Larry S. Johnson et al v. David Knoller et al

Plaintiff: Larry S. Johnson and Blake Keller
Defendant: Courtney Kemp Abgoh, Anchor Bay Entertainment LLC, CBS Television, Mark Canton, DOES, Randall Emmett, Curtis Jackson, David Knoller, Starz Entertainment LLC and Nikki Turner
Case Number: 2:2016cv07761
Filed: October 18, 2016
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Rozella A. Oliver
Presiding Judge: Manuel L. Real
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2017 71 Opinion or Order of the Court (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Manuel L. Real. Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than July 20, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In accordan ce with Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, no oral argument on this Order to Show Cause will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order will result in the dismissal of the action. (iv)
April 25, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL by Judge Manuel L. Real. This Courts Order Re: Notice to Counsel ORDERS counsel to meet 30 days after the first answer ing defendant. Plaintiffs counsel is then required to file a Joint Report of Early Meeting within 14 days of the holding of the Early meeting of Counsel. Failure to comply with the Courts Order may lead to the imposition of sanctions which may inc lude the striking of pleadings and entry of judgment or dismissal of the action. The parties in this case have failed to comply with the Courts Order. To date, a Joint Report of Early Meeting has not been filed with the Court. The Court ORDERS the parties to file an Early Meeting Report or show cause in writing on or before May 2, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the Courts Order. No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive filing on or before the date upon which a response by the parties is due. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. IT IS SO ORDERED. (clee)
January 23, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Manuel L. Real. Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than January 30, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In acco rdance with Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, no oral argument on this Order to Show Cause will be heard unless ordered by theCourt. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order will result in the dismissal of the action. (iv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larry S. Johnson et al v. David Knoller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Kemp Abgoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchor Bay Entertainment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Television
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Canton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Emmett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Knoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starz Entertainment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikki Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry S. Johnson
Represented By: Olu K Orange
Represented By: Monique D Pressley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Keller
Represented By: Olu K Orange
Represented By: Monique D Pressley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?