Michael Miller v. Great American Insurance Company, et al

Plaintiff: Michael Miller
Defendant: Does and Great American Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv07689
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Michael W. Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Jean P. Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Insurance

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Stipulation for Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice 28 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald that this action, Case No. 2:16-cv-07689-MWF (JPRx), is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that each party shall bear its own attorneys fees and costs in this matter. (Case Terminated. Made JS-6.) (jp)
April 6, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: In light of the Notice of Settlement filed 4/5/2017, the Court sets a hearing on Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal for 5/8/2017, at 11:30 a.m. If a stipulated dismissal is filed prior to this date, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance is needed. All other dates are hereby vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cw)
January 26, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. re Stipulation for Order 18 , 19 . (See Order for details) (NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT) (bem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Miller v. Great American Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Randy M Marmor
Represented By: Randolph P Sinnott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Miller
Represented By: Daniel Eli
Represented By: R Rex Parris
Represented By: Kitty Szeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?