Larry S. Johnson et al v. David Knoller et al
Plaintiff: |
Larry S. Johnson and Blake Keller |
Defendant: |
Courtney Kemp Abgoh, Anchor Bay Entertainment LLC, CBS Television, Mark Canton, DOES, Randall Emmett, Curtis Jackson, David Knoller, Starz Entertainment LLC and Nikki Turner |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv07761 |
Filed: |
October 18, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Rozella A. Oliver |
Presiding Judge: |
Manuel L. Real |
Nature of Suit: |
Copyright |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 13, 2017 |
Filing
71
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Manuel L. Real. Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than July 20, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In accordan ce with Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, no oral argument on this Order to Show Cause will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order will result in the dismissal of the action. (iv)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing
50
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL by Judge Manuel L. Real. This Courts Order Re: Notice to Counsel ORDERS counsel to meet 30 days after the first answer ing defendant. Plaintiffs counsel is then required to file a Joint Report of Early Meeting within 14 days of the holding of the Early meeting of Counsel. Failure to comply with the Courts Order may lead to the imposition of sanctions which may inc lude the striking of pleadings and entry of judgment or dismissal of the action. The parties in this case have failed to comply with the Courts Order. To date, a Joint Report of Early Meeting has not been filed with the Court. The Court ORDERS the parties to file an Early Meeting Report or show cause in writing on or before May 2, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the Courts Order. No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive filing on or before the date upon which a response by the parties is due. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. IT IS SO ORDERED. (clee)
|
January 23, 2017 |
Filing
13
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Manuel L. Real. Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than January 30, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In acco rdance with Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, no oral argument on this Order to Show Cause will be heard unless ordered by theCourt. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order will result in the dismissal of the action. (iv)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?