Southern California Regional Rail Authority v. Hyundai Rotem Company
Plaintiff: Southern California Regional Rail Authority
Defendant: Does and Hyundai Rotem Company
Counter Defendant: Does and Southern California Regional Rail Authority
Counter Claimant: Hyundai Rotem Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv08042
Filed: October 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E. McDermott
Presiding Judge: John A. Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott re Stipulation for Order 70 . (See Order for Further Details) (kl)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott re Stipulation for Protective Order 69 . [See Order for details.] (san)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND 20 ; PLAINTIFF AND COUNTER-DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO D ISMISS COUNT TWO OF HYUNDAI ROTEM COMPANY'S FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS 39 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. For the reasons stated in this Order, the Motion to Remand is DENIED and the Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND 20 ; PLAINTIFF AND COUNTER-DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT TWO OF HYUNDAI ROTEM COMPANY'S FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS 39 and STATUS CONFERENCE RE AGREED UPON PRIVATE NEUTRAL held befo re Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Court takes the Remand Motion and Motion UNDER SUBMISSION and a ruling will be issued. The status conference is held. The Court leaves it to the parties as to when it would be best to participate in the mediation. However, the dates with respect to settlement remain. Dkt. 37 , 38 . In light of the Motion, the April 3, 2017 hearing is taken off calendar. Dkt. 38 . Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (pso)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern California Regional Rail Authority v. Hyundai Rotem Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Southern California Regional Rail Authority
Represented By: Kevin Dorse
Represented By: Edward Eric Johnson
Represented By: Jon R Mower
Represented By: Michael E Murphy
Represented By: Allan L Schare
Represented By: Todd C Theodora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Rotem Company
Represented By: Alycia Degen
Represented By: Allen C Kim
Represented By: Peter I Ostroff
Represented By: Eric B Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Hyundai Rotem Company
Represented By: Alycia Degen
Represented By: Allen C Kim
Represented By: Peter I Ostroff
Represented By: Eric B Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern California Regional Rail Authority
Represented By: Kevin Dorse
Represented By: Edward Eric Johnson
Represented By: Jon R Mower
Represented By: Michael E Murphy
Represented By: Allan L Schare
Represented By: Todd C Theodora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?