Lisa Mollicone v. Universal Handicraft, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Lisa Mollicone |
Defendant: |
Shay S Sagev and Universal Handicraft, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv07322 |
Filed: |
September 29, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Christina A. Snyder |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael R. Wilner |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Fraud |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 17, 2017 |
Filing
57
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court GRANTS Defendant Universal Handicraft, Inc., doing business as Deep Sea Cosmetics and Adore Organic Innovations's motion to transfer this action to the Southern District of Florida 50 . Case electronically transferred. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing
40
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder RE: Defendant Universal Handicraft, Inc.'s ("UHI") Motion to Dismiss 28 ; Specially Appearing Defendant Shay Sabag Segev's Motion Dismiss 29 . The Court: GRANTS Seg ev's motion to dismiss the FAC and DISMISSES plaintiffs claims against Segev without prejudice; DENIES UHI's motion to dismiss plaintiffs claims for injunctive relief; DENIES UHI's motion to dismiss plaintiffs claims pertaining to any product other than the CELLMAX kit; GRANTS UHI's motion and DISMISSES without prejudice plaintiffs claims that are based on laws other than those of California and New Jersey; DENIES UHI's motion to dismiss plaintiffs fraud-based claims; To the extent UHi requests that the Court dismiss plaintiffs CLRA, UCL, FAL, and CF A claims on the grounds that plaintiff only alleges lack of substantiation, the Court DENIES UHI's motion; GRANTS UHI's motion to dismiss plaintiffs MMWA clai m and DISMISSES that claim without prejudice; DENIES UHI's motion to dismiss plaintiffs claims that are predicated on allegations that defendants' labels are misleading; GRANTS UHI's motion to dismiss plaintiffs claims that are predica ted on allegations that defendants are marketing unapproved new drugs unlawfully, and DISMISSES any such claims without prejudice; GRANTS UHI's motion to dismiss plaintiffs claim for declaratory relief and DISMISSES that claim without prejudice; and DENIES UHI's motion to dismiss plaintiffs unjust enrichment claim. Plaintiff shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file a second amended complaint addressing the deficiencies identified in this order. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
|
January 25, 2017 |
Filing
39
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - PLAINTIFF LISA MOLLICONE'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE LOCAL RULE 23-3 DEADLINE FOR THE FILING OF A MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Christina A. Snyder: On 1/11/2017, Plaintiff filed an Ex Parte Applicati on to continue the deadline to file a motion for class certification 34 . It appears that defendants do not oppose a continuance of the deadline to 3/20/2017. Therefore, the Court continues the deadline for filing a motion for class certification to 3/20/2017, without prejudice to plaintiff's seeking a further continuance upon a showing of good cause. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?