United States of America v. United Health Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America and Benjamin Poehling
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Health Net Inc, United HealthCare Services, Inc., Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., Catamaran Insurance of Ohio, Inc., Optum, Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., United Defendants, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Bravo Health, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UHIC Holdings, Inc., Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., UHC of California, UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., Managed Health, Inc., Tufts Associated Health Plans, Inc., Pacificare of Arizona Inc, UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., Ovations, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Inc, UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., Aetna Inc, Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, OptumInsight, Inc., Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Preferred Care Partners, Inc., MedAssurant, Inc., United Health Care Ins. Co. and United New York, UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc, Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Medica Holding Company, Emblemhealth, Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., United Health Group Inc, UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., Wellmed Medical Management, Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Arcadian Management Services, Inc., Pacificare, WellCare Health Plans, Inc., Ingenix, Inc. and Managed Health, Inc. doing business as Healthfirst New York, Humana, Inc.
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Alan Friedman
Special Master: Judge Suzanne H. Segal
Case Number: 2:2016cv08697
Filed: November 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER RE SUPPLEMENT AL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS INTERROGATORY NO. 1 filed by Special Master Suzanne H. Segal. See order for dates / deadlines. (lom)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Jury Trial reset for 3/29/2022 at 8:45 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for dates and deadlines adopted.* (vdr)
June 4, 2020 Filing 398 RECOMMENDATION REGARDING THE PARTIES' JOINT REQUEST FOR A CONTINUANCE OF DISCOVERY CUT-OFF, PRETRIAL, AND TRIAL DATES by Special Master Suzanne H. Segal. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER RE TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE by Special Master Suzanne H. Segal. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
May 8, 2020 Filing 396 SPECIAL MASTER AFFIDAVIT filed by Special Master Suzanne H. Segal. (iv)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Hon. Suzanne H. Segal (Ret.) is tentatively appointed as Special Master. *See Order for details.* (iv)
April 30, 2020 Filing 394 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Appoint Special Master #390 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Lee, John)
April 22, 2020 Filing 393 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Henry C Su counsel for Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. Rosie Dawn Griffin is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff-Relator Benjamin Poehling. (Su, Henry)
April 22, 2020 Filing 392 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Henry C Su counsel for Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. Timothy P. McCormack is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff-Relator Benjamin Poehling. (Su, Henry)
April 22, 2020 Filing 391 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #389 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Appoint Special Master #390 e-mailed to Timothy P McCormack at tmccormack@constantinecannon.com bounced due to No such email box. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 20, 2020 Filing 390 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Appoint Special Master filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc. Motion set for hearing on 5/21/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schindler, David)
April 17, 2020 Filing 389 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jack David Ross counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Paul G. Freeborne is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Ross, Jack)
April 10, 2020 Filing 388 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kathryn H Ruemmler counsel for Counter Claimants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc, Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United Health Care Ins. Co. and United New York, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Co., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc. Kathryn H. Ruemmler is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants and counter claimants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Ca re Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc.. (Ruemmler, Kathryn)
March 5, 2020 Filing 387 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen S Hasegawa counsel for Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. Taeva C. Shefler is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff's Counsel Stephen S. Hasegawa. (Hasegawa, Stephen)
October 28, 2019 Filing 386 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jack David Ross counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Adding Martha Glover as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Ross, Jack)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES' JOINT REQUEST FOR A CONTINUANCE OF DISCOVERY CUT- OFF, PRETRIAL, AND TRIAL DATES #382 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The final pretrial conference and hearing on motions in limine is scheduled for September 10, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. The trial is scheduled to begin on Tuesday, September 28, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. *See Order for dates and deadlines.* (iv)
October 22, 2019 Filing 384 Notice of Electronic Filing re Order,,, #383 , Stipulation to Continue, #382 e-mailed to Benjamin Snyder bounced due to No longer with firm. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 21, 2019 Filing 383 RECOMMENDATION REGARDING THE PARTIES' JOINT REQUEST FOR A CONTINUANCE OF DISCOVERY CUT-OFF, PRETRIAL, AND TRIAL DATES #382 by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. This Court held an informal discovery conference with counsel on October 8, 2019 (Dkt. 378). After conferring with counsel for all parties regarding the scope and breadth of remaining discovery, pre-trial matters, and other issues in this case, and upon stipulation of the parties, and good cause appearing, I HEREBY RECOMMEND that the Scheduling and Case Management Order be modified as follows: 1. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than December 4, 2020. 2. All expert discovery shall be completed by April 5, 2021. (see document for further details) (hr)
October 17, 2019 Filing 382 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Discovery Cut-Off, Pretrial, and Trial Dates from December 5, 2019; June 5, 2020; and June 23, 2020 to December 4, 2020; September 10, 2021; and September 28, 2021 Re: Order, Set/Reset Hearing #364 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Recommendation, #2 Proposed Order)(Lee, John)
October 11, 2019 Filing 381 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/08/19 re Transcript #380 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 11, 2019 Filing 380 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/08/19. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2020. (ha)
October 9, 2019 Filing 379 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Shirin Behrooz at shirin.behrooz@lw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Schindler, David)
October 8, 2019 Filing 378 MINUTES OF (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE settling #377 Motion Re: Informal Discovery Dispute held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. On October 8, 2019, the Court held an informal discovery Conference. Court Recorder: XTR 10/08/19. (hr)
October 8, 2019 Filing 377 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE (hr)
October 8, 2019 Filing 376 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jack David Ross counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Adding Linda M. McMahon as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Ross, Jack)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 375 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING MATTER FOR A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Conference on Tuesday, October 8, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. The Court Clerk will send instructions for calling into the Telephonic Conference by e-mail. (hr)
September 27, 2019 Filing 374 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David J Schindler counsel for Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Co., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc. Benjamin W. Snyder is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant David J. Schindler. (Attorney David J Schindler added to party Unitedhealthcare Insurance Co.(pty:dft))(Schindler, David)
June 28, 2019 Filing 373 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John E Lee counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Gretchen L. Wylegala is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Lee, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 372 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John E Lee counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Carol Lynn Wallack is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Lee, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 371 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John E Lee counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Adam R. Tarosky is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Lee, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 370 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John E Lee counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Mark Justin Draycott is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Lee, John)
June 10, 2019 Filing 368 NOTICE re: Status of Parties filed by Attorney United States of America. (Ross, Jack)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER RE: STATUS OF REMAINING PARTIES by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. No later than 6/10/2019, the United States of America shall file a Notice Re: Status of Parties. No later than 6/10/2019, each defendant that has filed a cross complaint or third-party complaint shall file a similar document. (bm) Modified on 6/6/2019 (vdr).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER RE: PENDING MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Motion #334 is denied and Motion #261 is moot. (vdr)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 364 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Jury Trial set for 6/23/2020 at 8:45 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for case deadlines, dates and requirements.* (vdr)
June 5, 2019 Filing 363 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to the calendar of Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:16-cv-08697 FMO(SSx). (rn)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DISQUALIFICATION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court disqualifies itself from this action. The action is returned to the Clerk's Office for random reassignment, pursuant to General Order 19-03. (iv)
April 16, 2019 Filing 360 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John E Lee counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Adding Gregory A. Mason as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Lee, John)
April 16, 2019 Filing 359 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings April 8, 2019 re Transcript #358 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Diaz, Amy) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 16, 2019 Filing 358 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on April 8, 2019. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Amy Diaz, phone number amyfcrr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/7/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/17/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2019. (Diaz, Amy)
April 8, 2019 Filing 357 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Co., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc for Court Reporter. Court will contact Lindsay Cinotto at lindsay.cinotto@lw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Schindler, David)
April 8, 2019 Filing 356 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling for Court Reporter. Court will contact Caroline DaCosta at cdacosta@susmangodfrey.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Subramanian, Arun)
April 8, 2019 Filing 355 MINUTES OF UNITED STATES' MOTION FOR REVIEW OF DISCOVERY ORDER #334 before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case called, and counsel make their appearance. The Court invites counsel to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv)
April 2, 2019 Filing 354 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's motion, the Court advances the time of the MOTION for Review of Discovery Order #334 , previously scheduled for 4/8/2019 at 10:00 AM. The Motion is now set for hearing on 4/8/2019 at 9:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #234 ; MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES #235 ; AND MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS #236 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. The Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses is GRANTED in its entirety. The Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims is GRANTED for lack of jurisdiction and the counterclaims are DISMISSED without prejudice. United's request for severance and transfer is DENIED. (iv)
March 27, 2019 Filing 352 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Incto Supplement(Motion related),, #346 (Schindler, David)
March 25, 2019 Filing 350 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Caroline DaCosta at cdacosta@susmangodfrey.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Subramanian, Arun)
March 22, 2019 Filing 369 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/14/2019, 11:02 a.m. re Transcript #351 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ls) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 22, 2019 Filing 351 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/14/2019, 11:02 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: JAMS CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPTION, phone number (661) 609-4528. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2019. (ls)
March 22, 2019 Filing 349 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Smart (CS) 3/14/19. Court will contact Juan Navarro at juan.navarro@thomsonreuters.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (ha)
March 21, 2019 Filing 348 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Shirin Behrooz at shirin.behrooz@lw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Schindler, David)
March 20, 2019 Filing 346 SUPPLEMENT to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Issuance of of Scheduling Order Pursuant to FRCP 16(b)(3) #261 Supplemental Brief ISO Motion for Issuance of a Scheduling Order Pursuant to FRCP 16(b)(3) filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amended Proposed Order Granting Motion for Scheduling Order Modifying Extent of Discovery, #2 Declaration of Carol Wallack ISO Motion for Issuance of a Scheduling Order, #3 Exhibit A-E to Declaration of Carol Wallack ISO Motion for Issuance of a Scheduling Order)(Ross, Jack)
March 18, 2019 Filing 345 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of Memorandum Decision re Order on Motion to Compel,, #324 #334 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Lee, John)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 344 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)ORDER RE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE: MOTION FOR SCHEDULING ORDER MODIFYING EXTENT OF DISCOVERY #336 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The hearing was therefore VACATED and removed form the Court's calendar. The Motion is GRANTED. Government shall file its proposed Supplemental Brief by no later than March 20, 2019. United may file reply no later than 7 days later after its Supplemental Brief. (pj)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 343 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER TAKING HEARING ON MOTION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF SCHEDULING ORDER MODIFYING EXTENT OF DISCOVERY #336 OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission on the papers without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set on this motion for March 18, 2019, is vacated and taken off calendar. (iv)
March 14, 2019 Filing 347 MINUTES OF INFORMAL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY settling #342 Motion re: Informal Discovery Dispute held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. On March 14, 2019, the Court held an informal discovery conference. Dan Segal, a representative from RTI, a third party, also participated in the call. Court Recorder: XTR 3/14/19. (hr)
March 13, 2019 Filing 342 Motion Re: Informal Discovery Dispute. Telephonic conference set for 3/14/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (jlo)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER ENLARGING BY ONE WEEK UNITED STATES' TIME TO FILE A REPLY MEMORANDUM ON MOTION FOR REVIEW OF DISCOVERY ORDER #340 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The United State shall file its reply memorandum regarding the Motion for Review on or before March 18, 2019. (iv)
March 11, 2019 Filing 340 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of Memorandum Decision re Order on Motion to Compel,, #324 #334 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jack Ross, #2 Proposed Order)(Lee, John)
March 4, 2019 Filing 339 REPLY in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Supplemental Briefing re Motion for Issuance of Scheduling Order Modifying Extent of Discovery #336 filed by Plaintiffs Benjamin Poehling, United States of America. (Lee, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 338 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of Memorandum Decision re Order on Motion to Compel,, #324 #334 filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Schindler in Support of United's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Review of Discovery Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Schindler, David)
February 25, 2019 Filing 337 OPPOSITION to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Supplemental Briefing re Motion for Issuance of Scheduling Order Modifying Extent of Discovery #336 filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc. (Schindler, David)
February 15, 2019 Filing 336 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Supplemental Briefing re Motion for Issuance of Scheduling Order Modifying Extent of Discovery filed by plaintiffs Benjamin Poehling, United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 3/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order) (Lee, John)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER LIFTING STAY AND RESETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE ON UNITED STATES' MOTION FOR REVIEW OF DISCOVERY ORDER #333 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The stay entered in this case (Dkt. 329) is lifted. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
February 4, 2019 Filing 334 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of Memorandum Decision re Order on Motion to Compel,, #324 filed by plaintiff United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 4/8/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Lee, John)
February 4, 2019 Filing 333 STIPULATION to Reset filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ross, Jack)
February 4, 2019 Filing 332 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John E Lee counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Adding Robert McAuliffe as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Lee, John)
January 24, 2019 Filing 331 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling for Court Reporter. Court will contact Caroline DaCosta at cdacosta@susmangodfrey.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Subramanian, Arun)
January 7, 2019 Filing 330 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc for Court Reporter. Court will contact Lindsay Cinotto at Lindsay.Cinotto@lw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Schindler, David)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER RE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A STAY OF THE ENTIRE CASE DUE TO THE LAPSE OF APPROPRIATIONS #328 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court, having considered the Ex Parte Application ORDERS, the entire case is stayed until Department attorneys are permitted to resume their usual civil litigation functions. (iv)
December 26, 2018 Filing 328 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Congressional Appropriations for Department of Justice filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ross, Jack)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE ON UNITED STATES' MOTION FOR REVIEW OF DISCOVERY ORDER #326 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The United States shall file its Motion for Review of the Memorandum Decision and Order Granting UnitedHealth Group, Inc.'s Motion to Compel the United States to Produce Documents on or before January 7, 2019. Opposition on or before January 28, 2019. Reply on or before February 11, 2019. Hearing on the Motion shall be February 25, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (iv)
December 21, 2018 Filing 326 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Review of Discovery Order filed by Attorney United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Ross, Jack)
December 17, 2018 Filing 325 NOTICE of Decision: Recent Development filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schindler, David)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE UNITED STATES TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS [Dkt. No. #310 ] by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: United's Motion to Compel the United States to Produce Documents is GRANTED. The Government shall produce the documents withheld solely on the ground of the deliberative process privilege within twenty-one days of the date of this Order. If additional time is necessary for the production of documents, counsel may submit a joint stipulation with a proposed order setting a schedule for production. (See document for further details). (mr)
December 12, 2018 Filing 323 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/11/2018, 10:05 a.m. re Transcript #322 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ls) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 12, 2018 Filing 322 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/11/2018, 10:05 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/2/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/14/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/12/2019. (ls)
December 4, 2018 Filing 321 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit E re Supplement(Motion related) #317 , Order on Motion for Leave, #319 filed by Plaintiff United States of America.(Lee, John)
December 3, 2018 Filing 320 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States of America, re Supplement(Motion related) #317 of Exhibit E to United States' Supplemental Memorandum of Law served on December 3, 2018. (Lee, John)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL #316 by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following document shall be filed under seal until further order of the Court: Exhibit E (MARA1309832-MARA1309835). (hr)
November 30, 2018 Filing 318 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel The United States to Produce Documents #310 [Supplemental Memorandum] filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Schindler in Support of United's Supplemental Memorandum Regarding United's Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibits 1-4 to the Declaration of David Schindler)(Schindler, David)
November 30, 2018 Filing 317 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel The United States to Produce Documents #310 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit F)(Lee, John)
November 30, 2018 Filing 316 APPLICATION to Seal Document re United's Motion to Compel Production (Dkt. 310) filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lee, John)
November 30, 2018 Filing 315 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by plaintiff United States of America. Re: United's Motion to Compel the United States to Produce Documents (Dkt. No. 310) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit A, #2 Attachment 1, #3 Attachment 2, #4 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit B)(Lee, John)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF PAGE AND TIME LIMITATIONS REGARDING SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDA TO UNITED'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal, re Stipulation #313 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: The parties may each file Supplemental Memoranda of Law concerning the parties' Joint Stipulation Regarding United's Motion to Compel the United States to Produce Documents not exceeding fifteen (15) pages on or before November 30, 2018. (hr)
November 21, 2018 Filing 313 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Memorandum to United's Motion to Compel filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schindler, David)
November 16, 2018 Filing 312 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc. correcting MOTION to Compel The United States to Produce Documents #310 (Schindler, David)
November 14, 2018 Filing 311 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jack David Ross counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Adding Jack D. Ross as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Jack David Ross added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Ross, Jack)
November 9, 2018 Filing 310 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel The United States to Produce Documents filed by Defendants Aetna Inc, Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arcadian Management Services, Inc., Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Bravo Health, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Catamaran Insurance of Ohio, Inc., Citrus Health Care Inc., Emblemhealth, Inc., Health Net Inc, Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Managed Health, Inc., MedAssurant, Inc., Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Medica Holding Company, Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., Tufts Associated Health Plans, Inc., UHC of California, UHIC Holdings, Inc., Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United Defendants, United Health Care Ins. Co. and United New York, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Co., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc, WellCare Health Plans, Inc., Wellmed Medical Management, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration David J. Schindler, #2 Exhibit 1-5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7-8, #5 Exhibit 9-27, #6 Declaration John E. Lee, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Declaration Cheri Rice, #11 Declaration George G. Mills Jr., #12 Declaration Patrick J. Cogley, #13 Proposed Order)(Schindler, David)
October 29, 2018 Filing 309 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/23/18 re Transcript #308 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 29, 2018 Filing 308 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/23/18. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC, phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2019. (ha)
October 29, 2018 Filing 307 NOTICE OF RECENT PROPOSED MEDICARE PART C REGULATION RELATING TO FEE-FOR-SERVICE ADJUSTER ISSUE re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Issuance of of Scheduling Order Pursuant to FRCP 16(b)(3) #261 , Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Issue of Defendants' Obligation to Delete Diagnosis Codes Known to be Unsupported by Medical Records #234 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Lee, John)
October 24, 2018 Filing 306 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants United Defendants for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Paul Gamez at paul.gamez@lw.cm with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Schindler, David)
October 24, 2018 Filing 305 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Caroline DaCosta at cdacosta@susmangodfrey.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Subramanian, Arun)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING THE UNITED STATES' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY STAY OF MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY PENDING ISSUANCE OF RULINGS #294 by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The Government's Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Stay of United's Motion to Compel pending the District Judge's rulings is DENIED. If the Government wishes to oppose United's proposed motion to compel, it shall return its portion of the Joint Stipulation to United within fourteen days of the date of this Order. (see order for further details) (hr)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING ON THE UNITED STATES' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY STAY OF MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY #294 by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. The Roybal building courtrooms are not well designed for a hearing with some participants appearing in-person and some appearing by telephone. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that all counsel desiring to attend or participate in the hearing shall appear telephonically. The Deputy Clerk will circulate dial-in instructions separately. Consistent with the Court's prior Order, the telephonic hearing will be held on October 23, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. Pacific Daylight Time. (see order for further details) (hr)
October 17, 2018 Filing 302 Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, #299 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, John)
October 17, 2018 Filing 301 REPLY in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending Issuance of Rulings United's Motion to Compel #294 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5)(Lee, John)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Wiliam R. H. Merrill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling, designating Meng Xi as local counsel #295 . (iv)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 299 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER: (1) GRANTING A TEMPORARY STAY OF PROCEEDINGS ON DEFENDANTS' ANTICIPATED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; AND (2) SETTING REPLY BRIEF DEADLINE AND EXPEDITED HEARING DATE ON THE GOVERNMENT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A STAY #294 by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. The Court ORDERS that proceedings related to Defendants' anticipated Motion to Compel are temporarily STAYED pending an expedited hearing on the government's Ex Parte Application. The government may file a Reply in support of its Application by October 17, 2018. The hearing on the Application will be held on Tuesday, October 23, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 590, Roybal Federal Building and Courthouse. If the Parties prefer that the hearing be held telephonically, they shall file a Stipulation and Proposed Order re Telephonic Hearing no later than October 17, 2018. (hr)
October 5, 2018 Filing 298 DECLARATION of Abid R. Qureshi in support of Opposition EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending Issuance of Rulings United's Motion to Compel #294 filed by Defendant United Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B Part 1, #3 Exhibit B Part 2, #4 Exhibit B Part 3, #5 Exhibit B Part 4, #6 Exhibit B Part 5, #7 Exhibit B Part 6, #8 Exhibit B Part 7, #9 Exhibit B Part 8, #10 Exhibit B Part 9, #11 Exhibit B Part 10, #12 Exhibit B Part 11, #13 Exhibit B Part 12, #14 Exhibit B Part 13, #15 Exhibit C, #16 Exhibit D, #17 Exhibit E)(Qureshi, Abid)
October 5, 2018 Filing 297 Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending Issuance of Rulings United's Motion to Compel #294 filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc, Movant Pacificare of Nevada Inc. (Schindler, David)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 296 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE BRIEFING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION (Dkt. No. #294 )by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: On October 3, 2018, Plaintiff filed an Ex Parte Application for an order temporarily staying briefing on the United Defendants' anticipated Motion to Compel the United States to Produce Documents." (Dkt. No. #294 ). Any Opposition to the Ex Parte Application must be filed no later than 4:00 p.m. on October 5, 2018. The matter will then be taken under submission without a hearing. (mr)
October 4, 2018 Filing 295 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William R. H. Merrill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 9/28/2018, Receipt No. 26CI0P9G) filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PO on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case PHV re William R. H. Merrill) (Xi, Meng)
October 3, 2018 Filing 294 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending Issuance of Rulings United's Motion to Compel filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of John E. Lee, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Proposed Order) (Lee, John)
October 2, 2018 Filing 293 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice #290 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 10/12/2018. (iv)
October 1, 2018 Filing 292 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William R. H. Merrill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22500142) #290 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): GSC for Texas is for Vaughn K. Schultz, and not for William R. H. Merrill. (lt)
October 1, 2018 Filing 291 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Oleg Elkhunovich on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling (Attorney Oleg Elkhunovich added to party Benjamin Poehling(pty:pla))(Elkhunovich, Oleg)
September 28, 2018 Filing 290 ***STRICKEN*** APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William R. H. Merrill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22500142) filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Xi, Meng) Modified on 10/2/2018 Per #293 (iv).
September 18, 2018 Filing 289 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter. Court will contact Mackenzi Siebert at msiebert@sidley.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (ls)
September 18, 2018 Filing 287 NOTICE OF AMENDED OPINION BY THE NINTH CIRCUIT re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Issuance of of Scheduling Order Pursuant to FRCP 16(b)(3) #261 , Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Issue of Defendants' Obligation to Delete Diagnosis Codes Known to be Unsupported by Medical Records #234 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lee, John)
September 18, 2018 Filing 286 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc for Court Reporter. Court will contact Lindsay Cinotto at lindsay.cinotto@lw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Schindler, David)
September 18, 2018 Filing 285 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling for Court Reporter. Court will contact Caroline DaCosta at cdacosta@susmangodfrey.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Subramanian, Arun)
September 17, 2018 Filing 288 AMENDED MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO ISSUE OF DEFENDANTS' OBLIGATION TO DELETE DIAGNOSIS CODES KNOWN TO BE UNSUPPORTED BY MEDICAL RECORDS #234 ; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES #235 ; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIM #236 ; JOINT MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF SCHEDULING ORDER #261 held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case called, and counsel make their appearance. The Court hears oral argument from counsel and takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. (iv)
September 17, 2018 Filing 284 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO ISSUE OF DEFENDANTS' OBLIGATION TO DELETE DIAGNOSIS CODES KNOWN TO BE UNSUPPORTED BY MEDICAL RECORDS #234 ; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES #235 ; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIM #236 ; JOINT MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF SCHEDULING ORDER #261 held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case called, and counsel make their appearance. The Court hears oral argument from counsel and takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin W. Snyder to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff's, designating David J. Schindler as local counsel #282 . (iv)
September 17, 2018 Filing 282 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin W. Snyder to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc, Movant Pacificare of Nevada Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22428920) filed by Defendant Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachement 1, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Schindler, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 281 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The TIME for the hearing on Motions #234 #235 #236 and #261 is hereby ADVANCED to 9:00 AM on 9/17/2018 before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 7, 2018 Filing 280 STATEMENT Recent Decision filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc, Movant Pacificare of Nevada Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schindler, David)
September 7, 2018 Filing 279 NOTICE OF DECISION IN APA CASE re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Issue of Defendants' Obligation to Delete Diagnosis Codes Known to be Unsupported by Medical Records #234 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opinion, #2 Exhibit B - Order)(Lee, John)
September 4, 2018 Filing 278 REPLY in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Issuance of of Scheduling Order Pursuant to FRCP 16(b)(3) #261 filed by Plaintiffs Benjamin Poehling, United States of America. (Lee, John)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER ENLARGING TO SEPTEMBER 4, 2018 THE DATE TO FILE A REPLY MEMORANDUM ON MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF A SCHEDULING ORDER #276 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The United States and Relator Poehling shall file their reply memorandum by September 4, 2018. Motion shall be heard on September 17, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (iv)
August 30, 2018 Filing 276 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Issuance of of Scheduling Order Pursuant to FRCP 16(b)(3) #261 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John E. Lee, #2 Proposed Order)(Lee, John)
August 27, 2018 Filing 275 DECLARATION of Abid R. Qureshi In Opposition to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Issuance of of Scheduling Order Pursuant to FRCP 16(b)(3) #261 filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc, Movant Pacificare of Nevada Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Qureshi, Abid)
August 27, 2018 Filing 274 Opposition re: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Issuance of of Scheduling Order Pursuant to FRCP 16(b)(3) #261 filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc, Movant Pacificare of Nevada Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rebecca Martin in Support of United's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Joint Motion Pursuant to Rule 16(b)(3) for Issuance of Scheduling Order Modifying Extent of Discovery, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Rebecca Martin, #3 Declaration of Marybeth Meyer in Support of United's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Joint Motion Pursuant to Rule 16(b)(3) for Issuance of Scheduling Order Modifying Extent of Discovery)(Schindler, David)
August 27, 2018 Filing 273 NOTICE of Erratum re Plaintiffs' Exhibit 38 on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 38)(Lee, John)
August 27, 2018 Filing 272 REPLY in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Issue of Defendants' Obligation to Delete Diagnosis Codes Known to be Unsupported by Medical Records #234 filed by Plaintiffs Benjamin Poehling, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martha Glover, #2 Exhibit 24, #3 Exhibit 25, #4 Exhibit 26, #5 Exhibit 27, #6 Exhibit 28, #7 Exhibit 29, #8 Exhibit 30, #9 Exhibit 31, #10 Exhibit 32, #11 Exhibit 33, #12 Exhibit 34, #13 Exhibit 35, #14 Exhibit 36, #15 Exhibit 37, #16 Exhibit 38, #17 Exhibit 39, #18 Exhibit 40)(Lee, John)
August 27, 2018 Filing 271 REPLY in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses Answer to Complaint (Discovery),,,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,,,, #223 #235 filed by Plaintiffs Benjamin Poehling, United States of America. (Lee, John)
August 27, 2018 Filing 270 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim #236 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Lee, John)
August 20, 2018 Filing 269 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/16/2018 re Transcript #268 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (at) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 20, 2018 Filing 268 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/16/2018. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2018. (at)
August 17, 2018 Filing 267 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact David Truong at david.truong@thomsonreuters.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (at)
August 17, 2018 Filing 266 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Shirin Behrooz at shirin.behrooz@lw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Schindler, David)
August 17, 2018 Filing 263 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Caroline DaCosta at cdacosta@susmangodfrey.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Subramanian, Arun)
August 16, 2018 Filing 265 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: Settling #264 Motion Re: Informal Discovery Dispute. Tape #: XTR 8/16/18. (mr)
August 16, 2018 Filing 264 Motion Re: Informal Discovery Dispute (mr)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING MATTER FOR A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Conference on Thursday, August 16, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. The Court Clerk will send instructions for calling into the Telephonic Conference by e-mail. (mr)
August 6, 2018 Filing 261 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Issuance of of Scheduling Order Pursuant to FRCP 16(b)(3) filed by plaintiff Benjamin Poehling, United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 9/17/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Martha Glover, #3 Exhibit 16, #4 Exhibit 17, #5 Exhibit 18, #6 Exhibit 19, #7 Exhibit 20, #8 Exhibit 21, #9 Exhibit 22, #10 Exhibit 23, #11 Proposed Order) (Attorney John E Lee added to party Benjamin Poehling(pty:pla)) (Lee, John)
July 31, 2018 Filing 260 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John E Lee counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Adding Amy L. Likoff as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Lee, John)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT UNITED FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXHIBITS TO STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES OF MATERIAL FACT IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT UNDER SEAL #255 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. United's Application is GRANTED. United may file under seal Exhibits 49 and 50 to its Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact. (iv)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITATION BY 25 PAGES REGARDING UNITEDHEALTH'S OPPOSITION TO THE UNITED STATES' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #253 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. UnitedHealth's Opposition to the Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment may not exceed 50 pages. Opposition may not exceed 75 pages. Reply may not exceed 50 pages. (iv)
July 24, 2018 Filing 257 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,,,,,, #256 served on July 24, 2018. (Schindler, David)
July 24, 2018 Filing 256 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (Exhibits to Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact) under seal #255 filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc, Movant Pacificare of Nevada Inc. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit 49, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit 50)(Qureshi, Abid)
July 24, 2018 Filing 255 APPLICATION to file document (Exhibits to Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact) under seal filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc, Movant Pacificare of Nevada Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schindler, David)
July 23, 2018 Filing 254 DECLARATION of David J. Schindler in Opposition to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Issue of Defendants' Obligation to Delete Diagnosis Codes Known to be Unsupported by Medical Records #234 filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc, Movant Pacificare of Nevada Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-20, #2 Exhibits 21-40, #3 Exhibits 41-58)(Schindler, David)
July 23, 2018 Filing 253 STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to United's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schindler, David)
July 23, 2018 Filing 252 NOTICE OF LODGING filed (Excerpts of Video Clips of Deposition Testimony) re Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,, #250 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schindler, David)
July 23, 2018 Filing 251 DECLARATION of Abid R. Qureshi in Opposition to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Issue of Defendants' Obligation to Delete Diagnosis Codes Known to be Unsupported by Medical Records #234 filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc, Movant Pacificare of Nevada Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 6)(Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Americhoice of New Jersey Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Arizona Physicians IPA Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Care Improvement Plus of Maryland(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Citrus Health Care Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Health Plan of Nevada Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Pacificare of Arizona Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Pacificare of Colorado Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Pacificare of Nevada Inc(pty:bkmov), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Preferred Care Partners, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UHC of California (pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc(pty:dft))(Qureshi, Abid)
July 23, 2018 Filing 250 OPPOSITION to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Issue of Defendants' Obligation to Delete Diagnosis Codes Known to be Unsupported by Medical Records #234 filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc, Movant Pacificare of Nevada Inc. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact)(Schindler, David)
July 23, 2018 Filing 249 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim #236 filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc, Movant Pacificare of Nevada Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David J. Schindler, #2 Exhibit A)(Schindler, David)
July 23, 2018 Filing 248 OPPOSITION to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses Answer to Complaint (Discovery),,,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,,,, #223 #235 filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc, Movant Pacificare of Nevada Inc. (Schindler, David)
July 16, 2018 Filing 247 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 7/12/2018 re Transcript #246 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ls) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 16, 2018 Filing 246 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/12/2018. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2018. (ls)
July 12, 2018 Filing 245 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: On July 12, 2018, the Court held an informal discovery conference. Court Recorder: XTR 7/12/18. (mr)
July 12, 2018 Filing 244 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Shirin Behrooz at shirin.behrooz@lw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Schindler, David)
July 12, 2018 Filing 243 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Relator Benjamin Poehling for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Caroline DaCosta at cdacosta@susmangodfrey.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Subramanian, Arun)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING MATTER FOR A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Conference on Thursday, June 12, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. The Court Clerk will send instructions for calling into the Telephonic Conference by e-mail. (mr)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON UNITED STATES' AND RELATOR POEHLING'S MOTION TO DISMISS, MOTION TO STRIKE, AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #240 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The July 30, 2018 hearing date on the United States and Relator Poehling's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike is hereby continued and said motions shall be heard together with the United States and Relator Poehling's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on September 17, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (iv)
June 12, 2018 Filing 240 Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re Motion to Dismss, Motion to Strike, and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Lee, John)
June 4, 2018 Filing 239 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #238 , Notice of Appearance #237 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 1, 2018 Filing 238 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John E Lee on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Lee, John)
June 1, 2018 Filing 237 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John E Lee on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Lee, John)
May 22, 2018 Filing 236 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim filed by plaintiff United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 7/30/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Lee, John)
May 22, 2018 Filing 235 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses Answer to Complaint (Discovery),,,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,,,, #223 filed by plaintiff United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 7/30/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Lee, John)
May 22, 2018 Filing 234 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Issue of Defendants' Obligation to Delete Diagnosis Codes Known to be Unsupported by Medical Records filed by plaintiff United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 7/30/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Cheri Rice, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Request for Judicial Notice, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Statement of Undisputed Facts and Conclusions of Law, #20 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lee, John)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING EXPERT DISCOVERY #232 by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: (see order for details) (hr)
May 15, 2018 Filing 232 Joint APPLICATION for Order for Expert Discovery Procedures filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, John)
April 20, 2018 Filing 231 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling for Court Reporter. Court will contact Jaclyn Osterlof at josterlof@susmangodfrey.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Subramanian, Arun)
April 20, 2018 Filing 230 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings April 9, 2018 re Transcript #229 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Diaz, Amy) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 20, 2018 Filing 229 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on April 9, 2018. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Amy Diaz, phone number amyfcrr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2018. (Diaz, Amy)
April 18, 2018 Filing 228 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc for Court Reporter. Court will contact Shirin Behrooz at shirin.behrooz@lw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Schindler, David)
April 9, 2018 Filing 227 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case called and counsel state their appearances. The Scheduling Conference is held. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court orders private mediation, but takes the dates under submission. The Court orders each party to file a report with a proposed discovery cut-off date; the report shall be no longer than two pages. If counsel are prepared to proceed with the date they originally proposed, they shall email the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Ms. Rita Sanchez. The report or email are due no later than April 16, 2018. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON UNITED STATES' RESPONSES TO UNITED DEFENDANTS' ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS #225 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (1) The United States and Relator may, after complying with Local Civil Rule 7-3, file one or more motions pursuant to Rule 12, Fed. R. Civ. P., on or before May 22, 2018. (2) Defendants may file their opposition(s) on or before June 21, 2018. (3) The United States and Relator may file any reply on or before July 16, 2018. (4) The United States' motion(s) in response to the Answer and Counterclaim shall be heard on July 30, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (iv)
April 5, 2018 Filing 225 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Answer to Complaint (Discovery),,,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,,,, #223 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John E Lee, #2 Proposed Order)(Lee, John)
April 2, 2018 Filing 224 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan (AMENDED) ; estimated length of trial 20-32, filed by Plaintiff United States of America.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lee, John)
March 23, 2018 Filing 223 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,, #171 , COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America filed by Defendants UnitedHealth Group Inc, Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Ovations, Inc., Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., Pacificare of Colorado Inc, UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., Pacificare of Arizona Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., Optum, Inc., Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc, UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UHC of California, Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York.(Schindler, David)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Stipulation Regarding Extending Deadline to Answer and Scheduling Conference #221 is APPROVED and SO ORDERED. Defendants' Answer to the First Amended Complaint is due by 3/23/2018; amended Joint Rule 26(f) Report due 4/2/2018, and the Scheduling Conference is continued to 4/9/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (cw)
March 8, 2018 Filing 221 Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding Extending Deadline to Answer and Scheduling Conference filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David J. Schindler, #2 Proposed Order)(Schindler, David)
March 1, 2018 Filing 220 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Relator/Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling for Court Reporter. Court will contact Caroline DaCosta at cdacosta@susmangodfrey.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Subramanian, Arun)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a Scheduling Conference set for 3/26/2018 at 11:00 AM. (iv)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 218 TEXT ENTRY ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: In light of the government's Notice of Decision Regarding Amendment of Complaint (Docket No. #217 ), the Court orders Defendants to file an Answer to the remaining claims in the First Amended Complaint (Docket No. #171 ) on or before 3/13/2018. The Court will issue a separate order setting a Scheduling Conference after conferring with counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 26, 2018 Filing 217 NOTICE of Decision Regarding Amendment of Complaint and Request for a Scheduling Conference filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Lee, John)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF MATERIALS PURSUANT TO TRADE SECRETS ACT by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal, re Stipulation for Order #215 . 1.The United States is authorized to produce, in response to appropriate discovery requests, responsive materials that include information related to particular Medicare Advantage Plans (see Order for details). (hr)
February 22, 2018 Filing 215 STIPULATION for Order Regarding Production of Trade Secrets Act Materials filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, John)
February 12, 2018 Filing 214 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 2/8/2018 re Transcript #213 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (at) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 12, 2018 Filing 213 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/8/2018. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/15/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/14/2018. (at)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS #182 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Motion is GRANTED in part with leave to amend. The Government may file a Second Amended Complaint-in-Intervention in which it attempts to adequately plead the materiality of the Attestations on or before February 26, 2018. While there may be a Second Amended Complaint, there will be no Third. Any future successful motion to dismiss shall be granted without leave to amend. (iv)
February 9, 2018 Filing 211 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Shirin Behrooz at shirin.behrooz@lw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Schindler, David)
February 8, 2018 Filing 210 MINUTES OF Telephonic Conference Re Discovery held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: On February 8, 2018, the Court held an informal discovery conference. Court Recorder: XTR 2/08/18. (mr)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Conference on Thursday, February 8, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel will call into the conference by calling (877) 205-3155 and using the access code listed below. Telephonic Conference Access Code (Please follow the prompts and enter the code below): User Password: 101745 (mr)
January 31, 2018 Filing 208 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings January 29, 2018 re Transcript #207 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Diaz, Amy) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 31, 2018 Filing 207 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on January 29, 2018. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Amy Diaz, phone number amyfcrr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/21/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2018. (Diaz, Amy)
January 30, 2018 Filing 206 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling for Court Reporter. Court will contact Caroline DaCosta at cdacosta@susmangodfrey.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Subramanian, Arun)
January 29, 2018 Filing 205 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc for Court Reporter. Court will contact Shirin Behrooz at shirin.behrooz@lw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Schindler, David)
January 29, 2018 Filing 204 MINUTES OF MOTION TO DISMISS #182 held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Cause called; appearances made. Court issues tentative ruling and hears oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the motion under submission. Order to issue. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv)
January 29, 2018 Filing 203 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #201 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 29, 2018 Filing 202 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #200 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 24, 2018 Filing 201 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John E Lee on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Lee, John)
January 18, 2018 Filing 200 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Catriona M Lavery on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling (Attorney Catriona M Lavery added to party Benjamin Poehling(pty:pla))(Lavery, Catriona)
January 16, 2018 Filing 199 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss United States First Amended Complaint-In-Partial-Intervention; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #182 filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc, Movant Pacificare of Nevada Inc. (Schindler, David)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Protective Order for Governing Non-Waiver of Privilege and Protected Material by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: Granting #196 Application for Protective Order re Joint APPLICATION for Protective Order for Governing Non-Waiver of Privilege and Protected Material #196 . (See document for details). (mr)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 197 PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING THE TREATMENT OF PROTECTED INFORMATION by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: Granting #195 Application for Protective Order re Joint APPLICATION for Protective Order for Governing Treatment of Protected Information #195 . (See document for details). (mr)
January 12, 2018 Filing 196 Joint APPLICATION for Protective Order for Governing Non-Waiver of Privilege and Protected Material filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Lee, John)
January 12, 2018 Filing 195 Joint APPLICATION for Protective Order for Governing Treatment of Protected Information filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Lee, John)
January 8, 2018 Filing 194 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss United States First Amended Complaint-In-Partial-Intervention; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #182 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Lee, John)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MINUTE ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION FOR EARLY DEPOSITION DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: vacating #167 Motion for Order. Defendants Motion for Early Deposition Discovery was set for hearing on January 22, 2018. On December 27, 2017, Defendants filed a Notice of Withdrawal of the motion. Accordingly, the January 22, 2018 hearing date is VACATED and no appearance is necessary. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mz)
December 27, 2017 Filing 192 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Order re Discovery Matter,,,,,,,,, #167 filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Co., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc. (Schindler, David)
December 22, 2017 Filing 191 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 20-32 days, filed by Plaintiff United States of America.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lee, John)
December 22, 2017 Filing 190 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Smart (CS).Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (ha)
December 21, 2017 Filing 189 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/18/17 re Transcript #188 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ls) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 21, 2017 Filing 188 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/18/17. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2018. (ls)
December 20, 2017 Filing 187 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Caroline DaCosta at cdacosta@susmangodfrey.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Subramanian, Arun)
December 19, 2017 Filing 186 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Shirin Behrooz at shirin.behrooz@lw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Schindler, David)
December 18, 2017 Filing 185 MINUTES OF Telephonic Conference Re Discovery held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: On December 18, 2017, the Court held an informal discovery conference. Court Recorder: XTR 12/18/17. (mr)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: GRANTING #183 Non-Resident Attorney Kathryn H. Ruemmler APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, etc., designating David S. Schindler as local counsel. (lt)
December 8, 2017 Filing 183 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kathryn H. Ruemmler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc, Movant Pacificare of Nevada Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20945832) filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Ca re Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schindler, David)
December 8, 2017 Filing 182 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss United States First Amended Complaint-In-Partial-Intervention; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/29/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David J. Schindler, #2 Proposed Order) (Schindler, David)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Stipulation Regarding Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule #178 is APPROVED and SO ORDERED. The hearing shall be scheduled for 1/29/2018. *See Order for briefing deadlines.* (cw)
November 30, 2017 Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John E Lee on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Lee, John)
November 30, 2017 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John E Lee on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Lee, John)
November 29, 2017 Filing 178 Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schindler, David)
November 21, 2017 Filing 177 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 11/20/2017; 11:08 a.m. re Transcript #176 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (at) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 21, 2017 Filing 176 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/20/2017; 11:08 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2018. (at)
November 21, 2017 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John E Lee on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Lee, John)
November 21, 2017 Filing 174 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Shirin Behrooz at shirin.behrooz@lw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Schindler, David)
November 21, 2017 Filing 173 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Caroline DaCosta at cdacosta@susmangodfrey.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Berry, Matthew)
November 20, 2017 Filing 172 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE UNITED'S MOTION FOR EARLY DEPOSITION DISCOVERY (DKT. #167 ) held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: On November 20, 2017, the Court held an informal discovery conference and discussed Defendant's Motion for Expedited Discovery. The Court continues the Motion hearing to Monday, January 22, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 590, Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, 5th Floor. Court Recorder: XTR 11/20/17. (mr).
November 17, 2017 Filing 171 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company amending Intervenor Complaint, #114 , filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21)(Lee, John)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE UNITED'S MOTION FOR EARLY DEPOSITION DISCOVERY (DKT. #167 ) by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Conference on Monday, November 20, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel will call into the conference by calling (877) 205-3155 and using the access code listed below. Telephonic Conference Access Code (Please follow the prompts and enter the code below): User Password: 101745 (mr)
November 16, 2017 Filing 169 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF MATTER to the Magistrate Judge. MOTION for Order for Early Deposition Discovery #167 filed on 11/15/2017, and currently scheduled fro hearing before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald on 12/18/2017 at 10:00 AM., is deemed a discovery matter, and is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. The hearing before Judge Fitzgerald is hereby VACATED. (jp)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE DISCLOSURE by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The magistrate judge discloses that her health insurance company, Anthem Blue Cross of California, provides prescription drug benefits through Optum, Inc., which appears to be a defendant or related to a defendant in this action. The Court finds that these facts do not require recusal under 28 U.S.C. 455(a) or (b). If any party contends that these facts establish grounds for recusal or disqualification, a motion for disqualification shall be filed within 7 days of the date of this Order. (mr)
November 15, 2017 Filing 167 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Early Deposition Discovery ; Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Catamaran Insurance of Ohio, Inc., Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, UHIC Holdings, Inc., Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc. Motion set for hearing on 12/18/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David J. Schindler, #2 Proposed Order)(Schindler, David)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Setting Date for Filing Amended Complaint-IN-Intervention #165 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald that The United States shall file an amended Complaint-In-Partial-Intervention by 11/17/2017 The deadline for the UnitedHealth Defendants to respond to the governments Complaint-In-Partial-Intervention and any response to Relator's Second Amended Complaint shall be extended until after the United States files its amended Complaint-In-Partial-Intervention. (jp)
October 18, 2017 Filing 165 Joint STIPULATION for Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints and Setting Date for Filing Amended Complaint-In-Intervention filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Catamaran Insurance of Ohio, Inc., Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Pacificare of Nevada Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, UHIC Holdings, Inc., Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schindler, David)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting #161 Non-Resident Attorney Geng Chen APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling, designating Meng Xi as local counsel. (lt)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting #160 Non-Resident Attorney Weston L. O'Black APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling, designating Meng Xi as local counsel. (lt)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting #159 Non-Resident Attorney Matthew R. Berry APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling, designating Meng Xi as local counsel. (lt)
October 9, 2017 Filing 161 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Geng Chen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20630465) filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ) (Xi, Meng)
October 9, 2017 Filing 160 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Weston L. O'Black to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20629995) filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling Benjamin Poehling. (Att achments: #1 Proposed Order) (Xi, Meng)
October 6, 2017 Filing 159 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew R. Berry to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20623971) filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. (Attachments: #1 Propos ed Order Granting Berry PHV) (Xi, Meng)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting #156 Non-Resident Attorney John P lahad APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling, designating Meng Xi as local counsel. (jp)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting #155 Non-Resident Attorney William C. Carmody APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling, designating Meng Xi as local counsel. (lt)
September 29, 2017 Filing 156 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John P. Lahad to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20586340) filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. (Attachments: #1 Proposed O rder) (Xi, Meng)
September 28, 2017 Filing 155 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William Christopher Carmody to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20582810) filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Xi, Meng)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MINUTES (In Chambers): ORDER DENYING Motion to Transfer #134 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: For the reasons set forth below, the Motion is DENIED. The Unitedhealth Defendants have not established that transferring this action a second time will result in any greater convenience or better serve the interests of justice. (jp)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Application #149 by Non-Resident Attorney Arun S. Subramanian to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling, designating Meng Xi as local counsel, is GRANTED. (cw)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney #147 is GRANTED. (cw)
September 25, 2017 Filing 151 MINUTES OF Defendants Motion to Transfer Case to United States District Court for The District of Columbia #134 before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Case called, and counsel make their appearance. The Court hears oral argument from counsel and takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (jp)
September 22, 2017 Filing 150 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Counsel #147 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Substitute Attorney (G-01) - under Category - Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests. Other error(s) with document(s): Miscellaneous Document event utilized in docketing this filing. In the future, please use the SEARCH feature on the CM/ECF Menu Bar if you are unsure of the events to use. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
September 22, 2017 Filing 149 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Arun S. Subramanian to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20549568) filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. (Attachments: #1 Exhi bit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Xi, Meng)
September 22, 2017 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Meng Xi on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling (Attorney Meng Xi added to party Benjamin Poehling(pty:pla))(Xi, Meng)
September 21, 2017 Filing 147 Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-01) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-01))(Williams, Michael) Modified on 9/25/2017 (cw).
September 11, 2017 Filing 146 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Columbia #134 filed by Defendants Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Catamaran Insurance of Ohio, Inc., Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company, Pacificare of Arizona Inc, Pacificare of Colorado Inc, Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC, Preferred Care Partners, Inc., Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc, Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc., UHC of California, UHIC Holdings, Inc., Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc., United Health Care Ins. Co. and United New York, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc., UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc., UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc., Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York, Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc, Movant Pacificare of Nevada Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffery Dumcum In Support, #2 Supplemental Declaration of Karen Erickson In Support, #3 Supplemental Declaration of Daniel Meron In Support)(Attorney David J Schindler added to party Americhoice of New Jersey Inc(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Arizona Physicians IPA Inc(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Care Improvement Plus of Maryland(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Catamaran Insurance of Ohio, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Citrus Health Care Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Health Plan of Nevada Inc(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Pacificare of Arizona Inc(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Pacificare of Colorado Inc(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Pacificare of Nevada Inc(pty:bkmov), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Preferred Care Partners, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UHC of California (pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party United Health Care Ins. Co. and United New York(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc(pty:dft))(Schindler, David)
August 29, 2017 Filing 145 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #139 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 29, 2017 Filing 144 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael E Williams counsel for Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. Adding Valerie Roddy as counsel of record for Benjamin Poehling for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff-Relator Benjamin Poehling. (Williams, Michael)
August 29, 2017 Filing 143 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael E Williams counsel for Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. Adding Sam Sheldon as counsel of record for Benjamin Poehling for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff-Relator Benjamin Poehling. (Williams, Michael)
August 29, 2017 Filing 142 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael E Williams counsel for Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. Adding Christopher Tayback as counsel of record for Benjamin Poehling for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff-Relator Benjamin Poehling. (Williams, Michael)
August 29, 2017 Filing 141 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael E Williams counsel for Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. Adding Kathleen M. Sullivan as counsel of record for Benjamin Poehling for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff-Relator Benjamin Poehling. (Williams, Michael)
August 29, 2017 Filing 140 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael E Williams counsel for Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. Adding Michael E. Williams as counsel of record for Benjamin Poehling for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff-Relator Benjamin Poehling. (Attorney Michael E Williams added to party Benjamin Poehling(pty:pla))(Williams, Michael)
August 29, 2017 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Henry C Su on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling (Attorney Henry C Su added to party Benjamin Poehling(pty:pla))(Su, Henry)
August 28, 2017 Filing 138 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Columbia #134 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carol Wallack, #2 Declaration of Maria Marsh)(Lee, John)
July 24, 2017 Filing 137 CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., UHIC Holdings, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, Americhoice of New Jersey Inc, Arizona Physicians IPA Inc, Care Improvement Plus of Maryland, Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company, Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co., Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company, Catamaran Insurance of Ohio, Inc., Citrus Health Care Inc., Health Plan of Nevada Inc, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc. amending Amended Complaint/Petition,, #117 , filed by Plaintiff Relator Benjamin Poehling (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Inman, Mary)
July 19, 2017 Filing 136 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Second Amended Complaint #117 by Clerk of Court to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 7/24/2017. Please do not indicate attachment "A" for Defendants named in the caption. All defendants namesmust be listed on the caption of the Second Amended Complaint. Also, attorney must add the "Defendants'" exactly as named on "Caption" on the Second Amended Complaint. (jp)
July 19, 2017 Filing 135 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Second Amended Complaint #117 . The following error(s) was found: Please do not indicate attachment "A" for Defendants named in the caption. All defendants names must be listed on the caption of the Second Amended Complaint. Also, attorney must add the "Defendants'" exactly as named on "Caption" on the Second Amended Complaint. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (jp)
July 17, 2017 Filing 134 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Columbia filed by Defendants Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., UHIC Holdings, Inc., United Defendants, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc. Motion set for hearing on 9/25/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Meron, #2 Declaration of Karen Erickson, #3 Proposed Order) (Schindler, David)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Stipulation for Order Regarding Venue Transfer Motion, etc. #131 is GRANTED. The Motion to Transfer Venue shall be filed by 7/17/2017. *See Order for further details.* (cw)
July 17, 2017 Filing 132 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Taeva Shefler counsel for Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. Adding Taeva C Shefler as counsel of record for Benjamin Poehling for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. (Attorney Taeva Shefler added to party Benjamin Poehling(pty:pla))(Shefler, Taeva)
July 14, 2017 Filing 131 Joint STIPULATION for Order REGARDING VENUE TRANSFER MOTION, BRIEFING SCHEDULE, FIRST TO FILE ISSUE, COMPLAINT RESPONSE DATE, AND COMMENCEMENT OF DISCOVERY filed by Defendants Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., UHIC Holdings, Inc., United Defendants, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schindler, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 130 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., UHIC Holdings, Inc., United Defendants, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, (Schindler, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 129 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., UHIC Holdings, Inc., United Defendants, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc (Schindler, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Abid R Qureshi on behalf of Defendants Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., UHIC Holdings, Inc., United Defendants, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc (Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Optum, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party OptumInsight, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party Ovations, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party UHIC Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party United Defendants(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party United HealthCare Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abid R Qureshi added to party United HealthCare, Inc.(pty:dft))(Qureshi, Abid)
July 14, 2017 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel Meron on behalf of Defendants Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., UHIC Holdings, Inc., United Defendants, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc (Attorney Daniel Meron added to party Optum, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Meron added to party OptumInsight, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Meron added to party Ovations, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Meron added to party UHIC Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Meron added to party United Defendants(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Meron added to party United HealthCare Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Meron added to party United HealthCare, Inc.(pty:dft))(Meron, Daniel)
July 14, 2017 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David J Schindler on behalf of Defendants Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., UHIC Holdings, Inc., United Defendants, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc (Attorney David J Schindler added to party Optum, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party OptumInsight, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Ovations, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party UHIC Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party United Defendants(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party United HealthCare Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party United HealthCare, Inc.(pty:dft))(Schindler, David)
July 12, 2017 Filing 125 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen S Hasegawa counsel for Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. Filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. (Attorney Stephen S Hasegawa added to party Benjamin Poehling(pty:pla))(Hasegawa, Stephen)
June 22, 2017 Filing 124 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Entered in error Re: Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator(ADR-11) #123 (mb)
June 22, 2017 Filing 123 ENTERED IN ERROR - NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator (mb).
May 30, 2017 Filing 122 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff-relator Benjamin Poehling. upon Benjamin Poehling waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/16/2017, answer due 7/17/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Abid R. Qureshi. (Hartman, Anne)
May 25, 2017 Filing 121 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff United States of America. upon United Defendants waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/16/2017, answer due 7/17/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Abid R. Qureshi. (Lee, John)
May 24, 2017 Filing 120 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff United States of America. correcting Intervenor Complaint, #114 (Attachments: #1 Corrected Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Lee, John)
May 17, 2017 Filing 119 21 DAY Summons Issued re Intervenor Complaint #114 as to defendants Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., UHIC Holdings, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company. (jp)
May 16, 2017 Filing 118 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff - Relator Benjamin Poehling, (Hartman, Anne)
May 16, 2017 Filing 117 **STRICKEN PER ORDER #136 *** SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Ovations, Inc., UHIC Holdings, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company amending Amended Complaint,, #8 , filed by Plaintiff - Relator Benjamin Poehling (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Inman, Mary) Modified on 7/19/2017 (jp).
May 16, 2017 Filing 116 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Intervenor Complaint, #114 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Lee, John)
May 16, 2017 Filing 115 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Lee, John)
May 16, 2017 Filing 114 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT against Defendants UnitedHealth Group Inc, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UHIC Holdings, Inc., Ovations, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Lee, John)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting #112 Non-Resident Attorney Daniel Meron APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants UnitedHealth Group Inc, Wellmed Medical Management, Inc, designating David J Schindler as local counsel. (jp)
April 24, 2017 Filing 112 Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel Meron to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants UnitedHealth Group Inc, Wellmed Medical Management, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 4/20/2017, Receipt No. 0973-19724254) filed by Defendants UnitedHealth Group Inc, Wellmed Medical Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schindler, David)
April 21, 2017 Filing 111 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel Meron to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants UnitedHealth Group Inc, Wellmed Medical Management, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19724254) #109 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 4/28/2017. (jp)
April 21, 2017 Filing 110 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel Meron to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants UnitedHealth Group Inc, Wellmed Medical Management, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19724254) #109 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (lom)
April 20, 2017 Filing 109 **STRICKEN** APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel Meron to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants UnitedHealth Group Inc, Wellmed Medical Management, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19724254) filed by Defendants UnitedHealth Group Inc, Wellmed Medical Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schindler, David) Modified on 4/24/2017 (cw).
April 17, 2017 Filing 108 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) #107 . Inadvertently, incorrect document - Order was docketed into this case. (lom)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. This case is referred to the ADR Program. Within twenty-one (21) days, plaintiff shall obtain the consent of a neutral listed on the Court's Mediation Panel who will conduct the mediation, and file form ADR-2, Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator. If the parties have not selected and obtained the consent of a Panel Mediator within twenty-one (21) days, the ADR Program will assign one. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: October 30, 2017. (lom)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO UNSEAL FIVE FILINGS #105 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. The Application to Unseal Documents (ECF No. 48), (ECF No. 49), (ECF No. 50), (ECF No. 58), (ECF No. 59) is Granted (lom) Modified on 4/18/2017 (pj).
April 13, 2017 Filing 105 Joint STIPULATION for Order to Unseal Five Filings filed by Defendants UnitedHealth Group Inc, Wellmed Medical Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schindler, David)
April 13, 2017 Filing 104 NOTICE of Change of address by David J Schindler attorney for Defendants UnitedHealth Group Inc, Wellmed Medical Management, Inc.. Changing attorneys address to 355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 100, Los Angeles, California 90071-1560. Filed by Defendants UnitedHealth Group Inc, Wellmed Medical Management, Inc.. (Schindler, David)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Application of Non-Resident Attorney Abid R. Qureshi to Appear Pro Hac Vice #98 on behalf of Defendants UnitedHealthGroup, Inc. and WellMed Medical Management, Inc., designating David J. Schindler as local counsel, is GRANTED. (cw)
April 11, 2017 Filing 102 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 filed by Defendant Wellmed Medical Management, Inc. identifying Collaborative Care Holdings, LLC, WMGHealthcarePartners, L.P. as Corporate Parent. (Schindler, David)
April 11, 2017 Filing 101 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 filed by Defendant UnitedHealth Group Inc (Schindler, David)
April 11, 2017 Filing 100 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wellmed Medical Management, Inc., identifying Collaborative Care Holdings, LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc., WMGHealthcarePartners, L.P., WHP Management, Inc., Lloyd's of London, Ace American Insurance Company, National Union, Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, One Beacon, Argo Re Ltd., Chartis Excess Ltd., XL Insurance Bermuda Ltd., Allied World Assurance Company Ltd., Endurance Specialty Ltd., Arch Reinsurance Ltd.. (Schindler, David)
April 11, 2017 Filing 99 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant UnitedHealth Group Inc, identifying Lloyd's of London, Ace American Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, One Beacon, Argo Re Ltd., Chartis Excess Ltd., XL Insurance Bermuda Ltd., Allied World Assurance Company Ltd., Endurance Specialty Ltd., Arch Reinsurance Ltd.. (Schindler, David)
April 11, 2017 Filing 98 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Abid R. Qureshi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants UnitedHealth Group Inc, Wellmed Medical Management, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19668835) filed by Defendants UnitedH ealth Group Inc, Wellmed Medical Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney David J Schindler added to party UnitedHealth Group Inc(pty:dft), Attorney David J Schindler added to party Wellmed Medical Management, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Schindler, David)
March 27, 2017 Filing 97 NOTICE of Filing in CV 09-5013 of Motion for Order Consolidating Actions filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lee, John)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald GRANTING Requests for approval of Substitution of attorney Jessica T Moore for Benjamin Poehling in place and stead of Brian M Melber, Rodney O Personius #94 , #95 . (jp)
March 21, 2017 Filing 95 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Brian M. Melber as counsel of record filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. (Moore, Jessica)
March 21, 2017 Filing 94 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Rodney O. Personius as counsel of record filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jessica T Moore added to party Benjamin Poehling(pty:pla)) (Moore, Jessica)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER ON CORRECTED NOTICE OF ELECTION OF THE UNITED STATES TO PARTIALLY INTERVENE #92 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald that: (1) The Relator's First Amended Complaint, the Notice of Election of the United States to Intervene in Part and Decline to Intervene in Part and the accompanying Order, and the Corrected Notice of Election of the United States to Partially Intervene and this Order shall remain unsealed. (2) All other papers filed or lodged in this matter shall remain under seal. (3) The seal shall remain lifted on all matters occurring in this action after 2/15/2017. (4) The United States shall file and serve its Complaint in Intervention upon Defendants UnitedHealth Group, Inc. and WellMed Medical Management, Inc., together with this Order, by 5/16/2017. (5) The Relator shall file and serve a Second Amended Complaint upon Defendants by 5/16/2017. (SEE ATTACHMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (jp)
March 14, 2017 Filing 92 NOTICE (CORRECTED) OF ELECTION OF UNITED STATES TO PARTIALLY INTERVENE filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, John)
March 9, 2017 Filing 91 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anne Hayes Hartman counsel for Plaintiff Benjamin Poehling. Adding Anne Hayes Hartman as counsel of record for Benjamin Poehling for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Anne Hayes Hartman. (Attorney Anne Hayes Hartman added to party Benjamin Poehling(pty:pla))(Hartman, Anne)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Application by Non-Resident Attorney Rosie Dawn Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice #83 on behalf of Qui Tam Plaintiff, Benjamin Poehling, designating Mary A. Inman as local counsel, is GRANTED. (cw)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Application by Non-Resident Attorney Max Voldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice #81 on behalf of Qui Tam Plaintiff, Benjamin Poehling, designating Mary A. Inman as local counsel, is GRANTED. (cw)
February 21, 2017 PHV FEE PAID for Non-Resident Attorney Max Voldman Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Receipt No. 0973-19395366 for $325 pro hac vice fee. (Inman, Mary)
February 21, 2017 PHV FEE PAID for Non-Resident Attorney Rosie Dawn Griffin Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Receipt No. 0973-19395278 for $325 pro hac vice fee. (Inman, Mary)
February 21, 2017 Filing 88 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Benjamin Poehling, United States of America (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Paid) #81 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Benjamin Poehling, United States of America (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Paid) #83 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The document is accepted as filed. Upon receipt of the $325 fee for each application, the Court will grant the Orders. The fees are to bepaid on or before February 27, 2017, or the applications will be stricken. (jp)
February 17, 2017 Filing 87 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #84 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #82 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice is the document that needs to be filed, not a Notice of Appearance.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
February 17, 2017 Filing 86 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Benjamin Poehling, United States of America (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Paid) #81 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Benjamin Poehling, United States of America (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Paid) #83 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(c) $325 fee not paid. (lt)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald that the Relator First amended Complaint #8 , the United States Notice of election of Intervention #78 , and this Order #79 shall be UNSEALED. All other papers filed or lodged in this matter shall remain under seal. The seal shall be LIFTED on all matters occuring in this action after the date of this Order. The Relator shall file and serve a Second Amended Complaint upon Defendants within 90 days of the filing of this Order. (SEE ATTACHMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (jp)
February 14, 2017 Filing 85 SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE (lt)
February 14, 2017 Filing 84 SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE (lt) Modified on 2/17/2017 (lt).
February 14, 2017 Filing 83 SEALED DOCUMENT - APPLICATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (lt)
February 14, 2017 Filing 82 SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE(lt)
February 14, 2017 Filing 81 SEALED DOCUMENT - APPLICATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (lt)
February 14, 2017 Filing 78 NOTICE OF ELECTION of the United States to Intervene in part and Decline to Intervene in Part and Stipulation Re Unsealing. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp) Modified on 2/16/2017 (jp).
February 8, 2017 Filing 74 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Paid) #72 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(c) $325 fee not paid. (lt)
February 2, 2017 Filing 77 SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE (cw)
February 2, 2017 Filing 73 SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION #72 (cw)
February 2, 2017 Filing 72 SEALED DOCUMENT - APPLICATION (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (cw)
February 2, 2017 Filing 70 SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER. (lom)
February 1, 2017 Filing 71 SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE.(lom)
February 1, 2017 Filing 69 SEALED DOCUMENT - APPLICATION. (lom)
February 1, 2017 Filing 68 SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER. (lom)
January 31, 2017 Filing 67 SEAL DOCUMENT - STIPULATION. (lom) Modified on 2/3/2017 (lom).
January 27, 2017 Filing 66 SEALED DOCUMENT- NOTICE OF (mat)
January 27, 2017 Filing 65 SEALED DOCUMENT- NOTICE (mat)
January 19, 2017 Filing 62 SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF. (lom)
January 19, 2017 Filing 61 SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF. (lom)
January 19, 2017 Filing 60 SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF. (lom)
January 18, 2017 Filing 64 UNDER SEAL- NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information. (mat)
January 18, 2017 Filing 63 UNDER SEAL- NOTICE of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (mat)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge John F. Walter, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:09-cv-05013 JFW(JEMx) (rn)
December 9, 2016 Filing 58 NOTICE [UNDER SEAL] United States of America. (cw)
December 2, 2016 Filing 57 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Timothy P. McCormack. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 2, 2016 Filing 56 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Rodney O. Personius. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 2, 2016 Filing 55 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Brian Melber. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
November 22, 2016 Filing 54 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 22, 2016 Filing 53 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (esa)
November 22, 2016 Filing 52 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 1:11-cv-00258 RJA, from Western District of New York. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:16-cv-08697 MWF (SSx). (esa)
November 22, 2016 Filing 50 * FILED IN WESTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK AS DOCUMENT NO 50 ON 11/8/16 * ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA (esa) Modified on 12/2/2016 (esa).
November 22, 2016 Filing 8 * FILED IN WESTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK AS DOCUMENT NO 8 ON 10/27/11 * FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Aetna Inc, Arcadian Management Services, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Bravo Health, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Inc, Emblemhealth, Inc., Health Net Inc, Managed Health, Inc., MedAssurant, Inc., Medica Holding Company, Tufts Associated Health Plans, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, WellCare Health Plans, Inc., Wellmed Medical Management, Inc., filed by Plaintiff United States of America(esa) Modified on 12/2/2016 (esa).
November 22, 2016 Filing 1 * FILED IN WESTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK AS DOCUMENT NO 1 ON 3/24/11 * COMPLAINT against defendants Health Net Inc, Tufts Associated Health Plans, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, Wellmed Medical Management, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (esa) Modified on 12/2/2016 (esa).
November 22, 2016 Filing 51 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from New York Western
November 8, 2016 Filing 50 (SG) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/22/2016.] Modified on 4/21/2017 (jp).
November 8, 2016 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT of Unopposed motion of the United States to Transfer Venue(SG) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/22/2016.] Modified on 4/18/2017 (pj).
November 8, 2016 Filing 48 UNOPPOSED MOTION OF THE UNITED STATES TO TRANSFER VENUE (SG) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/22/2016.] Modified on 4/18/2017 (pj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. United Health Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Inc
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacificare of Nevada Inc
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Net Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Improvement Plus of Texas Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Plan of Nevada Inc
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacificare of Colorado Inc
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Alabama Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Health Choice of Texas, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Washington Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unison Health Plan of Tennessee Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Community Plan Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catamaran Insurance of Ohio, Inc.
Represented By: David J Schindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Oregon Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas L.L.C.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthCare Benefits of Texas Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Plan of the River Valley Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of the Midlands Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacificare Life and Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citrus Health Care Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Defendants
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Improvement Plus of Maryland
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symphonix Health Insurance, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Bravo Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Health Maintenance Organization, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Utah Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHIC Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Improvement Plus South Central Insurance Co.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHC of California
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Pennsylvania Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Ohio Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Ohio Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Managed Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tufts Associated Health Plans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacificare of Arizona Inc
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Florida Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Tennessee Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ovations, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of New England Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Improvement Plus Wisconsin Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company Inc
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumInsight, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Physicians IPA Inc
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Oklahoma Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Care Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MedAssurant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Health Care Ins. Co. and United New York
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of the Midwest Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unitedhealthcare Of North Carolina Inc
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford Health Plans (CT), Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americhoice of New Jersey Inc
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medica Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emblemhealth, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Georgia Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unitedhealthcare Insurance Co.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Arkansas Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Health Group Inc
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of New York Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellmed Medical Management, Inc.
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcadian Management Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacificare
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WellCare Health Plans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingenix, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn H Ruemmler
Represented By: David J Schindler
Represented By: Benjamin W Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Represented By: Abid R Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Managed Health, Inc. doing business as Healthfirst New York, Humana, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Alan Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Hallie E Noecker
Represented By: Gregory A Mason
Represented By: Jessica Krieg
Represented By: Jessica T Moore
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Lynch
Represented By: Timothy P McCormack
Represented By: Zoila E Hinson
Represented By: Linda McMahon
Represented By: Edward Crooke
Represented By: Mark Justin Draycott
Represented By: Edward Henry Arens
Represented By: Amy L Likoff
Represented By: Gretchen L. Wylegala
Represented By: Carol Lynn Wallack
Represented By: Paul Perkins
Represented By: Mary A Inman
Represented By: Robert McAuliffe
Represented By: Adam R Tarosky
Represented By: Martha Glover
Represented By: John E Lee
Represented By: Jack David Ross
Represented By: Paul G Freeborne
Represented By: Zoila Hinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Poehling
Represented By: Henry C Su
Represented By: Arun Subramanian
Represented By: Geng Chen
Represented By: Timothy P McCormack
Represented By: Kathleen M Sullivan
Represented By: Oleg Elkhunovich
Represented By: Meng Xi
Represented By: Max Voldman
Represented By: William C Carmody
Represented By: Christopher Tayback
Represented By: Weston L O'Black
Represented By: Rodney O Personius
Represented By: Taeva Shefler
Represented By: Eric R Havian
Represented By: Edward Henry Arens
Represented By: Brian Melber
Represented By: Rosie Dawn Griffin
Represented By: William R H Merrill
Represented By: Sam S Sheldon
Represented By: Jessica T Moore
Represented By: Matthew R Berry
Represented By: Mary A Inman
Represented By: John P Lahad
Represented By: Stephen S Hasegawa
Represented By: Hallie E Noecker
Represented By: Catriona M Lavery
Represented By: Valerie Roddy
Represented By: Michael E Williams
Represented By: Anne Hayes Hartman
Represented By: John E Lee
Represented By: Harry P Litman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Judge Suzanne H. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?