Flip Flop Shops Franchise Company, LLC et al v. Amy Neb et al
Plaintiff: |
Cherokee Inc., FFS Holdings, LLC and Flip Flop Shops Franchise Company, LLC |
Defendant: |
Kings X, LLC, Amy Neb, Chad Neb, Polu Lani LLC and Swagger LLC |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv07259 |
Filed: |
September 27, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Charles F. Eick |
Presiding Judge: |
John F. Walter |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 1, 2017 |
Filing
114
AMENDED JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter, in favor of Cherokee Inc., FFS Holdings, LLC, Flip Flop Shops Franchise Company, LLC against Kings X, LLC, Polu Lani LLC, Swagger LLC, Amy Neb, Chad Neb. Plaintiffs are entitled to an award of damages in th e amount $44,254.53, plus 18% interest beginning on December 12, 2016, the date on which the Court issued its Preliminary Injunction [ECF 65], such interest totaling $3,077.21 as of May 1, 2017, and accruing at a daily rate of $ ;21.82 thereafter; 98 Defendants will pay the amount of $200,000.00 (Two Hundred Thousand) to Plaintiffs in full satisfaction of Plaintiffs Request for Attorneys Fees. Final judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiffs;Plaintiffs are the pr evailing parties in this action and their costs shall be taxed against Defendants. Any motions or applications for costs or attorneys fees shall be served and filed within fourteen (14) days after the entry of this Final Judgment; and, thereafter. (pj)
|
May 2, 2017 |
Filing
98
JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT: (1) Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 85 is GRANTED; (2) Plaintiffs are entitled to an award of damages in the amount of $44,254.53, plus 18% interest beginning on December 12, 2016, the date on which the Court issued its Preliminary Injunction [ECF 65], such interest totaling $3,077.21 as of 5/1/2017, and accruing at a daily rate of $21.82 thereafter; (3) Plaintiffs are also entitled to their reasonable attorneys fees and costs incurred in enforcing the Non-Compete Provision and seeking injunctive relief, in an amount to be submitted by Plaintiffs in a Motion for Attorney' Fees and Costs; further GRANTS Plaintiffs permanent injunctive relief: Defendants and their officers, agents, servants, employees, andattorneys are hereby permanently restrained and enjoined. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp)
|
December 12, 2016 |
Filing
65
PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge John F. Walter that: Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED and the Court ordersas follows: Defendants and their officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys acting on their behalf are hereby preliminarily restrained and enjoined. (SEE ATTACHMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). A bond is not required to be posted by Plaintiffs per the Parties Franchise Agreements. (jp)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?