Yijin Lu et al v. Daniel Hong Deng et al
Plaintiff: |
Qian Han, Yijin Lu, Yuhan Yang and Yunyao Zhai |
Defendant: |
Robert Darren Cornforth, Daniel Hong Deng, Does, Floyd Rayford Fountain and Evan Philip Freed |
Cross Defendant: |
Daniel Hong Deng |
Cross Claimant: |
Evan Philip Freed |
Unknown: |
Evan P Freed |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv07283 |
Filed: |
September 28, 2016 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Rozella A. Oliver |
Presiding Judge: |
Christina A. Snyder |
Nature of Suit: |
Racketeer/Corrupt Organization |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 5, 2017 |
Filing
65
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder RE: Daniel Deng's and Floyd Fountain's Motion to Dismiss 56 ; Evan Freed's Motion to Dismiss 59 . Freed's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Deng and Fountain's mot ion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is DENIED with respect to Lu's claim for fraud, Han's claim for fraud, Lu and Han's claim for violation of the UCL, Han and Yang's claim for declaratory relief again st Deng, Yang's claim for breach of fiduciary duty, Yang's claim for professional negligence, Zhai's claim for breach of fiduciary duty, and Zhai's claim for professional negligence. In all other respects, Deng and Fountain's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The Court has previously dismissed the declaratory relief claim against Freed. Plaintiffs' failure to correct the deficiencies previously identified in the declaratory relief claim against Freed warrants dismissal of plaintiffs' claim against Freed with prejudice. Plaintiffs' remaining claims are dismissed without prejudice. The Court grants plaintiffs 14 days leave in which to file any amended complaint curing the deficiencies identified herein. Pla intiffs will not be permitted to add any additional claims other than those already alleged in the SAC. Furthermore, if plaintiffs choose to amend their RICO allegations, plaintiffs shall file an amended RICO Case Statement. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
|
April 10, 2017 |
Filing
53
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Evan Freed's Motion to Dismiss 50 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' claim pursuant to Section 6148 is DISMISSED without prejudice as applied to Freed. Plaintiff is granted 14 days leave, from the date of this order, in which to file any amended allegations against Freed. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
|
January 23, 2017 |
Filing
40
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Evan Freed's motion to dismiss the complaint 34 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' claims against Freed are DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiffs are granted 30 days leave in which to file any amended complaint. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (gk)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing
28
MINUTES OF ROBERT CORNFORTH'S MOTION TO DISMISS 7 granting 7 n Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder. In accordance with the foregoing, Cornforth's motion to dismiss plaintiffs' claims against him is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' claims against Cornforth are DISMISSED without prejudice. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (lom)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?