkt. #88 ) are denied as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 15, 2020 Filing 88 EX PARTE APPLICATION to MODIFY Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 85 , Status Conference - optional html form,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, #56 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of ex Parte, #2 Declaration of Michael Manning in Support of Ex parte, #3 Exhibit 1- to dec of Michael Manning, #4 Exhibit 2- to dec of Michael Manning, #5 Exhibit 3- to dec of Michael Manning, #6 Exhibit 4- to dec of Michael Manning, #7 Exhibit 5- to dec of Michael Manning, #8 Exhibit 6- to dec of Michael Manning, #9 Exhibit 7- to dec of Michael Manning, #10 Exhibit 8- to dec of Michael Manning, #11 Exhibit 9- to dec of Michael Manning, #12 Exhibit 10- to dec of Michael Manning, #13 Exhibit 11- to dec of Michael Manning, #14 Proposed Order) (Manning, Joseph)
June 9, 2020 Filing 87 Joint STIPULATION to MODIFY Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 85 , Status Conference - optional html form,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, #56 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles.(Manning, Joseph)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Accordingly, the Pretrial Conference scheduled for July 20, 2020, will remain on the calendar on July 20, 2020, with a time change to 11:00 a.m. The trial date and time remain unchanged. Counsel shall take notice that Judge Bernal is located in the Riverside Courthouse at 3470 Twelfth Street, Riverside, CA 92501, Courtroom 1. The parties shall familiarize themselves with Judge Bernal's Procedures and Schedules located on the Court's website. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-054) approved by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. IT IS ORDERED, with the concurrence of the Case Management and Assignment Committee, that the following cases be reassigned from the calendar of Judge S. James Otero to the Calendar of Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all futher proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-06599 JGB(FFMx). (rn)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero: The Court Orders the following: (1) VACATE AND SET ASIDE the default judgment #81 entered on 12/12/2019, and (2) deem the Answer to Amended Complaint (ECF No. 82) filed on the date of the entry of this order. (3) The Court continues the Pretrial Conference from 03/16/2020 to 07/20/2020 9:00 a.m. and thetrial from 03/24/2020 to 07/28/2020 9:00 a.m. (lc)
December 13, 2019 Filing 82 (DEEMED FILED AS OF DATE OF ENTRY OF 2/18/20 MINUTES DOCKET NO. 83) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #66 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SDCCU Opinion, #2 Exhibit B - DOJ Letter, #3 Exhibit C - DOJ July 19th Letter, #4 Exhibit D - DOJ September 4 Letter)(Hurley, Gregory) Modified on 2/18/2020 (lc).
December 12, 2019 Filing 81 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Dominos Pizza LLC, on the First Amended Complaint (lc)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero: The Court the Notice of Deficiency issued at ECF No. 79. The Court finds that the First AmendedComplaint was properly served on Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC pursuant to L.R. 5-3.2.1 through the Notice of Electronic Filing that issued to defendant's counsel on 6/14/19. The Notice of Electronic filing constitutes service here because an amended complaint is not served pursuant to Federal Rule of CivilProcedure Rule 4. See Emp. Painters' Tr. v. Ethan Enters., 480 F.3d 993, 999 (9th Cir. 2007) (explaining that generally an amended complaint is not served pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 4 because it is a pleading subsequent to the initial complaint that was served pursuant toRule 4). Therefore, the Court instructs the Clerks office to enter default against Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (lc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC #78 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: No proof of service/waiver of service on file. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. No formal proof of service of the First Amended Complaint on file to show how, when nor on whom it was served. Clerk reviewed the First amended complaint, No proof of service attached. Clerk reviewed the Request which cites defendant DOMINOS PIZZA LLC, a limited liability corporation was electronically served via ecf on 6/14/2019". The CM/ECF Notice is ONLY a notice of electronic filing. The Court does not provide any service of process of initiating documents without a court order. No such order was found on case docket.. (lc)
December 6, 2019 Filing 78 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of JRM) (Manning, Joseph)
November 22, 2019 Filing 77 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Michael G Balmages: Mediation held on 11/12/19. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link: #MediationParticipantSurvey(Balmages, Michael)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jessica P. Weber to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Guillermo Robles and designating Joseph R. Manning Jr. as local counsel #75 by Judge S. James Otero. (lc)
November 18, 2019 Filing 75 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jessica P. Weber to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Guillermo Robles (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24801383) filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Manning, Joseph)
November 13, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #73 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
November 12, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eve L Hill on behalf of Plaintiff Guillermo Robles (Attorney Eve L Hill added to party Guillermo Robles(pty:pla))(Hill, Eve)
October 24, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Michael G Balmages has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
October 23, 2019 Filing 71 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Michael Balmages may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 11/21/2019 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC(Hurley, Gregory)
July 30, 2019 Filing 70 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING DEFENDANT'S WRIT OF CERTIORARI #64 . (lc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 69 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge S. James Otero. On the Court's motion, the Court takes off calendar and under submission the Motion to Stay Case Pending Defendant's Forthcoming Petition for a Writ of Certiorari #64 , previously scheduled for 7/15/2019. No appearance is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo)
July 1, 2019 Filing 68 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Defendant's Forthcoming Petition for a Writ of Certiorari #64 filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bradley Leimkuhler, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Hurley, Gregory)
June 24, 2019 Filing 67 OPPOSITION IN OPPOSITION OF re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Defendant's Forthcoming Petition for a Writ of Certiorari #64 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
June 14, 2019 Filing 66 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles(Manning, Joseph)
June 13, 2019 Filing 65 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #60 . Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint must be filed and served on Defendants 10 days after the date of this order. Defendant's response is due 10 days thereafter. (lc)
June 11, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Defendant's Forthcoming Petition for a Writ of Certiorari filed by defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/15/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Bradley J. Leimkuhler, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B) (Hurley, Gregory)
June 3, 2019 Filing 63 REPLY In Support of Motion for Leave to Amend NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Plaintiff's Complaint #60 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
May 31, 2019 Filing 62 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge S. James Otero. The Court finds the following motion is suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing on the MOTION to AMEND Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (ECF No. 60)., set for hearing on June 17, 2019. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). No appearance is required. The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 24, 2019 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Plaintiff's Complaint #60 filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leimkuhler in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Leimkuhler)(Hurley, Gregory)
May 15, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. Motion set for hearing on 6/17/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Joseph R Manning, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Declaration of Tristan Jankowski, #6 Declaration of Osman Taher, #7 Proposed Order) (Manning, Joseph)
May 13, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) #57 and Notice of Clerical Error (G-11) #58 . Both the Order and the Clerical error were issued and docketed on this case in error. The ADR order was to be docketed and now has been docketed under the correct and applicable case only, 2:18cv7588 SJO Complex Media vs X17. (lc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Clerk inadvertently selected ADR 3 event #57 instead of ADR 2, docket entry was corrected to ADR procedure selection No. 2, a copy of this form is also attached for reference. (lc)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge S. James Otero. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation (lc) Modified on 5/13/2019 (lc).
April 15, 2019 Filing 56 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge S. James Otero: The Court sets the following schedule:Jury Trial: Tuesday, March 24, 2020 9:00 a.m.Pretrial Conference: Monday, March 16, 2020. 9:00 a.m. Motion Cutoff: Tuesday, January 21, 2010 10:00 a.m.Discovery Cutoff: Monday, December 23, 2019.Last Date to Amend: Wednesday, May 15, 2019.Settlement is referred to the Alternative Dispute Resolution Program for all further proceedings.All discovery dispute to be brought before the Magistrate Judge assigned to the case; parties reminded of requirements of FRCP 26-1(a); counsel are advised all pretrial documents (as listed) must be filed in compliance with Courts Initial Standing order. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (lc) Modified on 5/13/2019 (lc).
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge S. James Otero. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. (lc)
April 12, 2019 Filing 54 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge S. James Otero. The parties are advised that the Status Conference set for hearing on April 15, 2019 @ 8:30 a.m. will be held in courtroom 6C, sixth floor, not 10C. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 1, 2019 Filing 53 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
February 21, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Change of address by Joseph Richard Manning, Jr attorney for Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. Changing attorneys address to 20062 SW Birch Street, Suite 200, Newport Beach, CA 92660. Filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero: On 02/06/19 the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals issued a Mandate Reversing and Remanding this action to the district court #50 . Accordingly, the Court sets a Status Conference on Monday, April 15, 2019 8:30 a.m. The parties shall file a joint status report by April 1, 2019. (Made JS-5, Case reopened) (lc)
February 6, 2019 Filing 50 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #43 CCA # 17-55504. The judgment of this Court, entered January 15, 2019, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Opinion #49 , Thus, we reverse the district court's reliance on the primary jurisdiction doctrine. Rather than promote efficiencythe deciding factor in whether to invoke primary jurisdictionthe district court's ruling unduly delays the resolution of an issue that a court can decide. REVERSED AND REMANDED. [See document for all details.] (mat)
January 15, 2019 Filing 49 OPINION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #43 filed by Guillermo Robles. CCA # 17-55504.We express no opinion about whether Dominos website or app comply with the ADA. We leave it to the district court, after discovery, to decide in the first instance whether Dominos website and app provide the blind with effectivecommunication and full and equal enjoyment of its products and services as the ADA mandates. REVERSED AND REMANDED. See Footnote: We also reverse the dismissal of Robles UCRA claims and remand for proceedings consistent with this opinion.(lc)
June 7, 2017 Filing 48 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Caitlin J Scott counsel for Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. Changing Firm Name to Strategic Legal Practices, APC. Changing Fax to 310 943 3838. Filed by Plaintiff GUILLERMO ROBLES. (Scott, Caitlin)
May 30, 2017 Filing 47 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gregory F Hurley counsel for Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. Alison Kleaver is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Domino's Pizza LLC. (Hurley, Gregory)
May 26, 2017 Filing 46 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr counsel for Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. Caitlin J. Scott is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
April 13, 2017 Filing 45 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 17-55504 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #43 as to Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (lom)
April 12, 2017 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles, served on 04/12/2017. (Manning, Joseph)
April 12, 2017 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. Appeal of Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #42 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19676248.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Manning, Joseph)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTES (in chambers):ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY #32 by Judge S. James Otero. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Defendant Domino's Pizza, LLC's Alternative Motion to Dismiss or Stay. This matter shall close. IT IS SO ORDERED. MINUTES MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (lom)
March 16, 2017 Filing 41 The Court finds the following motion suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing re the MOTION for Summary Judgment as to the Complaint filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. #32 , set for hearing on March 27, 2017. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). No appearance is required. The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 13, 2017 Filing 40 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to the Complaint #32 filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Objections to Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Objections to Evidence, #3 Supplemental Declaration of Bradley J. Leimkuhler ISO Objections to Evidence, #4 Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Declaration of Leimkuhler, #5 Exhibit 2 to Supplemental Declaration of Leimkuhler)(Hurley, Gregory)
March 6, 2017 Filing 39 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of Opposition to MSJ filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Manning, Joseph)
March 6, 2017 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Guillermo Robles In Support of Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to the Complaint #32 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
March 6, 2017 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Caitlin J. Scott In Support of Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to the Complaint #32 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Manning, Joseph)
March 6, 2017 Filing 36 STATEMENT of Additional Uncontroverted Material Facts in Support of Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to the Complaint #32 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
March 6, 2017 Filing 35 STATEMENT of Genuine Disputes of MAterial Facts in Support of Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to the Complaint #32 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
March 6, 2017 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Rosemary Musachio In Support of Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to the Complaint #32 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Manning, Joseph)
March 6, 2017 Filing 33 Opposition TO MSJ re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to the Complaint #32 filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
February 22, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to the Complaint filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/27/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Separate Statement in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Declaration of Galluch in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit A iso Declaration of Galluch, #5 Exhibit B iso Declaration of Galluch, #6 Declaration of Leimkuhler in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #7 Exhibit A iso Declaration, #8 Exhibit B iso Declaration, #9 Exhibit C iso Declaration, #10 Exhibit D iso Declaration, #11 Exhibit E iso Declaration, #12 Exhibit F iso Declaration, #13 Exhibit G iso Declaration, #14 Exhibit H iso Declaration, #15 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment) (Hurley, Gregory)
February 17, 2017 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr counsel for Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. Filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
January 11, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 11/28/16 8:41 a.m. re Transcript #29 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Zurborg, Carol) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 11, 2017 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/28/16 8:41 a.m. Court Reporter: Carol Jean Zurborg, phone number (213) 894-3539. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/1/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2017. (Zurborg, Carol)
December 15, 2016 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael J Chilleen counsel for Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. Adding Michael J. Chilleen as counsel of record for Defendant Domino's Pizza for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Domino's Pizza LLC. (Attorney Michael J Chilleen added to party Dominos Pizza LLC(pty:dft))(Chilleen, Michael)
December 2, 2016 Filing 25 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC for Court Reporter. Court will contact Carrie Strand at cstrand@sheppardmullin.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Leimkuhler, Bradley)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge S. James Otero. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. See order for details. (jy)
November 28, 2016 Filing 26 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge S. James Otero. Matter called. Court and counsel confer regarding Plaintiff's claim that defendant Dominos has failed to construct a website that's fully accessible to the seeing impaired. Matter is placed on second call. Matter recalled. Plaintiff's counsel explains the process of compliance which meets the standards imposedby ADA. The Court sets the following schedule: Jury Trial: Tuesday, August 29, 2017 @ 9:00 a.m. Pretrial Conference: Monday, August 21, 2017 @ 9:00 a.m. Motion Cutoff: Monday, June 26, 2017 @ 10:00 a.m. Discovery Cutoff: Monday, May 29, 2017. Last Date to Amend: Wednesday, December 28, 2016. See minute order for further details. Court Reporter: Carol Zurborg. (jy)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT DOMINO'S PIZZA LLC'S REQUEST FOR COUNSEL TO APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE THE DATE #21 by Judge S. James Otero: The Court is in receipt of Defendant Domino's Pizza LLC's ("Defendant") Request For Counsel To Appear At Scheduling Conference Or, In The Alternative, To Continue The Date currently set for November 28, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. Having considered the papers submitted by counsel, the Court GRANTS therequest. Attorney Alison Kleaver may appear on behalf of Defendant at thescheduling conference. Gregory F. Hurley and Bradley J. Leimkuhler are excused. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jy)
November 22, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST for Leave of Alison Kleaver to Appear for Scheduling Conference #21 (instead of other attorneys, with a proposed order submitted). The following error(s) was found: request is erroneously set for 11/28/16 hearing date, the same date as the scheduling conference; request format does not require a hearing to be set on calendar. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
November 22, 2016 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gregory F Hurley counsel for Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. Adding Alison Kleaver as counsel of record for Domino's Pizza for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Domino's Pizza. (Hurley, Gregory)
November 22, 2016 Filing 21 REQUEST for Leave of Alison Kleaver to Appear for Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. Request set for hearing on 11/28/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hurley in Support of Request for Counsel to Appear, #2 Proposed Order Granting Request for Counsel to Appear) (Hurley, Gregory)
November 18, 2016 Filing 20 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles.. (Manning, Joseph)
November 1, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge S. James Otero. Effective November 7, 2016, Judge Otero will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 10C on the 10th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 10C of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 30, 2016 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bradley J Leimkuhler counsel for Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. Adding Bradley J. Leimkuhler as counsel of record for Domino's Pizza LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Domino's Pizza LLC. (Attorney Bradley J Leimkuhler added to party Dominos Pizza LLC(pty:dft))(Leimkuhler, Bradley)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge S. James Otero. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for Monday, November 28, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. before District Judge S. James Otero in Courtroom 1, 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. (jy)
September 29, 2016 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC (Hurley, Gregory)
September 29, 2016 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC.(Attorney Gregory F Hurley added to party Dominos Pizza LLC(pty:dft))(Hurley, Gregory)
September 22, 2016 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Guillermo Robles, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Judi Schuett in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
September 9, 2016 Filing 13 CORRECTED NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying Domino's Pizza LLC. (Manning, Joseph)
September 9, 2016 Filing 12 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice (Other) #8 , Notice (Other) #9 by Clerk of Court. The document is accepted as filed. Counsel shall correct deficiency by close of business 9/9/16. Failure to comply shall result in striking of indicated documents. (lc)
September 8, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: plaintiffs Notice (Other) #8 ; Notice (Other) #9 (correcting no. 8. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notice: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
September 2, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INTRESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Guillermo Robles. CORRECTED (Manning, Joseph)
September 2, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INTRESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Guillermo Robles. (Manning, Joseph)
September 2, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et)
September 2, 2016 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC. (et)
September 2, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
September 2, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (et)
September 1, 2016 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff guillermo robles. (Manning, Joseph)
September 1, 2016 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Attorney for Plaintiff guillermo robles. (Manning, Joseph)
September 1, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-18480769 - Fee: $400, filed by Attorney for Plaintiff guillermo robles. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party guillermo robles(pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph)
September 1, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-18480769 - Fee: $400, filed by Attorney for Plaintiff guillermo robles. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party guillermo robles(pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guillermo Robles v. Dominos Pizza LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Robles
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Represented By: Mark A Hiller
Represented By: Caitlin J Scott
Represented By: Jessica P Weber
Represented By: Eve L Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominos Pizza LLC
Represented By: Alison Nicole Kleaver
Represented By: Gregory F Hurley
Represented By: Bradley J Leimkuhler
Represented By: Michael J Chilleen
Represented By: Stacy Marie Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Michael G Balmages
Represented By: Michael G Balmages
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?